GeoTag Inc v. Aromatique Inc et al
Plaintiff: GeoTag Inc
Defendant: Adidas America Inc, Kohl's Illinois Inc, Victoria's Secret Stores Inc, Kohl's Department Stores Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Foot Locker Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Rolex Watch USA Inc, New Cingular Wireless Services Inc, BBY Solutions Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc, Geoffrey LLC, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Gamestop Corp, Old Navy LLC, VF Corporation doing business as 7 For All Mankind doing business as 7 Fam doing business as Seven Jeans doing business as Lucy Activewear Inc, Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC, Footlocker.com Inc, Gander Mountain Company, Sterling Jewelers Inc doing business as Jared The Galleria Of Jewelry doing business as Kay Jewelers, Lucy Activewear Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Hinkley Lighting Inc, Aromatique Inc, Target Corp, Michaels Stores Inc, Petsmart Inc, VF Outdoor Inc doing business as The North Face, The TJX Companies Inc doing business as TJ Maxx, Christian Dior Boutiques Inc, Best Buy Co Inc doing business as Best Buy, Avon Products Inc, Kay Jewelers Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes Inc doing business as Dior doing business as Dior.com doing business as Christian Dior, Old Navy (Apparel) LLC, Toys "R" Us Inc, BJI Inc doing business as Brown Jordan, Cartier Inc, Brookstone Company Inc, Cartier North America Inc, Academy LTD doing business as Academy Sports Outdoors doing business as Academy Sports and Ourdoors, Foot Locker Retail Inc, BestBuy.com LLC, ASICS America Corp, Cartier Enterprises Inc, CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc doing business as Craftmaster doing business as CMI, VF Jeanswear LP doing business as Wrangler, Brown Jordan International Inc doing business as Brown Jordan, AT&T Mobility II LLC, Richemont North America Inc doing business as Cartier, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC doing business as Dior doing business as Dior.com doing business as Christian Dior, Cartier International LLC, Oscar De La Renta LTD, AT&T Services Inc., Nordstrom Inc and Old Navy Inc
Counter Claimant: VF Corporation, Academy LTD, Richemont North America Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, Sterling Jewelers Inc, VF Jeanswear LP, Brown Jordan International Inc, Best Buy Co Inc, The TJX Companies Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC and CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc
Counter Defendant: iCIMS, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: David Keyzer
Case Number: 2:2010cv00570
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Dft Gander Mountain Company is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/18/2014. (ch, )
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal. Dft VF Corporation is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Dft Dollar Tree Management Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/14/2014. (ch, )
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Dft Academy Ltd is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2014. (ch, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. GameStop Corp is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2014. (ch, )
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Dft PetSmart Inc and PetSmart Store Support Group Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2014. (ch, )
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Dft Toys "R" Us and Geoffrey LLC are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2014. (ch, )
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER dismissing #635 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss. VF Outdoor Inc and Michaels Stores Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/31/2014. (nkl, )
January 29, 2014 Filing 635 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice of Multiple Deefendants by GeoTag Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, VF Outdoor Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 634 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion of Dismissal. Dft ASICS America Corporation is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/13/2014. (ch, )
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Dft Seven For All Mankind LLC is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/9/2014. (ch, )
January 9, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, TO BE FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE. Document # 632, Agreed Motion to dismiss is now Terminated. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
January 8, 2014 Filing 632 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Seven For All Mankind, LLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reese, Joel) Modified on 1/9/2014 (sm, ).
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Dft VF Jeanswear LP is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/8/2014. (ch, )
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER, granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice. Christian Dior Perfumes LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/31/13. (mrm, )
December 30, 2013 Filing 629 NOTICE of Change of Address by Willem G Schuurman (Schuurman, Willem)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER granting Stipulation Motion for Dismissal. Dft Brookstone Company Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/12/2013. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Dfts Old Navy (Apparel) LLC; Old Navy Inc.; Old Navy LLC; Banana Republic (Apparel), LLC; Banana Republic (ITM) Inc.; Banana Republic LLC; Gap (Apparel) LLC; and Gap Inc. are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/22/2013. (ch, )
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER granting Agreed Motion for Dismissal. Nordstrom dismissed with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/21/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Dft Richemont North America Inc and Van Cleef & Arpels Ins is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2013. (ch, )
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Dft Sterling Jewelers Inc and Kay Jewelers Inc is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2013. (ch, )
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Dft The TJX Companies Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/2013. (ch, )
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Kohls Corporation, Kohls Department Stores, Inc., and Kohls Illinois, Inc. Dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER granting Agreed Motion for Dismissal. Dft Target Corp. is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER granting Stipulation Motion of Dismissal. Dft BestBuy.com, LLC is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal. Dft Esprit US Retail Limited is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/21/2013. (ch, )
October 18, 2013 Filing 618 NOTICE by Rolex Watch USA Inc Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Hardin, Roy)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER ON JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS ROLEX WATCH U.S.A., INC., Rolex Watch USA Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/15/13. (mrm, )
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Dft Aromatique Inc is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/30/2013. (ch, )
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER granting Motion to Stay Deadlines between Plaintiff and Dft. Aromatique Inc until 10/13/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/13/2013. (ch, )
September 16, 2013 Filing 614 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings for Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc. and Defendant BestBuy.com, LLC by BestBuy.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Stay Proceedings)(McMahon, Emmett) Modified on 9/16/2013 (sm, ).
September 16, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, MOTION TO BE FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE. Document # 614, Agreed Motion to Stay is now TERMINATED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. Dft Craftmaster Manufacturing Inc is hereby Dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/12/2013. (ch, )
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER denying #547 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/28/2013. (ch, )
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER denying #578 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/2/2013. (ch, )
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER granting #608 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian K Buss and Danny Lloyd Williams, and David Wooten terminated as counsel for BestBuy.com LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/18/2013. (ch, )
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER granting #607 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew M Stern; Robert R Baron, Jr and Charley F Brown terminated as counsel for Dollar Tree Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/8/13. (ehs, )
June 17, 2013 Filing 608 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney FOR BESTBUY.COM, LLC by BestBuy.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
June 14, 2013 Filing 607 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dollar Tree Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baron, Robert)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 606 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/11/2013. (ch, )
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER granting #604 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charlene M. Morrow, Patrick Premo, Hector Ribera, Kathleen Lu, and Brian Lahti are hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for BestBuy.com. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/3/13. (ehs, )
May 31, 2013 Filing 604 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion for Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant and Counterclaimant BestBuy.com, LLC by BestBuy.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Premo, Patrick)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER - granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal. All claims against the following parties directed solely to the use, manufacture, purchase, or provision of any SuccessFactors product or service, namely SuccessFactors job locator product and services, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. BestBuy.com, LLCJos. A. Bank Clothiers Inc. Life Time Fitness Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/24/2013. (ch, )
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER granting Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Brown Jordan International, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/24/2013. (ch, )
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER denying #539 Motion to Enter Proposed Case Management Schedule; denying #593 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/11/2013. (ch, )
March 8, 2013 Filing 599 NOTICE by Target Corp Re: Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Carter, Richard)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER to withdraw Jane J Du as attorney of record. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/13. (ehs, )
February 27, 2013 Filing 598 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Du, Jane)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER; The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:10-cv-265. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/4/13. (mrm, )
February 4, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing set for 2/12/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
February 1, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Status conference held on 2/1/2013. Counsel for the parties appeared and were given dates for the Markman Hearing, Pretrial Conference and Jury Selection. The parties were directed to meet and confer and submit by 2/12/2013 a Docket Control Order, Discovery Order and Protective Order in conformance with this Courts models and the Court's directives from the Bench. The Protective Order will incorporate the substantive determinations from Judge Schneider's recent opinion and order. The parties were further instructed to meet and confer and submit by 2/12/2013 a joint notice identifying consolidated groups of cases for mediation purposes also reciting either an agreed upon mediator by name and address or indicating a lack of agreement on a mediator. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER granting #595 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Devan V Padmanabhan and Paul J Robbennolt terminated as counsel for BestBuy.com LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/30/2013. (ch, )
January 29, 2013 Filing 595 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by BestBuy.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ribera, Hector)
January 25, 2013 Filing 594 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc (Joint Notice of Proposals for Case Management) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bennett, David)
January 18, 2013 Filing 593 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
January 18, 2013 Filing 592 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in Northern District of Texas as case 3:13-cv-00169, filed 01/16/2013, AT&T Services Inc.,and AT&T Mobility LLC severed and transferred (mrm, )
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ORDER; Status Conference set for 2/1/2013 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The Court enters this Order sua sponte. It is hereby ORDERED that Appendix E to General Order 13-3 does not apply to the above-styled cases. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/15/2013(mrm, )
January 15, 2013 Filing 590 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew M Stern on behalf of Dollar Tree Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3954594. (Stern, Andrew)
January 15, 2013 Filing 589 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Charley F Brown on behalf of Dollar Tree Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3954577. (Brown, Charley)
January 15, 2013 Filing 588 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert R Baron, Jr on behalf of Dollar Tree Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3953792. (Baron, Robert)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 587 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Rodney Gilstrap per General Order 13-3. For proposed scheduling order see Appendix E to General Order 13-3. Judge Michael H. Schneider no longer assigned to the case. (tlh, )
January 14, 2013 Filing 586 GeoTag's Response to the Letter Brief on Indefiniteness filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bennett, David)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 585 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #444 MOTION to Sever and Transfer to the Northern District of Texas filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc. AT&T Services Inc.,and AT&T Mobility LLC severed and transferred. The 20-day waiting period established in Local Rule CV-83(b) is waived. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/14/13. (mrm, )
January 8, 2013 Filing 584 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #578 Unopposed MOTION to Stay the Case Against Defendants Indemnified by Microsoft Corporation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Corrected Certificate of Conference)(Bennett, David)
January 8, 2013 Filing 583 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #578 Unopposed MOTION to Stay the Case Against Defendants Indemnified by Microsoft Corporation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Corrected Certificate of Conference)(Bennett, David) Modified on 1/8/2013 (sm, ).
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #525 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part #526 Motion for Protective Order. Furthermore, the parties are ORDERED to submit to the Court a revised proposed protective order incorporating all of the rulings discussed above. The proposed order is due within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/7/13. (mrm, )
January 8, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE. Document # 583, Additional attachment to main document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER FOR RESPONSE; Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to respond to Defendants letter brief by Monday, January 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/7/13. (mrm, )
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER granting #561 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patrick Doll terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/7/13. (mrm, )
January 4, 2013 Filing 579 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc of Filing of Joint Claim Construction Chart in Compliance iwth P.R. 4-5(d) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bennett, David)
January 2, 2013 Filing 578 Unopposed MOTION to Stay the Case Against Defendants Indemnified by Microsoft Corporation by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
December 31, 2012 Filing 577 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #554 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by GeoTag Inc. (Bennett, David)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER granting #570 Motion to file under seal. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/21/12. (bas, )
December 21, 2012 Filing 575 REPLY TO RESPONSE in Support re #554 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Kay Jewelers Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bittner, Michael) Modified on 12/21/2012 (sm, ).
December 20, 2012 Filing 574 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wasif H Qureshi on behalf of ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc (Qureshi, Wasif)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER granting #567 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/19/12. (mrm, )
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER granting #558 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for their Responsive Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/19/12. (mrm, )
December 18, 2012 Filing 571 SEALED Letter Brief filed by BestBuy.com LLC, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Target Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Buss, Brian)
December 18, 2012 Filing 570 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by BestBuy.com LLC, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Target Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buss, Brian)
December 18, 2012 Filing 569 REPLY to #564 Claim Construction Brief,,, filed by GeoTag Inc. (Bennett, David)
December 17, 2012 Filing 568 REPLY to Response to Motion re #547 MOTION to Strike (MOTION TO STRIKE INSUFFICIENT CONTENTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, COMPEL MEANINGFUL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS) MOTION to Strike (MOTION TO STRIKE INSUFFICIENT CONTENTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, COMPEL MEANINGFUL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS) (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE INSUFFICIENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, COMPEL MEANINGFUL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS) filed by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Bittner, Michael)
December 17, 2012 Filing 567 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT) by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
December 13, 2012 Filing 566 RESPONSE to Motion re #554 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Bennett Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
December 12, 2012 Filing 565 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deirdre Marie Dorval on behalf of Christian Dior Perfumes LLC (Dorval, Deirdre)
December 11, 2012 Filing 564 RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD)(Bittner, Michael) Modified on 12/11/2012 (sm, ).
December 10, 2012 Filing 563 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Granaghan on behalf of Christian Dior Perfumes LLC (Granaghan, Christopher)
December 7, 2012 Filing 562 REPLY to Response to Motion re #558 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (DEFENDANTS' EXPEDITED OPPOSED MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS)Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (DEFENDANTS' EXPEDITED OPPOSED MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS) filed by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Bittner, Michael)
December 7, 2012 Filing 561 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Patrick Doll by Christian Dior Perfumes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schuurman, Willem)
December 7, 2012 Filing 560 RESPONSE to Motion re #558 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (DEFENDANTS' EXPEDITED OPPOSED MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS)Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (DEFENDANTS' EXPEDITED OPPOSED MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS) filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2012: #2 CORRECTED ORDER) (ch, ).
December 6, 2012 Filing 559 RESPONSE to Motion re #547 MOTION to Strike (MOTION TO STRIKE INSUFFICIENT CONTENTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, COMPEL MEANINGFUL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS) MOTION to Strike (MOTION TO STRIKE INSUFFICIENT CONTENTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, COMPEL MEANINGFUL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS) filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
December 6, 2012 Filing 558 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (DEFENDANTS' EXPEDITED OPPOSED MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS) by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
November 30, 2012 Filing 557 REPLY to Response to Motion re #539 Opposed MOTION to Enter GeoTags Proposed Case Management Schedule, Postpone The Pretrial Conference and Trial Setting Date Four Months, and Create a Single Case Number For Consolidated Filings filed by GeoTag Inc. (Bennett, David)
November 28, 2012 Filing 556 RESPONSE in Opposition re #358 MOTION for Entry of Case Management Plan and Docket Control Order, #539 Opposed MOTION to Enter GeoTags Proposed Case Management Schedule, Postpone The Pretrial Conference and Trial Setting Date Four Months, and Create a Single Case Number For Consolidated Filings (DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENTER PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULED, POSTPONE THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING DATE FOR FOUR MONTHS, AND CREATE A SINGLE CASE NUMBER FOR CONSOLIDATED FILINGS) filed by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
November 28, 2012 Filing 555 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Bennett Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Bennett, David)
November 27, 2012 Filing 554 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Academy LTD, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Target Corp, VF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2B(i), #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2B(ii), #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2B(iii), #7 Exhibit Exhibit 2B(iv), #8 Exhibit Exhibit 2C, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 2D, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 2E, #11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wine, Jodi)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER granting #552 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #539 Opposed MOTION to Enter GeoTags Proposed Case Management Schedule, Postpone The Pretrial Conference and Trial Setting Date Four Months, and Create a Single Case Number For Consolidated Filings. Responses due by 11/28/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/27/12. (mrm, )
November 26, 2012 Filing 552 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND RESPONSE DEADLINE) by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Kay Jewelers Inc, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
November 21, 2012 Filing 551 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jane J Du on behalf of Seven For All Mandkind LLC (Du, Jane)
November 21, 2012 Filing 550 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of Seven For All Mandkind LLC (Bittner, Michael)
November 21, 2012 Filing 549 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Seven For All Mandkind LLC (McNabnay, Neil)
November 20, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY - MISSING ATTACHMENTS Document # 548, Motion to Strike. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 19, 2012 Filing 548 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Strike INSUFFICIENT INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, COMPEL MEANINGFUL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS THAT COMPLY WITH P.R. 3-1 by BestBuy.com LLC, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Target Corp. Responses due by 12/6/2012 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buss, Brian) Modified on 11/20/2012 (ch, ).
November 19, 2012 Filing 547 MOTION to Strike (MOTION TO STRIKE INSUFFICIENT CONTENTIONS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, COMPEL MEANINGFUL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS) by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
November 16, 2012 Filing 546 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc identifying Corporate Parent JELD-WEN, Inc. for CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc. (Heartfield, J)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSALS, granting #543 (Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice Defendant iCIMS, Inc. and Certain Claims Against Defendants Who Are Customers of iCIMS, Inc.) filed by GeoTag Inc. iCIMS, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/13/12. (mrm, )
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER, granting #541 (Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of Avon Products, Inc.) filed by GeoTag Inc. Avon Products Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/13/12. (mrm, )
November 12, 2012 Filing 543 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice Defendant iCIMS, Inc. and Certain Claims Against Defendants Who Are Customers of iCIMS, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR, David Keyzer added.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/9/2012. (sm, )
November 9, 2012 Filing 541 MOTION to Dismiss (Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice of Avon Products, Inc.) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
November 7, 2012 Filing 540 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Spangler, Andrew)
November 6, 2012 Filing 539 Opposed MOTION to Enter GeoTags Proposed Case Management Schedule, Postpone The Pretrial Conference and Trial Setting Date Four Months, and Create a Single Case Number For Consolidated Filings by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
November 6, 2012 Filing 538 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to David R Bennett on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Bennett, David)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER granting #536 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Keith Bryan Smiley and Charles Tadlock for GeoTag Inc. Attorney Timothy Tiewei Wang; Mark John Zimmermann; Stevenson Moore, V and Andrew W. Spangler terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/5/12. (mrm, )
November 1, 2012 Filing 536 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER REGARDING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/22/12. (mrm, )
October 17, 2012 Filing 534 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell J Genet on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (Genet, Russell)
October 17, 2012 Filing 533 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C Kravitz on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (Kravitz, Jason)
October 17, 2012 Filing 532 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jodi Rosen Wine on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (Wine, Jodi)
October 11, 2012 Filing 531 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Spangler, Andrew)
October 11, 2012 Filing 530 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc of Compliance Regarding Technology Tutorial (Spangler, Andrew)
October 5, 2012 Filing 529 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-2 Disclosure (Spangler, Andrew)
October 2, 2012 Filing 528 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell J Genet on behalf of Academy LTD, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Target Corp, VF Corporation (Genet, Russell)
September 28, 2012 Filing 527 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc Compliance Regarding Privilege Logs and P.R. 4-1 Disclosure (Bennett, David)
September 27, 2012 Filing 526 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order (Amended) by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, David)
September 27, 2012 Filing 525 MOTION for Protective Order by ASICS America Corp, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Academy LTD, Aromatique Inc, Avon Products Inc, BestBuy.com LLC, Brookstone Company Inc, Brown Jordan International Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Gamestop Corp, Gander Mountain Company, Geoffrey LLC, Kay Jewelers Inc, Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Rolex Watch USA Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Target Corp, The TJX Companies Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Defendants' Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B - Google-MicroSoft Agreed Protective Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schuurman, Willem)
September 27, 2012 Filing 524 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C Kravitz on behalf of Old Navy LLC, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, VF Corporation (Kravitz, Jason)
September 27, 2012 Filing 523 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jodi Rosen Wine on behalf of Old Navy LLC, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, VF Corporation (Wine, Jodi)
September 25, 2012 Filing 522 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Martin Pasquinelli on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pasquinelli, Kevin)
September 24, 2012 Filing 521 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel S Mount on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mount, Daniel)
September 24, 2012 Filing 520 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R Bennett on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Bennett, David)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER; granting #518 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing #510 Motion for Extension of Time to Secure New Counsel. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/20/12. (mrm, )
September 14, 2012 Filing 518 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #510 MOTION for Extension of Time to File "Motion for Extension of Time to Secure New Counsel" by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
September 14, 2012 Filing 517 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Kent Wooten on behalf of BestBuy.com LLC, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Target Corp (Wooten, David)
September 13, 2012 Filing 516 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Tiewei Wang on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Wang, Timothy)
September 13, 2012 Filing 515 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stevenson Moore, V on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Moore, Stevenson)
September 13, 2012 Filing 514 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark John Zimmermann on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Zimmermann, Mark)
September 13, 2012 Filing 513 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc Regarding Retention of Counsel (Ni, Hao)
September 13, 2012 Filing 512 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hao Ni on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Ni, Hao)
September 11, 2012 Filing 511 RESPONSE in Opposition re #510 MOTION for Extension of Time to File "Motion for Extension of Time to Secure New Counsel" filed by ASICS America Corp, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Academy LTD, Aromatique Inc, Avon Products Inc, BestBuy.com LLC, Brookstone Company Inc, Brown Jordan International Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Gamestop Corp, Gander Mountain Company, Geoffrey LLC, Kay Jewelers Inc, Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Rolex Watch USA Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Target Corp, The TJX Companies Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Schuurman, Willem)
September 10, 2012 Filing 510 MOTION for Extension of Time to File "Motion for Extension of Time to Secure New Counsel" by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John W. Veenstra, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
September 10, 2012 Filing 509 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Spangler on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Spangler, Andrew)
August 31, 2012 Filing 508 ANSWER to #479 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
August 31, 2012 Filing 507 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc re #505 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Counsel's Notice of Compliance (Moore, Stevenson)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 506 FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Parties shall have up to and including September 27, 2012 to submit an Amended Protective Order., GRANTING #502 Unopposed MOTION Extension of Time re #464 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #465 Scheduling Order, Set Hearings,, filed by GeoTag Inc. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/30/12. (mrm, )
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER denying #503 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Within 14 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a notice with the Court stating whether it has secured new counsel or whether it will be dismissing this litigation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/30/12. (bas)
August 29, 2012 Filing 503 Opposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ni Law Firm, PLLC by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
August 29, 2012 NOTICE: The parties are hereby advised that the following cases were severed out of related case 2:11-cv-404 and will continue to be controlled by the existing Scheduling and Discovery Order: [2:12cv520 through 2:12cv557]. (mrm, )
August 28, 2012 Filing 502 Unopposed MOTION Extension of Time re #464 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #465 Scheduling Order, Set Hearings,, by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER denying #363 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/27/12. (mrm, )
August 20, 2012 Filing 500 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Target Corp - Initial Disclosures (Montgomery, M.)
August 20, 2012 Filing 499 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Old Navy LLC - Initial Disclosures (Montgomery, M.)
August 20, 2012 Filing 498 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Nordstrom Inc - Initial Disclosures (Montgomery, M.)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 497 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER granting #467 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for Defendants to serve Initial Disclosures and comply with Local Patent Rule 3-4(a) in the above-captioned actions is hereby extended up to and including September 7, 2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/20/12. (mrm, )
August 20, 2012 Filing 496 NOTICE by Avon Products Inc of Compliance with Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures (McSwane, Douglas)
August 20, 2012 Filing 495 NOTICE by Aromatique Inc ; New Albertsons, Inc., AS America, Inc.; Bob Evans Farms, Inc.; Bob Evans Restaurants of Michigan, LLC; CEC Entertainment, Inc.; CEC Entertainment Concepts, L.P.; Esprit US Retailer Limited; Heeling Sports, Ltd.; Hugo Boss Fashions, Inc.; Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc.; Piggly Wiggly, LLC; Quest Diagnostics, Inc. (DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER) (McCormack, Brian)
August 20, 2012 Filing 494 NOTICE by Gander Mountain Company re #465 Scheduling Order, Set Hearings,, Initial Disclosures (Braunel, Matthew)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER granting #473 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Hinkley Lighting Inc, GeoTag Inc. Hinkley Lighting Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/17/12. (mrm, )
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 492 ORDER granting #468 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Meredith J Fitzpatrick terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/17/12. (mrm, )
August 17, 2012 Filing 491 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Christian Dior Perfumes LLC [Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures] (Schuurman, Willem)
August 17, 2012 Filing 490 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc (Initial CV-26) (Vincent, Lance)
August 17, 2012 Filing 489 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BestBuy.com LLC (Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosures) (Buss, Brian)
August 17, 2012 Filing 488 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Michaels Stores Inc, VF Outdoor Inc Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Schwartz, Daniel)
August 17, 2012 Filing 487 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (Ni, Hao)
August 17, 2012 Filing 486 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Brown Jordan International Inc regarding Compliance with Initial Disclosures and PR 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Gardner, Allen)
August 17, 2012 Filing 485 NOTICE by Gamestop Corp, Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc, The TJX Companies Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (Jivani, Kamran)
August 17, 2012 Filing 484 NOTICE by Gamestop Corp, Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc, The TJX Companies Inc of Service Compliance with P.R. 3-4 (Jivani, Kamran)
August 17, 2012 Filing 483 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Academy LTD (Initial Disclosures CV-26) (Drake, Kirby)
August 17, 2012 Filing 482 NOTICE by Seven For All Mandkind LLC of Compliance with Scheduling and Discovery Order (Schonberg, Michael)
August 17, 2012 Filing 481 NOTICE by VF Jeanswear LP of Compliance with Scheduling and Discovery Order (Schonberg, Michael)
August 17, 2012 Filing 480 NOTICE by VF Corporation of Compliance with Scheduling and Discovery Order (Schonberg, Michael)
August 17, 2012 Filing 479 AT&T's First Amended ANSWER to Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint against GeoTag Inc by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc..(Durst, Timothy)
August 17, 2012 Filing 478 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (Initial Disclosures CV-26) (Durst, Timothy)
August 17, 2012 Filing 477 NOTICE by ASICS America Corp, AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Academy LTD, Aromatique Inc, Avon Products Inc, BestBuy.com LLC, Brookstone Company Inc, Brown Jordan International Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Gamestop Corp, Gander Mountain Company, Geoffrey LLC, Hinkley Lighting Inc, Kay Jewelers Inc, Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy Inc, Old Navy LLC, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Rolex Watch USA Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Target Corp, The TJX Companies Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc re #465 Scheduling Order, Set Hearings,, of Compliance with Scheduling and Discovery Order (Schuurman, Willem)
August 16, 2012 Filing 504 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew A Werber for Michaels Stores Inc., and for VF Outdoor Inc. (pkb, )
August 16, 2012 Filing 476 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #444 MOTION to Sever and Transfer to the Northern District of Texas PLAINTIFF GEOTAG, INC.S SURREPLY IN OPPOSITION TO AT&TS MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by GeoTag Inc. (Moore, Stevenson)
August 16, 2012 Filing 475 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Academy LTD, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Target Corp, VF Corporation (Montgomery, M.)
August 16, 2012 Filing 474 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Academy LTD, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Target Corp, VF Corporation (Heartfield, J)
August 16, 2012 Filing 473 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Hinkley Lighting Inc. by GeoTag Inc, Hinkley Lighting Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
August 16, 2012 Filing 472 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jodi Rosen Wine for Academy LTD,Nordstrom Inc and Target Corp. (pkb, )
August 16, 2012 Filing 471 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jason C Kravitz for Academy LTD,Nordstrom Inc and Target Corp. (pkb, )
August 16, 2012 Filing 470 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Doll on behalf of Christian Dior Perfumes LLC (Doll, Patrick)
August 16, 2012 Filing 469 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Daniel Shead on behalf of Christian Dior Perfumes LLC (Shead, James)
August 16, 2012 Filing 468 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Meredith J. Fitzpatrick by Christian Dior Perfumes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schuurman, Willem)
August 16, 2012 Filing 467 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (DEFENDANTS RICHEMONT NORTH AMERICA, INC., VAN CLEEF & ARPELS, INC. UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES) by Richemont North America Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
August 14, 2012 NOTICE: The parties are hereby advised that the following cases were severed out of related case 2:11-cv-405 and will continue to be controlled by the existing Scheduling and Discovery Order: 2:12cv436 through 2:12cv488. (mrm, )
August 6, 2012 Filing 466 REPLY to Response to Motion re #444 MOTION to Sever and Transfer to the Northern District of Texas filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc.. (Durst, Timothy)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 465 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER:( Amended Pleadings due by 8/17/2012., Joinder of Parties due by 8/17/2012., Mediation Completion due by 5/2/2013., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/6/2013.), (Markman Hearing set for 1/24/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Tyler) before Judge Michael H. Schneider.) Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Tyler) before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/2/12. (mrm, )
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER granting #463 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Protective Order. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/2/12. (mrm, )
August 1, 2012 Filing 463 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Submission of Amended Protective Order by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER CANCELLING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/30/12. (mrm, )
July 27, 2012 Filing 461 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc Parties Joint Notice of Attendees at Scheduling Conference on August 2, 2012 (Moore, Stevenson)
July 27, 2012 Filing 460 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Alan Noteware, Jr on behalf of Brown Jordan International Inc (Noteware, Daniel)
July 26, 2012 Filing 459 RESPONSE in Opposition re #444 MOTION to Sever and Transfer to the Northern District of Texas filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Veenstra Declaration, #2 Affidavit Moore Declaration)(Ni, Hao)
July 23, 2012 Filing 458 NOTICE by iCIMS, Inc. of Intention to Appear at Scheduling Conference (Anderson, David)
July 17, 2012 Filing 457 ANSWER to #446 Intervenor Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against iCIMS, Inc. by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER granting #455 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #444 MOTION to Sever and Transfer to the Northern District of Texas Responses due by 7/26/2012. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/10/2012. (sm, )
July 9, 2012 Filing 455 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #444 MOTION to Sever and Transfer to the Northern District of Texas by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
July 5, 2012 Filing 454 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meredith J Fitzpatrick on behalf of Christian Dior Perfumes LLC (Fitzpatrick, Meredith)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER RESETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Conference reset for 8/2/2012 10:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Tyler) before Judge Michael H. Schneider.) Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/29/12. (mrm, )
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; granting #449 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by GeoTag Inc, Oscar De La Renta LTD terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/29/12. (mrm, )
June 28, 2012 Filing 451 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc re #432 Order, Set Hearings GeoTag, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance (Moore, Stevenson)
June 27, 2012 Filing 450 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Moore, Stevenson)
June 27, 2012 Filing 449 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
June 27, 2012 Filing 448 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Matthew Rowan on behalf of Avon Products Inc (Rowan, James)
June 26, 2012 Filing 446 Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by iCIMS, Inc..(Anderson, David)
June 25, 2012 Filing 447 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney, Avani C Macaluso for CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc. $100 Pro Hac Vice fee paid, Receipt No. 2-1168. (dlc, )
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER granting #443 Motion to Intervene and ICIMS shall have ten days from date or order to file its complaint in intervention. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/22/2012. (sm, )
June 21, 2012 Filing 444 MOTION to Sever and Transfer to the Northern District of Texas by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paula Phillips, #2 Affidavit of Bethany Rumford, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Durst, Timothy)
June 21, 2012 Filing 443 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by iCIMS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, David)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER denying in part #441 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for filing venue transfer motions is extended to 6/21/12. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/20/12. (bas)
June 20, 2012 Filing 441 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION TO TRANSFER) by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
June 5, 2012 Filing 440 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul J Robbennolt for BestBuy.com LLC.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1137) (bsw, )
June 5, 2012 Filing 439 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Devan V Padmanabhan for BestBuy.com LLC (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1137) (bsw, )
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER granting #437 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Aaron Benefield terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on May 4, 2012. (rml, )
May 3, 2012 Filing 437 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael A. Benefield by BestBuy.com LLC, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Target Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benefield, Michael)
April 27, 2012 Filing 436 NOTICE by Aromatique Inc CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (McCormack, Brian)
April 27, 2012 Filing 435 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gander Mountain Company (Braunel, Matthew)
April 23, 2012 Filing 434 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley N Pate on behalf of Avon Products Inc (Pate, Ashley)
April 17, 2012 Filing 433 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc Notice of Related Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moore, Stevenson)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER TO MEET, REPORT, AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2012 10:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Tyler) before Judge Michael H. Schneider.) Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/11/12. (mrm, )
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/11/2012. (bas)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 430 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/11/12. (mrm, )
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER granting #428 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Srinivas Giriraj Pathmanaban terminated as Counsel for Christian Dior Perfumes, LLC. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/11/2012. (ch, )
April 10, 2012 Filing 428 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Srinivas Giriraj Pathmanaban and Termination of Electronic Notices by Christian Dior Perfumes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Avelyn)
April 10, 2012 Filing 427 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ajeet P Pai on behalf of Christian Dior Perfumes LLC (Pai, Ajeet)
April 3, 2012 Filing 426 RESPONSE to #425 Notice (Other) GeoTag, Inc.'s Response to Movants Notice of Additional Authority by GeoTag Inc. (Moore, Stevenson)
March 28, 2012 Filing 425 NOTICE by ASICS America Corp, Dollar Tree Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc re #363 MOTION to Stay of Additional Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McNabnay, Neil)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting #418 Motion for Extension of Time to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/26/2012. (sm, )
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER - the undersigned hereby VACATES the referral of this case to Judge Craven for pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/23/2012. (ch, )
March 21, 2012 Filing 422 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #363 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc.'s Sur-Reply in Opposition to Moving Defendants' Renewed Motion to Stay filed by GeoTag Inc. filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Moore, Stevenson)
March 21, 2012 Filing 421 NOTICE by Michaels Stores Inc re #363 MOTION to Stay JOINDER IN (Schwartz, Daniel)
March 19, 2012 Filing 420 ANSWER to #398 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of PetSmart, Inc. and PetSmart Store Support by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 19, 2012 Filing 419 ANSWER to #397 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Toys "R" Us & Geoffrey, LLC by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 16, 2012 Filing 418 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Moving Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Filing 417 ANSWER to #387 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of BestBuy.com, LLC by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Filing 416 ANSWER to #384 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Gander Mountain Company by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Filing 415 ANSWER to #389 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Target Corporation by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Filing 414 ANSWER to #391 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Avon Products, Inc. by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Filing 413 ANSWER to #388 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Old Navy, LLC by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Filing 412 ANSWER to #392 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of AT&T Mobility LLC & AT&T Services, Inc. by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Filing 411 ANSWER to #395 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Christian Dior Perfumes, LLC by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Filing 410 ANSWER to #394 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Nordstrom, Inc. by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Filing 409 ANSWER to #373 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Academy, Ltd. by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Filing 408 ANSWER to #374 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Brown Jordan International, Inc. by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Filing 407 ANSWER to #371 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of GameStop Corp. by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Filing 406 ANSWER to #372 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of The TJX Companies by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER granting #403 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/12/2012. (sm, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 404 REPLY to Response to Motion re #363 MOTION to Stay filed by ASICS America Corp, Aromatique Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McNabnay, Neil)
March 9, 2012 Filing 403 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Movants' Reply to GeoTag's Response in Opposition to the Motion to Stay by ASICS America Corp, Aromatique Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting #401 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/8/2012. (ch, )
March 8, 2012 NOTICE - EXHIBITS TO CORRECTED RESPONSE # 400, WERE PREVIOUSLY FILED WITH # 378) (ch, )
March 7, 2012 Filing 401 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc.'s Unopposed Motionf or Leave to Exceed Page Limit by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
March 7, 2012 Filing 400 RESPONSE to Motion re #363 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc.'s "Corrected" Response to Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay filed by GeoTag Inc. (Moore, Stevenson) (EXHIBITS WERE PREVIOUSLY FILED WITH # 378) Modified on 3/8/2012 (ch, ).
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER granting #396 Motion for Extension of Time to File deadline for MovantsReply to GeoTags Response to Moving Defendants Motion to Stay in the above-captionedactions is hereby extended up to and including March 9, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on March 5, 2012. (rml, )
March 5, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
March 2, 2012 Filing 398 ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Petsmart Inc.(Vincent, Lance)
March 2, 2012 Filing 397 ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Toys "R" Us Inc, Geoffrey LLC.(Vincent, Lance)
March 2, 2012 Filing 396 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (MOVANT'S UNOPOSSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE) by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Hinkley Lighting Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
February 24, 2012 Filing 395 CHRISTIAN DIOR PERFUMES, LLCS AMENDED ANSWER, DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF GEOTAG, INC.S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Christian Dior Perfumes LLC.(Ross, Avelyn)
February 24, 2012 Filing 394 ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM (S) against GeoTag Inc by Nordstrom Inc.(Williams, Danny)
February 24, 2012 Filing 393 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Services Inc.. (Kennedy, Susan)
February 24, 2012 Filing 392 ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc(a Texas Corporation ) by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc..(Kennedy, Susan)
February 24, 2012 Filing 391 Avon Products, Inc.'s ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,, (Second), COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Avon Products Inc.(McSwane, Douglas)
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting #379 Motion for Leave to File document in excess of page limit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/24/2012. (sm, )
February 24, 2012 Filing 389 ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM (S) against GeoTag Inc by Target Corp.(Williams, Danny)
February 24, 2012 Filing 388 ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM (S) against GeoTag Inc by Old Navy LLC.(Williams, Danny)
February 24, 2012 Filing 387 ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM (S) against GeoTag Inc by BestBuy.com LLC.(Williams, Danny)
February 24, 2012 Filing 386 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Logan J Drew for BestBuy.com LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-938) (ehs, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2012: #1 sealed document) (ehs, ).
February 24, 2012 Filing 385 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Emmett J McMahon for BestBuy.com LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-938) (ehs, )
February 23, 2012 Filing 384 ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Gander Mountain Company.(Blum, Anthony)
February 23, 2012 Filing 383 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Conference): #379 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moore, Stevenson) Modified on 2/24/2012 (sm, ).
February 23, 2012 Filing 382 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #379 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moore, Stevenson) Modified on 2/23/2012 (ch, ).
February 23, 2012 Filing 381 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony F Blum on behalf of Gander Mountain Company (Blum, Anthony)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER that case is TRANSFERRED to the docket of Honorable Michael Schneider. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/22/2012. (sm, )
February 23, 2012 Judge Michael H. Schneider added as presiding judge. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. (sm, )
February 23, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE Document # 382, Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 22, 2012 Filing 379 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
February 21, 2012 Filing 378 RESPONSE in Opposition re #363 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff GeoTag, Inc.'s Respose to Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting #368 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allen Franklin Gardner and Michael E Jones terminated as attys for Petsmart and TJX. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/21/2012. (sm, )
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting #370 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #363 MOTION to Stay Replies due by 2/20/2012.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/21/2012. (sm, )
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER granting #369 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #358 MOTION for Entry of Case Management Plan and Docket Control Order Replies due by 2/20/2012.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/21/2012. (sm, )
February 21, 2012 Filing 374 ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Brown Jordan International Inc.(Fischer, Ury)
February 20, 2012 Filing 373 ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc(a Texas Corporation ), GeoTag Inc(a Texas Corporation) by Academy LTD.(Klemchuk, Darin)
February 20, 2012 Filing 372 AMENDED ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by The TJX Companies Inc. (Lee, Robert)
February 20, 2012 Filing 371 AMENDED ANSWER to #364 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Gamestop Corp. (Lee, Robert)
February 17, 2012 Filing 370 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #363 MOTION to Stay Second Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time to Respond to Moving Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
February 17, 2012 Filing 369 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #365 Response in Opposition to Motion, Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time to Reply to the Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Case Management Plan and Docket Control Order by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
February 17, 2012 Filing 368 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E. Jones and Allen F. Gardner by Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, The TJX Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting #366 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #363 MOTION to Stay Responses due by 2/17/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/14/2012. (sm, )
February 13, 2012 Filing 366 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #363 MOTION to Stay Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time to Respond to Moving Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
February 7, 2012 Filing 365 RESPONSE in Opposition re #358 MOTION for Entry of Case Management Plan and Docket Control Order filed by BestBuy.com LLC, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Target Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - GeoTag's Scheduling Proposal, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Defendants' December 7th Scheduling Proposal, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Judge Andrews' Order Denying Transfer, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Judge Folsom's November 14th Order)(Williams, Danny)
February 6, 2012 Filing 364 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ASICS America Corp, AT&T Mobility LLC, Academy LTD, Aromatique Inc, Avon Products Inc, BestBuy.com LLC, Brookstone Company Inc, Brown Jordan International Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Gamestop Corp, Gander Mountain Company, Geoffrey LLC, Hinkley Lighting Inc, Kay Jewelers Inc, Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Oscar De La Renta LTD, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Rolex Watch USA Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Target Corp, The TJX Companies Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc, AT&T Services Inc., filed by GeoTag Inc.(Moore, Stevenson)
January 27, 2012 Filing 363 MOTION to Stay by ASICS America Corp, Aromatique Inc, Brown Jordan International Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(McNabnay, Neil)
January 24, 2012 Filing 362 NOTICE by Geoffrey LLC, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc re #357 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Joinder (Notice of Compliance with 11/14/11 Orders) (Vincent, Lance)
January 23, 2012 Filing 361 NOTICE by VF Corporation re #338 Order on Motion to Stay, #337 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (MOVANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO REURGE MOTION TO STAY) (McNabnay, Neil)
January 23, 2012 Filing 360 NOTICE by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Hinkley Lighting Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc re #338 Order on Motion to Stay, #337 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (MOVANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO RE-URGE MOTION TO STAY) (McNabnay, Neil)
January 23, 2012 Filing 359 Additional Attachments to Main Document (CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE): #358 MOTION for Entry of Case Management Plan and Docket Control Order.. (Ni, Hao)
January 20, 2012 Filing 358 MOTION for Entry of Case Management Plan and Docket Control Order by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Ni, Hao)
January 20, 2012 Filing 357 NOTICE by ASICS America Corp, AT&T Mobility LLC, Academy LTD, Aromatique Inc, Avon Products Inc, BestBuy.com LLC, Brookstone Company Inc, Brown Jordan International Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Gamestop Corp, Gander Mountain Company, Geoffrey LLC, Hinkley Lighting Inc, Kay Jewelers Inc, Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Oscar De La Renta LTD, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Rolex Watch USA Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Target Corp, The TJX Companies Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc of Compliance with Court's November 14, 2011 Orders (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ***VACATED PER ORDER # 423***ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/18/2012. (ch, ) Modified on 3/23/2012 (ch, ).
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting #343 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Daniel J Schwartz for Michaels Stores Inc. Attorney Robert L Lee; Derek Scott Neilson; Adam David Swain; Jason Woodard Cook and Kamran Jivani terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/10/12. (mrm, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER, granting #339 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Appearance of Daniel J. Schwartz filed by VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP. Attorney Daniel J Schwartz terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/10/12. (mrm, )
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting #352 Motion for Extension of Deadline. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/10/12. (mrm, )
January 9, 2012 Filing 352 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Invalidity Contentions by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Hinkley Lighting Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bittner, Michael)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER granting #350 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Case Management Plan. Deadline is 1/20/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/9/2012. (ch, )
January 6, 2012 Filing 350 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Third Agreed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File the Joint Proposed Case Management Plan by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting #347 Motion to Withdraw. Alan L. Whitehurst is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Kohls Corporation, Kohls Department Stores Inc. and Kohls Illinois Inc. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/6/12. (ehs, )
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting #344 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed case mgt plan up to and including 1/6/2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/3/2012. (sm, )
January 4, 2012 Filing 347 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Counsel Alan L. Whitehurst by Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swain, Adam)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge David Folsom recused. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/3/2012. (ch, )
January 4, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. BY CLERK Document # 345, Order of Recusal. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 4, 2012 The previous case assigned to Judge Davis, is hereby reassigned to Judge Folsom per Local Rule CV 63-B(ch, )
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ***FILED IN ERROR. BY CLERK. PLEASE IGNORE.***ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/3/2012. (ch, ) Modified on 1/4/2012 (ch, ).
December 30, 2011 Filing 344 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Case Management Plan by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
December 22, 2011 Filing 343 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Daniel J. Schwartz by Michaels Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Daniel)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting #341 Motion for Extension of Time to File. the Parties shall have up to and including December 30, 2011, to file the Joint Proposed Case Management Plan.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/21/11. (ehs, )
December 20, 2011 Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap re: misc order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (rvw, )
December 16, 2011 Filing 341 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File File The Joint Proposed Case Management Plan by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
December 5, 2011 Filing 340 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 9, 2011, Motion Hearing and Scheduling Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2012. (Crawford, Libby)

December 1, 2011 Filing 339 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Appearance of Daniel J. Schwartz by VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER denying #269 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/11. (mrm, )
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER denying #318 Motion Entry of Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/11. (mrm, )
November 9, 2011 Filing 336 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel J Schwartz for VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP, VF Outdoor Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-803(ch, )
November 9, 2011 Filing 335 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Scheduling Conference held on 11/9/2011, Motion Hearing held on 11/9/2011 re #269 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc, Aromatique Inc, ASICS America Corp, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Richemont North America Inc. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (Attachments: #1 Sign-in Sheet) (mrm, )
November 9, 2011 Filing 334 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc (Dacus, Deron)
November 8, 2011 Filing 333 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc (Dacus, Shannon)
November 8, 2011 Filing 332 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Avon Products Inc (Bufe, John)
November 7, 2011 Filing 331 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of BestBuy.com LLC, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Target Corp (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 3, 2011 Filing 330 NOTICE by Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc re #318 Joint MOTION Entry of Docket Control Order Joinder (Vincent, Lance)
November 3, 2011 Filing 329 NOTICE by Geoffrey LLC, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc re #321 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Joinder (Compliance) (Vincent, Lance)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #326 Motion to Substitute Party. ORDERED that the name GeoTag, Inc., a Texas corporation, is hereby substituted in place of GeoTag Inc., a Delaware corporation, as the named plaintiff in each of the lawsuits referenced above. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/1/2011. (ch, )
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #325 Motion to Dismiss all claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff GeoTag Inc. and Footlocker.com Inc., are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All costs, expenses and attorneys fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/1/11. (ehs, )
October 31, 2011 Filing 326 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Plaintiff's Unopposed Rule 25(c) to Substitute Party by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
October 28, 2011 Filing 325 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Footlocker.com Inc. by Footlocker.com Inc, GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting #279 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge David Folsom on October 28, 2011. (jml, )
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting #244 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard Trevor Carter terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on October 28, 2011. (jml, )
October 26, 2011 Filing 322 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc Brief Regarding Joint Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order (Ni, Hao)
October 26, 2011 Filing 321 NOTICE by ASICS America Corp, Brookstone Company Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Hinkley Lighting Inc, Kay Jewelers Inc, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc (NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Order on Electronic Discovery)(McNabnay, Neil) Modified on 10/27/2011 (ch, ).
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #269 Joint MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side will have 15 minutes for oral argument. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/21/11. (mrm, )
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2011 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/14/11. (mrm, )
October 7, 2011 Filing 318 Joint MOTION Entry of Docket Control Order by ASICS America Corp, AT&T Mobility LLC, Academy LTD, Aromatique Inc, Avon Products Inc, BestBuy.com LLC, Brookstone Company Inc, Brown Jordan International Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Footlocker.com Inc, Gamestop Corp, Gander Mountain Company, GeoTag Inc, Geoffrey LLC, Hinkley Lighting Inc, Kay Jewelers Inc, Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy LLC, Oscar De La Renta LTD, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Rolex Watch USA Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Target Corp, The TJX Companies Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
October 7, 2011 Filing 317 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Lee on behalf of Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc (Lee, Robert)
October 5, 2011 Filing 316 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam David Swain on behalf of Gamestop Corp, Michaels Stores Inc, The TJX Companies Inc (Swain, Adam)
October 5, 2011 Filing 315 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Woodard Cook on behalf of Gamestop Corp, Michaels Stores Inc, The TJX Companies Inc (Cook, Jason)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/2011. (ch, )
October 4, 2011 Filing 313 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derek Scott Neilson on behalf of Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc (Neilson, Derek)
October 4, 2011 Filing 312 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kamran Jivani on behalf of Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc (Jivani, Kamran)
October 3, 2011 Filing 311 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Woodard Cook on behalf of Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc (Cook, Jason)
September 14, 2011 Case assigned to Judge David Folsom. Associated Cases: 2:11-cv-00404, 2:06-cv-00475-CE, 2:10-cv-00265-TJW, 2:10-cv-00272-TJW, 2:10-cv-00569-TJW, 2:10-cv-00570-TJW, 2:10-cv-00571-TJW -CE, 2:10-cv-00572-TJW, 2:10-cv-00573-TJW -CE, 2:10-cv-00574-DF -CE, 2:10-cv-00575-TJW, 2:10-cv-00587-TJW, 2:11-cv-00175-DF, 2:11-cv-00403-TJW -CE, 2:11-cv-00405(ch, )
September 6, 2011 Filing 310 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc of Readiness for a Scheduling Conference (Ni, Hao)
September 2, 2011 Filing 309 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Aaron Benefield on behalf of Old Navy LLC (Benefield, Michael)
September 2, 2011 Filing 308 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Buss on behalf of Old Navy LLC (Buss, Brian)
September 2, 2011 Filing 307 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Needham Cravey on behalf of Old Navy LLC (Cravey, Christopher)
September 2, 2011 Filing 306 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry D Morgan on behalf of Old Navy LLC (Morgan, Terry)
September 2, 2011 Filing 305 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Old Navy LLC (Williams, Danny)
August 31, 2011 Filing 304 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jane J Du on behalf of Hinkley Lighting Inc (Du, Jane)
August 31, 2011 Filing 303 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Hinkley Lighting Inc (McNabnay, Neil)
August 30, 2011 Filing 302 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Needham Cravey on behalf of BestBuy.com LLC, Nordstrom Inc, Target Corp (Cravey, Christopher)
August 30, 2011 Filing 301 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of Hinkley Lighting Inc (Bittner, Michael)
August 30, 2011 Filing 300 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stevenson Moore, V on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Moore, Stevenson)
August 19, 2011 Filing 299 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Smith, Michael)
August 16, 2011 Filing 298 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Ni, Hao) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER granting #296 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Andrew Bittner and Neil J McNabnay terminated as counsel for Defendants Kohl's Department Stores, Kohl's Illinois, Inc. and Kohl's Corporation. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/10/2011. (ch, )
August 8, 2011 Filing 296 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw (UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, KOHL'S ILLINOIS, INC. AND KOHL'S COPRORATION), MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2011: #2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
August 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting #294 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Charles Van Cleef; John J Edmonds and Stephen F Schlather terminated as counsel for GeoTag. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/8/2011. (ch, )
August 5, 2011 Filing 294 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
August 4, 2011 Filing 293 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hao Ni on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Ni, Hao)
August 4, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 291 submitted by GeoTag Inc. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
August 3, 2011 Filing 292 NOTICE by GeoTag Inc of Withdrawal of Motion for Substitution of Counsel and Notice of Appearance (Edmonds, John)
August 3, 2011 Filing 291 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Notice of Appearance by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John) Modified on 8/4/2011 (ch, ).
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting #287 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/1/2011. (ch, )
July 29, 2011 Filing 289 REPLY to Response to Motion re #269 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by ASICS America Corp, Aromatique Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McNabnay, Neil)
July 29, 2011 Filing 288 NOTICE by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 29, 2011 Filing 287 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Movants' Reply to GeoTag's Response in Opposition to the Motion to Stay by ASICS America Corp, Aromatique Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #283 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by GeoTag Inc as to deft Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between plaintiff, GeoTag, Inc., and defendant, VICTORIA'S SECRET DIRECT BRAND MANAGEMENT, LLC, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all costs, expenses and attorneys fees are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/27/11. (ehs, )
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting #282 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by GeoTag Inc as to deft Lucy Activewear Inc. All claims dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/27/11. (ehs, )
July 26, 2011 Filing 284 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam David Swain on behalf of Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc (Swain, Adam)
July 25, 2011 Filing 283 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
July 25, 2011 Filing 282 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting #276 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Movant's motion to stay. Responses due by 7/29/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/19/11. (ehs, )
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***ORDER granting #279 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #278 Responses due by 7/29/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/2011. (ch, ) Modified on 7/19/2011 (ch, ).
July 19, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. BY CLERK Document # 280, Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
July 18, 2011 Filing 279 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #278 Response in Opposition to Motion, by ASICS America Corp, Aromatique Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix I, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
July 12, 2011 Filing 278 RESPONSE in Opposition re #269 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Edmonds, John)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting #274 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rickey Lawrence Faulkner terminated as counsel for Bestbuy.com LLC. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/5/2011. (ch, )
July 1, 2011 Filing 276 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #269 Joint MOTION to Stay by GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
June 30, 2011 Filing 275 NOTICE by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC of Firm Name Change (Ainsworth, Charles)
June 28, 2011 Filing 274 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Termination of Electronic Notices by BestBuy.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Faulkner, Rickey)
June 24, 2011 Filing 273 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc (Montgomery, M.)
June 24, 2011 Filing 272 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc (Heartfield, J)
June 24, 2011 Filing 271 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John G Bisbikis on behalf of CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc (Bisbikis, John)
June 17, 2011 Filing 270 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jane J Du on behalf of Brookstone Company Inc, Kay Jewelers Inc, Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc (Du, Jane)
June 17, 2011 Filing 269 Joint MOTION to Stay by ASICS America Corp, Aromatique Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, Dollar Tree Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER Plaintiffs claims against AT&T MOBILITY II LLC and NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS SERVICES, INC. are DISMISSED without prejudice.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/16/11. (ehs, )
June 16, 2011 Filing 267 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of ASICS America Corp, Richemont North America Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc (Bittner, Michael)
June 15, 2011 Filing 266 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of Brookstone Company Inc (Bittner, Michael)
June 15, 2011 Filing 265 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Brookstone Company Inc (McNabnay, Neil)
June 14, 2011 Filing 264 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
June 14, 2011 Filing 263 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jane J Du on behalf of ASICS America Corp, Dollar Tree Inc, Richemont North America Inc, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc (Du, Jane)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER - granting #260 Notice Voluntary Dismissal. ORDERS that Plaintiffs claims against CHRISTIAN DIOR PERFUMES, INC. D/B/A CHRISTIAN DIOR D/B/A DIOR D/B/A DIOR.COM. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/3/2011. (ch, )
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting #259 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allen Franklin Gardner and Michael E Jones terminated as counsel for Defendants Brookstone Company, Inc., CraftMaster Manufacturing, Inc., and Hinkley Lighting,. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/3/11. (ehs, )
June 1, 2011 Filing 260 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
June 1, 2011 Filing 259 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brookstone Company Inc, CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Hinkley Lighting Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER denying #253 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by GeoTag Inc.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/31/11. (ehs, )
May 27, 2011 Filing 257 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin R Johnson on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Johnson, Benjamin)
May 27, 2011 Filing 256 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Cannon Kennedy on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Kennedy, Susan)
May 27, 2011 Filing 255 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Wood Kennerly on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Kennerly, Christopher)
May 27, 2011 Filing 254 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad Christian Walters on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Walters, Chad)
May 25, 2011 Filing 253 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
May 20, 2011 Filing 252 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark P Wine for Geoffrey LLC, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc (mll, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 251 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas J Gray for Geoffrey LLC, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc. (mll, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 250 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benjamin S Lin for Geoffrey LLC, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc. (mll, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 249 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael Chow for Geoffrey LLC, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc. (mll, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 248 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hardip Brar Passananti for Geoffrey LLC, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc. (mll, )
May 9, 2011 Filing 247 ANSWER to #241 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of GANDER MOUNTAIN COMPANY by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
May 9, 2011 Filing 246 ANSWER to #239 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of VAN CLEEF & ARPELS, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
May 9, 2011 Filing 245 ANSWER to #237 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of RICHEMONT NORTH AMERICA, INC. DBA CARTIER by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
May 6, 2011 Filing 244 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Target Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Richard)
May 4, 2011 Filing 243 ANSWER to #231 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant AT&T MOBILITY, LLC by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 22, 2011 Filing 242 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gander Mountain Company (Braunel, Matthew)
April 22, 2011 Filing 241 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, Additional Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Gander Mountain Company.(Braunel, Matthew)
April 21, 2011 Filing 240 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Van Cleef & Arpels Inc identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie Financiere Richemont, S.A., Other Affiliate Richemont North America Inc for Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
April 21, 2011 Filing 239 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Van Cleef & Arpels Inc.(McNabnay, Neil)
April 21, 2011 Filing 238 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Richemont North America Inc identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie Financiere Richemont, S.A. for Richemont North America Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
April 21, 2011 Filing 237 ANSWER to Complaint Dkt No 88 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Richemont North America Inc.(McNabnay, Neil)
April 20, 2011 Filing 236 ANSWER to #205 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant NORDSTROM'S, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 19, 2011 Filing 235 NOTICE by Gamestop Corp, Michaels Stores Inc (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
April 18, 2011 Filing 234 ANSWER to #199 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim oif Defendant STERLING JEWELERS INC. DBA JARED THE GALLERIA OF JEWELRY DBA KAY JEWELERS by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 15, 2011 Filing 233 ANSWER to #197 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant AROMATIQUE, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 13, 2011 Filing 232 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Mobility Corporation, Corporate Parent SBC Alloy Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Corporate Parent New BellSouth Cingular Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance LLC for AT&T Mobility LLC. (Durst, Timothy)
April 13, 2011 Filing 231 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Durst, Timothy)
April 13, 2011 Filing 230 ANSWER to #186 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant TARGET CORPORATION by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 13, 2011 Filing 229 ANSWER to #188 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant DOLLAR TREE MANAGEMENT, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 13, 2011 Filing 228 ANSWER to #184 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant BROOKSTONE COMPANY, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 13, 2011 Filing 227 ANSWER to #190 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Defendant BESTBUY.COM, LLC by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER - granting #110 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiffs claims against FOOT LOCKER RETAIL, INC. AND FOOT LOCKER, INC. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/12/2011. (ch, )
April 11, 2011 Filing 225 ANSWER to #176 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant VICTORIA'S SECRET DIRECT BRAND MANAGEMENT, LLC by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 11, 2011 Filing 224 ANSWER to #174 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants VF CORPORATION, VF JEANSWEAR, LP, VF OUTDOOR, INC. AND SEVEN FOR ALL MANKIND, LLC by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 11, 2011 Filing 223 ANSWER to #165 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant OLD NAVY, LLC by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 11, 2011 Filing 222 ANSWER to #170 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants KOHLS CORPORATION, KOHLS ILLINOIS, INC. AND KOHLS DEPARTMENT STORES, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 11, 2011 Filing 221 ANSWER to #161 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant HINKLEY LIGHTING, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 11, 2011 Filing 220 ANSWER to #164 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant FOOTLOCKER.COM, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 11, 2011 Filing 219 ANSWER to #168 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant CRAFTMASTER MANUFACTURING, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 11, 2011 Filing 218 ANSWER to #163 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant CHRISTIAN DIOR PERFUMES, LLC by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 8, 2011 Filing 217 ANSWER to #153 Answer to Complaint, Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants TOYS R US, INC. AND by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 8, 2011 Filing 216 ANSWER to #152 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant ROLEX WATCH USA, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 8, 2011 Filing 215 ANSWER to #155 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants PETSMART, INC. AND PETSMART STORE SUPPORT GROUP, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 8, 2011 Filing 214 ANSWER to #157 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant BROWN JORDAN INTERNATIONL, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 8, 2011 Filing 213 ANSWER to #150 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant ASICS AMERICA CORP. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 6, 2011 Filing 212 ANSWER to #137 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant TJX Companies by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 6, 2011 Filing 211 ANSWER to #135 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant MICHAELS STORES, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 6, 2011 Filing 210 ANSWER to #133 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Gamestop by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 6, 2011 Filing 209 ANSWER to #127 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant AVON PRODUCTS, INC. by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #207 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Antoinette M Tease terminated as counsel for Brookstone Company, Inc., CraftMaster Manufacturing, Inc., and Hinkley Lighting,Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/5/2011. (ch, )
March 31, 2011 Filing 207 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brookstone Company Inc, CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Hinkley Lighting Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
March 30, 2011 Filing 206 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nordstrom Inc (Williams, Danny)
March 30, 2011 Filing 205 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Nordstrom Inc.(Williams, Danny)
March 30, 2011 Filing 204 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Allison H Altersohn for Avon Products Inc,Allison H Altersohn for Avon Products Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-2565) (ehs, )
March 30, 2011 Filing 203 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan D Ball for Avon Products Inc,Jonathan D Ball for Avon Products Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-2565) (ehs, )
March 30, 2011 Filing 202 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laura S Huffman for Avon Products Inc,Laura S Huffman for Avon Products Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-2565) (ehs, )
March 28, 2011 Filing 201 ANSWER to #90 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by GeoTag Inc.(Van Cleef, Charles)
March 28, 2011 Filing 200 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sterling Jewelers Inc (McNabnay, Neil)
March 28, 2011 Filing 199 DEFENDANT STERLING JEWELERS INC.'S ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against GeoTag Inc by Sterling Jewelers Inc.(McNabnay, Neil)
March 25, 2011 Filing 198 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Aromatique Inc (McCormack, Brian)
March 25, 2011 Filing 197 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, DEFENDANT AROMATIQUE, INC.'S ORIGINAL ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND COUNTERCLAIMS, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Aromatique Inc.(McCormack, Brian)
March 25, 2011 Filing 196 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Allen Engels on behalf of Aromatique Inc (Engels, Nathan)
March 25, 2011 Filing 195 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Charles McCormack on behalf of Aromatique Inc (McCormack, Brian)
March 25, 2011 Filing 194 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark David Taylor on behalf of Aromatique Inc (Taylor, Mark)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #141 Motion to Substitute Party. BestBuy.com LLC added. Best Buy Co Inc, BBY Solutions Inc are terminated. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/24/2011. (ch, )
March 24, 2011 Filing 192 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Old Navy LLC identifying Corporate Parent Gap, Inc. for Old Navy LLC. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
March 23, 2011 Filing 191 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Best Buy Co Inc (Williams, Danny)
March 23, 2011 Filing 190 BESTBUY.COM, LLCS ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM (BESTBUY.COM, LLCS ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (#88)) against GeoTag Inc by Best Buy Co Inc.(Williams, Danny)
March 23, 2011 Filing 189 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dollar Tree Inc identifying Other Affiliate Dollar Tree Management, Inc. for Dollar Tree Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
March 23, 2011 Filing 188 DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE MANAGEMENT, INC.'S ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against GeoTag Inc by Dollar Tree Inc.(McNabnay, Neil)
March 23, 2011 Filing 187 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corp (Williams, Danny)
March 23, 2011 Filing 186 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Target Corp.(Williams, Danny)
March 23, 2011 Filing 185 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Brookstone Company Inc identifying Corporate Parent Brookstone, Inc. for Brookstone Company Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
March 23, 2011 Filing 184 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Brookstone Company Inc.(Gardner, Allen)
March 23, 2011 Filing 183 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Willem G Schuurman on behalf of Christian Dior Perfumes LLC (Schuurman, Willem)
March 22, 2011 Filing 182 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Avelyn Marie Ross on behalf of Christian Dior Perfumes LLC (Ross, Avelyn)
March 22, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Srinivas Giriraj Pathmanaban on behalf of Christian Dior Perfumes LLC (Pathmanaban, Srinivas)
March 22, 2011 Filing 180 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew A Braunel on behalf of Gander Mountain Company (Braunel, Matthew)
March 22, 2011 Filing 179 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Gander Mountain Company.( Franklin, Dean)
March 22, 2011 Filing 178 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dean Franklin on behalf of Gander Mountain Company (Franklin, Dean)
March 22, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Gander Mountain Company to 4/22/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 21, 2011 Filing 177 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC identifying Corporate Parent Limited Brands, Inc., Other Affiliate Victoria's Secret Stores Brand Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Intimate Brands, Inc., Other Affiliate Intimate Brands Holdings, LLC for Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
March 21, 2011 Filing 176 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) Modified on 3/22/2011 (ch, ).
March 21, 2011 Filing 175 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Seven For All Mandkind LLC, VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP, VF Outdoor Inc (Schonberg, Michael)
March 21, 2011 Filing 174 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Seven For All Mandkind LLC, VF Outdoor Inc, VF Jeanswear LP, VF Corporation.(Schonberg, Michael)
March 21, 2011 Filing 173 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kohl's Illinois Inc identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. for Kohl's Illinois Inc. (Whitehurst, Alan)
March 21, 2011 Filing 172 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kohl's Corporation (Whitehurst, Alan)
March 21, 2011 Filing 171 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Khol's Department Stores Inc identifying Corporate Parent Kohl's Corporation for Khol's Department Stores Inc. (Whitehurst, Alan)
March 21, 2011 Filing 170 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Kohl's Illinois Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Khol's Department Stores Inc.(Whitehurst, Alan)
March 21, 2011 Filing 169 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc identifying Corporate Parent None for CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
March 21, 2011 Filing 168 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc.(Gardner, Allen)
March 21, 2011 Filing 167 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Footlocker.com Inc identifying Corporate Parent Foot Locker, Inc. for Footlocker.com Inc. (Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
March 21, 2011 Filing 166 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Christian Dior Perfumes LLC (Ross, Avelyn)
March 21, 2011 Filing 165 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, Additional Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Old Navy LLC.(Papastavros, Nicholas)
March 21, 2011 Filing 164 Footlocker.com, Inc.'s ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Footlocker.com Inc.(Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
March 21, 2011 Filing 163 Christian Dior Perfumes, LLC ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Christian Dior Perfumes LLC.(Ross, Avelyn)
March 21, 2011 Filing 162 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hinkley Lighting Inc identifying Corporate Parent None for Hinkley Lighting Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
March 21, 2011 Filing 161 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Hinkley Lighting Inc.(Gardner, Allen)
March 21, 2011 Filing 160 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
March 21, 2011 Filing 159 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Gerald Graham on behalf of Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC (Graham, Robert)
March 18, 2011 Filing 158 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Brown Jordan International Inc identifying Corporate Parent Brown Jordan Holdings, LLC for Brown Jordan International Inc. (Fischer, Ury)
March 18, 2011 Filing 157 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Brown Jordan International Inc.(Fischer, Ury)
March 18, 2011 Filing 156 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc (Vincent, Lance)
March 18, 2011 Filing 155 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Petsmart Inc.(Vincent, Lance)
March 18, 2011 Filing 154 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Geoffrey LLC, Toys "R" Us Inc (Vincent, Lance)
March 18, 2011 Filing 153 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Toys "R" Us Inc, Geoffrey LLC.(Vincent, Lance)
March 18, 2011 Filing 152 Rolex Watch USA, Inc.s ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Rolex Watch USA Inc.(Hardin, Roy)
March 18, 2011 Filing 151 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ASICS America Corp (McNabnay, Neil)
March 18, 2011 Filing 150 DEFENDANT ASICS AMERICA CORP.'S ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against GeoTag Inc by ASICS America Corp.(McNabnay, Neil)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #131 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Robert L Lee substituted as counsel for GameStop Corp and Attorney Jennifer Parker Ainsworth terminated as counsel for GameStop. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/11. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #130 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Robert L Lee substituted as counsel of record for Michaels Stores Inc and Attorney Jennifer Parker Ainsworth terminated as counsel for Michaels Stores Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/11. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #122 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Clyde Moody Siebman terminated as counsel for Avon Products Inc and Douglas R McSwane Jr added as counsel for Avon Products. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/11. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney J Thad Heartfield terminated as counsel of record for CraftMaster Manufacturing, Inc.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/11. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #113 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant BBY deadline extended March 23, 2011.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/11. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Target Corp deadline extended to March 23, 2011.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/11. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #105 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Nordstrom Inc deadline extended to answer March 30, 2011.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/11. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #104 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Best Buy Co Inc deadline extended to March 23, 2011.. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/18/11. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Target Corp to 3/23/2011. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for BBY Solutions Inc to 3/23/2011. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Best Buy Co Inc to 3/23/2011. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Nordstrom Inc to 3/30/2011. (ehs, )
March 17, 2011 Filing 141 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party /(Parties) by BBY Solutions Inc, Best Buy Co Inc, GeoTag Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
March 16, 2011 Filing 140 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derek Scott Neilson on behalf of Gamestop Corp, Michaels Stores Inc, The TJX Companies Inc (Neilson, Derek)
March 16, 2011 Filing 139 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kamran Jivani on behalf of Gamestop Corp, Michaels Stores Inc, The TJX Companies Inc (Jivani, Kamran)
March 16, 2011 Filing 138 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The TJX Companies Inc (Lee, Robert)
March 16, 2011 Filing 137 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by The TJX Companies Inc.(Lee, Robert)
March 16, 2011 Filing 136 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Michaels Stores Inc identifying Corporate Parent Michaels Holdings, LLC for Michaels Stores Inc. (Lee, Robert)
March 16, 2011 Filing 135 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Michaels Stores Inc.(Lee, Robert)
March 16, 2011 Filing 134 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gamestop Corp (Lee, Robert)
March 16, 2011 Filing 133 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,, Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Gamestop Corp.(Lee, Robert)
March 16, 2011 Filing 132 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Lee on behalf of Gamestop Corp, Michaels Stores Inc, The TJX Companies Inc (Lee, Robert)
March 16, 2011 Filing 131 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Gamestop Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Robert)
March 16, 2011 Filing 130 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Michaels Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Robert)
March 16, 2011 Filing 129 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
March 16, 2011 Filing 128 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Avon Products Inc identifying Corporate Parent NYSE Company for Avon Products Inc. (McSwane, Douglas)
March 16, 2011 Filing 127 Avon Products, Inc's ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Avon Products Inc.(McSwane, Douglas)
March 16, 2011 Filing 126 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Petsmart Store Support Group Inc.( Vincent, Lance)
March 16, 2011 Filing 125 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Petsmart Inc.( Vincent, Lance)
March 16, 2011 Filing 124 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toys "R" Us Inc.( Vincent, Lance)
March 16, 2011 Filing 123 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Geoffrey LLC.( Vincent, Lance)
March 16, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toys "R" Us Inc to 3/18/2011; Petsmart Store Support Group Inc to 3/18/2011; Geoffrey LLC to 3/18/2011; Petsmart Inc to 3/18/2011. 2 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 15, 2011 Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney For Defendant Avon Products, Inc. by Avon Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
March 15, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Christian Dior Perfumes LLC to 3/21/2011; Christian Dior Perfumes Inc to 3/21/2011. 8 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 14, 2011 Filing 121 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Christian Dior Perfumes LLC.( Ross, Avelyn)
March 14, 2011 Filing 120 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Christian Dior Perfumes Inc.( Ross, Avelyn)
March 14, 2011 Filing 119 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dollar Tree Inc.( McNabnay, Neil)
March 14, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Dollar Tree Inc to 3/23/2011. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 14, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kohl's Illinois Inc to 3/28/2011; Khol's Department Stores Inc to 3/28/2011; Kohl's Corporation to 3/28/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 11, 2011 Filing 118 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Khol's Department Stores Inc.( Whitehurst, Alan)
March 11, 2011 Filing 117 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kohl's Illinois Inc.( Whitehurst, Alan)
March 11, 2011 Filing 116 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kohl's Corporation.( Whitehurst, Alan)
March 11, 2011 Filing 115 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Buss on behalf of BBY Solutions Inc (Buss, Brian)
March 11, 2011 Filing 114 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Aaron Benefield on behalf of BBY Solutions Inc (Benefield, Michael)
March 11, 2011 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF GEOTAG, INC.S AMENDED COMPLAINT by BBY Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
March 11, 2011 Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry D Morgan on behalf of BBY Solutions Inc (Morgan, Terry)
March 11, 2011 Filing 111 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of BBY Solutions Inc (Williams, Danny)
March 11, 2011 Filing 110 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER - granting #86 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. CARTIER, INC., CARTIER INTERNATIONAL, LLC, CARTIER ENTERPRISES, INC., CARTIER NORTH AMERICA, INC., and KAY JEWELERS, INC. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/10/2011. (ch, )
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER - granting #87 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Victoria's Secret Stores Inc are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/10/2011. (ch, )
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER - granting #93 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Dft Adidas America Inc is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 3/10/2011. (ch, )
March 9, 2011 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #88 Amended Complaint,,,, by Target Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
March 9, 2011 Filing 105 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #88 Amended Complaint,,,, by Nordstrom Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
March 9, 2011 Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #88 Amended Complaint,,,, by Best Buy Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Danny)
March 9, 2011 Filing 103 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Aaron Benefield on behalf of Best Buy Co Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Target Corp (Benefield, Michael)
March 9, 2011 Filing 102 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Buss on behalf of Best Buy Co Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Target Corp (Buss, Brian)
March 9, 2011 Filing 101 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry D Morgan on behalf of Best Buy Co Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Target Corp (Morgan, Terry)
March 9, 2011 Filing 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Best Buy Co Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Target Corp (Williams, Danny)
March 9, 2011 Filing 99 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Richemont North America Inc.( McNabnay, Neil)
March 9, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Richemont North America Inc to 4/22/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 98 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Mobility II LLC, (Attachments: #1 AT&T Mobility LLC, #2 New Cingular Wireless Services Inc, #3 Richemont North America Inc, #4 Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC)(ch, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 97 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew C Berntsen for Victoria's Secret Stores Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-2194) (ehs, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 96 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick Robert Colsher for Victoria's Secret Stores Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-2194) (ehs, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 95 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John F Ward for Victoria's Secret Stores Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-2194) (ehs, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 94 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J Zinna for Victoria's Secret Stores Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-194) (ehs, )
March 7, 2011 Filing 93 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
March 7, 2011 Filing 92 ANSWER to #43 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Rolex Watch USA, Inc. by GeoTag Inc.(Edmonds, John)
March 4, 2011 Filing 91 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Academy LTD identifying Corporate Parent Academy Managing Co., LLC, Corporate Parent Associated Investors, Inc. for Academy LTD, Academy LTD. (Klemchuk, Darin)
March 4, 2011 Filing 90 ANSWER to #88 Amended Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Academy LTD.(Klemchuk, Darin)
March 3, 2011 Filing 89 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Van Cleef & Arpels Inc.( McNabnay, Neil)
March 3, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Van Cleef & Arpels Inc to 4/22/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 2, 2011 Filing 88 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ASICS America Corp, Academy LTD, Adidas America Inc, Aromatique Inc, Avon Products Inc, BBY Solutions Inc, BJI Inc, Best Buy Co Inc, Brookstone Company Inc, Brown Jordan International Inc, Cartier Enterprises Inc, Cartier Inc, Cartier International LLC, Cartier North America Inc, Christian Dior Boutiques Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes Inc, Christian Dior Perfumes LLC, CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Dollar Tree Inc, Foot Locker Inc, Foot Locker Retail Inc, Footlocker.com Inc, Gamestop Corp, Gander Mountain Company, Geoffrey LLC, Hinkley Lighting Inc, Kay Jewelers Inc, Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc, Lucy Activewear Inc, Michaels Stores Inc, Nordstrom Inc, Old Navy (Apparel) LLC, Old Navy Inc, Old Navy LLC, Oscar De La Renta LTD, Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc, Rolex Watch USA Inc, Seven For All Mandkind LLC, Sterling Jewelers Inc, Target Corp, The TJX Companies Inc, Toys "R" Us Inc, VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP, VF Outdoor Inc, Van Cleef & Arpels Inc, Victoria's Secret Stores Inc, filed by GeoTag Inc.(Edmonds, John)
March 2, 2011 Filing 87 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
March 2, 2011 Filing 86 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
March 2, 2011 Filing 85 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Geoffrey LLC.( Vincent, Lance)
March 2, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Geoffrey LLC to 3/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #82 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by GeoTag Inc as to deft BJI, INC. D/B/A BROWN JORDAN. All claims dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/28/11. (ehs, )
February 25, 2011 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ury Fischer on behalf of Brown Jordan International Inc (Fischer, Ury)
February 25, 2011 Filing 82 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schlather, Stephen)
February 24, 2011 Filing 81 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph J Richetti for Toys "R" Us Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-333 (ch, )
February 24, 2011 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Antoinette M Tease on behalf of CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Hinkley Lighting Inc (Tease, Antoinette)
February 24, 2011 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Hinkley Lighting Inc (Gardner, Allen)
February 24, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc, Hinkley Lighting Inc (Jones, Michael)
February 23, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Adidas America Inc to 3/9/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 22, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey K Gavin on behalf of Adidas America Inc (Gavin, Geoffrey)
February 22, 2011 Filing 76 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Adidas America Inc.( Ferrario, Matias)
February 22, 2011 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matias Ferrario on behalf of Adidas America Inc (Ferrario, Matias)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - granting #66 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Dft Old Navy Inc and Old Navy (Apparel) LLC is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/22/2011. (ch, ) Modified on 2/22/2011 (ch, ).
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER - granting [67 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Dft Christian Dior Boutiques Inc is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 2/22/2011. (ch, )
February 22, 2011 Filing 72 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Van Cleef & Arpels Inc. (ehs, )
February 18, 2011 Filing 71 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Gander Mountain Company. (ch, )
February 17, 2011 Filing 70 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Avon Products Inc.( Siebman, Clyde)
February 17, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Avon Products Inc to 3/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 16, 2011 Filing 69 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Target Corp.( Carter, Richard)
February 16, 2011 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Trevor Carter on behalf of Target Corp (Carter, Richard)
February 16, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Target Corp to 3/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 15, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Best Buy Co Inc to 3/16/2011; BBY Solutions Inc to 3/16/2011; ASICS America Corp to 3/18/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 14, 2011 Filing 67 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
February 14, 2011 Filing 66 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GeoTag Inc (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, John)
February 14, 2011 Filing 65 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re BBY Solutions Inc, Best Buy Co Inc.( Faulkner, Rickey)
February 14, 2011 Filing 64 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ASICS America Corp.( McNabnay, Neil)
February 14, 2011 Filing 63 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hinkley Lighting Inc.( Wiedemer, Eric)
February 14, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hinkley Lighting Inc to 3/21/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 14, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Lucy Activewear Inc to 3/21/2011; Seven For All Mandkind LLC to 3/21/2011; VF Outdoor Inc to 3/21/2011; VF Corporation to 3/21/2011. 26 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 11, 2011 Filing 62 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Seven For All Mandkind LLC.( Sostek, Bruce)
February 11, 2011 Filing 61 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lucy Activewear Inc.( Sostek, Bruce)
February 11, 2011 Filing 60 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re VF Corporation.( Sostek, Bruce)
February 11, 2011 Filing 59 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re VF Outdoor Inc.( Sostek, Bruce)
February 11, 2011 Filing 58 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re VF Jeanswear LP.( Sostek, Bruce)
February 11, 2011 Filing 57 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toys "R" Us Inc.( Adair, Thomas)
February 11, 2011 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of The TJX Companies Inc (Gardner, Allen)
February 11, 2011 Filing 55 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric C Wiedemer for Hinkley Lighting Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-301 (ch, )
February 11, 2011 Filing 54 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint up to and including March 14, 2011 re The TJX Companies Inc. (Jones, Michael)
February 11, 2011 Filing 53 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Christian Dior Perfumes Inc.( Ross, Avelyn)
February 11, 2011 Filing 52 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Christian Dior Perfumes LLC.( Ross, Avelyn)
February 11, 2011 Filing 51 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cartier Inc.( McNabnay, Neil)
February 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Old Navy LLC to 3/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cartier Inc to 3/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Christian Dior Boutiques Inc to 3/13/2011; Christian Dior Perfumes Inc to 3/13/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toys "R" Us Inc to 3/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The TJX Companies Inc to 3/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 10, 2011 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce S Sostek on behalf of Lucy Activewear Inc, VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP, VF Outdoor Inc (Sostek, Bruce)
February 10, 2011 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr on behalf of Lucy Activewear Inc, VF Corporation, VF Jeanswear LP, VF Outdoor Inc (Wynne, Richard)
February 10, 2011 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of Kay Jewelers Inc, Sterling Jewelers Inc (Bittner, Michael)
February 10, 2011 Filing 47 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Old Navy LLC.( Papastavros, Nicholas)
February 10, 2011 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas G Papastavros on behalf of Old Navy LLC (Papastavros, Nicholas)
February 10, 2011 Filing 45 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nordstrom Inc.( Garrett, Mark)
February 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Gamestop Corp to 3/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Michaels Stores Inc to 3/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Nordstrom Inc to 3/23/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 9, 2011 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rolex Watch USA Inc (Hardin, Roy)
February 9, 2011 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against GeoTag Inc by Rolex Watch USA Inc.(Hardin, Roy)
February 9, 2011 Filing 42 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Gamestop Corp.( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 9, 2011 Filing 41 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Michaels Stores Inc.( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 9, 2011 Filing 40 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sterling Jewelers Inc.( McNabnay, Neil)
February 9, 2011 Filing 39 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kay Jewelers Inc.( McNabnay, Neil)
February 9, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kay Jewelers Inc to 3/28/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 9, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sterling Jewelers Inc to 3/28/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 8, 2011 Filing 38 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Antoinette M Tease for Brookstone Company Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-282) (ehs, )
February 8, 2011 Filing 37 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc.( Heartfield, J)
February 8, 2011 Filing 36 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Victoria's Secret Stores Inc.(Graham, Robert)
February 8, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, MOTION TERMINATED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT. Document # 35, Motion to extend time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
February 8, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Victoria's Secret Stores Inc to 3/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 8, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc to 3/13/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 7, 2011 Filing 35 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, requested by Victoria's Secret Stores Inc. (Graham, Robert) Modified on 2/8/2011 (sm, ).
February 7, 2011 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Gerald Graham on behalf of Victoria's Secret Stores Inc (Graham, Robert)
February 7, 2011 Filing 33 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Khol's Department Stores Inc.( McNabnay, Neil)
February 7, 2011 Filing 32 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kohl's Illinois Inc.( McNabnay, Neil)
February 7, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of Dollar Tree Inc, Khol's Department Stores Inc, Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Illinois Inc (Bittner, Michael)
February 7, 2011 Filing 30 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kohl's Corporation.( McNabnay, Neil)
February 7, 2011 Filing 29 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dollar Tree Inc.( McNabnay, Neil)
February 7, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Petsmart Store Support Group Inc to 3/14/2011; Petsmart Inc to 3/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 7, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Academy LTD to 3/5/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 7, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kohl's Illinois Inc to 3/14/2011; Khol's Department Stores Inc to 3/14/2011; Dollar Tree Inc to 3/16/2011; Kohl's Corporation to 3/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 7, 2011 ***Document # 8, Summons MODIFIED to show that summons were issued and not a return of summons as to defts Academy, Sterling Jewelers and Aromatique.*** (ehs, )
February 4, 2011 Filing 28 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint up to and including March 14, 2011 re Petsmart Inc, Petsmart Store Support Group Inc. (Jones, Michael)
February 3, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirby Blair Drake on behalf of Academy LTD (Drake, Kirby)
February 3, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Casey Lee Griffith on behalf of Academy LTD (Griffith, Casey)
February 3, 2011 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Academy LTD.( Klemchuk, Darin)
February 3, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darin Michael Klemchuk on behalf of Academy LTD (Klemchuk, Darin)
February 2, 2011 Filing 23 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey E Dupler for Rolex Watch USA Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-270 (ch, )
February 2, 2011 Filing 22 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian W Brokate for Rolex Watch USA Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-269 (ch, )
February 2, 2011 Filing 21 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David H. T. Kane for Rolex Watch USA Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-258) (ehs, )
February 2, 2011 Filing 20 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven F Meyer for Rolex Watch USA Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-257) (ehs, )
February 1, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Brookstone Company Inc (Gardner, Allen)
February 1, 2011 Filing 18 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint up to and including March 23, 2011 re Brookstone Company Inc. (Jones, Michael)
February 1, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Brookstone Company Inc to 3/23/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 31, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Van Cleef on behalf of GeoTag Inc (Van Cleef, Charles)
January 31, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Foot Locker Inc to 3/11/2011; Foot Locker Retail Inc to 3/11/2011; Footlocker.com Inc to 3/11/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 28, 2011 Filing 16 Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FOOT LOCKER RETAIL, INC., FOOT LOCKER, INC., FOOTLOCKER.COM, INC..( Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
January 28, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Hershkowitz on behalf of FOOT LOCKER RETAIL, INC., FOOT LOCKER, INC., FOOTLOCKER.COM, INC. (Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
January 27, 2011 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to CHRISTIAN DIOR PERFUMES, INC. D/B/A CHRISTIAN DIOR D/B/A DIOR D/B/A DIOR.COM. (ehs, )
January 26, 2011 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of BROWN JORDAN INTERNATIONAL, INC. D/B/A BROWN JORDAN (Gardner, Allen)
January 26, 2011 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint up to and including March 14, 2011 re BROWN JORDAN INTERNATIONAL, INC. D/B/A BROWN JORDAN. (Jones, Michael)
January 26, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of BROWN JORDAN INTERNATIONAL, INC. D/B/A BROWN JORDAN (Jones, Michael)
January 26, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roy William Hardin on behalf of ROLEX WATCH USA, INC. (Hardin, Roy)
January 26, 2011 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to ADIDAS AMERICA, INC., BJI, INC. D/B/A BROWN JORDAN, CARTIER INTERNATIONAL, LLC, CARTIER NORTH AMERICA, INC., GANDER MOUNTAIN COMPANY, KAY JEWELERS, INC., KOHL'S ILLINOIS, INC., OLD NAVY (APPAREL), LLC, OSCAR DE LA RENTA, LTD, VF CORP. D/B/A 7 FOR ALL MANKIND D/B/A 7FAM D/B/A SEVEN JEANS D/B/A LUCY ACTIVEWEAR. (Attachments: #1 BJI, #2 Cartier International, #3 Cartier North Am, #4 Gander Mountain, #5 Kay Jewelers, #6 Kohl's Illinois, #7 Old Navy, #8 Oscar De La Renta, #9 VF Corp)(ehs, )
January 26, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for BJI, INC. D/B/A BROWN JORDAN to 3/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 13, 2011 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to AROMATIQUE, INC., STERLING JEWELERS, INC. D/B/A JARED THE GALLERIA OF JEWELRY D/B/A KAY JEWELERS, ACADEMY, LTD. D/B/A ACADEMY SPORTS OUTDOORS D/B/A ACADEMY SPORTS AND OUTDOORS. (Attachments: #1 Aromatique, #2 Sterling Jewelers)(ehs, )
January 6, 2011 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to ROLEX WATCH USA, INC., SEVEN FOR ALL MANKIND, LLC, TARGET CORP., THE TJX COMPANIES, INC. D/B/A TJ MAXX, TOYS"R"US, INC., VAN CLEEF & ARPELS, INC., VF JEANSWEAR, L.P. D/B/A WRANGLER, VF OUTDOOR, INC. D/B/A THE NORTH FACE, VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Seven for all Mankind, #2 Target, #3 The TJX Companies, #4 Toys R Us, #5 VF Jeanswear, #6 VF Outdoor, #7 Van Cleef & Arpels, #8 Victoria's Secret)(ehs, )
January 6, 2011 Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to HINKLEY LIGHTING, INC., KOHL'S CORPORATION, KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., LUCY ACTIVEWEAR, INC., MICHAELS STORES, INC., NORDSTROM, INC., OLD NAVY, INC., OLD NAVY, LLC, PETSMART STORE SUPPORT GROUP, INC., PETSMART, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Kohl's Corp, #2 Kohl's Department Stores, #3 Lucy Activewear Inc, #4 Michaels Stores Inc, #5 Nordstrom Inc, #6 Old Navy Inc, #7 Old Navy LLC, #8 Petsmart Inc, #9 Petsmart Store Support Group)(ehs, )
January 6, 2011 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to CHRISTIAN DIOR BOUTIQUES, INC., CHRISTIAN DIOR PERFUMES, LLC D/B/A CHRISTIAN DIOR D/B/A DIOR D/B/A DIOR.COM, CRAFTMASTER MANUFACTURING, INC. D/B/A CRAFTMASTER D/B/A CMI, DOLLAR TREE, INC., FOOT LOCKER RETAIL, INC., FOOT LOCKER, INC., FOOTLOCKER.COM, INC., GAMESTOP CORP., GEOFFREY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Christian Dior Perfules LLC, #2 Craftmaster Mfg, #3 Dollar Tree, #4 Foot Locker Inc, #5 Foot Locker Retail, #6 Footlocker.com, #7 Gamestop Corp, #8 Geoffrey LLC)(ehs, )
January 6, 2011 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to ASICS AMERICA CORP., AVON PRODUCTS, INC., BBY SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST BUY CO., INC. D/B/A BEST BUY, BROOKSTONE COMPANY, INC., BROWN JORDAN INTERNATIONAL, INC. D/B/A BROWN JORDAN, CARTIER ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Avon, #2 BBY Solutions, #3 Best Buy, #4 Brookstone, #5 Brown Jordan Intern'l, #6 Cartier Enterprises, #7 Cartier)(ehs, )
December 20, 2010 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GEOTAG, INC. (Schlather, Stephen)
December 20, 2010 Judge T. John Ward added. (ehs, )
December 20, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ehs, )
December 18, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen F Schlather on behalf of GEOTAG, INC. (Schlather, Stephen)
December 17, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACADEMY, LTD. D/B/A ACADEMY SPORTS OUTDOORS D/B/A ACADEMY SPORTS AND OUTDOORS, ADIDAS AMERICA, INC., AROMATIQUE, INC., ASICS AMERICA CORP., AVON PRODUCTS, INC., BBY SOLUTIONS, INC., BEST BUY CO., INC. D/B/A BEST BUY, BJI, INC. D/B/A BROWN JORDAN, BROOKSTONE COMPANY, INC., BROWN JORDAN INTERNATIONAL, INC. D/B/A BROWN JORDAN, CARTIER ENTERPRISES, INC., CARTIER INTERNATIONAL, LLC, CARTIER NORTH AMERICA, INC., CARTIER, INC., CHRISTIAN DIOR BOUTIQUES, INC., CHRISTIAN DIOR PERFUMES, INC. D/B/A CHRISTIAN DIOR D/B/A DIOR D/B/A DIOR.COM, CHRISTIAN DIOR PERFUMES, LLC D/B/A CHRISTIAN DIOR D/B/A DIOR D/B/A DIOR.COM, CRAFTMASTER MANUFACTURING, INC. D/B/A CRAFTMASTER D/B/A CMI, DOLLAR TREE, INC., FOOT LOCKER RETAIL, INC., FOOT LOCKER, INC., FOOTLOCKER.COM, INC., GAMESTOP CORP., GANDER MOUNTAIN COMPANY, GEOFFREY, LLC, HINKLEY LIGHTING, INC., KAY JEWELERS, INC., KOHL'S CORPORATION, KOHL'S DEPARTMENT STORES, INC., KOHL'S ILLINOIS, INC., LUCY ACTIVEWEAR, INC., MICHAELS STORES, INC., NORDSTROM, INC., OLD NAVY (APPAREL), LLC, OLD NAVY, INC., OLD NAVY, LLC, OSCAR DE LA RENTA, LTD, PETSMART STORE SUPPORT GROUP, INC., PETSMART, INC., ROLEX WATCH USA, INC., SEVEN FOR ALL MANKIND, LLC, STERLING JEWELERS, INC. D/B/A JARED THE GALLERIA OF JEWELRY D/B/A KAY JEWELERS, TARGET CORP., THE TJX COMPANIES, INC. D/B/A TJ MAXX, TOYS"R"US, INC., VAN CLEEF & ARPELS, INC., VF CORP. D/B/A 7 FOR ALL MANKIND D/B/A 7FAM D/B/A SEVEN JEANS D/B/A LUCY ACTIVEWEAR, VF JEANSWEAR, L.P. D/B/A WRANGLER, VF OUTDOOR, INC. D/B/A THE NORTH FACE, VICTORIA'S SECRET STORES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2808065.), filed by GEOTAG, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Edmonds, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GeoTag Inc v. Aromatique Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adidas America Inc
Represented By: Matias Ferrario
Represented By: Geoffrey K Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Illinois Inc
Represented By: Derek Scott Neilson
Represented By: Adam David Swain
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Represented By: Alan Lee Whitehurst
Represented By: Kamran Jivani
Represented By: Jane J Du
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Stores Inc
Represented By: Michael J Zinna
Represented By: Robert Gerald Graham
Represented By: Patrick R. Colsher
Represented By: John F Ward
Represented By: Matthew C Berntsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores Inc
Represented By: Derek Scott Neilson
Represented By: Adam David Swain
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Represented By: Alan Lee Whitehurst
Represented By: Kamran Jivani
Represented By: Jane J Du
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Inc
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Robert R Baron, Jr
Represented By: Wasif H Qureshi
Represented By: Jane J Du
Represented By: Charley F Brown
Represented By: Andrew M Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foot Locker Inc
Represented By: Benjamin Hershkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Corporation
Represented By: Derek Scott Neilson
Represented By: Adam David Swain
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Represented By: Alan Lee Whitehurst
Represented By: Kamran Jivani
Represented By: Jane J Du
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolex Watch USA Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey E Dupler
Represented By: David H. T. Kane
Represented By: Steven F Meyer
Represented By: Brian W Brokate
Represented By: Roy William Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Cingular Wireless Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBY Solutions Inc
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: Rickey Lawrence Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Cleef & Arpels Inc
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Wasif H Qureshi
Represented By: Jane J Du
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey LLC
Represented By: Michael C Chow
Represented By: Thomas J Gray
Represented By: Benjamin S Lin
Represented By: Hardip Brar Passananti
Represented By: Mark P Wine
Represented By: Lance Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven For All Mandkind LLC
Represented By: Jason C Kravitz
Represented By: Russell J Genet
Represented By: Jodi Rosen Wine
Represented By: Michael Ecuyer Schonberg
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Wasif H Qureshi
Represented By: Jane J Du
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Bruce S Sostek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gamestop Corp
Represented By: Derek Scott Neilson
Represented By: Adam David Swain
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Kamran Jivani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy LLC
Represented By: Jason C Kravitz
Represented By: Russell J Genet
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Jodi Rosen Wine
Represented By: Nicholas G Papastavros
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: David Kent Wooten
Represented By: Christopher Needham Cravey
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VF Corporation doing business as 7 For All Mankind doing business as 7 Fam doing business as Seven Jeans doing business as Lucy Activewear Inc
Represented By: Jason C Kravitz
Represented By: Russell J Genet
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr
Represented By: Daniel J Schwartz
Represented By: Jodi Rosen Wine
Represented By: Michael Ecuyer Schonberg
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Bruce S Sostek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria's Secret Direct Brand Management LLC
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Michael J Zinna
Represented By: Robert Gerald Graham
Represented By: Patrick R. Colsher
Represented By: John F Ward
Represented By: Matthew C Berntsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Footlocker.com Inc
Represented By: Benjamin Hershkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gander Mountain Company
Represented By: Dean Franklin
Represented By: Anthony F Blum
Represented By: Matthew A Braunel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Jewelers Inc doing business as Jared The Galleria Of Jewelry doing business as Kay Jewelers
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Wasif H Qureshi
Represented By: Jane J Du
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Activewear Inc
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr
Represented By: Bruce S Sostek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Jason C Kravitz
Represented By: Russell J Genet
Represented By: Chad Christian Walters
Represented By: Jodi Rosen Wine
Represented By: Christopher Wood Kennerly
Represented By: Benjamin R Johnson
Represented By: Timothy S Durst
Represented By: Susan Cannon Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petsmart Store Support Group Inc
Represented By: Michael C Chow
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Thomas J Gray
Represented By: Benjamin S Lin
Represented By: Hardip Brar Passananti
Represented By: Mark P Wine
Represented By: Lance Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinkley Lighting Inc
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Antoinette M Tease
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Jane J Du
Represented By: Eric C Wiedemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aromatique Inc
Represented By: Nathan Allen Engels
Represented By: Mark David Taylor
Represented By: Brian Charles McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corp
Represented By: Jason C Kravitz
Represented By: Russell J Genet
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Jodi Rosen Wine
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: David Kent Wooten
Represented By: Christopher Needham Cravey
Represented By: Richard Trevor Carter
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michaels Stores Inc
Represented By: Derek Scott Neilson
Represented By: Adam David Swain
Represented By: Daniel J Schwartz
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Represented By: Kamran Jivani
Represented By: Matthew A Werber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petsmart Inc
Represented By: Michael C Chow
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Thomas J Gray
Represented By: Benjamin S Lin
Represented By: Hardip Brar Passananti
Represented By: Mark P Wine
Represented By: Lance Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VF Outdoor Inc doing business as The North Face
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr
Represented By: Daniel J Schwartz
Represented By: Michael Ecuyer Schonberg
Represented By: Matthew A Werber
Represented By: Bruce S Sostek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The TJX Companies Inc doing business as TJ Maxx
Represented By: Derek Scott Neilson
Represented By: Adam David Swain
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Represented By: Kamran Jivani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Dior Boutiques Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Co Inc doing business as Best Buy
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: Rickey Lawrence Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avon Products Inc
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr
Represented By: James Matthew Rowan
Represented By: Ashley N Pate
Represented By: Clyde Moody Siebman
Represented By: Allison H Altersohn
Represented By: Laura S Huffman
Represented By: Jonathan D Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Jewelers Inc
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jane J Du
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Dior Perfumes Inc doing business as Dior doing business as Dior.com doing business as Christian Dior
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Avelyn Marie Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy (Apparel) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toys "R" Us Inc
Represented By: Michael C Chow
Represented By: Thomas J Gray
Represented By: Joseph J Richetti
Represented By: Benjamin S Lin
Represented By: Thomas Jameson Adair
Represented By: Hardip Brar Passananti
Represented By: Mark P Wine
Represented By: Lance Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJI Inc doing business as Brown Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cartier Inc
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookstone Company Inc
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Antoinette M Tease
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Wasif H Qureshi
Represented By: Jane J Du
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cartier North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Academy LTD doing business as Academy Sports Outdoors doing business as Academy Sports and Ourdoors
Represented By: Jason C Kravitz
Represented By: Russell J Genet
Represented By: Casey Lee Griffith
Represented By: Jodi Rosen Wine
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Darin Michael Klemchuk
Represented By: Kirby Blair Drake
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foot Locker Retail Inc
Represented By: Benjamin Hershkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BestBuy.com LLC
Represented By: Paul J Robbennolt
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Represented By: Patrick Premo
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Brian Edwin Lahti
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: Charlene M Morrow
Represented By: Rickey Lawrence Faulkner
Represented By: David Kent Wooten
Represented By: Logan James Drew
Represented By: Christopher Needham Cravey
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Emmett J McMahon
Represented By: Hector Ribera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASICS America Corp
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Wasif H Qureshi
Represented By: Jane J Du
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cartier Enterprises Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc doing business as Craftmaster doing business as CMI
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Antoinette M Tease
Represented By: John George Bisbikis
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Avani C Macaluso
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VF Jeanswear LP doing business as Wrangler
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr
Represented By: Daniel J Schwartz
Represented By: Michael Ecuyer Schonberg
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Bruce S Sostek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown Jordan International Inc doing business as Brown Jordan
Represented By: Daniel Alan Noteware, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Ury Fischer
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richemont North America Inc doing business as Cartier
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jane J Du
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Dior Perfumes LLC doing business as Dior doing business as Dior.com doing business as Christian Dior
Represented By: Srinivas Giriraj Pathmanaban
Represented By: Willem G Schuurman
Represented By: James Daniel Shead
Represented By: Patrick Doll
Represented By: Meredith Joelle Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Avelyn Marie Ross
Represented By: Ajeet P Pai
Represented By: Deirdre Marie Dorval
Represented By: Christopher G Granaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cartier International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar De La Renta LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services Inc.
Represented By: Jason C Kravitz
Represented By: Russell J Genet
Represented By: Jodi Rosen Wine
Represented By: Timothy S Durst
Represented By: Susan Cannon Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom Inc
Represented By: Jason C Kravitz
Represented By: Russell J Genet
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Jodi Rosen Wine
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: David Kent Wooten
Represented By: Mark Thomas Garrett
Represented By: Christopher Needham Cravey
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Navy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: VF Corporation
Represented By: Michael Ecuyer Schonberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Academy LTD
Represented By: Jason C Kravitz
Represented By: Casey Lee Griffith
Represented By: Jodi Rosen Wine
Represented By: Darin Michael Klemchuk
Represented By: Kirby Blair Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Richemont North America Inc
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: VF Outdoor Inc
Represented By: Michael Ecuyer Schonberg
Represented By: Matthew A Werber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Sterling Jewelers Inc
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: VF Jeanswear LP
Represented By: Michael Ecuyer Schonberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Brown Jordan International Inc
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Ury Fischer
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Best Buy Co Inc
Represented By: Brian K Buss
Represented By: Danny Lloyd Williams
Represented By: Terry D Morgan
Represented By: Michael Aaron Benefield
Represented By: Rickey Lawrence Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: The TJX Companies Inc
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Christian Dior Perfumes LLC
Represented By: Srinivas Giriraj Pathmanaban
Represented By: Willem G Schuurman
Represented By: Avelyn Marie Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: CraftMaster Manufacturing Inc
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Antoinette M Tease
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Avani C Macaluso
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: iCIMS, Inc.
Represented By: David Kent Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GeoTag Inc
Represented By: Kevin Martin Pasquinelli
Represented By: Andrew W. Spangler
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: Charles Craig Tadlock
Represented By: Daniel S Mount
Represented By: John J Edmonds
Represented By: L. Charles Van Cleef
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: Keith Bryan Smiley
Represented By: Joel W Reese
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Represented By: Mark John Zimmermann
Represented By: Timothy Tiewei Wang
Represented By: David R Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Keyzer
Represented By: David Michael Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?