John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC v. Google Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC
Defendant: Google Inc. and AOL LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv00151
Filed: May 14, 2009
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Referring Judge: Charles Everingham
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2011 89 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING held on 12/1/10 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082. (84 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2011. (tja, )
December 1, 2010 88 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Evidentiary Hearing held on 12/1/2010. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
November 17, 2010 87 NOTICE by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust Plaintiffs' Witness List (Meyer, Nathan)
November 17, 2010 86 NOTICE by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust Plaintiffs' Exhibit List (Meyer, Nathan)
November 17, 2010 85 NOTICE by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust Plaintiff's Deposition Designations (Meyer, Nathan)
November 17, 2010 84 NOTICE by AOL LLC, Google Inc. DEFENDANTS WITNESS DESIGNATIONS (Babcock, Charles)
November 17, 2010 83 NOTICE by AOL LLC, Google Inc. DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT LIST (Babcock, Charles)
November 17, 2010 82 NOTICE by AOL LLC, Google Inc. DEFENDANTS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Babcock, Charles)
November 17, 2010 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George L McWilliams on behalf of AOL LLC, Google Inc. (McWilliams, George)
November 15, 2010 80 REPLY to Response to Motion re 69 MOTION to Strike filed by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
November 15, 2010 79 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 59 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class filed by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Babcock, Charles)
November 5, 2010 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re 69 MOTION to Strike filed by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nathan D. Meyer)(Meyer, Nathan)
November 4, 2010 77 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 61 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Thomas J. Maronick and Brief in Support filed by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Meyer, Nathan)
November 4, 2010 76 Featured Case ORDER granting 74 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ronald Casey Low and David Philip Whittlesey terminated as counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/4/2010. (ch, )
November 3, 2010 75 ****DUPLICATED TO # 74 *****Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald) Modified on 11/4/2010 (ch, ).
November 3, 2010 74 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record)(Whittlesey, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
November 1, 2010 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re 59 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class filed by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Meyer, Nathan)
October 25, 2010 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re 61 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Thomas J. Maronick and Brief in Support filed by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Declaration of Itamar Simonson)(Babcock, Charles)
October 18, 2010 71 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 70 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kerry Barker, # 2 Exhibit 1-5 to Declaration of Kerry Barker, # 3 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Kerry Barker, # 4 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Kerry Barker, # 5 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Kerry Barker, # 6 Exhibit 9-18 to Declaration of Kerry Barker)(Babcock, Charles)
October 18, 2010 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re 59 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class filed by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl Butzer, # 2 Exhibit 1-54 to Declaration of Carl Butzer, # 3 Exhibit 55-61 to Declaration of Carl Butzer, # 4 Declaration of Shannon Zmud Teicher, # 5 Declaration of Dr. Itamar Simonson, # 6 Exhibit to Declaration of Dr. Itamar Simonson, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
October 18, 2010 69 MOTION to Strike by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
October 15, 2010 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Zmud Teicher on behalf of AOL LLC, Google Inc. (Teicher, Shannon)
October 14, 2010 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Thomas J. Maronick and Brief in Support filed by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nathan D. Meyer, # 2 Exhibit A-B)(Meyer, Nathan)
October 12, 2010 66 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nathan Meyer for John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID) (ehs, )
October 7, 2010 65 Featured Case ORDER granting 64 Motion to Amend docket control order. The Court has determined the motion should be GRANTED and the Courts November 6, 2009 Docket Control Order should be modified. The briefing schedule on Defendants Daubert motion is as follows: Plaintiffs Opposition: October 14, 2010 Defendants Reply: October 25, 2010 Plaintiffs Sur-reply: November 4, 2010. Defendants are permitted twenty (20) pages for their brief in response to Plaintiffs Opposed Motion for Class Certification in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/7/10. (ehs, )
October 6, 2010 64 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 29 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions Docket Control Order by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
September 28, 2010 63 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion to Consolidate. Pending before the court is defendants Google Inc. and AOL LLCs motion to consolidate class discovery in Civil Action Number 2:09-cv-00151-TJW-CE with discovery in Civil Action Number 2:09-cv-00142-TJW (Dkt. No. 20). The court GRANTS the defendants motion to consolidate these cases for discovery purposes. As such, discovery related filings shall be made in Civil Action Number 2:09-cv-00151-TJW-CE, the later filed case. The court declines, however, to consolidate the cases for all purposes and will conduct separate class certification hearings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/28/2010. (ch, )
September 20, 2010 62 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 59 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class. Declaration of Marc A. Fenster In Support of Motion for Class Certification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C Part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibit C Part 2 of 2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Fenster, Marc)
September 20, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION ATTY WILL REFILE Document # 60, SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
September 20, 2010 61 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Thomas J. Maronick and Brief in Support by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl Butzer, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 1, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 2, # 4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 3, # 5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 4, # 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 5, # 7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 6, # 8 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 7, # 9 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 8, # 10 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 9, # 11 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 10, # 12 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 11, # 13 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 12, # 14 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 13, # 15 Exhibit A to Declaration of Carl Butzer part 14, # 16 Exhibit B to Declaration of Carl Butzer, # 17 Declaration of Itamar Simonson, # 18 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Itamar Simonson, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
September 20, 2010 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #58 Motion to exclude submitted by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. No certificate of conference included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motion is now terminated. (sm, )
September 17, 2010 60 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: Declaration of Marc A. Fesnter In Support of Motion for Class Certification 59 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C Part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibit C Part 2 of 2, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Fenster, Marc) Modified on 9/20/2010 (ch, ).
September 17, 2010 59 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of David Whittlesey, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
September 17, 2010 58 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION to Exclude the Expert Report and Opinion of Thomas J. Maronick and Brief in Support by AOL LLC, Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl Butzer, # 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 1, # 3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 2, # 4 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 3, # 5 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 4, # 6 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 5, # 7 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 6, # 8 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 7, # 9 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 8, # 10 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 9, # 11 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 10, # 12 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 11, # 13 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 12, # 14 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 13, # 15 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carl Butzer - part 14, # 16 Declaration of Itamar Simonson, # 17 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Itamar Simonson, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles) Modified on 9/20/2010 (sm, ).
August 11, 2010 57 Featured Case ORDER granting 56 Motion to Continue Certain Deadlines. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/11/2010. (ch, )
August 4, 2010 56 Joint MOTION to Continue Certain Deadlines by AOL LLC, Google Inc., John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
July 30, 2010 55 NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL LLC Amended Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
July 30, 2010 54 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google Inc. Amended Disclosures (Babcock, Charles)
July 14, 2010 53 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL LLC (Babcock, Charles)
July 7, 2010 52 NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL LLC, Google Inc. Defendants' Notice of Expert Disclosure (Babcock, Charles)
June 4, 2010 51 NOTICE of Disclosure by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF EXPERT DISCLOSURE (Fenster, Marc)
June 4, 2010 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Todd Y Brandt terminated as counsel for John Beck Amazing Profits LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/4/2010. (ch, )
June 3, 2010 49 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandt, Todd)
May 5, 2010 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Y Brandt on behalf of John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC (Brandt, Todd)
April 29, 2010 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald Casey Low on behalf of John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC (Low, Ronald)
April 28, 2010 46 Featured Case ORDER granting 45 Motion to Modify the Courts Docket Control Order. Deadline for Plaintiffs to designate any expert witness(es) and file a report for any such witness upon whom Plaintiffs intend to rely in support of their Motions for Class Certification is now June 2, 2010. Deadline for Defendants to designate any such expert witness(es) and file a report for any such witness upon whom Defendants intend to rely in opposition to Plaintiffs Motions for Class Certification is now July 7, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/28/10. (ehs, )
April 27, 2010 45 Agreed MOTION Modify Docket Control Order re 29 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Agreed Motion to Modify Docket Control Order)(Whittlesey, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
April 23, 2010 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Harold Kip Glasscock, Jr terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust and John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/23/10. (ehs, )
April 23, 2010 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Philip Whittlesey on behalf of John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust (Whittlesey, David)
April 22, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY REFILED SEE # 42 Document # 41, Unopposed Motion to Withdraw. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
April 22, 2010 42 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glasscock, Harold)
April 22, 2010 41 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY REFILED SEE # 42 ***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glasscock, Harold) Modified on 4/22/2010 (ch, ).
March 1, 2010 40 Featured Case ORDER granting 39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debera Wells Hepburn terminated as counsel for John Beck Amazing Profits LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/1/2010. (ch, )
February 26, 2010 39 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hepburn, Debera)
February 25, 2010 38 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/25/10. (ehs, )
February 15, 2010 37 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
December 16, 2009 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debera Wells Hepburn on behalf of all plaintiffs (Hepburn, Debera)
November 30, 2009 35 Counter-Defendant John Beck Amazing Profits LLC ANSWER to 26 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Google Inc. by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC.(Fenster, Marc)
November 25, 2009 34 NOTICE of Disclosure by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust (Fenster, Marc)
November 25, 2009 33 NOTICE of Disclosure by AOL LLC (Babcock, Charles)
November 25, 2009 32 NOTICE of Disclosure by Google Inc. (Babcock, Charles)
November 16, 2009 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 MOTION to Consolidate Class Discovery filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Babcock, Charles)
November 6, 2009 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 MOTION to Consolidate Class Discovery filed by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
November 6, 2009 29 Featured Case DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Hearing for Class Certification is 10/26/2010 @ 1:30 pm before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/6/09. (ch, )
November 5, 2009 28 Submission of Docket Control Order by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control)(Vallejo, Raquel)
November 5, 2009 27 Defendant AOL, LLC's ANSWER to 21 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint by AOL LLC.(Babcock, Charles)
November 5, 2009 26 Defendant Google Inc.'s ANSWER to 21 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC by Google Inc..(Babcock, Charles)
October 30, 2009 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Raquel Vallejo on behalf of John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC (Vallejo, Raquel)
October 29, 2009 24 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Raquel Vallejo for John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4995 (ch, )
October 28, 2009 23 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/26/09 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Susan Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2010. (lss, )
October 26, 2009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Scheduling Conference held on 10/26/2009, (Class Certification Hearing set for 10/26/2010 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.). (Jan Lockhart, ECRO) (jml)
October 23, 2009 22 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control and Discovery Order by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Docket Control and Discovery Order)(Fenster, Marc)
October 23, 2009 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc., AOL LLC, filed by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust.(Fenster, Marc)
October 22, 2009 20 MOTION to Consolidate Class Discovery by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Babcock, Charles)
October 21, 2009 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/21/09. (ehs, )
October 6, 2009 18 Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2009 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/6/09. (ch, )
September 28, 2009 17 John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC's ANSWER to 9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Google, Inc. by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC.(Fenster, Marc)
September 24, 2009 16 RESPONSE to Motion re 14 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Google Inc., AOL LLC. (Babcock, Charles)
September 17, 2009 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google Inc., AOL LLC, filed by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC, The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust.(Fenster, Marc)
September 17, 2009 14 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint by The Rodney A. Hamilton Living Trust, John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
September 4, 2009 Magistrate Consent Form eMailed to Google Inc., AOL LLC (ch, )
September 3, 2009 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC (Fenster, Marc)
September 3, 2009 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AOL LLC identifying Corporate Parent AOL Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Time Warner Inc, Other Affiliate TW AOL Holdings Inc for AOL LLC. (Babcock, Charles)
September 3, 2009 11 Defendant AOL LLC's ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by AOL LLC.(Babcock, Charles)
September 3, 2009 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. (Babcock, Charles)
September 3, 2009 9 Defendant Google Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Google Inc. by Google Inc..(Babcock, Charles)
September 3, 2009 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl Christof Butzer on behalf of Google Inc., AOL LLC (Butzer, Carl)
September 3, 2009 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David T Moran on behalf of Google Inc., AOL LLC (Moran, David)
September 3, 2009 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles L Babcock on behalf of Google Inc., AOL LLC (Babcock, Charles)
May 26, 2009 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Pridham on behalf of John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC (Pridham, David)
May 15, 2009 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-4693 (ch, )
May 14, 2009 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AOL LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Google, Inc.)(ch, )
May 14, 2009 3 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC (ehs, )
May 14, 2009 2 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE for pretrial proceedings to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/14/09. (ehs, )
May 14, 2009 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Google Inc., AOL LLC, filed by John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Beck Amazing Profits, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Wesley Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?