Personal Audio, LLC v. Togi Entertainment, Inc.

Plaintiff: Personal Audio, LLC
Defendant: Togi Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00013
Filed: January 7, 2013
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Marshall Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S. Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2014 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 188 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/05/2014. (jrg3)
June 19, 2014 182 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/19/2014. (ch, )
March 31, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER; adopting 65 Report and Recommendations; denying 6 MOTION to Dismiss Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Personal Audio, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/31/14. (mrm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Personal Audio, LLC v. Togi Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Togi Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Personal Audio, LLC
Represented By: Papool S. Chaudhari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?