FPX, LLC v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: FPX, LLC
Defendant: Google, Inc., YouTube, LLC, AOL, LLC., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., MySpace, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp
Case Number: 2:2009cv00142
Filed: May 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2011 Filing 109 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING held on 12/1/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (84 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2011. (tja, )
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting Pltf's 107 Motion for Leave to File additional documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/8/10. (ehs, )
December 7, 2010 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Documents by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nathan D. Meyer, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Affidavit of Scott Kline, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Meyer, Nathan)
December 1, 2010 Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Class Certification Hearing held on 12/1/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
November 17, 2010 Filing 105 NOTICE by FPX, LLC Plaintiff's Witness List (Meyer, Nathan)
November 17, 2010 Filing 104 NOTICE by FPX, LLC Plaintiff's Exhibit List (Meyer, Nathan)
November 17, 2010 Filing 103 NOTICE by FPX, LLC Platiff's Deposition Designations (Meyer, Nathan)
November 17, 2010 Filing 102 NOTICE by AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC DEFENDANTS WITNESS DESIGNATIONS (Babcock, Charles)
November 17, 2010 Filing 101 NOTICE by AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT LIST (Babcock, Charles)
November 17, 2010 Filing 100 NOTICE by AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC DEFENDANTS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Babcock, Charles)
November 17, 2010 Filing 99 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George L McWilliams on behalf of AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC (McWilliams, George)
November 15, 2010 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re 86 MOTION to Strike filed by AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Babcock, Charles)
November 15, 2010 Filing 97 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 77 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class filed by AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Babcock, Charles)
November 5, 2010 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re 86 MOTION to Strike filed by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nathan D. Meyer)(Meyer, Nathan)
November 4, 2010 Filing 95 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 79 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Thomas J. Maronick and Brief in Support filed by FPX, LLC. (Meyer, Nathan)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 92 Motion to Withdraw. David P. Whittlesey and Ronald Casey Low are relieved of all further responsibility as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/4/2010. (ch, )
November 3, 2010 Filing 93 ***DUPLICATE OF #92, SIGNED BY SAME ATTY AS #92***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald) Modified on 11/4/2010 (ch, ).
November 3, 2010 Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record)(Whittlesey, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
November 1, 2010 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to Motion re 77 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class filed by FPX, LLC. (Meyer, Nathan)
October 25, 2010 Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion re 79 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Thomas J. Maronick and Brief in Support filed by AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Supplemental Declaration of Itamar Simonson)(Babcock, Charles)
October 18, 2010 Filing 89 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 87 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
October 18, 2010 Filing 88 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 87 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kerry Barker, # 2 Exhibit 1-5 to Declaration of Kerry Barker, # 3 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Kerry Barker, # 4 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Kerry Barker, # 5 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Kerry Barker, # 6 Exhibit 9-18 to Declaration of Kerry Barker)(Babcock, Charles)
October 18, 2010 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re 77 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class filed by AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl Butzer, # 2 Exhibit 1-54 of Carl Butzer, # 3 Exhibit 55-61 of Carl Butzer, # 4 Declaration of Shannon Zmud Teicher, # 5 Declaration of Dr. Itamar Simonson, # 6 Exhibit to Declaration of Dr. Itamar Simonson)(Babcock, Charles)
October 18, 2010 Filing 86 MOTION to Strike by AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
October 15, 2010 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Zmud Teicher on behalf of AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC (Teicher, Shannon)
October 14, 2010 Filing 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Thomas J. Maronick and Brief in Support filed by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nathan D. Meyer, # 2 Exhibit A-B)(Meyer, Nathan)
October 12, 2010 Filing 83 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nathan Meyer for FPX, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID)(ehs, )
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 81 Motion to Amend docket control order. The Court has determined the motion should be GRANTED and the Courts November 6, 2009 Docket Control Order should be modified. The briefing schedule on Defendants Daubert motion is as follows: Plaintiffs Opposition: October 14, 2010 Defendants Reply: October 25, 2010 Plaintiffs Sur-reply: November 4, 2010. Defendants are permitted twenty (20) pages for their brief in response to Plaintiffs Opposed Motion for Class Certification in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/7/10. (ehs, )
October 6, 2010 Filing 81 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 44 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,, Docket Control Order by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
September 20, 2010 Filing 80 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 77 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Marc A. Fenster, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C Part 1 of 2, # 5 Exhibit C Part 2 of 2, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Fenster, Marc)
September 20, 2010 Filing 79 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Thomas J. Maronick and Brief in Support by AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl Butzer, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 1, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 2, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 3, # 5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 4, # 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 5, # 7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 6, # 8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 7, # 9 Errata A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 8, # 10 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 9, # 11 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 10, # 12 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 11, # 13 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 12, # 14 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 13, # 15 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 14, # 16 Exhibit B to Declaration of Carl Butzer, # 17 Declaration of Itamar Simonson, # 18 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Itamar Simonson, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
September 20, 2010 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #76 Motion to Exclude submitted by AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., YouTube, LLC. No certificate of conference included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motion is terminated. (sm, )
September 20, 2010 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #78 Sealed Additional Attachments to #77 submitted by FPX, LLC. No certificate of authority to seal was included and declaration was main document instead of being an attachment. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
September 17, 2010 Filing 78 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: Declaration of Marc A. Fenster In Support of Motion for Class Certification 77 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C Part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibit C Part 2 of 2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Fenster, Marc) Modified on 9/20/2010 (sm, ).
September 17, 2010 Filing 77 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David Whittlesey, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
September 17, 2010 Filing 76 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Thomas J. Maronick and Brief in Support by AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl Butzer, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 1, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 2, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 3, # 5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 4, # 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 5, # 7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 6, # 8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 7, # 9 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 8, # 10 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 9, # 11 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 10, # 12 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 11, # 13 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 12, # 14 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 13, # 15 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 14, # 16 Exhibit B to Declaration of Carl Butzer, # 17 Declaration of Itamar Simonson, # 18 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Itamar Simonson, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 9/20/2010 (sm, ).
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 74 Motion to Continue certain deadlines. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/11/2010. (ch, )
August 4, 2010 Filing 74 Joint MOTION to Continue Certain Deadlines by AOL, LLC., FPX, LLC, Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
July 30, 2010 Filing 73 NOTICE of Disclosure by IAC/InterActiveCorp Amended Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
July 30, 2010 Filing 72 NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC. Amended Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
July 30, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google, Inc., YouTube, LLC Amended Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
July 14, 2010 Filing 70 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL, LLC. (Babcock, Charles) Modified on 7/15/2010 (sm, ).
July 7, 2010 Filing 69 NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC., Google, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp, MySpace, Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC Defendants' Notice of Expert Disclosure (Babcock, Charles)
June 4, 2010 Filing 68 NOTICE of Disclosure by FPX, LLC PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED NOTICE OF EXPERT DISCLOSURE (Fenster, Marc)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Todd Y Brandt terminated as counsel for FPX, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/4/2010. (ch, )
June 3, 2010 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandt, Todd)
June 2, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE by FPX, LLC of Expert Disclosure (Fenster, Marc)
May 5, 2010 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Y Brandt on behalf of FPX, LLC (Brandt, Todd)
April 29, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald Casey Low on behalf of FPX, LLC (Low, Ronald)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Motion to Modify the Courts Docket Control. Plaintiffs to designate any expert witness(es) and file a report for any such witness upon whom Plaintiffs intend to rely in support of their Motions for Class Certification is now June 2, 2010. Deadline for Defendants to designate any such expert witness(es) and file a report for any such witness upon whom Defendants intend to rely in opposition to Plaintiffs Motions for Class Certification is now July 7, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/28/10. (ehs, )
April 27, 2010 Filing 61 Agreed MOTION Modify Docket Control Order re 44 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,, by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Agreed Motion to Modify Docket Control Order)(Whittlesey, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2010: # 2 Revised Order) (sm, ).
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 58 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Harold Kip Glasscock, Jr terminated for Plaintiff FPX, LLC (d.b.a. Firepond). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/23/10. (ehs, )
April 23, 2010 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Philip Whittlesey on behalf of FPX, LLC (Whittlesey, David)
April 22, 2010 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glasscock, Harold)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Motion to Withdraw Debera Hepburn as attorney for FPX, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/2010. (ch, )
February 26, 2010 Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hepburn, Debera)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PROTECTIVE ORDER, Motions terminated: 54 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., YouTube, LLC, IAC/InterActiveCorp, AOL, LLC., MySpace, Inc., Google, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/16/10. (ehs, )
February 15, 2010 Filing 54 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Google, Inc., YouTube, LLC, AOL, LLC., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., MySpace, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 51 Motion to Withdraw Donald C. Templin,Haynes and Boone L.L.C., 2323 Victory Avenue, Suite 700, Dallas, Texas 75219. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/16/09. (ehs, )
December 16, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debera Wells Hepburn on behalf of FPX, LLC (Hepburn, Debera)
December 15, 2009 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Certain Counsel by AOL, LLC., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
November 25, 2009 Filing 50 NOTICE of Disclosure by FPX, LLC (Fenster, Marc)
November 25, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE of Disclosure by IAC/InterActiveCorp (Babcock, Charles)
November 25, 2009 Filing 48 NOTICE of Disclosure by MySpace, Inc. (Babcock, Charles)
November 25, 2009 Filing 47 NOTICE of Disclosure by Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. (Babcock, Charles)
November 25, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL, LLC. (Babcock, Charles)
November 25, 2009 Filing 45 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google, Inc., YouTube, LLC (Babcock, Charles)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification 10/26/2010 @ 9:30 AM, before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. All other deadlines are set forth herein Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/6/09. (ch, ) Modified on 11/9/2009 (ch, ).
November 6, 2009 Filing 43 Submission of Docket Control Order by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control)(Vallejo, Raquel)
November 6, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED. Document # 42, Submission of docket control order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
November 5, 2009 Filing 42 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Submission of Docket Control Order by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control)(Vallejo, Raquel) Modified on 11/6/2009 (sm, ).
October 30, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raquel Vallejo on behalf of FPX, LLC (Vallejo, Raquel)
October 29, 2009 Filing 40 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Raquel Vallejo for FPX, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4996(ch, )
October 28, 2009 Filing 39 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/26/09 Scheduling Conference before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2010. (lss, )
October 26, 2009 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Scheduling Conference held on 10/26/2009, (Class Certification Hearing set for 10/26/2010 09:30 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.). (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml)
October 22, 2009 Filing 37 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control and Discovery Order by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Docket Control and Discovery Order)(Fenster, Marc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2009: # 2 Revised Order) (sm, ).
October 5, 2009 Filing 36 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 10/26/2009, 01:30 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.(delat)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REFERRING CASE for pretrial proceedings to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/28/09. (ehs, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 34 Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2009 01:50 PM before Judge T. John Ward.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/22/09. (ch, )
August 6, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Marshall Kline on behalf of FPX, LLC (Kline, Scott)
August 3, 2009 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Historic TW Inc., Corporate Parent Warner Communications, Inc. for Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
August 3, 2009 Filing 31 Defendant Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Turner Broadcasting System, Inc..(Babcock, Charles)
August 3, 2009 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MySpace, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fox Interactive Media, Inc., Other Affiliate News Corporation for MySpace, Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
August 3, 2009 Filing 29 Defendant MySpace, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by MySpace, Inc..(Babcock, Charles)
August 3, 2009 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent AOL Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate TW AOL Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Time Warner Inc. for AOL, LLC.. (Babcock, Charles)
August 3, 2009 Filing 27 Defendant AOL LLC's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by AOL, LLC..(Babcock, Charles)
August 3, 2009 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by IAC/InterActiveCorp identifying Other Affiliate IAC Search & Media, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Media Corp. for IAC/InterActiveCorp. (Babcock, Charles)
August 3, 2009 Filing 25 Defendant IAC's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by IAC/InterActiveCorp.(Babcock, Charles)
August 3, 2009 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by YouTube, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Google, Inc. for YouTube, LLC. (Babcock, Charles)
August 3, 2009 Filing 23 Defendant YouTube, LLC's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by YouTube, LLC.(Babcock, Charles)
August 3, 2009 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. (Babcock, Charles)
August 3, 2009 Filing 21 Defendant Google Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Google, Inc..(Babcock, Charles)
June 23, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google, Inc. to 8/3/2009; YouTube, LLC to 8/3/2009; AOL, LLC. to 8/3/2009; Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. to 8/3/2009; MySpace, Inc. to 8/3/2009; IAC/InterActiveCorp to 8/3/2009. (ehs, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended for defts Google, Inc., YouTube, LLC, AOL, LLC, Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., MySpace, Inc. and IAC/InterActiveCorp shall have up to and including Monday, August 3, 2009 to answer,. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/23/09. (ehs, )
June 22, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of FPX, LLC (Fenster, Marc)
June 19, 2009 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Google, Inc., YouTube, LLC, AOL, LLC., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., MySpace, Inc., IAC/InterActiveCorp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
June 19, 2009 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl Christof Butzer on behalf of all defendants (Butzer, Carl)
June 19, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David T Moran on behalf of all defendants (Moran, David)
June 19, 2009 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles L Babcock on behalf of all defendants (Babcock, Charles)
June 12, 2009 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by FPX, LLC. YouTube, LLC served on 6/1/2009, answer due 6/22/2009. (ch, )
June 12, 2009 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by FPX, LLC. MySpace, Inc. served on 6/1/2009, answer due 6/22/2009. (ch, )
June 12, 2009 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by FPX, LLC. AOL, LLC. served on 5/14/2009. (ch, )
June 12, 2009 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by FPX, LLC. Google, Inc. served on 5/20/2009, answer due 6/9/2009. (ch, )
June 12, 2009 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by FPX, LLC. IAC/InterActiveCorp served on 5/15/2009, answer due 6/4/2009. (ch, )
June 12, 2009 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by FPX, LLC. Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. served on 5/18/2009. (ch, )
May 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. to 7/23/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AOL, LLC. to 7/17/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 28, 2009 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Turner Broadcasting System, Inc..( Templin, Donald)
May 28, 2009 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AOL, LLC..( Templin, Donald)
May 27, 2009 Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to MySpace, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 YouTube, LLC)(ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by CT Trust Co as to YouTube, LLC, MySpace, Inc. stating they are not the registered agent for these defendants. (ehs, )
May 12, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harold Kip Glasscock, Jr on behalf of FPX, LLC (Glasscock, Harold)
May 12, 2009 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Pridham on behalf of FPX, LLC (Pridham, David)
May 12, 2009 Filing 2 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AOL, LLC., (Attachments: # 1 Google, Inc., # 2 IAC/InterActive Corp, # 3 MySpace. Inc., # 4 Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc, # 5 YouTube, LLC)(ch, )
May 11, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000001989741.), filed by FPX, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FPX, LLC v. Google, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FPX, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Wesley Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MySpace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAC/InterActiveCorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?