Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC v. A9.com, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC
Defendant: A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc., Nokia, Inc. and Ricoh Innovations, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00364
Filed: September 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2012 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT from the Northern District of California as to Case Transferred Out - District Transfer received on 3/12/12 and assigned case number 3:12cv01217. (ehs, )
March 9, 2012 Interdistrict electronic transfer to the Northern District of California. (ehs, )
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - Considering all of the private and public interest factors, Defendants have shown that the Northern District of California is clearly more convenient than the Eastern District of Texas. Four of the § 1404(a) factors weigh in favor of transfer, and the rest are neutral or do not apply. None of the factors weigh against transfer. As such, Defendants motions to transfer venue in the 287 Patent International Action (Dkt. No. 62); the 287 Patent International Action (Dkt. No. 20); the 474 Patent Domestic Action (Dkt. No. 36); and the 474 Patent International Action Dkt. No. 22) are each GRANTED.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/14/12. (ehs, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 127 RESPONSE to 123 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Brief Addressing the Dismissal of Ricoh Innovations, Inc. and Ricoh Company, Ltd. on their Motion to Transfer Venue by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Tousi, Cameron)
February 9, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY WILL REFILE. Document # 126, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
February 8, 2012 Filing 126 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC re 123 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Response in Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Brief Addressing the Dismissal of Ricoh Innovations, Inc. and Ricoh Company, Ltd. (Tousi, Cameron) Modified on 2/9/2012 (sm, ).
February 2, 2012 Filing 125 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC and Defendants A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc. and Nokia, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tousi, Cameron)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting 122 Motion for Supplemental Brief Addressing the Impact of the Dismissal of Ricoh Innovations, Inc. and Ricoh Company, Ltd. on their motions to Transfer. Plaintiffs Response is due 2/8/2012. No Reply or Sur-Reply will be permitted. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/1/2012. (ch, )
January 31, 2012 Filing 123 NOTICE by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc. re 62 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Supplemental Brief Addressing the Impact of the Dismissal of Ricoh Entities on Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Michael)
January 31, 2012 Filing 122 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief Addressing the Impact of the Dismissal of Ricoh Entities on Defendants' Motion to Transfer re 62 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
January 31, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Selection set for 12/2/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Markman Hearing set for 8/22/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/24/2012. (ch, )
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting 119 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff WRT and Defendants Ricoh are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees, costs of court and expenses are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/9/2012. (ch, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 119 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Ricoh Company, Ltd. and Ricoh Innovations, Inc. by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tousi, Cameron)
December 20, 2011 Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap re: misc order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (rvw, )
December 5, 2011 Filing 118 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC of Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Farnum, David)
December 2, 2011 Filing 117 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google, Inc., Regarding Service of Supplemental Disclosures (Shvodian, Daniel)
November 28, 2011 Filing 116 Joint MOTION for Entry of Amended Discovery and Docket Control Orders by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Ricoh Innovations, Inc., Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Discovery Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Amended Docket Control Order (consolidated versions), # 3 Text of Proposed Order Amended Docket Control Order (Defendants' Version), # 4 Text of Proposed Order Amended Docket Control Order (Plaintiff's Version))(Smith, Michael)
October 28, 2011 Filing 115 REPLY to Response to Motion re 104 Cross MOTION to Sever Pursuant to Rules 20 and 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Ricoh Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit J)(Smith, Michael)
October 28, 2011 Filing 114 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Ricoh Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G, # 5 Exhibit H, # 6 Exhibit I)(Smith, Michael)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 111 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 104 Cross MOTION to Sever Pursuant to Rules 20 and 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 109 Response in Opposition to Motion, 108 Reply to Response to MotionUnopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Replly. Replies due by 10/28/2011.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on October 28, 2011. (jml, )
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 110 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Replies due by 10/26/2011.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on October 28, 2011. (jml)
October 26, 2011 Filing 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 109 Response in Opposition to Motion, 108 Reply to Response to Motion by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Ricoh Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
October 21, 2011 Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 109 Response in Opposition to Motion, 108 Reply to Response to Motion by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Ricoh Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
October 11, 2011 Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re 104 Cross MOTION to Sever Pursuant to Rules 20 and 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - United States District Court, Eastern District of Texas, Sherman Division; Case No. 4:10-cv-435; Oasis Research, LLC v. Adrive, LLC, et. al.; Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tousi, Cameron)
October 11, 2011 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion re 94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiff Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC's Reply in Support of its Motion to Consolidate filed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Tousi, Cameron)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MISC. 11-1 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/11. (bga, )
September 30, 2011 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 102 Response in Opposition to Motion to Consolidate by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 28, 2011 Filing 105 NOTICE by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Ricoh Innovations, Inc. of Compliance With Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Shvodian, Daniel)
September 27, 2011 Filing 104 Cross MOTION to Sever Pursuant to Rules 20 and 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Ricoh Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Valentine, James)
September 26, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #103 Cross Motion submitted by A9.com, Inc.. No certificate of service was included and no proposed order attached. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motion is now TERMINATED. (sm, )
September 23, 2011 Filing 103 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Cross MOTION to Sever Pursuant to Rules 20 and 21 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Valentine, James) Modified on 9/26/2011 (sm, ).
September 23, 2011 Filing 102 RESPONSE in Opposition re 94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Valentine, James)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Responses due by 9/23/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/20/2011. (ch, )
September 16, 2011 Filing 100 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
September 12, 2011 Filing 99 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Erik J Dykema for Nokia, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-694)(ehs, )
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 97 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff Wireless Recognition Technologies LLCs Motion to Consolidate Responses due by 9/16/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/6/11. (ehs, )
September 2, 2011 Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Ricoh Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
August 18, 2011 Filing 96 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Entry of) by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Ricoh Innovations, Inc., Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Protective Order with Competing Proposals, # 2 Exhibit 2-Plaintiff's Proposed Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit 3-Defendants' Proposed Protective Order, # 4 Exhibit 4-Dkt. No. 241 from LTT case, # 5 Exhibit 5-Dkt. No. 169 from LTT case, # 6 Exhibit Dkt. No. 169-1 from LTT case, # 7 Exhibit 7-ST Sales v. Daimler-LEXIS, # 8 Exhibit 8-Yudell Power of Attorney)(Shvodian, Daniel)
August 17, 2011 Filing 95 Additional Attachments to Main Document (CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE SHOWING OPPOSED) : 94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases.. (Davis, William)
August 16, 2011 Filing 94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 92 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for partied to submit a proposed Protective Order is 8/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/5/2011. (ch, ) Modified on 8/5/2011 (ch, ).
August 4, 2011 Filing 92 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 90 Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on July 22, 2011. (delat, )
July 21, 2011 Filing 90 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline to submit a proposed Protective Order is extended to 7/21/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/7/2011. (ch, )
July 6, 2011 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline by which the parties may submit a proposed Protective Order has been extended to July 7, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/20/11. (ehs, )
June 16, 2011 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/6/11. (ehs, )
June 2, 2011 Filing 84 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
May 23, 2011 Filing 83 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Clinton L Conner for Ricoh Innovations, Inc.,Clinton L Conner for Ricoh Innovations, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-3327) (ehs, )
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 79 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties are to submit a Proposed Protective Order by 6/2/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/2011. (ch, )
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 80 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Discovery Order is hereby modified to extend the deadline to join additional parties until 6/2/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/20/2011. (ch, )
May 19, 2011 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 64 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, to Extend Deadline to Join Additional Parties by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
May 19, 2011 Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
May 16, 2011 Filing 78 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 62 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Support of its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit T - Declaration of Bradley J. Botsch)(Davis, William)
May 9, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE of Disclosure by Nokia, Inc. (Initial Dislcosures) (Smith, Michael)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline by which the parties may submit a proposed Protective Order has been extended to May 19, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/6/11. (ehs, )
May 6, 2011 Filing 75 NOTICE by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 (Davis, William)
May 5, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE of Disclosure by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc., Regarding Service of Initial Disclosures (Shvodian, Daniel)
May 5, 2011 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re 62 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P, # 2 Exhibit Q)(Shvodian, Daniel)
May 5, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE of Disclosure by Ricoh Innovations, Inc. regarding Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
May 5, 2011 Filing 71 NOTICE of Disclosure by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (Davis, William)
May 5, 2011 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 67 Motion to Withdraw Aaron Hand as Attorney.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/26/2011. (sm, )
April 25, 2011 Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re 62 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Bradley J. Botsch, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Craig Yudell, # 3 Exhibit C - "Hiding in Plain Sight, Google Seeks More Power," The New York Times, June 14, 2006, # 4 Exhibit D - Areas of Focus at Bangalore Center, Amazon Development Center, India, # 5 Exhibit E - Areas of Focus at Bangalore Center, Amazon Development Center, India, # 6 Exhibit F - Nokia Point & Find, May 17, 2010, # 7 Exhibit G - Unicorn Media Company, Executive Staff, # 8 Exhibit H - Unicorn Media Contact Information, # 9 Exhibit I - Declaration of Raymond F. Ratcliff, III, July 24, 2001, # 10 Exhibit J - U.S. Patent No. 7,392,287, # 11 Exhibit K - Revocation and Appointment of New Power of Attorney of Craig Yudell, February 19, 2009, # 12 Exhibit L - Power of Attorney Regarding Pillsbury Winthrop LLP, July 24, 2002, # 13 Exhibit M - Correspondence from Kelber to Assistant Commissioner for Patents, Regarding Revocation of Power of Attorney and New Power of Attorney Re Piper Rudnick LLP, April 21, 2004, # 14 Exhibit N - July 19, 2007 Amendment Re '287 Patent, # 15 Exhibit O - Northern District of California Judicial Caseload Profile, # 16 Exhibit P - Eastern District of Texas Judicial Caseload Profile, # 17 Exhibit Q - NovelPoint Learning LLC v. LeapFrog Enterprises, Inc., et al., Case No. 6:10-cv-229, (EDTX), Dkt. 67 Memorandum Opinion and Order, # 18 Exhibit R - Optimum Power Solutions LLC v. Apple Inc., et al., Case No. 6:10-cv-61 (EDTX), Dkt. 69 Defendant's Initial Disclosures, # 19 Exhibit S - Calypso Wireless, Inc. and Drago Daic v. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Case No. 2:08-cv-441 (EDTX), Dkt. 146, Order Denying Motion to Transfer)(Davis, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2011: # 20 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
April 22, 2011 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Aaron R. Hand by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hand, Aaron)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 62 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) Responses due by 4/25/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/11/2011. (ch, )
April 5, 2011 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 62 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a)Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2011., Discovery due by 5/3/2013., Expert Witness List due by 1/25/2013., Joinder of Parties due by 5/19/2011., Markman Hearing set for 8/22/2012 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Motions due by 11/1/2013., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2013., Jury Selection set for 12/2/2013 09:00AM before Judge T. John Ward., Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2013 09:00 AM before Judge T. John Ward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/24/11. (ehs, )
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DISCOVERY ORDER - granting 61 Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order filed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/24/11. (ehs, )
March 23, 2011 Filing 62 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Ricoh Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
March 23, 2011 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 Proposed Docket Control Order)(Davis, William)
March 22, 2011 Filing 60 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael Charles Smith (Smith, Michael)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed docket control and discovery orders. Deadline extended to March 23, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/17/11. (ehs, )
March 15, 2011 Filing 58 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shvodian, Daniel)
March 11, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc., of Withdrawal of Appearance of Aaron R. Hand (Shvodian, Daniel)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for the parties to submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the Court is extended by one (1) week, up to and including March 16, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/11/11. (ehs, )
March 9, 2011 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. Deadline extended to March 9, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on March 3, 2011. (jml)
March 2, 2011 Filing 53 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Ricoh Innovations, Inc., Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
February 16, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 2/16/11. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of todays date. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
February 16, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge T. John Ward and Judge Charles Everingham: Status Conference held on 2/16/11. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to Judge Everingham. Depending on their answer, they were then given Markman and jury selection dates for the appropriate court. The parties are to meet and confer regarding a scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of todays date. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (delat, )
February 15, 2011 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Augustine Phillips on behalf of A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc. (Phillips, Lawrence)
February 15, 2011 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (Smith, Michael)
January 21, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/16/2011 11:15 AM before Judge T. John Ward. (ehs, )
January 20, 2011 Filing 50 Status Conference set for 2/16/2011 11:15 AM before Judge T. John Ward and Honorable Chad Everingham. Parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery order to court by 3/2/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 1/20/2011. (ch, )
December 29, 2010 Filing 49 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Allison H Altersohn for Nokia, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-197) (ehs, )
December 29, 2010 Filing 48 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert F Perry for Nokia, Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-197) (ehs, )
December 9, 2010 Filing 47 RESPONSE to 34 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Davis, William)
December 9, 2010 Filing 46 RESPONSE to 37 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant A9.com, Inc. by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Davis, William)
December 9, 2010 Filing 45 RESPONSE to 30 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim [Plaintiff's First Amended Answer to Ricoh Innovations, Inc.'s Counterclaims] by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Davis, William)
December 9, 2010 Filing 44 RESPONSE to 28 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim [Plaintiff's First Amended Answer to Google Inc.'s Counterclaims] by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Davis, William)
December 6, 2010 Filing 43 RESPONSE to 30 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Ricoh Innovations, Inc. by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Davis, William)
December 6, 2010 Filing 42 RESPONSE to 28 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Google Inc. by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Davis, William)
November 30, 2010 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew R Clements on behalf of Ricoh Innovations, Inc. (Clements, Matthew)
November 30, 2010 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark D Rowland on behalf of Ricoh Innovations, Inc. (Rowland, Mark)
November 22, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron R Hand on behalf of A9.com, Inc. (Hand, Aaron)
November 22, 2010 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by A9.com, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for A9.com, Inc.. (Shvodian, Daniel)
November 22, 2010 Filing 37 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC by A9.com, Inc..(Shvodian, Daniel)
November 17, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron R Hand on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Hand, Aaron)
November 17, 2010 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Shvodian, Daniel)
November 17, 2010 Filing 34 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC by Amazon.com, Inc..(Shvodian, Daniel)
November 15, 2010 Filing 33 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James F Valentine for A9.com, Inc.,James F Valentine for Amazon.com, Inc.,James F Valentine for Google, Inc.,,James F Valentine for Google, Inc.,,James F Valentine for Google, Inc.,. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-115) (ehs, )
November 15, 2010 Filing 32 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel T Shvodian for A9.com, Inc.,Daniel T Shvodian for Amazon.com, Inc.,Daniel T Shvodian for Google, Inc.,,Daniel T Shvodian for Google, Inc.,,Daniel T Shvodian for Google, Inc.,. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-115 (ehs, )
November 12, 2010 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ricoh Innovations, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ricoh Company, LTD. for Ricoh Innovations, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
November 12, 2010 Filing 30 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC by Ricoh Innovations, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
November 12, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE from clerk - documet # 23 was filed in error, not # 25, please disregard notice of #25. (ch, )
November 12, 2010 Filing 28 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC by Google, Inc.,.(Smith, Michael)
November 12, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 23, Answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 11, 2010 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron R Hand on behalf of Google, Inc., (Hand, Aaron)
November 11, 2010 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nokia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nokia Corporation, Corporate Parent Nokia Holding, Inc. for Nokia, Inc.. (Smith, Michael)
November 11, 2010 Filing 25 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Nokia, Inc..(Smith, Michael)
November 11, 2010 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google, Inc., identifying Corporate Parent None for Google, Inc.,. (Smith, Michael)
November 11, 2010 Filing 23 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC by Google, Inc.,.(Smith, Michael) Modified on 11/12/2010 (ch, ).
October 15, 2010 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Ricoh Innovations, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
October 13, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ricoh Innovations, Inc. to 11/12/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 12, 2010 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ricoh Innovations, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
October 8, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com, Inc. to 11/17/2010; A9.com, Inc. to 11/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 8, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google, Inc., to 11/11/2010; Nokia, Inc. to 11/11/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 8, 2010 Filing 20 Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Davis, William)
October 8, 2010 Filing 19 Defendant A9.com, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Davis, William)
October 8, 2010 Filing 18 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nokia, Inc. (Smith, Michael)
October 8, 2010 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google, Inc. (Smith, Michael)
October 4, 2010 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. A9.com, Inc. served on 9/30/2010 through Registered Agent Corporation Services, answer due 10/21/2010. (ehs, )
September 30, 2010 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC as to A9.com, Inc.. Letter received from CT Corporation stating that the Corporation Trust Company is not the agent for an entity by the name of A9.com (ehs, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 14 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ralph P Albrecht for Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5671) (ehs, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. A9.com, Inc. served on 9/21/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent, The Corporation Trust Center, answer due 10/12/2010. (ehs, )
September 28, 2010 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. Amazon.com, Inc. served on 9/27/2010 shown on Proof of Service page through Registered Agent, Corporation Service Co. (no date on return green card) date calculated per date on proof of service page - answer due 10/18/2010 (ehs, )
September 27, 2010 Filing 11 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cameron H Tousi for Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5667) (ehs, )
September 27, 2010 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. Ricoh Innovations, Inc. served on 9/21/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Kerin Ridout, answer due 10/12/2010. (ehs, )
September 27, 2010 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. Nokia, Inc. served on 9/20/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent, National Registered Agents Inc, answer due 10/12/2010. (ehs, )
September 27, 2010 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. Google, Inc., served on 9/20/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Services Co, answer due 10/12/2010. (ehs, )
September 23, 2010 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to A9.com, Inc.. (ch, )
September 21, 2010 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David M Farnum for Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID 2-1-5655) (ehs, )
September 15, 2010 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to A9.com, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Amazon.com Inc, # 2 Google Inc, # 3 Nokia Inc, # 4 Ricoh Innovations Inc)(ch, )
September 15, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/15/2010. (ch, )
September 15, 2010 Case assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
September 14, 2010 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC (Davis, William)
September 14, 2010 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William)
September 14, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against A9.com, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Google, Inc.,, Nokia, Inc., Ricoh Innovations, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2668414.), filed by Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,392,287, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC v. A9.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wireless Recognition Technologies LLC
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A9.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricoh Innovations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?