API Technologies, LLC v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: API Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon Web Services LLC, AOL LLC, Mapquest, Inc., Bebo, Inc., Truveo, Inc., Best Buy Co. Inc.,, CBS Corporation, CBS INTERACTIVE INC., CBS Interactive Media Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Last.FM Limited, The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc., Google Inc., Android, Inc., Thomson Reuters Corporation, Thomson Reuters PLC, Thomson Reuters U.S., Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc., Reuters America, LLC and Yahoo! Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00147
Filed: May 12, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting 190 Motion to Stay. ORDERS that the case is stayed pending the final outcome, including any appeals, of the pending inter partes reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 6,859,699, filed by Google Inc. on 4/2/2010 with the United States Patent and Trademark Office. The following agreed and stipulated terms shall apply. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/1/2010. (ch, )
June 30, 2010 Filing 190 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Reexamination by Android, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Al-Salam, Ramsey)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting 188 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply in Support of its Response to deft's motion to transfer venue. Responses due by 7/1/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/25/10. (ehs, )
June 25, 2010 Filing 188 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of Its Opposition To Defts Motion To Transfer Venue by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
June 25, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 187, Sealed Sur-Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 24, 2010 Filing 187 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 174 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Wiley, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/25/2010 (ch, ).
June 14, 2010 Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion re 174 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Android, Inc., Best Buy Co. Inc.,, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Michels Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Smith Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Smith Ex. 1, # 4 Exhibit Smith Ex. 2, # 5 Exhibit Smith Ex. 3, # 6 Exhibit Smith Ex. 4)(Smith, Kevin)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 184 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Todd Y Brandt terminated as counsel for API Technologies LLC. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/4/2010. (ch, )
June 3, 2010 Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandt, Todd)
June 3, 2010 Filing 183 RESPONSE to Motion re 174 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Wiley Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Affidavit Spangenberg Declaration, # 37 Affidavit Spangler Declaration, # 38 Affidavit Hepburn Declaration)(Wiley, Elizabeth)
June 3, 2010 Filing 182 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Stoebner Wiley on behalf of API Technologies, LLC (Wiley, Elizabeth)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting 180 Motion for Extension of Time to File. API Technologies, LLC is granted an extension of time up to and including 6/3/2010 to file its response to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/18/2010. (ch, )
May 17, 2010 Filing 180 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response In Opposition to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saxon, Adam)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/12/2010. (ch, )
May 11, 2010 Filing 178 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 175 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed agreed Protective Order. Deadline extended to 5/11/10. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/5/10. (ehs, )
May 5, 2010 Filing 176 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Y Brandt on behalf of API Technologies, LLC (Brandt, Todd)
May 4, 2010 Filing 175 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File (proposed agreed Protective Order) by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saxon, Adam)
April 30, 2010 Filing 174 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Android, Inc., Best Buy Co. Inc.,, Google Inc., Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Ryan McBrayer, # 2 Exhibit RM1, # 3 Exhibit RM2, # 4 Exhibit RM3, # 5 Exhibit RM4, # 6 Exhibit RM5, # 7 Exhibit RM6, # 8 Exhibit RM7, # 9 Exhibit RM8, # 10 Exhibit RM9, # 11 Exhibit RM10, # 12 Exhibit RM11, # 13 Exhibit RM12, # 14 Exhibit RM13, # 15 Exhibit RM14, # 16 Exhibit RM15, # 17 Exhibit RM16, # 18 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Neal Sample, # 19 Exhibit C -- Declaration of Kris Brewer, # 20 Exhibit D -- Declaration of Kevin Matheny, # 21 Exhibit E -- Declaration of Oren Michels, # 22 Exhibit F -- Declaration of Mary McNeill, # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Singh, Vincent)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting 168 Motion for Extension of Time to File a proposed agreed Protective Order. Deadline May 4, 2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/21/10. (ehs, )
April 20, 2010 Filing 172 NOTICE of Disclosure by Android, Inc., Google Inc. Pursuant to Court's Discovery Order (Singh, Vincent)
April 20, 2010 Filing 171 NOTICE of Disclosure by Yahoo! Inc. Pursuant to Court's Discovery Order (Smith, Kevin)
April 20, 2010 Filing 170 NOTICE of Disclosure by Best Buy Co. Inc., (Faulkner, Rickey)
April 20, 2010 Filing 169 NOTICE of Disclosure by API Technologies, LLC (Initial Disclosures) (Saxon, Adam)
April 19, 2010 Filing 168 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File (proposed agreed Protective Order) by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saxon, Adam)
April 16, 2010 Filing 167 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Melissa M Wendland for Best Buy Co. Inc.,,Melissa M Wendland for Best Buy Co. Inc., (RECEIPT 2-1-5304). (rml, )
April 8, 2010 Filing 166 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stanley H Thompson, Jr on behalf of API Technologies, LLC (Thompson, Stanley)
April 7, 2010 Filing 165 NOTICE of Disclosure by API Technologies, LLC (re P.R. 3-1 and 3-2) (Saxon, Adam)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting 163 Motion for Extension of Time for P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures. ORDERED that APIs deadline for P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures to Defendants is extended from 4/2/2010,up to and including 4/6/2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/5/2010. (ch, )
April 2, 2010 Filing 163 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures) by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saxon, Adam)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 160 Motion to Dismiss defendants, The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation and Hoovers Inc. with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and cists are to be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/16/10. (ehs, )
March 16, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED SEPARATELY Document # 161, Proposed Motion to Dismiss Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 15, 2010 Filing 161 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Proposed MOTION to Dismiss Order by The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation. (Newton, Michael) Modified on 3/16/2010 (ch, ).
March 15, 2010 Filing 160 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation. (Newton, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/16/2010: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 2, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation to 3/15/2010; Hoover's, Inc. to 3/15/2010. (ch, )
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting 157 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. D & B Dfts deadline is extended to 3/15/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/2/2010. (ch, )
March 1, 2010 Filing 158 NOTICE of Disclosure by API Technologies, LLC (of accused instrumentalities) (Saxon, Adam)
March 1, 2010 Filing 157 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 154 Motion to Amend/Correct. It is ORDERED that the date for compliance with P.R. 4-5(c) be changed from 12/17/2011 to 12/17/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/18/2010. (ch, )
February 18, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation to 3/1/2010; Hoover's, Inc. to 3/1/2010. (ch, )
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 153 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. D & B Dfts deadline is extended to 3/1/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/18/2010. (ch, )
February 18, 2010 Filing 154 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct a Typographical Error Within The Docket Control Order by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saxon, Adam)
February 17, 2010 Filing 153 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
February 2, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation to 2/15/2010; Hoover's, Inc. to 2/15/2010. (ch, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting 151 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. D & B Dfts deadline is extended to 2/15/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/2/2010. (ch, )
February 1, 2010 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
January 25, 2010 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: (To Correct Docket Text for Jury Selection on Docket Control Order # 149) Jury Selection set for 4/2/2012 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
January 25, 2010 ***PLEASE IGNORE.***Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: To correct entry on docket control order Jury Selection set for 4/12/2012 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward. (ch, ) Modified on 1/25/2010 (ch, ).
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/22/2010. (ch, )
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 9/24/2010., Joinder of Parties due by 9/24/2010., Markman Hearing set for 2/9/2011 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward., Jury Selection set for 4/2/2012 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/22/2010. (ch, ) Modified on 1/25/2010 (ch, ).
January 21, 2010 Filing 148 Joint MOTION Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Saxon, Adam)
January 19, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation to 2/1/2010; Hoover's, Inc. to 2/1/2010. (ehs, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 144 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for D&B defendants extended to 2/1/10. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/19/10. (ehs, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 143 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions. Deadline is extended to 1/21/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/19/2010. (ch, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 142 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Proposed Discovery Order. Deadline is extended to 1/21/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/19/2010. (ch, )
January 18, 2010 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
January 14, 2010 Filing 143 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File P.R. 3-1 by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saxon, Adam)
January 14, 2010 Filing 142 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File proposed Docket Control Order and Disovery Order by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saxon, Adam)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 140 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tyler Kendall Brochstein terminated as attorney of record for API Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/12/10. (ehs, )
January 8, 2010 Filing 140 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brochstein, Tyler)
January 7, 2010 Filing 139 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Craig Saxon on behalf of API Technologies, LLC (Saxon, Adam)
January 5, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation to 1/18/2010; Hoover's, Inc. to 1/18/2010. (ehs, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. D&B Defendants shall have through and including until January 18, 2010 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/5/10. (ehs, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 135 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice With Prejudice filed by Last.FM Limited, CBS Interactive Media Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CBS INTERACTIVE INC., CBS Corporation. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, API Technologies, LLC, and defendants, CBS Corporation, CBS Interactive Inc., CBS Interactive Media, Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., and Last.FM Ltd., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of a confidential settlement agreement dated December 16, 2009. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/5/10. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 136 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
January 4, 2010 Filing 135 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by CBS Corporation, CBS INTERACTIVE INC., CBS Interactive Media Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., Last.FM Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
December 22, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for CBS Corporation to 1/4/2010; CBS INTERACTIVE INC. to 1/4/2010; CBS Interactive Media Inc. to 1/4/2010; CNET Investments, Inc. to 1/4/2010; CNET Networks, Inc. to 1/4/2010; The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation to 1/4/2010; Hoover's, Inc. to 1/4/2010. (ehs, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CBS and D&B Defendants shall have until January 4, 2010 to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/22/09. (ehs, )
December 21, 2009 Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CBS Corporation, CBS INTERACTIVE INC., CBS Interactive Media Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
December 14, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 12/14/09. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders by January 14, 2010. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (shd, )
December 14, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 12/14/09. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders BY 1/14/10. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.)(delat) Modified on 12/15/2009 (jml, ).
December 10, 2009 Filing 132 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Google Inc., Android, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B Martin terminated as counsel for API Technologies LLC. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/9/09. (ch, )
December 9, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for CBS Corporation to 12/21/2009; CBS INTERACTIVE INC. to 12/21/2009; CBS Interactive Media Inc. to 12/21/2009; CNET Investments, Inc. to 12/21/2009; CNET Networks, Inc. to 12/21/2009; The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation to 12/21/2009. (ch, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time to File. CBS and D&B Dfts deadline is extended to 12/21/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/9/09. (ch, )
December 7, 2009 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Richard)
December 7, 2009 Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CBS Corporation, CBS INTERACTIVE INC., CBS Interactive Media Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
November 25, 2009 Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent Ajay Singh on behalf of Google Inc., Android, Inc. (Singh, Vincent)
November 24, 2009 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard B Martin on behalf of API Technologies, LLC (Martin, Richard)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER - this case is set for Status Conference set 12/14/2009 02:50 PM before Judge T. John Ward and Honorable Chad Everingham. Parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on 1/14/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/24/09. (ch, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 123 Motion to Dismiss defts Thomson Reuters Corporation, Thomson Reuters PLC, Thomson Reuters U.S., Inc., Thomson Reuters U.S.A., Inc., and Reuters America, LLC with prejudice. All attorneys' fees, expenses and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/12/09. (ehs, )
November 11, 2009 Filing 123 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Thomson Reuters Corporation, Thomson Reuters PLC, Thomson Reuters U.S., Inc., Thomson Reuters U.S.A., Inc., and Reuters America, LLC by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brochstein, Tyler)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 121 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CBS and D&B Defendants shall have through and including until December 7, 2009 to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/10/09. (ehs, )
November 6, 2009 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CBS Corporation, CBS INTERACTIVE INC., CBS Interactive Media Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
October 13, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Thomson Reuters Corporation to 11/13/2009; Thomson Reuters PLC to 11/13/2009; Thomson Reuters U.S. to 11/13/2009; Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc. to 11/13/2009. (ch, )
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 117 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Thomson Reuters Corporation; Thomson Reuters PLC; Thomson Reuters U.S. Inc.; Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc.; and Reuters America, LLC (collectively Reuters) deadline is extended to 11/13/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/13/09. (ch, )
October 13, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for CBS Corporation to 11/7/2009; CBS INTERACTIVE INC. to 11/7/2009; CBS Interactive Media Inc. to 11/7/2009; CNET Investments, Inc. to 11/7/2009; CNET Networks, Inc. to 11/7/2009; The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation to 11/7/2009; Hoover's, Inc. to 11/7/2009. (ch, )
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 115 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for CBS Corporation, CBS Interactive Inc.,CBS Interactive Media, Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc. (collectively CBS Defendants), The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation and Hoovers, Inc. (collectively D&B Defendants) is extended to 11/7/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/13/09. (ch, )
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 114 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff, API Technologies, LLC, and Defendants, AOL LLC, Mapquest, Inc., Bebo, Inc., and Truveo, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of a confidential settlement agreement dated 9/22/09.It is further ORDERED that all attorneys' fees, expenses and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/13/09. (ch, )
October 12, 2009 Filing 117 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Thomson Reuters Corporation, Thomson Reuters PLC, Thomson Reuters U.S., Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc., Reuters America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 112 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer Parker Ainsworth terminated as counsel for defendants CBS Corporation; CBS Interactive Inc.; CBS Interactive Media Inc.; CNET Investments, Inc.; and CNET Networks, Inc.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/9/09. (ch, )
October 8, 2009 Filing 115 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mapquest, Inc., Bebo, Inc., Truveo, Inc., CBS Corporation, CBS INTERACTIVE INC., CBS Interactive Media Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
October 8, 2009 Filing 114 Consent MOTION to Dismiss AOL LLC, Mapquest, Inc., Bebo, Inc., and Truveo, Inc. by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brochstein, Tyler)
October 8, 2009 Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Race, Deborah)
October 7, 2009 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CBS Corporation, CBS INTERACTIVE INC., CBS Interactive Media Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
October 5, 2009 Filing 111 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan J McBrayer for Google Inc. and Android, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-19575. (ch, )
September 17, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Reuters America, LLC to 10/14/2009. (ehs, )
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time to answer. Reuters is granted an extension of the time to answer Plaintiffs Original Complaint up to and including October 14, 2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/17/09. (ehs, )
September 14, 2009 Filing 109 ANSWER to 102 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Google Inc. and Android, Inc. by API Technologies, LLC.(Bustamante, John)
September 11, 2009 Filing 108 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Thomson Reuters Corporation, Thomson Reuters PLC, Thomson Reuters U.S., Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc., Reuters America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher)
September 10, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for CBS Corporation to 10/8/2009; CBS INTERACTIVE INC. to 10/8/2009; CBS Interactive Media Inc. to 10/8/2009; CNET Investments, Inc. to 10/8/2009; CNET Networks, Inc. to 10/8/2009; The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation to 10/8/2009; AOL LLC to 10/8/2009. (ch, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 106 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AOL, CBS and D&B Dft's deadline is extended to 10/8/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/10/09. (ch, )
September 4, 2009 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mapquest, Inc., Bebo, Inc., Truveo, Inc., CBS Corporation, CBS INTERACTIVE INC., CBS Interactive Media Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
September 3, 2009 Filing 105 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ramsey M Al-Salam for Google Inc., Android, Inc., Google Inc. and Android, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-0019158) (ehs, )
August 21, 2009 Filing 104 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Android, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc. for Android, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
August 21, 2009 Filing 103 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Google Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
August 21, 2009 Filing 102 Google Inc. and Android, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against API Technologies, LLC by Google Inc., Android, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
August 14, 2009 Filing 101 ANSWER to 80 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Yahoo!, Inc. by API Technologies, LLC.(Bustamante, John)
August 14, 2009 Filing 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Marcus Bustamante on behalf of API Technologies, LLC (Bustamante, John)
August 12, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Thomson Reuters Corporation to 9/14/2009; Thomson Reuters PLC to 9/14/2009; Thomson Reuters U.S. to 9/14/2009; Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc. to 9/14/2009. (ch, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 97 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Reuters deadline is extended to 9/14/ 09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/12/09. (ch, )
August 10, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Bebo, Inc. to 9/8/2009; Truveo, Inc. to 9/8/2009; CBS Corporation to 9/8/2009; CBS INTERACTIVE INC. to 9/8/2009; CBS Interactive Media Inc. to 9/8/2009; CNET Investments, Inc. to 9/8/2009; CNET Networks, Inc. to 9/8/2009; The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation to 9/8/2009; AOL LLC to 9/8/2009. (ch, )
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that the AOL, CBS and D&B Defendants shall have through and including until September 8, 2009 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/10/09. (ch, )
August 10, 2009 Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Thomson Reuters Corporation, Thomson Reuters PLC, Thomson Reuters U.S., Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher)
August 7, 2009 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mapquest, Inc., Bebo, Inc., Truveo, Inc., CBS Corporation, CBS INTERACTIVE INC., CBS Interactive Media Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc., The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Alan)
August 6, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 8/21/2009; Android, Inc. to 8/21/2009. (ch, )
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google Inc. and Android, Inc. shall have through 8/21/09 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/6/09. (ch, )
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 90 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between Plaintiff and Dft are hereby dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All costs, expenses and attorney fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/6/09. (ch, )
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 89 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, API Technologies, LLC, and defendants, Amazon.com, Inc. andAmazon Web Services LLC, are hereby dismissed WITH PREJUDICE, subject to the terms ofthat certain agreement entitled PATENTS IN SUIT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and dated 7/13/09. All attorneys' fees, expenses and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/6/09. (ch, )
July 31, 2009 Filing 92 ANSWER to 70 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Best Buy Co. Inc. by API Technologies, LLC.(Fenster, Marc)
July 31, 2009 Filing 91 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Google Inc., Android, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 31, 2009 Filing 90 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Facebook, Inc. by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brochstein, Tyler)
July 31, 2009 Filing 89 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Web Services LLC by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brochstein, Tyler)
July 30, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Android, Inc. to 8/7/2009. (ch, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Android Inc deadline is extended to 8/7/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/30/09. (ch, )
July 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 85 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ruffin B Cordell terminated as counsel for Android, Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/29/09. (ch, )
July 29, 2009 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Android, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 27, 2009 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney And Termination of Electronic Notices by Android, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordell, Ruffin)
July 24, 2009 Filing 84 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for Yahoo! Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID) 2-1-4832 (ehs, )
July 24, 2009 Filing 83 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mary H McNeill for Yahoo! Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID) 2-1-4832 (ehs, )
July 24, 2009 Filing 82 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Kash for Yahoo! Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID) 2-1-4832(ehs, )
July 23, 2009 Filing 81 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Cert of Service): 80 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim.. (Smith, Kevin) Modified on 7/23/2009 (sm, ).
July 22, 2009 Filing 80 ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against API Technologies, LLC by Yahoo! Inc..(Smith, Kevin)
July 22, 2009 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles K Verhoeven on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Verhoeven, Charles)
July 22, 2009 Filing 78 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Yahoo! Inc. (Smith, Kevin)
July 22, 2009 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer A Kash on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Kash, Jennifer)
July 16, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Facebook, Inc. to 8/8/2009. 18 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 16, 2009 Filing 76 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Facebook, Inc..( Dacus, Deron)
July 14, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Thomson Reuters Corporation to 8/14/2009; Thomson Reuters PLC to 8/14/2009; Thomson Reuters U.S. to 8/14/2009; Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc. to 8/14/2009; Reuters America, LLC to 8/14/2009. (ehs, )
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Reuters granted an extension of the time to answer by August 14, 2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/13/09. (ehs, )
July 13, 2009 Filing 75 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lauren E Schrero for Best Buy Co. Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4809. (ch, )
July 13, 2009 Filing 74 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Emmett J McMahon for Best Buy Co. Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4809. (ch, )
July 10, 2009 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Thomson Reuters Corporation, Thomson Reuters PLC, Thomson Reuters U.S., Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc., Reuters America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryan, Christopher)
July 8, 2009 Filing 71 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Best Buy Co. Inc., (Faulkner, Rickey)
July 8, 2009 Filing 70 Best Buy Co., Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against API Technologies, LLC by Best Buy Co. Inc.,.(Faulkner, Rickey)
July 6, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 8/7/2009; Amazon.com, Inc. to 8/7/2009; Amazon Web Services LLC to 8/7/2009. (ch, )
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon Web Services, LLC and Google Inc. shall have through August 7, 2009 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/6/09. (ch, )
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Ernest Richardson terminated as counsel for The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation and Hoover's. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/6/09. (ch, )
July 1, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Mapquest, Inc. to 8/8/2009; Bebo, Inc. to 8/8/2009; Truveo, Inc. to 8/8/2009; AOL LLC to 8/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 1, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation to 8/8/2009; Hoover's, Inc. to 8/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 1, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CBS Corporation to 8/8/2009; CBS INTERACTIVE INC. to 8/8/2009; CBS Interactive Media Inc. to 8/8/2009; CNET Investments, Inc. to 8/8/2009; CNET Networks, Inc. to 8/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 1, 2009 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Google Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon Web Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 1, 2009 Filing 66 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc..( Whitehurst, Alan)
July 1, 2009 Filing 65 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CBS Corporation, CBS INTERACTIVE INC., CBS Interactive Media Inc., CNET Investments, Inc., CNET Networks, Inc..( Whitehurst, Alan)
July 1, 2009 Filing 64 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mapquest, Inc., Bebo, Inc., Truveo, Inc., AOL LLC.( Whitehurst, Alan)
July 1, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Facebook, Inc. to 7/21/2009. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 1, 2009 Filing 63 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Facebook, Inc..( Dacus, Deron)
June 30, 2009 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Michael E. Richardson as Counsel of Record for Defendants The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation and Hoover's Inc. by The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 59 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ruffin B Cordell terminated as counsel for Google, Inc.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/29/09. (ch, )
June 29, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Yahoo! Inc. to 7/22/2009. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 29, 2009 Filing 60 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Yahoo! Inc..( Smith, Kevin)
June 26, 2009 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney And Termination of Electronic Notices by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordell, Ruffin)
June 26, 2009 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler Kendall Brochstein on behalf of API Technologies, LLC (Brochstein, Tyler)
June 25, 2009 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Newton on behalf of Mapquest, Inc., Bebo, Inc., Truveo, Inc., The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc., AOL LLC (Newton, Michael)
June 25, 2009 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marissa Rachel Ducca on behalf of Mapquest, Inc., Bebo, Inc., Truveo, Inc., The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc., AOL LLC (Ducca, Marissa)
June 25, 2009 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Lee Whitehurst on behalf of Mapquest, Inc., Bebo, Inc., Truveo, Inc., The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation, Hoover's, Inc., AOL LLC (Whitehurst, Alan)
June 16, 2009 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew D Weiss on behalf of API Technologies, LLC (Weiss, Andrew)
June 16, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 52, Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTORNEY WILL REFILE)(ch, )
June 12, 2009 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of API Technologies, LLC (Fenster, Marc)
June 9, 2009 Filing 52 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew D Weiss on behalf of API Technologies, LLC (Weiss, Andrew) Modified on 6/16/2009 (ch, ).
June 8, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Thomson Reuters U.S. to 7/15/2009. 37 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 8, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc. to 7/15/2009. 37 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 8, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Thomson Reuters PLC to 7/15/2009. 22 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 8, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Thomson Reuters Corporation to 7/15/2009. 37 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 8, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Reuters America, LLC to 7/15/2009. 37 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 8, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Truveo, Inc. to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 8, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Mapquest, Inc. to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 8, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Bebo, Inc. to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 5, 2009 Filing 51 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc..( Ryan, Christopher)
June 5, 2009 Filing 50 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Thomson Reuters U.S..( Ryan, Christopher)
June 5, 2009 Filing 49 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Thomson Reuters PLC.( Ryan, Christopher)
June 5, 2009 Filing 48 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Thomson Reuters Corporation.( Ryan, Christopher)
June 5, 2009 Filing 47 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Reuters America, LLC.( Ryan, Christopher)
June 5, 2009 Filing 46 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Truveo, Inc..( Newton, Michael)
June 5, 2009 Filing 45 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mapquest, Inc..( Newton, Michael)
June 5, 2009 Filing 44 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bebo, Inc..( Newton, Michael)
June 5, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AOL LLC to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 5, 2009 Filing 43 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AOL LLC.( Newton, Michael)
June 5, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com, Inc. to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 5, 2009 Filing 42 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com, Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 5, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CNET Networks, Inc. to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 5, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CNET Investments, Inc. to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 5, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CBS Interactive Media Inc. to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 5, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CBS INTERACTIVE INC. to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 5, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CBS Corporation to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 5, 2009 Filing 41 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CNET Networks, Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 5, 2009 Filing 40 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CNET Investments, Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 5, 2009 Filing 39 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CBS Interactive Media Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 5, 2009 Filing 38 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CBS INTERACTIVE INC..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 5, 2009 Filing 37 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CBS Corporation.( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 5, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Best Buy Co. Inc., to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 5, 2009 Filing 36 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Best Buy Co. Inc.,.( Faulkner, Rickey)
June 2, 2009 Filing 35 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Thomson Reuters Corporation served on 5/19/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 6/8/2009. (ehs, )
June 1, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hoover's, Inc. to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 1, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 1, 2009 Filing 34 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hoover's, Inc..( Richardson, Michael)
June 1, 2009 Filing 33 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation.( Richardson, Michael)
May 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Yahoo! Inc. to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 28, 2009 Filing 32 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Yahoo! Inc..( Carroll, Otis)
May 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Android, Inc. to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 31 Defendant Android, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint(Cordell, Ruffin)
May 27, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Android, Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin)
May 27, 2009 Filing 29 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Yahoo! Inc. served on 5/20/2009, answer due 6/9/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 28 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Truveo, Inc. served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 27 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc. served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 26 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Thomson Reuters U.S. served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 25 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation served on 5/20/2009, answer due 6/9/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 24 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Reuters America, LLC served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 23 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Mapquest, Inc. served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 22 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Last.FM Limited served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 21 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Hoover's, Inc. served on 5/20/2009, answer due 6/9/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Google Inc. served on 5/20/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Facebook, Inc. served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. CBS Interactive Media Inc. served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. CNET Investments, Inc. served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. CNET Networks, Inc. served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. CBS INTERACTIVE INC. served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. CBS Corporation served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Best Buy Co. Inc., served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Bebo, Inc. served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. AOL LLC served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Android, Inc. served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Amazon Web Services LLC served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by API Technologies, LLC. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 5/18/2009, answer due 6/8/2009. (ch, )
May 27, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google Inc. to 7/8/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 7 Defendant Google, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Cordell, Ruffin)
May 26, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Google Inc. (Cordell, Ruffin)
May 13, 2009 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Last.FM Limited, (different address) (Attachments: # 1 Mapquest Inc, # 2 Thomson Reuters U.S. Inc)(ch, )
May 13, 2009 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Amazon Web Services LLC, (Attachments: # 1 Amazon.com, Inc., # 2 Android, Inc., # 3 AOL, LLC, # 4 Bebo, Inc., # 5 Best Buy Co., Inc, # 6 CBS Corporation, # 7 CBS Interactive Inc., # 8 CBS Interactive Media Inc., # 9 CNET Investments Inc, # 10 CNET Networks Inc, # 11 Dun & Bradstreet Corp., # 12 Facebook Inc, # 13 Google Inc, # 14 Hoovers Inc., # 15 Last FM Limited, # 16 Reuters America LLC, # 17 Thomson Reuters Corporation, # 18 Thomson Reuters PLC, # 19 Thomson Reuters US, # 20 Thomson Reuters USA Inc, # 21 Truveo, Inc, # 22 Yahoo! Inc.)(ch, )
May 13, 2009 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew)
May 12, 2009 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to API Technologies, LLC (ehs, )
May 12, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000001991259.), filed by API Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: API Technologies, LLC v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: API Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Wesley Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapquest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bebo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truveo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co. Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS INTERACTIVE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Interactive Media Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNET Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNET Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Last.FM Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dun & Bradstreet Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoover's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Android, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Reuters Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Reuters PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Reuters U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Reuters U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reuters America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?