Large Audience Display Systems, LLC v. Tennman Productions, LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Large Audience Display Systems, LLC
Defendant: Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Justin Timberlake, Music Tour Management, Inc., Pussycat Dolls, LLC, Tennman Productions, LLC, Britney Spears, Steve Dixon and Britney Touring, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00356
Filed: November 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Tyler
Presiding Judge: Charles Everingham
Referring Judge: T John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2011 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to Case Transferred Out - District Transfer to the Central District of California on 4/21/11 and assigned case number 2:11cv03398. (ehs, )
April 20, 2011 Interdistrict Electronic transfer to the Central District of California. (ehs, )
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - granting Defendants motion to transfer venue to the Central District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/30/11. (ehs, )
March 9, 2011 NOTICE FROM CLERK re #94 Submission of JOINT Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, and Discovery Order. This entry has been modified to reflect the exhibits to propertly identify them as proposed orders. (sm, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 94 JOINT Submission of Discovery and DOcket Control Orders by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, #2 DISCOVERY ORDER)(Beard, Ryan) Modified on 3/9/2011 (sm, ).
March 8, 2011 Filing 93 NOTICE of Disclosure by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC (Beard, Ryan)
March 4, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 92, Submission of Orders. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 3, 2011 Filing 92 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY PLEASE IGNORE.***Submission of Agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Beard, Ryan) Modified on 3/3/2011 (sm, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2011: #3 REVISED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, #4 REVISED DISCOVERY ORDER) (sm, ). Modified on 3/4/2011 (ch, ).
March 3, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, ORDERS WERE THE MAIN DOCUMENT INSTEAD OF BEING ATTACHED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 90 and #91, Submission of Agreed Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 2, 2011 Filing 91 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Beard, Ryan) Modified on 3/3/2011 (sm, ).
March 2, 2011 Filing 90 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Beard, Ryan) Modified on 3/3/2011 (sm, ).
February 16, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 2/16/11. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of todays date. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
February 16, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 2/16/11. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of todays date. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (delat, )
January 21, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/16/2011 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward. (ehs, )
January 20, 2011 Filing 89 NOTICE by Britney Touring, Inc., Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Britney Spears, Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake re #46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Second Further Notice of Supplemental Authority (Ainsworth, Charles)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Status Conference set for 2/16/2011 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Honorable Chad Everingham. The purpose of the conference will be to assign a claim construction hearing date and a trial setting. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on March 2, 2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/20/11. (ehs, )
December 29, 2010 Filing 87 NOTICE by Britney Touring, Inc., Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Britney Spears, Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake re #46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Further Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Motion to Transfer Venue (Ainsworth, Charles)
November 23, 2010 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion re #78 MOTION to Dismiss (Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply) filed by Steve Dixon, Music Tour Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Steve Dixon)(Crouch, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2010 Filing 85 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #78 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Burk, Michael)
November 8, 2010 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion re #78 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Steve Dixon, Music Tour Management, Inc.. (Crouch, Jeffrey)
November 1, 2010 Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Defendants Steve Dixons and Music Tour Managements Motion to Dismiss)(Burk, Michael)
November 1, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. NOT IN PDF SEARCHABLE FORMAT. Document # 82, Response in Opposition. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 1, 2010 Filing 82 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Defendants Steve Dixons and Music Tour Managements Motion to Dismiss)(Burk, Michael) Modified on 11/1/2010 (ch, ).
November 1, 2010 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #81 Response in opposition submitted by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. Exhibits not properly attached and identified. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 81 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Opposition re #78 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Defendants Steve Dixon's and Music Tour Management, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Burk, Michael) Modified on 11/1/2010 (sm, ).
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #78 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 10/29/2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all relief not expressly granted herein is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/15/2010. (ch, )
October 14, 2010 Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Opposition to Defendants Steve Dixon's and Music Tour Management, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Burk, Michael)
October 1, 2010 Filing 78 MOTION to Dismiss by Steve Dixon, Music Tour Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve Dixon)(Crouch, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2010: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
September 10, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Steve Dixon to 10/1/2010; Music Tour Management, Inc. to 10/1/2010. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
September 10, 2010 Filing 77 Defendants' Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Steve Dixon, Music Tour Management, Inc..( Crouch, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Steve Dixon to 9/16/2010; Music Tour Management, Inc. to 9/16/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 14, 2010 Filing 76 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Steve Dixon, Music Tour Management, Inc..( Crouch, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2010 Filing 75 RESPONSE to #73 Notice (Other) Defendants Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Motion to Transfer Venue by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Burk, Michael)
July 22, 2010 Filing 74 Defendants' First Amended ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint, by Britney Touring, Inc., Britney Spears, Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake.(Ainsworth, Charles)
July 22, 2010 Filing 73 NOTICE by Britney Touring, Inc., Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Britney Spears, Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake re #46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue of Supplemental Authority (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 19, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Britney Touring, Inc. to 7/23/2010; Britney Spears to 7/23/2010; Tennman Productions, LLC to 7/23/2010; Justin Timberlake to 7/23/2010. (ehs, )
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Tennman Productions, LLC (Tennman Productions); Justin Timberlake (Timberlake); Britney Tours, LLC. s/h/a Britney Touring Inc. (Britney Tours); and the Co-Conservators of the Estate of Britney Jean Spears (Co- Conservators), on behalf of defendant Britney Jean Spears (Spears) s/h/a Britney Spears (Spears). Deadline extended to 7/23/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/10. (ehs, )
July 16, 2010 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #56 Amended Complaint, by Britney Touring, Inc., Britney Spears, Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
July 16, 2010 Filing 70 First Amended ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint, by Los Angeles Lakers, Inc..(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 30, 2010 Filing 69 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Steve Dixon, Music Tour Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Music Tour)(ehs, )
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Leave to File amended complaint. Plaintiff may amend its original complaint to join Steve Dixon and Music Tour Management, Inc. as additional defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/29/10. (ehs, )
June 1, 2010 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and to Join Steve Dixon and Music Tour Management, Inc. as Additional Defendants filed by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Burk, Michael)
May 21, 2010 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and to Join Steve Dixon and Music Tour Management, Inc. as Additional Defendants filed by Britney Touring, Inc., Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Britney Spears, Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake. (Ainsworth, Charles)
May 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendants file their Motion for Leave to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Its Original Complaint and to Join Steve Dixon and Music Tour Management, Inc. as Additional Defendants on 5/21/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/18/2010. (ch, )
May 17, 2010 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Original Complaint and to Join Steve Dixon and Music Tour Management, Inc. as Additional Defendants by Britney Touring, Inc., Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Britney Spears, Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 13, 2010 Filing 63 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Central District of California filed by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Burk, Michael)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #60 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on their Reply to Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/11/2010. (ch, )
May 10, 2010 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Central District of California filed by Britney Touring, Inc., Britney Spears, Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew Langsam, #2 Affidavit of Pamela Daniels)(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 10, 2010 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Reply to Motion to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California by Britney Touring, Inc., Britney Spears, Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to The Central District of California. ORDER that Plaintiff may exceed the 15-page limit set by Local Rule CV-71a)(2) and file a Response in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue that is approximately 25 pages in lenght (not including exhibits). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/3/10. (poa, )
April 30, 2010 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Central District of California by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael)
April 30, 2010 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Central District of California filed by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1-3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Burk, Michael)
April 30, 2010 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Britney Touring, Inc., Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Britney Spears, Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake, Steve Dixon, Music Tour Management, Inc., filed by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Burk, Michael)
April 30, 2010 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and to Join Steve Dixon and Music Tour Management, Inc. as Additional Defendants by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit)(Burk, Michael)
March 25, 2010 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Bryant Meyertons on behalf of Large Audience Display Systems, LLC (Meyertons, Eric)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue Responses due by 4/30/2010 Dft shall have 17 days after the court rules on Dfts Joint Motion to Transfer to file response to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/24/2010. (ch, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 52 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael)
March 16, 2010 Filing 51 Amended MOTION to Strike by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael)
March 16, 2010 Filing 50 MOTION to Strike by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Burk, Michael)
March 16, 2010 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC (Burk, Michael)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #44 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC as to deft Pussycat Dolls LLC. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/16/10. (ehs, )
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/16/2010. (ch, )
March 12, 2010 Filing 46 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake, Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Britney Spears, Britney Touring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Andrew Langsam, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Langsam, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Langsam, #4 Affidavit Declaration of James L. Perzik, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Kevin Bilida, #6 Affidavit of James Childress, #7 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Childress, #8 Affidavit Steve Dixon, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
March 12, 2010 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake, Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Britney Spears, Britney Touring, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
March 12, 2010 Filing 44 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2010: #2 Revised Order) (sm, ).
March 12, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT AND ATTACHING A PDF ORDER. Document # 38, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 12, 2010 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake, Britney Spears, Britney Touring, Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles)
March 12, 2010 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake, Britney Spears, Britney Touring, Inc..(Ainsworth, Charles)
March 12, 2010 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah E Bell on behalf of Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake, Britney Spears (Bell, Sarah)
March 12, 2010 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry E Negrin on behalf of Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake, Britney Spears (Negrin, Barry)
March 12, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew S Langsam on behalf of Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake, Britney Spears (Langsam, Andrew)
March 11, 2010 Filing 38 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Claims Against Pussycat Dolls, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael) Modified on 3/12/2010 (sm, ).
March 10, 2010 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake, Britney Spears, Britney Touring, Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles)
March 10, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake, Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Britney Spears, Britney Touring, Inc. (Parker, Robert)
March 10, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake, Los Angeles Lakers, Inc., Britney Spears, Britney Touring, Inc. (Bunt, Robert)
March 2, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Tennman Productions, LLC to 3/12/2010; Justin Timberlake to 3/12/2010; Los Angeles Lakers, Inc. to 3/12/2010; Britney Spears to 3/12/2010; Britney Touring, Inc. to 3/12/2010; Pussycat Dolls, LLC to 3/12/2010. (ehs, )
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. the deadline for Defendant Pussycat Dolls LLC to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is hereby extended to and including March 12, 2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/2/10. (ehs, )
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Defendants, TENNMAN PRODUCTIONS, LLC, JUSTIN TIMBERLAKE,BRITNEY TOURING, INC. and BRITNEY SPEARS, to file its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaintfor Patent Infringement or to otherwise respond is extended to March 12, 2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/2/10. (ehs, )
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Defendant, LOS ANGELES LAKERS, INC., to file its Answerto Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement or to otherwise respond is extended to March 12,2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/2/10. (ehs, )
March 1, 2010 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC, Pussycat Dolls, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Montgomery, M.)
March 1, 2010 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Los Angeles Lakers, Inc..(Ainsworth, Charles)
March 1, 2010 Filing 29 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Tennman Productions, Justin Timberlake, Britney Spears and Britney Touring by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael)
March 1, 2010 Filing 28 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Los Angeles Lakers, Inc. by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael)
February 19, 2010 Filing 27 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stanley M Gibson for Los Angeles Lakers, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-0021141) (ehs, )
February 19, 2010 Filing 26 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Rod S Berman for Los Angeles Lakers, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-0021141) (ehs, )
February 9, 2010 Filing 25 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #24 Notice of Attorney Appearance.. (Beard, Ryan)
February 9, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan T Beard on behalf of Large Audience Display Systems, LLC (Beard, Ryan)
January 25, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Tennman Productions, LLC to 3/1/2010; Justin Timberlake to 3/1/2010; Britney Spears to 3/1/2010; Britney Touring, Inc. to 3/1/2010. (ch, )
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Tennman Productions LLC., Justin Timberlake, Britney Touring, Inc., and Britney Spears deadline is extended to 3/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/25/2010. (ch, )
January 25, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Pussycat Dolls, LLC to 3/1/2010. (ch, )
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Pussycat Dolls LLC deadline is extended to 3/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/25/2010. (ch, )
January 22, 2010 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Pussycat Dolls by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael)
January 22, 2010 Filing 20 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendants Tennman Productions, LLC, Justin Timberlake, Britney Touring, INC & Britney Spears by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael)
January 19, 2010 Filing 19 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Aaron A Barlow for Pussycat Dolls, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5145) (ehs, )
January 8, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Los Angeles Lakers, Inc. to 3/1/2010. (ch, )
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Los Angeles Lakers Inc deadline is extended to 3/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/8/2010. (ch, )
January 7, 2010 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Los Angeles Lakers, INC. by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael)
December 22, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Britney Touring, Inc. to 1/30/2010. (ehs, )
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant, BRITNEY TOURING, INC., to file its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement or to otherwise respond is extended to January 30, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/22/09. (ehs, )
December 18, 2009 Filing 15 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew S Langsam for Britney Touring, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5097) (ehs, )
December 18, 2009 Filing 14 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Barry E Negrin for Britney Touring, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5097) (ehs, )
December 18, 2009 Filing 13 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sarah E Bell for Britney Touring, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5097) (ehs, )
December 18, 2009 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Britney Touring, Inc. by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael)
December 18, 2009 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #11 Agreed Motion to extend time submitted by Britney Touring, Inc.. Atty did not sign pleading. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. This motion is now terminated. (sm, )
December 17, 2009 Filing 11 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Britney Touring Inc. by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael) Modified on 12/18/2009 (sm, ).
December 16, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Pussycat Dolls, LLC to 1/29/2010. (ch, )
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft PussyCat Dolls LLC deadline is extended to 1/29/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/16/09. (ch, )
December 15, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Pussycat Dolls, LLC (Montgomery, M.)
December 15, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Pussycat Dolls, LLC (Heartfield, J)
December 15, 2009 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer For Defendant Pussycat Dolls, LLC by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burk, Michael)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Los Angeles Lakers Inc deadline is extended to 1/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/11/09. (ch, )
December 10, 2009 Filing 5 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Los Angeles Lakers by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Burk, Michael)
November 12, 2009 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Large Audience Display Systems, LLC (ch, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/12/09. (ch, )
November 12, 2009 Filing 2 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Britney Spears, (Attachments: #1 Britney Touring Inc., #2 Justin Timberlake, #3 Los Angeles Lakers (agent), #4 Pussycat Dolls LLC, #5 Tennman Productions LLS)(ch, )
November 12, 2009 Case Assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
November 11, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002237107.), filed by Large Audience Display Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Burk, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Large Audience Display Systems, LLC v. Tennman Productions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Lakers, Inc.
Represented By: Stanley M Gibson
Represented By: Rod S Berman
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Timberlake
Represented By: Barry Evan Negrin
Represented By: Andrew S Langsam
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Sarah E Bell
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Music Tour Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pussycat Dolls, LLC
Represented By: Aaron A Barlow
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennman Productions, LLC
Represented By: Barry Evan Negrin
Represented By: Andrew S Langsam
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Sarah E Bell
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britney Spears
Represented By: Barry Evan Negrin
Represented By: Andrew S Langsam
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Sarah E Bell
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Dixon
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britney Touring, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Evan Negrin
Represented By: Andrew S Langsam
Represented By: Sarah E Bell
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Large Audience Display Systems, LLC
Represented By: Eric Bryant Meyertons
Represented By: Michael Gainer Burk
Represented By: Ryan T Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?