NovelPoint Security LLC v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: NovelPoint Security LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv00112
Filed: March 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, Apple Inc terminated., GRANTS 21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc. Pursuant to Settlement filed by NovelPoint Security LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 10/9/2012. (sm, )
October 4, 2012 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Apple Inc. Pursuant to Settlement by NovelPoint Security LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - final motion to dismiss should be submitted in 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 9/7/2012. (ch, )
September 6, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE of Settlement Between NovelPoint and Apple by NovelPoint Security LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
August 20, 2012 ***ALL PARTIES ARE INSTRUCTED TO FILE ANY FUTURE FILINGS (EXCEPT RELATING TO VENUE) IN THE LEAD CASE 2:12-CV-100*** (ch, )
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER the above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:12-cv-100. All parties are instructed to file any future motions (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 8/17/2012. (ch, ) Modified on 9/11/2012 (ch, ).
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Deadline for NovelPoint to comply with Local Patent Rules 3-1 and 3-2 is hereby extended, up to and including September 12, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne on 8/16/12. (ehs, )
August 15, 2012 Filing 16 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to Comply with P.R. 3-1 And 3-2) by NovelPoint Security LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/3/2012. (ch, )
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/29/2012 09:30 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/16/12. (bas)
June 25, 2012 Filing 13 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney, Celine Jimenez Crowson for Apple Inc. $100 Pro Hac Vice fee paid, Receipt no. 2-1166. (dlc, )
June 15, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clayton C James on behalf of Apple Inc (James, Clayton)
June 15, 2012 Filing 11 DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND, COUNTERCLAIM against NovelPoint Security LLC by Apple Inc.(Smith, Melissa)
June 13, 2012 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc identifying Corporate Parent None for Apple Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
May 16, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple Inc to 6/15/2012. (ch, )
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Apple Inc deadline is extended to 6/15/2012. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF TIME TO ANSWER SHALL BE GRANTED ABSENT A SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE. GOOD CAUSE SHALL NOT BE MET SIMPLY BECAUSE THE EXTENSION IS UNOPPOSED OR AGREED TO. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/15/2012. (ch, )
May 11, 2012 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 1, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Craig Tadlock (Tadlock, Charles)
April 27, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NovelPoint Security LLC. Apple Inc served on 3/26/2012, answer due 5/16/2012. (ehs, )
April 11, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc to 5/16/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
April 10, 2012 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Smith, Melissa)
March 13, 2012 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (ehs, )
March 13, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ehs, )
March 12, 2012 Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. (ehs, )
March 9, 2012 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NovelPoint Security LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
March 9, 2012 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles)
March 9, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3484924.), filed by NovelPoint Security LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (562 Patent), # 2 Exhibit B (635 Patent), # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadlock, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NovelPoint Security LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NovelPoint Security LLC
Represented By: Charles Craig Tadlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?