Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. v. Abt Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Bluefly, Inc., Improvement Direct, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation and The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Elastic Path Software, Inc. and PowerUser
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Coastal Contacts Inc. and Abt Electronics, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00313
Filed: October 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/22/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER granting #241 Motion to Dismiss the Third Party Complaint filed by ABT Electronics against PowerUser Incorporated be and is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/20/12. (ehs, )
June 19, 2012 Filing 241 MOTION to Dismiss by PowerUser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foreman, Bradley)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER - granting #239 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claima and counterclaims against PetMed Express Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own cost, expenses and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/30/2012. (ch, )
May 23, 2012 Filing 239 STIPULATION of Dismissal of PetMed Express, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #237 Motion to Stay All Deadlines as Between Plaintiff and Defendant PetMed Express, Inc. until May 31, 2012, pending the finalization of a settlement agreement between the parties. Parties to file with the Court either an Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Defendant PetMed or a status report regarding the finalization of the settlement agreement on or before May 31, 2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/2/12. (ehs, )
May 1, 2012 Filing 237 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines as Between Plaintiff and PetMed Express, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
April 24, 2012 Filing 236 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Petmed Express, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to David Swetnam-Burland Declaration, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Swetnam-Burland, David)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #234 Motion Leave to Produce Settlement Negotiation Documents. Plaintiff may comply with the Courts Order of April 3, 2012 (ECF No. 232, filed Apr. 4, 2012) on a rolling basis, with such compliance beginning on April 24, 2012 and continuing until completed no later than May 8, 2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/23/12. (ehs, )
April 20, 2012 Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Produce Settlement Negotiation Documents on a Rolling Basis re #232 Memorandum & Opinion,, by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER - Defendant PetMed Express, Inc. (PetMed) has filed a letter brief requesting permission to file a motion for summary judgment of invalidity under 35 U.S.C. 112, 1. On consideration of the letter brief and all timely filed responses,the Court ORDERS that PetMeds request is GRANTED. PetMed has the Courts permission to file a motion for summary judgment on the issues set forth in its letter brief. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/11/12. (ehs, )
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - GRANTS the Motion to Compel and ORDERS Plaintiff to produce draft license agreements and communications, if any, between Hill and third parties relating to the negotiation of license agr eements entered into to resolve past claims under the patents-in-suitwithin twenty-one (21) days of this Order. Pursuant to the existing Protective Order, such documents shall be designated "Outside Counsel Eyes Only Confidential Information.". Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/3/2012. (ch, )
March 27, 2012 Filing 231 MOTION to Dismiss by PowerUser. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Foreman, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2012: #2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
March 14, 2012 Filing 230 Letter Brief filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
March 13, 2012 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #228 Letter Brief submitted by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Not filed in proper pleading format and brief was not filed according to Judge's Standing Order. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
March 13, 2012 Filing 229 Letter Brief filed by Petmed Express, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Reply Letter Brief in Support of Request for Permission to File Motion for Summary Judgment)(Swetnam-Burland, David)
March 12, 2012 Filing 228 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Letter Brief filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (Lechleiter, Daniel) Modified on 3/13/2012 (sm, ).
February 23, 2012 Filing 227 Letter Brief filed by Petmed Express, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Letter Brief), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Swetnam-Burland, David)
February 22, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. ENTERED IN WRONG CASE Document # 226, Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ***ENTERED IN WRONG CASE BY CHAMBERS.***ORDER granting #170 Motion to Compel. GRANTS the Motion to Compel upon the following term herein. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/22/2012. (ch, ) Modified on 2/22/2012 (ch, ).
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER granting #220 Motion for Reconsideration. The Courts prior construction of the terms integrating and combining be, and hereby is, modified as follows: With respect to the asserted claims in this case, the terms integrating and combining mean merging or uniting in the remote computer the constant data and variable data in a meaningful way except that as used in claim 1 of the 649 Patent combining means merging or uniting in the remote computer the graphics data and textual data in a meaningful way.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/15/12. (ehs, )
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 224 FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Discovery due by 8/3/2012., Motions due by 9/26/2012., Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2012., Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2012 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.), Motions terminated: #222 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #121 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc... Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/12. (ehs, )
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #221 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. as to deft Abt Electronics Inc. Plaintiff's Complaint against Abt Electronics, Inc. is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Abt Electronics, Inc.'s claims and counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorney's fees.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/12. (ehs, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 222 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #121 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,, by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
February 8, 2012 Filing 221 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Abt Electronics, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard)
February 2, 2012 Filing 220 Unopposed MOTION for Reconsideration re #219 Memorandum & Opinion,, by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lechleiter Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
January 31, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - The Court adopts the constructions set forth in this opinion for the disputed terms of the patents-in-suit. The parties are ordered that they may not refer, directly or indirectly, to each others claim construction positions in the presence of the jury. Likewise, the parties are ordered to refrain from mentioning any portion of this opinion, other than the actual definitions adopted by the Court, in the presence of the jury. Any reference to claim construction proceedings is limited to informing the jury of the definitions adopted by the Court. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/10/12. (ehs, )
January 10, 2012 Filing 218 NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of Change of Law Firm and E-Mail Addresses (Carter, Richard)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #216 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. as to deft Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. Plaintiffs Complaint against Ralph Lauren is dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Ralph Laurens claims and counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/6/12. (ehs, )
January 6, 2012 Filing 216 STIPULATION of Dismissal Between Plaintiff and Defendant Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard)
January 6, 2012 Filing 215 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/22/11 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons, CSR,Telephone number: 903/935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2012. (lss, )

January 4, 2012 Filing 214 NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. Regarding Submission of Second Revised Claim Construction Chart Pursuant to P.R. 4-5(d) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Revised Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Carter, Richard)
December 22, 2011 Filing 213 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Markman Hearing held on 12/22/2011. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
December 20, 2011 Filing 212 NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. Regarding Submission of Revised Claim Construction Chart Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Revised Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
December 20, 2011 Case Reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap per Misc Order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (leh, )
December 15, 2011 Filing 211 NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER - Claim Construction Hearing set for 12/22/2011 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/2/2011. (ch, )
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER - The Court previously set the above-captioned case for a Claim Construction Hearing on November 29, 2011. See 12/8/2010 Docket Control Order, Dkt. No. 121 at 3. The criminal trial of USA v. Ansan Suman-Amir Meadows, No. 5:10-CR-5, is set to begin on November 28, 2011. The Claim Construction Hearing in the above-captioned case is therefore hereby CONTINUED to a date to be determined by the Court. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/21/2011. (ch, )
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #207 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/17/2011. (ch, )
November 16, 2011 Filing 207 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
November 16, 2011 Filing 206 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Lechleiter, Daniel)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #204 Motion to Amend docket control order to extend deadline. The Docket Control Order is hereby modified such that the new deadline for Hills Reply Claim Construction Brief is November 16, 2011.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/11. (ehs, )
November 11, 2011 Filing 204 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order to Extend the Deadline for Hill's Reply Claim Construction Brief by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
October 26, 2011 Filing 203 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc., and Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Swetnam-Burland, David)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/2011. (ch, )
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting #200 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brandon S Judkins terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/30/2011. (ch, )
September 29, 2011 Filing 200 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed on behalf of Brandon S. Judkins by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting #198 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/29/2011. (ch, )
September 28, 2011 Filing 198 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
September 28, 2011 Filing 197 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Lechleiter Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - US Pat 5,528,490, #3 Exhibit B - US Pat 5,761,649, #4 Exhibit C - US Pat 6,029,142, #5 Exhibit D - Compusere Claim Constr Order, #6 Exhibit E - Amazon Claim Constr Order, #7 Exhibit F - Abercrombie Claim Constr Order, #8 Exhibit G - definition of graphics, #9 Exhibit H - definition of graphics, #10 Exhibit I - definition of data, #11 Exhibit J - definition of data, #12 Exhibit K - definition of request, #13 Exhibit L - definition of query, #14 Exhibit M - definition of query, #15 Exhibit N - definition of coupled, #16 Exhibit O - definition of automatic connection, #17 Exhibit P - definition of automatic, #18 Exhibit Q - definition of automatic, #19 Exhibit R - definition of connection, #20 Exhibit S - definition of disconnect)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #195 Motion to Amend/Correct. Docket Control Order is hereby modified to the new deadlines herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/28/2011. (ch, )
September 23, 2011 Filing 195 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order to Extend Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #193 Motion to Amend/Correct. Parties shall complete mediation by 10/5/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/22/2011. (ch, )
September 21, 2011 Filing 193 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #121 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,, #191 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Abt Electronics, Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard)
August 29, 2011 Filing 192 ANSWER to #189 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc..(Lechleiter, Daniel)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #190 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/11/2011. (ch, )
August 9, 2011 Filing 190 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Abt Electronics, Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swetnam-Burland, David)
August 8, 2011 Filing 189 First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation.(Wine, Mark)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #187 Plantiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Modify the Docket Control Order to Extend Claim Construction Briefing Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 4, 2011. (jml)
August 2, 2011 Filing 187 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefing by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
July 28, 2011 Filing 186 NOTICE of Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to patent local rule 4-3 by Abt Electronics, Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - chart of Agreed Limitations, #2 Exhibit B - chart of Disputed Limitations)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
July 6, 2011 Filing 185 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #177 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Stitham, Stacy)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #181 Motion to Amend docket control order deadlines. The deadlines for P.R. 4-2, P.R. 4-3, and the discovery deadline for claim construction issues are respectively moved to July 14, 2011, July 28, 2011, and August 12, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/5/11. (ehs, )
June 30, 2011 Filing 183 REPLY to Response to Motion re #177 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PowerUser. (Foreman, Bradley)
June 30, 2011 Filing 182 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #170 MOTION to Compel Settlement Negotiation Documents filed by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter J. Brann, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
June 30, 2011 Filing 181 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #121 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,,,,, Modify the Docket Control Order to Extend Deadlines for Claim Construction by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wine, Mark)
June 29, 2011 Filing 180 RESPONSE in Opposition re #177 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Stitham, Stacy)
June 23, 2011 Filing 179 RESPONSE in Opposition re #170 MOTION to Compel Settlement Negotiation Documents filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #175 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. #170 MOTION to Compel Settlement Negotiation Documents. Responses due by 6/23/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on June 16, 2011. (delat, )
June 16, 2011 Filing 177 Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PowerUser. (Foreman, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ).
June 15, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding doc #176 Motion to Dismiss submitted by PowerUser. There is No certificate of service. Correction should be made by 1 business day. (ljw, )
June 15, 2011 Filing 176 PLEASE IGNORE, ATTORNEY TO REFILE MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PowerUser. Responses due by 6/29/2011 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Foreman, Bradley) Modified on 6/16/2011 (ljw, ).
June 15, 2011 Filing 175 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #170 MOTION to Compel Settlement Negotiation Documents by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard)
June 10, 2011 Filing 174 NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Lechleiter, Daniel)
June 10, 2011 Filing 173 NOTICE by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation of Compliance with Local Patent Rules (Wine, Mark)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #171 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Compel (ECF No. 170). Responses due by 6/16/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/27/11. (ehs, )
May 26, 2011 Filing 171 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #170 MOTION to Compel Settlement Negotiation Documents by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
May 23, 2011 Filing 170 MOTION to Compel Settlement Negotiation Documents by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stitham, Stacy)
May 20, 2011 Filing 169 NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of Compliance with Identification of Privileged Materials (Lechleiter, Daniel)
May 20, 2011 Filing 168 NOTICE by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation Compliance with Identification of Privileged Materials (Vincent, Lance)
May 20, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 167 submitted by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 167 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation Compliance with Identification of Privileged Materials (Vincent, Lance) Modified on 5/20/2011 (ch, ).
May 20, 2011 Filing 166 NOTICE by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc., of Compliance with Identification of Privileged Materials (Stitham, Stacy)
May 3, 2011 Filing 165 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format (Dkt. #118) set for 5/10/2011, 12:00 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham is CANCELLED. (delat, )
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER withdrawing #118 Motion to Compel; granting #163 Motion to Withdraw. The Motion to Compel is withdrawn without prejudice to re-file. Further, there is no need for the hearing on the Motion to Compel on May 10, 2011 at 12:00 noon (see ECF No. 162), and the hearing is, therefore, CANCELED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/2/11. (ehs, )
April 29, 2011 Filing 163 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #118 MOTION to Compel Defendant Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
April 26, 2011 Filing 162 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant ABT Electronics, Inc., to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format (Dkt. #118) set for 5/10/2011, 12:00 PM, in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (delat, )
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #159 Motion to Withdraw #143 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on April 26, 2011. (jml)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #158 Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs. Deadline is extended through and including May 20, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on April 26, 2011. (jml)
April 25, 2011 Filing 159 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Letter Brief by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stitham, Stacy)
April 21, 2011 Filing 158 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Lechleiter, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants Abt Electronics, Inc., PetMed Express, Inc. and Polo Ralph Lauren Corporations Letter Brief. Responses due by 4/25/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/12/11. (ehs, )
April 11, 2011 Filing 156 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #142 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, Plaintiff's Third Unopposed Motion to Extend Time by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Dfts Letter Brief #142 . Responses due by 4/11/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/29/2011. (ch, )
March 28, 2011 Filing 154 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion To Extend Time by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #151 Motion for Extension of Time to File a response to Defendants Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc. and Polo Ralph Lauren Corporations Letter Brief. Plaintiff Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., shall have until and including March 28, 2011, to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/17/11. (ehs, )
March 16, 2011 Filing 152 ANSWER to #139 Third Party Complaint by PowerUser.(Foreman, Bradley)
March 14, 2011 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Letter Brief by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott)
March 10, 2011 Filing 150 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. PowerUser served on 2/24/2011 by CM RRR, answer due 3/17/2011. (ehs, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 149 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bradley H Foreman for PowerUser. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-357) (ehs, )
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER - granting #147 Stipulation of Dismissal. Dft Bluefly Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/2/2011. (ch, )
March 1, 2011 Filing 147 STIPULATION of Dismissal for Bluefly, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #141 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Jennifer Parker Ainsworth,Peter J Brann for Petmed Express, Inc.,,Jennifer Parker Ainsworth,Peter J Brann for Petmed Express, Inc.,. Attorney William D Belanger and Michael Ernest Richardson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/28/11. (ehs, )
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #141 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Jennifer Parker Ainsworth,Peter J Brann,David Asher Swetnam-Burland,Stacy O Stitham for Petmed Express, Inc.,. Attorney Courtney Quish; Michael Ernest Richardson; William D Belanger and Alexandra C Fennell terminated as counsel for Petmed Express Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/28/2011. (ch, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 144 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #143 Sealed Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief - Sealed,.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 25, 2011 Filing 143 Sealed Letter Brief filed by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Attachments: #1 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 25, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 142, Letter Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 142 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Letter Brief filed by Abt Electronics, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Attachments: #1 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment)(Stitham, Stacy) Modified on 2/25/2011 (ch, ).
February 25, 2011 Filing 141 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Petmed Express, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
February 16, 2011 Filing 140 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to PowerUser. (ch, )
February 16, 2011 Filing 139 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against PowerUser, filed by Abt Electronics, Inc..(Stitham, Stacy)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #137 Motion for Leave to File to File Third-Party Complaint.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/16/2011. (ch, )
February 15, 2011 Filing 137 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Party Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stitham, Stacy)
January 14, 2011 Filing 136 NOTICE of Disclosure by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a)) (Lin, Benjamin)
January 14, 2011 Filing 135 NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of Compliance with Discovery Order (Lechleiter, Daniel)
January 14, 2011 Filing 134 NOTICE of Disclosure by Abt Electronics, Inc., Bluefly, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Invalidity Contentions) (Swetnam-Burland, David)
January 7, 2011 Filing 133 NOTICE of Disclosure by Abt Electronics, Inc. (Compliance with PR 3-4(a)) (Swetnam-Burland, David)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER re #131 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. as to deft Build.com Inc f/k/a Improvement Direct Inc.All claims in complaint dismissed with prejudice. Any counterclaims by Build.com, are dismissed with prejudice except that Build.com's counterclaims for non-infringement and patent invalidity are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorney fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/7/11. (ehs, )
January 4, 2011 Filing 131 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, R)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #129 Motion for Leave to File Excess Page Limits in regard to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format ("Reply Brief"). Plaintiff may have leave to exceed the page limit for reply briefs set forth under Local Rule CV-7(a)(2) by three (3) pages, and deems the Reply Brief as properly filed.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/22/10. (ehs, )
December 21, 2010 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel)
December 21, 2010 Filing 128 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #118 MOTION to Compel Defendant Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format filed by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Stitham, Stacy)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #124 Motion to modify the discovery order. Deadline for Additional Disclosures 3(b) is extended to January 11, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/20/10. (ehs, )
December 20, 2010 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #118 MOTION to Compel Defendant Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Carter, R)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #123 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. All claims and counterclaims against pltf and deft are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/20/10. (ehs, )
December 17, 2010 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct The Discovery Order To Extend Deadline for Additional Disclosures by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wine, Mark)
December 15, 2010 Filing 123 STIPULATION of Dismissal of The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, R)
December 10, 2010 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re #118 MOTION to Compel Defendant Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format filed by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Stitham, Stacy)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2011., Discovery due by 8/3/2012., Expert Witness List due by 6/1/2012., Joinder of Parties due by 2/15/2011., Markman Hearing set for 11/29/2011 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Motions due by 10/17/2012., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2012., Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward., Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2012 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward.), Motions terminated: #119 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order filed by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Improvement Direct, Inc., Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Abt Electronics, Inc., Bluefly, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/8/10. (ehs, )
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/8/10. (ehs, )
December 2, 2010 Filing 119 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Abt Electronics, Inc., Bluefly, Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Improvement Direct, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Carter, R)
November 29, 2010 Filing 118 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #118 *** MOTION to Compel Defendant Abt Electronics, Inc. to Produce Documents and Electronically Stored Information in a Reasonably Usable Format by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of D. Lechleiter, #2 Exhibit 1 to Lechleiter Decl, #3 Exhibit 2 to Lechleiter Decl, #4 Exhibit 3 to Lechleiter Decl, #5 Exhibit 4 to Lechleiter Decl, #6 Exhibit 5 to Lechleiter Decl, #7 Exhibit 6 to Lechleiter Decl, #8 Exhibit 7 to Lechleiter Decl, #9 Exhibit 8 to Lechleiter Decl, #10 Affidavit of G. Barberio, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, R) Modified on 5/3/2011 (ehs, ).
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #94 Joint Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. The parties will submit a docket control order and discovery order reflecting this order within ten days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/22/2010. (ch, )
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #95 Motion to Compel. Pursuant to the terms of the protective order entered in this litigation, the court orders Hill to produce all final, executed, license and settlement agreements between Hill and any third party related to the patents-in-suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/19/10. (ehs, )
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #103 Motion - The Court adopts the parties Agreed Electronic Discovery Protocol (Dkt. # 103).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/19/10. (ehs, )
November 2, 2010 Filing 114 NOTICE of Disclosure by Improvement Direct, Inc. (Pogorzelski, Henry)
November 2, 2010 Filing 113 NOTICE by Bluefly, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosure Requirements (Richardson, Michael)
November 2, 2010 Filing 112 NOTICE by Petmed Express, Inc., Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosure Requirements (Richardson, Michael)
November 1, 2010 Filing 111 NOTICE of Disclosure by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Lin, Benjamin)
November 1, 2010 Filing 110 NOTICE of Disclosure by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. (Faulkner, Rickey)
November 1, 2010 Filing 109 NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of service of initial disclosures (Lechleiter, Daniel)
November 1, 2010 Filing 108 NOTICE of Disclosure by Abt Electronics, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Swetnam-Burland, David)
October 20, 2010 Filing 107 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tuhin Ganguly for Bluefly, Inc.,Tuhin Ganguly for Petmed Express, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-45) (ehs, )
October 18, 2010 Filing 106 ANSWER to #99 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Abt Electronics, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc..(Lechleiter, Daniel)
October 13, 2010 Filing 105 NOTICE by Improvement Direct, Inc. of Name Change (Robinson, Erick)
October 12, 2010 Filing 104 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erick Scott Robinson on behalf of Improvement Direct, Inc. (Robinson, Erick)
October 5, 2010 Filing 103 Joint MOTION to Enter Agreed Electronic Discovery Protocol by Bluefly, Inc., Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc., Improvement Direct, Inc., Petmed Express, Inc.,, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lechleiter, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2010: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #101 Motion to Dismiss Defendant, Coastal Contacts Inc without prejudice until full payment of the Agreement is made. Defendant's claims and counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE until full payment under the agreement is made. Once full payment is made, any claims and counterclaims asserted by Defendant are dismissed with PREJUDICE. 3. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/5/10. (ehs, )
September 29, 2010 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, R) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2010: #2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
September 24, 2010 Filing 100 NOTICE of Disclosure by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. of Preliminary Infringement Contentions (Lechleiter, Daniel)
September 24, 2010 Filing 99 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Abt Electronics, Inc..(Stitham, Stacy)
September 22, 2010 Filing 98 NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. re #97 Order, confirming compliance (Judkins, Brandon)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER - The court grants leave for the third-party licensees to file objections to the motion to compel within fourteen days of this order. Hill shall immediately forward a copy of this order to the last known counsel of the objecting third parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/21/10. (ehs, )
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #90 Report and Recommendations denying #48 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/20/10. (ehs, )
September 17, 2010 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Production of License Agreements by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Peter J. Brann, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brann, Peter)
September 16, 2010 Filing 94 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Docket Control Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Docket Control Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Discovery Order)(Carter, R) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2010: #5 PLFT'S REVISED DISCOVERY ORDER, #6 Exhibit B Plt's REVISED DOCKED CONTROL ORDER, #7 Exhibit C Dft's REVISED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, #8 Exhibit D - Dft's REVISED DISCOVERY ORDER) (ch, ).
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Deadline extended to 9/16/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/10/10. (ehs, )
September 10, 2010 Filing 92 OBJECTION to #90 Report and Recommendations by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Stitham, Stacy)
September 9, 2010 Filing 91 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Coastal Contacts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
August 31, 2010 Filing 90 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - recommends denying #48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Abt Electronics, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/31/10. (ehs, )
August 30, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 8/30/10. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders by September 13, 2010. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons) (bga )
August 30, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 8/30/10. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders by 9/13/10. Court adjourned.(delat)
August 29, 2010 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Van Cleef on behalf of Improvement Direct, Inc. (Van Cleef, Charles)
August 27, 2010 Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bobby Lance Vincent on behalf of Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Vincent, Bobby)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 AGREED ORDER on Expert Discovery as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/18/10. (ehs, )
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/17/10. (ehs, )
August 16, 2010 Filing 85 Joint MOTION Entry of Agreed Order on Expert Discovery by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prall, Stacy)
August 16, 2010 Filing 84 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prall, Stacy)
August 10, 2010 Filing 83 NOTICE of Change of Address by Henry Mark Pogorzelski (Pogorzelski, Henry)
July 26, 2010 Filing 82 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sharon E Roberg-Perez for The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-5507)(ehs, )
July 26, 2010 Filing 81 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jan M Conlin for The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5507) (ehs, )
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER setting Status Conference set for 8/30/2010 09:45 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Magistrate Judge Chad Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/21/10. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 79 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cynthia A Lock for Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5487 (ch, )
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #76 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff Coastal Contacts, Inc.s Third- Party Complaint and any and all motions relating thereto, including the following Elastic Path motions: Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, Motion for Enforcement of Arbitration Agreement, Motion to Compel Arbitration are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/18/2010. (ch, )
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #73 Third Party MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #71 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, #72 Third Party MOTION Enforcement of Arbitration Agreement Responses due by 5/14/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/18/2010. (ch, )
May 14, 2010 Filing 76 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Coastal Contacts Inc.. Responses due by 6/1/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saunders, Jason)
May 13, 2010 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #72 Third Party MOTION Enforcement of Arbitration Agreement, #71 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, #73 Third Party MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Coastal Contacts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
April 30, 2010 Filing 74 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benjamin S Lin,Andre De La Cruz,Mark P Wine for Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation,Benjamin S Lin,Andre De La Cruz,Mark P Wine for Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation,Benjamin S Lin,Andre De La Cruz,Mark P Wine for Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation,Benjamin S Lin,Andre De La Cruz,Mark P Wine for Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation. (Attachments: #1 PHV de La Cruz, #2 PHV Mark Wine RECEIPT 2--1-5336)(rml, )
April 26, 2010 Filing 73 Third Party MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Elastic Path Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Davison, Dan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2010: #5 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
April 26, 2010 Filing 72 Third Party MOTION Enforcement of Arbitration Agreement by Elastic Path Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Davison, Dan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2010: #5 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
April 26, 2010 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Elastic Path Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Davison, Dan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2010: #5 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
April 26, 2010 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dan Duncan Davison on behalf of Elastic Path Software, Inc. (Davison, Dan)
March 31, 2010 Filing 69 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to (Third Party Dft) Elastic Path Software, Inc.. (ch, )
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint for Indemnity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/30/10. (ehs, )
March 26, 2010 Filing 67 NOTICE by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. re #65 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint for Indemnity that Hill does not oppose Coastal Contacts' Motion for Leave (Carter, R)
March 12, 2010 Filing 66 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Elastic Path Software, Inc., filed by Coastal Contacts Inc..(Bunt, Robert)
March 12, 2010 Filing 65 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint for Indemnity by Coastal Contacts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
January 19, 2010 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason A Saunders on behalf of Coastal Contacts Inc. (Saunders, Jason)
January 19, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gordon T Arnold on behalf of Coastal Contacts Inc. (Arnold, Gordon)
January 13, 2010 Filing 62 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #57 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Coastal Contacts, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc..(Prall, Stacy)
January 11, 2010 Filing 61 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Amy J Benjamin for Coastal Contacts Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5128. (ch, )
January 11, 2010 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Abt Electronics, Inc. (Swetnam-Burland, David)
January 11, 2010 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Coastal Contacts Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles)
January 8, 2010 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Coastal Contacts Inc. (Bunt, Robert)
January 8, 2010 Filing 57 Defendant Coastal Contacts, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Coastal Contacts Inc..(Bunt, Robert)
January 6, 2010 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Swetnam-Burland, David)
December 31, 2009 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of 7-2-09)(Prall, Stacy)
December 28, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Coastal Contacts Inc. to 1/8/2010. (ch, )
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Coastal Contacts Inc deadline is extended to 1/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/28/09. (ch, )
December 23, 2009 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Coastal Contacts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
December 22, 2009 Filing 52 RESPONSE to #38 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Improvement Direct, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Prall, Stacy)
December 22, 2009 Filing 51 RESPONSE to #31 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Petmed Express, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Prall, Stacy)
December 22, 2009 Filing 50 RESPONSE to #42 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Prall, Stacy)
December 22, 2009 Filing 49 RESPONSE to #32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Bluefly, Inc. by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Prall, Stacy)
December 14, 2009 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss by Abt Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swetnam-Burland, David)
December 8, 2009 Filing 47 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Swetnam-Burland for Abt Electronics, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5071. (ch, )
December 8, 2009 Filing 46 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter J Brann for Abt Electronics, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5071. (ch, )
December 8, 2009 Filing 45 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stacy O Stitham for Abt Electronics, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5071. (ch, )
December 4, 2009 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Petmed Express, Inc., (Richardson, Michael)
December 3, 2009 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation (Daybell, Donald)
December 3, 2009 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation.(Daybell, Donald)
December 3, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Collins on behalf of Improvement Direct, Inc. (Collins, Michael)
December 3, 2009 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Edmonds on behalf of Improvement Direct, Inc. (Edmonds, John)
December 3, 2009 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Improvement Direct, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Other Affiliate Wolseley plc for Improvement Direct, Inc.. (Pogorzelski, Henry)
December 3, 2009 Filing 38 Improvement Direct's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Improvement Direct, Inc..(Pogorzelski, Henry)
December 3, 2009 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bluefly, Inc. (Richardson, Michael)
December 3, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE. Document # 36, Corporate Disclosure Statement. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
December 3, 2009 Filing 36 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bluefly, Inc. (Beck, David) Modified on 12/3/2009 (sm, ).
December 3, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Abt Electronics, Inc. to 12/17/2009. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 3, 2009 Filing 35 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Abt Electronics, Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
December 3, 2009 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. (Faulkner, Rickey)
December 3, 2009 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Estee Lauder Companies Inc..(Faulkner, Rickey)
December 2, 2009 Filing 32 Bluefly, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.'s Original Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Bluefly, Inc..(Richardson, Michael)
December 2, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY IS GOING TO REFILE. Document # 30, Answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
December 2, 2009 Filing 31 PetMed Express, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.'s Original Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Petmed Express, Inc.,.(Richardson, Michael)
December 2, 2009 Filing 30 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Bluefly, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.'s Original Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. by Bluefly, Inc..(Richardson, Michael) Modified on 12/2/2009 (sm, ).
November 5, 2009 Filing 29 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Coastal Contacts Inc. served on 10/22/2009, answer due 11/12/2009. (ehs, )
November 4, 2009 Filing 28 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Courtney Quish for Bluefly, Inc. and Petmed Express, Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5010(ch, )
November 4, 2009 Filing 27 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William D Belanger for Bluefly, Inc. and Petmed Express, Inc. (ATTORNEY FEE PAID) 2-1-5009. (ch, )
November 2, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Improvement Direct, Inc. to 12/3/2009. 31 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 2, 2009 Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Improvement Direct, Inc..( Pogorzelski, Henry)
October 29, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Abt Electronics, Inc. to 12/3/2009. 24 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 29, 2009 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Abt Electronics, Inc..( Mitchell, Mark)
October 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation to 12/3/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 28, 2009 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation.(Daybell, Donald)
October 28, 2009 Filing 23 ***REPLACES # 21 ***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra C Fennell on behalf of Petmed Express, Inc., (Fennell, Alexandra) Modified on 10/28/2009 (ch, ).
October 28, 2009 Filing 22 ***REPLACES # 20 ***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra C Fennell on behalf of Bluefly, Inc. (Fennell, Alexandra) Modified on 10/28/2009 (ch, ).
October 28, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Document # 20, Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney must refile an attach a Certificate of Service)(ch, )
October 28, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Document # 21, Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (Attorney must refile an attach a Certificate of Service)(ch, )
October 28, 2009 Filing 21 ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra C Fennell on behalf of Petmed Express, Inc., (Fennell, Alexandra) Modified on 10/28/2009 (ch, ).
October 28, 2009 Filing 20 ***FILED IN ERROR. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra C Fennell on behalf of Bluefly, Inc. (Fennell, Alexandra) Modified on 10/28/2009 (ch, ).
October 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. to 12/3/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Bluefly, Inc. to 12/3/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Petmed Express, Inc., to 12/3/2009. 31 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 28, 2009 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bluefly, Inc..( Richardson, Michael)
October 28, 2009 Filing 18 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re The Estee Lauder Companies Inc..( Faulkner, Rickey)
October 28, 2009 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Petmed Express, Inc.,.( Richardson, Michael)
October 23, 2009 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Abt Electronics, Inc. served on 10/18/2009, answer due 11/9/2009. (ehs, )
October 20, 2009 Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Bluefly, Inc. served on 10/14/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (ch, )
October 20, 2009 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. The Estee Lauder Companies Inc. served on 10/14/2009, answer due 11/3/2009. (ch, )
October 19, 2009 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Petmed Express, Inc., served on 10/13/2009, answer due 11/2/2009. (ehs, )
October 19, 2009 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation served on 10/13/2009, answer due 11/2/2009. (ehs, )
October 19, 2009 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. Improvement Direct, Inc. served on 10/13/2009, answer due 11/2/2009. (ehs, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 10 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney R Trevor Carter for Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (APPROVE FEE PAID) 2-1-4965. (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2009: #1 Confidential Information) (ch, ).
October 15, 2009 Filing 9 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel M Lechleiter for Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4965. (ch, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stacy L Prall for Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4965. (ch, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brandon S Judkins for Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.(APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-4965. (ch, )
October 9, 2009 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (Stevens, Scott)
October 9, 2009 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Bluefly, Inc., (Attachments: #1 PetMed Express Inc (Bruce Rosenbloom), #2 Coastal Contacts Inc (Washington), #3 Coastal Contacts Inc., #4 Improvement Direct, Inc., #5 Abt Electronic Inc. (Marshall D. Krolick), #6 Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, #7 The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.)(ch, )
October 9, 2009 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. (ch, )
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 10/9/09. (ch, )
October 9, 2009 Case Assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
October 9, 2009 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Stevens, Scott)
October 9, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002192519.), filed by Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevens, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc. v. Abt Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluefly, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney M Quish
Represented By: Alexandra C Fennell
Represented By: William D Belanger
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Represented By: Tuhin Ganguly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Improvement Direct, Inc.
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: Erick Scott Robinson
Represented By: L. Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: Michael James Collins
Represented By: Henry Mark Pogorzelski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petmed Express, Inc.,
Represented By: Courtney M Quish
Represented By: Peter J Brann
Represented By: Stacy O Stitham
Represented By: William D Belanger
Represented By: David Asher Swetnam-Burland
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Represented By: Tuhin Ganguly
Represented By: Alexandra C Fennell
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation
Represented By: Andre De La Cruz
Represented By: Mark P Wine
Represented By: Benjamin S Lin
Represented By: Donald Erik Daybell
Represented By: Lance Vincent
Represented By: Cynthia A Lock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estee Lauder Companies Inc.
Represented By: Jan M Conlin
Represented By: Rickey Lawrence Faulkner
Represented By: Sharon E Roberg-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Elastic Path Software, Inc.
Represented By: Dan Duncan Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: PowerUser
Represented By: Bradley H Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Coastal Contacts Inc.
Represented By: Gordon T Arnold
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Jason A Saunders
Represented By: Amy J Benjamin
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Abt Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy O Stitham
Represented By: Peter J Brann
Represented By: David Asher Swetnam-Burland
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Mark Toler Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Hill & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Scott English Stevens
Represented By: R Trevor Carter
Represented By: Richard Trevor Carter
Represented By: Stacy L Prall
Represented By: Daniel M Lechleiter
Represented By: Brandon S Judkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?