SimpleAir, Inc. v. AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: SimpleAir, Inc.
Defendant: AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc., The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc., Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, Facebook, Inc., ESPN, Inc., Disney Online, The Walt Disney Company, ABC, Inc., Handango, Inc. and Handmark, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00289
Filed: September 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2012 Filing 583 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: Settled(Folsom, David)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS; re 579 Sealed Document. ORDERED that all parties or their counsel shall submit to the Court all papers necessary for the closing of this case and its removal from the active docket sheet of this Court on or before May 24, 2012, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/24/12. (mrm, )
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER, granting 580 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by SimpleAir, Inc., Research In Motion Limited, Research In Motion Corporation. Research In Motion Corporation and Research In Motion Limited terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/24/12. (mrm, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 580 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
April 23, 2012 Filing 579 **SEALED** Court's Exhibit No. 1 - Settlement Agreement (lgp, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 578 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Schneider: Settlement Conference held on 4/23/2012. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (lgp, )
April 23, 2012 Filing 577 RESPONSE to 568 Notice (Other) SimpleAir's response to Apple's objections to impeachment exhibits (refiled version of dkt#570 per notice of deficiency) by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
April 23, 2012 Filing 576 Sealed Document (Plaintiff SimpleAirs Reply in Support of its Objections to portions of the April 6, 2012 supplemental report of Dr. Ray Perryman) (Eichmann, John)
April 23, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 570, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
April 22, 2012 Filing 575 Exhibit List (EIGHTH AMENDED) by Apple, Inc... (Alper, Adam)
April 22, 2012 Filing 574 SEALED RESPONSE TO SIMPLEAIR'S OBJECTIONS TO PORTIONS OF THE APRIL 6, 2012 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT OF DR. RAY PERRYMAN by Apple, Inc. to 560 Sealed Document filed by Apple, Inc.. (Alper, Adam)
April 22, 2012 Filing 573 STIPULATION re MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Apple, Inc., SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Alper, Adam)
April 22, 2012 Filing 572 Sealed Document (SimpleAir's revised deposition designations and Apple's counters)(Eichmann, John)
April 22, 2012 Filing 571 Proposed Jury Instructions by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
April 22, 2012 Filing 570 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. re 568 Notice (Other) SimpleAir's response to Apple's objections to impeachment exhibits (Eichmann, John) Modified on 4/23/2012 (ch, ).
April 21, 2012 Filing 569 Sealed Document (APPLE'S DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Alper, Adam)
April 21, 2012 Filing 568 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF SIMPLEAIR'S FOURTH AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST (Alper, Adam)
April 20, 2012 Filing 567 Exhibit List (Seventh Revised) by Apple, Inc... (Alper, Adam)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER denying 563 Motion for Jury Questionaire. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/20/2012. (mhs1, )
April 20, 2012 Filing 565 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE SPECIAL MASTER adopting 555 Special Master Report and Recommendation filed by David Folsom. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/20/12. (mrm, )
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER granting 549 Sealed Emergency Motion to Compel Apple's Supplemental Production of Sales and Damages Related Information.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/20/12. (mrm, )
April 20, 2012 Filing 563 Agreed MOTION for Jury Questionnaire by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Questionnaire, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER granting 552 Sealed Motion. The Unopposed Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits identified in Exhibit A is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/19/12. (ehs, )
April 19, 2012 Filing 561 NOTICE by David Folsom re 555 Notice (Other) Supplemental Report and Recommendation of the Special Master (Folsom, David)
April 19, 2012 Filing 560 Sealed Document (SimpleAir's objections to portions of 4/5/12 supplemental report of Dr. Perryman and any related testimony)(Eichmann, John)
April 18, 2012 Filing 559 Exhibit List (Fourth Amended) by SimpleAir, Inc... (Eichmann, John)
April 18, 2012 Filing 558 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., SimpleAir, Inc. JOINT LIST OF WITNESSES AND COUNSEL FOR VOIR DIRE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Alper, Adam)
April 18, 2012 Filing 557 SEALED SUR-REPLY in Response to Motion re 549 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Supplemental Production of Damages Related Information filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Alper, Adam)
April 18, 2012 Filing 556 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 549 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Supplemental Production of Sales and Damages Related Information filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Eichmann, John)
April 18, 2012 Filing 555 NOTICE by David Folsom Report and Recommendation of the Special Master (Folsom, David)
April 18, 2012 Filing 554 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by David Folsom Report and Recommendation of the Special Master (Folsom, David) Modified on 4/18/2012 (sm, ).
April 18, 2012 Filing 553 SEALED RESPONSE re 549 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Supplemental Production of Damages Related Information filed by Apple, Inc.. (Alper, Adam)
April 18, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #555)***. Document # 554, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
April 17, 2012 Filing 552 Unopposed SEALED MOTION TO SEAL CERTAIN TRIAL EXHIBITS by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Alper, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2012: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER FOR EXPEDITED RESPONSE to 549 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Supplemental Production of Damages Related Information filed by SimpleAir, Inc by 12:00 pm on Wednesday, April 18, 2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/17/2012. (sm, )
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re 505 . Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/17/2012. (sm, )
April 16, 2012 Filing 549 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Supplemental Production of Damages Related Information by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order compelling supplemental production)(Eichmann, John)
April 16, 2012 Filing 548 AFFIDAVIT of special master by David Folsom. (rml, )
April 14, 2012 Filing 547 Sealed Document (SimpleAir's deposition designations) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: SimpleAir's designations of Apple testimony, Apple's objections and counters, SimpleAir's responsive objections)(Eichmann, John)
April 13, 2012 Filing 546 SEALED RESPONSE by SimpleAir, Inc. to 543 Sealed Document, (SimpleAir's response to Apple's objections) filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
April 13, 2012 Filing 545 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. Joint Statement by SimpleAir and Apple of remaining exhibit and deposition designation objections in dispute (Eichmann, John)
April 13, 2012 Filing 544 Sealed Document (SimpleAir's updated objections to Defendant Apple's revised deposition designations) (Eichmann, John)
April 13, 2012 Filing 543 Sealed Document - Dft Apple's Inc. Summary of Objections to Plainiff Simpleair's Amended Exhibit List and Deposition Designations and Responses to Simpleair's Objections to Dft's Revised Exhibits Lists and Desposition Designation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Alper, Adam)
April 13, 2012 Filing 542 NOTICE of Settlement by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, SimpleAir, Inc. (Gillam, Harry)
April 13, 2012 Filing 541 Sealed Document (SimpleAir's objections to Defendant Apple's revised exhibit list) Eichmann, John)
April 12, 2012 Filing 540 Exhibit List Plaintiff's Third Amended Exhibit List (With Apple's current objections listed) by SimpleAir, Inc... (Eichmann, John)
April 12, 2012 Filing 539 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Dubiansky for Apple, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1034) (ehs, )
April 11, 2012 Filing 538 Exhibit List Amended Exhibit List by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dryer, Jane)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER denying 530 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Reports. Pursuant to the Courts oral rulings and for the reasons stated during the pretrial conference held on April 5, 2012, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/9/12. (ehs, )
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Special Master. Judge David Folsom appointed. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/5/2012. (lgp, )
April 5, 2012 Filing 535 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael H. Schneider: Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/5/2012. (Court Reporter Jan Mason.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (lgp, )
April 5, 2012 Filing 534 SEALED RESPONSE by Research In Motion Limited, Research In Motion Corporation to 511 Sealed Document filed by SimpleAir Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dryer, Jane)
April 5, 2012 Filing 533 Exhibit List Amended Exhibit List by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited.. (Dryer, Jane)
April 5, 2012 Filing 532 RESPONSE in Opposition re 530 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Reports filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
April 5, 2012 Filing 531 SEALED RESPONSE by SimpleAir, Inc. to 519 Notice (Other) filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (SimpleAir's supplemental statement of objections to Defendants' amended deposition designations) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: detailed objections to von Kaenel depo designations)(Eichmann, John)
April 5, 2012 Filing 530 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Expert Reports by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Jessee, Seth)
April 5, 2012 Filing 529 SEALED RESPONSE by SimpleAir, Inc. to 525 Notice (Other) filed by SimpleAir, Inc. (SimpleAir's response to Apple's objections and counter designations of depo testimony) (Eichmann, John)
April 5, 2012 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 520 Supplemental Order; modified entry to add #501 which is the order this is supplementing. (sm, )
April 5, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 526 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
April 4, 2012 Filing 528 SEALED RESPONSE by SimpleAir, Inc. to 526 Sealed Document filed by SimpleAir, Inc. (SimpleAir's response to RIM's objections and counter-designations of deposition testimony) (Eichmann, John)
April 4, 2012 Filing 527 RESPONSE to 510 Exhibit List Objections to SimpleAir's Second Amended Exhibit List by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Dryer, Jane)
April 4, 2012 Filing 526 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. RIM's Objections and Counter-designations. (Dryer, Jane) Modified on 4/5/2012 (ch, ).
April 4, 2012 Filing 525 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. OBJECTIONS AND COUNTERDESIGNATIONS TO PLAINTIFF SIMPLEAIR'S AMENDED DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Alper, Adam)
April 4, 2012 Filing 524 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 510 Exhibit List (Objections to Simpleair's Second Amended Exhibit List (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Alper, Adam)
April 4, 2012 Filing 523 Sealed Document SimpleAir's Objection to Defendants' Revised Deposition Designations [Dkt. 515]. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Depo designations, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Von Kaenel Depo, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Weisberg Depo, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Geron Depo, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Hirsch Depo)(Eichmann, John)
April 4, 2012 Filing 522 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. re 518 Exhibit List, 516 Exhibit List SimpleAir's objections to Defendants' revised exhibit lists (Eichmann, John)
April 4, 2012 Filing 521 Exhibit List Amended Exhibit List by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited.. (Dryer, Jane)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 520 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re 507 ORDER and 348 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant Apple's expert Dr. Stephen Wicker filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/4/2012. (mhs1, ) Modified on 4/5/2012 (sm, ).
April 4, 2012 Filing 519 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited Defendants' Amended Deposition Designations (Corrected) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants Amended Deposition Designations)(Albritton, Eric)
April 4, 2012 Filing 518 Exhibit List Defendant Apple Inc.'s Amended Trial Exhibit List by Apple, Inc... (Albritton, Eric)
April 4, 2012 Filing 517 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***Exhibit List Defendants Amended Trial Exhibit List by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited.. (Albritton, Eric) Modified on 4/4/2012 (ehs, ).
April 4, 2012 Filing 516 Exhibit List by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited.. (Dryer, Jane)
April 4, 2012 Filing 515 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited Defendants' Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defs Amended Depo Designations)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 4/4/2012 (ehs, ).
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER granting 509 Motion to Replace Exhibit F of Dkt. 469 Joint Pretrial Order, With Correct Exhibit F. ORDERED that the clerk replace Exhibit F of Dkt. 469 with the correct Exhibit F.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/3/2012. (ch, )
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER denying as moot 502 Motion to Withdraw Apples Motion to Strike Dr. Srinivasans and Mr. Mills Supplemental Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/3/2012. (ch, )
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER denying as moot 369 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/3/2012. (ch, )
April 4, 2012 Filing 511 Sealed Document (Plaintiff SimpleAir's revised deposition designations) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: revised depo designations of RIM witnesses, # 2 Exhibit B: revised depo designations of Apple witnesses)(Eichmann, John)
April 3, 2012 Filing 510 Exhibit List (Plaintiff's Second Amended Exhibit List) by SimpleAir, Inc... (Eichmann, John)
April 3, 2012 Filing 509 Unopposed MOTION to Replace Exhibit F of Dkt. 469 - Joint Pretrial Order re 469 Proposed Pretrial Order,,,, by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit F)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 3, 2012 Filing 508 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joel R Merkin for Apple, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1028)(ehs, )
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER denying 348 Sealed Motion; granting 349 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 350 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 351 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 352 Sealed Patent Motion; granting in part and denying in part 353 Sealed Motion; denying 354 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 355 Motion to Expedite; denying 356 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 357 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 358 Sealed Motion; finding as moot 359 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 360 Sealed Motion; denying 361 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 362 Sealed Patent Motion; granting in part and denying in part 363 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 365 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 367 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 368 Sealed Motion; denying 403 Sealed Patent Motion; granting in part and denying in part 439 Sealed Motion; denying 272 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 273 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 282 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/3/12. (ehs, )
April 3, 2012 Filing 506 Sealed Document (Plaintiff's additional statement in support of objections to Defendants' deposition designations (Exh J to the PTCO, dkt. #469-11) [this is a re-filed version of dkt. #503, with the certificate of authorization to file now added per the Court's notice of deficiency] (Eichmann, John)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 466 Sealed Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 468 Sealed Patent Motion in Limine. Exhibit lists and deposition designation are to be refiled by Wednesday, April 4, 2012 at 12:00 p.m. Written detailed categorized objections are due by Wednesday, April 4, 2012 at 8:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/3/12. (ehs, )
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER - to aid the parties trial preparation, the Court notifies the parties that trial of this case will occur at the 1901 Historic Harrison County Courthouse. To effectively plan trial logistics, the parties will be given the opportunity to walk through the facility prior to the commencement of trial.Parties to schedule a joint walkthrough between April 9 and April 13, 2012. The pretrial conference in this case remains scheduled for Thursday, April 5, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. in Tyler, Texas.2 At the pretrial conference, the parties will be given a date closer to trial on which they will have access to the courtroom to setup any equipment. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/3/12. (ehs, )
April 3, 2012 Filing 503 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document (Plaintiff's additional statement in support of objections to Defendants' deposition designations (Exh J to the PTCO, dkt. #469-11))(Eichmann, John) Modified on 4/3/2012 (ch, ).
April 3, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 503 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
April 2, 2012 Filing 502 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 354 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE MR. MILLS AND DR. SRINIVASANS SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS AND OTHER UNTIMELY PRODUCTION, 403 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Dr. Srinivasan's and Mr. Mills' Supplemental Expert Reports by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alper, Adam)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER granting 495 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff SimpleAir, Inc., Defendants Apple Inc., and Defendants Research In Motion Limited and Research In Motion Corporation shall exchange demonstrative exhibits during trial of the above-referenced action according to the schedule set forth in the Proposed Pretrial Order (Dkt. No. 469). Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/2/2012. (ch, )
April 2, 2012 Filing 500 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 498 Notice (Other), Notice (Other).. (Eichmann, John)
April 2, 2012 Filing 499 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Withdrawal of Motions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation between SimpleAir and Apple regarding supplemental expert reports and related matters)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 4/2/2012 (ch, ).
April 2, 2012 Filing 498 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. re 403 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Dr. Srinivasan's and Mr. Mills' Supplemental Expert Reports, 480 Sealed Response to Motion,, 466 SEALED MOTION in limine (Notice of Stipulation between SimpleAir and Apple regarding supplemental expert reports and related issues and evidence) (Eichmann, John)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER granting 488 Motion for Leave to File in Excess of the Page limit for its sur-reply in opposition to SimpleAir's motion to exclude certain expert opinions of Apple's expert Dr. Ray Perryman. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/30/12. (mrm, )
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER granting 483 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on their Surreply to Plaintiff SimpleAir, Inc.'s Reply to Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Stephen Wicker. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/30/12. (mrm, )
April 2, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO FILE MOTION WITH ORDER Document # 499, Notice of Withdrawal of Motions. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
April 1, 2012 Filing 495 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 450 Order, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alper, Adam)
March 30, 2012 Filing 494 SEALED SUR-REPLY re 361 SEALED PATENT MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. SRINIVASAN AND MR. MILLS filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
March 30, 2012 Filing 493 SEALED SUR-REPLY re 368 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT DUE TO LICENSE AND EXHAUSTION filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
March 30, 2012 Filing 492 SEALED SUR-REPLY re 356 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT ON THE GROUNDS OF EXPRESS LICENSE, IMPLIED LICENSE, OR PATENT EXHAUSTION filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
March 30, 2012 Filing 491 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 489 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,.. (Alper, Adam)
March 30, 2012 Filing 490 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 403 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Dr. Srinivasan's and Mr. Mills' Supplemental Expert Reports filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
March 29, 2012 Filing 489 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 350 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant Apple's expert Dr. M. Ray Perryman filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit J)(Alper, Adam)
March 29, 2012 Filing 488 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alper, Adam)
March 29, 2012 Filing 487 SEALED SUR-REPLY re 352 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE '433 PATENT BASED ON THE "ON OR OFF" LIMITATION filed by SimpleAir, Inc.(Eichmann, John)
March 29, 2012 Filing 486 SEALED SUR-REPLY re 360 SEALED MOTION MSJ of NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,021,433 AND 7,035,914 filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
March 29, 2012 Filing 485 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to 469 Proposed Pretrial Order,,,, filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Alper, Adam)
March 29, 2012 Filing 484 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 348 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant Apple's expert Dr. Stephen Wicker filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2012-01-16 Wicker Transcript, # 2 Exhibit B - 2011-12-03 Wicker Transcript, # 3 Exhibit C - 2011-12-23 Wicker Report, # 4 Exhibit D - 2011-10-07 Wicker Invalidity Report, # 5 Exhibit E - U.S. 7,035,914, # 6 Exhibit F - 2011-10-10 Knox Report, # 7 Exhibit G - 2012-01-19 Knox Transcript)(Albritton, Eric)
March 29, 2012 Filing 483 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendant Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
March 29, 2012 Filing 482 Sealed Response to Dkt #469-12 and 469-13 (Apple and RIM's Summary of Objections to Exhibits and Deposition Designations) (Eichmann, John)
March 29, 2012 Filing 481 RESPONSE to 469 Proposed Pretrial Order,,,, Exhibit J by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Dryer, Jane)
March 29, 2012 Filing 480 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 466 SEALED MOTION in limine filed by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z)(Alper, Adam)
March 29, 2012 Filing 479 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 468 SEALED PATENT MOTION (DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE) SEALED PATENT MOTION (DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE) filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER denying 473 Sealed Motion for leave to file; striking 474 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/29/2012. (sm, )
March 29, 2012 Filing 477 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Amy R Lemyre for Apple, Inc. APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1022. (ch, )
March 29, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 476 submitted by Apple, Inc.. OVER THE PAGE LIMITS. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
March 28, 2012 Filing 476 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 348 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant Apple's expert Dr. Stephen Wicker filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Alper, Adam) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ch, ).
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER granting 464 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages re: Sur-reply to Defendant Apple's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Dr. James Knox. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/28/12. (mrm, )
March 27, 2012 Filing 474 STRICKEN PER ORDER #478***Opposed SEALED MOTION in limine by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) Modified on 3/29/2012 (sm, ).
March 27, 2012 Filing 473 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for leave to file motion in limine by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
March 27, 2012 Filing 472 Proposed Joint Proposed Verdit Form by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, SimpleAir, Inc.. (Alper, Adam) Modified on 3/27/2012 (ch, ).
March 27, 2012 Filing 471 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Proposed Findings of Fact by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, SimpleAir, Inc.. (Alper, Adam) Modified on 3/27/2012 (ch, ).
March 27, 2012 Filing 470 Proposed Jury Instructions by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, SimpleAir, Inc.. (Alper, Adam)
March 27, 2012 Filing 469 Proposed Pretrial Order (Revised and with revised exhibits) by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: SimpleAir's witness list, # 2 Exhibit B: SimpleAir's depo designations, Apple's objections and counters, # 3 Exhibit C: SimpleAir's depo designations, RIM's objections and counters, # 4 Exhibit D: Apple's witness list, # 5 Exhibit E: Apple's depo designations, SimpleAir's objections and counters, Apple's replies, # 6 Exhibit F: RIM's witness list, # 7 Exhibit G: RIM's depo designations, SimpleAir's objections and counters, RIM's replies, # 8 Exhibit H: SimpleAir's exhibit list, # 9 Exhibit H-1: Defendant RIM and Defendant Apple's objections to SimpleAir's exhibit list (in sequence), # 10 Exhibit I: Defendants' exhibit list and SimpleAir's objections, # 11 Exhibit J: SimpleAir's summary of objections to Defendants' depo designations and exhibits, # 12 Exhibit K: Apple's summary of objections to SimpleAir's depo designations and exhibits, # 13 Exhibit L: RIM's summary of objections to SimpleAir's depo designations and exhibits)(Eichmann, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2012: # 14 Corrected Exhibit F) (ch, ).
March 27, 2012 Filing 468 SEALED PATENT MOTION (DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Alper, Adam)
March 27, 2012 Filing 467 NOTICE by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, SimpleAir, Inc. Joint Proposed Voir Dire Questions (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 27, 2012 Filing 466 SEALED MOTION in limine by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2012: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 27, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 471, Proposed Findings of Facts. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 26, 2012 Filing 465 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 353 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant RIM's expert Mr. Daniel Jackson, 439 Amended SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Mr. Daniel Jackson (corrected version of dkt. # 353)Amended SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Mr. Daniel Jackson (corrected version of dkt. # 353) filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaFuze, William)
March 26, 2012 Filing 464 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in sur-reply (dkt. #463) by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order granting leave to file additional pages)(Eichmann, John)
March 26, 2012 Filing 463 SEALED SUR-REPLY re 367 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. JAMES M. KNOX filed by SimpleAir, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3: Wicker depo. testimony, # 2 Exhibit 4: Search results for "interrupt" in initial Wicker report)(Eichmann, John)
March 26, 2012 Filing 462 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 363 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Apple Inc., Research In Motion Corporation and Research In Motion Limited Daubert Motion to Strike Expert Report of Robert Mills filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12 - Ofec Article, # 2 Exhibit 13 - Rossi Depo, # 3 Exhibit 14 - Perryman Depo)(Eichmann, John)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER granting 454 Motion for Extension of Timeto 3/28/2012 to File Response/Reply re 348 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant Apple's expert Dr. Stephen Wicker Replies due by 3/28/2012.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/26/2012. (sm, )
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER granting 457 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SimpleAirs use of 12 pages of briefing in its sur-reply (filed as Doc. No. 455) is hereby permitted and the foregoing sur-reply brief is deemed properly filed. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/26/12. (ehs, )
March 24, 2012 Filing 459 SEALED SUR-REPLY to 359 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - No Evidence filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
March 23, 2012 Filing 458 SEALED SUR-REPLY to 354 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE MR. MILLS AND DR. SRINIVASANS SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS AND OTHER UNTIMELY PRODUCTION filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JE2: Eichmann further decl., # 2 Exhibit H: email exchange)(Eichmann, John)
March 23, 2012 Filing 457 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Sur-Reply (filed as dkt #455) to Apple's motion for summary judgement of no joint infringement by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order granting leave to file excess pages in sur-reply)(Eichmann, John)
March 23, 2012 Filing 456 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 282 (Alper, Adam)
March 23, 2012 Filing 455 SEALED SUR-REPLY to 362 APPLE'S SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on No Joint Infringement filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11: Apple provided applications, # 2 Exhibit 12: SimpleAir's 10'8'11 supp. response to common rog 3 (as to Apple))(Eichmann, John)
March 23, 2012 Filing 454 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 348 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant Apple's expert Dr. Stephen Wicker by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alper, Adam)
March 23, 2012 Filing 453 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 282 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Dryer, Jane)
March 23, 2012 Filing 452 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory P Teran for Research In Motion Corporation,Gregory P Teran for Research In Motion Limited. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1014) (ehs, )
March 23, 2012 Filing 451 SEALED SUR-REPLY to 361 DEFENDANTS' SEALED PATENT MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. SRINIVASAN AND MR. MILLS filed by SimpleAir, Inc..(Eichmann, John)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER granting extension of time. Deadline for Plaintiff SimpleAir, Inc., Defendants Apple Inc., and Defendants Research In Motion Limited and Research In Motion Corporation to file Joint Proposed Jury Instructions, Form of the Verdict, and Motions in Limine is extended up to Tuesday, March 27, 2012 at 12:00 p.m.. The Court imposes the following additional requirements for filing pretrial materials. To the extent the parties existing filings do not comply with these procedures, they are to refile those documents by Tuesday, March 27, 2012 at 12:00 p.m.. Should any party or counsel fail to cooperate in doing anything required by this order, such party or counsel or both may be subject to sanctions.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/23/12. (ehs, )
March 23, 2012 Filing 449 SEALED SUR-REPLY to 358 RIM's SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement (Territoriality) and Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by SimpleAir, Inc. (Eichmann, John)
March 23, 2012 Filing 448 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 357 RIM'S SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT ON THE GROUNDS OF DIVIDED INFRINGEMENT filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS - instructions set forth herein. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/23/12. (ehs, )
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER granting 397 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Research in Motions Motion to Strike Supplemental Reports of Mr. Mills, Dr. Srinivasan, and other evidence (Doc. No. 397). The response to RIMs motion to strike filed by SimpleAir on March 5, 2012 (Doc. No. 389), will be deemed to be timely filed; The deadline for SimpleAir to file a sur reply regarding RIMs motion to strike shall be advanced by 3 calendar days from the date the sur-reply would otherwise be due under the Local Rules.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/23/12. (ehs, )
March 23, 2012 Filing 445 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 367 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. JAMES M. KNOX by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 22, 2012 Filing 444 Proposed Pretrial Order by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: SimpleAir's witness list & depo designations, # 2 Exhibit A-1: Defendants' objections to SimpleAir's depo designations, # 3 Exhibit B: Apple's witness list, # 4 Exhibit C: Apple's depo designations and SimpleAir's objections, # 5 Exhibit D: RIM's witness list, # 6 Exhibit E: Rim's depo designations and SimpleAir's objections, # 7 Exhibit F: SimpleAir's First Amended Exhibit List, # 8 Exhibit F-1: Defendant's objections to SimpleAir's exhibit list, # 9 Exhibit G: Defendants' exhibit list and SimpleAir's objections)(Eichmann, John)
March 22, 2012 Filing 443 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 338 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,,,,, by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dryer, Jane)
March 22, 2012 Filing 442 SEALED SUR-REPLY in Opposition to Motion re 351 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Concerning Priority Dates of the Patents-In-Suit filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER granting 375 Sealed Patent Motion to compel deposition. SimpleAir is to produce Dr. Knox for an additional three-and-a-half hours of deposition within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, unless otherwise agreed to by the parties. Questioning by Apple during the deposition is limited to issues addressed in Dr. Knoxs rebuttal report. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/22/12. (ehs, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 440 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Leon Carter on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Carter, Edgar)
March 20, 2012 Filing 439 Amended SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Mr. Daniel Jackson (corrected version of dkt. # 353) by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order excluding Jackson opinions, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Jackson report, # 3 Exhibit 2- Jackson depo)(Eichmann, John)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER granting 429 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SimpleAir shall be permitted up to eight pages in its reply in support of the foregoing motion and the reply that has been filed by SimpleAir (dkt. #426) shall be received by the Court as if this Order were entered prior to the filing of that document. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/20/12. (ehs, )
March 20, 2012 Filing 437 NOTICE by The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. of Request to Terminate Electronic Notifications (Sayles, Richard)
March 20, 2012 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING: (To be Held in TYLER, TEXAS) Pretrial Conference reset for THURSDAY, APRIL 5, 2012 at 10:00 AM at the Wm. M. Steger Federal Building, 211 W. Ferguson, TYLER, TEXAS before Judge Michael H. Schneider. (lgp, )
March 20, 2012 NOTICE - disregard notice of deficiency for #426, Attorney filed Motion for Excess Pages # 429 and order was signed at #438 (ch, )
March 19, 2012 Filing 436 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 368 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT DUE TO LICENSE AND EXHAUSTION filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (PR 3-1 Appendix C (Facebook)), # 2 Exhibit B (Facebook settlement agreement (SA001669-680)), # 3 Exhibit C (PR 3-1 Appendix A), # 4 Exhibit D (Yahoo Settlement and License Agreement (S018338-353), # 5 Exhibit E (2011-10-10 Expert report of James Knox))(Alper, Adam)
March 19, 2012 Filing 435 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 365 SEALED PATENT MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO EXCLUDE DR. JAMES M. KNOXS BATTERY TESTING AND OPINIONS REGARDING BATTERY LIFE filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Weaver, # 2 Exhibit 1--Part 1--Impact of 2G and 3G, # 3 Exhibit 1--Part 2--Parallel Connections, # 4 Exhibit 2--BlackBerry8700c website, # 5 Exhibit 3--http_www.gsma website, # 6 Exhibit 4--Excerpts from 2/3/2012 Knox deposition, # 7 Exhibit 5--Excerpts from 10/07/2011 Srinivasan Expert Report, # 8 Exhibit 6--Excerpts from 10/14/2011 Mills Expert Report, # 9 Exhibit 7--Excerpts from 12/23/2011 Wolff Expert Report, # 10 Exhibit 8--Dkt 358-RIM 2/10/2012 Partial Summary Judgment Motion, # 11 Exhibit 9--Excerpts from 1/26/2012 Halvorsen deposition)(LaFuze, William)
March 19, 2012 Filing 434 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 356 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT ON THE GROUNDS OF EXPRESS LICENSE, IMPLIED LICENSE, OR PATENT EXHAUSTION filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve Borgman, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Facebook for BlackBerry Smartphones User Guide (v1.8), # 3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from 10/17/2011 James Knox Expert Report, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from 2/2/2012 James Knox Deposition)(LaFuze, William)
March 19, 2012 Filing 433 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 352 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE '433 PATENT BASED ON THE "ON OR OFF" LIMITATION filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of 2/2/2012 James Knox deposition)(LaFuze, William)
March 19, 2012 Filing 432 SEALED REPLY - RIM's REPLY IN SUPPORT OF Motion re 360 SEALED MOTION MSJ of NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,021,433 AND 7,035,914 filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Gillam, Harry)
March 19, 2012 Filing 431 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Compliance regarding its Amended Trial Exhibit List (Albritton, Eric)
March 19, 2012 Filing 430 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 352 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE '433 PATENT BASED ON THE "ON OR OFF" LIMITATION filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (LaFuze, William) Modified on 3/19/2012 (ehs, ).
March 19, 2012 Filing 429 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Ray Perryman by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order allowing additional pages for reply brief)(Eichmann, John)
March 19, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 425, SEALED DOCUMENT - AMENDED MOTION TO AMEND. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 19, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 426 submitted by SimpleAir, Inc.. OVER THE PAGE LIMITS. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
March 19, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 430, Reply to Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
March 16, 2012 Filing 428 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 375 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Simplair's Expert Dr. James M. Knox filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
March 16, 2012 Filing 427 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 425 (Amended version of 353 ) SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant RIM's expert Mr. Daniel Jackson filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 - Jackson Depo)(Eichmann, John)
March 16, 2012 Filing 426 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 350 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant Apple's expert Dr. M. Ray Perryman filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John) Modified on 3/19/2012 (ch, ). Modified on 3/20/2012 (ch, ).
March 16, 2012 Filing 425 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Plaintiff's Amended Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Mr. Daniel Jackson (amended version of dkt. #353 - correcting table of contents and section headings) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order excluding Jackson opinions, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Jackson report, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Jackson depo testimony)(Eichmann, John) Modified on 3/19/2012 (ch, ).
March 16, 2012 Filing 424 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 358 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement (Territoriality) and Non-Infringing Alternatives (Amended to Correct Table of Contents) filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER granting 414 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/16/2012. (ch, )
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER granting 417 Motion to Amend/Correct the Discovery Order. ORDERED that RIM is allowed four (4) individual expert witnesses, not to exceed five (5) total experts. The Discovery Order is so amended. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/16/2012. (ch, )
March 16, 2012 Filing 421 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Constance Choi for Apple, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-980)(ehs, )
March 15, 2012 Filing 420 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 363 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Apple Inc., Research In Motion Corporation and Research In Motion Limited Daubert Motion to Strike Expert Report of Robert Mills filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K (2012-01-05 Mills Vol. 1 Deposition Transcript), # 2 Exhibit L (Sawtooth Assessing the Monetary Value of Attribute Levels), # 3 Exhibit M (Excerpts of Jackson Report), # 4 Exhibit N (2011-10-07 Srinivasan Report, Table W))(Alper, Adam)
March 15, 2012 Filing 419 RESPONSE to Motion re 397 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to RIM's motion to strike supplemental expert reports filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (LaFuze, William)
March 15, 2012 Filing 418 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 354 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE MR. MILLS AND DR. SRINIVASANS SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS AND OTHER UNTIMELY PRODUCTION filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (LaFuze, William)
March 15, 2012 Filing 417 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Order UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AMEND DISCOVERY ORDER by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting 378 Motion for extension of deadlines. Deadline for Plaintiff SimpleAir, Inc. to respond to Defendants Apple Inc., Research in Motion, Limited and Research in Motion Corporations Daubert Motion to Strike Expert Report of Robert Mills (Dkt. 363) is extended to March 5, 2012. Deadlines for defendants responses to SimpleAirs Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. M. Ray Perryman (Dkt. 350) and SimpleAirs Daubert Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Mr. Daniel Jackson (Dkt. 353) are extended to March 5, 2012.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/14/12. (ehs, )
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting 374 Motion for Extension of Time to File. SimpleAir shall have up to and including March 9, 2012, to file its responses to the following motions: Motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of the on/off element of the 433 patent [Dkt 352]. Motion for summary judgment re license, patent exhaustion defense [Dkt 356]. Motion for summary judgment of non-infringement of the transmission gateway element of the 433 and 914 patent [Dkt 360]. Apple joinder in dkt. # 352 [Dkt 364] Daubert motion to strike report of Dr. Knox re battery testing [Dkt365]. Motion for summary judgment re license, patent exhaustion defense [Dkt 368]. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/14/12. (ehs, )
March 14, 2012 Filing 414 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in reply in support of Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Stephen Wicker (corrected filing - adding certificate of conference) by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order for granting leave to file additional pages)(Eichmann, John)
March 14, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 411 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one busniess day (ch, )
March 13, 2012 Filing 413 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 349 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant RIM's non-infringement expert Tim Halvorsen filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
March 13, 2012 Filing 412 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 348 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant Apple's expert Dr. Stephen Wicker filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Wicker Depo, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Wicker Depo, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Wicker Depo, # 4 Exhibit 4 - '433 patent, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Knox Rebuttal)(Eichmann, John)
March 13, 2012 Filing 411 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Reply Briefing in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Stephen Wicker by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order permitting additional pages of reply briefing)(Eichmann, John) Modified on 3/14/2012 (ch, ).
March 12, 2012 Filing 410 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 361 SEALED PATENT MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. SRINIVASAN AND MR. MILLS filed by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - List of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Andrea M. Houston, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Srinivasan 10/07/2011 Report, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Srinivasan 01/31/2012 Supplemental Report, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Srinivasan 02/17/2012 Supplemental Report, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Srinivasan 02/29/2012 Supplemental Report, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Srinivasan 12/16/2011 Deposition Excerpts, # 8 Exhibit 6 - Mills 02/03/2012 Supplemental Report, # 9 Exhibit 7 - Rossi 12/23/2011 Report, # 10 Exhibit 8 - Rossi 02/06/2012 Deposition Excerpts, # 11 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from Wolff 12/23/2011 Rebuttal Report, # 12 Exhibit 10 - Bryan Orme, "Assessing Monetary Value of Attribute Levels," Sawtooth (2001), # 13 Exhibit 11 - Bryan Orme, "Market Simulators for Conjoint Analysis," Sawtooth (2010))(LaFuze, William)
March 12, 2012 Filing 409 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited Notice of Request for Daily Transcript (Gillam, Harry)
March 12, 2012 Filing 408 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 362 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on No Joint Infringement filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (2011-09-02 Memorandum Opinion & Order), # 2 Exhibit B (2011-10-10 Expert report of James Knox), # 3 Exhibit C (2011-03-22 Amended Infringement Contentions), # 4 Exhibit D (U.S. Patent 6,021,433), # 5 Exhibit E (U.S. Patent 6,167,426), # 6 Exhibit F (2010-08-16 SimpleAir's Responses to 2nd Common Rogs), # 7 Exhibit G (2012-01-20 J. Knox Deposition Transcript))(Alper, Adam)
March 12, 2012 Filing 407 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 367 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. JAMES M. KNOX filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J (2011-12-03 S. Wicker Deposition Transcript), # 2 Exhibit K (2012-01-20 J. Knox Deposition Transcript))(Alper, Adam)
March 12, 2012 Filing 406 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 358 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement (Territoriality) and Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (LaFuze, William)
March 12, 2012 Filing 405 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 359 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - No Evidence filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Li Chen (Ex. B), # 2 Exhibit 30 - First Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 31 - RIM Answer to Am. Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 32 - 2011.08.29 Eichmann Email, # 5 Exhibit 33 - 33 - 2012.01.16 Chen Email, # 6 Exhibit 34 - Excerpts from Dkt 354, # 7 Exhibit 35 - Excerpts from John Payne Depo, # 8 Exhibit 36 - Excerpts from Dkt. 356, # 9 Appendix of Cases, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
March 12, 2012 Filing 404 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 357 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT ON THE GROUNDS OF DIVIDED INFRINGEMENT filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Knox Rebuttal Report, Sec. 2)(LaFuze, William)
March 12, 2012 Filing 403 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Strike Dr. Srinivasan's and Mr. Mills' Supplemental Expert Reports by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - 2012-02-29 Srinivasan supp. report, # 3 Exhibit B - 2012-02-29 Mills Report)(Albritton, Eric)
March 12, 2012 Filing 402 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea M Houston on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Houston, Andrea)
March 12, 2012 Filing 401 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 12, 2012 Filing 400 REPLY to Response to Motion re 351 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Concerning Priority Dates of the Patents-In-Suit filed by Apple, Inc.. (Albritton, Eric)
March 12, 2012 Filing 399 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Request for Daily Transcript (Albritton, Eric)
March 9, 2012 Filing 398 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 365 SEALED PATENT MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO EXCLUDE DR. JAMES M. KNOXS BATTERY TESTING AND OPINIONS REGARDING BATTERY LIFE filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Knox CV, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Knox RIM report Section 4, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Knox Apple report Section 4, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Halvorsen depo, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Wolff depo)(Eichmann, John)
March 9, 2012 Filing 397 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to RIM's motion to strike supplemental expert reports by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eichmann Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Email chain between Eichmann and Chen, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
March 9, 2012 Filing 396 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 356 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT ON THE GROUNDS OF EXPRESS LICENSE, IMPLIED LICENSE, OR PATENT EXHAUSTION filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Facebook Agreement, # 2 Exhibit B - Knox RIM Report, # 3 Exhibit C - Mills RIM Report, # 4 Exhibit D - Mills Supp. Report)(Eichmann, John)
March 9, 2012 Filing 395 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 368 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT DUE TO LICENSE AND EXHAUSTION filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Knox Apple Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Facebook Agreement, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Yahoo Agreement, # 4 Exhibit 4 - eBay Agreement, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Mills Report, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Mills Supp. Report, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Perryman Report)(Eichmann, John)
March 9, 2012 Filing 394 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 360 SEALED MOTION MSJ of NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,021,433 AND 7,035,914 filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JK - Knox Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Knox Qualifications CV, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Knox RIM 914, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Knox RIM 433)(Eichmann, John)
March 9, 2012 Filing 393 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 352 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE '433 PATENT BASED ON THE "ON OR OFF" LIMITATION and re 364 Apple Joinder filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JK - Knox Declaration, # 2 Exhibit JE - Eichmann Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A - Knox Qualifications CV, # 4 Exhibit B - Knox RIM 914, # 5 Exhibit C - Knox RIM 433, # 6 Exhibit D - Knox Apple 914, # 7 Exhibit E - Knox Apple 433)(Eichmann, John)
March 8, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 392 submitted by SimpleAir, Inc.. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
March 7, 2012 Filing 392 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to RIM's motion to strike supplemental expert reports by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eichmann declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order granting extension)(Eichmann, John) Modified on 3/8/2012 (ch, ).
March 5, 2012 Filing 391 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 350 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant Apple's expert Dr. M. Ray Perryman filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - App B (List of Testimony), # 3 Exhibit B - 2011-12-23 Ray Perryman Report, # 4 Exhibit C - 2011-08-18 Payne Vol. 2 Deposition Transcript, # 5 Exhibit D - 2011-09-21 Lutton Deposition Transcript, # 6 Exhibit E - 2011-12-23 Wicker Noninfringement Report, # 7 Exhibit F - 2012-01-31 Perryman Deposition Transcript)(Alper, Adam)
March 5, 2012 Filing 390 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 363 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Apple Inc., Research In Motion Corporation and Research In Motion Limited Daubert Motion to Strike Expert Report of Robert Mills filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Mills Apple Report, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Mills RIM Report, # 3 Exhibit 3 - MIT Dictionary, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Wessels, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Initial Srinivasan Report, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Apple Document, # 7 Exhibit 7 - RIM Document, # 8 Exhibit 8 - RIM Document, # 9 Exhibit 9 - RIM Document, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Jackson Depo, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Nobel Press Release, # 12 Exhibit RM - Mills Declaration)(Eichmann, John)
March 5, 2012 Filing 389 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 354 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE MR. MILLS AND DR. SRINIVASANS SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS AND OTHER UNTIMELY PRODUCTION filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JE - Eichmann Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A - Initial Srinivasan Report, # 3 Exhibit B - Rebuttal to Shugan, # 4 Exhibit C - Rebuttal to Rossi, # 5 Exhibit D - Srinivasan Supp. Rep., # 6 Exhibit E - Mills RIM Report, # 7 Exhibit F - Mills Supp. Rep., # 8 Exhibit G - Mills Supp. Rep. 2'29'12)(Eichmann, John)
March 5, 2012 Filing 388 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 353 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant RIM's expert Mr. Daniel Jackson filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Lauren Grau, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Jackson Daubert (Dkt 00353), # 3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from John Payne Depo, Vol. II 2011.08.18 (AEO), # 4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from Tim Von Kaenel Depo 2011.08.19 (AEO), # 5 Exhibit 4 - 2011.10.14 R. Mills Report RIM (redacted), # 6 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from Seth Weisberg Depo 2011.08.24 (AEO), # 7 Exhibit 6 - SimpleAir Email S018440, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Jackson Report 2011.12.23, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts from Jackson Depo 2012.02.07 (AEO), # 10 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from SimpleAir Infringement Contentions Appx C, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts from SimpleAir Infringement Contentions Appx B, # 12 Exhibit 11 - (00285) Corrected Notice of non-opposition to letter brief, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Excerpts from Mills supplemental report, # 14 Appendix of Cases, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
March 2, 2012 Filing 387 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 362 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on No Joint Infringement filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JK - Knox Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Knox Report, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Knox Supplemental Report, # 4 Exhibit 3 - SimpleAir Response to Rog, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Stirling Specs, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Thunderdome Diagram, # 7 Exhibit 6 - iOS Tech Review, # 8 Exhibit 7 - GameKit Programming, # 9 Exhibit 8 - iPhone developer license, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Remote notification documentation, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Programming guide)(Eichmann, John)
March 2, 2012 Filing 386 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 351 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Concerning Priority Dates of the Patents-In-Suit filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Knox Declaration)(Eichmann, John)
March 2, 2012 Filing 385 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 357 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT ON THE GROUNDS OF DIVIDED INFRINGEMENT filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JK - Knox Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A - Knox Report, # 3 Exhibit B - Halvorsen Depo, # 4 Exhibit C - De Melo Depo, # 5 Exhibit D - RIM document, # 6 Exhibit E - BPDS Marketing Req., # 7 Exhibit F - BPDS Tech. Feasibility, # 8 Exhibit G - Push APIs, # 9 Exhibit H - Service Specs, # 10 Exhibit I - Admin Specs, # 11 Exhibit J - Admin Portal Specs, # 12 Exhibit K - SDK Agreement, # 13 Exhibit L - App World Agreement, # 14 Exhibit M - SimpleAir Rog Response)(Eichmann, John)
March 2, 2012 Filing 384 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 359 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - No Evidence filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Eichmann to Chen 1'19'12)(Eichmann, John)
March 2, 2012 Filing 383 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion-RIMS' SEALED RESPONSE TO 349 SimpleAir's DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN OPINIONS OF MR. TIM HALVORSEN filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
March 2, 2012 Filing 382 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re 367 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. JAMES M. KNOX filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JK - Knox Declaration, # 2 Exhibit JE - Eichmann Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Wicker Depo, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Knox Report)(Eichmann, John)
March 2, 2012 Filing 381 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 361 SEALED PATENT MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. SRINIVASAN AND MR. MILLS filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Initial Srinivasan Report, # 2 Exhibit B - Rebuttal to Shugan, # 3 Exhibit C - Rebuttal to Rossi, # 4 Exhibit D - Survey Report, # 5 Exhibit E - Srinivasan Depo, # 6 Exhibit F - Ofec Srinivasan Article, # 7 Exhibit G - Rossi Depo, # 8 Exhibit H - Shugan Depo, # 9 Exhibit I - Reference Guide, # 10 Exhibit J - Netzer Srinivasan Article, # 11 Exhibit K - Srinivasan Declaration)(Eichmann, John)
March 2, 2012 Filing 380 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 348 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant Apple's expert Dr. Stephen Wicker filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - 2011-12-23 Wicker Noninfringement Report, # 3 Exhibit B - 2011-10-07 Stephen Wicker Invalidity Expert Report, # 4 Exhibit C - 2012-01-16 Wicker Deposition Transcript, # 5 Exhibit D - 2011-12-03 Wicker Deposition Transcript)(Albritton, Eric)
March 2, 2012 Filing 379 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 358 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement (Territoriality) and Non-Infringing Alternatives SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement (Territoriality) and Non-Infringing Alternatives SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement (Territoriality) and Non-Infringing Alternatives SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement (Territoriality) and Non-Infringing Alternatives SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement (Territoriality) and Non-Infringing Alternatives SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement (Territoriality) and Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit JK - Knox Declaration, # 2 Exhibit RM - Mills Declaration, # 3 Exhibit JE - Eichmann Declaration, # 4 Exhibit A - Knox Report re RIM, # 5 Exhibit B - Knox Supplemental Report, # 6 Exhibit C - Mills Report re RIM, # 7 Exhibit D - Mills Supplemental Report)(Eichmann, John)
March 1, 2012 Filing 378 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER denying 313 Sealed Patent Motion to Compel the Deposition. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 2/29/2012. (ch, )
February 28, 2012 Filing 376 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric Cheng for Apple, Inc.(APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-945. (ch, )
February 28, 2012 Filing 375 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff Simplair's Expert Dr. James M. Knox by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Knox Rebuttal Report)(Albritton, Eric)
February 28, 2012 Filing 374 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to dkt # 352, 356, 360, 364, 365, 368 by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order to extending deadline for motion responses)(Eichmann, John)
February 24, 2012 Filing 373 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward C Donovan for Apple, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-937) (ehs, )
February 21, 2012 Filing 372 ANSWER to 344 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim (Reply to Apple's Counterclaims) by SimpleAir, Inc..(Eichmann, John)
February 16, 2012 Filing 371 Amended Trial Witness List by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Gillam, Harry)
February 15, 2012 Filing 370 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jane Dryer for Research In Motion Corporation,Jane Dryer for Research In Motion Limited. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-925) (ehs, )
February 13, 2012 Filing 369 Opposed MOTION for Joinder in Apple's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment & Portions of Apple's Motion to Strike re Knox by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
February 13, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 366 submitted by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
February 11, 2012 Filing 366 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION for Joinder by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li) Modified on 2/13/2012 (ch, ).
February 10, 2012 Filing 368 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT DUE TO LICENSE AND EXHAUSTION by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Exhibit R, # 18 Exhibit S, # 19 Exhibit T, # 20 Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit V, # 22 Exhibit W, # 23 Exhibit X, # 24 Exhibit Y, # 25 Exhibit AA)(Alper, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2012: # 26 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
February 10, 2012 Filing 367 SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. JAMES M. KNOX by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Albritton, Eric)
February 10, 2012 Filing 365 SEALED PATENT MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO EXCLUDE DR. JAMES M. KNOXS BATTERY TESTING AND OPINIONS REGARDING BATTERY LIFE by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of David Weaver, # 2 Exhibit A - copy of Expert Report of James M. Knox, Ph.D. regarding infringement and technical benefits of 914 and 433 patents as to Defendant RIM, signed by James M. Knox, Ph.D. on October 17, 2011, # 3 Exhibit B - excerpts of the deposition of James M. Knox, Ph.D., taken on February 3, 2012, # 4 Exhibit C - copy of the Battery Life Measurement and Current Consumption Technique, Version 6.3, 25th May 2011, by the GSM Association, # 5 Exhibit D - excerpts of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Richard S. Wolff Regarding the Battery Life Analysis Performed by James M. Knox, dated December 23, 2011, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
February 10, 2012 Filing 364 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE 433 PATENTBASED THE ON OR OFF LIMITATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (Albritton, Eric)
February 10, 2012 Filing 363 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendants Apple Inc., Research In Motion Corporation and Research In Motion Limited Daubert Motion to Strike Expert Report of Robert Mills by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit - (SimpleAir P.R. 3-1 Contentions, First Amended as to Apple, # 3 Exhibit B - (SimpleAir P.R. 3-1 Contentions), # 4 Exhibit C - (Mills Apple Rep.), # 5 Exhibit D - (Mills Vol. 1 Tr.), # 6 Exhibit E - (Srinivasan Rep.), # 7 Exhibit F - (Mills Supp. Rpt.), # 8 Exhibit G - (Mills RIM Rep.), # 9 Exhibit H - (Mills Vol. 2 Tr.), # 10 Exhibit I - (Srinivasan Tr.), # 11 Exhibit J - APPSIM00153256)(Albritton, Eric)
February 10, 2012 Filing 362 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on No Joint Infringement by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - (433 patent), # 3 Exhibit B - (614 patent), # 4 Exhibit C - SimpleAirs Resp. to Defs. Second Set of Common Interrogs., # 5 Exhibit D - (Dkt. 191) (Pl.s Opening Br.), # 6 Exhibit E - (426 Patent), # 7 Exhibit F - (10/10/11 Knox Infringement Report (Knox Report)),, # 8 Exhibit G - (3/22/11 1st Amended Infringement Contentions Appendix A), # 9 Exhibit H - (10/16/11 3rd Amended Infringement Contentions), # 10 Exhibit I - (09/02/11 Memorandum Opinion and Order (Dkt. 240), # 11 Exhibit J - (10/19/11 Knox Suppl. Infringement Report), # 12 Exhibit K - (05/27/11 SimpleAirs Reply Brief in Support of Proposed Claim Constructions (Dkt. 201), # 13 Exhibit L - (Pl.s Opening Claim Construction Br.,, # 14 Exhibit M - APPSIM00130173, Distribution and Revenue Share Agreement,, # 15 Exhibit N - APPSIM00109378, iPhone Developer License Agreement,, # 16 Exhibit O - APPSIM00110059, Best Practices for Apple Push Notification Service on iPhone OS 3.0,, # 17 Exhibit P - (APPSIM00130204, Certification Agreement), # 18 Exhibit Q - (APPSIM00133512, iPhone Agreement (Verizon)), # 19 Exhibit R - (APPSIM00133411 iPhone Agreement,), # 20 Exhibit S - (914 Patent))(Albritton, Eric)
February 10, 2012 Filing 361 SEALED PATENT MOTION UNDER DAUBERT TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORTS OF DR. SRINIVASAN AND MR. MILLS by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Weaver, # 2 Exhibit 1 - copy of the Report of V. Seenu Srinivasan, Ph.D., dated October 7, 2011, # 3 Exhibit 2 - copy of the Supplemental Expert Report of V. Seenu Srinivasan, Ph. D., dated January 31, 2012, # 4 Exhibit 3 - excerpts from the deposition transcript of Dr. V. Seenu Srinivasan, taken on December 16, 2011, # 5 Exhibit 4 - copy of the Expert Report of Professor Steven M. Shugan, dated December 20, 2011, # 6 Exhibit 5 - copy of the Expert Report of Dr. Peter E. Rossi, dated December 23, 2011, # 7 Exhibit 6 - excerpts from the rough deposition transcript of Dr. Peter Rossi, taken on February 6, 2012, # 8 Exhibit 7 - copy of How Much Does the Market Value an Improvement in a Product Attribute? Marketing Science, 21, No. 4 (Fall 2002), # 9 Exhibit 8 - excerpts from the Expert Report of James M. Knox, Ph.D. regarding infringement and technical benefits of 914 and 433 patents as to Defendant RIM, dated October 17, 2011, # 10 Exhibit 9 - excerpt from the deposition transcript of Dr. James M. Knox, taken on February 23, 2012, # 11 Exhibit 10 - excerpts from the Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Richard S. Wolff Regarding the Battery Life Analysis Performed by James M. Knox, dated December 23, 2011, # 12 Exhibit 11 - excerpts from Robert S. Pindyck and Daniel L. Rubenfeld, Microeconomics (2005), # 13 Exhibit 12 - excerpts from Paul A. Samuelson, and William D. Nordhaus, Economics, 17th Ed. (2001), # 14 Exhibit 13 - excerpts from David R. Anderson, Dennis J. Sweeney, and Thomas A. Williams, Statistics for Business and Economics, 11th Ed. (2011), # 15 Exhibit 14 - excerpts from James E. Bartlett, Joe W. Kotrlik, and Chadwick C. Higgins, Organizational Research: Determining Appropriate Sample Size in Survey Research, Information Technology, Learning, and Performance Journal, Vol. 19 No. 1 (Spring 2001), # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, David)
February 10, 2012 Filing 360 SEALED MOTION MSJ of NON-INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,021,433 AND 7,035,914 by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Li Chen, # 2 Exhibit A - Knox Report, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
February 10, 2012 Filing 359 SEALED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - No Evidence by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Lauren Grau, # 2 Exhibit 1 - SimpleAir 3-1 disclosures, # 3 Exhibit 2 - SimpleAir response to RIM's ROGs, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Eichmann to Valek re RIM's doc prod, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Eichmann to Chen re RIM doc prod, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Chen email to Eichmann re Source Code, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Grau emails to Eichman re Source Code, # 8 Exhibit 7 - RIM Source Code Review Log, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Grau encl PR 3-4 prod, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Grau to Eichmann encl Doc. Prod, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Grau to Eichmann trans doc prod, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Grau to Eichmann re doc prod, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Grau to Eichmann re doc prod, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Grau to Eichmann re doc prod, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Chen Ltr to Eichmann re SimpleAir, # 16 Exhibit 15 - Chen email to Eichmann re Doc prod, # 17 Exhibit 16 - RIM Depositions, # 18 Exhibit 17 - Grau to Eichmann re Search Terms, Custodians, # 19 Exhibit 18 - SimpleAir's response to RIM RFAs, # 20 Exhibit 19 - Eichmann to Chen re Contact Alert, # 21 Exhibit 20 - Grau to Eichmann re doc prod, # 22 Exhibit 21 - 2010.06.01 Docket Control Order, # 23 Exhibit 22 - ORDER granting 274, # 24 Exhibit 23 - ECF 338, # 25 Exhibit 24 - John Payne, Vol. II, # 26 Exhibit 25 - SimpleAir response to ROGs, # 27 Exhibit 26 - Mills, Vol. II., # 28 Exhibit 27 - Eichmann email to Chen, # 29 Exhibit 28 - Mills Report RIM, # 30 Exhibit 28a - Mills Report RIM (full), # 31 Exhibit 29 - James Knox report excerpts, # 32 Exhibit 29a - Knox report part 1, # 33 Exhibit 29a - Knox report part 2, # 34 Exhibit 29a - Knox report part 3, # 35 Appendix A - Case Law, # 36 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
February 10, 2012 Filing 358 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Non-Infringement (Territoriality) and Non-Infringing Alternatives by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Lauren Grau, # 2 Exhibit 1 - RIM Push, # 3 Exhibit 2 - RIM Futher Extends Push, # 4 Exhibit 3 - DeMelo Depo, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Knox report excerpts, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Mills report excerpts, # 7 Exhibit 6 - PR 3-1 Disclosures, # 8 Exhibit 6a - PR 3-1 1st Am. Disclosures, # 9 Exhibit 7 - PR 3-1 2nd Am. Disclosures, # 10 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts RIM's Supp Resps to 1st Common Rogs, # 11 Exhibit 9 - DeMelo 2nd depo, # 12 Exhibit 10 - SEALED RIMs Ltr Brief re MSJ on Territorality, # 13 Exhibit 11 - Sealed Notice of non-opp to letter brief, # 14 Exhibit 12 - ECF 285, # 15 Exhibit 13 - Mills depo, # 16 Exhibit 14 - Mills Supp report, # 17 Exhibit 15 - Eichmann letter to Chen re servers, # 18 Exhibit 16 - Williams depo, # 19 Exhibit 17 - Jackson Expert Report, # 20 Exhibit 18 - Halvorsen Expert Report, # 21 Exhibit 19 - Knox depo, # 22 Exhibit 20 - Knox supp report, # 23 Exhibit 21 - Knox report part 1, # 24 Exhibit 21 - Knox report part 2, # 25 Exhibit 21 - Knox report part 3, # 26 Exhibit 22 - Knox report (Apple redacted), # 27 Appendix A - Case law, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
February 10, 2012 Filing 357 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT ON THE GROUNDS OF DIVIDED INFRINGEMENT by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Steve Borgman, # 2 Exhibit 1 - copy of U.S. Patent No. 7,035,914, # 3 Exhibit 2 - copy of U.S. Patent No. 6,021,433, # 4 Exhibit 3 - excerpts from Section 5 of the infringement report of Plaintiffs expert, James M. Knox, dated October 17, 2011, # 5 Exhibit 4 - excerpts from the non-infringement rebuttal report of RIMs expert, Tim Halvorsen, dated December 23, 2011, # 6 Exhibit 5 - excerpts of Appendix B of Plaintiffs Second Amended Infringement Contentions, # 7 Exhibit 6 - excerpts of the transcript of James Knoxs deposition dated February 2, 2012, # 8 Exhibit 7 - excerpts from SimpleAirs Response to Office Action dated April 4, 2005, from the prosecution history of the 7,035,914 Patent, # 9 Exhibit 8 - excerpts from Section 3 of the infringement report of Plaintiffs expert, James M. Knox, dated October 17, 2011, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Copy of figure from RIM literature, # 11 Exhibit 10 - excerpts from Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Second Set of Common Interrogatories dated August 16, 2010, # 12 Exhibit 11 - excerpts of the transcript of Timothy Von Kaenels 30(b)(6) deposition dated August 19, 2011, # 13 Exhibit 12 - RIM Agreement, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(LaFuze, William)
February 10, 2012 Filing 356 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT ON THE GROUNDS OF EXPRESS LICENSE, IMPLIED LICENSE, OR PATENT EXHAUSTION by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Steve Borgman, # 2 Exhibit 1 - copy of Attachment 9 from the Expert Report of Daniel L. Jackson, dated December 23, 2011, # 3 Exhibit 2 - copy of Exhibit 10 from the Expert Report of Robert Mills Regarding Defendants Research In Motion Corporation and Research In Motion Limited, # 4 Exhibit 3 - excerpts from the Expert Report of Daniel L. Jackson, dated December 23, 2011, # 5 Exhibit 4 - excerpts from the Rebuttal Expert Report of Tim Halvorsen Regarding Non-Infringement of the Asserted Claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,021,433 and 7,035,914, # 6 Exhibit 5 - RIM Agreement, # 7 Exhibit 6 - excerpts from Plaintiff SimpleAirs Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions under Patent Rule 3-1 (served June 21, 2010), # 8 Exhibit 7 - excerpts from Plaintiff SimpleAirs Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions under Patent Rule 3-1: Second Amended as to Defendant RIM (served September 30, 2011), # 9 Exhibit 8 - Settlement and License Agreeement, # 10 Exhibit 9 - excerpts from the deposition transcript of Dr. James M. Knox, taken on February 23, 2012, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(LaFuze, William)
February 10, 2012 Filing 355 MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON MOTION TO STRIKE [DKT. 354] by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaFuze, William)
February 10, 2012 Filing 354 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE MR. MILLS AND DR. SRINIVASANS SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORTS AND OTHER UNTIMELY PRODUCTION by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David Weaver, # 2 Exhibit 1- Excerpt from Defendants Research In Motion Ltd. and Research In Motion Corporations Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs SimpleAirs Second Set of Individual Interrogatories to Defendant RIM (Nos. 22-29) dated September 12, 2011, # 3 Exhibit 2 - excerpt from the Expert Report of Robert Mills Regarding Defendants Research And [sic] Motion Corporation and Research In Motion Limited (October 14, 2011), # 4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt from the Expert Report of Daniel L. Jackson (December 23, 2011), # 5 Exhibit - Excerpt from the Deposition of Robert B. Mills, taken on January 6, 2012, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Copy of a letter dated January 20, 2012 from Jeff Eichmann to Li Chen, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Copy of Round Rock Research, LLC v. Oracle Corp., No. 4:11-cv-00332-MHS-ALM, Docket No. 40 (E.D. Tex. Oct. 25, 2011) (Report and Recommendation of Judge Mazzant), # 8 Exhibit 7 - Copy of Round Rock Research, LLC v. Oracle Corp., No. 4:11-cv-00332-MHS-ALM, Docket No. 51, 2011 WL 5837246 (E.D. Tex. Nov. 21, 2011) (Memorandum Adopting Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge), # 9 Exhibit 8 - Copy of an excerpt from SimpleAir, Inc. v. Microsoft Corp., 2:11-cv-416-DF-CMC, Docket No. 84, Plaintiff SimpleAir, Inc.s Opposition to Defendant Microsoft Corporations Motion to Dismiss (January 9, 2012), # 10 Exhibit 9 - Excerpt from the Deposition of V. Seenu Srinivasan, Ph.D., taken on December 16, 2011, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Excerpt from a partially unredacted version of an email dated November 30, 2010 from Michael Mirel to John Payne regarding the Facebook settlement, produced to Defendants by SimpleAir on February 2, 2012, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Excerpt from a redacted version of an email dated November 30, 2010 from Michael Mirel to John Payne regarding the Facebook settlement, produced to Defendants by SimpleAir on August 18, 2011, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Copy of an email dated December 5, 2011 from Jeff Eichmann to Li Chen regarding Expert Deposition Scheduling, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(LaFuze, William)
February 10, 2012 Filing 353 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant RIM's expert Mr. Daniel Jackson by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to exclude certain Jackson opinions, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Expert Report of Mr. Daniel Jackson, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Jackson Deposition Rough)(Eichmann, John)
February 10, 2012 Filing 352 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE '433 PATENT BASED ON THE "ON OR OFF" LIMITATION by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Steve Borgman, # 2 Exhibit 1 - United States Patent Number 6,021,433, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts from the Expert Report of James M. Knox, Ph.D. Regarding Infringement and Technical Benefits of 914 and 433 Patentsas to Defendant RIM, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts from the deposition transcript of Tim Von Kaenel, taken on August 19, 2011., # 5 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts from the 30(b)(6) deposition transcript of John Payne, taken on August 17, 2011., # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(LaFuze, William)
February 10, 2012 Filing 351 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Concerning Priority Dates of the Patents-In-Suit by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - US 6,021,433, # 3 Exhibit B - US 7,035,914, # 4 Exhibit C - Provisional App 60-010651, # 5 Exhibit D - Provisional App 60-014341, # 6 Exhibit E - Provisional App 60-014735, # 7 Exhibit F - Provisional App 60-026471, # 8 Exhibit G - US 6,167,426, # 9 Exhibit H - US 6,735,614, # 10 Exhibit I - Provisional App 60-030839, # 11 Exhibit J - 2010-07-22 SimpleAir response to defs' 1st set of common rogs (nos. 1 & 2), # 12 Exhibit K - 2011-09-23 SimpleAir Suppl Response to Common Rog. 1, # 13 Exhibit L - S0011772, # 14 Exhibit M - S0011862, # 15 Appendix N - S0011726, # 16 Exhibit O - S0011729, # 17 Exhibit P - S0001318, # 18 Exhibit Q - (Vol.1)_2011-08-17 Payne Vol. I Deposition Transcript (CAEO), # 19 Exhibit R - (Vol.2)_2011-08-18 Payne Vol. 2 Deposition Transcript, # 20 Exhibit S - 2011-08-19 von Kaenel Deposition Transcript (AEO), # 21 Exhibit T - Reexam No. 90-009904 2011-07-19 Office Action, # 22 Exhibit U - Reexam No. 90-009906 2011-07-19 Office Action, # 23 Exhibit V - Reexam No 90-009905 2011-06-20 Office Action, # 24 Exhibit W - Reexam No. 90-000631 2011-06-21 Office Action, # 25 Exhibit X - Reexam No. 90-009905 2011-08-22 Payne Decl, # 26 Exhibit Y - Reexam No. 95-000631 2011-08-22 Payne Decl, # 27 Exhibit Z - 2011-12-16 Office Action Reexam No. 09-009,905APPSIM00158486, # 28 Exhibit AA - 2012-01-14 Action Closing Prosectuion Reexam No. 09-000,631, # 29 Exhibit BB - 2011-12-23 James Knox Rebuttal report (ex.1, att 1-5) (CAEO))(Albritton, Eric)
February 10, 2012 Filing 350 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant Apple's expert Dr. M. Ray Perryman by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to exclude certain Perryman opinions, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Perryman Expert Report, # 3 Exhibit 2 - SimpleAir-Facebook Agreement, # 4 Exhibit 3 - 1'31'12 Perryman Deposition, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 1'16'12 Wicker Deposition)(Eichmann, John)
February 10, 2012 Filing 349 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant RIM's non-infringement expert Tim Halvorsen by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order to exclude certain Halvorsen opinions, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Halvorsen non-infringement report)(Eichmann, John)
February 10, 2012 Filing 348 SEALED MOTION to exclude certain expert opinions of Defendant Apple's expert Dr. Stephen Wicker by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order to exclude Wicker opinions, # 2 Exhibit Wicker depo testimony (vol. 1), # 3 Exhibit Wicker depo. testimony (vol. 2), # 4 Exhibit Opinion from Network-1 case)(Eichmann, John)
February 6, 2012 Filing 347 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST and DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Gillam, Harry)
February 6, 2012 Filing 346 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Compliance regarding the Exchange of trial exhibit lists and deposition designations (Albritton, Eric)
February 3, 2012 Filing 345 AMENDED ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint,, by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (LaFuze, William)
February 2, 2012 Filing 344 Apple Inc.'s Amended ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against SimpleAir, Inc. by Apple, Inc..(Albritton, Eric)
January 31, 2012 Filing 343 First Amended Trial Witness List by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
January 31, 2012 Filing 342 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David B Weaver on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Weaver, David)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting 226 Sealed Motion to amend answers filed by Defendants Research in Motion, Ltd., Research in Motion Corporation, and Apple Inc.s. Defendants motion to amend (Doc. No. 226) is GRANTED. Furthermore, Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days, unless otherwise agreed to by the parties, from the date of this order to complete additional discovery on Defendants licensing and exhaustion defense.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/31/12. (ehs, )
January 27, 2012 Filing 340 Trial Witness List by Apple, Inc.. (Albritton, Eric)
January 27, 2012 Filing 339 Trial Witness List by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Gillam, Harry)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER AMENDING DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - deadlines reset: ( Discovery due by 2/10/2012., Motions in Limine due by 3/22/2012., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/22/2012., Jury Selection set for 4/23/2012 02:00PM before Judge Michael H. Schneider IN MARSHALL, TX., Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2012 02:00 PM before Judge Michael H. Schneider IN MARSHALL.), Response to Dispositive Motions (including Daubert motions) due 3/2/12., For filing Dispositive motions and any other motions that may require a hearing (including Daubert motions) Motions terminated: 332 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 298 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,, 248 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control OrderJoint MOTION to Amend/Correct 298 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,, 248 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order filed by SimpleAir, Inc., Research In Motion Limited, Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/20/12. (ehs, )
January 17, 2012 Filing 337 NOTICE of Order from the USCA for the Federal Circuit Court as to Miscellaneous Docket No. 103 denying the petition for Writ of Mandamus (ehs, )
January 13, 2012 Filing 336 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited of Compliance with Mediation Deadline (Chen, Li)
January 13, 2012 Filing 335 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Compliance with Mediation Deadline (Albritton, Eric)
January 11, 2012 Filing 334 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. of Compliance with mediation deadline (Eichmann, John)
January 11, 2012 Filing 333 Trial Witness List by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
January 10, 2012 Filing 332 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 298 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,, 248 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
January 6, 2012 Filing 331 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Erin Greenfield Mehta for Research In Motion Corporation,Erin Greenfield Mehta for Research In Motion Limited. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-863) (ehs, )
January 2, 2012 Filing 330 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 313 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff's John Payne and Timothy Von Kaenel filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
December 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting 328 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply in Opposition. ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff SimpleAir to file a surreply in opposition to Apples Motion to Compel Additional Deposition Testimony is extended up to and including January 2, 2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/28/2011. (ch, )
December 27, 2011 Filing 328 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Sur-reply in opposition to Apple's Motion to Compel by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order extending time)(Eichmann, John)
December 15, 2011 Filing 327 SEALED REPLY re 313 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff's John Payne and Timothy Von Kaenel filed by Apple, Inc..(Albritton, Eric)
December 6, 2011 Filing 326 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 325 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Discovery Order form, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Discovery Order from PACID, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Discovery Order from Hopewell, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Discovery Order from Eolas, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Discovery Order from Microunity)(Eichmann, John)
December 6, 2011 Filing 325 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 313 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff's John Payne and Timothy Von Kaenel filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
December 2, 2011 Filing 324 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kalpesh K Shah for Research In Motion Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-837) (ehs, )
November 28, 2011 Filing 323 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 282 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATIONS (Plaintiff's sur-reply in Opposition to Motion to Stay) filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
November 26, 2011 Filing 322 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 273 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Plaintiff's sur-reply in opposition to RIM's motion to transfer) filed by SimpleAir, Inc. (Eichmann, John)
November 25, 2011 Filing 321 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 272 SEALED PATENT MOTION (Plaintiff's sur-reply in opposition to Motion to Sever) filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
November 23, 2011 Filing 319 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Parks for Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (APPROVED FEE PAID RECEIPT # 02-830) (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2011: # 1 Receipt) (poa, ). Modified on 11/29/2011 (poa, ).
November 21, 2011 Filing 320 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James M Dowd for Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-824(ch, )
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER - granting 303 Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Motions in limine due by 3/22/2012., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/22/2012., Jury Selection set for 4/23/2012 02:00PM before Judge Michael H. Schneider., Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2012 02:00 PM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Mediation to be completed 1/16/2012. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/18/2011. (ch, )
November 17, 2011 Filing 317 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 282 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATIONS filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited.(Chen, Li)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting 308 Sealed Patent Motion to Withdraw it Motion to Remove Confidential Designation (Dkt. 281).. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/17/2011. (ch, )
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting 302 Motion to Dismiss. ESPN Enterprises, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., and Disney Online are dismissed with prejudice with respect to the Licensed Products (as that term is defined by the parties Settlement and License Agreement) and without prejudice as to all other products, services, systems, or actions; The counterclaims of ESPN Enterprises, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., and Disney Online against SimpleAir are dismissed as moot. The parties shall each bear their own attorneys fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/17/2011. (ch, )
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting 304 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 282 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATIONS, 281 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO REMOVE CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION Responses due by 11/7/2011. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/17/2011. (ch, )
November 16, 2011 Filing 313 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel the Deposition of Plaintiff's John Payne and Timothy Von Kaenel by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Signed Discovery Order, # 2 Exhibit B - John Payne Transcript v.1 (CAEO), # 3 Exhibit C - John Payne Transcript v.2, # 4 Exhibit D - Mills Expert Report (Damages) (HCAEO), # 5 Exhibit E - Apple 30(b)(6) Depo Notice of SimpleAir, # 6 Exhibit F - T. von Kaenel Transcript (AEO), # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
November 15, 2011 Filing 312 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 272 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant's Joint Motion to Sever filed by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Expert Report re Apple, Inc., # 2 Exhibit B--Expert Report re RIM, # 3 Exhibit C--Supplemental Expert Report re Apple, Inc.)(LaFuze, William)
November 15, 2011 Filing 311 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 273 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion to Transfer Severed Case filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (LaFuze, William)
November 15, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED USING WRONG EVENT Document # 309 and 310, Sealed Patent Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 14, 2011 Filing 310 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED PATENT REPLY by Research In Motion Limited, Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation to 300 Sealed Response to Motion filed by Research In Motion Limited, Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Expert Report re Apple, Inc., # 2 Exhibit B--Expert Report re RIM, # 3 Exhibit C--Supplemental Expert Report re Apple, Inc.)(LaFuze, William) Modified on 11/15/2011 (ch, ).
November 14, 2011 Filing 309 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED PATENT REPLY by Research In Motion Limited, Research In Motion Corporation to 301 Sealed Response to Motion filed by Research In Motion Limited, Research In Motion Corporation. (LaFuze, William) Modified on 11/15/2011 (ch, ).
November 10, 2011 Filing 308 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Remove Confidential Designation by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
November 9, 2011 Filing 307 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Notice of Withdrawal of Dkt 281 Motion to Remove Confidential Designation. (Chen, Li) Modified on 11/9/2011 (ch, ).
November 9, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER THE WRONG EVENT Document # 307, Seaked Document - Notice of Withdrawal. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 7, 2011 Filing 306 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 282 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATIONS filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eichmann declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ex parte statistics, # 3 Exhibit Ex parte statistics)(Eichmann, John)
November 7, 2011 Filing 305 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 281 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO REMOVE CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
November 3, 2011 Filing 304 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 282 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATIONS, 281 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO REMOVE CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 3, 2011 Filing 303 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 298 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,, 248 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
November 2, 2011 Filing 302 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims Asserted between SimpleAir and the Disney Defendants by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order to dismiss Disney Defendants)(Eichmann, John)
November 2, 2011 Filing 301 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 273 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion to Transfer Severed Case filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
November 1, 2011 Filing 300 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 272 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant's Joint Motion to Sever filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Eichmann declaration)(Eichmann, John)
October 28, 2011 Filing 299 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen E Edwards on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Edwards, Stephen)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 298 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - granting 271 and 280 Motions to Amend Docket Control Order. Motions in limine due by 3/22/2012., Jury Selection set for 4/23/2012 02:00PM before Judge Michael H. Schneider., Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2012 02:00 PM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Mediation to be completed 1/16/2012. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/27/2011. (ch, )
October 27, 2011 Filing 297 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jacob S Oyloe for Research In Motion Corporation,Jacob S Oyloe for Research In Motion Limited. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-774) (ehs, )
October 27, 2011 Filing 296 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael R Heyison for Research In Motion Corporation,Michael R Heyison for Research In Motion Limited. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-774)(ehs, )
October 27, 2011 Filing 295 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark G Matuschak for Research In Motion Corporation,Mark G Matuschak for Research In Motion Limited.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-774) (ehs, )
October 26, 2011 Filing 294 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian P Johnson on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Johnson, Brian)
October 26, 2011 Filing 293 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Seth M Jessee for Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-774 (ch, )
October 26, 2011 Filing 292 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel V Williams for Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-774 (ch, )
October 26, 2011 Filing 291 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Donald R Steinberg for Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-774 (ch, )
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting 274 Motion to Amend docket control order. SimpleAirs expert report regarding damages as to Defendant RIM October 14, 2011. SimpleAirs expert report regarding infringement as to Defendant Research in Motion October 17, 2011. RIMs rebuttal report regarding damages November 7, 2011. RIMs rebuttal report regarding infringement November 10, 2011. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/26/11. (ehs, )
October 24, 2011 Filing 289 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Reply Letter Brief to Docket No. 277)(Albritton, Eric)
October 24, 2011 Filing 288 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to the Court in Reply to Plaintiff SimpleAir's Response (DKT 283) to RIM's Letter Brief regarding a Motion for partial summary judgment of license/exhaustion (DKT 255))(LaFuze, William)
October 21, 2011 Filing 287 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Witness List by Apple, Inc.. (Albritton, Eric)
October 21, 2011 Filing 286 Trial Witness List by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Nester, Brian)
October 18, 2011 Filing 285 Sealed Document - Corrected Notice of non-opposition to Letter brief of Defendant RIM (dkt. #256) - correcting Dkt # 278 (Eichmann, John)
October 17, 2011 Filing 284 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Attachment - Defendants' Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,167,426, and 6,735,614) (Chen, Li)
October 17, 2011 Filing 283 Sealed Document (Notice of submission of letter brief in response to RIM filing (docket #255)) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Responsive letter brief re dkt. #255)(Eichmann, John)
October 17, 2011 Filing 282 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO STAY PENDING REEXAMINATIONS by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
October 17, 2011 Filing 281 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 316***Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTION TO REMOVE CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li) Modified on 11/17/2011 (ch, ).
October 17, 2011 Filing 280 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 119 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, 243 Notice of Hearing - Motion to Amend the Court's Docket Control Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
October 17, 2011 Filing 279 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File a Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Concerning Conception and Priority Dates of the Patents-in-Suit)(Albritton, Eric)
October 17, 2011 Filing 278 Sealed Document (Notice of non-opposition to Letter brief of Defendant RIM (dkt. #256)). (Eichmann, John)
October 17, 2011 Filing 277 Sealed Notice of Submission of Responsive Letter Brief (response to Dkt. #253) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's responsive letter brief (filed in response to dkt. #253))(Eichmann, John)
October 17, 2011 Filing 276 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants' Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File a Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement)(LaFuze, William)
October 17, 2011 Filing 275 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph A Micallef on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Micallef, Joseph)
October 15, 2011 Filing 274 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order as to certain expert deadlines between SimpleAir and RIM by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order to amend DCO)(Eichmann, John)
October 14, 2011 Filing 273 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion to Transfer Severed Case by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of B. Parvis, # 2 Affidavit of Li Chen in Support of RIM Motion to Transfer Severed Case, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Chen Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Chen Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Chen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Chen Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Chen Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 1 to Motion to Transfer, # 9 Exhibit 2 to Motion to Transfer, # 10 Exhibit 3 to Motion to Transfer, # 11 Exhibit 4 to Motion to Transfer, # 12 Exhibit 5 to Motion to Transfer, # 13 Exhibit 6 to Motion to Transfer, # 14 Exhibit 7 to Motion to Transfer, # 15 Exhibit 8 to Motion to Transfer, # 16 Exhibit 9 to Motion to Transfer, # 17 Exhibit 10 to Motion to Transfer, # 18 Exhibit 11 to Motion to Transfer, # 19 Exhibit 12 to Motion to Transfer, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
October 14, 2011 Filing 272 SEALED PATENT MOTION Defendant's Joint Motion to Sever by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit B Parvis in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
October 14, 2011 Filing 271 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Li)
October 14, 2011 Filing 270 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement Based on License or, Alternatively, Patent Exhaustion)(Albritton, Eric)
October 14, 2011 Filing 269 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Justin Singh for Apple, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-751)(ehs, )
October 13, 2011 Filing 268 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott M Border on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Border, Scott)
October 13, 2011 Filing 267 NOTICE from the USCA Fed Cir setting deadline for SimpleAir Inc to respond. Deadline set for 10/20/11 (ehs, )
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting 262 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. SimpleAirs expert report regarding infringement as to Defendant Apple deadline reset to October 10, 2011 SimpleAirs expert reports regarding infringement and damages as to Defendant Research in Motion deadline reset to October 10, 2011. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/12/11. (ehs, )
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting 260 Motion to Stay. All discovery and other scheduled deadlines relating to the claims and counterclaims between SimpleAir, Inc. and the Disney defendants, are hereby stayed pending a motion by one or both of the foregoing parties to lift the stay. No discovery or deadlines relating to SimpleAirs claims against the other defendants, or such defendants counterclaims against SimpleAir, are affected by this Order.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/12/11. (ehs, )
October 8, 2011 Filing 264 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 226 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EITHER AMENDED ANSWERS OR SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
October 7, 2011 Filing 263 Trial Witness List by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
October 7, 2011 Filing 262 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order (certain expert deadlines) by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order amending certain expert report deadlines)(Eichmann, John)
October 7, 2011 Filing 261 NOTICE from USCA for the Federal Circuit assigning Petition for writ of mandamus MISC NO. 103 In Re: Apple Inc (ehs, )
October 7, 2011 Filing 260 Joint MOTION to Stay as between Plaintiff and the Disney Defendants by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order to stay as between SimpleAir and the Disney defendants)(Eichmann, John)
October 6, 2011 Filing 259 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Woodrow DeVries on behalf of Apple, Inc. (DeVries, Michael)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Schneider for all further proceedings. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/4/11. (mrm, )
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10-3-11. (jml, )
October 3, 2011 Filing 256 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement)(LaFuze, William)
October 3, 2011 Filing 255 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement)(LaFuze, William)
October 3, 2011 Filing 254 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 253 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed (Certificate of Authority to File Under Seal).(Albritton, Eric)
October 3, 2011 Filing 253 Sealed Letter Brief filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Apple, Inc., Disney Online, ESPN Enterprises, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement)(Albritton, Eric)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting 251 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 226 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EITHER AMENDED ANSWERS OR SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS Responses due by 10/7/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/30/2011. (ch, )
September 29, 2011 Filing 251 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 226 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EITHER AMENDED ANSWERS OR SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting 249 Motion to Dismiss. SimpleAirs claims against Handmark and Handmarks counterclaims against SimpleAir in this action are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/28/2011. (ch, )
September 21, 2011 Filing 249 Joint MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice claims between SimpleAir and Defendant Handmark by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order of dismissal as to Handmark)(Eichmann, John)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting 246 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/20/2011. (ch, )
September 19, 2011 Filing 247 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 226 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EITHER AMENDED ANSWERS OR SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS filed by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Emails re Production of Facebook License, # 2 Exhibit B - SimpleAir PR 3-1 Infrin...(Appx A, Table A, Appx B, Appx C), # 3 Exhibit C - Provider Agmts, # 4 Exhibit D - 2011-2-11 Callender Transcript - FULL (highlighting), # 5 Exhibit E - 2011-03-10 Bleau Transcript (highlighting), # 6 Exhibit F - 11-08-26 Bell Dep. Tr. (Rough), # 7 Exhibit G - 11-08-30 Davey Dep. Tr. (Rough), # 8 Exhibit H (SEALED Excerpt from Onofre DeMelo deposition), # 9 Exhibit I (SEALED Excerpts from Kushnir, Odobas, Arora, Rudenko depositions (rough transcript)), # 10 Exhibit J - Steve Sinclair 30b6 Dep Tr (2011-7-19) (highlighting), # 11 Exhibit K (SEALED Excerpt from Kevin Williams deposition), # 12 Exhibit L (SEALED Excerpt from Bhauvuk Kaul deposition), # 13 Exhibit M - 2011-9-15 Email re scheduling depos, # 14 Exhibit N - 2011-09-12 Apple's 4th rogs (Nos 1-3) and Ex A, # 15 Exhibit O (SEALED Excerpt from RIM's 2011 09 14 non-infringement contentions))Albritton, Eric)
September 16, 2011 Filing 246 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 119 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, (Motion to Amend DCO - expert deadlines) by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 proposed order to amend DCO)(Eichmann, John)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting 244 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to SimpleAirs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Leave to Amend or Supplement Their Answers (Dkt. 238). Responses due by 9/19/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/14/11. (ehs, )
September 12, 2011 Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 238 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaFuze, William)
September 12, 2011 Filing 243 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection RESET for 12/1/2011, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (delat, )
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting 241 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to SimpleAirs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Leave to Amend or Supplement Their Answers (Dkt. 238). Responses due by 9/13/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/12/11. (ehs, )
September 9, 2011 Filing 241 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 238 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaFuze, William)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - The court held a Markman hearing on June 17, 2011. After considering the submissions and the arguments of counsel, the court issues the following order concerning the claim construction issues. The court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the patents-in-suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/2/2011. (ch, )
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting 235 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney R Whitney Winston terminated as counsel for Disney Online, ESPN Enterprises, Inc., and American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/2/11. (ehs, )
September 1, 2011 Filing 238 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 237 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR ***SEALED PATENT (Corrected) RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 226 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EITHER AMENDED ANSWERS OR SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John) Modified on 9/1/2011 (ehs, ).
September 1, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 237 , Response. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 238 *** (ehs, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 237 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 238 ***SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 226 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EITHER AMENDED ANSWERS OR SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John) Modified on 9/1/2011 (ehs, ).
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting 234 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 226 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EITHER AMENDED ANSWERS OR SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS Responses due by 8/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/31/2011. (ch, )
August 31, 2011 Filing 235 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Disney Online, ESPN Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winston, R)
August 30, 2011 Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 226 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EITHER AMENDED ANSWERS OR SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting 231 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Efren Garcia terminated as Counsel for Research In Motion Ltd. and Research In MotionCorporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/11. (ehs, )
August 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting 230 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Dowling Hornberger terminated as Counsel for Research In Motion Ltd. and Research In Motion Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/11. (ehs, )
August 18, 2011 Filing 231 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Research In Motion Ltd. and Research In Motion Corporation by Efren Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Garcia, Efren) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2011: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
August 18, 2011 Filing 230 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Research In Motion Ltd. and Research In Motion Corporation by David D. Hornberger. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hornberger, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2011: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting 225 Motion to Amend/Correct. The fact discovery deadline is hereby extended to 9/9/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/15/2011. (ch, )
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting 155 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/15/2011. (ch, )
August 12, 2011 Filing 227 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 226 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EITHER AMENDED ANSWERS OR SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Amended RIM Answer, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Redlined Amended RIM Answer, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Supplemental RIM Answer, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Apple Amended Answer, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Apple Redlined Answer, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Apple Supplemental Answer, # 7 Exhibit 7 - LecTec Order dated 01.04.2011)(LaFuze, William)
August 12, 2011 Filing 226 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EITHER AMENDED ANSWERS OR SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS by Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8 - AEO--SimpleAir-Facebook Settlement and License Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 9 - SimpleAir Second Set of Interrogatories to RIM, # 3 Exhibit 10 - SimpleAir email dated 07.21.2011, # 4 Exhibit 11 - SimpleAir email dated 08.03.2011 (REDACTED), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(LaFuze, William)
August 11, 2011 Filing 225 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct CERTAIN DEADLINES IN THE COURTS DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
July 19, 2011 Filing 224 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Gail Grau on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Grau, Lauren)
July 18, 2011 Filing 223 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ajeet P Pai on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Pai, Ajeet)
July 18, 2011 Filing 222 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Joshua Tobin on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Tobin, David)
July 18, 2011 Filing 221 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Patrick Wisse on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Wisse, John)
July 18, 2011 Filing 220 REPORT of Mediation by Harlan Martin. Mediation result: Continuing to work wtih the parties to reach settlement(Martin, Harlan)
July 13, 2011 Filing 219 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jared D Edgar for Apple, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-616)(ehs, )
July 5, 2011 Filing 218 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MARKMAN HEARING held on 6/17/11 before Judge Chad Everingham. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kimberly Julian, Sunbelt Reporting,Telephone number: (713) 667-0763. (148 Pages)NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2011. (tja, )
June 20, 2011 Filing 216 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. (Notice of Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant RIM's proposed compromise constructions) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (RIM's proposed compromise constructions))(Eichmann, John)
June 20, 2011 Filing 215 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. re 191 Claim Construction Brief (SimpleAir's Markman presentation - filing of slides) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Section 1 of SimpleAir's Markman presentation), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Section 2 of SimpleAir's Markman presentation), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Section 3 of SimpleAir's Markman presentation), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Section 4 of SimpleAir's Markman presentation), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Section 5 of SimpleAir's Markman presentation), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Section 6 of SimpleAir's Markman presentation), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Section 7 of SimpleAir's Markman presentation), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Section 8 of SimpleAir's Markman presentation), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Section 9 of SimpleAir's Markman presentation), # 10 Exhibit R (Rebuttal section of SimpleAir's Markman presentation))(Eichmann, John)
June 17, 2011 Filing 217 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Markman Hearing held on 6/17/2011. (Court Reporter Kim Julian, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
June 16, 2011 Filing 214 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 191 Claim Construction Brief.. (Eichmann, John)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 98 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on June 15, 2011. (delat, )
June 15, 2011 Filing 212 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Scott Dovel on behalf of SimpleAir, Inc. (Dovel, Gregory)
June 14, 2011 Filing 211 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Rochelle Coleman on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Coleman, Debra)
June 13, 2011 Filing 210 NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing RESET for 6/17/2011, 01:00 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (delat, )
June 9, 2011 Filing 209 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. of Submission of Technology Tutorial (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 8, 2011 Filing 208 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART [PR 4-5(d)] (as submitted on June 7, 2011) by SimpleAir, Inc. (Eichmann, John)
June 8, 2011 Filing 207 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Apple Inc's Notice of Submission of Defendants Technology Tutorial (Albritton, Eric)
June 7, 2011 Filing 206 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-5(d) (Albritton, Eric)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting 185 Motion to Dismiss Defendant The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. without prejudice. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/3/11. (ehs, )
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 203 Motion to Amend docket control order. Deadline for submission of background technology tutorial dueJune 8, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/3/11. (ehs, )
June 2, 2011 Filing 203 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 119 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, Unopposed Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nester, Brian)
June 2, 2011 Filing 202 NOTICE of Hearing: Markman Hearing RESET for 6/17/2011, 09:00 AM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (delat, )
May 27, 2011 Filing 201 REPLY to 191 Claim Construction Brief filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 29: Deposition of Dr. Harry Bims, # 2 Exhibit 30: additional portions of '433 prosecution history, # 3 Exhibit 31: additional portions of '914 prosecution history)(Eichmann, John)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting 199 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have up to twenty (20) pages in total for its reply claim construction brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/26/2011. (ch, )
May 25, 2011 Filing 199 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (up to 20 pages for claim construction reply brief) by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order granting additional pages for reply brief)(Eichmann, John)
May 18, 2011 Filing 198 Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief to 191 Claim Construction Brief filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Apple, Inc., Disney Online, ESPN Enterprises, Inc., Handmark, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Affidavit Declaration of Dr Bims)(Albritton, Eric)
May 17, 2011 Filing 197 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. re 186 Notice (Other) Filing of Plaintiff SimpleAir's Revision to Parties' P.R. 4-3 statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Revised Exhibit A to Parties' P.R. 4-3 Statement)(Eichmann, John)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting 195 Motion to Amend docket control order. Discovery deadline-claims construction issues extended to 5/24/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/11/11. (ehs, )
May 10, 2011 Filing 195 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 119 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Amending DCO)(Eichmann, John)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 190 Motion for Leave to File Excess Page Limits on Claim Construction Briefing. Plaintiff shall have up to an additional ten (10) pages for its opening claim construction brief, and up to an additional five (5) pages for its reply claim construction brief. Defendants shall have up to an additional twelve (12) pages for their responsive claim construction brief.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/21/11. (ehs, )
April 21, 2011 Filing 193 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 191 Claim Construction Brief.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2011 Filing 192 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 191 Claim Construction Brief.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 433 patent, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - '914 patent, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - '426 patent, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - '614 patent, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - McGraw Hill (1994) definitions, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - IEEE (1996) definitions, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - MSFT Computer Dictionary (1999) definitions, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Random House Computer (1999) definitions, # 9 Exhibit Exh. 13 - Modern Dictionary of Electronics (1999) definitions, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - IEEE (2000) definitions, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - McGrawHill Computer (2003) definitions, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 16 - MSFT Computer (2002) definitions, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 17 - Webster New World Computer (2003) definitions, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 18 - McGraw Hill (2003) definitions, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 19 - Wiley Electrical (2004) definitions, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 20 - American Heritage (1994) definitions, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 21 - Random House (2001) definitions, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 22 - CDF specification, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 23 - C.V. of Dr. James Knox, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 24 - '621 patent to Nawaz, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 25 - '454 patent to Hobbs, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 26 - Hauswirth article (1999), # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 27 - Kapyla articled (1998), # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 28 - '088 patent to Bezaire)(Eichmann, John)
April 20, 2011 Filing 191 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dr. James Knox in support of Plaintiff's opening claim construction brief)(Eichmann, John)
April 19, 2011 Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Claim Construction Briefing by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting 188 Motion to Amend docket control order. Plaintiff complies with P.R. 4-5(a) April 20, 2011 Defendants comply with P.R. 4-5(b) May 18, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/12/11. (ehs, )
April 11, 2011 Filing 188 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 119 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, (Motion to Amend Docket Control Order) by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Amend DCO)(Eichmann, John)
April 6, 2011 Filing 187 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 186 Notice (Other).. (Eichmann, John)
April 6, 2011 Filing 186 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. (filing of Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement under P.R. 4-3) (Eichmann, John)
March 6, 2011 Filing 185 Joint MOTION to Dismiss claims and counterclaims asserted between Plaintiff SimpleAir & Defendant The Weather Channel by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting 183 Apple Inc.'s Motion to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on March 3, 2011. (jml)
March 2, 2011 Filing 183 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 119 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, Unopposed Motion to the Amend Docket Control Order as to PR 4-1 & PR 4-2 Deadlines by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
February 24, 2011 Filing 182 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sarah Forney for Apple, Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-335) (ehs, )
February 23, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited to the Court Regarding Disputes Over Privileged Documents or Information (Chen, Li)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 177 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Facebook, Inc. without prejudice. All claims asserted in this suit by Plaintiff SimpleAir against Defendant Facebook are hereby dismissed with prejudice, and all counterclaims asserted by Facebook are hereby dismissed without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all costs are assessed against the party who incurred them.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/10/11. (ehs, )
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting 178 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted between plaintiff and dft AWS Convergence, are hereby dismissed with prejudice as follows. All costs are assessed against the party who incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/10/2011. (ch, )
February 7, 2011 Filing 178 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims and Counterclaims between Plaintiff SimpleAir & Defendant AWS Convergence by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
February 7, 2011 Filing 177 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Claims and Counterclaims as Between Plaintiff SimpleAir and Defendant Facebook by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/21/11. (ehs, )
December 20, 2010 Filing 175 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by ABC, Inc., Apple, Inc., Disney Online, ESPN Enterprises, Inc., Handmark, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Agreed Protective Order))(Chen, Li)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting 173 Motion to Stay. All discovery and other scheduled deadlines relating to the claims and counterclaims between SimpleAir, Inc. and The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc., are hereby stayed pending a motion by one or both of the foregoing parties to lift the stay. No discovery or deadlines relating to SimpleAirs claims against the other defendants, or such defendants counterclaims against SimpleAir, are affected by this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/1/2010. (ch, )
November 29, 2010 Filing 173 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation as Between Plaintiff SimpleAir and Defendant The Weather Channel by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 170 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Apple Inc Surreply to SimpleAir Inc Motion to Compel Apple to respond to Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/27/2010. (ch, )
October 26, 2010 Filing 171 Sealed Document. APPLE INC.S SURREPLY TO SIMPLEAIR, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT APPLE INC. TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Albritton, Eric)
October 26, 2010 Filing 170 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Apple Inc's Unopposed Motion for Leave to file under seal its surreply to SimpleAir Inc's Motion to Compel by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
October 26, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 169 submitted by Apple, Inc.. NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
October 25, 2010 Filing 169 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. APPLE INC.S SURREPLY TO SIMPLEAIR, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT APPLE INC. TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 10/26/2010 (ch, ).
October 15, 2010 Filing 168 REPLY to Response to Motion re 155 MOTION to Compel Defendant Apple to respond to interrogatories filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Eichmann, John)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting 163 Motion to Stay. All discovery and other scheduled deadlines relating to the claims and counterclaims between SimpleAir, Inc. and AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc. are hereby stayed pending a motion by one or both of the foregoing parties to lift the stay. No discovery or deadlines relating to SimpleAirs claims against the other defendants, or such defendants counterclaims against SimpleAir, are affected by this Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/15/2010. (ch, )
October 5, 2010 Filing 166 RESPONSE to Motion re 155 MOTION to Compel Defendant Apple to respond to interrogatories filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Albritton, Eric)
October 5, 2010 Filing 165 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of SimpleAir, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting 162 Motion for Extension of Time to File respond to interrogatories. Responses due by 10/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/4/10. (ehs, )
October 1, 2010 Filing 163 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation as Between Plaintiff SimpleAir and Defendant AWS Convergence by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
September 30, 2010 Filing 162 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 155 MOTION to Compel Defendant Apple to respond to interrogatories Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 160 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dft Apple Inc deadline is extended to 10/1/2010 to respond to SimpleAir's motion to compel dft Apple to respond to interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/27/2010. (ch, )
September 24, 2010 Filing 160 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
September 24, 2010 Filing 159 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY******Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 9/24/2010 (ehs, ).
September 14, 2010 Filing 158 NOTICE by Handmark, Inc. of Compliance of Discovery Order (Day, Graham)
September 14, 2010 Filing 157 NOTICE of Disclosure by The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. (Additional Disclosures) (Sayles, Richard)
September 13, 2010 Filing 156 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Compliance of Discovery Order (Keefe, Heidi)
September 8, 2010 Filing 155 MOTION to Compel Defendant Apple to respond to interrogatories by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Jeff Eichmann, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6)(Eichmann, John)
August 27, 2010 Filing 154 NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Apple Inc Notice of Disclosure regarding PR 3-3 and PR 3-4 (Albritton, Eric)
August 27, 2010 Filing 153 NOTICE by Handmark, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4(b) (Day, Graham)
August 27, 2010 Filing 152 NOTICE by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Chen, Li)
August 27, 2010 Filing 151 NOTICE of Disclosure by The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. Re: P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Sayles, Richard)
August 26, 2010 Filing 150 NOTICE by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Disney Online, ESPN Enterprises, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Caracappa, John)
August 26, 2010 Filing 149 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Compliance P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Keefe, Heidi)
August 26, 2010 Filing 148 NOTICE by Handmark, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Day, Graham)
August 19, 2010 Filing 147 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Adam R Alper on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Alper, Adam)
August 12, 2010 Filing 146 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven R Borgman on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Borgman, Steven)
August 9, 2010 Filing 145 NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Apple Inc. certifies it complied with Paragraph 1 of the Courts Discovery Order (Albritton, Eric)
August 9, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 133, 134, 135, Notice of Disclosure. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (SEE REFILED DOCUMENTS 141, 142, 143)(ch, )
August 6, 2010 Filing 144 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. (Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures) (Eichmann, John)
August 6, 2010 Filing 143 NOTICE of Disclosure by ESPN Enterprises, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Patterson, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2010 Filing 142 NOTICE of Disclosure by Disney Online Initial Disclosures (Patterson, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2010 Filing 141 NOTICE of Disclosure by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Patterson, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2010 Filing 140 NOTICE of Disclosure by The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. re: Initial Disclosures (Sayles, Richard)
August 6, 2010 Filing 139 NOTICE of Disclosure by Facebook, Inc. (Keyes, Melissa)
August 6, 2010 Filing 138 NOTICE of Disclosure by Handmark, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Day, Graham)
August 6, 2010 Filing 137 NOTICE of Disclosure by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (LaFuze, William)
August 6, 2010 Filing 136 NOTICE of Disclosure by AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
August 6, 2010 Filing 135 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Disclosure by ESPN Enterprises, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Patterson, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/9/2010 (ch, ).
August 6, 2010 Filing 134 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Disclosure by Disney Online Initial Disclosures (Patterson, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/9/2010 (ch, ).
August 6, 2010 Filing 133 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Disclosure by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Patterson, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/9/2010 (ch, ).
August 3, 2010 Filing 132 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David T Pritikin for Research In Motion Corporation,David T Pritikin for Research In Motion Limited. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5532) (ehs, )
August 2, 2010 Filing 131 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Christopher Wheeler on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Wheeler, Kevin)
July 29, 2010 Filing 130 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Ralph Nester on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Nester, Brian)
July 29, 2010 Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Li Chen on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Chen, Li)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 127 Motion to Amend docket control order. Defendants comply with PR 3-3 and 3-4 extended to 8/26/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
July 23, 2010 Filing 127 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Unopposed Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
July 23, 2010 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Graham Day on behalf of Handmark, Inc. (Day, Graham)
June 21, 2010 Filing 125 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Eichmann, John)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 123 Motion to Amend docket control order. Plaintiff complies with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 June 21, 2010. Defendants comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 August 18, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/17/10. (ehs, )
June 16, 2010 Filing 123 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 119 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 121 Motion to Amend/Correct. Docket Control Order is amended as follows herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/15/2010. (ch, )
June 14, 2010 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 119 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
June 3, 2010 Filing 120 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kimberly A Mottley for AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5398. (ch, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2011., Joinder of Parties due by 11/17/2010., Markman Hearing set for 6/15/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Motions due by 11/14/2011., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/14/2011., Jury Selection set for 12/5/2011 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Pretrial Conference set for 11/29/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/1/10. (ehs, )
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/1/10. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 Filing 117 Submission of Agreed Discovery and Docket Control Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order)(Albritton, Eric)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 114 Motion for Extension of Time to File the Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Deadline extended to 5/28/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/25/10. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 Filing 115 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 98 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A) filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Eichmann, John)
May 21, 2010 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER assigning case to Judge Everingham by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/11/10. (ehs, )
May 11, 2010 Filing 112 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (ehs, )
May 10, 2010 Filing 111 REPLY to Response to Motion re 98 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A) filed by AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Apple, Inc., Disney Online, ESPN Enterprises, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Handmark, Inc., The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Mark Bentley Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J)(Albritton, Eric)
May 7, 2010 Filing 110 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of SimpleAir, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon)
May 7, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/7/10. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders by May 21, 2010. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
May 7, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 5/7/10. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders by 5/21/10. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (delat)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 108 Motion for Extension of Time to FileReply in support of its motion to transfer venue. Deadline extended to 5/10/10, Pltf's Sur-Reply is due on 5/21/10. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/5/10. (ehs, )
April 30, 2010 Filing 108 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File modify the briefing schedule for the Motion to Transfer Venue by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
April 28, 2010 Filing 107 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert David Daniel on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Daniel, Robert)
April 26, 2010 Filing 106 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Alan Cleveland on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Cleveland, Timothy)
April 22, 2010 Filing 105 NOTICE by SimpleAir, Inc. re 104 Response to Motion,, Notice of Errata (Eichmann, John)
April 21, 2010 Filing 104 RESPONSE to Motion re 98 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A) filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(Eichmann, John)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 Unopposed Motion of Plaintiff SimpleAir to Modify the Briefing Schedule for Dfts Motion to Transfer Venue 102 . Parties shall abide by the following briefing schedule herein. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/19/2010. (ch, )
April 16, 2010 Filing 102 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule for Dft 98 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A)Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A) by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John) Modified on 4/16/2010 (ch, ).
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 99 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and dft Handango are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/16/2010. (ch, )
April 15, 2010 Filing 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Efren Garcia on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Garcia, Efren)
April 14, 2010 Filing 99 Joint MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice claims between SimpleAir and Handango by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eichmann, John)
March 31, 2010 Filing 98 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A) by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Melissa Keyes, # 2 Exhibit A to Keyes Dec, # 3 Exhibit B to Keyes Dec, # 4 Exhibit C to Keyes Dec, # 5 Exhibit D to Keyes Dec, # 6 Exhibit E to Keyes Dec, # 7 Exhibit F to Keyes Dec, # 8 Exhibit G to Keyes Dec, # 9 Exhibit H to Keyes Dec, # 10 Exhibit I to Keyes Dec, # 11 Exhibit J to Keyes Dec, # 12 Affidavit Marsha Reed, # 13 Affidavit Mark Bentley, # 14 Affidavit Daniel O'Connell, # 15 Affidavit James Hanford, # 16 Affidavit Anthony Waggoner, # 17 Affidavit Craig Clark, # 18 Affidavit Terry Carlton, # 19 Affidavit Pat Clark, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Keyes, Melissa)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER - Status Conference set for 5/7/2010 10:10 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Honorable Chad Everingham. Parties shall submit proposed docket control order and discovery orders on 5/21/2010. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/30/2010. (ch, )
January 19, 2010 Filing 96 ANSWER to 53 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Handmark by SimpleAir, Inc..(Eichmann, John)
January 19, 2010 Filing 95 ANSWER to 83 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Handango by SimpleAir, Inc..(Eichmann, John)
January 19, 2010 Filing 94 ANSWER to 54 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of AWS Convergence by SimpleAir, Inc..(Eichmann, John)
January 19, 2010 Filing 93 ANSWER to 64 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Facebook, Inc. by SimpleAir, Inc..(Eichmann, John)
January 19, 2010 Filing 92 ANSWER to 59 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 81 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim, ANSWER to 59 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 81 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by SimpleAir, Inc..(Eichmann, John)
January 19, 2010 Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ESPN Enterprises, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Walt Disney Company, Corporate Parent The Hearst Corporation, Corporate Parent ESPN, Inc. for ESPN Enterprises, Inc.. (Patterson, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2010 Filing 90 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Disney Online identifying Corporate Parent The Walt Disney Company, Corporate Parent Disney Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent ABC Enterprises, Inc. for Disney Online. (Patterson, Jeffrey)
January 19, 2010 Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Walt Disney Company, Corporate Parent ABC Holding Company Inc. for American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Patterson, Jeffrey)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 84 Motion re: Defendants AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc.s, The Weather Channel Interactive Inc.s, Research in Motion Corporations, Research in Motion Limiteds, Facebook, Inc.s, and Handmark, Inc.s Answers to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint. The answers to Plaintiff SimpleAirs original Complaint as filed by AWS, The Weather Channel, RIM, Facebook and Handmark on December 7, 2009 shall serve as their respective answers to SimpleAir's First Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that AWS, The Weather Channel, RIM, Facebook and Handmark stipulate that their respective answers to SimpleAir's First Amended Complaint shall be considered filed on December 28, 2009, and that the last day to file SimpleAir's responses to our respective counterclaims shall be calculated from that day. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/5/10. (ehs, )
December 31, 2009 Filing 87 ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint,, by ESPN Enterprises, Inc..(Patterson, Jeffrey)
December 31, 2009 Filing 86 ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint,, by Disney Online.(Patterson, Jeffrey)
December 31, 2009 Filing 85 ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint,, by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc..(Patterson, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2009 Filing 84 Agreed MOTION the Court accept the respective answers of defendants AWS, The Weather Channel, RIM, Facebook and Handmark to SimpleAir's First Amended Complaint to have been filed on December 28, 2009 re 56 Answer to Complaint, 53 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 54 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 64 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 63 Answer to Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
December 29, 2009 Filing 83 Defendant Handango's ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint,, And, COUNTERCLAIM against SimpleAir, Inc. by Handango, Inc..(Reger, Thomas)
December 29, 2009 Filing 82 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Kenton Wernli on behalf of Handango, Inc. (Wernli, Matthew)
December 28, 2009 Filing 81 Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to 72 Amended Complaint,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against SimpleAir, Inc. by Apple, Inc..(Albritton, Eric)
December 16, 2009 Filing 80 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Adam R Alper for Apple, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5090. (ch, )
December 16, 2009 Filing 79 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan J Casamiquela for Apple, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5090. (ch, )
December 16, 2009 Filing 78 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory S Arovas for Apple, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5090. (ch, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 76 Motion to Dismiss Defendant The Walt Disney Company be dismissed without prejudice from this action with all attorneys fees and costs of court being borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/16/09. (ehs, )
December 15, 2009 Filing 76 ***REPLACES # 75 ***Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by The Walt Disney Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/15/2009 (ch, ).
December 15, 2009 Filing 75 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by The Walt Disney Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Patterson, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/15/2009 (ch, ).
December 15, 2009 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R Whitney Winston on behalf of ESPN Enterprises, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Disney Online (Winston, R)
December 15, 2009 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Caracappa on behalf of ESPN Enterprises, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Disney Online (Caracappa, John)
December 15, 2009 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 75 submitted by The Walt Disney Company. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 72 AMENDED COMPLAINT for patent infringement (substituting entities) against ESPN Enterprises, Inc., American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Handango, Inc., Handmark, Inc., AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc., The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc., Apple, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited, Facebook, Inc., Disney Online, filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A ('433 patent), # 2 Exhibit B - '914 patent, # 3 Exhibit C - '426 patent, # 4 Exhibit D - '614 patent)(Eichmann, John)
December 11, 2009 Filing 71 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven M Bauer for AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5079 (ch, )
December 11, 2009 Filing 70 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph A Capraro, Jr for AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5079. (ch, )
December 9, 2009 Filing 69 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Handmark, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
December 8, 2009 Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
December 8, 2009 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
December 8, 2009 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (LaFuze, William)
December 7, 2009 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Facebook, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
December 7, 2009 Filing 64 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against SimpleAir, Inc. by Facebook, Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
December 7, 2009 Filing 63 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited.(LaFuze, William)
December 7, 2009 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Handango, Inc. (Reger, Thomas)
December 7, 2009 Filing 61 ORIGINAL ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS to 1 Complaint, by Handango, Inc..(Reger, Thomas) Modified on 12/8/2009 (ch, ).
December 7, 2009 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent TWCC Holding Corp. for The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc.. (Sayles, Richard)
December 7, 2009 Filing 59 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against SimpleAir, Inc. by Apple, Inc..(Albritton, Eric)
December 7, 2009 Filing 58 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ESPN, Inc..( Patterson, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2009 Filing 57 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Walt Disney Company.( Patterson, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2009 Filing 56 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc..(Sayles, Richard)
December 7, 2009 Filing 55 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ABC, Inc..( Patterson, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2009 Filing 54 AWS Convergence Technologies ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against SimpleAir, Inc. by AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
December 7, 2009 Filing 53 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against SimpleAir, Inc. by Handmark, Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
December 7, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ESPN, Inc. to 12/21/2009. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 7, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Walt Disney Company to 12/21/2009. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 7, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ABC, Inc. to 12/21/2009. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 23, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey T Norberg on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Norberg, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi Lyn Keefe on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
November 20, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ESPN, Inc. to 12/7/2009. 17 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Handmark Inc. deadline is extended to 12/7/09. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/19/09. (ch, )
November 19, 2009 Filing 49 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ESPN, Inc..( Patterson, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2009 Filing 48 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Walt Disney Company.( Patterson, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2009 Filing 47 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ABC, Inc..( Patterson, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant FACEBOOK, INC. has until and through December 7, 2009 to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff SimpleAir, Inc.s Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/19/09. (ehs, )
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Apple Inc. shall have until and including December 7, 2009, to answer or otherwise respond to the Original Complaint. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/19/09. (ehs, )
November 19, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ABC, Inc. to 12/7/2009. 17 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 19, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple, Inc. to 12/7/2009; Facebook, Inc. to 12/7/2009. (ehs, )
November 19, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Walt Disney Company to 12/7/2009. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 19, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Handmark, Inc. to 12/7/2009. (ch, )
November 18, 2009 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Handmark, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
November 18, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Research In Motion Corporation to 12/7/2009. Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 18, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc. to 12/7/2009. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 18, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Research In Motion Limited to 12/7/2009. Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 18, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. to 12/7/2009. 12 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 18, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Handango, Inc. to 12/7/2009. 19 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 17, 2009 Filing 43 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc..( Sayles, Richard)
November 17, 2009 Filing 42 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Handango, Inc..( Reger, Thomas)
November 17, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Dowling Hornberger on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Hornberger, David)
November 17, 2009 Filing 40 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keyes, Melissa)
November 17, 2009 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
November 17, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Anthony Valek on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Valek, Michael)
November 17, 2009 Filing 37 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Research In Motion Limited.( LaFuze, William)
November 17, 2009 Filing 36 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Research In Motion Corporation.( LaFuze, William)
November 17, 2009 Filing 35 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 17, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 16, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
November 12, 2009 Filing 32 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven J Rocci for The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID, 2-1-5023) (ehs, )
November 12, 2009 Filing 31 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven B Samuels for The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5023) (ehs, )
November 3, 2009 Filing 30 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ABC, Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 3, 2009 Filing 29 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ESPN, Inc..( DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 3, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ESPN, Inc. to 11/20/2009. 29 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 3, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ABC, Inc. to 11/20/2009. 36 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 28, 2009 Filing 28 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by SimpleAir, Inc.. Research In Motion Corporation served on 9/28/2009, answer due 11/18/2009. (ehs, )
October 28, 2009 Filing 27 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by SimpleAir, Inc.. Apple, Inc. served on 9/28/2009, answer due 11/18/2009. (ehs, )
October 28, 2009 Filing 26 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by SimpleAir, Inc.. Handmark, Inc. served on 9/28/2009, answer due 11/18/2009. (ehs, )
October 22, 2009 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Jeffrey Eichmann on behalf of SimpleAir, Inc. (Eichmann, John)
October 20, 2009 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc..( Sayles, Richard)
October 20, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Research In Motion Corporation to 11/18/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 20, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. to 11/25/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 20, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Walt Disney Company to 11/23/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 19, 2009 Filing 23 Defendant The Walt Disney Company's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by SimpleAir, Inc..( DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 19, 2009 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Research In Motion Corporation.( Gillam, Harry)
October 15, 2009 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Handmark, Inc..( Dacus, Deron)
October 15, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Handmark, Inc. to 11/18/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 14, 2009 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Facebook, Inc..( Keyes, Melissa)
October 14, 2009 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc..( Albritton, Eric)
October 14, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
October 14, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 11/18/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 14, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Facebook, Inc. to 11/9/2009. 25 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 13, 2009 Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by SimpleAir, Inc.. AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc. served on 10/2/2009, answer due 11/23/2009. (ehs, )
October 13, 2009 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by SimpleAir, Inc.. ESPN, Inc. served on 10/2/2009, answer due 10/22/2009. (ehs, )
October 13, 2009 Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by SimpleAir, Inc.. The Walt Disney Company served on 10/2/2009, answer due 10/22/2009. (ehs, )
October 13, 2009 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by SimpleAir, Inc.. ABC, Inc. served on 9/25/2009, answer due 10/15/2009. (ehs, )
October 13, 2009 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by SimpleAir, Inc.. Facebook, Inc. served on 9/25/2009, answer due 10/15/2009. (ehs, )
October 13, 2009 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by SimpleAir, Inc.. Handango, Inc. served on 9/25/2009, answer due 11/18/2009. (ehs, )
October 13, 2009 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by SimpleAir, Inc.. The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. served on 10/5/2009, answer due 10/26/2009. (ehs, )
October 7, 2009 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Handango, Inc..( Reger, Thomas)
October 7, 2009 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint RE: AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
October 7, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc. to 11/23/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 7, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Handango, Inc. to 11/18/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 5, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William L. LaFuze on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (LaFuze, William)
September 28, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ernest Richardson on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Richardson, Michael)
September 28, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe W Redden, Jr on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research In Motion Limited (Redden, Joe)
September 24, 2009 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to ABC, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Apple, Inc., # 2 AWS Convergence Technologies Inc, # 3 Disney Online, # 4 ESPN, Inc., # 5 Facebook, Inc., # 6 Handango, Inc., # 7 Handmark, Inc., # 8 Research in Motion Corporation, # 9 Research in Motion Limited, # 10 The Walt Disney Company, # 11 The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc.)(ch, )
September 24, 2009 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to SimpleAir, Inc. (ch, )
September 24, 2009 Case Assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
September 23, 2009 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SimpleAir, Inc. (Capshaw, Sidney)
September 23, 2009 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Capshaw, Sidney)
September 23, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002168691.), filed by SimpleAir, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Capshaw, Sidney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SimpleAir, Inc. v. AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SimpleAir, Inc.
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AWS Convergence Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESPN, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Online
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handango, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Handmark, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?