GeoTag Inc v. Frontier Communications Corp et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: GeoTag Inc
Defendant: Local Corporation, Academy, LTD, Dex One Corporation, Center'd Corporation, "hibu Inc.", CityGrid Media, LLC, Columbia SportsWear North America Inc, Go2 Media, Inc., Windstream Communications, Inc., Intelius, Inc., Magicyellow, Inc., Canon U.S.A. Inc., Local.com Corporation and Yelp!, Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: HomeAdvisor, Inc., Conn's Inc., PSP Group, LLC, Wendy's/Arby's Group Inc, Mee Accessories LLC, Canon USA Inc, Kroger Texas LP, 24 Hour Fitness Worldwide Inc., Gander Mountain Company, Leo's Dancewear Inc, Petco Animal Supplies Stores Inc, CONN, National Interlock Systems Inc, Petsmart Inc, Spencer Gifts LLC, Hagger Clothing Co, Factory Connection LLC, Valspar Corporation, Geoffrey LLC, Coldwater Creek Inc., Genesco Inc., Eye Care Centers of America, Inc., Trane Inc, BJ's Wholesale Club Inc, Old Navy LLC, Hickory Farms Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp, Levi Strauss & Co, Pet Supplies Plus, Vanguard Car Rental USA Inc, Rolex Watch USA Inc, Citi Trends Inc., The Kroger Co, Burberry Limited, Cinemark USA Inc, Life Time Fitness Inc., Wendy's International Inc, Gucci America Inc, General Nutrition Corporation, Petco Animal Supplies Inc, Belk Inc, U.S. Vision Inc., Web Team Associates, Inc., Brookstone Company Inc, Randall's Food Markets Inc, Radio Shack Corp, Toys "R" Us Inc, Diesel U.S.A. Inc., Ralph Lauren Media LLC, Kubota Tractor Corporation, Coach Inc, Charming Shoppes Inc., Barnes & Noble Inc, Kampgrounds of America d/b/a KOA, Advance Auto Parts Inc, Kohl's Department Stores Inc, LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton Inc., Dollar Tree Inc, BPS Direct LLC, Great Clips Inc., Avis Rent A Car System LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Penske Automotive Group Inc, Safeway Inc, Big Lots Stores Inc, Aeropostale Inc, MIELE, INC., Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Payless Car Rental System Inc, Sunbelt Rentals, Inc., Wendy's/Arby's Restaurants LLC, ASICS America Corp, Godiva Chocolatier Inc, Bass Pro Outdoors Online LLC, GSI Commerce Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, The Sports Authority Inc, Dillon Companies Inc, The Finish Line Inc., Alamo Rent A Car LLC, E-Advance LLC, The Boeing Co, Kohl's Corporation, Mee Direct LLC, Geo Tag Inc, Nike Inc, J. Crew Group Inc., Buth-Na-Bodhaige Inc, VF Corporation, VIEWSONIC CORP., The Yankee Candle Company, Inc., Nordstrom Inc, Applied Industrial Technologies Inc, Trane US Inc, Cache Inc., Oldemark LLC, VICTORINOX SWISS ARMY, INC., Toys "R" US-Delaware Inc, TCF CO. LLC, New York & Company Inc, American Eagle Outfitters Inc., The William Carter Company, GAP Inc, Interstate Battery Systems of America Inc, Vitamin Shoppe Industries, Inc., Columbia SportsWear USA Corp, Remington Arms Company Inc, Yakira LLC, David's Bridal Inc., Christus Health, Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Avalon Global Group Inc, Chico's FAS Inc., Macy's Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, Kohler Co, BioScrip Inc., Banana Republic LLC, Sephora USA Inc., MEE Apparel, Bally Total Fitness Corporation, Sonic Corporation, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc, Burlington Factory Warehouse Corporation, L.A. Fitness International LLC, Brown Jordan International Inc, CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Kroger Limited Partnership I, Curves International Inc, BOBCAT COMPANY, TA Operating LLC, M.A.C. Cosmetics Inc., Hallmark Cards, Inc., THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INC., Ace Hardware Corp, Toysrus.com LLC, Long John Silver's Inc, Deb Shops Inc., Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, ALCO Stores Inc., Justin Boot Company, JOANN.COM, LLC, National Vision Inc., Rhino Linings Corp, Service Magic Inc, Fred Meyer Stores Inc, Enterprise Holding Inc, Penske System Inc, PATAGONIA, INC., Maurices Inc, Avis Budget Group Inc, Thrifty Inc, Burleigh Point Ltd., Dollar Rent A Car Inc, Sally Beauty Supply LLC, Richemont North America Inc, Brown Shoe Company Inc., Group 1 Automotive Inc, Collective Brands Inc., Quicksilver Inc, Dress Barn Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC, Carhartt Inc, Cost Plus Inc, Match.Com LLC, Vitamin Cottage Natural Food Markets, Inc., U-Haul Leasing & Sales Co., Staples Inc, Gates That Open LLC, BCBG Max Azria Group Inc, Guess Retail Inc., Claire's Boutiques, Inc., SPATIALPOINT LLC, VF Outdoor Inc, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Delias Inc., 7-Eleven, Inc., Bass Pro Inc, Chanel Inc, Columbia Sportswear Company, CHRISTUS HEALTH FOUNDATION, Bare Escentuals Inc., V E W Ltd, Ross Stores Inc, Merle Norman Cosmetics, Guitar Center Inc., American Greetings Corporation, Cinemark Holdings Inc, IQ Services.com, VF Jeanswear LP, Monster Cable Products, Inc., GFM HOLDINGS LLC, DSW Inc., Ritz Interactive LLC, Terex Corporation, Formal Specialists Ltd., Charlotte Ruse Inc, Rolex SA, O'Reilly Automotive Inc, Things Remembered, Inc., The Vons Companies Inc, Target Corp, AutoZone Inc and The Pep Boys -- Manny Moe & Jack
Undetermined: Joe Dodson Clayton
Counter Defendant: iCIMS, Inc.
Special Master: Francis McGovern
Consolidated Plaintiff: Wilke Thornton Inc and Where 2 Get It Inc
Case Number: 2:2010cv00265
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2208 ORDER - the Court enters this Order sua sponte. The Court directs the clerk of the court to terminate as moot the following motions herein. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/23/2015. (ch, )
February 19, 2015 Filing 2207 MOTION clarification of protective order re #480 Protective Order by GeoTag Inc. (Reese, Joel)
February 6, 2015 Filing 2206 NOTICE by VF Corporation Request For Termination of Electronic Notices (Schonberg, Michael)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2205 ORDER granting #2201 Motion to Enforce Judgment of the First Amended Protective Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/21/2015. (ch, )
January 12, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED SEPARATELY. Document # 2204, Additonal attachment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 9, 2015 Filing 2204 ***FILED IN ERROR. ***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #2201 MOTION to Enforce Judgment First Amended Protective Order.. (Reese, Joel) Modified on 1/12/2015 (ch, ).
January 9, 2015 Filing 2203 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Status Conference held on 1/9/2015. (Court Reporter Brenda Butler, CSR.) (jml)
December 15, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference concerning #2201 MOTION to Enforce Judgment First Amended Protective Order by GeoTag Inc. set for 1/9/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
July 28, 2014 Filing 2202 NOTICE by Gander Mountain Company re #2200 Order,,, of Compliance Regarding Payment to Special Master (Blum, Anthony)
June 11, 2014 Filing 2201 MOTION to Enforce Judgment First Amended Protective Order by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2015: #2 Order that Court Specifically requested) (ch, ).
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2200 ORDER the court enters this Order sua sponte. The court has previously ordered that one-half of fees due to Special Master McGoven are to be paid by plaintiff and remaining one-half by the defendants. Attached to this Order as Appendix 1 is Professor McGoverns invoice for services through March 2014. It is hereby ORDERED that all defendants shall remit payment of all amounts due to McGovern within fourteen days of the date of this Order. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send copies of this Order to the counsel indicated on the list attached to this McGoverns invoice. Each counsel receiving this Order is ORDERED to transmit a copy of this Order to each of his or her listed clients, and to ensure their clients prompt compliance with this Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/3/2 014. (ch, )
May 30, 2014 Filing 2199 NOTICE by ASICS America Corp, American Greetings Corporation, Avis Budget Group Inc, Avis Rent A Car System LLC, BJ's Wholesale Club Inc, Chanel Inc, Charming Shoppes Inc., David's Bridal Inc., Formal Specialists Ltd., Guess Retail Inc., Hot Topic Inc., Kohler Co, Kubota Tractor Corporation, Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Mexican Restaurants Inc, Payless Car Rental System Inc, Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Radio Shack Corp, Rhino Linings Corp, Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. (DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING PAYMENT TO SPECIAL MASTER) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bittner, Michael)
May 21, 2014 Filing 2198 NOTICE by National Vision Inc., Regis Corporation re #2187 Order,,, Notice of Compliance Regarding Payment to Special Master (Baker, Charles)
May 20, 2014 Filing 2197 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Notice of Compliance with Protective Order (Vakil, Bijal)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2196 ORDER granting #2193 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jennifer Gossain is terminated as attorney. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/20/2014. (ch, )
May 19, 2014 Filing 2195 NOTICE by Intelius, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Payment to Special Master (Craft, Roger)
May 17, 2014 Filing 2194 NOTICE by Carr-Gottstein Foods Co, Chick-Fil-A Inc, Frederick's of Hollywood Stores Inc., GFM HOLDINGS LLC, Genuardi's Family Markets LP, JO-ANN STORES, INC., JOANN.COM, LLC, Michaels Stores Inc, New York & Company Inc, PATAGONIA, INC., RANDALL'S FOOD & DRUGS LP, Randall's Food Markets Inc, Safeway Inc, TCF CO. LLC, THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INC., The Timberland Company, The Vons Companies Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, VIEWSONIC CORP., WHERE 2 GET IT, INC. re #2187 Order,,, in Compliance re: Special Master McGovern (Schwartz, Daniel)
May 16, 2014 Filing 2193 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jennifer Gossain by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gossain, Jennifer)
May 16, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 2191 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
May 15, 2014 Filing 2192 NOTICE by Dots, LLC, M.A.C. Cosmetics Inc. re #2187 Order,,, in Compliance re: Special Master McGovern (Yang, Irene)
May 15, 2014 Filing 2191 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jennifer P. Gossain by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gossain, Jennifer) Modified on 5/16/2014 (ch, ).
May 8, 2014 Filing 2190 NOTICE by Groupe Dynamite, Inc., The Sports Authority Inc re #2187 Order,,, of Compliance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chow, Michael)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2189 ORDER granting #2188 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David R Bennett terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2014. (ch, )
May 1, 2014 Filing 2188 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney David R. Bennett by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2187 ORDER The Court enters this Order sua sponte. The Court has previously ordered that one-half of fees due to Special Master McGovern (McGovern) are to be paid by the plaintiff and the remaining one-half of fees are to be paid collectively by the defendants (Dkt. No. 577). Dfts are to remit payment of all amounts due within fourteen days of the date of this order. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send copies of this Order to the counsel indicated on the list attached to this Order as Appendix 10. Each counsel receiving this Order is ORDERED to transmit a copy of this Order to each of his or her listed clients, and to ensure their clients prompt compliance with this order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/1/2014. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3, #4 Appendix 4, #5 Appendix 5, #6 Appendix 6, #7 Appendix 7, #8 Appendix 8, #9 Appendix 9, #10 Appendix 10)(ch, )
April 22, 2014 Filing 2186 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Reese, Joel)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2185 ORDER; it is hereby ORDERED that this case is stayed with respect to Defendant Coldwater Creek, Inc. in accordance with 11 U.S.C. 362. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/21/14. (mrm, )
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2184 ORDER, granting #2179 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant National Vision, Inc. with Prejudice filed by GeoTag Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/21/14. (mrm, )
April 17, 2014 Filing 2183 NOTICE by Jimmy Jazz Inc. re #2178 Sealed Response to Motion, of Joinder (Noteware, Daniel)
April 17, 2014 Filing 2181 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #2168 SEALED MOTION to Disburse Proceeds Under Settlement Agreements filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reese Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - email to Tobey)(Reese, Joel)
April 15, 2014 Filing 2182 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Status Conference held on 4/15/2014. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (jml)
April 15, 2014 Filing 2180 NOTICE by AutoZone Inc, Big Lots Inc, Big Lots Stores Inc, Carmax Business Services LLC, Carmax Inc, Collective Brands Inc., Dillard's Inc, Gamestop Corp, Guitar Center Inc., Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Inc, Solutia Inc, The Finish Line Inc., The Pep Boys -- Manny Moe & Jack, The TJX Companies Inc, The William Carter Company, Zale Delaware Inc re #2167 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, of Payment to Special Master (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Confirmation Email)(Jivani, Kamran)
April 15, 2014 Filing 2179 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant National Vision, Inc. with Prejudice by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sanderson, Adam)
April 14, 2014 Filing 2178 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #2168 SEALED MOTION to Disburse Proceeds Under Settlement Agreements - Settling Defendants' Response in Opposition to GeoTag's Motion to Disburse Proceeds Under Settlement Agreements filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bijal V. Vakil, #2 Exhibit 1 to Vakil Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Vakil Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
April 14, 2014 Filing 2177 NOTICE by Ace Hardware Corp, Aeropostale Inc, Babiesrus.com LLC, Charlotte Ruse Inc, Christopher & Banks Corp, Cost Plus Inc, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, GSI Commerce Inc, General Nutrition Centers Inc, General Nutrition Corporation, Geoffrey LLC, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Haggar Direct Inc, Hagger Clothing Co, Levi Strauss & Co, Maurices Inc, Mee Accessories LLC, Mee Direct LLC, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Quicksilver Inc, Spanx Inc, The Sports Authority Inc, Toys "R" US-Delaware Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, Toysrus.com LLC, Vera Wang Bridal House Ltd, Yakira LLC re #2167 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, of Payment to Special Master (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chow, Michael)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2176 ORDER, granting #2173 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor iCIMS, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/14/14. (mrm, )
April 14, 2014 Filing 2175 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Coldwater Creek Inc. by Coldwater Creek Inc.. (Brann, Peter)
April 12, 2014 Filing 2174 NOTICE by 7-Eleven, Inc., Bare Escentuals Inc., Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, Crabtree & Evelyn, Gold's Gym International Inc., Sephora USA Inc. of Payment to Special Master (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dorval, Deirdre)
April 11, 2014 Filing 2173 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Intervenor iCIMS, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
April 11, 2014 Filing 2172 SEALED MOTION Supplement to Motion to Disburse Proceeds Under Settlement Agreements by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Supplement to Veenstra Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2014: #3 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
April 9, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference RESET for 4/15/2014 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***Please note that only the time for the hearing has changed.***(jml)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2171 ORDER, granting #2170 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP filed by GeoTag Inc. H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/2/14. (mrm, )
April 1, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, PROPOSED ORDER FILED BY ITSELF (CLERK HAS ATTACHED THIS REVISED ORDER TO #2168). Document # 2169, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 31, 2014 Filing 2170 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 31, 2014 Filing 2169 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Sealed Document. (Reese, Joel) Modified on 4/1/2014 (sm, ).
March 28, 2014 Filing 2168 SEALED MOTION to Disburse Proceeds Under Settlement Agreements by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Veenstra Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Johnston ltr, #3 Exhibit 2 - Reese ltr, #4 Exhibit 3 - Opinion 610, #5 Exhibit 4 - Clark ltr, #6 Exhibit 5 - engagement ltr, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2014: #8 REVISED PROPOSED ORDER (no lines)) (sm, ).
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2167 ORDER - To remit full payment in the amounts listed in the attached Appendix D to the Special Master, Francis E. McGovern, c/o Viebig, McCommon & Associates, 401 W. Alabama Street, Houston, Texas 77006, no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Status Conference set for 4/15/2014 12:00 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/21/2014. (nkl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2014: #1 Appendix Appendix D) (nkl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2014: #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C) (nkl, ).
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2166 ORDER granting #2148 Motion for Summary Judgment of non-infringement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/18/2014. (ch, )
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2165 ORDER granting #2147 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Wal-mart Stored Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/18/2014. (ch, )
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2164 ORDER granting #2146 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Gander Mountain Company is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/18/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2163 ORDER granting #2137 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Eye Care Centers of American Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2162 ORDER granting #2132 Motion to Dismiss Dft VF Corporation is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2161 ORDER granting #2145 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Things Remembered Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2160 ORDER granting #2144 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Spencer Gifts LLC is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2159 ORDER granting #2143 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Ritz Interactive LLC is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2158 ORDER granting #2142 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Regis Corporation is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2157 ORDER granting #2141 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Kohler Co is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2156 ORDER granting #2140 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Jimmy Jazz Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2155 ORDER granting #2139 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Hot Topic Inc is dimissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2154 ORDER granting #2138 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Genesco Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2153 ORDER granting #2135 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Kubota Tractor Corporation is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2152 ORDER granting #2134 Motion to Dismiss. American Apparel Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 NOTICE from clerk - # 2151 is DUPLICATE ORDER PLEASE IGNORE (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2151 ***DUPLICATE ORDER***ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal. National Vision Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/18/2014. (ch, ) Modified on 3/18/2014 (ch, ).
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2150 ORDER granting #2133 Motion to Dismiss. Dft National Vision Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2149 ORDER granting #2128 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Terex Corporation is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/14. (ch, )
March 17, 2014 Filing 2148 Agreed MOTION for Summary Judgment Entry of Final Judgment as to GeoTag, Inc.'s Claims Against Defendant Eddie Bauer, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 17, 2014 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: The Show Cause/Status Conference hearing previously set on March 18, 2014 at 12:00 p.m. is CANCELLED (jml)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2147 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2146 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gander Mountain Company by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2145 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Things Remembered, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2144 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Spencer Gifts, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2143 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ritz Interactive, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2142 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Regis Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2141 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kohler Co. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2140 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jimmy Jazz, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2139 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hot Topic, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2138 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Genesco, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 17, 2014 Filing 2137 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Eye Care Centers of America, Inc. n/k/a Visionworks of America, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 14, 2014 Filing 2136 Joint MOTION Seven-Day Extension of Stay Concerning All Deadlines Applicable To Claims Involving Defendant H&M Hennes & Mauritz, L.P. by GeoTag Inc, H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John)
March 14, 2014 Filing 2135 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Kubota Tractor Corp. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 14, 2014 Filing 2134 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant American Apparel, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 14, 2014 Filing 2133 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant National Vision, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 14, 2014 Filing 2132 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant VF Corporation (d/b/a 7 For All Mankind; d/b/a 7 Fam; Seven Jeans; d/b/a Lucy Activewear Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2131 ORDER granting #2122 Motion to Dismiss. David Bridals Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/14/2014. (ch, )
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2130 ORDER granting #2124 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Guess? Rental Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/14/2014. (ch, )
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2129 ORDER granting #2123 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Dollar Tree Management Inc dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/14/2014. (ch, )
March 14, 2014 Filing 2128 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Terex Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2127 ORDER granting #2121 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Regis Corporation is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2014. (ch, )
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2126 ORDER granting #2120 Motion to Dismiss. Academy Ltd is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2014. (ch, )
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2125 ORDER granting #2119 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Deer & Company is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2014. (ch, )
March 14, 2014 Filing 2124 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Guess? Retail, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 14, 2014 Filing 2123 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dollar Tree Management, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 14, 2014 Filing 2122 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant David's Bridal, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 13, 2014 Filing 2121 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Regis Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 13, 2014 Filing 2120 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendant Academy, Ltd. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 13, 2014 Filing 2119 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendant Deere & Company by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 13, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 3/18/2014 12:00 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2118 ORDER granting #2116 Motion to Stay. Deadlines between plaintiff and dft Jimmy Jazz Inc are Stayed up to 3/17/2014, if dismissal papers are not filed by 5:00 pm on 3/17/2014, they are ORDERED to appear before the court on 3/18/2014 @ 12:00 pm to show cause. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2014. (ch, )
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2117 ORDER granting #2115 Motion to Dismiss.ft Trane US Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2014. (ch, )
March 12, 2014 Filing 2116 Agreed MOTION to Stay Extend Stay as Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Jimmy Jazz, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 12, 2014 Filing 2115 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Trane U.S., Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2114 ORDER granting #1949 Motion to Sever. Defendant BCBG MaxAzria Group, Inc. are hereby severed from Civil Action No. 2:10- CV-00265-JRG and Civil Action No. 2:10-CV-00587-JRG, and are to proceed under a new cause number to be assigned by the clerk of the Court. The requirement for a filing fee in this new case is ORDERED to be waived. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/12/2014. (ch, )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2113 ORDER granting #2108 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company; National Car Rental System, Inc.; Vanguard Car Rental USA Inc.; and Vanguard Car Rental Group Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/12/2014. (ch, )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2112 ORDER granting #2107 Motion to Dismiss=. Payless Car Sales, Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/12/2014. (ch, )
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2111 ORDER granting #2105 Motion to Dismiss. Enterprise Holdings, Inc.; Vanguard Car Rental USA, LLC; and Alamo Rent A Car, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/12/2014. (ch, )
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2110 ORDER, granting and denying in part #2080 (JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND STAY AND REQUEST FOR HEARING) filed by Deere & Company, GeoTag Inc, Things Remembered, Inc., Dollar Tree Inc, Hot Topic Inc., Spencer Gifts LLC, Guess Retail Inc., Kubota Tractor Corporation, Kohler Co, National Vision Inc., David's Bridal Inc., Regis Corporation; granting and denying in part #2101 Agreed MOTION to Stay filed by Deere & Company. (Hearing set for 3/18/2014 12:00 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.) Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/11/14. (mrm, )
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2109 ORDER, granting #1969 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc. and Big Lots, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. Big Lots Inc and Big Lots Stores Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/11/14. (mrm, )
March 11, 2014 Filing 2108 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 11, 2014 Filing 2107 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Payless Car Sales, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2106 ORDER granting #2090 Motion to Stay. Between plaintiff and dft Terex. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/10/2014. (ch, )
March 10, 2014 Filing 2105 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Enterprise Holdings, Inc.; Vanguard Car Rental USA, LLC; and Alamo Rent A Car, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 10, 2014 Filing 2104 STIPULATION re #2090 Joint MOTION to Stay re #1996 Order on Motion to Stay for Joinder and Request for Hearing by Terex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Thomas)
March 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2103 ORDER granting #2102 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on March 7, 2014. (jml)
March 7, 2014 Filing 2102 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant H&M Hennes & Mauritz, L.P. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 7, 2014 Filing 2101 Agreed MOTION to Stay by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buss, Brian)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2100 ORDER granting #2097 Motion to Stay. Deadlines between plaintiff and dft American Apparel Inc are stayed up to 3/14/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/7/2014. (ch, )
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2099 ORDER granting #2095 Motion to Stay. Deadlines between plaintiff and dft Wal-Mart Stores, Inc is stayed up to 3/19/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/7/2014. (ch, )
March 7, 2014 Filing 2098 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Dermot Marketos on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Marketos, Peter)
March 7, 2014 Filing 2097 Agreed MOTION to Stay Extend Stay as Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant American Apparel, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2096 ORDER granting #2094 Motion to Dismiss. Dft DSW Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/6/2014. (ch, )
March 6, 2014 Filing 2095 Agreed MOTION to Stay Extend Stay as Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 5, 2014 Filing 2094 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Defendant DSW, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2093 ORDER granting #2091 Motion to Dismiss. Dft BJ's Wholesale Club Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/4/2014. (ch, )
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2092 ORDER granting #2089 Motion to Dismiss. Dft 7-Eleven Inc and Seven & Holdings Co LTD and Seven-Eleven Japan Co Ltd is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/4/2014. (ch, )
March 4, 2014 Filing 2091 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 4, 2014 Filing 2090 Joint MOTION to Stay re #1996 Order on Motion to Stay by Academy, LTD, GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Motion to Extend Stay and Request for Hearing - Lien Letter, #2 Text of Proposed Order granting Joint Motion to Extend Stay and Request for Hearing)(Drake, Kirby)
March 4, 2014 Filing 2089 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants 7-Eleven, Inc.; Seven & I Holdings Co., Ltd.; and Seven-Eleven Japan Co., Ltd. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2088 ORDER granting #2074 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Genesco Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2087 ORDER granting #2073 Motion to Stay. All deadlines are stayed between plaintiff and dft Tered Corporation untiol 3/3/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2086 ORDER granting #2072 Motion to Dismiss. The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2085 ORDER granting #2068 Motion to Dismiss. Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation and Ralph Lauren Media, LLC is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2084 ORDER granting #2066 Motion to Dismiss. The Dress Barn, Inc. and RadioShack Corporation is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2083 ORDER granting #2064 Motion to Dismiss. Avis Budget Group, Inc.; Avis Rent ACar System, LLC; Payless Car Rental System, Inc.; Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc.; Dollar Rent A Car, Inc.; and Thrifty, Inc. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2082 ORDER granting #2065 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Charming Shoppes Inc dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
February 28, 2014 Filing 2081 RESPONSE to Motion re #1967 Amended MOTION in Limine filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John)
February 28, 2014 Filing 2080 Joint MOTION to Stay (JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND STAY AND REQUEST FOR HEARING) by David's Bridal Inc., Deere & Company, Dollar Tree Inc, GeoTag Inc, Guess Retail Inc., Hot Topic Inc., Kohler Co, Kubota Tractor Corporation, National Vision Inc., Regis Corporation, Spencer Gifts LLC, Things Remembered, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2079 ORDER granting #2067 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Luxottica Retail North America Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2078 ORDER granting #2069 Motion to Dismiss. Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2077 ORDER granting #2070 Motion to Dismiss. Dft The Finsh Line Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2076 ORDER granting #2071 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Guitar Center Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2075 ORDER granting #2044 Motion to Stay. Deadlines between plaintiff and dft National Vision Inc is stayed until 3/1/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
February 27, 2014 Filing 2074 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Genesco Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 27, 2014 Filing 2073 Agreed MOTION to Stay Extend Stay as to Defendant Terex Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 27, 2014 Filing 2072 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 27, 2014 Filing 2071 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Guitar Center, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 27, 2014 Filing 2070 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant The Finish Line, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 26, 2014 Filing 2069 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 26, 2014 Filing 2068 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation and Ralph Lauren Media, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 26, 2014 Filing 2067 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Luxottica Retail North America Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 26, 2014 Filing 2066 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants The Dress Barn, Inc. and RadioShack Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 26, 2014 Filing 2065 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Charming Shoppes, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 26, 2014 Filing 2064 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Avis Budget Group, Inc.; Avis Rent A Car System, LLC; Payless Car Rental System, Inc.; Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc.; Dollar Rent A Car, Inc.; and Thrifty, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2063 ORDER granting #2045 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant AutoZone, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. AutoZone Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/26/14. (mrm, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2062 ORDER granting #2043 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Mr. Gatti's, L.P. filed by GeoTag Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/26/14. (mrm, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2061 ORDER, granting #2042 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Bare Escentuals, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. Bare Escentuals Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/26/14. (mrm, )
February 26, 2014 Filing 2060 NOTICE by A&W Restaurants Inc, Carhartt Inc, Eyemart Express, Ltd., Long John Silver's Inc of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2059 ORDER granting #2032 Motion for Extension of Stay for Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. Plaintiff and Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. is EXTENDED up to and including March 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/25/14. (mrm, )
February 26, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT ULTA SALON, COSMTICS & FRAGRANCE, INC. submitted document #2053 PDF not editable. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2058 ORDER, granting #2031 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Nike, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. Nike Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/25/14. (mrm, )
February 26, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS submitted document #2052 PDF not editable. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2057 ORDER, denying as moot #2026 Agreed MOTION to Extend Stay as to Defendant Citi Trends, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc, granting #2030 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Citi Trends, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. Citi Trends Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/25/14. (mrm, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2056 ORDER, granting #2029 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Carhartt, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. Carhartt Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/25/14. (mrm, )
February 26, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT LUXOTTICA RETAIL NORTH AMERICA INC. submitted document #2051 PDF not editable. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
February 26, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS submitted document #2050 PDF not editable. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
February 26, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS submitted document #2049 PDF not editable. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
February 26, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT CHARMING SHOPPES, INC. submitted document #2048 PDF not editable. Correction should be made by one business day (nkl, )
February 26, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF MULTIPLE DEFENDANT submitted document #2047 PDF not editable. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
February 26, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS submitted document #2046 PDF not editable. Correction should be made by one business day (nkl, )
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2055 ORDER granting #2028 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Advance Auto Parts, Inc.; Advance Stores Co., Inc.; and E-Advance, LLC filed by GeoTag Inc. E-Advance LLC, Advance Auto Parts Inc and Advance Stores Company Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/25/14. (mrm, )
February 26, 2014 Filing 2054 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/18/14 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/30/2014. (sholmes, )
February 25, 2014 Filing 2053 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nkl, ).
February 25, 2014 Filing 2052 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERRORS Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation and Ralph Lauren Media, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nkl, ).
February 25, 2014 Filing 2051 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Luxottica Retail North America Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nkl, ).
February 25, 2014 Filing 2050 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Live Nation Worldwide, Inc. and Ticketmaster L.L.C. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nkl, ).
February 25, 2014 Filing 2049 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants The Dress Barn, Inc. and RadioShack Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nkl, ).
February 25, 2014 Filing 2048 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Charming Shoppes, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nkl, ).
February 25, 2014 Filing 2047 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Burger King Corporation and Jack in the Box, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nkl, ).
February 25, 2014 Filing 2046 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Avis Budget Group, Inc.; Avis Rent A Car System, LLC; Payless Car Rental System, Inc.; Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc.; Dollar Rent A Car, Inc.; and Thrifty, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 2/26/2014 (nkl, ).
February 25, 2014 Filing 2045 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant AutoZone, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 25, 2014 Filing 2044 Agreed MOTION to Stay Extend Stay as to Defendant National Vision, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 25, 2014 Filing 2043 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Mr. Gatti's, L.P. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 25, 2014 Filing 2042 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Bare Escentuals, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2041 ORDER granting #2025 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Macy's Retail Holdings Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2014. (ch, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2040 ORDER granting #2024 Motion to Stay. Dft Citi Trends Inc is stayed until 2/25/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2014. (ch, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2039 ORDER granting #2023 Motion to Withdraw. Motion to Show Cause (Dkt. No. 866) is hereby withdrawn as to Defendants Match.com, LLC, Match.com SN LLC, People Media, Inc. and HomeAdvisor, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2014. (ch, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2038 ORDER granting #2021 Motion to Withdraw. Motion for Sanctions Against Where2GetIt, Inc., Dillards, Inc., Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc., and Ross Stores, Inc. for Spoliation of Xionetics Source Code (Dkt.No. 1544) (Motion for Sanctions). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2014. (ch, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2037 ORDER granting #2019 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Golds Gym International Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2014. (ch, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2036 ORDER granting #2018 Motion to Dismiss. Dft GameStop Corp is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2014. (ch, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2035 ORDER granting #2007 Motion to Dismiss. PetSmart Inc and PetSmart Store Support Group Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2014. (ch, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2034 ORDER granting #2006 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Sephora USA Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2014. (ch, )
February 21, 2014 Filing 2033 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #1870 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions of William Easttom II Regarding Infringement of Claims 1 and 20 filed by H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP. (Jackson, John)
February 21, 2014 Filing 2032 Agreed MOTION to Stay Extend Stay as to Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 21, 2014 Filing 2031 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Nike, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 21, 2014 Filing 2030 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Citi Trends, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 21, 2014 Filing 2029 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Carhartt, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 21, 2014 Filing 2028 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Advance Auto Parts, Inc.; Advance Stores Co., Inc.; and E-Advance, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 21, 2014 Filing 2026 Agreed MOTION to Stay Extend Stay as to Defendant Citi Trends, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Reese, Joel)
February 21, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Agreed Motion To Extend Stay document #2022 does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
February 20, 2014 Filing 2025 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 20, 2014 Filing 2024 Agreed MOTION to Stay Extend Stay as to Defendant Bare Escentuals, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Reese, Joel)
February 20, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Agreed Motion to Extend Stay submitted document #2020 does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
February 20, 2014 Filing 2023 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #866 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (GEOTAGS MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEFENDANTS FAILURE TO PRODUCE THEIR DAMAGES DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS ORDERS AND LOCAL RULES) as to Certain Defendants by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 20, 2014 Filing 2022 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR Agreed MOTION to Stay Extend Stay as to Defendant Citi Trends, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 2/21/2014 (nkl, ).
February 20, 2014 Filing 2021 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Its Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants Where2GetIt; Dillard's, Inc.; Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc.; and Ross Stores, Inc. for Spoliation of Xionetic's Source Code by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 20, 2014 Filing 2020 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR Agreed MOTION to Stay Extend the Stay as to Defendant Bare Escentuals, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 2/20/2014 (nkl, ).
February 20, 2014 Filing 2019 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice of Defendant Gold's Gym International, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 20, 2014 Filing 2018 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice of Defendant GameStop Corp. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2017 ORDER granting #1984 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendant Gold's Gym International, Inc. The stay shall be in effect up to and including FEBRUARY 28, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/19/14. (bas, )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2016 ORDER granting #1983 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/1/9/14. (bas, )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2015 ORDER granting #1982 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/19/14. (bas, )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2014 ORDER granting #1981 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Herman Miller, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/19/14. (bas, )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2013 ORDER granting #1980 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendanta DSW Inc. d/b/a DSW Shoe, Inc. The stay shall be in effect up to and including MARCH 4, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/19/14. (bas, )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2012 ORDER granting #1979 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendant DSW Inc. d/b/a DSW Shoe, Inc. The stay shall be in effect up to and including MARCH 4, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/19/14. (bas, )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2011 ORDER granting #1978 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendants Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Vanguard Car Rental USA, LLC. The stay shall be in effect up to and including MARCH 4, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/19/14. (bas, )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2010 ORDER granting #1977 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/19/14. (bas, )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2009 ORDER granting #1976 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendant Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. The stay shall be in effect up to and including MARCH 4, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/19/14. (bas, )
February 20, 2014 Filing 2008 NOTICE by Cinemark Holdings Inc, Cinemark USA Inc of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Cox, Barton)
February 19, 2014 Filing 2007 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Petsmart, Inc. and Petsmart Store Support Group, Inc. with Prejudice by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 19, 2014 Filing 2006 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. with Prejudice by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2005 ORDER granting #1965 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. The stay shall be in effect up to and including MARCH 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2004 ORDER granting #1975 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendant Deere & Company. The stay shall be in effect up to and including MARCH 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2003 ORDER granting #1974 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendant Gander Mountain Company. The stay shall be in effect up to and including MARCH 19, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Filing 2002 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Susanna Chenette on behalf of H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4529891. (Chenette, Susanna)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 2001 ORDER granting #1973 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants CarMax, Inc. and CarMax Business Services, LLC filed by GeoTag Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Filing 2000 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert D Becker on behalf of H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4529843. (Becker, Robert)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1999 ORDER granting #1972 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. d/b/a O'Reilly Auto Parts filed by GeoTag Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1998 ORDER granting #1971 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Cinemark Holdings, Inc. and Cinemark USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1997 ORDER GRANTING #1970 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dillard's Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1996 ORDER granting #1956 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendant Academy, Ltd. All proceedings and deadlines between these parties are stayed up to and including MARCH 5, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1995 ORDER granting #1935 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Forever 21 Retail, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1994 ORDER granting #1933 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Vera Wang Bridal House, Ltd. and V.E.W., Ltd. filed by GeoTag Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1993 ORDER granting #1932 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendants AutoZone, Inc., Big Lots Stores, Inc., Big Lots, Inc., CarMax, Inc., CarMax Business Services, LLC, Dillard's Inc., and O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., d/b/a O'Reilly Auto Parts. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1992 ORDER granting #1931 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1991 ORDER granting #1930 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. The stay is extended up to and including FEBRUARY 21, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1990 ORDER granting #1929 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by GeoTag Inc. Justin Boot Company terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1989 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Deb Shops Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1988 ORDER granting #1966 Motion to Stay between Plaintiff and Defendant GameStop Corp. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1987 ORDER granting #1963 Motion for Leave to File Excess Page. The new page limit is 22 pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1986 ORDER granting #1958 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Match.com, LLC; Match.com SN LLC; People Media, Inc.; and HomeAdvisor, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc Match.com SN LLC, People Media Inc, HomeAdvisor, Inc. and Match.Com LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1985 ORDER granting #1948 Motion to Stay. The case is stayed between Plaintiff and Defendant American Apparel, Inc. up to and including MARCH 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/18/14. (bas, )
February 18, 2014 Filing 2027 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motions Hearing held on 2/18/2014 re #1101 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Dynamic Replication Claim Limitations #1095 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT BASED ON THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS LIMITATIONS. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
February 18, 2014 Filing 1984 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Gold's Gym International, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 18, 2014 Filing 1983 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendants Enterprise Holdings, Inc. and Vanguard Car Rental USA, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 18, 2014 Filing 1982 Agreed MOTION to Stay Extend Stay as to Defendants PetSmart, Inc. and PetSmart Store Support Group, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 18, 2014 Filing 1981 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Herman Miller, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 18, 2014 Filing 1980 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant DSW Inc. d/b/a DSW Shoe, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 18, 2014 Filing 1979 Agreed MOTION to Stay by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malouf, Stephen)
February 18, 2014 Filing 1978 Agreed MOTION to Stay by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malouf, Stephen)
February 18, 2014 Filing 1977 Agreed MOTION to Stay re #1900 Order on Motion to Stay by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malouf, Stephen)
February 18, 2014 Filing 1976 Agreed MOTION to Stay Macy's Retail Holdings, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
February 17, 2014 Filing 1975 Agreed MOTION to Stay as to Defendant Deere & Company by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 17, 2014 Filing 1974 Agreed MOTION to Stay as to Defendant Gander Mountain Company by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 17, 2014 Filing 1973 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants CarMax, Inc. and CarMax Business Services, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 17, 2014 Filing 1972 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. d/b/a O'Reilly Auto Parts by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 17, 2014 Filing 1971 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss as to Cinemark Holdings, Inc. and Cinemark USA, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 17, 2014 Filing 1970 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Dillard's Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 17, 2014 Filing 1969 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Big Lots Stores, Inc. and Big Lots, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 17, 2014 Filing 1968 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Carhartt, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 17, 2014 Filing 1967 Amended MOTION in Limine by GeoTag Inc. (Reese, Joel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2014: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
February 16, 2014 Filing 1966 Agreed MOTION to Stay GameStop Corp. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
February 15, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 1955 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day. MOTION HAS BEEN TERMIMATED. (ch, )
February 14, 2014 Filing 1965 Agreed MOTION to Stay Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1964 SEALED MOTION (DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE) by Gander Mountain Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Blum, Anthony)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1963 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages For Defendants' Omnibus Motions in Limine by Gander Mountain Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blum, Anthony)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1962 NOTICE by DSW Inc. of Compliance With Courts Order (Dkt No. 1716) (Ahrens, Gregory)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1961 NOTICE by Gander Mountain Company re #1941 MOTION to Strike CERTAIN PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES (Notice of Joinder) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blum, Anthony)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1960 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #1881 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions of William Easttom II Regarding Infringement by Deere & Company of U.S. Patent 5,930,474 filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1959 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #1952 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1958 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Match.com, LLC; Match.com SN LLC; People Media, Inc.; and HomeAdvisor, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1957 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #1870 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions of William Easttom II Regarding Infringement of Claims 1 and 20 filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Klausner depo, #2 Exhibit B - Easttom depo, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1956 Agreed MOTION to Stay as to Defendant Academy, Ltd. by Academy, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drake, Kirby)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1955 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE***Amended MOTION in Limine by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 2/15/2014 (ch, ).
February 14, 2014 Filing 1954 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP Regarding Service of Amended Supplemental Rebuttal Disclosures (Acosta, Matthew)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1953 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc of Compliance (1) Objections to American Apparel, Inc.'s Supplemental Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures; (2) Objections to Gold's Gym International, Inc.'s Supplemental Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures; (3) Objections to H&M Hennes & Mauritz, L.P.'s Supplemental Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures; (4) Objections to Macy's, Inc.'s Supplemental Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures; and (5) Supplemental Objections to Defendants' Common Amended Rule 26(A)(3) Disclosures (Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1952 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #1878 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions of William Easttom II Regarding Infringement filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 W C Easttom Declaration, #2 Exhibit A-2 Gander Mountain Store Locator, #3 Exhibit A-3 Gander Mountain Am Store Locator, #4 Exhibit A-4 DSW Store Locator, #5 Exhibit A-5 Enterprise Store Locator, #6 Exhibit A-6 Vanguard Store Locator, #7 Exhibit A-7 Macy's Store Locator, #8 Exhibit A-8 Walmart Store Locator, #9 Exhibit A-9 Gold's Gym Locator, #10 Exhibit A-10 American Apparel Store Locator, #11 Exhibit A-11 H&M Store Locator, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1951 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #1177 MOTION to Strike EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. MICHALSON ON INVALIDITY filed by Gander Mountain Company on behalf of all Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invalidity Expert Report, #2 Exhibit B - Appendix to Invalidity Contentions, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Blum, Anthony)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1950 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #1217 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF PETER KENT AND IVAN ZATKOVICH filed by Gander Mountain Company on behalf of Responding Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Zatkovich Deposition, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Blum, Anthony)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1949 Agreed MOTION to Sever Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendant BCBG Max Azria Group, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1948 Agreed MOTION to Stay as to Defendant American Apparel, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1947 STIPULATION - JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING CERTAIN MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1946 ORDER granting #1927 Motion for Extension of Stay for Defendant Citi Trends, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/14. (mrm, )
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1945 ORDER granting #1923 Joint Motion Regarding the Testimony of Dr. Bruce Maggs. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/2014. (ch, )
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1944 ORDER, granting #1926 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant American Eagle Outfitters, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. American Eagle Outfitters Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/14. (mrm, )
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1943 ORDER, granting #1925 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Trane, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. Trane Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/14. (mrm, )
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1942 ORDER, granting #1918 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal filed by Intelius, Inc., GeoTag Inc. Intelius, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/14. (mrm, )
February 14, 2014 Filing 1941 MOTION to Strike CERTAIN PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1940 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #1908 MOTION to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(B) and Local Rule CV-41 filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit W C Easttom Declaration, #2 Affidavit A C Sanderson Declaration, #3 Exhibit A - Common Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit B - Common Requests for Admission, #5 Exhibit C - Interrogatories on E-Mail Discovery, #6 Exhibit D - 2nd Common Interrogatories, #7 Exhibit E - Claim Chart, #8 Exhibit F - 7/17/2013 letter)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1939 NOTICE by Enterprise Holding Inc, Vanguard Car Rental USA Inc re #1716 Order (Amended Supplemental Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1938 NOTICE by Enterprise Holding Inc, Vanguard Car Rental USA Inc re #1716 Order (Amended Common Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures) (on behalf of all defendants) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1937 ORDER, granting #1915 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Abercrombie & Fitch Co. filed by GeoTag Inc. Abercrombie & Fitch Co. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/14. (mrm, )
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1936 ORDER granting #1914 Motion to Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Things Remembered, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/14. (mrm, )
February 14, 2014 Filing 1935 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Forever 21 Retail, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1934 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1218 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. CRAIG A. KNOBLOCK filed by Gamestop Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1933 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Vera Wang Bridal House, Ltd. and V.E.W., Ltd. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1932 Agreed MOTION to Stay as to Defendants AutoZone, Inc.; Big Lots Stores, Inc.; Big Lots, Inc.; CarMax, Inc.; CarMax Business Services, LLC; Dillard's, Inc.; and O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. d/b/a O'Reilly Auto Parts by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1931 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1930 Agreed MOTION to Stay Motion for Extension of Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1929 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 14, 2014 Filing 1928 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 13, 2014 Filing 1927 Agreed MOTION to Stay Motion for Extension of Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Citi Trends, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 13, 2014 Filing 1926 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant American Eagle Outfitters, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 13, 2014 Filing 1925 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Trane, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 13, 2014 Filing 1924 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Kurt Truelove on behalf of Gander Mountain Company (Truelove, Justin)
February 13, 2014 Filing 1923 Joint MOTION Regarding the Testimony of Dr. Bruce Maggs by 7-Eleven, Inc., Bare Escentuals Inc., GeoTag Inc, Gold's Gym International Inc., Sephora USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorval, Deirdre)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1922 ORDER granting #1910 Motion to Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Bare Escentuals, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/14. (mrm, )
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1921 ORDER granting #1897 Motion to Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendants Cinemark Holdings, Inc. and Cinemark USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/14. (mrm, )
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1920 ORDER granting #1892 Motion to Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/14. (mrm, )
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1919 ORDER granting #1885 Motion to Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Genesco Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/14. (mrm, )
February 13, 2014 Filing 1918 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Joint Stipulation for Dismissal by GeoTag Inc, Intelius, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1917 ORDER granting #1912 Motion to Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendants Nike, Inc., Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Advance Stores Co., Inc., and E-Advance LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/14. (mrm, )
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1916 ORDER granting #1911 Motion to Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Jimmy Jazz, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/12/14. (mrm, )
February 12, 2014 Filing 1915 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Abercrombie & Fitch Co. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 12, 2014 Filing 1914 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Things Remembered, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 12, 2014 Filing 1913 NOTICE by Gold's Gym International Inc. of Compliance Regarding Supplemental Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures (Dorval, Deirdre)
February 11, 2014 Filing 1912 Agreed MOTION to Stay as to Defendants Nike, Inc.; Advance Auto Parts, Inc.; Advance Stores Co., Inc.; and E-Advance LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 11, 2014 Filing 1911 Agreed MOTION to Stay as to Defendant Jimmy Jazz, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 11, 2014 Filing 1910 Agreed MOTION to Stay as to Defendant Bare Escentuals, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 11, 2014 Filing 1909 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shamita D Etienne-Cummings on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Etienne-Cummings, Shamita)
February 11, 2014 Filing 1908 MOTION to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(B) and Local Rule CV-41 by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Buss, Brian)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1907 ORDER granting #1866 Motion for Entry of Payment Order of Special Master Francis E. McGovern. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1906 ORDER denying #1867 Motion to Stay Proceedings Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Carhartt, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1905 ORDER granting #1856 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing for certain defendants #866 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (GEOTAGS MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEFENDANTS FAILURE TO PRODUCE THEIR DAMAGES DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS ORDERS AND LOCAL RULES). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1904 ORDER granting #1855 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendants Vera Wang Bridal House, Ltd. And V.E.W., Ltd. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1903 ORDER granting #1854 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Intelius, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1902 ORDER granting #1853 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. (Plaintiff) and Defendants BJs Wholesale Club, Inc.; Davids Bridal Inc.; Dollar Tree Management, Inc.; Guess? Retail Inc.; Hot Topic Inc.; Kohler Co.; Kubota Tractor Corp.; Avis Budget Group, Inc.; Avis Rent A Car System, LLC; Payless Car Rental System, Inc.; Charming Shoppes, Inc.; Dress Barn, Inc.; Maurices, Inc.; Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc.; Dollar Rent A Car, Inc.; Thrifty, Inc.; Luxottica Retail North America Inc.; Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation; Ralph Lauren Media, LLC; RadioShack Corporation; and Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1901 ORDER granting #1851 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1900 ORDER granting #1877 Motion for Extension of Stay filed by Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc., and Defendants PetSmart, Inc. and PetSmart Store Support Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1899 ORDER granting #1876 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Forever 21 Retail, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Filing 1898 NOTICE by Macy's Inc NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS (Mandaro, Richard)
February 10, 2014 Filing 1897 Joint MOTION to Stay Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendants Cinemark Holdings, Inc. and Cinemark USA, Inc. by Cinemark Holdings Inc, Cinemark USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Charles)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1896 ORDER granting #1875 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Trane, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1895 ORDER granting #1874 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Spencer Gifts, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1894 ORDER granting #1873 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1893 ORDER granting #1872 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Guitar Center, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Filing 1892 Agreed MOTION to Stay between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. by Sephora USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dorval, Deirdre)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1891 ORDER granting #1871 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant The Finish Line, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1890 ORDER, granting #1869 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chanel, Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. Chanel Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1889 ORDER granting #1865 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Regis Corporation. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1888 ORDER granting #1864 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant National Vision, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1887 ORDER granting #1863 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Terex Corporation. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1886 ORDER granting #1852 Motion for Stay as between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/10/14. (mrm, )
February 10, 2014 Filing 1885 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Genesco Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 10, 2014 Filing 1884 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Heartfield, J)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1883 NOTICE by Advance Auto Parts Inc, Advance Stores Company Inc, E-Advance LLC, Nike Inc NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Bettinger, Michael)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1882 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc of Compliance Regarding Service of Amended Pretrial Disclosures (Reese, Joel)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1881 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions of William Easttom II Regarding Infringement by Deere & Company of U.S. Patent 5,930,474 by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Buss, Brian)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1880 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. DEFENDANTS' COMMON NOTICE PURSUANT TO 35 U.S.C. SECTION 282 (Vakil, Bijal)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1879 NOTICE by H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP of Compliance Regarding Service of Amended Pretrial Disclosures (Acosta, Matthew)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1878 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions of William Easttom II Regarding Infringement by Gander Mountain Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Moving Defendants, #2 Exhibit B - Easttom Report, #3 Exhibit C - Suppl. Claim Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Klausner Report, #5 Exhibit E-1 - Easttom Deposition (12/20), #6 Exhibit E-2 - Easttom Deposition (1/24), #7 Exhibit F - Ltr from D. Bennett, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Blum, Anthony)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1877 Agreed MOTION to Stay re #1843 Order on Motion to Stay Agreed Motion for Extension of Stay for Defendants Petsmart, Inc. and Petsmart Store Support Group, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1876 Agreed MOTION to Stay As Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Forever 21 Retail, Inc., by Forever 21 Retail Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meyer, Nathan)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1875 Agreed MOTION to Stay Defendant Trane, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1874 Agreed MOTION to Stay Defendant Spencer Gifts, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1873 Agreed MOTION to Stay Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1872 Agreed MOTION to Stay Defendant Guitar Center, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1871 Agreed MOTION to Stay Defendant The Finish Line, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1870 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Opinions of William Easttom II Regarding Infringement of Claims 1 and 20 by Gander Mountain Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Klausner Deposition, #2 Exhibit B - Easttom Deposition (12/20), #3 Exhibit C - Easttom Deposition (1/24), #4 Exhibit D - Suppl. Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit E - Financial Documents, #6 Exhibit F - Asserted Patent, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Blum, Anthony)
February 7, 2014 Filing 1869 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chanel, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 6, 2014 Filing 1868 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Vincent Galluzzo on behalf of Enterprise Holding Inc, Vanguard Car Rental USA Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4512225. (Galluzzo, Vincent)
February 6, 2014 Filing 1867 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for Plaintiff Geotag, Inc. and Defendant Carhartt, Inc. by Carhartt Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2014 Filing 1866 Joint MOTION for Entry of Payment Order by GeoTag Inc, HomeAdvisor, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com SN LLC, People Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Payment Order - Gilstrap, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
February 5, 2014 Filing 1865 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Regis Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 5, 2014 Filing 1864 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant National Vision, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 5, 2014 Filing 1863 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Terex Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 5, 2014 Filing 1862 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Joseph Cornelius, Jr on behalf of Academy LTD (Cornelius, William)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1861 ORDER granting #1849 Motion to Stay. Proceeding between plaintiff and dft HomeAdvisor Inc., Match.com, LLC., Match.com SN, LLC., and People Media Inc are stayed until 2/13/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/4/2014. (ch, )
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1860 ORDER granting #1848 Motion to Stay. Deadlines between plaintiff and dft Citi Trends Inc are stayed until 2/13/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/4/2014. (ch, )
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1859 ORDER granting #1847 Motion to Stay. Deadlines between Plaintiff and dft American Eagle Outfitters Inc is 2/13/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/4/2014. (ch, )
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1858 ORDER granting #1846 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Life Time Fitness Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/4/2014. (ch, )
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1857 ORDER granting #1845 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Bally Total Fitness Corporation is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/4/2014. (ch, )
February 4, 2014 Filing 1856 Amended MOTION to Withdraw Certain Defendants from Motion to Show Cause (D.I. 866) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
February 4, 2014 Filing 1855 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendants Vera Wang Bridal House, Ltd. and V.E.W., Ltd. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 4, 2014 Filing 1854 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Intelius, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 4, 2014 Filing 1853 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendants BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.; David's Bridal, Inc.; Dollar Tree Management, Inc.; Guess? Retail Inc.; Hot Topic Inc.; Kohler Co.; Kubota Tractor Corp.; Avis Budget Group, Inc.; Avis Rent A Car System, LLC; Payless Car Rental System, Inc.; Charming Shoppes, Inc.; Dress Barn, Inc.; Maurices, Inc.; Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group, Inc.; Dollar Rent A Car, Inc.;Thrifty, Inc.; Luxottica Retail North America Inc.; Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation; Ralph Lauren Media, LLC; RadioShack Corporation; and Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 4, 2014 Filing 1852 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant 7-Eleven, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 4, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 1850, Motion to Withdraw. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 3, 2014 Filing 1851 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE as to Defendant Where2GetIt, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 3, 2014 Filing 1850 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #866 MOTION for Order to Show Cause (GEOTAGS MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEFENDANTS FAILURE TO PRODUCE THEIR DAMAGES DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURTS ORDERS AND LOCAL RULES) as to Certain Defendants (Carr-Gottstein Foods Co. d/b/a Carr's; Chick-Fil-A, Inc.; Genuardi's Family Markets LP d/b/a Genuardi's; GFM Holdings LLC; Jo-Ann Stores, Inc.; Jo-Ann.com LLC; Merle Norman Cosmetics, Inc.; Michaels Stores, Inc.; New York & Company, Inc.; Patagonia, Inc.; Randall's Food and Drugs LP; Randall's Food Markets, Inc.; Safeway, Inc. d/b/a Tom Thumb; The Vons Companies, Inc. d/b/a Vons; TCF Co. LLC; The Cheesecake Factory, Inc.; The Timberland Co. d/b/a Timberland Co.; VF Outdoor d/b/a The North Face; ViewSonic Corp.; Valspar Corp.; and Where2GetIt, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 2/4/2014 (ch, ).
February 3, 2014 Filing 1849 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendants HomeAdvisor, Inc.; Match.com, LLC; Match.com SN, LLC; and People Media, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 3, 2014 Filing 1848 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Citi Trends, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 3, 2014 Filing 1847 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant American Eagle Outfitters, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 3, 2014 Filing 1846 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Life Time Fitness, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 3, 2014 Filing 1845 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Bally Total Fitness Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1844 ORDER granting #1812 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff and dft Abercrombie & Fitcy Co are stayed until 2/12/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1843 ORDER granting #1811 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff and dft Petsmart Inc are stayed unil 2/7/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1842 ORDER granting #1824 Motion to Dismiss. Carr-Gottstein Foods Co. d/b/a Carrs; Genuardis Family Markets LP d/b/a Genuardis; GFM Holdings, LLC;Randalls Food & Drugs LP; Randalls Food Markets, Inc.; Safeway Inc. d/b/a Tom Thumb;The Vons Companies, Inc. d/b/a Vons; and Valspar Corp. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1841 ORDER granting #1823 Motion to Dismiss. The Sports Authority Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1840 ORDER granting #1822 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Group Dynamite Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1839 ORDER granting #1821 Motion to Dismiss. Toy "R" Us and Geoffrey LLC are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1838 ORDER granting #1816 Motion to Dismiss. Merle Norman Cosemetics Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1837 ORDER granting #1815 Motion to Dismiss. Michaels Stores, Inc. and VF Outdoor, Inc. d/b/a The North Face are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1836 ORDER granting #1825 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants AceHardware Corporation; Aeropostale, Inc.; Charlotte Russe, Inc.; Christopher & Banks Corp.d/b/a CJ Banks; Cost Plus, Inc. d/b/a Cost Plus World Market; Dicks Sporting Goods, Inc.;General Nutrition Centers, Inc.; General Nutrition Corporation; GSI Commerce, Inc.; HaggarClothing Co.; Hagger Direct, Inc.; Levi Strauss & Co.; Maurices Inc.; Nautica Retail USA, Inc.;Quiksilver, Inc. d/b/a Roxy; Spanx Inc.; MEE Accessories LLC (f/k/a Marc Ecko EnterprisesAccessories, LLC); MEE Direct LLC (f/k/a Ecko Direct, LLC) (d/b/a Marc Ecko Enterprises),MEE Apparel LLC (f/k/a Ecko Complex LLC), Yakira, LLC; Toys R Us-Delaware, Inc.,Toysrus.com, LLC, Babiesrus.com, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1835 ORDER dismissing Michaels Stores Inc and VF Outdoor Inc terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/31/2014. (nkl, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1834 ORDER granting #1828 Motion to Stay. All proceedings and deadlines between plaintiff and dft Sephora USA Inc are stayed until 2/10/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1833 ORDER granting #1827 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Rolex SA and Graco NV is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1832 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Dft Merle Norman Cosmetics Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1831 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Chick-fil-A,Inc.; Jo-Ann Stores, Inc.; Joann.com, LLC; Patagonia, Inc.; TCF Co LLC; The Cheesecake Factory, Inc.; ViewSonic Corp.; Where 2 Get It, Inc dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1830 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Defendants New York & Company, Inc. and The Timberland Co. are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1829 ORDER granting #1795 Sealed Motion to Supplement the Expert Report. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
January 30, 2014 Filing 1828 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 30, 2014 Filing 1827 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice of Multiple Defendants by GeoTag Inc, Graco N V, Rolex SA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 30, 2014 Filing 1826 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 30, 2014 Filing 1825 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice of Multiple Defendants by Ace Hardware Corp, Aeropostale Inc, Babiesrus.com LLC, Charlotte Ruse Inc, Christopher & Banks Corp, Cost Plus Inc, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, GSI Commerce Inc, General Nutrition Centers Inc, General Nutrition Corporation, Geo Tag Inc, GeoTag Inc, Haggar Direct Inc, Hagger Clothing Co, Levi Strauss & Co, Maurices Inc, Mee Accessories LLC, Mee Direct LLC, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Quicksilver Inc, Spanx Inc, Toys "R" US-Delaware Inc, Toysrus.com LLC, Yakira LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 30, 2014 Filing 1824 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice of Multiple Defendants by Carr-Gottstein Foods Co, Genuardi's Family Markets LP, Geo Tag Inc, GeoTag Inc, RANDALL'S FOOD & DRUGS LP, Safeway Inc, The Vons Companies Inc, Valspar Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 30, 2014 Filing 1823 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice of The Sports Authority Defendant by Geo Tag Inc, GeoTag Inc, The Sports Authority Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 30, 2014 Filing 1822 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice of Groupe Dynamite, Inc. by GeoTag Inc, Groupe Dynamite, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 30, 2014 Filing 1821 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice of Multiple Defendants by GeoTag Inc, Geoffrey LLC, Toys "R" Us Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 30, 2014 Filing 1820 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #1795 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. WILLIAM MICHALSON REGARDING INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,930,474 filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - David Klausner depo excerpts, #2 Exhibit Ex B - William Michalson report excerpts)(Reese, Joel)
January 30, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 1814 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION. Correction should be made by one business day. (ch, )
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1819 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/29/2014. (ch, )
January 29, 2014 Filing 1818 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice of Multiple Defendants by GeoTag Inc, New York & Company Inc, The Timberland Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 29, 2014 Filing 1817 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Multiple Defendants by Chick-Fil-A Inc, GeoTag Inc, JO-ANN STORES, INC., JOANN.COM, LLC, PATAGONIA, INC., TCF CO. LLC, THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INC., VIEWSONIC CORP., Where 2 Get It Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 29, 2014 Filing 1816 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice of Merle Norman Cosmetics, Inc. by GeoTag Inc, Merle Norman Cosmetics. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 29, 2014 Filing 1815 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Multiple Defendants by GeoTag Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, VF Outdoor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss)(Bennett, David)
January 29, 2014 Filing 1814 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #1795 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. WILLIAM MICHALSON REGARDING INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,930,474 filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - David Klausner depo excerpts, #2 Exhibit Ex B - William Michalson report excerpts)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 1/30/2014 (ch, ).
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1813 ORDER denying #1776 Sealed Motion for Leave to Supplement Evidence in Opposition to Dfts Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Relating to Dynamic Replication and Geographical Claim Limitations. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/27/2014. (ch, )
January 29, 2014 Filing 1812 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Abercrombie & Fitch Co. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 29, 2014 Filing 1811 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant PetSmart, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1810 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/29/2014. (ch, )
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1809 ORDER granting #1807 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Crabtree & Evelyn Ltd. is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/28/2014. (ch, )
January 29, 2014 Notice of Hearing on Motions #1095 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-infringement Based on the Geographical Areas Limitations, #1101 Sealed Patent Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Dynamic Replication Claim Limitations: Motions Hearing set for 2/18/2014 10:30 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
January 27, 2014 Filing 1808 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barton Wayne Cox on behalf of Cinemark Holdings Inc, Cinemark USA Inc (Cox, Barton)
January 27, 2014 Filing 1807 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Crabtree & Evelyn, Ltd. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1806 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/24/201. (ch, )
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1805 ORDER denying #1786 Motion for Reconsideration of Order granting GeoTags Motion to Conduct Depositions. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/24/2014. (ch, )
January 24, 2014 Filing 1804 NOTICE by VF Jeanswear LP For Termination of Electronic Notices (Schonberg, Michael)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1803 ORDER granting #1800 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Hanesbrands Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/24/2014. (ch, )
January 23, 2014 Filing 1802 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #1776 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Evidence in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Relating to Dynamic Replication and Geographical Claim Limitations filed by Advance Auto Parts Inc, Advance Stores Company Inc, E-Advance LLC, Nike Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bettinger, Michael)
January 23, 2014 Filing 1801 RESPONSE to Motion re #1786 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re #1770 Order on Motion for Discovery Previously-Deposed Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Adam Sanderson Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 23, 2014 Filing 1800 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Hanesbrands Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 22, 2014 Filing 1799 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Tobolowsky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tobolowsky, Michael)
January 22, 2014 Filing 1798 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Nockels on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nockels, Jonathan)
January 22, 2014 Filing 1797 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeremy C Martin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Martin, Jeremy)
January 22, 2014 Filing 1796 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen F Malouf on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Malouf, Stephen)
January 17, 2014 Filing 1795 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE EXPERT REPORT OF DR. WILLIAM MICHALSON REGARDING INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 5,930,474 by Advance Auto Parts Inc, Advance Stores Company Inc, E-Advance LLC, Nike Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael)
January 17, 2014 Filing 1794 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Notice of Service of Expert Report (Vakil, Bijal)
January 17, 2014 Filing 1793 NOTICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Co. Defendant Abercrombie & Fitch Co.'s Notice of Service of Expert Reports (Kerlin, Paul)
January 16, 2014 Filing 1792 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Putnam Haas on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Haas, Eric)
January 16, 2014 Filing 1791 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Putnam Haas on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Haas, Eric)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1790 ORDER granting in part #1777 Motion to Expedite Briefing Relating to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Evidence in Opposition to Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Related to Dynamic Replication and Geographical Claim Limitations. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/16/14. (mrm, )
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1789 ORDER granting #1779 Motion to Stay all proceedings, deadlines and motions between Plaintiff and Defendant Sephora USA, Inc up to and including February 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/16/2014. (sm, )
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1788 ORDER granting #1778 Motion to Withdraw #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE. ORDERING that only ROss Stores Inc and Hobby Lobby Stores Inc are Withdrawn from this pending motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/16/2014. (sm, )
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1787 ORDER, granting #1736 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss The Rockport Company, LLC filed by GeoTag Inc. The Rockport Company LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/15/14. (mrm, )
January 15, 2014 Filing 1786 Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration re #1770 Order on Motion for Discovery Previously-Deposed Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration by AutoZone Inc, Gamestop Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Derek Neilson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Robert)
January 15, 2014 Filing 1785 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1777 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing Relating to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Evidence in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by AutoZone Inc, Big Lots Inc, Big Lots Stores Inc, Carmax Business Services LLC, Carmax Inc, Dillard's Inc, Gamestop Corp, Guitar Center Inc., O'Reilly Automotive Inc, The Finish Line Inc., The Pep Boys -- Manny Moe & Jack. (Lee, Robert)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1784 ORDER granting #1774 Motion to Stay. All proceedings between GeoTag and Dft Hanesbrands Inc are stayed until 1/31/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/14/2014. (ch, )
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1783 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/13/2014. (ch, )
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1782 ORDER granting #1771 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Graco Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/13/2014. (ch, )
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1781 ORDER granting #1769 Motion to Dismiss. Dft ASICS America Corporation is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/13/2014. (ch, )
January 13, 2014 Filing 1780 Defendant Dillard's Inc.'s Sur-Reply to GeoTag's Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation of Xionetic's Source Code Sealed Document. (Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2014 Filing 1779 Agreed MOTION to Stay as Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Sephora USA, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 13, 2014 Filing 1778 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE (Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Solely Hobby Lobby Stores and Ross Stores) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 13, 2014 Filing 1777 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing Relating to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Evidence in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 13, 2014 Filing 1776 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Evidence in Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Relating to Dynamic Replication and Geographical Claim Limitations by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Ex 1 - William C. Easttom Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex A - Easttom CV, #4 Exhibit Ex B - Easttom Expert Report, #5 Exhibit Ex C - Easttom Vol. 1 Depo Transcript, #6 Exhibit Ex 2 - 11/8/2013 hearing transcript)(Reese, Joel)
January 13, 2014 Filing 1775 REPORT of Mediation by Joe Dodson Clayton. Mediation result: SETTLED(Clayton, Joe)
January 13, 2014 Filing 1774 Agreed MOTION to Stay Between GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Hanesbrands, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 10, 2014 Filing 1773 SEALED MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by The Rockport Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matias Ferrario, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #12 Exhibit K to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #13 Exhibit L to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #14 Exhibit M to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #15 Exhibit N to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #16 Exhibit O to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #17 Exhibit P to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #18 Exhibit Q to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #19 Exhibit R to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #20 Exhibit S to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #21 Exhibit T to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #22 Exhibit U to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #23 Exhibit V to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #24 Exhibit W to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #25 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrario, Matias)
January 10, 2014 Filing 1772 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #1736 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss The Rockport Company, LLC filed by The Rockport Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matias Ferrario, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #12 Exhibit K to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #13 Exhibit L to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #14 Exhibit M to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #15 Exhibit N to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #16 Exhibit O to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #17 Exhibit P to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #18 Exhibit Q to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #19 Exhibit R to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #20 Exhibit S to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #21 Exhibit T to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #22 Exhibit U to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #23 Exhibit V to Declaration of Matias Ferrario, #24 Exhibit W to Declaration of Matias Ferrario)(Ferrario, Matias)
January 10, 2014 Filing 1771 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Graco, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1770 ORDER granting in part #1720 Motion for Discovery. The request to appoint a Special Master is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/10/2014. (ch, )
January 10, 2014 Filing 1769 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ASICS America Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1768 ORDER granting #1756 Motion to Stay. Deadlines between Plaintiff and Dft Carhartt Inc are stayed for 30 days 2/7/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/9/2014. (ch, )
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1767 ORDER granting #1755 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Seven For All Mankind LLC is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/9/2014. (ch, )
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1766 ORDER granting #1754 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Rhino Linings Corporation is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/9/2014. (ch, )
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1765 ORDER granting #1753 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Mexican Restaurants Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/9/2014. (ch, )
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1764 ORDER granting #1752 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Formal Specialists LTD is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/9/2014. (ch, )
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1763 ORDER granting #1751 Motion to Dismiss. Dft American Greetings Corporation is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/9/2014. (ch, )
January 9, 2014 Filing 1762 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #1720 MOTION for Discovery Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Appointment of Special Master (Dkt 1719 refiled due to incorrect document name) filed by HomeAdvisor, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com SN LLC, People Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Blackburn, #2 Exhibit A - 072913 Perry report excerpts, #3 Exhibit B - 102213 geotag exhibit list, #4 Exhibit C - Supp Resp to Common ROGS, #5 Exhibit D - 070813 30b6 depo notice, #6 Exhibit E - Howard depo excerpt, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
January 9, 2014 Filing 1761 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #1760 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wytsma, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Findlay, Eric)
January 9, 2014 Filing 1760 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1720 MOTION for Discovery Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Appointment of Special Master (Dkt 1719 refiled due to incorrect document name) filed by Trane Inc, Trane US Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Gregory F. Ahrens, #3 Declaration of Charles S. Baker on behalf of Cinemark, #4 Declaration of Charles S. Baker on behalf of National Vision, #5 Declaration of Charles S. Baker on behalf of Regis, #6 Declaration of Charles S. Baker on behalf of Spencer Gifts, #7 Declaration of Michael A. Bittner, #8 Declaration of Anthony F. Blum, #9 Declaration of Brian K. Buss, #10 Declaration of Leslie Grab, #11 Declaration of Thomas J. Gray, #12 Declaration of Robert G. Lancaster, #13 Declaration of Nathan D. Meyer, #14 Declaration of Philip J. Moy Jr., #15 Declaration of Daniel A. Noteware, Jr., #16 Declaration of William H. Oldach III, #17 Declaration of Willem Schuurman, #18 Declaration of Daniel J. Schwartz, #19 Declaration of Erika Selli, #20 Declaration of Irene Yang)(Wytsma, Laura)
January 9, 2014 Filing 1759 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1720 MOTION for Discovery Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Appointment of Special Master (Dkt 1719 refiled due to incorrect document name) The Alston & Bird Defendants' Response in Opposition filed by AutoZone Inc, Big Lots Inc, Big Lots Stores Inc, Carmax Business Services LLC, Carmax Inc, Dillard's Inc, Gamestop Corp, Guitar Center Inc., O'Reilly Automotive Inc, The Finish Line Inc., The Pep Boys -- Manny Moe & Jack. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Derek Neilson, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Derek Neilson, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Derek Neilson, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Derek Neilson, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
January 9, 2014 Filing 1758 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1720 MOTION for Discovery Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Appointment of Special Master (Dkt 1719 refiled due to incorrect document name) filed by American Eagle Outfitters Inc., Hot Topic Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Craft, Roger)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1757 ORDER granting #1745 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Hobby Lobby Stores Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/8/2014. (ch, )
January 8, 2014 Filing 1756 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Carhartt Inc, GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 8, 2014 Filing 1755 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Seven For All Mankind, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 8, 2014 Filing 1754 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Rhino Linings Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 8, 2014 Filing 1753 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Mexican Restaurants Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 8, 2014 Filing 1752 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Formal Specialists, Ltd. d/b/a Al's Formal Wear by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 8, 2014 Filing 1751 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant American Greetings Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 8, 2014 Filing 1750 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Granaghan on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club Inc, Bare Escentuals Inc., Crabtree & Evelyn, Gold's Gym International Inc., Sephora USA Inc. (Granaghan, Christopher)
January 8, 2014 Filing 1749 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deirdre Marie Dorval on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club Inc, Bare Escentuals Inc., Crabtree & Evelyn, Gold's Gym International Inc., Sephora USA Inc. (Dorval, Deirdre)
January 8, 2014 Filing 1748 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Avelyn Marie Ross on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club Inc, Bare Escentuals Inc., Crabtree & Evelyn, Gold's Gym International Inc., Sephora USA Inc. (Ross, Avelyn)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1747 ORDER granting #1744 Motion to Dismiss. Dft VF Jeanswear LP is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/8/2014. (ch, )
January 7, 2014 Filing 1746 Supplemental MOTION for Discovery Leave to Conduct Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Appointment of a Special Master by GeoTag Inc. (Reese, Joel)
January 7, 2014 Filing 1745 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Hobby Lobby Stores, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 6, 2014 Filing 1744 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss VF Jeanswear, L.P. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1743 ORDER, granting #1728 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Eyemart Express, Ltd. filed by GeoTag Inc. Eyemart Express, Ltd. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1742 ORDER granting #1727 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Keith Bryan Smiley and Charles Craig Tadlock terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1741 ORDER, granting #1726 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Christian Dior Perfumes, LLC filed by GeoTag Inc. Christian Dior Perfumes LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1740 ORDER, granting #1725 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Hallmark Cards, Incorporated filed by GeoTag Inc. Hallmark Cards, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1739 ORDER granting #1724 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by GeoTag Inc, Hugo Boss Fashion Inc. Hugo Boss Fashion Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1738 ORDER granting #1723 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by GeoTag Inc, Heely's Inc. Heely's Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1737 ORDER granting #1722 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by As America Inc, GeoTag Inc. As America Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
January 2, 2014 Filing 1736 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss The Rockport Company, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1735 ORDER, granting #1721 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Fitness International, LLC f/k/a LA Fitness International, LLC filed by GeoTag Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1734 ORDER, granting #1718 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss HEB Grocery Company LP filed by GeoTag Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1733 ORDER, granting #1717 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Godiva Chocolatier Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. Godiva Chocolatier Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1732 ORDER granting #1715 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph M Schreiber terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1731 ORDER granting #1714 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE. Replies due by 12/30/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
December 30, 2013 Filing 1730 NOTICE of Change of Address by Willem G Schuurman (Schuurman, Willem)
December 30, 2013 Filing 1729 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS EVIDENCE OFFERED IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPONSES TO GEOTAGS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR SPOLIATION)(Bennett, David)
December 27, 2013 Filing 1728 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Eyemart Express, Ltd. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
December 27, 2013 Filing 1727 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney The Tadlock Law Firm and Request for Termination of Electronic Notices by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
December 27, 2013 Filing 1726 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Christian Dior Perfumes, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
December 27, 2013 Filing 1725 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Hallmark Cards, Incorporated by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
December 26, 2013 Filing 1724 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by GeoTag Inc, Hugo Boss Fashion Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCormack, Brian)
December 26, 2013 Filing 1723 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by GeoTag Inc, Heely's Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCormack, Brian)
December 26, 2013 Filing 1722 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by As America Inc, GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCormack, Brian)
December 26, 2013 Filing 1721 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Fitness International, LLC f/k/a LA Fitness International, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
December 23, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 1719, Motion to Appoint Receiver. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (bas, )
December 23, 2013 Filing 1720 MOTION for Discovery Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions and Appointment of Special Master (Dkt 1719 refiled due to incorrect document name) by GeoTag Inc. (Reese, Joel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2013: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (bas, ).
December 23, 2013 Filing 1719 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Appoint Receiver and for Leave to Conduct Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions by GeoTag Inc. (Reese, Joel) Modified on 12/23/2013 (bas, ).
December 23, 2013 Filing 1718 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss HEB Grocery Company LP by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
December 23, 2013 Filing 1717 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Godiva Chocolatier Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1716 ORDER; This order sets new deadlines and resolves some disputes regarding the replacement of Plaintiff's expert David Klausner by Charles Easttom for health reasons. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/20/13. (mrm, )
December 23, 2013 Filing 1715 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Abercrombie & Fitch Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Schreiber, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2013: #2 Revised proposed Order) (bas, ).
December 20, 2013 Filing 1714 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1713 ORDER granting #1710 MOTION to Dismiss Solutia Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/19/13. (bas, )
December 19, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #1712 Motion to withdraw submitted by Abercrombie & Fitch Co.. No cert of conference included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motion now TERMINATED. (sm, )
December 19, 2013 Filing 1712 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Abercrombie & Fitch Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel)(Schreiber, Joseph) Modified on 12/19/2013 (sm, ).
December 18, 2013 Filing 1711 NOTICE by Remington Arms Company Inc, Stihl Incorporated (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Swanson, Derek)
December 18, 2013 Filing 1710 MOTION to Dismiss Solutia Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1709 ORDER granting #1708 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss filed by Yellowpages.com LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/18/13. (bas, )
December 17, 2013 Filing 1708 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Yellowpages.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durst, Timothy)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1707 ORDER granting #1700 Motion to Dismiss Christus Health and Christus Health Foundation. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/16/13. (bas, )
December 16, 2013 Filing 1706 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE filed by Where 2 Get It Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Schwartz, Daniel)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1705 ORDER granting #1691 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The new deadline is 12/16/13. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/13. (bas, )
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1704 ORDER granting #1690 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. GeoTag has until 12/30/13 to reply to the collective response of Dillard's and Hobby Lobby Stores to its Motion for Sanctions; and Dillard's and Hobby Lobby Stores have until 1/13/14 to file their surreply. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/13. (bas, )
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1703 ORDER granting #1689 Motion to Dismiss Remington Aarms Company, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/13. (bas, )
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1702 ORDER granting #1676 Agreed MOTION to Stay (Agreed Motion for Extension of Stay) filed by The Rockport Company LLC, ( Show Cause Hearing set for 1/3/2014 11:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/13. (bas, )
December 13, 2013 Filing 1701 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #1546 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Job Locator Claims Against Certain Defendants and Related Counterclaims, WIth Prejudice filed by Advance Auto Parts Inc, Advance Stores Company Inc, BJ's Wholesale Club Inc, Crabtree & Evelyn, E-Advance LLC, Eddie Bauer LLC, Gold's Gym International Inc., Nike Inc. (Schuurman, Willem)
December 13, 2013 Filing 1700 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Christus Health and Christus Health Foundation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
December 13, 2013 Filing 1699 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Eugene Youngblood on behalf of FR Defendants (Youngblood, James)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1698 ORDER granting #1688 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Plaintiff and Dft Eyemart Express LTD are stayed for 20 days to 12/31/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/12/2013. (ch, )
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1697 ORDER granting #1687 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Yelp! Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/12/2013. (ch, )
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1696 ORDER granting #1686 Motion to Dismiss. Dft CityGrid Media LLC is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/12/2013. (ch, )
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1695 ORDER granting #1685 Motion to Dismiss. Bft Brown Shoe Company Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/12/2013. (ch, )
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1694 ORDER granting #1684 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Brookstone Company Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/12/2013. (ch, )
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1693 ORDER granting #1683 Motion to Dismiss. Dft STIHL Incorporated is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/12/2013. (ch, )
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1692 ORDER granting #1679 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Diesel USA Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/12/2013. (ch, )
December 12, 2013 Filing 1691 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE by Where 2 Get It Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Daniel)
December 12, 2013 Filing 1690 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
December 12, 2013 Filing 1689 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) by Remington Arms Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swanson, Derek)
December 11, 2013 Filing 1688 Agreed MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS FOR PLAINTIFF GEOTAG, INC. AND DEFENDANT EYEMART EXPRESS, LTD. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 11, 2013 Filing 1687 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by GeoTag Inc, Yelp!, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
December 11, 2013 Filing 1686 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by CityGrid Media, LLC, GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
December 11, 2013 Filing 1685 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant Brown Shoe Company, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 11, 2013 Filing 1684 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant Brookstone Company, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 11, 2013 Filing 1683 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE) by Stihl Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swanson, Derek)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1682 ORDER, granting #1512 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by The Hertz Corp. The Hertz Corp terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/10/13. (mrm, )
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1681 ORDER, granting #1511 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Great Clips Inc. Great Clips Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/10/13. (mrm, )
December 10, 2013 Filing 1680 REPORT of Mediation by Joe Dodson Clayton. Mediation result: SETTLED(Clayton, Joe)
December 9, 2013 Filing 1679 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant Diesel U.S.A., Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 9, 2013 Filing 1678 ANSWER to #1586 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of BCBG Max Azria Group, Inc. by GeoTag Inc.(Bennett, David)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1677 ORDER granting #1673 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Interstate Systems of America Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/8/2013. (ch, )
December 6, 2013 Filing 1676 Agreed MOTION to Stay (Agreed Motion for Extension of Stay) by The Rockport Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrario, Matias)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1675 ORDER granting #1670 Motion to Dismiss. Dft The William Carter Company is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/5/2013. (ch, )
December 5, 2013 Filing 1674 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1546 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Job Locator Claims Against Certain Defendants and Related Counterclaims, WIth Prejudice filed by GeoTag Inc. (Tadlock, Charles)
December 5, 2013 Filing 1673 STIPULATED MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Interstate Battery Systems of America, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 4, 2013 Filing 1672 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE filed by Dillard's Inc, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Lee, #2 Exhibit A to Lee Declaration - Declaration of Brooks White, #3 Exhibit B to Lee Declaration - Declaration of Bill Adkerson, #4 Exhibit C to Lee Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Robert)
December 4, 2013 Filing 1671 NOTICE by American Eagle Outfitters Inc. of Compliance (Craft, Roger)
December 4, 2013 Filing 1670 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant The William Carter Company) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
December 4, 2013 Filing 1669 NOTICE by Hot Topic Inc. re #1628 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,, (DEFENDANT HOT TOPIC, INC.'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE) (Bittner, Michael)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1668 ORDER granting #1666 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE Responses due by 12/11/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/3/2013. (ch, )
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1667 ORDER granting #1665 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Ross Stores Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/4/2013. (ch, )
December 2, 2013 Filing 1666 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE by WHERE 2 GET IT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Daniel)
December 2, 2013 Filing 1665 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant Ross Stores Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1664 ORDER granting #1657 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE Responses due by 12/4/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/26/2013. (ch, )
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1663 ORDER granting #1656 Motion to Stay. Deadlines between plaintiff and dft The Rockport Company are stayed until 12/6/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/26/2013. (ch, )
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1662 ORDER granting #1653 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William H Stewart; Daniel S Mount and Kevin Martin Pasquinelli terminated as counsel for GeoTag. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/25/2013. (ch, )
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1661 ORDER granting #1651 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted between GeoTag and Dft Dress Barn based on job locator or career locator functionality or instrumentalities only are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/25/2013. (ch, ) Modified on 11/26/2013 (ch, ).
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1660 ORDER granting #1647 Motion to Dismiss. Dft TA Operating LLC is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/25/2013. (ch, )
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1659 ORDER granting #1654 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Burberry Limited is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/25/2013. (ch, )
November 25, 2013 Filing 1658 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1546 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Job Locator Claims Against Certain Defendants and Related Counterclaims, WIth Prejudice filed by Advance Auto Parts Inc, Advance Stores Company Inc, BJ's Wholesale Club Inc, Crabtree & Evelyn, E-Advance LLC, Eddie Bauer LLC, Gold's Gym International Inc., Nike Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Granaghan In Support of Response, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schuurman, Willem)
November 25, 2013 Filing 1657 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1544 SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE by Dillard's Inc, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
November 25, 2013 Filing 1656 Agreed MOTION to Stay (Agreed Motion for Extension of Stay) by The Rockport Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrario, Matias)
November 22, 2013 Filing 1655 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1653 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (PARTIALLY OPPOSED MOTION OF PLAINTIFF GEOTAG, INC., TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL FROM MOUNT SPELMAN & FINGERMAN, PC, AND REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES) On Behalf of Certain Defendants filed by Intelius, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
November 22, 2013 Filing 1654 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant Burberry Limited) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
November 22, 2013 Filing 1653 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (PARTIALLY OPPOSED MOTION OF PLAINTIFF GEOTAG, INC., TO WITHDRAW COUNSEL FROM MOUNT SPELMAN & FINGERMAN, PC, AND REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 22, 2013 Filing 1652 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc (JOINT NOTICE REGARDING TRIAL CONTINUANCE) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 22, 2013 Filing 1651 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss (partial dismissal of certain claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant The Dress Barn, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 22, 2013 Filing 1650 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc of Readiness for Status Conference (Tadlock, Charles)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1649 ORDER granting #1637 Motion to Stay. Proceedings between GeoTag and Dft Yelp Inc are stayed until 12/6/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/22/2013. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1648 ORDER granting #1636 Motion to Stay. GeoTag and CityGrid Media LLC are stayed til 12/6/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/22/2013. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Filing 1647 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant TA Operating LLC) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1646 ORDER granting #1635 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Old Navy (Apparel) LLC; Old Navy Inc.; Old Navy LLC; Banana Republic (Apparel), LLC; Banana Republic (ITM) Inc.; Banana Republic LLC; Gap (Apparel) LLC; and Gap Inc. dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/22/2013. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 1/3/2014 11:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1645 ORDER granting #1593 Motion to Stay. Deadlines between GeoTag and Yellowpages.com LLC are STAYED until 12/17/2013. If parties have not filed a joint motion to dismiss by 12/17/2013 counsel shall appear in hearing on 1/3/2014 @ 11:00 am. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/22/2013. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1644 ORDER granting #1634 Motion to Dismiss. M.A.C. Cosmetics Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/21/2013. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1643 ORDER granting #1633 Motion to Dismiss. Dft J Crew Group Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/21/2013. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1642 ORDER granting #1632 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Dots LLC is dismissed with prejudice+. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/21/2013. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1641 ORDER granting #1631 Motion to Dismiss. SpatialPoint LLC is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/21/2013. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1640 ORDER granting #1630 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Nordstrom is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/21/2013. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1639 ORDER granting #1629 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Costco Wholesale Corporation is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/21/2013. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1638 ORDER granting #1615 Motion to Stay Proceeding between GeoTag and Dft STIHL Incorporated until 12/2/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/21/2013. (ch, )
November 21, 2013 Filing 1637 Agreed MOTION to Stay (Agreed Motion for Extension of Stay) by GeoTag Inc, Yelp!, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
November 21, 2013 Filing 1636 Agreed MOTION to Stay (Agreed Motion for Extension of Stay) by CityGrid Media, LLC, GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
November 21, 2013 Filing 1635 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice) by Banana Republic LLC, GAP Inc, Old Navy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael)
November 20, 2013 Filing 1634 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice) by M.A.C. Cosmetics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael)
November 20, 2013 Filing 1633 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice) by J. Crew Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael)
November 20, 2013 Filing 1632 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice) by Dots, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael)
November 20, 2013 Filing 1631 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant SpatialPoint LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 20, 2013 Filing 1630 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Nordstrom, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 20, 2013 Filing 1629 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1628 ORDER terminating #871 Motion for Order to Show Cause; terminating #872 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Hot Topic and AEO are ORDERED to produce any such documents not yet producted to GeoTag within 14 days. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1627 ORDER granting #1613 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Richemont North America Inc and Van Cleef & Arpels Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1626 ORDER granting #1612 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Sterling Jewelers Inc and Kay Jewelers is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1625 ORDER granting #1611 Motion to Dismiss. Dft AutoNation Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1624 ORDER granting #1608 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Chico's FAS Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1623 ORDER granting #1607 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Royal Purple Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1622 ORDER granting #1606 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Leslie's Poolmart Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1621 ORDER granting #1605 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Brake Centers of the Southwest Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1620 ORDER granting #1604 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Gucci America Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1619 ORDER granting #1603 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Collective Brands Inc is hereby dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1618 ORDER granting #1602 Motion to Dismiss. CMRG Apparel LLC is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1617 ORDER granting #1601 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Catalogue Ventures Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1616 ORDER granting #1600 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Clark Equipment Company is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Filing 1615 Agreed MOTION to Stay by Remington Arms Company Inc, Stihl Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swanson, Derek)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1614 ORDER granting #1599 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Bass Pro Inc and BPS Direct LLC and Bass Pro Outdoors Online LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2013. (ch, )
November 19, 2013 Filing 1613 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Defendants Richemont North America Inc. and Van Cleef & Arpels, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 19, 2013 Filing 1612 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Defendants Sterling Jewelers Inc. and Kay Jewelers, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 19, 2013 Filing 1611 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant AutoNation, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1610 ORDER denying without prejudice #1481 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, #1483 Motions in Limine, #1484 Motions in Limine, #1486 Motions in Limine, #1487 Motions in Limine, #1489 Motions in Limine, #1491 Motions in Limine, #1494 Motions in Limine, #1495 Motions in Limine, #1497 Motions in Limine, #1502 Motions in Limine, #1526 Motions in Limine, #1527 Motions in Limine, #1528 Motions in Limine, and #1543 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/18/2013. (ch, ) Modified on 11/20/2013 (mrm, ).
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1609 ORDER granting #1591 Motion to Dismiss. Dft BCBGMaxAzriaGroup Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/18/2013. (ch, ) Modified on 11/20/2013 (mrm, ).
November 18, 2013 Filing 1608 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Defendant Chicos FAS, Inc.,) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 18, 2013 Filing 1607 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by Royal Purple, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
November 18, 2013 Filing 1606 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by Leslie's Poolmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
November 18, 2013 Filing 1605 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by Brake Centers of the Southwest Inc, Just Brakes of Nevada Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
November 18, 2013 Filing 1604 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by Gucci America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
November 18, 2013 Filing 1603 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by Collective Brands Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
November 18, 2013 Filing 1602 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by CMRG Apparel LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
November 18, 2013 Filing 1601 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by Catalogue Ventures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
November 18, 2013 Filing 1600 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by BOBCAT COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
November 18, 2013 Filing 1599 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by BPS Direct LLC, Bass Pro Inc, Bass Pro Outdoors Online LLC, Bass Pro Shops Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1598 ORDER granting #1583 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Buth-Na-Bodhaige Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/15/2013. (ch, )
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1597 ORDER granting #1581 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Cabela's Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/15/2013. (ch, )
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1596 ORDER granting #1580 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Belk Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/15/2013. (ch, )
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1595 ORDER granting #1569 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Deadline is 11/22/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/15/2013. (ch, )
November 17, 2013 Filing 1594 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/8/13 (Motion/Status Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 935-3868.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/12/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2014. (sholmes, )

November 15, 2013 Filing 1593 Agreed MOTION to Stay (AGREED MOTION TO EXTEND THE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT YELLOWPAGES.COM, LLC) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 15, 2013 Filing 1591 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant BCBGMAXAZRIAGROUP, INC. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 14, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 1582, Motion To Dismiss. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1590 ORDER granting #1572 Motion to Dismiss. Dft hibu Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/2013. (ch, )
November 14, 2013 Filing 1589 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BCBG Max Azria Group Inc. (Zinna, Michael)
November 14, 2013 Filing 1588 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BCBG Max Azria Group Inc (Zinna, Michael)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1587 ORDER granting #1571 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Local Corporation is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/2013. (ch, )
November 14, 2013 Filing 1586 BCBG Max Azria Group, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint from Case 2:10-cv-00587, Document 1, filed on 12/22/10, COUNTERCLAIM against Geo Tag Inc, GeoTag Inc by BCBG Max Azria Group Inc.(Zinna, Michael)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1585 ORDER granting #1570 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Dex One Corporation is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/2013. (ch, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1584 ORDER granting #1568 Motion to Dismiss. Dft The TJX Companies Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/2013. (ch, )
November 13, 2013 Filing 1583 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant Buth-Na-Bodhaige, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 13, 2013 Filing 1582 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant Pacific Bioscience Laboratories, Inc. d/b/a Clarisonic) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles) Modified on 11/14/2013 (ch, ).
November 13, 2013 Filing 1581 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant Cabelas Incorporated) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 13, 2013 Filing 1580 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant Belk, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1579 ORDER granting #1555 Motion to Stay. Dft Diesel USA Inc deadlines are stayed until 11/21/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/2013. (ch, )
November 13, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 1567, 1574, 1576, Motion and additional attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (CORRECTED DOCUMENT IS FILED AS #1577)(ch, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1578 ORDER granting #1553 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/2013. (ch, )
November 13, 2013 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: The Pretrial Conference previously set in this matter on November 20, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. (jml)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1577 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mount, Daniel)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1576 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1567 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney .. (Mount, Daniel) Modified on 11/13/2013 (ch, ).
November 12, 2013 Filing 1575 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Cooper Sanderson on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Sanderson, Adam)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1574 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1567 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney .. (Mount, Daniel) Modified on 11/13/2013 (ch, ).
November 12, 2013 Filing 1573 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel W Reese on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Reese, Joel)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1572 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice) by "hibu Inc.", GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1571 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice) by GeoTag Inc, Local Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1570 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice) by Dex One Corporation, GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1569 Joint MOTION (Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines) (JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES) by FR Defendants, GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1568 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant The TJX Companies, Inc.,) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1567 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mount, Daniel) Modified on 11/13/2013 (ch, ).
November 12, 2013 Filing 1566 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael C Chow on behalf of Ace Hardware Corp, Aeropostale Inc, Babiesrus.com LLC, Charlotte Ruse Inc, Christopher & Banks Corp, Cost Plus Inc, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, GSI Commerce Inc, General Nutrition Centers Inc, General Nutrition Corporation, Geoffrey LLC, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Haggar Direct Inc, Hagger Clothing Co, Levi Strauss & Co, Maurices Inc, Mee Accessories LLC, Mee Direct LLC, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Quicksilver Inc, Spanx Inc, The Sports Authority Inc, Toys "R" US-Delaware Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, Toysrus.com LLC, V E W Ltd, Vera Wang Bridal House Ltd, Yakira LLC (Chow, Michael)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1565 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Will Hussein Melehani on behalf of Ace Hardware Corp, Aeropostale Inc, Babiesrus.com LLC, Charlotte Ruse Inc, Christopher & Banks Corp, Cost Plus Inc, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, GSI Commerce Inc, General Nutrition Centers Inc, General Nutrition Corporation, Geoffrey LLC, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Haggar Direct Inc, Hagger Clothing Co, Levi Strauss & Co, Maurices Inc, Mee Accessories LLC, Mee Direct LLC, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Quicksilver Inc, Spanx Inc, The Sports Authority Inc, Toys "R" US-Delaware Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, Toysrus.com LLC, V E W Ltd, Vera Wang Bridal House Ltd, Yakira LLC (Melehani, Will)
November 12, 2013 Filing 1564 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark P Wine on behalf of Ace Hardware Corp, Aeropostale Inc, Babiesrus.com LLC, Charlotte Ruse Inc, Christopher & Banks Corp, Cost Plus Inc, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, GSI Commerce Inc, General Nutrition Centers Inc, General Nutrition Corporation, Geoffrey LLC, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Haggar Direct Inc, Hagger Clothing Co, Levi Strauss & Co, Maurices Inc, Mee Accessories LLC, Mee Direct LLC, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Quicksilver Inc, Spanx Inc, The Sports Authority Inc, Toys "R" US-Delaware Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, Toysrus.com LLC, V E W Ltd, Vera Wang Bridal House Ltd, Yakira LLC (Wine, Mark)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1563 ORDER granting #1525 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendants Nordstrom Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp., Hallmark Cards, Inc., Bally Total Fitness Corporation, and Fitness International, LLC (f/k/a LA Fitness International, LLC) deadline is stayed until 11/19/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2013. (ch, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1562 ORDER granting #1524 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. J. Thad Heartfield and M. Dru Montgomery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2013. (ch, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1561 ORDER granting #1539 Motion to Stay deadlines. All proceeding are STAYED between plaintiff and Dft Godiva Chocolatier Inc to 11/19/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2013. (ch, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1560 ORDER granting #1520 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Zale Delaware, Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2013. (ch, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1559 ORDER granting #1519 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Wendys International Inc., Wendys/Arbys Group Inc., Wendys/Arbys Restaurants LLC, and Oldemark LLC is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2013. (ch, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1558 ORDER granting #1518 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Vitamin Shoppe Industries Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2013. (ch, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1557 ORDER granting #1517 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Staples Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2013. (ch, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1556 ORDER granting #1516 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Sonic Corporation is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2013. (ch, )
November 11, 2013 Filing 1555 Agreed MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF GEOTAG, INC. AND DEFENDANT DIESEL U.S.A., INC. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
November 8, 2013 Filing 1592 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Hearing on Motions and Status Conference held on 11/8/2013. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 8, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection RESET for 3/10/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
November 8, 2013 Filing 1554 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #1545 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B to Dkt. 1545)(Smiley, Keith)
November 8, 2013 Filing 1553 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO GEOTAG'S MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. ALIN DEUTSCH by Advance Auto Parts Inc, Nike Inc, Valspar Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1552 ORDER granting #1515 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Dillon Companies Inc.; Food 4 Less GM, INC.; Food 4 Less Holdings, Inc.; Kroger Limited Partnership I; Kroger Limited Partnership II; Kroger Texas L.P.; Pay Less Markets Inc.; Ralphs Grocery Company; Smiths Food & Drug Centers Inc.; The Kroger Co.; and Fred Meyer Stores Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/8/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Filing 1551 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss (Agreed Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Claims Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc., and Defendant Maurices Incorporated) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1550 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss (Agreed Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Claims Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc., and Defendant Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1549 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss (Agreed Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Claims Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc., and Defendant Cost Plus, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1548 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss (Agreed Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Claims Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc., and Defendant Christopher & Banks Corporation) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1547 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss (Agreed Moton for Dismissal with Prejudice of Certain Claims Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc., and Defendant Aeropostale, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1546 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Job Locator Claims Against Certain Defendants and Related Counterclaims, WIth Prejudice by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - GeoTag Email with CNS Offer and Draft Papers, #2 Exhibit B - Executed Covenants Not to Sue, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1545 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #1143 SEALED MOTION to Exclude The Opinion of GeoTag's Damages Expert Philip Green filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration ISO Sur-reply, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Jackson Report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Green Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Green Deposition, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Green Supplement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Green Update, #7 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Exclude Green)(Stewart, William)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1544 ***PER ORDER #1788 THIS MOTION IS WITHDRAWN FOR PARTIES ROSS STORES INC AND HOBBY LOBBY INC BUT STILL PENDING FOR ALL OTHERS*** PER ORDER #1901 THIS MOTION IS WITHDRAWN FOR WHERE2GETIT, INC.***SEALED MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS WHERE2GETIT, DILLARDS, INC., AND HOBBY LOBBY STORES, INC., FOR SPOLIATION OF XIONETICS SOURCE CODE by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David) Modified on 1/16/2014 (sm, ). Modified on 2/10/2014 (mrm, ).
November 7, 2013 Filing 1543 MOTION in Limine To Bar Evidence Of Patent-Related Damages by WHERE 2 GET IT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Daniel)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1542 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #1510 SEALED MOTION Motion in Limine. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Conference to Original Document, #2 Text of Proposed Order to Original Document)(Bennett, David)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1541 ORDER granting #1509 Motion to Dismiss. Coach Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1540 ORDER granting #1505 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Ann Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Filing 1539 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings for GeoTag and Godiva Chocolatier, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1538 ORDER - the court enters this order sua sponte. The court has scheduled a status conference and hearing on 11 motions for summary judgment on 11/8/2013 @ 9:00 am, parties should plan to argue these motion in the following order, within the time allotments herein. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1537 ORDER granting #1514 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Department Stores, Inc., and Kohls Illinois, Inc dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/203. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1536 ORDER granting #1513 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Jos. A. Bank Clothiers Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1535 ORDER granting #1508 Motion to Dismiss. Burlington Factory Warehouse Corporation is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1534 ORDER granting #1507 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Bose Corporation is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1533 ORDER granting #1506 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Barnes & Noble Inc and Barnesandnoble.com LLC is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #1499 Motion in Limine submitted by Chick-Fil-A Inc and other dfts. No certificate of conference was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motion now Terminated. (sm, )
November 7, 2013 Filing 1532 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew C Acosta on behalf of H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP (Acosta, Matthew)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1531 ORDER granting #1504 Motion to Dismiss. Dfts A&W Restaurants, Inc.; KFC Corporation; Long John Silvers, Inc.; Pizza Hut Inc.; and Taco Bell Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1530 ORDER granting #1503 Motion to Dismiss. Dft 24 Fitness Worldwide Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Filing 1529 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #1495 MOTION in Limine to Bar Use of Certain Public Hearsay Documents.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conference)(Gray, Thomas)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1528 MOTION in Limine Regarding Untimely Infringement Allegations and Damages Against www.manalive.com by Jimmy Jazz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 060613 email from Pasquinelli, #2 Exhibit B - 061113 email from Neilson, #3 Exhibit C - 070313 email from Noteware, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1527 SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE by Cinemark Holdings Inc, Cinemark USA Inc, National Vision Inc., Regis Corporation, Spencer Gifts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Charles)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1526 MOTION in Limine to Bar Discontinued Use of Accused Store Locator by Ace Hardware Corp, Aeropostale Inc, Babiesrus.com LLC, Charlotte Ruse Inc, Christopher & Banks Corp, Cost Plus Inc, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, GSI Commerce Inc, General Nutrition Centers Inc, General Nutrition Corporation, Geoffrey LLC, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Haggar Direct Inc, Hagger Clothing Co, Levi Strauss & Co, Maurices Inc, Mee Accessories LLC, Mee Direct LLC, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Quicksilver Inc, Spanx Inc, The Sports Authority Inc, Toys "R" US-Delaware Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, Toysrus.com LLC, Yakira LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Thomas)
November 7, 2013 Filing 1525 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings between GeoTag and Nordstrom, Costco, Hallmark Cards, Bally Total Fitness) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 7, 2013 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 1500 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day. MOTION HAS BEEN TERMINATED. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 1498 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day. MOTION HAS BEEN TERMINATED (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Filing 1524 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Academy LTD, Ann Inc., Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Hallmark Cards, Inc., Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, TCF CO. LLC, THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INC., VF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
November 7, 2013 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 1493 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE OR PROPOSED ORDER. Correction should be made by one business day. MOTION HAS BEEN TERMINATED (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1523 ORDER granting #1465 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1223 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF SUSAN SPIELMAN Responses due by 11/12/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1522 ORDER granting #1464 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #1464 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1222 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. DENNIS SHASHA ( Responses due by 11/12/2013). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1521 ORDER granting #1461 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1220 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. BRUCE MAGGS Responses due by 11/12/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 6, 2013 Filing 1520 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Zale Delaware Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1519 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Oldemark LLC, Wendy's International Inc, Wendy's/Arby's Group Inc, Wendy's/Arby's Restaurants LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1518 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Vitamin Shoppe Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1517 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Staples Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1516 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Sonic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1515 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Dillon Companies Inc, Food 4 Less GM Inc, Food 4 Less Holdings Inc, Fred Meyer Stores Inc, KROGER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP II, Kroger Limited Partnership I, Kroger Texas LP, Pay Less Markets Inc, Ralphs Grocery Company, Smith's Food & Drug Centers Inc, The Kroger Co. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1514 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Illinois Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1513 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Jos. A. Bank Clothiers Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1512 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by The Hertz Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1511 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Great Clips Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1510 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED MOTION Motion in Limine by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed Exhibits 1-2, #2 Exhibit Sealed Exhibits 3-9, #3 Exhibit Sealed Exhibits 10-14)(Pasquinelli, Kevin) Modified on 11/7/2013 (sm, ).
November 6, 2013 Filing 1509 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Coach Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1508 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Burlington Factory Warehouse Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1507 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Bose Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1506 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Barnes & Noble Inc, Barnesandnoble.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1505 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ann Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1504 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by A&W Restaurants Inc, KFC Corporation, Long John Silver's Inc, Pizza Hut Inc, Taco Bell Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1503 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by 24 Hour Fitness Worldwide Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1502 SEALED MOTION Motion In Limine by Dillard's Inc, Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1501 NOTICE by HomeAdvisor, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com SN LLC, People Media Inc re #1497 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE of Joinder (Noteware, Daniel)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1500 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION in Limine Regarding Untimely Infringement Allegations and Damages Against www.manalive.com by Jimmy Jazz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 060613 email from Pasquinelli, #2 Exhibit B - 061113 email from Neilson, #3 Exhibit C - 070313 email from Noteware, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel) Modified on 11/7/2013 (ch, ).
November 6, 2013 Filing 1499 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***MOTION in Limine To Bar Evidence Of Patent-Related Damages by Carr-Gottstein Foods Co, Chick-Fil-A Inc, GFM HOLDINGS LLC, Genuardi's Family Markets LP, JO-ANN STORES, INC., JOANN.COM, LLC, Michaels Stores Inc, New York & Company Inc, PATAGONIA, INC., RANDALL'S FOOD & DRUGS LP, Randall's Food Markets Inc, Safeway Inc, TCF CO. LLC, THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INC., The Timberland Company, The Vons Companies Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, VIEWSONIC CORP., WHERE 2 GET IT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Daniel) Modified on 11/7/2013 (sm, ).
November 6, 2013 Filing 1498 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE by Cinemark Holdings Inc, Cinemark USA Inc, National Vision Inc., Regis Corporation, Spencer Gifts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Charles) Modified on 11/7/2013 (ch, ).
November 6, 2013 Filing 1497 SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE by Intelius, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gretchen J. Hoog, #2 Exhibit A to Hoog Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Hoog Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Hoog Decl., #5 Exhibit D to Hoog Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Hoog Decl., #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1496 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS: Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal: in re: Main Document: #1487 Opposed MOTION in Limine Regarding Period of Alleged Infringement and Unsupported Expert Testimony. (Kerlin, Paul)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1495 MOTION in Limine to Bar Use of Certain Public Hearsay Documents by Charlotte Ruse Inc, Cost Plus Inc, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Haggar Direct Inc, Hagger Clothing Co, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Spanx Inc, The Sports Authority Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declration of Benjamin S. Lin, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Gray, Thomas)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1494 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Admission of Settlement Agreements and Any Testimony or Documents Relying Thereon Filed on Behalf of All Defendants by Trane Inc, Trane US Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Wytsma, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9)(Findlay, Eric)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1493 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION in Limine to Bar Discontinued Use of Accused Store Locator by Ace Hardware Corp, Aeropostale Inc, Babiesrus.com LLC, Christopher & Banks Corp, Cost Plus Inc, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, GSI Commerce Inc, General Nutrition Centers Inc, General Nutrition Corporation, Geoffrey LLC, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Haggar Direct Inc, Hagger Clothing Co, Levi Strauss & Co, Maurices Inc, Mee Accessories LLC, Mee Direct LLC, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Quicksilver Inc, Spanx Inc, The Sports Authority Inc, Toys "R" US-Delaware Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, Yakira LLC. (Gray, Thomas) Modified on 11/7/2013 (ch, ).
November 6, 2013 NOTICE FROM CLERK - # 1487 was modified to be Sealed per attorney, certificate of authorization to file under seal will be filed momentarily (ch, )
November 6, 2013 Filing 1492 Agreed MOTION to Stay (AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF STAY AS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF GEOTAG, INC. AND DEFENDANT LOCAL CORPORATION) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1491 Opposed SEALED MOTION Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s Motions In Limine by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1490 Agreed MOTION to Stay (AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF STAY AS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF GEOTAG, INC. AND DEFENDANT HIBU, INC.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1489 Opposed SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT NIKE, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING UNTIMELY SUPPLEMENTAL DAMAGES EXPERT REPORT by Nike Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bettinger, Michael)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1488 Agreed MOTION to Stay (AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF STAY AS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF GEOTAG, INC. AND DEFENDANT DEX ONE CORPORATION) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1487 SEALED Opposed MOTION in Limine Regarding Period of Alleged Infringement and Unsupported Expert Testimony by Abercrombie & Fitch Co.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of William H. Oldach III in Support of Defendant Abercrombie & Fitch Co._s Motion in Limine Regarding Period of Alleged Infringement and Unsupported Expert Testimony, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order to Motion in Limine)(Kerlin, Paul) Modified on 11/6/2013 (ch, ).
November 6, 2013 Filing 1486 SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine Regarding Legal Conclusions Regarding Enablement and Cumulativeness (On Behalf of All Defendants) by HomeAdvisor, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com SN LLC, People Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MIL re Klausner Legal Conclusions, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1485 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/29/13 (Show Cause Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/2/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/7/2014. (sholmes, )
November 6, 2013 Filing 1484 SEALED MOTION (DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTIONS IN LIMINE) by FR Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1483 SEALED PATENT MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Parent Company of Defendants Match.com LLC, Match.com SN LLC, People Media Inc., and HomeAdvisor, Inc. by HomeAdvisor, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com SN LLC, People Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1482 NOTICE Regarding Motion Hearing by FR Defendants re #1101 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Dynamic Replication Claim Limitations, #1095 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT BASED ON THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS LIMITATIONS, #1099 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Lack of Topical Organization and/or Searchable Topics, #1106 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Disavowal of the Job Locator Functionality, #1098 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based On Lack Of Written Description, #1107 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO DIRECT INFRINGEMENT OF CLAIMS 1 AND 31 AND THEIR ASSERTED DEPENDENT CLAIMS, #1100 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents, #1111 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Infringement for Customer Defendants With Fully-Hosted Locators Provided by Third-Party, #899 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement for Defendants Who Provide Access to a Third-Party Locator System (Bittner, Michael)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1481 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS) by FR Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1480 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #1457 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,. (Stewart, William)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1479 RESPONSE to #1352 Notice (Other) Defendants Response and Objections to GeoTags Notice Regarding GeoTags Testifying Technical Expert filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Vakil, Bijal)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1478 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #1107 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO DIRECT INFRINGEMENT OF CLAIMS 1 AND 31 AND THEIR ASSERTED DEPENDENT CLAIMS filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1477 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #1100 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1476 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #1111 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Infringement for Customer Defendants With Fully-Hosted Locators Provided by Third-Party filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1475 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to GANDER MOUNTAINS SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF to Response to PATENT Motion re #1099 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Lack of Topical Organization and/or Searchable Topics filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1474 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to TRANES REPLY BRIEF to Response to PATENT Motion re #1099 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Lack of Topical Organization and/or Searchable Topics filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1473 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #1099 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Lack of Topical Organization and/or Searchable Topics filed by GeoTag Inc. (Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1472 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #1104 SEALED MOTION BY THE MICROSOFT CUSTOMERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT filed by GeoTag Inc. (Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1471 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #1098 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based On Lack Of Written Description filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1470 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #1106 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Disavowal of the Job Locator Functionality filed by GeoTag Inc. (Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1469 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #1095 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT BASED ON THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS LIMITATIONS filed by GeoTag Inc. (Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1468 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #1113 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment Related to Laches (GeoTag's Surreply and Objection to Trane Inc. and Trane U.S. Inc's Improper Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment Related to Laches) filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1467 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #1113 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment Related to Laches filed by GeoTag Inc. (Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1466 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #1101 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Dynamic Replication Claim Limitations filed by GeoTag Inc. (Bennett, David)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1465 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1223 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF SUSAN SPIELMAN by Ace Hardware Corp, Aeropostale Inc, Babiesrus.com LLC, Charlotte Ruse Inc, Cost Plus Inc, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, GSI Commerce Inc, General Nutrition Centers Inc, General Nutrition Corporation, Geoffrey LLC, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Haggar Direct Inc, Hagger Clothing Co, Levi Strauss & Co, Maurices Inc, Mee Accessories LLC, Mee Direct LLC, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Quicksilver Inc, Spanx Inc, The Sports Authority Inc, Toys "R" US-Delaware Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, V E W Ltd, Vera Wang Bridal House Ltd, Yakira LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gray, Thomas)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1464 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO GEOTAG'S MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY BY DR. DENNIS SHASHA), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1222 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. DENNIS SHASHA by FR Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1463 ORDER granting #1449 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1217 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF PETER KENT AND IVAN ZATKOVICH Responses due by 11/12/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/5/2013. (ch, )
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1462 ORDER granting #1427 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1224 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF MR. COLIN WHITE Responses due by 11/12/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/5/2013. (ch, )
November 5, 2013 Filing 1461 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1220 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. BRUCE MAGGS by HomeAdvisor, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com SN LLC, People Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1460 ORDER granting #1394 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to GeoTag's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/5/2013. (ch, )
November 5, 2013 Filing 1459 NOTICE by Eye Care Centers of America, Inc. - Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Harkins, J)
November 5, 2013 Filing 1458 NOTICE by Remington Arms Company Inc, Stihl Incorporated Notice of Request for Trial Transcripts (Swanson, Derek)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1457 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #1115 SEALED MOTION of Frontier Defendants', IAC Defendants' and YP to Exclude the Opinion of GeoTag's Damages Expert Chase Perry filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Denying the Defendants Motion to Exclude Perry)(Stewart, William)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1456 NOTICE by Hanesbrands Inc. of Request for Daily Transcript and Real-Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Findlay, Eric)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1455 NOTICE by Forever 21 Retail Inc. re #481 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, requests daily transcripts or Real Time (Meyer, Nathan)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1454 NOTICE by Cache Inc., Claire's Boutiques, Inc., Schlotsky's Franchise LLC (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Erickson, Brian)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1453 NOTICE by As America Inc, Heely's Inc., Hugo Boss Fashion Inc. Notice of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts (McCormack, Brian)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1452 NOTICE by Ace Hardware Corp, Aeropostale Inc, Babiesrus.com LLC, Charlotte Ruse Inc, Christopher & Banks Corp, Cost Plus Inc, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, GSI Commerce Inc, General Nutrition Centers Inc, General Nutrition Corporation, Geoffrey LLC, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Haggar Direct Inc, Hagger Clothing Co, Levi Strauss & Co, Maurices Inc, Mee Accessories LLC, Mee Direct LLC, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Quicksilver Inc, Spanx Inc, The Sports Authority Inc, Toys "R" US-Delaware Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, V E W Ltd, Vera Wang Bridal House Ltd, Yakira LLC Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Gray, Thomas)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1451 NOTICE by Life Time Fitness Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Robbennolt, Paul)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1450 NOTICE by Carhartt Inc of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1449 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1217 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF PETER KENT AND IVAN ZATKOVICH by Carr-Gottstein Foods Co, Chick-Fil-A Inc, GFM HOLDINGS LLC, Genuardi's Family Markets LP, JO-ANN STORES, INC., JOANN.COM, LLC, Michaels Stores Inc, New York & Company Inc, PATAGONIA, INC., RANDALL'S FOOD & DRUGS LP, Randall's Food Markets Inc, Safeway Inc, TCF CO. LLC, THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INC., The Timberland Company, The Vons Companies Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, VIEWSONIC CORP., WHERE 2 GET IT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Daniel)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1448 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Heartfield, J)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1447 NOTICE by Macy's Inc NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS (Mandaro, Richard)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1446 NOTICE by DSW Inc. of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts (Ahrens, Gregory)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1445 NOTICE by Carr-Gottstein Foods Co, Chick-Fil-A Inc, GFM HOLDINGS LLC, Genuardi's Family Markets LP, JO-ANN STORES, INC., JOANN.COM, LLC, Michaels Stores Inc, New York & Company Inc, PATAGONIA, INC., RANDALL'S FOOD & DRUGS LP, Randall's Food Markets Inc, Safeway Inc, TCF CO. LLC, THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INC., The Timberland Company, The Vons Companies Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, VIEWSONIC CORP., WHERE 2 GET IT, INC. of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts (Schwartz, Daniel)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1444 NOTICE by Eyemart Express, Ltd. of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts (Taube, Mari-Elise)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1443 NOTICE by Godiva Chocolatier Inc Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Colsher, Patrick)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1442 ORDER granting #1390 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to GeoTag's Motion to Strike. Deadline 11/12/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1441 ORDER granting #1389 Motion for Extension of Time to File Certain Deadlines. Deadline is 11/12/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1440 ORDER granting #1388 Motion for Extension of Time to File Certain Response Deadlines. Deadlines are extended to 11/12/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Filing 1439 NOTICE by Things Remembered, Inc. of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts (Moy, Philip)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1438 ORDER granting #1384 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Target Corp is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Filing 1437 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS (Tadlock, Charles)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1436 ORDER granting #1393 Motion to Stay. All proceeding between plaintiff and dft Yelp, Inc are stayed until 11/22/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Filing 1435 NOTICE by TA Operating LLC of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Fisch, Alan)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1434 NOTICE by FR Defendants re #481 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, (FR DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS AND REAL TIME REPORTING) (Bittner, Michael)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1433 NOTICE by Advance Auto Parts Inc, Nike Inc of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts (Bettinger, Michael)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1432 NOTICE by Terex Corporation of Request for Daily Transcripts or Realtime Reporting of Court Proceedings (Cunningham, Thomas)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1431 NOTICE by Enterprise Holding Inc, Vanguard Car Rental USA Inc (Notice of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1430 NOTICE by Jimmy Jazz Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts (Noteware, Daniel)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1429 NOTICE by Autonation Inc, Intelius, Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts or Realtime Reporting of Court Proceedings (Craft, Roger)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1428 NOTICE by Cinemark Holdings Inc, Cinemark USA Inc, National Vision Inc., Regis Corporation, Spencer Gifts LLC of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts (Baker, Charles)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1427 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1224 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF MR. COLIN WHITE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lo, Carmen)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1426 NOTICE by BestBuy.com LLC Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (McMahon, Emmett)
November 4, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/8/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. **The Status Conference will be held at the conclusion of the Motions hearing previously scheduled.**(jml)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1425 NOTICE by Abercrombie & Fitch Co. of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts (Kerlin, Paul)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1424 NOTICE by AutoZone Inc, Big Lots Inc, Big Lots Stores Inc, Brown Shoe Company Inc., Carmax Business Services LLC, Carmax Inc, Dillard's Inc, Gamestop Corp, Guitar Center Inc., Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Inc, The Finish Line Inc., The Pep Boys -- Manny Moe & Jack Notice of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts (Jivani, Kamran)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1423 ORDER granting #1381 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Cache Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Filing 1422 NOTICE by Academy LTD of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts (Drake, Kirby)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1421 NOTICE by HomeAdvisor, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com SN LLC, People Media Inc of Request for Daily Transcripts (Noteware, Daniel)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 ORDER granting #1379 Motion to Dismiss. Dft BestBuy.com LLC is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1419 ORDER granting #1377 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jodi Rosen Wine; Russell J Genet and Jason C Kravitz terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1418 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Dft Caterpillar Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1417 ORDER granting #1376 Motion to Dismiss. Caterpillar Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1416 ORDER granting #1367 Motion to Withdraw #1216 Sealed Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Filing 1415 NOTICE by Genesco Inc. of Request for Daily Trial Transcripts or Realtime Reporting of Court Proceedings (Grab, Leslie)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 ORDER granting #1366 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1217 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF PETER KENT AND IVAN ZATKOVICH Responses due by 11/8/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1413 ORDER granting #1364 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1222 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. DENNIS SHASHA Responses due by 11/8/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1412 ORDER granting #1363 Motion to Stay Proceeding between plaintiff and Dft Christus Health Non-Profit Corporation and Christus Health Foundations until 11/22/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1411 ORDER granting #1383 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Schlotzsky's Franchise LLC is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1410 ORDER granting #1382 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Claire's Boutiques Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1409 ORDER granting #1378 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to GeoTags Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Filing 1408 NOTICE by 7-Eleven, Inc., Bare Escentuals Inc., Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, Crabtree & Evelyn, Gold's Gym International Inc., Sephora USA Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts or Real Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Schuurman, Willem)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1407 NOTICE by Bally Total Fitness Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corp, Deere & Company, Hallmark Cards, Inc., L.A. Fitness International LLC, Nordstrom Inc OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS (Williams, Danny)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1406 NOTICE by H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Jackson, John)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1405 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc re #1224 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF MR. COLIN WHITE GeoTag's Notice of Amended Certificate of Service and Supplemental Certificate of Conference for Docket No. 1224 (Tadlock, Charles)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1404 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc re #1222 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. DENNIS SHASHA GeoTag's Notice of Amended Certificate of Service and Supplemental Certificate of Conference for Docket No. 1222 (Tadlock, Charles)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1403 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc re #1221 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. M. RAY MERCER GeoTag's Notice of Amended Certificate of Service and Supplemental Certificate of Conference for Docket No. 1221 (Tadlock, Charles)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1402 NOTICE by Trane Inc, Trane US Inc of Request for Daily Transcripts or Realtime Reporting of Court Proceedings (Craft, Roger)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1401 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc re #1220 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. BRUCE MAGGS GeoTag's Notice of Amended Certificate of Service and Supplemental Certificate of Conference for Docket No. 1220 (Tadlock, Charles)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1400 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc re #1219 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. RAY R. LARSON GeoTag's Notice of Amended Certificate of Service and Supplemental Certificate of Conference for Docket No. 1219 (Tadlock, Charles)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1399 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc re #1218 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. CRAIG A. KNOBLOCK GeoTag's Notice of Amended Certificate of Service and Supplemental Certificate of Conference for Docket No. 1218 (Tadlock, Charles)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1398 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc re #1217 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF PETER KENT AND IVAN ZATKOVICH GeoTag's Notice of Amended Certificate of Service and Supplemental Certificate of Conference for Docket No. 1217 (Tadlock, Charles)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1397 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc re #1215 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. ANANTH GRAMA GeoTag's Notice of Amended Certificate of Service and Supplemental Certificate of Conference for Docket No. 1215 (Tadlock, Charles)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1396 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc re #1214 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. MARGARET H. DUNHAM GeoTag's Notice of Amended Certificate of Service and Supplemental Certificate of Conference for Docket No. 1214 (Tadlock, Charles)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1395 NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Conference and Service by GeoTag Inc re #1213 First SEALED GEOTAG MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. ALIN DEUTSCH (Tadlock, Charles) Modified on 11/4/2013 (sm, ).
November 4, 2013 Filing 1394 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Defendants Response to GeoTags Motion to Strike Expert Report and to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Margaret H. Dunham by As America Inc, Heely's Inc., Hugo Boss Fashion Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCormack, Brian)
November 1, 2013 Filing 1393 Agreed MOTION to Stay with Respect to Defendant Yelp!, Inc., Pending Completion of Settlement by Yelp!, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nishimoto, Ryan)
November 1, 2013 Filing 1392 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1111 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Infringement for Customer Defendants With Fully-Hosted Locators Provided by Third-Party filed by Carr-Gottstein Foods Co, Chick-Fil-A Inc, GFM HOLDINGS LLC, Genuardi's Family Markets LP, JO-ANN STORES, INC., JOANN.COM, LLC, Michaels Stores Inc, New York & Company Inc, PATAGONIA, INC., RANDALL'S FOOD & DRUGS LP, Randall's Food Markets Inc, Safeway Inc, TCF CO. LLC, THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INC., The Timberland Company, The Vons Companies Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, VIEWSONIC CORP., WHERE 2 GET IT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schwartz, Daniel)
November 1, 2013 Filing 1391 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #1107 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NO DIRECT INFRINGEMENT OF CLAIMS 1 AND 31 AND THEIR ASSERTED DEPENDENT CLAIMS filed by CHRISTUS HEALTH FOUNDATION, Christus Health, Cinemark Holdings Inc, Cinemark USA Inc, National Vision Inc., Regis Corporation, Spencer Gifts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Charles)
November 1, 2013 Filing 1390 Unopposed JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to TO EXTEND CERTAIN RESPONSE DEADLINES) by CHRISTUS HEALTH FOUNDATION, Christus Health, Cinemark Holdings Inc, Cinemark USA Inc, National Vision Inc., Regis Corporation, Spencer Gifts LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Charles)
November 1, 2013 Filing 1389 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Certain Response Deadlines by AutoZone Inc, Belk Inc, Big Lots Inc, Big Lots Stores Inc, Brown Shoe Company Inc., Carmax Business Services LLC, Carmax Inc, Dillard's Inc, Gamestop Corp, Guitar Center Inc., Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Inc, The Finish Line Inc., The Pep Boys -- Manny Moe & Jack. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
November 1, 2013 Filing 1388 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to EXTEND CERTAIN RESPONSE DEADLINES) by FR Defendants, GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Order))(Bittner, Michael)
November 1, 2013 Filing 1387 NOTICE by Academy LTD, Ann Inc., BOBCAT COMPANY, Banana Republic LLC, Barnes & Noble Inc, Deere & Company, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Hallmark Cards, Inc., Herman Miller Inc, Levi Strauss & Co, Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Macy's Inc, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Petco Animal Supplies Inc, Petco Animal Supplies Stores Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, TCF CO. LLC, THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INC., Target Corp, Toys "R" US-Delaware Inc, VF Corporation (Request For Termination Of Electronic Notices) (Genet, Russell)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1386 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1215 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. ANANTH GRAMA filed by Intelius, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1385 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Parties' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery by ASICS America Corp, Avis Budget Group Inc, Avis Rent A Car System LLC, BJ's Wholesale Club Inc, Brookstone Company Inc, Chanel Inc, Charming Shoppes Inc., David's Bridal Inc., Dollar Rent A Car Inc, Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Guess Retail Inc., Hot Topic Inc., Kohler Co, Kubota Tractor Corporation, Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Polo Ralph Lauren Corporation, Radio Shack Corp, The Sports Authority Inc, Thrifty Inc, Ulta Salon, Cosmetics & Fragrance, Inc., Vitamin Shoppe Industries, Inc.. (Bittner, Michael)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1384 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss of all Claims between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Target Corp. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1383 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice, Defendant Schlotzsky's Franchise, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1382 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice, Defendant Claire's Boutiques, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1381 MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice, Defendant Cache, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1380 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Mark Weeks on behalf of AutoZone Inc, Belk Inc, Big Lots Inc, Big Lots Stores Inc, Brown Shoe Company Inc., Carmax Business Services LLC, Carmax Inc, Dillard's Inc, Gamestop Corp, Guitar Center Inc., Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Inc, The Finish Line Inc., The Pep Boys -- Manny Moe & Jack (Weeks, Joshua)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1379 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant BestBuy.com, LLC With Prejudice by BestBuy.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMahon, Emmett)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1378 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants Opposition to GeoTag's Motion to Strike the Expert Report and to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Dr. Alin Deutsch by Advance Auto Parts Inc, Nike Inc, Valspar Corporation, Yelp!, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Brian)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1377 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Academy LTD, Ann Inc., BOBCAT COMPANY, Banana Republic LLC, Barnes & Noble Inc, Deere & Company, GAP Inc, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Hallmark Cards, Inc., Herman Miller Inc, Levi Strauss & Co, Luxottica Retail North America Inc., Macy's Inc, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, TCF CO. LLC, THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INC., Target Corp, Toys "R" US-Delaware Inc, VF Corporation, Valspar Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wine, Jodi)
October 30, 2013 Filing 1376 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Defendant Caterpillar Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1375 ORDER granting #1360 Motion to Stay Proceedings between Plaintiff Geotag and Defendant Diesel U.S.A.up to and including November 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/2013. (sm, )
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1374 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Granting #1359 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Coldwater Creek, Inc. with prejudice filed by GeoTag Inc., Coldwater Creek Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/2013. (sm, )
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 ORDER granting #1329 Motion for Extension of Time to File re certain pretrial deadlines. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/2013. (sm, )
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1372 ORDER granting #1361 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr; Roger Brian Craft and Eric Hugh Findlay terminated as attys for Advance Auto Part, Addvance Stores Company and E-Advance LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/2013. (sm, )
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 ***DUPLICATE ORDER. PLEASE IGNORE.***ORDER granting #1361 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Roger Brian Craft and Eric Hugh Findlay terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/13. (bas, ) Modified on 10/30/2013 (bas, ).
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1370 ORDER granting #1350 Motion to Extend Deadline Solely to Complete Deposition of Inventor Peter Dunworth. The deposition may proceed on or before NOVEMBER 21, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/13. (bas, )
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1369 ORDER granting #1348 Motion to Stay proceedings between Plaintiffs and Defendants Chico's FAS Inc. and Ross Stores Inc. up to and including NOVEMBER 21, 2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/13. (bas, )
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1368 ORDER granting #1357 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 11/8/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/13. (bas, )
October 30, 2013 Filing 1367 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw #1216 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. MARKUS JAKOBSSON by Forever 21 Retail Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meyer, Nathan)
October 30, 2013 Filing 1366 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1217 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF PETER KENT AND IVAN ZATKOVICH by Carr-Gottstein Foods Co, Chick-Fil-A Inc, GFM HOLDINGS LLC, Genuardi's Family Markets LP, JO-ANN STORES, INC., JOANN.COM, LLC, Michaels Stores Inc, New York & Company Inc, PATAGONIA, INC., RANDALL'S FOOD & DRUGS LP, Randall's Food Markets Inc, Safeway Inc, TCF CO. LLC, THE CHEESECAKE FACTORY INC., The Timberland Company, The Vons Companies Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, VIEWSONIC CORP., WHERE 2 GET IT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Daniel)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 ORDER granting #1328 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Visionworks of America, Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/2013. (ch, )
October 30, 2013 Filing 1364 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1222 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. DENNIS SHASHA Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Defendants' Response to GeoTag's Motion to Strike Expert Report and to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Dr. Dennis Shasha by FR Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Defendants' Response to GeoTag's Motion to Strike Expert Report and to Exclude Opinion Testimony of Dr. Dennis Shasha)(McNabnay, Neil)
October 30, 2013 Filing 1363 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings as to Certain Defendants by CHRISTUS HEALTH FOUNDATION, Christus Health. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Charles)
October 29, 2013 Filing 1362 NOTICE by H&M Hennes & Mauritz LP of Compliance Regarding Service of Rebuttal Pretrial Disclosures (Jackson, John)
October 29, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection RESET for 12/9/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
October 29, 2013 Filing 1361 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Eric H. Findlay, Brian Craft, and Walter W. Lackey, Jr. by Advance Auto Parts Inc, Advance Stores Company Inc, E-Advance LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
October 29, 2013 Filing 1360 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Between Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant Diesel U.S.A., Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, William)
October 29, 2013 Filing 1359 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Coldwater Creek, Inc. by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, William)
October 29, 2013 Filing 1358 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 10/29/2013 re #871 GEOTAG'S MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEFENDANT HOT TOPICS FAILURE TO PRODUCE ANY DAMAGES DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO THE CLOSE OF DISCOVERY, #872 GEOTAG'S MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE FOR DEFENDANT AMERICAN EAGLE OUTFITTERS FAILURE TO PRODUCE ITS DAMAGES DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO THE CLOSE OF DISCOVERY filed by GeoTag Inc. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney attendance sheet) (jml)
October 29, 2013 Filing 1357 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Defendants Response to GeoTags Motion to Strike Expert Report and to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Margaret H. Dunham by Academy LTD, As America Inc, Heely's Inc., Hugo Boss Fashion Inc., Jimmy Jazz Inc., Terex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCormack, Brian)
October 29, 2013 Filing 1356 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell C Petersen on behalf of Bare Escentuals Inc. (Petersen, Russell)
October 29, 2013 Filing 1355 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert A McFarlane on behalf of Bare Escentuals Inc. (McFarlane, Robert)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1354 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1104 SEALED MOTION BY THE MICROSOFT CUSTOMERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT filed by Bally Total Fitness Corporation, Costco Wholesale Corp, Hallmark Cards, Inc., L.A. Fitness International LLC, Nordstrom Inc. (Buss, Brian)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1353 NOTICE by Nike Inc of Service of Supplemental Rebuttal Disclosures (Yang, Irene)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1352 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc REGARDING GEOTAGS TESTIFYING TECHNICAL EXPERT (Bennett, David)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1351 SEALED PATENT SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #1099 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Lack of Topical Organization and/or Searchable Topics filed by Gander Mountain Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Blum, Anthony)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1350 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline Solely to Complete Deposition of Inventor Peter Dunworth by Trane Inc, Trane US Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1349 ORDER granting #1322 Motion to Stay. Dft Caterpillar Inc deadline is STAYED until 11/8/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2013. (ch, )
October 28, 2013 Filing 1348 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings for Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Certain Defendants by Chico's FAS Inc., Ross Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1347 ORDER granting #1318 Motion to Stay. Dft Rockport Company LLC deadline is 11/22/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2013. (ch, )
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 ORDER granting #1312 Motion to Stay. Deadlines for Dft Dex One Corporation is stayed up to 11/1/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2013. (ch, )
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1345 ORDER granting #1311 Motion to Stay. Dft hibu Inc deadlines are stayed until 11/1/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2013. (ch, )
October 28, 2013 Filing 1344 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1099 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Lack of Topical Organization and/or Searchable Topics filed by Trane Inc, Trane US Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1343 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #1113 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment Related to Laches filed by Trane Inc, Trane US Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wytsma, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Findlay, Eric)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1342 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1098 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based On Lack Of Written Description filed by AutoZone Inc, Belk Inc, Big Lots Inc, Big Lots Stores Inc, Brown Shoe Company Inc., Carmax Business Services LLC, Carmax Inc, Dillard's Inc, Gamestop Corp, Guitar Center Inc., Hobby Lobby Stores Inc, O'Reilly Automotive Inc, The Finish Line Inc., The Pep Boys -- Manny Moe & Jack. (Lee, Robert)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 ORDER granting #1310 Motion to Stay. Deadlines related to motions between pla and dft Local Corporation, are stayed until 11/1/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2013. (ch, )
October 28, 2013 Filing 1340 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #1143 SEALED MOTION to Exclude The Opinion of GeoTag's Damages Expert Philip Green filed by Ace Hardware Corp, Aeropostale Inc, Charlotte Ruse Inc, Christopher & Banks Corp, Cost Plus Inc, Dick's Sporting Goods Inc, GSI Commerce Inc, General Nutrition Centers Inc, Groupe Dynamite, Inc., Haggar Direct Inc, Hagger Clothing Co, Levi Strauss & Co, Mee Accessories LLC, Mee Direct LLC, Nautica Retail USA Inc, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Quicksilver Inc, Spanx Inc, The Sports Authority Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, Vera Wang Bridal House Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Appendix Declaration of Mark P. Wine)(Vincent, Lance)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1339 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1113 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment Related to Laches filed by CityGrid Media, LLC, HomeAdvisor, Inc., Match.Com LLC, People Media Inc. (Noteware, Daniel)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1338 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1095 SEALED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT BASED ON THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS LIMITATIONS filed by Remington Arms Company Inc, Stihl Incorporated. (Swanson, Derek)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1337 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #1101 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Dynamic Replication Claim Limitations filed by 7-Eleven, Inc., BJ's Wholesale Club Inc, Bare Escentuals Inc., Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, Crabtree & Evelyn, Gold's Gym International Inc., Sephora USA Inc.. (Schuurman, Willem)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1336 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1100 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Under the Doctrine of Equivalents DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT UNDER THE DOCTRINE OF EQUIVALENTS filed by FR Defendants. (Bittner, Michael)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1335 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1099 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Lack of Topical Organization and/or Searchable Topics REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT BASED ON LACK OF "TOPICAL" ORGANIZATION AND/OR SEARCHABLE "TOPICS" filed by FR Defendants. (Bittner, Michael)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1334 ORDER granting #1325 Motion to Dismiss, Dft Group 1 Automotive inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2013. (ch, )
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1333 ORDER denying #1320 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2013. (ch, )
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1332 ORDER granting #1319 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1220 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. BRUCE MAGGS Responses due by 11/8/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2013. (ch, )
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1331 ORDER denying #1305 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2013. (ch, )
October 28, 2013 Filing 1330 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1106 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement Based on Disavowal of the Job Locator Functionality filed by American Eagle Outfitters Inc., Autonation Inc, Citi Trends Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1329 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND CERTAIN PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES by FR Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
October 28, 2013 Filing 1328 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant Visionworks of America, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1327 ORDER granting #1313 Motion to Withdraw, withdrawing #1275 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/25/2013. (ch, )
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1326 ORDER granting #1302 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dfts Response to GeoTags Motion to Strike Expert Report and Exclude opinion Testimony of Dr. Markus Jakobsson. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/25/2013. (ch, )
October 25, 2013 Filing 1325 MOTION to Dismiss (STIPULATED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Defendant Group 1 Automotive, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
October 25, 2013 Filing 1324 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amie Leann Medley on behalf of "hibu Inc.", CityGrid Media, LLC, Dex One Corporation, HomeAdvisor, Inc., Local Corporation, Match.Com LLC, Match.com SN LLC, People Media Inc, Yelp!, Inc. (Medley, Amie)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1323 ORDER granting #1296 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1223 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF SUSAN SPIELMAN Responses due by 11/8/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/25/2013. (ch, )
October 25, 2013 Filing 1322 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Between GeoTag and Caterpillar by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Stay Proceedings Between GeoTag and Caterpillar)(Stewart, William)
October 25, 2013 Filing 1321 NOTICE by Forever 21 Retail Inc. of Service of Supplemental Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures (Meyer, Nathan)
October 25, 2013 Filing 1320 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by CHRISTUS HEALTH FOUNDATION, Christus Health. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Charles)
October 25, 2013 Filing 1319 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1220 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. BRUCE MAGGS by HomeAdvisor, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com SN LLC, People Media Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
October 25, 2013 Filing 1318 Agreed MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS AS TO THE ROCKPORT COMPANY, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
October 25, 2013 Filing 1317 NOTICE by DSW Inc. of Service of Supplemental Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures (Ahrens, Gregory)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1316 ORDER granting #1298 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1224 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF MR. COLIN WHITE Responses due by 11/8/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/24/2013. (ch, )
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1315 ORDER granting #1297 Motion to Stay. Dft Bluberry Limitied deadlines are STAYED until 11/5/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/24/2013. (ch, )
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1314 ORDER granting #1295 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1295 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1177 MOTION to Strike EXPERT REPORT AND TO EXCLUDE OPINION TESTIMONY OF DR. MICHALSON ON INVALIDITY Responses due by 11/1/2013 Replies due by 11/18/2013.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/24/2013. (ch, )
October 24, 2013 Filing 1313 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #1275 Opposed MOTION for Order to Show Cause WHY LOMBARD & GELIEBTER LLP SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT FOR VIOLATING THE PROTECTIVE ORDER by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
October 24, 2013 Filing 1312 Agreed MOTION to Stay re #1248 Order on Motion to Stay (Agreed Motion for Extension of Stay) by Dex One Corporation, GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
October 24, 2013 Filing 1311 Agreed MOTION to Stay re #1254 Order on Motion to Stay (Agreed Motion for Extension of Stay) by "hibu Inc.", GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
October 24, 2013 Filing 1310 Agreed MOTION to Stay re #1253 Order on Motion to Stay (Agreed Motion for Extension of Stay) by GeoTag Inc, Local Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noteware, Daniel)
October 24, 2013 Filing 1309 NOTICE by Advance Auto Parts Inc, Advance Stores Company Inc, E-Advance LLC, Valspar Corporation, Yelp!, Inc. of Service of Defendant's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(3) Rebuttal Disclosures (Yang, Irene)
October 24, 2013 Filing 1308 NOTICE by Graco Inc, Valspar Corporation of Service of Defendant's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures (Yang, Irene)
October 24, 2013 Filing 1307 RESPONSE in Support re #1115 SEALED MOTION of Frontier Defendants', IAC Defendants' and YP to Exclude the Opinion of GeoTag's Damages Expert Chase Perry filed by CityGrid Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Abernathy in Support of Reply re: Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Chase Perry, #2 Exhibit T)(Bettinger, Michael)
October 24, 2013 Filing 1306 NOTICE by HomeAdvisor, Inc., Match.Com LLC, Match.com SN LLC, People Media Inc of Compliance regarding Objections to Pretrial Disclosures and Rebuttal Pretrial Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures (Noteware, Daniel)
October 24, 2013 Filing 1305 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings for Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Certain Defendants by Chico's FAS Inc., Ross Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jivani, Kamran)
October 24, 2013