Lodsys, LLC v. Combay, Inc. et al Featured Case

Lodsys, LLC alleged that Defendants Combay, Inc. (Mega Poker Online Texas Holdem for iPhone), Iconfactory, Inc. (Twitterific for iPhone, iPad and Mac), Illusion Labs AB (Labyrinth for iPhone and Android), Shovelmate (69 Positions for iPhone), Quickoffice (Quickoffice Connect for iPhone), Richard Shinderman (Hearts and Daggers for iPhone) and Wulven Game Studios (Shadow Era for iPhone) infringed Claim 27 of U.S. Patent No. 7,620,565 entitled "Customer-Based Product Design Module" and Claims 1-24 of U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078 entitled "Methods and Systems for Gathering Information from Units of a Commodity Across a Network."

Plaintiff: Lodsys, LLC
Defendant: Combay, Inc., Iconfactory, Inc., Illusion Labs AB, Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate, Quickoffice, Inc., Richard Shinderman and Wulven Game Studios
Intervenor_defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00272
Filed: May 31, 2011
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/12. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Court's scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. Court adjourned.(Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (jml)
August 29, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne.: Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/12. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
August 21, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, FILED IN WRONG CASE (MUST BE FILED IN LEAD CASE ONLY). Document # 145, Answer. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
August 20, 2012 145 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint, by Illusion Labs AB.(Findlay, Michael) Modified on 8/21/2012 (sm, ).
August 20, 2012 ***ALL PARTIES ARE INSTRUCTED TO FILE ANY FUTURE FILINGS (EXCEPT RELATING TO VENUE) IN THE LEAD CASE 2:11-CV-90*** (ch, )
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order 144 ORDER - the above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:11- cv-90. All parties are instructed to file any future motions (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ordered to meet-and-confer following the upcoming August 29, 2012 scheduling conference to discuss the entry of uniform docket control, protective and discovery orders, which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. The local rules page limitations for Markman briefs and other motions will apply to the consolidated case. To further promote judicial economy and to conserve the parties resources, the Court encourages the parties to file a notice with the Court in the event that there are other related cases currently pending on the Courts docket that may also be appropriate for consolidation with this case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/17/2012. (ch, )
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order 143 ORDER granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for Lodsys to comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 is extended to Monday, September 17, 2012, and the deadline for defendants to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 is extended to Monday, December 10, 2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/9/12. (ehs, )
August 9, 2012 142 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quickoffice, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Google Inc. for Quickoffice, Inc.. (Banner, Brian)
August 8, 2012 141 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Re: (Dkt. 129) Certain Discovery Deadlines by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
August 7, 2012 140 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lowell D Jacobson for Quickoffice, Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-9888) (bsw, )
August 1, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Illusion Labs AB to 8/20/2012. 19 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 1, 2012 139 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Illusion Labs AB.(Findlay, Eric).
July 27, 2012 138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order 137 ORDER granting 136 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Craig Tadlock terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on July 23, 2012. (jrg1, )
July 20, 2012 136 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Craig Tadlock) by Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
July 19, 2012 135 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Thomas Weingaertner on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Weingaertner, Scott)
July 19, 2012 134 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert F Perry on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Perry, Robert)
July 19, 2012 133 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Charles Carnaval on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Carnaval, Christopher)
July 19, 2012 132 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Christopher Banner on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Banner, Brian)
July 19, 2012 131 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Jones, Michael)
July 19, 2012 130 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order 129 ORDER - Status Conference set for 8/29/2012 10:15 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/17/2012. (ch, )
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order 128 ORDER granting 126 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Combay, Inc. with prejudice. All attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/5/12. (ehs, )
June 1, 2012 127 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kit W Roth (Roth, Kit)
May 31, 2012 126 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Combay by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
May 21, 2012 125 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group LLC. Rovio Mobile Ltd served on 4/13/2012, answer due 7/13/2012. (ehs, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2012: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (ehs, ).
May 21, 2012 124 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group LLC. Square Enix Ltd. served on 4/23/2012, answer due 7/23/2012. (ehs, )
May 21, 2012 123 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group LLC. Illusion Labs AB served on 5/2/2012, answer due 8/1/2012. (ehs, )
May 18, 2012 122 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kit W Roth for Lodsys Group LLC (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1097) (bsw, )
May 18, 2012 121 Plaintiff's Original ANSWER to 118 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
May 18, 2012 120 Plaintiff's Original ANSWER to 111 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
May 14, 2012 119 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Square Enix Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Square Enix Holdings Co., Ltd. for Square Enix Ltd.. (Barsky, Wayne)
May 14, 2012 118 Square Enix Ltd.'s ANSWER to Complaint , Amended (D.I. 26), Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM S against Lodsys Group LLC by Square Enix Ltd..(Barsky, Wayne)
May 14, 2012 117 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rose Pezzano on behalf of Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd. (Pezzano, Amanda)
May 14, 2012 116 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer J Rho on behalf of Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd. (Rho, Jennifer)
May 14, 2012 115 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C Lo on behalf of Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd. (Lo, Jason)
May 14, 2012 114 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wayne M Barsky on behalf of Rovio Mobile Ltd, Square Enix Ltd. (Barsky, Wayne)
May 4, 2012 113 Plaintiff's Original ANSWER to 107 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys Group LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
May 4, 2012 112 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rovio Mobile Ltd identifying Corporate Parent Trema International Holdings BV for Rovio Mobile Ltd. (Barsky, Wayne)
May 4, 2012 111 Rovio Entertainment Ltd.'s ANSWER to Complaint , Amended (D.I. 26), Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM S against Lodsys Group LLC by Rovio Mobile Ltd.(Barsky, Wayne)
May 1, 2012 110 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Craig Tadlock (Tadlock, Charles)
April 13, 2012 108 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
April 13, 2012 107 APPLE INC.'s ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys Group LLC by Apple, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
April 13, 2012 106 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kirby Blair Drake on behalf of Combay, Inc. (Drake, Kirby)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order 105 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER - Apple has satisfied each of the four requirements for intervention as a matter of right under Rule 24(a)(2). The Court finds that permissive intervention is also appropriate under Rule 24(b). To avoid any potential prejudice to Lodsys rights under the License Agreement such intervention shall be and is hereby limited to the issues of license and patent exhaustion. Apples Motion to Intervene is GRANTED-IN-PART to the extent and as specified herein. Motions terminated: 4 MOTION to Intervene filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/12/12. (ehs, ) Modified on 4/12/2012 (ch, ).
April 3, 2012 104 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Rose Pezzano on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Pezzano, Amanda)
March 8, 2012 103 SUMMONS Issued as to Rovio Mobile Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Square Enix Ltd)(ch, )
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order 102 ORDER granting 101 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff Lodsys Group, LLC and Defendant Iconfactory, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees, expenses, and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/7/12. (ehs, )
March 6, 2012 101 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Iconfactory, Inc., with Prejudice by Lodsys Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
March 6, 2012 100 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys Group LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings Group, LLC for Lodsys Group LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
March 6, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 4 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing previously set for 3/13/2012 10:00 AM is RESET for 4/4/2012 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
March 5, 2012 99 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey E Ostrow for Apple, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-954) (ehs, )
March 1, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 4 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2012 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (bga, )
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order 98 ORDER denying as moot 85 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/21/2012. (ch, )
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order 97 ORDER granting 96 Motion to Substitute Party. Lodsys Group, LLC is substituted for Lodsys, LLC for all purposes in this action, including as plaintiff and counterclaim defendant. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/9/12. (ehs, )
February 7, 2012 96 MOTION to Substitute Party by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
January 31, 2012 95 NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Assignment and Intent to File Motion to Substitute (Huck, Christopher)
December 20, 2011 Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap re: misc order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (rvw, )
December 8, 2011 94 AMENDED ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to 26 Amended Complaint, by Combay, Inc..(ehs, )
December 2, 2011 93 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Iconfactory, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Iconfactory, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
December 2, 2011 92 ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint, by Iconfactory, Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order 91 ORDER granting 90 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Iconfactory, Inc. be given to December 2, 2011 to answer,. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/29/11. (ehs, )
November 23, 2011 90 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 26 Amended Complaint, by Iconfactory, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
November 9, 2011 NOTICE - modified # 89, to link to # 82 also per request from attorney (ch, )
November 9, 2011 89 Plaintiff Lodsys Original ANSWER to 80 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, 82 AMENDED ANSWER of Defendant Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc., by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 11/9/2011 (ch, ).
November 9, 2011 88 Plaintiff Lodsys Original ANSWER to 78 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Atari Interactive, Inc., by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
November 9, 2011 87 Plaintiff Lodsys Original ANSWER to 76 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Electronic Arts, Inc. by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
October 28, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Iconfactory, Inc. to 11/25/2011. (ch, )
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order 86 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Iconfactory, Inc. deadline is 11/25/201. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/28/2011. (ch, )
October 27, 2011 85 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Combay, Inc.. (ehs, )
October 25, 2011 84 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 26 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Iconfactory, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
October 20, 2011 83 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Barsky, Wayne)
October 20, 2011 82 AMENDED ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.. (Barsky, Wayne)
October 19, 2011 81 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Barsky, Wayne)
October 19, 2011 80 Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc.'s ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..(Barsky, Wayne) Modified on 10/20/2011 to add Software to defts title(ehs, ).
October 19, 2011 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atari Interactive, Inc. (Barsky, Wayne)
October 19, 2011 78 Atari Interactive, Inc.'s ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Atari Interactive, Inc..(Barsky, Wayne)
October 19, 2011 77 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (Barsky, Wayne)
October 19, 2011 76 Electronic Arts Inc.'s ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Electronic Arts Inc..(Barsky, Wayne)
October 19, 2011 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer J Rho on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Rho, Jennifer)
October 19, 2011 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason C Lo on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Lo, Jason)
October 19, 2011 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wayne M Barsky on behalf of Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. (Barsky, Wayne)
October 14, 2011 72 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Combay, Inc. served on 10/6/2011, answer due 10/27/2011. (baf, )
October 14, 2011 71 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Combay, Inc. served on 10/6/2011 by serving Marshall F Trotter who is designated by law to accept service on behalf of Combay Inc, Keller, Texas by Process Server Fred L Svidlow, answer due 10/27/2011. (ehs, )
October 12, 2011 70 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Combay, Inc. served on 9/27/2011, answer due 10/18/2011. (ehs, )
October 12, 2011 69 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Lodsys, LLC as to Combay, Inc.. returned unclaimed # 1 unclaimed, # 2 unclaimed) (ehs, ).
October 10, 2011 68 NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Dismissal of Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate (Huck, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
October 6, 2011 67 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Combay, Inc.. (ehs, )
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order 66 MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10-3-11. (jml, )
September 30, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Iconfactory, Inc. to 10/26/2011. (ch, )
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order 65 ORDER granting 62 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Iconfactory, Inc deadline is extended to 10/26/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/30/2011. (ch, )
September 27, 2011 64 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Combay, Inc.. (ch, )
September 26, 2011 63 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Atari Interactive, Inc. served on 9/26/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent, answer due 10/17/2011. (ehs, )
September 26, 2011 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 26 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Iconfactory, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
September 23, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate to 9/23/2011. (ch, )
September 23, 2011 Opinion or Order 61 ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Michael G. Karr deadline is 9/23/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/23/2011. (ch, )
September 21, 2011 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 26 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order 59 ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Atari Interactive, Inc deadline is extended to 10/19/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/20/2011. (ch, )
September 19, 2011 58 ANSWER to 48 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Lodsys, LLC.(Huck, Christopher)
September 19, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Atari Interactive, Inc. to 10/17/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
September 16, 2011 57 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Atari Interactive, Inc..( Barsky, Wayne)
September 15, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Electronic Arts Inc. to 10/16/2011. (ch, )
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order 56 ORDER granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Electronic Arts Inc deadline is extended to 10/19/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/15/2011. (ch, )
September 15, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. to 10/19/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
September 15, 2011 55 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 26 Amended Complaint, by Atari Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barsky, Wayne)
September 14, 2011 54 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc..( Barsky, Wayne)
September 14, 2011 53 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barsky, Wayne)
September 9, 2011 52 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Take-Two Interactive Software, Inc. served on 8/29/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Company d/b/a CSC, answer due 9/19/2011. (ehs, )
September 9, 2011 51 Summons Returned Unexecuted on 9/6/11 by Lodsys, LLC as to Illusion Labs AB. (ehs, ).
September 7, 2011 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quickoffice, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles)
August 31, 2011 49 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Electronic Arts Inc. served on 8/26/2011 by CM RRR, answer due 9/16/2011. (ehs, )
August 29, 2011 48 Quickoffice's ANSWER to 26 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lodsys, LLC by Quickoffice, Inc..(Tadlock, Charles)
August 24, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Iconfactory, Inc. to 9/26/2011. (ch, )
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order 47 ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Iconfactory Inc deadline is extended to 9/26/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/24/2011. (ch, )
August 24, 2011 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 26 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Iconfactory, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
August 23, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Quickoffice, Inc. to 8/29/2011. (ehs, )
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order 45 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Quickoffice, Inc. has until August 29, 2011 in which to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/23/11. (ehs, )
August 23, 2011 44 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate to 9/21/2011. (ehs, )
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order 43 ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate be given to and including September 21, 2011 to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/23/11. (ehs, )
August 22, 2011 42 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Atari Interactive, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Electronics Arts Inc, # 2 Take-Two Interactive Software Inc)(ch, )
August 19, 2011 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 26 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
August 18, 2011 40 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION to Intervene filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
August 18, 2011 39 SEALED SURREPLY TO REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion re 4 MOTION to Intervene filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
August 16, 2011 38 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
August 9, 2011 37 NOTICE by Atari Interactive, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., Square Enix Ltd. re 4 MOTION to Intervene (Statement in Support of Apple's Motion to Intervene) (Barsky, Wayne)
August 8, 2011 36 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION to Intervene filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
August 8, 2011 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re 4 MOTION to Intervene - Apple Inc.'s Redacted Reply In Support of Motion to Intervene - filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
August 3, 2011 34 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Lodsys, LLC as to Combay, Inc.. Summons returned unclaimed and returned to sender on 7/21/11 (ehs, )
August 1, 2011 33 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Combay, Inc.. (ch, )
July 29, 2011 32 NOTICE by Lodsys, LLC of Dismissal of Defendant Richard Shinderman without Prejudice (Huck, Christopher)
July 28, 2011 31 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 30 Sealed Response to Motion.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Opposition, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
July 28, 2011 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 29 Response in Opposition to Motion. Clerk has modified entry to reflect that this document (response) is a REDACTED version. (Complete version filed separately under seal) (sm, )
July 27, 2011 30 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 4 MOTION to Intervene filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Huck, Christopher)
July 27, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 28, response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
July 27, 2011 29 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 28 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***REDACTED RESPONSE in Opposition re 4 MOTION to Intervene filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Opposition, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 7/27/2011 (ehs, ). Modified on 7/28/2011 (sm, ).
July 27, 2011 28 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 29 ***RESPONSE in Opposition re 4 MOTION to Intervene filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 7/27/2011 (ehs, ).
July 26, 2011 27 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 4 MOTION to Intervene - Supplemental Declaration of Jonathan C. Sanders in Further Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Intervene - (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit - Declaration of Jonathan C. Sanders, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jonathan C. Sanders, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jonathan C. Sanders)(Smith, Melissa)
July 21, 2011 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against Combay, Inc., Iconfactory, Inc., Illusion Labs AB, Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate, Quickoffice, Inc., Richard Shinderman, Wulven Game Studios, filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Huck, Christopher)
July 18, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG DATE ADDED Document # 24, Sealed Summons. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
July 18, 2011 25 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Richard Shinderman served on 7/7/2011, answer due 7/28/2011. (ch, )
July 18, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Richard Shinderman. (ch, )
July 18, 2011 24 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Richard Shinderman served on 6/7/2011 by CM RRR, answer due 6/28/2011. (ehs, ) Modified on 7/18/2011 (ch, ).
July 18, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate to 8/20/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
July 18, 2011 23 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate.(Findlay, Eric).
July 15, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Quickoffice, Inc. to 8/20/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
July 15, 2011 22 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Quickoffice, Inc. (to 8/20/2011).(Tadlock, Charles)
July 15, 2011 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Craig Tadlock on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles)
July 15, 2011 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
July 14, 2011 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Illusion Labs AB. (ch, )
July 12, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Iconfactory, Inc. to 8/25/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
July 12, 2011 18 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Iconfactory, Inc.(Findlay, Eric).
July 11, 2011 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Iconfactory, Inc. served on 7/5/2011 by CM RRR on Registered Agent, answer due 7/26/2011. (ehs, )
July 8, 2011 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys, LLC. Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate served by CM RRR on 6/30/2011, answer due 7/21/2011; Quickoffice, Inc. served on 6/30/2011, answer due 7/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Quickoffice)(ehs, )
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 4 MOTION to Intervene Responses due by 7/27/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/27/2011. (ch, )
June 22, 2011 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Apple Inc.'s Motion to Intervene by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher)
June 22, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 13, Motion for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 21, 2011 13 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Apple Inc's Motion to Intervene by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 6/22/2011 (ch, ).
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Seal Document Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jonathan C. Sanders in Support of Apples Motion to Intervene shall be maintained under seal. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/21/2011. (ch, )
June 17, 2011 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Combay, Inc., Iconfactory, Inc., Illusion Labs AB, Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate, Quickoffice, Inc., Richard Shinderman, Wulven Game Studios. (Attachments: # 1 Iconfactory, # 2 Illusion Labs, # 3 Michael Karr, # 4 Quickoffice, # 5 Shindermann, # 6 Combay)(ehs, )
June 17, 2011 10 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jonathan C Sanders for Apple, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-3599. (ch, )
June 17, 2011 9 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney George M Newcombe for Apple, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-3600. (ch, )
June 15, 2011 8 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher M Huck for Lodsys, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-567) (ehs, )
June 15, 2011 7 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Goldfarb for Lodsys, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-567) (ehs, )
June 9, 2011 6 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Exhibit A to Sanders Declartaion in Support of Main Document: 4 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Sanders Declaration)(Findlay, Eric)
June 9, 2011 5 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit A to Sanders Declaration in Support of Apple Inc.'s Motion to Intervene by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
June 9, 2011 4 MOTION to Intervene by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Answer and Counterclaims, # 3 Affidavit of Sanders, # 4 Exhibit B to Sanders Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Sanders Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Sanders Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Sanders Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F to Sanders Declaration)(Findlay, Eric)
June 1, 2011 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
June 1, 2011 Case assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
May 31, 2011 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William)
May 31, 2011 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings, LLC for Lodsys, LLC. (Davis, William)
May 31, 2011 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Combay, Inc., Iconfactory, Inc., Illusion Labs AB, Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate, Quickoffice, Inc., Richard Shinderman, Wulven Game Studios ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3057445.), filed by Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,620,565, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lodsys, LLC v. Combay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodsys, LLC
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Represented By: Michael A Goldfarb
Represented By: Christopher M Huck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Combay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iconfactory, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illusion Labs AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Karr d/b/a Shovelmate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quickoffice, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Shinderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wulven Game Studios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: George M Newcombe
Represented By: Jonathan C Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?