NovelPoint Tracking LLC v. Apple Inc Featured Case
Plaintiff: NovelPoint Tracking LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv00713
Filed: November 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims for relief asserted against APPLE INC. by NOVELPOINT TRACKING LLC herein are dismissed. All attorneys fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/6/13. (ehs, )
February 27, 2013 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(James, Clayton)
February 27, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carey Matthew Rozier on behalf of Apple Inc (Rozier, Carey)
February 27, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clayton C James on behalf of Apple Inc (James, Clayton)
January 17, 2013 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple Inc to 2/27/2013. (ch, )
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Apple Inc deadline is extended to 2/27/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/17/2013. (ch, )
January 16, 2013 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 29, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc to 1/28/2013. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 28, 2012 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.(Smith, Melissa)
November 16, 2012 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
November 14, 2012 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc. (ch, )
November 13, 2012 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Upshaw, Everett)
November 13, 2012 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc (Upshaw, Everett)
November 12, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3868986.), filed by NovelPoint Tracking LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Appendix)(Upshaw, Everett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NovelPoint Tracking LLC v. Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NovelPoint Tracking LLC
Represented By: Everett McClyde Upshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?