WI-LAN Inc. v. HTC Corporation et al
Plaintiff: WI-LAN Inc.
Defendant: HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc. and Exedea,Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00068
Filed: February 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 649 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; granting and denying in part 635 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER FRCP 50(B) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL UNDER FRCP 59 filed by WI-LAN Inc. Accordingly, the Court hereby VACATES the portion of the Judgment (Dkt. No. 628 ) that found claims 1 and 10 of the '802 patent to be invalid. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/2/14. (mrm, )
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 445 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/17/2013. (ch, )
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/11/2013. (ch, )
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION Granting In Part Dell's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement of Non-Infringement (filed in 2:12cv600, #192). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/25/2013. (sm, )
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Dft's motion to transfer venue is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/27/2012. (ch, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WI-LAN Inc. v. HTC Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WI-LAN Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exedea,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?