Vertical Computer Systems, Inc. v. Interwoven, Inc. et al Featured Case

Vertical files a patent infringement suit over "generating web sites in an arbitrary object framework" against LG, Samsung, and other smartphone makers.

Plaintiff: Vertical Computer Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Interwoven, Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00490
Filed: November 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2012 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re 84 SEALED MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims filed by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Healey, David)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 84 SEALED MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims Responses due by 8/23/2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/20/2012. (ch, )
August 17, 2012 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Marie Devine on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc (Devine, Claire)
August 16, 2012 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 87 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, by LG Electronics Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
August 16, 2012 Filing 88 RESPONSE to Motion re 84 SEALED MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims filed by Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (Findlay, Eric)
August 10, 2012 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re 84 SEALED MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims filed by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Luiz Claudio Valdetaro (signed), # 2 Exhibit A - Google Information on LG Electronics, # 3 Exhibit B - Complaint (Vertical Computer Systems, Inc. v. Interwoven, Inc., et al; Civil Action No. 210-cv-490), # 4 Exhibit C - Samsung's Claim Charts, # 5 Exhibit D - LG's Claim Charts, # 6 Exhibit E - U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit - Brief of Petitioner - Vertical Computer Systems, Inc, # 7 Exhibit F - U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit - Petition on Writ of Mandamus Order, # 8 Exhibit G - U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California - Claims Construction Order, # 9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Seo Won Kwon, # 10 Exhibit I - LexisNexis Documents, # 11 Exhibit J - LexisNexis Documents, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 85 Motion for leave to file under seal defts Seal Document (motion) to Sever and Transfer Claims to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey or in the Alternative to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/1/12. (ehs, )
July 31, 2012 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document 84 SEALED MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
July 30, 2012 Filing 84 SEALED MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Affidavit Fishler Declation, # 8 Exhibit Fishler Decl - Ex A, # 9 Exhibit Fishler Decl - Ex B, # 10 Exhibit Fishler Decl - Ex C, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 82 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher B Hadley terminated as counsel for Defendants LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc. and LG Electronics, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/12/2012. (ch, )
July 10, 2012 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christopher B. Hadley by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
May 22, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 5/5/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Markman Hearing set for 9/4/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order MISC 12-1 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap for all further proceedings. Judge Michael H. Schneider & Magistrate Craven no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on March 16, 2012. (rml, )
March 16, 2012 Filing 81 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc re P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Healey, David)
March 15, 2012 Filing 80 NOTICE by Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER - Motion practice order as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/23/12. (ehs, )
February 22, 2012 Judge Michael H. Schneider added as presiding judge. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. (sm, )
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER that case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the docket of Honorable Michael Schneider. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/22/2012. (sm, )
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/22/2012. (sm, )
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4 Document Production. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/13/12. (mrm, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Serve P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4 Document Production by Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/10/2012. (ch, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 73 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher B Hadley for LG Electronics Inc,Christopher B Hadley for LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-860) (ehs, )
December 20, 2011 Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap re: misc order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (rvw, )
December 16, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Vertical Computer Systems Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (Davis, William)
December 16, 2011 Filing 71 NOTICE by Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD of Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
December 16, 2011 Filing 70 NOTICE by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Su, Kevin)
November 15, 2011 Filing 69 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Vertical Computer Systems Inc Pursuant to Local Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 (Davis, William)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2013., Discovery due by 1/31/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 9/18/2012., Markman Hearing set for 9/4/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom., Motions due by 4/16/2014., Pretrial Order due by 4/23/2014., Jury Selection set for 5/7/2014 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom., Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2011 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge David Folsom.), Motions terminated: 66 Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order filed by Vertical Computer Systems Inc.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/3/11. (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/3/11. (ehs, )
November 2, 2011 Filing 66 Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery Order and Docket Control Order by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Davis, William)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties shall submit proposed docket control order and discovery orders to the Court by November 2, 2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on October 28, 2011. (jml, )
October 21, 2011 Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time to File the parties' proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders until October 21, 2011. Vertical shall submit its Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions on November 14, 2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on October 18, 2011. (jml, )
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 60 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven Scott Cherensky terminated as counsel for Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/17/11. (ehs, )
October 14, 2011 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order and Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dossas, Vasilios)
October 13, 2011 Filing 60 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cherensky, Steven)
October 13, 2011 Filing 59 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin Su for LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc and LG Electronics Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-726)(ehs, )
October 13, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #57 Motion to withdraw submitted by Samsung Electronic America Inc. not in pdf searchable format and no certificate of conference was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
October 13, 2011 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Su on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc (Su, Kevin)
October 12, 2011 Filing 57 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cherensky, Steven) Modified on 10/13/2011 (sm, ).
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/2011. (ch, )
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - This case is now set for jury selection on May 7, 2014 and for a claim construction on September 4, 2013. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on October 14, 2011. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under local patent rules, the court deems October 31, 2011 to be the date of the initial case management conference. As a result, the Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on October 21, 2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/16/2011. (ch, )
August 17, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared B Bobrow on behalf of Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD (Bobrow, Jared)
August 17, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 53, Notice of Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 16, 2011 Filing 53 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared B Bobrow on behalf of Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD (Bobrow, Jared) Modified on 8/17/2011 (ch, ).
June 16, 2011 Filing 52 RESPONSE to 48 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc. by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. (Davis, William)
June 1, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Samsung Electronic America Inc to 5/27/2011; Samsung Electronics Co LTD to 5/27/2011. (ehs, )
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. to answer Plaintiffs Complaint is May 27, 2011.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/31/11. (ehs, )
May 27, 2011 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronic America Inc identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronic America Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
May 27, 2011 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics Co LTD identifying Corporate Parent None for Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (Findlay, Eric)
May 27, 2011 Filing 48 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Vertical Computer Systems Inc by Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Web Object Management Facility)(Findlay, Eric)
May 26, 2011 Filing 47 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 42 Answer to Complaint.. (Healey, David)
May 25, 2011 Filing 46 NOTICE by Vertical Computer Systems Inc Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Petition for Writ of Mandamus of Vertical Computer Systems, Inc., Misc. Docket No. 985 (U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit), # 2 Exhibit B - Order of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Misc. Docket No. 985, dated May 16, 2011)(Davis, William)
May 23, 2011 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to Order to sever Vertical claims against Interwoven. Transfer received on 5/18/11 and assigned case number 4:11cv02425. (ehs, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
May 20, 2011 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aamir A Kazi on behalf of LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc (Kazi, Aamir)
May 20, 2011 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc identifying Corporate Parent LG Corporation for LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc. (Healey, David)
May 20, 2011 Filing 42 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc.(Healey, David)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss. For the aforementioned reasons, the Court sua sponte severs Verticals case against Interwoven from Verticals case against Samsung and LG, and Interwovens Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California is GRANTED-IN-PART with respect to Defendant Interwoven and DENIED-IN-PART with respect to Defendants Samsung and LG. Samsungs Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California is GRANTED-IN-PART with respect to Defendant Interwoven and DENIED-IN-PART with respect to Defendants Samsung and LG. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/10/2011. (ch, )
May 2, 2011 Filing 40 NOTICE by Interwoven Inc Second Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Second Request for Judicial Notice)(Vakil, Bijal)
April 14, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for LG Electronics Inc to 5/20/2011; LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc to 5/20/2011. (ch, )
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc and LG Electronics INc deadline is extended to 5/20/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/13/2011. (ch, )
April 7, 2011 Filing 38 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re EOT to Respond to the Complaint)(Healey, David)
April 4, 2011 Filing 37 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Stay or Transfer filed by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. (Davis, William)
March 25, 2011 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Stay or Transfer filed by Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (Findlay, Eric)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven Kalogeras terminated as counsel for Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. andSamsung Electronics America, Inc.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/11. (ehs, )
March 15, 2011 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Dismiss Stay or Transfer Plaintiff's Opposition to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Stay or Transfer filed by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Luiz Claudio Valdetaro, # 2 Exhibit A Eastern District of Texas Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B Samsungs' NDCA Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, # 4 Exhibit C Email to Valdetaro Regarding Richardson, Texas Office Space, # 5 Exhibit D List of EDTX Cases Involving Samsung, # 6 Exhibit E Vertical's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Interwoven's California Declaratory Judgment Action, # 7 Exhibit F In Re: Alphicon, Federal Circuit Decision, # 8 Exhibit G In Re: Google Federal Circuit Decision, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
March 11, 2011 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Steven Kalogeras by Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Samsung Electronics America Inc and Samsung Electronics Co Ltd deadline is extended to 2/25/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/28/2011. (ch, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Stay or Transfer by Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Seo-won Kwon, # 2 Affidavit of Steven ONeill, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Steven ONeill, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Steven ONeill, # 5 Affidavit of Julian Moore, # 6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Julian Moore, # 7 Exhibit B to Declaration of Julian Moore, # 8 Exhibit C to Declaration of Julian Moore, # 9 Exhibit D to Declaration of Julian Moore, # 10 Exhibit E to Declaration of Julian Moore, # 11 Exhibit F to Declaration of Julian Moore, # 12 Exhibit G to Declaration of Julian Moore, # 13 Exhibit H to Declaration of Julian Moore, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
February 17, 2011 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
February 16, 2011 Filing 29 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Stay, or Transfer filed by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L, # 2 Exhibit M, # 3 Exhibit N)(Davis, William)
February 14, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for LG Electronics Inc to 4/12/2011; LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc to 4/12/2011. (ch, )
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of time to answer. Dft LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc and LG Electronics Inc deadline is extended to 4/12/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/14/2011. (ch, )
February 11, 2011 Filing 27 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Julian Moore for Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-302 (ch, )
February 9, 2011 Filing 26 Agreed MOTION Second Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
February 7, 2011 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Stay, or Transfer filed by Interwoven Inc. (Vakil, Bijal)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/7/2011. (ch, )
January 27, 2011 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Stay, or Transfer Plaintiff's Opposition to Interwoven, Inc.'s Motion to Stay, Dismiss or Transfer filed by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Luiz Claudia Valdetaro, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of William E. Davis, III, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
January 27, 2011 Filing 22 NOTICE by Interwoven Inc Request for Judicial Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice)(Vakil, Bijal)
January 27, 2011 Filing 21 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations in Their Opposition to Interwoven, Inc.'s Motion to Stay, Dismiss or Transfer by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
January 25, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Interwoven Inc (Bunt, Robert)
January 10, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Stay, or Transfer by Interwoven Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of Bijal V. Vakil ISO Interwoven's Motion to Stay, Dismiss or Transfer, # 2 Exhibit A to Vakil Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Vakil Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Vakil Decl., # 5 Exhibit D to Vakil Decl., # 6 Exhibit E to Vakil Decl., # 7 Exhibit F to Vakil Decl., # 8 Exhibit G to Vakil Decl., # 9 Exhibit H to Vakil Decl., # 10 Exhibit I to Vakil Decl., # 11 Exhibit J to Vakil Decl., # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Vakil, Bijal)
December 27, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Samsung Electronic America Inc to 2/22/2011; Samsung Electronics Co LTD to 2/22/2011. (ehs, )
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SamsungElectronics America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint is February 22, 2011.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/27/10. (ehs, )
December 22, 2010 Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. Samsung Electronic America Inc served on 11/23/2010 on Registered Agent CT Corporation, answer due 12/14/2010. (ehs, )
December 22, 2010 Filing 16 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven Kalogeras for Samsung Electronic America Inc,Steven Kalogeras for Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-189)(ehs, )
December 22, 2010 Filing 15 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Timothy E DeMasi for Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-189) (ehs, )
December 20, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Scott Cherensky on behalf of Samsung Electronic America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD (Cherensky, Steven)
December 20, 2010 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. Samsung Electronics Co LTD waiver sent on 11/24/2010, answer due 1/24/2011. (ehs, )
December 16, 2010 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Samsung Electronic America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
December 15, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for LG Electronics Inc to 2/11/2011; LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc to 2/11/2011. (ch, )
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. LG Electronic Mobilecomm USA Inc and LG Electronic Inc deadline is extended to 2/11/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/15/2010. (ch, )
December 14, 2010 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc served on 11/22/2010 on Jennifer Busalacchi designated by law to accept service of process, answer due 12/13/2010. (ehs, )
December 14, 2010 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vertical Computer Systems Inc. Interwoven Inc served on 11/22/2010 on Dona Niemeyer, authorized Agent to accept sedrvice for the deft, answer due 1/10/2011. (ehs, )
December 14, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Interwoven Inc to 1/10/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 13, 2010 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Interwoven Inc.( Vakil, Bijal)
December 13, 2010 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by LG Electronics Inc, LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re LG Defendants' Agreed Mtn for Ext of Time to Respond to the Complaint)(Healey, David)
November 30, 2010 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Vasilios D Dossas for Vertical Computer Systems Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-147 (ch, )
November 19, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Ellsworth Davis, III on behalf of Vertical Computer Systems Inc (Davis, William)
November 19, 2010 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Interwoven Inc, (Attachments: # 1 LG Electronics Inc, # 2 LG Electronics MobileComm USA Inc, # 3 Samsung Electronics America Inc, # 4 Samsung Electronics Co Ltd)(ch, )
November 16, 2010 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Pham, Lu)
November 16, 2010 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vertical Computer Systems, Inc. (Pham, Lu)
November 16, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
November 16, 2010 Case assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
November 15, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Interwoven, Inc., LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2761679.), filed by Vertical Computer Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A U.S. Patent No. 6,826,744, # 2 Exhibit B U.S. Patent No. 7,716,629, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pham, Lu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vertical Computer Systems, Inc. v. Interwoven, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vertical Computer Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Lu Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interwoven, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics MobileComm U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?