Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc v. Acer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc
Defendant: Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation, Apple Inc, AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, Exedea Inc, Google Inc., HTC Corporation, HTC America Inc., LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Motorola Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., Palm Inc., Qualcomm Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation and Texas Instruments Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00185
Filed: June 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2010 Filing 139 RESPONSE to Motion re 130 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Inequitable Conduct Defenses and Counterclaims Asserted by Defendants filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Palm Inc., Qualcomm Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - D)(Gillam, Harry)
September 14, 2010 Filing 138 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew Robson for Qualcomm Inc.. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-5630) (ehs, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 137 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Luann Loraine Simmons for Google Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5619. (ch, )
September 1, 2010 Filing 136 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT by Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation.(Chen, Kyle)
September 1, 2010 Filing 135 RESPONSE to 102 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC's Counterclaims by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. (Grinstein, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 134 RESPONSE to 88 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Google Inc.'s Counterclaims by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. (Grinstein, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 133 RESPONSE to 91 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Motorola Inc.'s Counterclaims by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. (Grinstein, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 132 RESPONSE to 90 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Texas Instruments Incorporated's Counterclaims by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. (Grinstein, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 131 RESPONSE to 112 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Counterclaims by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. (Grinstein, Joseph)
September 1, 2010 Filing 130 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike Inequitable Conduct Defenses and Counterclaims Asserted by Defendants by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Grinstein, Joseph)
August 25, 2010 Filing 129 AMENDED ANSWER to Microunity System Engineering, Inc.'s 1 Complaint,,, For Patent Infringement by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2010 Filing 128 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Paul Anderson on behalf of Cellco Partnership (Anderson, Kevin)
August 24, 2010 Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karin Hessler on behalf of Cellco Partnership (Hessler, Karin)
August 12, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 87, Answer. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 121 *** (ehs, )
August 12, 2010 Filing 126 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Exedea Inc identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation for Exedea Inc. (Chen, Kyle)
August 12, 2010 Filing 125 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HTC America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation for HTC America Inc.. (Chen, Kyle)
August 12, 2010 Filing 124 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HTC Corporation (Chen, Kyle)
August 12, 2010 Filing 123 RESPONSE to 1 Complaint,,, 103 Answer to Complaint (Corrected) by Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation. (Chen, Kyle)
August 12, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
August 12, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 116 submitted by Exedea Inc. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
August 12, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 115 submitted by HTC America Inc.. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
August 12, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 114 submitted by HTC Corporation. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
August 12, 2010 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 103 submitted by Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation. NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
August 12, 2010 Filing 121 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 87 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR*** LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc by LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., LG Electronics Inc..(Heartfield, J) Modified on 8/12/2010 (ehs, ).
August 11, 2010 Filing 120 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. (Ratinoff, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2010 Filing 119 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc..(Ratinoff, Jeffrey)
August 11, 2010 Filing 118 PALM, INC.'S ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc by Palm Inc..(Day, Margaret)
August 11, 2010 Filing 117 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Palm Inc. (Day, Margaret)
August 11, 2010 Filing 116 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Exedea Inc identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation for Exedea Inc. (Chen, Kyle) Modified on 8/12/2010 (ch, ).
August 11, 2010 Filing 115 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HTC America Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation for HTC America Inc.. (Chen, Kyle) Modified on 8/12/2010 (ch, ).
August 11, 2010 Filing 114 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HTC Corporation (Chen, Kyle) Modified on 8/12/2010 (ch, ).
August 11, 2010 Filing 113 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc (Stephens, Garland)
August 11, 2010 Filing 112 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc by Apple Inc.(Stephens, Garland)
August 11, 2010 Filing 111 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola Inc., (Abraham, Amanda)
August 11, 2010 Filing 110 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sprint Nextel Corporation (Weber, Robert)
August 11, 2010 Filing 109 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, and Affirmative Defenses by Sprint Nextel Corporation.(Weber, Robert)
August 11, 2010 Filing 108 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Qualcomm Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Qualcomm Inc.. (Gillam, Harry)
August 11, 2010 Filing 107 Qualcomm Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc by Qualcomm Inc..(Gillam, Harry)
August 11, 2010 Filing 106 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Telecommunications America LLC identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics America, Inc. for Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Jones, Michael)
August 11, 2010 Filing 105 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Semiconductor Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics America, Inc. for Samsung Semiconductor Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
August 11, 2010 Filing 104 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., identifying Corporate Parent None for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,. (Jones, Michael)
August 11, 2010 Filing 103 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by MicroUnity Systems Engineering Inc. by Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation.(Chen, Kyle) Modified on 8/12/2010 (ch, ).
August 11, 2010 Filing 102 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc by Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Telecommunications America LLC.(Jones, Michael)
August 11, 2010 Filing 101 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Mobility Corporation, Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance, LLC, Corporate Parent SBC Alloy Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Corporate Parent New BellSouth Cingular Holdings, Inc. for AT&T Mobility LLC. (Clonts, David)
August 11, 2010 Filing 100 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Inc (Clonts, David)
August 11, 2010 Filing 99 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC.(Clonts, David)
August 11, 2010 Filing 98 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications, Inc, Corporate Parent Vodafone Group PLC for Cellco Partnership. (Smith, Michael)
August 11, 2010 Filing 97 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Texas Instruments Inc. (Abraham, Amanda)
August 11, 2010 Filing 96 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Cellco Partnership.(Smith, Michael)
August 11, 2010 Filing 95 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nokia Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nokia Corporation, Corporate Parent Nokia Holding, Inc. for Nokia Inc.. (Smith, Michael)
August 11, 2010 Filing 94 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nokia Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Nokia Corporation. (Smith, Michael)
August 11, 2010 Filing 93 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, by Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc..(Smith, Michael)
August 11, 2010 Filing 92 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for LG Electronics Inc.; Corporate Parent LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. for LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
August 11, 2010 Filing 91 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc by Motorola Inc.,.(Abraham, Amanda)
August 11, 2010 Filing 90 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc by Texas Instruments Inc..(Abraham, Amanda)
August 11, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
August 11, 2010 Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Google Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
August 11, 2010 Filing 88 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc by Google Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
August 11, 2010 Filing 87 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 121 ***,br>ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc..(Heartfield, J) Modified on 8/12/2010 (ehs, ).
August 10, 2010 Filing 86 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nora M Puckett for Google Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5551)(ehs, )
August 10, 2010 Filing 85 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Alexas D Skucas for Nokia Corporation,Alexas D Skucas for Nokia Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5543) (ehs, )
August 10, 2010 Filing 84 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey M Ratinoff for Acer America Corporation,Jeffrey M Ratinoff for Acer Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5544) (ehs, )
August 9, 2010 Filing 83 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert F Perry for Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID0 2-1-5543. (ch, )
August 9, 2010 Filing 82 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven T Snyder for Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5543. (ch, )
July 28, 2010 Filing 81 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael G Oleinik for LG Electronics Inc.,Michael G Oleinik for LG Electronics Inc.,Michael G Oleinik for LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5511) (ehs, )
July 28, 2010 Filing 80 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Larry R Schmadeka for LG Electronics Inc.,Larry R Schmadeka for LG Electronics Inc.,Larry R Schmadeka for LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5511) (ehs, )
July 28, 2010 Filing 79 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Soo A Hong for LG Electronics Inc.,Soo A Hong for LG Electronics Inc.,Soo A Hong for LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5511) (ehs, )
July 28, 2010 Filing 78 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan Y Kang for LG Electronics Inc.,Jonathan Y Kang for LG Electronics Inc.,Jonathan Y Kang for LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5511) (ehs, )
July 19, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Google Inc.s deadline extended to 8/11/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/10. (ehs, )
July 15, 2010 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
July 13, 2010 Filing 75 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney George C Yu for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,,George C Yu for Samsung Semiconductor Inc.,George C Yu for Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-0023102)(ehs, )
July 13, 2010 Filing 74 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark E Miller for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,,Mark E Miller for Samsung Semiconductor Inc.,Mark E Miller for Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-0023102) (ehs, )
July 12, 2010 Filing 73 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Palm Inc. served on 6/11/2010 on Joanne Rauch, corporate paralegal authorized to accept service of process, answer due 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
July 12, 2010 Filing 72 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Sprint Nextel Corporation served on 6/24/2010 on Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
July 12, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
July 12, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for LG Electronics Inc. to 8/11/2010; LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. to 8/11/2010. (ch, )
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 69 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft LG Electronics MobileComm USA Inc and LG Electronics Inc deadline is extended to 8/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/2010. (ch, )
July 9, 2010 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond, by LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
July 9, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sprint Nextel Corporation to 8/11/2010. 27 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 9, 2010 Filing 68 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sprint Nextel Corporation.( Weber, Robert)
July 9, 2010 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert William Weber on behalf of Sprint Nextel Corporation (Weber, Robert)
July 7, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. to 7/9/2010. 3 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 6, 2010 Filing 66 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.( Heartfield, J)
July 6, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. (Heartfield, J)
July 2, 2010 Filing 64 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cono A Carrano for AT&T Inc,Cono A Carrano for AT&T Mobility LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5461 (ch, )
July 1, 2010 Filing 63 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Kash for Qualcomm Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5455. (ch, )
July 1, 2010 Filing 62 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Nelson for Qualcomm Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5455. (ch, )
July 1, 2010 Filing 61 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Bauer for Qualcomm Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5455. (ch, )
July 1, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Nokia Corporation to 8/11/2010; Nokia Inc. to 8/11/2010. (ch, )
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nokia Corporation and Nokia Inc deadline is extended to 8/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/1/2010. (ch, )
June 30, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Motorola Inc., to 8/11/2010; Texas Instruments Inc. to 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 54 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deft's Texas Instruments Inc and Motorola Inc deadline extended to 8/11/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/30/10. (ehs, )
June 30, 2010 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
June 29, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Exedea Inc to 8/11/2010; HTC America Inc. to 8/11/2010; HTC Corporation to 8/11/2010. (ch, )
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants HTC Corporation,HTC America, Inc. and Exedea, Inc. deadline is extended to 8/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/29/2010. (ch, )
June 29, 2010 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brendan Clay Roth on behalf of Motorola Inc.,, Texas Instruments Inc. (Roth, Brendan)
June 29, 2010 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl R Roth on behalf of Motorola Inc.,, Texas Instruments Inc. (Roth, Carl)
June 29, 2010 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Motorola Inc.,, Texas Instruments Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abraham, Amanda)
June 28, 2010 Filing 53 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Texas Instruments Inc. served on 6/11/2010 Sarah A Donch - Senior Counsel designated to accept service of process, answer due 7/2/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 52 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Samsung Telecommunications America LLC served on 6/15/2010 on Registered Agent Corporation Service Co d/b/a CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Co, answer due 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 51 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Qualcomm Inc. served on 6/15/2010 on Registered agent Prentice Hall Corp System, answer due 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 50 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Motorola Inc., served on 6/11/2010 on CT Corporation System, answer due 7/2/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 49 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. HTC America Inc. served on 6/21/2010 Registered Agent Christine C Hsu, answer due 7/12/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 48 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Google Inc. served on 6/15/2010 on Registered Agent Corporation Service Co d/b/a CSC-Lawyers Incorp Svc Co, answer due 7/6/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 47 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Cellco Partnership served on 6/11/2010 on David Pagan, answer due 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 46 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. AT&T Mobility LLC served on 6/11/2010 on CT Corporation Systems, answer due 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 45 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. AT&T Inc served on 6/11/2010 through CT Corporation Systems, answer due 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 44 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Apple Inc served on 6/11/2010 by CM RRR on CT Corporaton, answer due 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 43 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Acer America Corporation personally served on 6/11/2010Sandy Galacia Authorized person to accept service, CT Corporation System, answer due 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Exedea Inc, HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Kyle)
June 28, 2010 Filing 41 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Samsung Semiconductor Inc. served National Registered Agents Inc on 6/14/2010, answer due 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 40 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Nokia Inc. served National Registered Agent Inc on 6/14/2010, answer due 7/6/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 39 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc. served National Registered Agent Inc on 6/14/2010, answer due 7/6/2010. (ehs, )
June 28, 2010 Filing 38 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. Exedea Inc personally served on 6/14/2010, answer due 7/6/2010. (ehs, )
June 25, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Cellco Partnership to 8/11/2010. (ch, )
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Cellco deadline is extended to 8/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/24/2010. (ch, )
June 23, 2010 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
June 21, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Samsung Electronics Co., LTD., to 8/11/2010; Samsung Semiconductor Inc. to 8/11/2010; Samsung Telecommunications America LLC to 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC have until and through August 11, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/21/10. (ehs, )
June 18, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Qualcomm Inc. to 8/11/2010. 57 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 18, 2010 Filing 34 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Qualcomm Inc..( Gillam, Harry)
June 18, 2010 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 17, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Francis Reeder on behalf of AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC (Reeder, Michael)
June 17, 2010 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven M Zager on behalf of AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC (Zager, Steven)
June 17, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Mobility LLC to 8/11/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 17, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Inc to 8/11/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 17, 2010 Filing 30 Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Mobility LLC.( Clonts, David)
June 17, 2010 Filing 29 Defendant AT&T Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Inc.( Clonts, David)
June 17, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R Clonts on behalf of AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC (Clonts, David)
June 17, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Acer America Corporation to 8/11/2010; Acer Inc. to 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation shall have through August 11, 2010 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/17/10. (ehs, )
June 16, 2010 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, Or Otherwise Respond by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Lei)
June 16, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Margaret Elizabeth Day on behalf of Palm Inc. (Day, Margaret)
June 16, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Philip Brinkmann on behalf of Apple Inc (Brinkmann, John)
June 16, 2010 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ana Elena Kadala on behalf of Apple Inc (Kadala, Ana)
June 16, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David J Healey on behalf of Apple Inc (Healey, David)
June 16, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garland T Stephens on behalf of Apple Inc (Stephens, Garland)
June 16, 2010 Filing 20 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kelly C Hunsaker for Apple Inc. (RECEIPT 6-1-22688) (rml, )
June 16, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple Inc to 8/11/2010; Palm Inc. to 8/11/2010. (ehs, )
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Apple Inc. shall have until and including August 11, 2010, to answer or otherwise respond to the Original Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/16/10. (ehs, )
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Palm, Inc. will have through August 11, 2010 toanswer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint for Patent Infringement.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/16/10. (ehs, )
June 15, 2010 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond by Palm Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
June 15, 2010 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 15, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc (Capshaw, Sidney)
June 15, 2010 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Apple Inc's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 15, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Apple Inc (Albritton, Eric)
June 9, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Erickson on behalf of Palm Inc. (Erickson, Brian)
June 4, 2010 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Acer America Corporation, (Attachments: # 1 Acer Inc, # 2 Apple Inc, # 3 AT&T Inc, # 4 AT&T Mobility LLC, # 5 Cello Partnership, # 6 Exedea Inc, # 7 Google Inc, # 8 HTC America Inc, # 9 HTC Corporation, # 10 LG Electronics Inc, # 11 LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, # 12 Motorola Inc, # 13 Nokia Corporation, # 14 Nokia Inc, # 15 Palm Inc, # 16 Qualcomm Incorporated, # 17 Samsung Electronics Co LTD # 18 Samsung Semiconductor Inc, # 19 Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, # 20 Sprint Nextel Corporation, # 21 Texas Instruments)(ch, )
June 4, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max Lalon Tribble, Jr on behalf of Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc (Tribble, Max)
June 4, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc (Grinstein, Joseph)
June 3, 2010 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc (ch, )
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/3/2010. (ch, )
June 3, 2010 Case assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
June 3, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Collin Michael Maloney on behalf of Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc (Maloney, Collin)
June 3, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc (Carroll, Otis)
June 3, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan J Davis on behalf of Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc (Davis, Nathan)
June 3, 2010 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Ron Wilson on behalf of Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc (Wilson, Douglas)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael F Heim on behalf of Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc (Heim, Michael)
June 3, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC, Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., Apple Inc, Cellco Partnership, Exedea Inc, Google Inc., HTC America Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc., Motorola Inc.,, Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., Palm Inc., Qualcomm Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.,, Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Texas Instruments Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2513044.), filed by Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit C-1, # 4 Exhibit U part 1, # 5 Exhibit U part 2, # 6 Exhibit U part 3, # 7 Exhibit U part 4, # 8 Exhibit U part 5)(Susman, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc v. Acer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microunity Systems Engineering, Inc
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exedea Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics MobileComm USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualcomm Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Telecommunications America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Instruments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?