TiVo Inc. v. Cisco Systems, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: TiVo Inc.
Defendant: Time Warner Cable
Consolidated Plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Robert W Faulkner and David Keyzer
Case Number: 2:2012cv00311
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Motion to Dismiss. Case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/25/2013. (ch, )
July 25, 2013 Filing 90 Joint MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO RULE 41 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #88 Sealed Patent Motion for extension of deadlines. Deadlines set to 8/8/13. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/13. (ehs, )
July 12, 2013 Filing 88 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Modify the Docket Control Order by Cisco Systems, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #86 Sealed Patent Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/18/2013. (ch, )
June 17, 2013 Filing 86 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Modify the Docket Control Order by Cisco Systems, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 5, 2013 Filing 85 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable of PR 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Constructions, #2 Exhibit B - Tivo's Intrinsic and Extrinsic Evidence, #3 Exhibit C - Defs Intrinsic and Extrinsic Evidence)(Jones, Michael)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2013., Markman Hearing set for 7/31/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in limine due by 1/27/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/10/2014., Jury Selection set for 3/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2014 10:30 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/30/2013. (ch, )
May 29, 2013 Filing 83 Joint MOTION to Amend Docket Control Order by Cisco Systems, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
May 23, 2013 Filing 82 NOTICE by TiVo Inc. Of Compliance With P.R. 4-2 (Werner, Thomas)
May 23, 2013 Filing 81 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cisco Systems, Inc., Time Warner Cable regarding PR 4-2 Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying #68 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims and Request for Expedited Briefing. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/17/13. (mrm, )
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER appointing David Keyzer as technical advisor. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/16/13. (bas, )
May 16, 2013 Filing 78 NOTICE by TiVo Inc. Of Compliance With P.R 4-1(a) (Werner, Thomas)
May 15, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin Haber on behalf of TiVo Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4140574. (Haber, Benjamin)
May 15, 2013 Filing 76 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cisco Systems, Inc., Time Warner Cable regarding Compliance with PR 4-1 (Jones, Michael)
May 13, 2013 Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Answer and Counterclaims and Request for Expedited Briefing filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Lipner, Joseph)
May 8, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Karim Z Oussayef on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc., Time Warner Cable. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4130391. (Oussayef, Karim)
May 8, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ameet A Modi on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc., Time Warner Cable. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4130388. (Modi, Ameet)
May 8, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael P Stadnick on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc., Time Warner Cable. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4130370. (Stadnick, Michael)
May 8, 2013 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John M Desmarais on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc and Time Warner Cable. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4129207. (Desmarais, John)
April 23, 2013 Filing 70 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
April 23, 2013 Filing 69 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against TiVo Inc. by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US 7,505,592, #2 Exhibit B - US 7,409,140, #3 Exhibit C - US 7,512.315)(Jones, Michael)
April 23, 2013 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Answer and Counterclaims and Request for Expedited Briefing by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Mehra, #2 Exhibit A - tivo-premiere-4-quad-tuner-500gb-249, #3 Exhibit B - tivo-stream-transcoder, #4 Exhibit C - tivo-mini-review, #5 Exhibit D - tivo-mini-available-suddenlink-price, #6 Exhibit E - Microsoft v. TiVo_Dkt. No. 61, #7 Exhibit F - products_tivo-mini_index, #8 Exhibit G - products_tivo-stream_index, #9 Exhibit H - products_tivo-walkthrough_index, #10 Exhibit I - TiVo Premiere Viewers Guide, #11 Exhibit J - US Pat. No. 7,529,465, #12 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Leave, #13 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Request for Expedited Briefing)(Jones, Michael)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2013., Markman Hearing set for 7/31/2013 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in limine due by 1/27/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/10/2014., Jury Selection set for 3/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2014 10:30 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation deadline is 8/28/2013. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/1/2013. (ch, )
March 27, 2013 Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Docket Control Order by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
March 26, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Scott Geyer on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Geyer, Christopher)
February 26, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Audrey L Maness on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Maness, Audrey)
February 26, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amber Hatfield Rovner on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Rovner, Amber)
February 1, 2013 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Paul Davis on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Davis, Joshua)
January 31, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Rudis on behalf of Time Warner Cable. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3979079. (Rudis, Alexander)
December 18, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Third Party Verint Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No.1)(Race, Deborah)
December 18, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc. of Subpoena to Third Party Verizon Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. 1)(Race, Deborah)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Cisco Systems, Inc. v. TiVo Inc., Case No. 2:12-CV-434-JRG is consolidated into the currently pending action TiVo Inc. v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al., Case No. 2:12-CV-311-JRG. In light of the foregoing, the Court vacates the scheduling conference calendared for December 19, 2012 in Cisco Systems, Inc. v. TiVo Inc., Case No. 2:12-CV- 434-JRG. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/12. (ch, )
December 5, 2012 Filing 57 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Cisco Systems, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable. (Wells, Maclain) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2012: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2014 10:30 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 9/26/2012. Jury Selection set for 3/3/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation Completion due by 8/28/2013. Markman Hearing set for 7/31/2013 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/10/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/22/12. (mrm, )
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/22/12. (mrm, )
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/22/12. (mrm, )
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying #43 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Purposes and Request for a Joint Status Conference. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/22/12. (mrm, )
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Extension of Initial Disclosures Deadline. Deadline 10/29/12. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/15/12. (mrm, )
October 12, 2012 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery regarding Initial Disclosure Deadline by Cisco Systems, Inc., Time Warner Cable. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 10, 2012 Filing 50 NOTICE of Joinder by Time Warner Cable re #48 Response in Opposition to Motion and Time Warner Cable LLC in Cisco Systems' Opposition to Tivo's Motion to Consolidate For Pretrial Purposes and Request For a Joint Status Conference (Doan, Jennifer)
October 10, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED. Document # 49, Motion now TERMINATED. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 9, 2012 Filing 49 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION re #48 Response in Opposition to Motion (Joinder By Time Warner Cable, Inc. and Time Warner Cable LLC in Cisco Systems' Opposition) by Time Warner Cable. (Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 10/10/2012 (sm, ).
October 9, 2012 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Purposes and Request for a Joint Status Conference filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 28, 2012 Filing 47 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER (WITH DISPUTED PROVISIONS) by Cisco Systems, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit P-1, #6 Exhibit P-2, #7 Exhibit P-3, #8 Exhibit D-1, #9 Exhibit D-2, #10 Text of Proposed Order (TiVo Proposal), #11 Text of Proposed Order (Cisco/TWC Proposal))(Werner, Thomas)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective Order. Deadline is 9/28/2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/27/2012. (ch, )
September 26, 2012 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Cisco Systems, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Joint Motion for Extension to Submit Protective Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/21/2012. (ch, )
September 19, 2012 Filing 43 MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Purposes and Request for a Joint Status Conference by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Crawford)
September 19, 2012 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for Extension to Submit Protective Order by Cisco Systems, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Judge Robert Faulkner, JAMS, 8401 N. Central Expressway, Suite 610, Dallas, Texas 75225, telephone number 214/744- 5267 and fax number 214/720-6010, is hereby appointed as mediator. Deadline 8/28/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/17/2012. (ch, )
September 14, 2012 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Enter Docket Control Order (with Competing Proposals) by Cisco Systems, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order DCO with Competing Proposals)(Jones, Michael)
September 14, 2012 Filing 39 Joint MOTION To Enter Discovery Order (With Competing Proposals) by Cisco Systems, Inc., TiVo Inc., Time Warner Cable. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to file Protective Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/14/2012. (ch, )
September 12, 2012 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER, PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY ORDER by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 12, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE by TiVo Inc. JOINT NOTICE OF MEDIATOR (Baxter, Samuel)
August 29, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/12. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Court's scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. Court adjourned.(Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (jml)
August 29, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne.: Scheduling Conference held on 8/29/12. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. Court adjourned. (Court Reporter Susan Simmons.) (bga, )
August 29, 2012 Filing 35 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Talin Gordnia for TiVo Inc.. (pkb, )
August 28, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Morgan Chu on behalf of TiVo Inc. (Chu, Morgan)
August 27, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrei Iancu on behalf of TiVo Inc. (Iancu, Andrei)
August 22, 2012 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa L Hotze on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Hotze, Melissa)
August 22, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arjun H Mehra on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Mehra, Arjun)
August 21, 2012 Filing 34 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ben J Yorks for TiVo Inc. APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-10198. (ch, )
August 21, 2012 Filing 29 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas C Werner for TiVo Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID #2-1283) (bsw, )
August 14, 2012 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garret Wesley Chambers on behalf of TiVo Inc. (Chambers, Garret)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - court DENIES Dft's Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/13/2012. (ch, )
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER VACATING REFERRAL OF PRETRIAL MATTERS - VACATES the referral of this case to Judge Payne for pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/3/2012. (ch, )
July 20, 2012 Filing 25 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Change Venue filed by TiVo Inc.. (Lipner, Joseph)
July 18, 2012 Filing 24 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against General Instrument Corporation, Motorola Mobility, Inc., Time Warner Cable Inc., Time Warner Cable LLC by TiVo Inc.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(bas)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/18/12. Time Warner Cable will be added as a party to this case per law clark.(bas)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Status Conference set for 8/29/2012 10:15 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/17/2012. (ch, )
July 16, 2012 Filing 23 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Crawford Maclain Wells for TiVo Inc.. (pkb, )
July 13, 2012 Filing 20 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney, Richard Birnholz for TiVo Inc.. $100 Pro Hac Vice fee paid, Receipt No. 02-1204. (dlc, )
July 13, 2012 Filing 19 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney, Douglas Fretty for TiVo Inc.. $100 Pro Hac Vice fee paid, Receipt No. 2-1203. (dlc, )
July 13, 2012 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nguyen, #2 Exhibit 22 - 100711 Email Chain, #3 Exhibit 23 - TiVo 10K excerpt, #4 Exhibit 24 - 070212 Droplets v eBay Order, #5 Exhibit 25 - Cisco Opp to Mtn to Dismiss or Transfer)(Jones, Michael)
July 11, 2012 Filing 17 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph M Lipner for TiVo Inc.. (pkb, )
July 9, 2012 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Change Venue filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of R. Birnholz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Text of Proposed Order)(Birnholz, Richard)
July 2, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
June 29, 2012 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cisco Systems, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
June 22, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah J Race on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Race, Deborah)
June 22, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Otis W Carroll, Jr on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Carroll, Otis)
June 21, 2012 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
June 21, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION to Change Venue by Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Nguyen Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - 053012 Cisco Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - TiVo MSFT Transfer Mtn, #4 Exhibit 3 - MS TiVo Order, #5 Exhibit 4 - Maps of ND Cal Jursdiction, #6 Exhibit 5 - Third Party Witnesses, #7 Exhibit 6 - '695 102011 Non-Final Action, #8 Exhibit 7 - '696 102011 Non-Final Action, #9 Exhibit 8 - Vertical v. Interwoven, #10 Exhibit 9 - 061112 Verizon's Mtn for Recon, #11 Exhibit 10 - 061212 Cisco Mtn to Intervene, #12 Exhibit 11 - 061212 Cisco Mtn to Stay, #13 Exhibit 12 - San Francisco, CA to Marshall, TX, #14 Exhibit 13 - 032612 TiVo's Answer & Amended Cntrclaims, #15 Exhibit 14 - 021711 TiVo 1st Amend Answer & CC, #16 Exhibit 15 - 060612 Memo Opinion and Order, #17 Exhibit 16 - Etrade Mtn, #18 Exhibit 17 - 060612 Cisco Depo Subpoena + NOD, #19 Exhibit 18 - 060612 Cisco Docs Subpoena, #20 Exhibit 19 - 061912 Cisco Mtn to Quash, #21 Exhibit 20 - STMicro Depo Subpoena, #22 Exhibit 21 - Table C-5 Sep11, #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 21, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas W McClellan on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (McClellan, Douglas)
June 21, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jared B Bobrow on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Bobrow, Jared)
June 21, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
June 21, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc. (Jones, Michael)
June 13, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TiVo Inc.. Cisco Systems, Inc. served on 6/8/2012, answer due 6/29/2012. (ehs, )
June 8, 2012 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TiVo Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for TiVo Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
June 8, 2012 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel)
June 8, 2012 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Cisco Systems, Inc.. (ch, )
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ***VACATED PER ORDER # 26 ***ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/5/2012. (ch, ) Modified on 8/3/2012 (ch, ).
June 5, 2012 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
June 5, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
June 4, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Cisco Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3618781.), filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 4, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Cisco Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3618781.), filed by TiVo Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxter, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TiVo Inc. v. Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jared B Bobrow
Represented By: Arjun H Mehra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TiVo Inc.
Represented By: Talin Gordnia
Represented By: Maclain Wells
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Richard Marc Birnholz
Represented By: Crawford Maclain Wells
Represented By: Garret Wesley Chambers
Represented By: Douglas Fretty
Represented By: Andrei Iancu
Represented By: Joseph M Lipner
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Ben J Yorks
Represented By: Benjamin Haber
Represented By: Thomas C Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable
Represented By: John M Desmarais
Represented By: Ameet A Modi
Represented By: Edward J DeFranco
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Alexander Rudis
Represented By: Michael P Stadnick
Represented By: Matthew A Traupman
Represented By: Stephen Wheeler Creekmore, IV
Represented By: Karim Z Oussayef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Robert W Faulkner
Represented By: Robert W Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Keyzer
Represented By: David Michael Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?