Beneficial Innovations, Inc. v. Careerbuilder, LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Beneficial Innovations, Inc.
Defendant: Careerbuilder, LLC, CNET Networks, Inc., The Dallas Morning News, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Google, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc., Morris Communications Company, LLC, The New York Times Company, Yahoo! Inc. and YouTube, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv00175
Filed: June 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER - that this case be administratively closed, all motions denied as moot re: 177 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jabez Networks, Inc. filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., 175 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Careerbuilder, LLC filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., 178 MOTION to Dismiss Yahoo! Inc. filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., 176 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant CNET Networks, Inc. filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/20/12. (ehs, )
January 19, 2012 Filing 178 MOTION to Dismiss Yahoo! Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
January 19, 2012 Filing 177 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jabez Networks, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
January 19, 2012 Filing 176 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant CNET Networks, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
January 19, 2012 Filing 175 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Careerbuilder, LLC by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
December 20, 2011 Case Reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap per Misc Order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (leh, )
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MISC. 11-1 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/2011. (ch, )
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting 172 Motion to Dismiss. Claims against Disney Online are hereby dismissed with prejudice, and Disneys counterclaims against Beneficial Innovations are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/12/2011. (ch, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 172 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Disney Online by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 170 Motion to Dismiss. Beneficials claims against IACSAM are hereby dismissed with prejudice, and IACSAMs counterclaims against Beneficial are hereby dismissed with prejudice, except as provided in the parties' settlement agreement. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/19/2011. (ch, )
July 15, 2011 Filing 170 Joint MOTION to Dismiss IAC Search & Media, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Cancelling Deadline, (Markman Hearing RESET for 9/12/2011 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge T. John Ward. The parties are Ordered to file a new proposed scheduling order that reflects this change and additionally any necessary changes (as a result of this Order) to the P.R. 4-5 deadlines.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/29/11. (ehs, )
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2011., Discovery due by 4/2/2012., Joinder of Parties due by 6/30/2011., Markman Hearing set for 9/27/2011 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2012., Jury Selection set for 9/4/2012 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward., Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2012 09:30 AM before Judge T. John Ward.), Motions terminated: 167 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 166 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, filed by Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc., Beneficial Innovations, Inc... Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/16/11. (ehs, )
May 12, 2011 Filing 167 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 166 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2011., Discovery due by 4/2/2013., Expert Witness List due by 12/23/2011., Joinder of Parties due by 6/10/2011., Markman Hearing set for 9/27/2011 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward., Motions due by 7/23/2012., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2012., Jury Selection set for 9/4/2012 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward., Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2012 09:30 AM before Judge T. John Ward.), Motions terminated: 165 Joint MOTION to Modify Docket Control Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4) filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc., Disney Online.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/11. (ehs, )
March 16, 2011 Filing 165 Joint MOTION to Modify Docket Control Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(4) by Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting 163 Motion to Dismiss deft Comcast Corporation. All claims against Comcast are dismissed with prejudice, each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/7/11. (ehs, )
March 4, 2011 Filing 163 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Comcast Corporation by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 161 Motion to Dismiss. All claims against deft Beneficial and Morris Communications are dismissed with prejudice, each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/7/11. (ehs, )
February 3, 2011 Filing 161 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Morris Communications Company, LLC by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting 159 Motion to Dismiss. Beneficials claims against the New York Times are hereby dismissed with prejudice, and the New York Times counterclaims against Beneficial are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/31/11. (ehs, )
January 27, 2011 Filing 159 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the New York Times Corporation by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 157 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Patent Local Rule 3-1, 3-2, 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures. Beneficial Innovations, Inc. may serve its Patent Local Rule 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures with respect to Disney Online and IAC Search & Media, Inc. on or before January 28, 2011. It is also ORDERED that Defendants Disney Online and IAC Search & Media, Inc. may serve their Patent Local Rule 3-3 and 3-4 disclosures on or before April 15, 2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/20/11. (ehs, )
January 14, 2011 Filing 157 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 3-1, 3-2, 3-3, and 3-4 Disclosures by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 155 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Rule 26 and PatentLocal Rules 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures. Deadline extended to 1/15/11. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/17/10. (ehs, )
December 15, 2010 Filing 155 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 and Patent Local Rules 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting 152 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff Beneficial Innovations, Inc. may file its P-R 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures with respect to Defendants Comcast, Disney, IAC, and Comcast may serve its Rule 26 disclosures, on or before December 14, 2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/6/10. (ehs, )
December 6, 2010 Filing 153 NOTICE by Google, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., YouTube, LLC Notice of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Smith, Melissa)
December 3, 2010 Filing 152 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosures under P-R 3.1 and 3.2 by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
December 2, 2010 Filing 151 NOTICE by IAC Search & Media, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Montgomery, M.)
December 2, 2010 Filing 150 NOTICE by Disney Online of Initial Disclosures (Montgomery, M.)
December 1, 2010 Filing 149 NOTICE of Disclosure by The New York Times Company (Baxter, Samuel)
December 1, 2010 Filing 148 NOTICE of Disclosure by Morris Communications Company, LLC of Initial Disclosure (Guthrie, Michael)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting 146 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Google Inc. (Google), YouTube, LLC (YouTube), and NBC Universal, Inc. with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/15/10. (ehs, )
November 12, 2010 Filing 146 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Google, Inc., YouTube, LLC, and NBC Universal, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 DISCOVERY ORDER, Motions terminated: 144 Joint MOTION For Entry of a Discovery Order filed by NBC Universal, Inc., YouTube, LLC, The New York Times Company, Comcast Corporation, IAC Search & Media, Inc., Morris Communications Company, LLC, Google, Inc., Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Disney Online.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/1/10. (ehs, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 144 Joint MOTION For Entry of a Discovery Order by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Disney Online, Google, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Morris Communications Company, LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., The New York Times Company, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Discovery Order))(Watson, Violetta) Modified on 11/1/2010 (ch, ).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 143 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 5/23/2011., Discovery due by 4/2/2012., Joinder of Parties due by 5/23/2011., Claim Construction Hearing set for 9/27/2011 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward., Motions in limine due by 7/23/2012., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2012., Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2012 09:30 AM before Judge T. John Ward., Jury Selection set for 9/4/2012 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward. Mediation deadline is 5/25/2012. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/25/2010. (ch, )
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Discovery Order. Deadline is extended to 10/29/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/25/2010. (ch, )
October 22, 2010 Filing 141 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Submit Proposed Discovery Order by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Disney Online, Google, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Morris Communications Company, LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., The New York Times Company, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 22, 2010 Filing 140 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Disney Online, Google, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Morris Communications Company, LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., The New York Times Company, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting 138 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Parties are granted an extension of time up to and including October 22, 2010, to submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/18/10. (ehs, )
October 15, 2010 Filing 138 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Disney Online, Google, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Morris Communications Company, LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., The New York Times Company, The Walt Disney Company, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watson, Violetta)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties are granted an extension of time up to and including October 15, 2010, to submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/13/10. (ehs, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 136 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Submit Porposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Disney Online, Google, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Morris Communications Company, LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., The New York Times Company, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 21, 2010 Filing 135 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Disney Online, Google, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Morris Communications Company, LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watson, Violetta)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 133 Motion for extension of time. The deadline for Plaintiff Beneficial Innovations, Inc. to comply with P.R. 3-1, Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions be and hereby is extended to October 18, 2010.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/20/10. (ehs, )
September 17, 2010 Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadline by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties are granted an extension of time up to and including September 22, 2010, to submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/15/10. (ehs, )
September 13, 2010 Filing 131 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Submit Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Beneficial Innovations, Inc., Comcast Corporation, Disney Online, Google, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Morris Communications Company, LLC, NBC Universal, Inc., The New York Times Company, YouTube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 128 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J Thad Heartfield and M. Dru Montgomery terminated as counsel for NBC Universal Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/8/2010. (ch, )
September 3, 2010 Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of NBC Universal, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
September 2, 2010 Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by NBC Universal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 126 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Cosmin Maier,Kate Hutchins,Mark G Matuschak,Violetta G Watson for NBC Universal, Inc.. Attorney Kevin A Smith; Charles K Verhoeven; Howard Y Chen and Jennifer A Kash terminated for NBC Universal Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/2/10. (ehs, )
August 30, 2010 Filing 126 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by NBC Universal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 30, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 8/30/10. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders by September 13, 2010. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons) (bga )
August 30, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 8/30/10. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders by 9/13/10. Court adjourned.(delat)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 124 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tigran Vardanian terminated. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/17/10. (ehs, )
August 16, 2010 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Tigran Vardanian by Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
July 21, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/30/2010 09:30 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Chad Everingham. (ehs, )
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER - This case is set for a status conference in Marshall, Texas, on August 30, 2010, at 9:30 a.m., before the Honorable T. John Ward and the Honorable Chad Everingham. The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting. The parties shall be prepared to inform the Court whether they will consent to trial before the Magistrate Judge. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on September 13, 2010. If the parties are unable to resolve their disagreements concerning these orders, the parties shall submit to the court their competing proposals along with a summary of their disagreements. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the court deems September 29, 2010 to be the date of the initial case management conference. As a result, the Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on September 17, 2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/21/10. (ehs, )
July 2, 2010 Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin A Smith on behalf of Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc. (Smith, Kevin)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 120 Motion to Dismiss deft Facebook Inc.. All claims dismissed without prejudice. All costs are assessed against the paraty incurring same. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/16/10. (ehs, )
April 15, 2010 Filing 120 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Facebook, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
April 15, 2010 Filing 119 NOTICE by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 14, 2010 Filing 118 RESPONSE to 38 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Reply to Counterclaims of Morris Communications Company, LLC by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Adams, Julien)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting 116 Motion to Dismiss deft Ebaum's World Inc without prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/12/10. (ehs, )
November 30, -0001 Filing 116
February 24, 2010 Filing 115 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J Silbert for Comcast Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-0021203) (ehs, )
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 113 Motion to Dismiss Defendant The Dallas Morning News, Inc. with prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/22/10. (ehs, )
February 19, 2010 Filing 113 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The Dallas Morning News, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 111 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alison E Monahan terminated as counsel for Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc.,a and NBC Universal Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/5/2010. (ch, )
February 3, 2010 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Alison E. Monahan by Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
January 27, 2010 Filing 110 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NBC Universal, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company, Corporate Parent Vivendi Universal, S.A. for NBC Universal, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
January 21, 2010 Filing 109 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Violetta G Watson for YouTube, LLC and Google, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5150) (ehs, )
January 21, 2010 Filing 108 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cosmin Maier for YouTube, LLC and Google, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5150) (ehs, )
January 21, 2010 Filing 107 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark G Matuschak for YouTube, LLC and Google, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5150) (ehs, )
January 21, 2010 Filing 106 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kate Hutchins for YouTube, LLC and Google, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5150) (ehs, )
December 28, 2009 Filing 105 RESPONSE to 74 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by NBC Universal, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Adams, Julien)
December 28, 2009 Filing 104 RESPONSE to 75 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by IAC Search & Media, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Adams, Julien)
December 28, 2009 Filing 103 RESPONSE to 76 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Facebook, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Adams, Julien)
December 28, 2009 Filing 102 RESPONSE to 73 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Disney Online by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Adams, Julien)
December 28, 2009 Filing 101 RESPONSE to 79 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Comcast by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Adams, Julien)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 99 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Virgil Bryan Medlock, Jr terminated as counsel for The Dallas Morning News Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/18/09. (ch, )
December 17, 2009 Filing 99 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by The Dallas Morning News, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malin, Steven)
December 16, 2009 Filing 98 NOTICE of Disclosure by The New York Times Company Corporate Disclosure (Rosenbloom, Brian)
December 15, 2009 Filing 97 ***REPLACES # 90 ***NOTICE by Comcast Corporation, Disney Online, Facebook, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc. of Opposition to Motion to Consolidate This Action With Actions 2:07-cv-00263 and 2:07-cv-00555 (Heartfield, J) Modified on 12/15/2009 (ch, ).
December 15, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY NEED TO FILE PHV Document # 96, Notice of Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
December 15, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED USING WRONG EVENT Document # 90, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
December 15, 2009 Filing 96 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David J. Silbert on behalf of Comcast Corporation (Silbert, David) Modified on 12/15/2009 (ch, ).
December 14, 2009 Filing 95 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Howard Y Chen for Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc. and NBC Universal, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5087 (ch, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 94 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Kash for Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc. and NBC Universal, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5087. (ch, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 93 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alison E Monahan for Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc. and NBC Universal, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5087. (ch, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 92 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc. and NBC Universal, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5087. (ch, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 91 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tigran Vardanian for Disney Online, IAC Search & Media, Inc. and NBC Universal, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5087. (ch, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 90 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Disney Online, NBC Universal, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Comcast Corporation of Opposition to Motion to Consolidate This Action with Actions 2:07-cv-00263 and 2:07-cv-00555 (Heartfield, J) Modified on 12/15/2009 (ch, ).
December 10, 2009 Filing 89 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel K Nazer for Comcast Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-1-20369(ch, )
December 9, 2009 Filing 88 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by IAC Search & Media, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent IAC/InterActiveCorp for IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
December 9, 2009 Filing 87 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Disney Online identifying Corporate Parent ABC Enterprises, Inc. for Disney Online. (Heartfield, J)
December 9, 2009 Filing 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Disney Online, NBC Universal, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 81 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael E Jones terminated as counsel for IAC Search & Media Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/9/09. (ch, )
December 8, 2009 Filing 84 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Oliver Edwards for The New York Times Company. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5069 (ch, )
December 8, 2009 Filing 83 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian S Rosenbloom for The New York Times Company. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5069(ch, )
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 78 Motion to Dismiss. The Walt Disney Company is hereby dimissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/7/09. (ch, )
December 7, 2009 Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E. Jones and the Potter Minton, P.C. law firm by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 4, 2009 Filing 80 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Comcast Corporation (Dacus, Deron)
December 4, 2009 Filing 79 ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by Comcast Corporation.(Dacus, Deron)
December 4, 2009 Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by The Walt Disney Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
December 4, 2009 Filing 77 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
December 4, 2009 Filing 76 ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by Facebook, Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
December 4, 2009 Filing 75 ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by IAC Search & Media, Inc..(Heartfield, J)
December 4, 2009 Filing 74 ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by NBC Universal, Inc..(Heartfield, J)
December 4, 2009 Filing 73 ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by Disney Online.(Heartfield, J)
November 25, 2009 Filing 72 ANSWER to 54 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Google, Inc. and Youtube LLC by Beneficial Innovations, Inc..(Adams, Julien)
November 25, 2009 Filing 71 ANSWER to 53 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of The New York Times Company by Beneficial Innovations, Inc..(Adams, Julien)
November 23, 2009 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey T Norberg on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Norberg, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2009 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi Lyn Keefe on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
November 16, 2009 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Guthrie on behalf of Morris Communications Company, LLC (Guthrie, Michael)
November 16, 2009 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Loren Maag on behalf of Morris Communications Company, LLC (Maag, Gregory)
November 16, 2009 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended for deft IAC Search U Media up to and including 12/4/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/12/09. (ehs, )
November 11, 2009 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 13 Amended Complaint, by IAC Search & Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit by Plaintiff Beneficial Innovations, Inc. against Defendant Digg Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice to the right of these parties to assert in the future any such claims except as provided by the parties settlement agreement.All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/10/09. (ehs, )
November 6, 2009 Filing 62 ***REPLACES # 61 ***Joint MOTION to Dismiss Digg, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien) Modified on 11/9/2009 (ch, ).
November 6, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT AND NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Document # 61, Stipulation of Dismissal. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 6, 2009 Filing 61 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT AND NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. PLEASE IGNORE.***STIPULATION of Dismissal Digg, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien) Modified on 11/6/2009 (ch, ).
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended through 12/4/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/6/09. (ehs, )
November 5, 2009 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tierney, Erica)
November 4, 2009 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by YouTube, LLC (Smith, Melissa)
November 4, 2009 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
November 4, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Digg, Inc. to 11/18/2009. (ch, )
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Digg Inc. deadline is extended to 11/18/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/4/09. (ch, )
November 4, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Comcast Corporation to 12/4/2009. (ch, )
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Comcast Corporation deadline is extended to 12/4/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/4/09. (ch, )
November 4, 2009 Filing 54 Defendants Google Inc.'s and YouTube, LLC's ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by YouTube, LLC, Google, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
November 4, 2009 Filing 53 ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by The New York Times Company.(Baxter, Samuel)
November 3, 2009 Filing 52 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 13 Amended Complaint, [Unopposed] by Digg, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bartow, D.)
November 3, 2009 Filing 51 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 13 Amended Complaint, by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
November 3, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for The Walt Disney Company to 12/4/2009. (ehs, )
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant The Walt Disney Company has up to and including December 4, 2009, to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/3/09. (ehs, )
November 3, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for NBC Universal, Inc. to 12/4/2009. (ehs, )
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant NBC Universal, Inc. has up to and including December 4, 2009, to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/3/09. (ehs, )
October 28, 2009 Filing 48 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 13 Amended Complaint, of The Walt Disney Company by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
October 28, 2009 Filing 47 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 13 Amended Complaint, of NBC Universal, Inc. by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien)
October 20, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ada Elene Brown on behalf of The New York Times Company (Brown, Ada)
October 19, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for NBC Universal, Inc. to 11/6/2009. 31 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 16, 2009 Filing 45 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re NBC Universal, Inc..( DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 13, 2009 Filing 44 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. IAC Search & Media, Inc. served on 9/21/2009, answer due 11/12/2009. (ehs, )
October 13, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for IAC Search & Media, Inc. to 11/12/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 12, 2009 Filing 43 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re IAC Search & Media, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
October 8, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Facebook, Inc. to 11/5/2009. 31 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 7, 2009 Filing 42 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Facebook, Inc.( Keyes, Melissa)
October 6, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Comcast Corporation to 11/4/2009. (ehs, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Comcast Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended up to and including November 4,2009. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/6/09. (ehs, )
October 6, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for The Walt Disney Company to 11/5/2009. (ehs, )
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant The Walt Disney Company has up to and including November 5, 2009 to answer amended complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/6/09. (ehs, )
October 5, 2009 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Morris Communications Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Morris Communications Holding Company, LLC for Morris Communications Company, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
October 5, 2009 Filing 38 ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by Morris Communications Company, LLC.(Jones, Michael)
October 5, 2009 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Dallas Morning News, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent A.H. Belo Corporation for The Dallas Morning News, Inc.. (Malin, Steven)
October 5, 2009 Filing 36 ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Beneficial Innovations, Inc. by The Dallas Morning News, Inc..(Malin, Steven)
October 5, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Virgil Bryan Medlock, Jr on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc. (Medlock, Virgil)
October 5, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Allen Foley on behalf of The Dallas Morning News, Inc. (Foley, David)
October 5, 2009 Filing 33 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 13 Amended Complaint, by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 5, 2009 Filing 32 ***REPLACES # 30 ***First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 13 Amended Complaint, of The Walt Disney Company by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Julien) Modified on 10/5/2009 (ch, ).
October 5, 2009 Filing 31 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Disney Online served on 9/22/2009, answer due 10/13/2009. (ehs, )
October 5, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED USING WRONG EVENT Document # 30, Plaintiffs Unopposed First Application. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 5, 2009 Filing 30 ***FILED IN ERROR. USED WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Plaintiff's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time for The Walt Disney Company to Answer Amended Complaint ( Adams, Julien) Modified on 10/5/2009 (ch, ).
October 5, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The New York Times Company to 11/4/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 5, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for YouTube, LLC to 11/4/2009; Google, Inc. to 11/4/2009. (ch, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Google Inc., and YouTube, LLC deadline is extended to 11/4/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/5/09. (ch, )
October 5, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Digg, Inc. to 11/4/2009. (ch, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Digg, Inc. deadline is extended to 11/4/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/5/09. (ch, )
October 5, 2009 Filing 27 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The New York Times Company.( Baxter, Samuel)
October 2, 2009 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 13 Amended Complaint, by Digg, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bartow, D.)
October 2, 2009 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff, Beneficial Innovations, Inc.'s Complaint by YouTube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 28, 2009 Filing 24 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. NBC Universal, Inc. served on 9/16/2009, answer due 10/6/2009. (ehs, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 23 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. The Walt Disney Company served on 9/14/2009, answer due 10/5/2009. (ehs, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 22 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. The New York Times Company served on 9/14/2009, answer due 10/5/2009. (ehs, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 21 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. The Dallas Morning News, Inc. served on 9/14/2009, answer due 10/5/2009. (ehs, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Morris Communications Company, LLC served on 9/15/2009, answer due 10/5/2009. (ehs, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Google, Inc. served on 9/14/2009, answer due 10/5/2009. (ehs, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Facebook, Inc. served on 9/14/2009, answer due 10/5/2009. (ehs, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. Digg, Inc. served on 9/14/2009, answer due 10/5/2009. (ehs, )
September 11, 2009 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Comcast Corporation, (Attachments: # 1 Digg Inc., # 2 Disney Online, # 3 Ebaums World Inc., # 4 Facebook Inc., # 5 Google Inc., # 6 IAC Search & Media Inc., # 7 Morris Communications Company LLC, # 8 NBC Universal Inc., # 9 The Dallas Morning News, Inc, # 10 The New York Times Company, # 11 The Walt Disney Company, # 12 Youtube LLC)(ch, )
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Ainsworth and Robert Christopher Bunt terminated as counsel for Beneficial Innovations Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/10/09. (ch, )
September 8, 2009 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
September 4, 2009 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Comcast Corporation, Disney Online, Facebook, Inc., IAC Search & Media, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., The Walt Disney Company, Morris Communications Company, LLC, The New York Times Company, YouTube, LLC, The Dallas Morning News, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Google, Inc., filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc..(Capshaw, Sidney)
September 3, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julien Antonio Adams on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Adams, Julien)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nancy Claire Abernathy terminated. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/22/09. (ehs, )
July 20, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 5, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon)
June 5, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 5, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney)
June 5, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles)
June 5, 2009 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (Bunt, Robert)
June 3, 2009 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form E-Mailed to Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (ch, )
June 2, 2009 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 2-1-4724 (ch, )
June 1, 2009 Filing 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.). (ch, )
June 1, 2009 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT has no parent corporation filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc. (ch, )
June 1, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Morris Communications Company, LLC, The New York Times Company, Yahoo! Inc., YouTube, LLC, Careerbuilder, LLC, CNET Networks, Inc., The Dallas Morning News, Inc., Digg, Inc., Ebaum's World, Inc., Google, Inc., Jabez Networks, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.), filed by Beneficial Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beneficial Innovations, Inc. v. Careerbuilder, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beneficial Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Claire Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Careerbuilder, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNET Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dallas Morning News, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digg, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebaum's World, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jabez Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Communications Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The New York Times Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?