Kelly et al v. Healthcare Services Group Inc
Plaintiff: Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino and Janice Waltman
Defendant: Healthcare Services Group Inc
Not Classified By Court: Gloria Portela and F Witcher McCullough, III
Case Number: 2:2013cv00441
Filed: May 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Cass
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Filing 336 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/8/15 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 1/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2021. (sholmes, )

February 16, 2016 Filing 335 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth Dawson Sulzer (Sulzer, Kenneth)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER granting #333 Joint Motion for Final Approval Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/11/15. (ch, )
December 9, 2015 Filing 333 MOTION JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL ORDER JOINT MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL ORDER by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER APPROVING FAIRNESS OF CLASS COUNSEL FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/8/2015. (ch, )
December 8, 2015 Filing 332 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Status Conference held on 12/8/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
October 2, 2015 Filing 330 NOTICE OF POTENTIAL ISSUANCE OF COMMON STOCK IN SATIFICATION OF CLASS COUNSEL ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AWARD. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/2/15. (ch, )
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER granting #327 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion to Approve FLSA Collective Settlement. Approval hearing set for 12/8/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/23/2015. (ch, )
September 22, 2015 Filing 328 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #327 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion to Approve FLSA Collective Settlement.. (Holleman, John)
August 7, 2015 Filing 327 MOTION for Settlement Unopposed Motion to Approve FLSA Collective Settlement by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J)(Holleman, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2015: #8 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #325 Motion for Extension of the Settlement Deadline and Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/6/2015. (ch, )
July 31, 2015 Filing 325 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Agreement and Motion for Settlement Approval by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting #323 Motion for Extension to Extend Settlement Deadline. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/28/2015. (ch, )
July 14, 2015 Filing 323 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Agreement and Motion for Settlement Approval by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Sulzer, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2015: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
June 23, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Status Conference held on 6/23/2015. Counsel on the call were Ms. Jackson, Messrs. Holleman, Ford, Smith, Sulzer, Stiegler and Cerrone. The Court and parties discussed the procedures for finalizing settlement. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (jml)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting #321 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. The hearing on Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for an Order to Show Cause(Dkt. No. 314), currently scheduled on Friday, June 19, 2015, at 2:30 p.m, is cancelled. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/23/2015. (ch, )
June 19, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 6/23/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***The Court's telephone number is (903) 938-8452. The parties are to contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call. Participants should use a landline phone connection. Cell phones are not to be used unless prior leave is granted by the Court, which leave will only be granted in exceptional circumstances.(jml)
June 18, 2015 Filing 321 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
June 17, 2015 Filing 320 RESPONSE to Motion re #310 Opposed MOTION in Limine , #307 MOTION in Limine Joint Notice of Parties' Agreement re Motions in Limine filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Stiegler, Charles)
June 17, 2015 Filing 319 RESPONSE in Opposition re #307 MOTION in Limine filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Stiegler Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
June 16, 2015 Filing 318 RESPONSE in Opposition re #310 Opposed MOTION in Limine filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 8)(Holleman, John)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #314 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause : Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2015 02:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/16/15. (ch, )
June 15, 2015 Filing 316 Proposed Jury Instructions by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Moore, Steven)
June 15, 2015 Filing 315 Proposed Pretrial Order JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
June 15, 2015 Filing 314 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 10)(Holleman, John)
June 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting #312 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #255 Order, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/15/2015.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/12/15. (ch, )
June 11, 2015 Filing 312 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #255 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
June 5, 2015 Filing 311 RESPONSE to Motion re #306 Opposed MOTION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF JURY QUESTIONNAIRE re #303 Status Report, filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
June 3, 2015 Filing 310 Opposed MOTION in Limine by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
June 3, 2015 Filing 309 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dorotha Michelle Ocker (Ocker, Dorotha)
June 3, 2015 Filing 308 BRIEF filed Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
June 3, 2015 Filing 307 MOTION in Limine by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
June 3, 2015 Filing 306 Opposed MOTION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF JURY QUESTIONNAIRE re #303 Status Report, by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jury Questionnaire, #2 Text of Proposed Order B - Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
June 3, 2015 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 298 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
June 3, 2015 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 305 submitted CERTIFICATE OF COFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
June 3, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 303, Status Report. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 2, 2015 Filing 305 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT*** MOTION in Limine by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Sulzer, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2015: #9 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ). Modified on 6/3/2015 (ch, ).
June 2, 2015 Filing 304 RESPONSE to #290 Notice (Other) Defendant's Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs' Rule 26(A)(3) Pretrial Disclosures filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
June 2, 2015 Filing 303 ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG EVENT***STATUS REPORT Motion for Approval of Jury Questionnaire by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Questionnaire, #2 Text of Proposed Order B - Proposed Order)(Holleman, John) Modified on 6/3/2015 (ch, ).
June 2, 2015 Filing 302 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #278 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Bankruptcy Plaintiffs filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
June 2, 2015 Filing 301 BRIEF filed in support of Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
June 2, 2015 Filing 300 NOTICE by Healthcare Services Group Inc of Defendant's Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs' Rule 26(A)(3) Pretrial Disclosures (Sulzer, Kenneth)
June 2, 2015 Filing 299 RESPONSE to #291 Exhibit List PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS RULE 26(A)(3) PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
June 2, 2015 Filing 298 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT*** MOTION in Limine by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Holleman, John) Modified on 6/3/2015 (ch, ).
June 2, 2015 Filing 297 NOTICE by Healthcare Services Group Inc of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting (Smith, Michael)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator F Witcher McCullough, III. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/1/15. (ch, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 295 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #276 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Noel D. Campbell, Ph.D. filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/1/15. (ch, )
May 28, 2015 Filing 293 REPLY to Response to Motion re #278 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Bankruptcy Plaintiffs filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Sulzer, Kenneth)
May 26, 2015 Filing 292 RESPONSE in Support re #276 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Noel D. Campbell, Ph.D. filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Moore, Steven)
May 19, 2015 Filing 291 Exhibit List and Pretrial Disclosures by Healthcare Services Group Inc.. (Sulzer, Kenneth)
May 19, 2015 Filing 290 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Plaintiffs' Pretrial Disclosures (Holleman, John)
May 19, 2015 Filing 289 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Intent to Conduct Mock Trial (Holleman, John)
May 18, 2015 Filing 288 RESPONSE in Opposition re #278 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Bankruptcy Plaintiffs filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/15/15. (ch, )
May 15, 2015 Filing 286 RESPONSE in Opposition re #276 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Noel D. Campbell, Ph.D. filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
May 14, 2015 Filing 285 NOTICE by Healthcare Services Group Inc OF COMPETING TRIAL DATES (Sulzer, Kenneth)
May 7, 2015 Filing 284 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #251 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
May 7, 2015 Filing 283 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/17/15 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2015. (sholmes, )
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting #274 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss for Voluntary Non-Suit of Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/7/2015. (ch, )
May 6, 2015 Filing 281 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #261 Opposed MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Applicable Statute of Limitations and for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs Whose Claims are Time-Barred filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
May 5, 2015 Filing 280 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #278 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Bankruptcy Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 119, #2 Exhibit 120, #3 Exhibit 121, #4 Exhibit 122, #5 Exhibit 123, #6 Exhibit 124, #7 Exhibit 125, #8 Exhibit 126, #9 Exhibit 127, #10 Exhibit 128, #11 Exhibit 129, #12 Exhibit 130, #13 Exhibit 131, #14 Exhibit 132, #15 Exhibit 133, #16 Exhibit 134, #17 Exhibit 135, #18 Exhibit 136, #19 Exhibit 137, #20 Exhibit 138, #21 Exhibit 139, #22 Exhibit 140, #23 Exhibit 141, #24 Exhibit 142, #25 Exhibit 143, #26 Exhibit 144, #27 Exhibit 145, #28 Exhibit 146, #29 Exhibit 147, #30 Exhibit 148, #31 Exhibit 149, #32 Exhibit 150, #33 Exhibit 151, #34 Exhibit 152, #35 Exhibit 153, #36 Exhibit 154, #37 Exhibit 155, #38 Exhibit 156, #39 Exhibit 157, #40 Exhibit 158, #41 Exhibit 159, #42 Exhibit 160, #43 Exhibit 161, #44 Exhibit 162, #45 Exhibit 163, #46 Exhibit 164, #47 Exhibit 165, #48 Exhibit 166, #49 Exhibit 167)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
May 5, 2015 Filing 279 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #278 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Bankruptcy Plaintiffs.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 50, #2 Exhibit 51, #3 Exhibit 52, #4 Exhibit 53, #5 Exhibit 54, #6 Exhibit 55, #7 Exhibit 56, #8 Exhibit 57, #9 Exhibit 58, #10 Exhibit 59, #11 Exhibit 60, #12 Exhibit 61, #13 Exhibit 62, #14 Exhibit 63, #15 Exhibit 64, #16 Exhibit 65, #17 Exhibit 66, #18 Exhibit 67, #19 Exhibit 68, #20 Exhibit 69, #21 Exhibit 70, #22 Exhibit 71, #23 Exhibit 72, #24 Exhibit 73, #25 Exhibit 74, #26 Exhibit 75, #27 Exhibit 76, #28 Exhibit 77, #29 Exhibit 78, #30 Exhibit 79, #31 Exhibit 80, #32 Exhibit 81, #33 Exhibit 82, #34 Exhibit 83, #35 Exhibit 84, #36 Exhibit 85, #37 Exhibit 86, #38 Exhibit 87, #39 Exhibit 88, #40 Exhibit 89, #41 Exhibit 90, #42 Exhibit 91, #43 Exhibit 92, #44 Exhibit 93, #45 Exhibit 94, #46 Exhibit 95, #47 Exhibit 96, #48 Exhibit 97, #49 Exhibit 98, #50 Exhibit 99, #51 Exhibit 100, #52 Exhibit 101, #53 Exhibit 102, #54 Exhibit 103, #55 Exhibit 104, #56 Exhibit 105, #57 Exhibit 106, #58 Exhibit 107, #59 Exhibit 108, #60 Exhibit 109, #61 Exhibit 110, #62 Exhibit 111, #63 Exhibit 112, #64 Exhibit 113, #65 Exhibit 114, #66 Exhibit 115, #67 Exhibit 116, #68 Exhibit 117, #69 Exhibit 118)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
May 5, 2015 Filing 278 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Bankruptcy Plaintiffs by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Escalante in Support of Defendant's Opposed Motion for Summary Judgment as to Bankruptcy Plaintiffs, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Index of Exhibits to Defendant's Opposed Motion for Summary Judgment as to Bankruptcy Plaintiffs, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 36, #40 Exhibit 37, #41 Exhibit 38, #42 Exhibit 39, #43 Exhibit 40, #44 Exhibit 41, #45 Exhibit 42, #46 Exhibit 43, #47 Exhibit 44, #48 Exhibit 45, #49 Exhibit 46, #50 Exhibit 47, #51 Exhibit 48, #52 Exhibit 49)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
May 5, 2015 Filing 277 Defendant's Witness List by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Sulzer, Kenneth)
May 5, 2015 Filing 276 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Noel D. Campbell, Ph.D. by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Noel D. Campbell Expert Report)(Moore, Steven)
May 4, 2015 Filing 275 REPLY to Response to Motion re #261 Opposed MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Applicable Statute of Limitations and for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs Whose Claims are Time-Barred filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Sulzer, Kenneth)
May 4, 2015 Filing 274 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss for Voluntary Non-Suit of Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
April 28, 2015 Filing 273 Plaintiffs Witness List by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
April 27, 2015 Filing 272 REPLY to Response to Motion re #251 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
April 27, 2015 Filing 271 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #241 MOTION for Summary Judgment DENYING THE APPLICABILITY OF THE FLUCTUATING WORKWEEK (FWW) METHOD AND APPROVING THE TIME AND A HALF METHOD FOR CALCULATING DAMAGES filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Stiegler, Charles)
April 24, 2015 Filing 270 RESPONSE in Opposition re #261 Opposed MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Applicable Statute of Limitations and for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs Whose Claims are Time-Barred filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
April 22, 2015 Filing 269 NOTICE of Change of Address by Dawn M Amos (Amos, Dawn)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER the Court enters this Order sua sponte. Due to the extensive briefing in this case and the voluminous exhibits associated with each brief, the Court ORDERS the following. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/20/2015. (ch, )
April 20, 2015 Filing 266 RESPONSE in Opposition re #251 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Summary Judgment On Defendant's Affifrmative Defenses filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit, #82 Exhibit, #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit, #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit, #87 Exhibit, #88 Exhibit, #89 Exhibit, #90 Exhibit)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
April 17, 2015 Filing 268 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion to Decertify Class Hearing held on 4/17/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
April 16, 2015 Filing 265 REPLY to Response to Motion re #241 MOTION for Summary Judgment DENYING THE APPLICABILITY OF THE FLUCTUATING WORKWEEK (FWW) METHOD AND APPROVING THE TIME AND A HALF METHOD FOR CALCULATING DAMAGES filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/10/2015. (ch, )
April 10, 2015 Filing 263 REPORT of Mediation by F Witcher McCullough, III. Mediation result: Impasse(ch, )
April 10, 2015 Filing 262 Mediator's Report by F. Witcher McCullough, III. Mediation conference resulted in an impasse. (jml)
April 9, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Motion to Decertify set for 4/17/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap (jml)
April 8, 2015 Filing 261 Opposed MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Applicable Statute of Limitations and for Summary Judgment as to All Plaintiffs Whose Claims are Time-Barred by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles Stiegler, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Sulzer, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2015: #9 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
April 7, 2015 Filing 260 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #233 Opposed MOTION Decertify the Collective of Hourly Account Managers filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
April 6, 2015 Filing 259 RESPONSE to Motion re #242 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF THE ISSUES TO BE DECIDED BY THE COURT AND STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DENYING THE APPLICABILITY OF THE FLUCTUATING WORKWEEK (FW filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Sulzer, Kenneth)
April 6, 2015 Filing 258 RESPONSE in Opposition re #241 MOTION for Summary Judgment DENYING THE APPLICABILITY OF THE FLUCTUATING WORKWEEK (FWW) METHOD AND APPROVING THE TIME AND A HALF METHOD FOR CALCULATING DAMAGES by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Escalante In Support of, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Errata 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62)(Sulzer, Kenneth) Modified on 4/7/2015 (ch, ).
April 6, 2015 Filing 257 REPLY to Response to Motion re #233 Opposed MOTION Decertify the Collective of Hourly Account Managers filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles Stiegler in Support of Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Decertify Collective of Hourly Account Managers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
April 6, 2015 Filing 256 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #235 Opposed MOTION Decertify Collective of Salaried Account Managers filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Holleman, John)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER granting #248 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery due by 4/22/2015. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/3/2015. (ch, )
April 3, 2015 Filing 254 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #251 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 110, #2 Exhibit 111, #3 Exhibit 112, #4 Exhibit 113, #5 Exhibit 114, #6 Exhibit 115, #7 Exhibit 116, #8 Exhibit 117, #9 Exhibit 118, #10 Exhibit 119, #11 Exhibit 120, #12 Exhibit 121, #13 Exhibit 122, #14 Exhibit 123, #15 Exhibit 124, #16 Exhibit 125, #17 Exhibit 126, #18 Exhibit 127, #19 Exhibit 128, #20 Exhibit 129, #21 Exhibit 130, #22 Exhibit 131, #23 Exhibit 132, #24 Exhibit 133, #25 Exhibit 134, #26 Exhibit 135, #27 Exhibit 136, #28 Exhibit 137, #29 Exhibit 138, #30 Exhibit 139, #31 Exhibit 140, #32 Exhibit 141, #33 Exhibit 142, #34 Exhibit 143, #35 Exhibit 144, #36 Exhibit 145, #37 Exhibit 146, #38 Exhibit 147, #39 Exhibit 148, #40 Exhibit 149, #41 Exhibit 150, #42 Exhibit 151, #43 Exhibit 152 - Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
April 3, 2015 Filing 253 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #251 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 73, #2 Exhibit 74, #3 Exhibit 75, #4 Exhibit 76, #5 Exhibit 77, #6 Exhibit 78, #7 Exhibit 79, #8 Exhibit 80, #9 Exhibit 81, #10 Exhibit 82, #11 Exhibit 83, #12 Exhibit 84, #13 Exhibit 85, #14 Exhibit 86, #15 Exhibit 87, #16 Exhibit 88, #17 Exhibit 89, #18 Exhibit 90, #19 Exhibit 91, #20 Exhibit 92, #21 Exhibit 93, #22 Exhibit 94, #23 Exhibit 95, #24 Exhibit 96, #25 Exhibit 97, #26 Exhibit 98, #27 Exhibit 99, #28 Exhibit 100, #29 Exhibit 101, #30 Exhibit 102, #31 Exhibit 103, #32 Exhibit 104, #33 Exhibit 105, #34 Exhibit 106, #35 Exhibit 107, #36 Exhibit 108, #37 Exhibit 109)(Holleman, John)
April 3, 2015 Filing 252 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #251 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 37, #2 Exhibit 38, #3 Exhibit 39, #4 Exhibit 40, #5 Exhibit 41, #6 Exhibit 42, #7 Exhibit 43, #8 Exhibit 44, #9 Exhibit 45, #10 Exhibit 46, #11 Exhibit 47, #12 Exhibit 48, #13 Exhibit 49, #14 Exhibit 50, #15 Exhibit 51, #16 Exhibit 52, #17 Exhibit 53, #18 Exhibit 54, #19 Exhibit 55, #20 Exhibit 56, #21 Exhibit 57, #22 Exhibit 58, #23 Exhibit 59, #24 Exhibit 60, #25 Exhibit 61, #26 Exhibit 62, #27 Exhibit 63, #28 Exhibit 64, #29 Exhibit 65, #30 Exhibit 66, #31 Exhibit 67, #32 Exhibit 68, #33 Exhibit 69, #34 Exhibit 70, #35 Exhibit 71, #36 Exhibit 72)(Holleman, John)
April 3, 2015 Filing 251 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36)(Holleman, John)
April 2, 2015 Filing 250 REPLY to Response to Motion re #235 Opposed MOTION Decertify Collective of Salaried Account Managers filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles Stiegler in Support of Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Decertify Collective of Salaried Account Managers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
April 1, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED SEPARATELY Document # 249, Submission of Proposed Docket Control Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
March 31, 2015 Filing 249 ***FILED IN ERROR.***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Healthcare Services Group Inc . (Sulzer, Kenneth) Modified on 4/1/2015 (ch, ).
March 31, 2015 Filing 248 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery For Limited Purpose by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Sulzer, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2015: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 26, 2015 Filing 247 RESPONSE in Opposition re #233 Opposed MOTION Decertify the Collective of Hourly Account Managers filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18 - Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
March 24, 2015 Filing 246 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #243 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 110, #2 Exhibit 111, #3 Exhibit 112, #4 Exhibit 113, #5 Exhibit 114, #6 Exhibit 115, #7 Exhibit 116, #8 Exhibit 117, #9 Exhibit 118, #10 Exhibit 119, #11 Exhibit 120, #12 Exhibit 121, #13 Exhibit 122, #14 Exhibit 123, #15 Exhibit 124, #16 Exhibit 125, #17 Exhibit 126, #18 Exhibit 127, #19 Exhibit 128, #20 Exhibit 129, #21 Exhibit 130, #22 Exhibit 131, #23 Exhibit 132, #24 Exhibit 133, #25 Exhibit 134, #26 Exhibit 135, #27 Exhibit 136, #28 Exhibit 137, #29 Exhibit 138, #30 Exhibit 139, #31 Exhibit 140, #32 Exhibit 141, #33 Exhibit 142, #34 Exhibit 143, #35 Exhibit 144, #36 Exhibit 145 - Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
March 24, 2015 Filing 245 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #243 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 73, #2 Exhibit 74, #3 Exhibit 75, #4 Exhibit 76, #5 Exhibit 77, #6 Exhibit 78, #7 Exhibit 79, #8 Exhibit 80, #9 Exhibit 81, #10 Exhibit 82, #11 Exhibit 83, #12 Exhibit 84, #13 Exhibit 85, #14 Exhibit 86, #15 Exhibit 87, #16 Exhibit 88, #17 Exhibit 89, #18 Exhibit 90, #19 Exhibit 91, #20 Exhibit 92, #21 Exhibit 93, #22 Exhibit 94, #23 Exhibit 95, #24 Exhibit 96, #25 Exhibit 97, #26 Exhibit 98, #27 Exhibit 99, #28 Exhibit 100, #29 Exhibit 101, #30 Exhibit 102, #31 Exhibit 103, #32 Exhibit 104, #33 Exhibit 105, #34 Exhibit 106, #35 Exhibit 107, #36 Exhibit 108, #37 Exhibit 109)(Holleman, John)
March 24, 2015 Filing 244 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #243 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 37, #2 Exhibit 38, #3 Exhibit 39, #4 Exhibit 40, #5 Exhibit 41, #6 Exhibit 42, #7 Exhibit 43, #8 Exhibit 44, #9 Exhibit 45, #10 Exhibit 46, #11 Exhibit 47, #12 Exhibit 48, #13 Exhibit 49, #14 Exhibit 50, #15 Exhibit 51, #16 Exhibit 52, #17 Exhibit 53, #18 Exhibit 54, #19 Exhibit 55, #20 Exhibit 56, #21 Exhibit 57, #22 Exhibit 58, #23 Exhibit 59, #24 Exhibit 60, #25 Exhibit 61, #26 Exhibit 62, #27 Exhibit 63, #28 Exhibit 64, #29 Exhibit 65, #30 Exhibit 66, #31 Exhibit 67, #32 Exhibit 68, #33 Exhibit 69, #34 Exhibit 70, #35 Exhibit 71, #36 Exhibit 72)(Holleman, John)
March 24, 2015 Filing 243 RESPONSE in Opposition re #235 Opposed MOTION Decertify Collective of Salaried Account Managers filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36)(Holleman, John)
March 24, 2015 Filing 242 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF THE ISSUES TO BE DECIDED BY THE COURT AND STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT DENYING THE APPLICABILITY OF THE FLUCTUATING WORKWEEK (FWW) METHOD AND APPROVING THE TIME AND A HALF METHOD FOR CALCULATING DAMAGES (Dkt. No. 241) by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
March 20, 2015 Filing 241 MOTION for Summary Judgment DENYING THE APPLICABILITY OF THE FLUCTUATING WORKWEEK (FWW) METHOD AND APPROVING THE TIME AND A HALF METHOD FOR CALCULATING DAMAGES by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. Responses due by 4/6/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
March 17, 2015 Filing 240 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Healthcare Services Group Inc Second Notice of Expert Witness Disclosure (Sulzer, Kenneth)
March 10, 2015 Filing 239 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #235 Opposed MOTION Decertify Collective of Salaried Account Managers .. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 116, #2 Exhibit 117)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
March 10, 2015 Filing 238 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #235 Opposed MOTION Decertify Collective of Salaried Account Managers .. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 81, #2 Exhibit 82, #3 Exhibit 83, #4 Exhibit 84, #5 Exhibit 85, #6 Exhibit 86, #7 Exhibit 87, #8 Exhibit 88, #9 Exhibit 89, #10 Exhibit 90, #11 Exhibit 91, #12 Exhibit 92, #13 Exhibit 93, #14 Exhibit 94, #15 Exhibit 95, #16 Exhibit 96, #17 Exhibit 97, #18 Exhibit 98, #19 Exhibit 99, #20 Exhibit 100, #21 Exhibit 101, #22 Exhibit 102, #23 Exhibit 103, #24 Exhibit 104, #25 Exhibit 105, #26 Exhibit 106, #27 Exhibit 107, #28 Exhibit 108, #29 Exhibit 109, #30 Exhibit 110, #31 Exhibit 111, #32 Exhibit 112, #33 Exhibit 113, #34 Exhibit 114, #35 Exhibit 115)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
March 10, 2015 Filing 237 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #235 Opposed MOTION Decertify Collective of Salaried Account Managers .. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 70 (Part 1), #2 Exhibit 70 (Part 2), #3 Exhibit 71, #4 Exhibit 72, #5 Exhibit 73, #6 Exhibit 74, #7 Exhibit 75, #8 Exhibit 76, #9 Exhibit 77, #10 Exhibit 78, #11 Exhibit 79, #12 Exhibit 80)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
March 10, 2015 Filing 236 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #235 Opposed MOTION Decertify Collective of Salaried Account Managers .. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41, #2 Exhibit 42, #3 Exhibit 43, #4 Exhibit 44, #5 Exhibit 45, #6 Exhibit 46, #7 Exhibit 47, #8 Exhibit 48, #9 Exhibit 49, #10 Exhibit 50, #11 Exhibit 51, #12 Exhibit 52, #13 Exhibit 53, #14 Exhibit 54, #15 Exhibit 55, #16 Exhibit 56, #17 Exhibit 57, #18 Exhibit 58, #19 Exhibit 59, #20 Exhibit 60, #21 Exhibit 61, #22 Exhibit 62, #23 Exhibit 63, #24 Exhibit 64, #25 Exhibit 65, #26 Exhibit 66, #27 Exhibit 67, #28 Exhibit 68, #29 Exhibit 69)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
March 10, 2015 Filing 235 Opposed MOTION Decertify Collective of Salaried Account Managers by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles Stiegler in Support of Opposed Motion to Decertify the Collective of Hourly Account Managers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40)(Sulzer, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2015: #42 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 10, 2015 Filing 234 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS (Holleman, John)
March 10, 2015 Filing 233 Opposed MOTION Decertify the Collective of Hourly Account Managers by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles Stiegler in Support of Opposed Motion to Decertify the Collective of Hourly Account Managers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
March 3, 2015 Filing 232 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Woodrow Moore (Moore, Steven)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER granting in part #229 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/2/2015. (ch, )
March 1, 2015 Filing 230 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/22/14 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2015. (sholmes, )

February 24, 2015 Filing 229 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages On Its Motion To Decertify The Salaried Account Manager Collective Action by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Leave to Exceed The Page Limitations On Its Motion To Decertify The Salaried Account Manager Collective Action)(Staley, James)
February 19, 2015 Filing 228 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dawn M Amos on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5066127. (Amos, Dawn)
January 30, 2015 Filing 227 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #220 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Dr. Crandall filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Sulzer, Kenneth)
January 30, 2015 Filing 226 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #219 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Dr. Banks filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Cristina Banks, Ph.D.)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
January 23, 2015 Filing 225 REPLY to Response to Motion re #220 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Dr. Crandall filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holleman, John)
January 20, 2015 Filing 224 REPLY to Response to Motion re #219 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Dr. Banks filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Holleman, John)
January 19, 2015 Filing 223 RESPONSE to Motion re #219 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Dr. Banks filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report of Alan L. Moss)(Reathaford, Laura)
January 19, 2015 Filing 222 RESPONSE to Motion re #220 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Dr. Crandall filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Reathaford, Laura)
January 15, 2015 Filing 221 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman OF PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATION OF REBUTTAL EXPERT WITNESS (Holleman, John)
January 5, 2015 Filing 220 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Dr. Crandall by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. Responses due by 1/19/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
January 5, 2015 Filing 219 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Dr. Banks by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. Responses due by 1/19/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
December 22, 2014 Filing 218 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2014 re #210 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY OPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Sandra Kelly, Janice Waltman, Sylvia Patino. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
December 19, 2014 Filing 217 REPLY to Response to Motion re #210 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY OPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM BRIEF IN SUPPORT REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY OPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 216 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Healthcare Services Group Inc DEFENDANT HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP INC.'S NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES (Reathaford, Laura)
December 18, 2014 Filing 215 RESPONSE in Opposition re #210 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY OPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Enzo Der Boghossian In Support of, #2 Declaration of Robert A. Escalante In Support of, #3 Proposed Order)(Sulzer, Kenneth)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER finding as moot #205 Plaintiff's Motion Appoint Mediator in light of the Court's order referring the case to a mediator #211 . Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/10/2014. (jrg3)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #210 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY OPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM BRIEF IN SUPPORT. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Dft's response is due by 5:00 pm on 12/18/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/9/2014. (ch, )
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #208 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS CERTAIN OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/9/2014. (ch, )
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator F Witcher McCullough, III added as Mediator. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/9/2014. (ch, )
December 9, 2014 Filing 210 MOTION to Compel PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY OPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM BRIEF IN SUPPORT by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
December 8, 2014 Filing 209 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #205 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT MEDIATOR filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Smith, Michael)
December 8, 2014 Filing 208 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS CERTAIN OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
December 8, 2014 Filing 207 REPLY to Response to Motion re #205 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT MEDIATOR PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO APPOINT MEDIATOR filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holleman, John)
December 7, 2014 Filing 206 RESPONSE to Motion re #205 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT MEDIATOR filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
December 5, 2014 Filing 205 MOTION PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPOINT MEDIATOR by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D Proposed Order)(Holleman, John) Modi
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER denying #189 Motion and Brief to Prohibit Improper Communications with Opt-In Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/04/2014. (nkl, )
December 1, 2014 Filing 203 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #189 MOTION Order that these Job Description forms cannot be used in this litigation against any Plaintiff; PLAINTIFFS OPPOSED MOTION AND BRIEF TO PROHIBIT IMPROPER COMMUNICATIONS WITH OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Laura Reathaford in Support of Defendant's Sur-Reply in Response to Motion and Brief to Prohibit Alleged Improper Communications with Opt-in Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Laura Reathaford, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Laura Reathaford)(Reathaford, Laura)
November 26, 2014 Filing 202 REPLY to Response to Motion re #189 MOTION Order that these Job Description forms cannot be used in this litigation against any Plaintiff; PLAINTIFFS OPPOSED MOTION AND BRIEF TO PROHIBIT IMPROPER COMMUNICATIONS WITH OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Holleman, John)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER finding as moot #192 Motion for Discovery by the Parties' agreement #196 . Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/25/2014. (jrg3)
November 24, 2014 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Opposition re #189 MOTION Order that these Job Description forms cannot be used in this litigation against any Plaintiff; PLAINTIFFS OPPOSED MOTION AND BRIEF TO PROHIBIT IMPROPER COMMUNICATIONS WITH OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion and Brief to Prohibit Alleged Improper Communications with Opt-In Plaintiffs filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeannie Fissinger in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion and Brief to Prohibit Alleged Improper communications with Opt-in Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jeannie Fissinger, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Jeannie Fissinger, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Jeannie Fissinger, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Jeannie Fissinger, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Jeannie Fissinger, #7 Affidavit Declaration of Chris Ricci in support of Defendant's Opposition, #8 Affidavit Declaration of Henry Lipner in support of Defendant's Opposition, #9 Affidavit Declaration of Boris Chauca in support of Defendant's Opposition, #10 Affidavit Declaration of Steve Winter in support of Defendant's Opposition, #11 Affidavit Declaration of Joel Nucifore in support of Defendant's Opposition)(Reathaford, Laura)
November 21, 2014 Filing 199 ANSWER to #186 Amended Complaint by Healthcare Services Group Inc.(Reathaford, Laura)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER -. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/19/2014. (ch, )
November 19, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 197, Proposed Amended Docket Control Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 18, 2014 Filing 197 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Amended Docket Control Order by Healthcare Services Group Inc, Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Steadman, Timothy) Modified on 11/19/2014 (ch, ).
November 18, 2014 Filing 196 NOTICE by Healthcare Services Group Inc, Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Joint Report on Discovery Issues (Holleman, John)
November 18, 2014 Filing 195 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert A Escalante on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4933172. (Escalante, Robert)
November 18, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing:Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/18/2014 04:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The Court's telephone number is (903) 938-8452. The parties are to contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call. Participants should use a landline phone connection. Cell phones are not to be used unless prior leave is granted by the Court, which leave will only be granted in exceptional circumstances.(jml)
November 17, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 11/17/2014 re #192 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Protective Order filed by Sandra Kelly, Janice Waltman, Sylvia Patino. Counsel on the call were Misses Jackson, Barnes, Reatherford and Messrs. Steadman, Sulzer and Escalante. The Court Ordered the parties to meet and confer regarding their disputes and to submit a report regarding same. The Court will set an additional hearing on November 18. 2014.(Court Reporter Carla Sims, CSR.) (jml)
November 17, 2014 Filing 193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #192 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Protective Order filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert A. Escalante in Support of Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Opposed Emergency Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Reathaford, Laura)
November 17, 2014 Filing 192 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Protective Order by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Holleman, John)
November 17, 2014 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #192 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Protective Order : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2014 04:45 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. The Court's telephone number is (903) 938-8452. The parties are to contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call. Participants should use a landline phone connection. Cell phones are not to be used unless prior leave is granted by the Court, which leave will only be granted in exceptional circumstances.(jml)
November 12, 2014 Filing 194 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Gloria Portela. by Gloria Portela (ch, )
November 10, 2014 Filing 191 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stacey C. S. Cerrone on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4921349. (Cerrone, Stacey)
November 6, 2014 Filing 190 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jerry D Garner on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4917770. (Garner, Jerry)
November 6, 2014 Filing 189 MOTION Order that these Job Description forms cannot be used in this litigation against any Plaintiff; PLAINTIFFS OPPOSED MOTION AND BRIEF TO PROHIBIT IMPROPER COMMUNICATIONS WITH OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Holleman, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2014: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
November 5, 2014 Filing 188 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Matthew M Ford on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4914505. (Ford, Matthew)
November 4, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman NOTICE OF FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holleman, John)
November 4, 2014 Filing 186 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman, Sandra Kelly.(Holleman, John)
October 6, 2014 Filing 185 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Ritesh Chand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
October 3, 2014 Filing 184 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Matthew Bivens (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
October 2, 2014 Filing 183 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Rhoda Kearse-Thomas, Joseph Warren (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Holleman, John)
October 1, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Gabriel Corrie, Darryl Dowe 1, Darryl Dowe 2 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Holleman, John)
September 30, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Kelly J Goad (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
September 29, 2014 Filing 180 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Richard Aguilar, Aaron Caldwell, Autrice Carson, Sherron Harper, Paul Jarrell, Emanuel Jimenez, Ruby King, Aliria Lai, Jeremy Newton, Ron Prendiz, Jeremiah Stewart, Michael Stilley, Ivan Tadeo 1, Ivan Tadeo 2, Vincent Taylor, Scott Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Holleman, John)
September 25, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Michael Armstead, Rhonda Grimes 1, Rhonda Grimes 2, Derek K Hynds, Luis A Montes, Kay Dawna Reisner, Matthew Santilli, Sukhvinder Singh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Holleman, John)
September 24, 2014 Filing 178 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Matthew Cipolla, Jessica Culver, Derek K Hynds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Holleman, John)
September 23, 2014 Filing 177 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: James R Lyon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
September 22, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Zachery D Edwards, Robert Garrett, Dan Haskins, Christy A House, Thena K Jackson, Joseph A Milton Jr, Kathleen Marie Thomas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Holleman, John)
September 19, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Tonya Benson, Darrin Booker, Dennis ScottBey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Holleman, John)
September 18, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Jesus Gonzalez, Albina Grave, Olivar Pollard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Holleman, John)
September 17, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Albina Grave and Cynthia Mooney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Holleman, John)
September 16, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Gregory Harris (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
September 15, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE by Healthcare Services Group Inc of Change of Lead Counsel (Sulzer, Kenneth)
September 15, 2014 Filing 170 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Roland Aguilar, Alfred Benson 1, Alfred Benson 2, Keli Lowery, Thomas McNeal, Berick Rogers, Tamara Spencer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Holleman, John)
September 12, 2014 Filing 169 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Marshall Bowman, Teresa Burnett, Christopher Hess, Ruth L Scibek (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Holleman, John)
September 11, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Linda Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
September 10, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: John M O'Connell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
September 10, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Travis Dobbins, Sabrina Jones, Michael G Turner, Michael Wells (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Holleman, John)
September 8, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Michael Capozzi, Brandon McKinney, Timothy Smith, Lisa A Stephenson, Elarence D Vinson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Holleman, John)
September 8, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Wayne Manswell, Michael Miller, Pearlie Utsey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Holleman, John)
September 5, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Brent Greene, Timothy Hayes, Timothy Hoover, Melinda Lucero, Kathy McCollum, Ian McLean, William McMahon, Elarence Vinson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Holleman, John)
September 4, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Crescencio Cortez Diaz and Matthew T. White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Holleman, John)
September 3, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Sharon Hutchings and Kaye Whittsett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Holleman, John)
September 2, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: JaQuan C Bomar 1, JaQuan C Bomar 2, James Cameron, Jose Coronel, Casey Cruz 1, Casey Cruz 2, Warren Eichner, James Mapp, Bonnie Petrie, Jeff Tross, Scott Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Holleman, John)
August 29, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Angelica Fields (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
August 28, 2014 Filing 158 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Sergio Escalante, Marie Ann Galloway, Rafael Pizarro, Kisa Rogers, Gloria J Thibodeaux (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Holleman, John)
August 27, 2014 Filing 157 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Valerie Harrison, Andrew Kenneth Rada 1, Andrew Kenneth Rada 2, Isabel Santiago (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Holleman, John)
August 26, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Gary A Bilek, William E. Duncan, Bill Luten, James Roberts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Holleman, John)
August 25, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Wilburn Bassett Jr, Sheri Gavin, Sharon Greene, Jermaine Jackson, Paul Jarrell, Eugene McQuinter, Robert B. Regalado, Sarah L. Smith, Keith Swett, Sergio Zepeda (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Holleman, John)
August 22, 2014 Filing 154 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Kelley Shawna, Oliver Pollard, Miranda Stagner, Andrea Watts, Lorenzo Wilson, Otis Wynn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Holleman, John)
August 21, 2014 Filing 153 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: William Baxter, Aaron Castro, Marty Celements, Clifton Gueco, Jasmine Howlett, Theresa Hruska, James Myers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Holleman, John)
August 19, 2014 Filing 152 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to File: Eliane DaSilva (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
August 18, 2014 Filing 151 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Consent to Join Collective Action: Isidro Aguayo, Jesse Andrade, Richard Collins, Diana Cotten, Robert Depasquale, Kenneth Gaither, Kelly Goad, Jeremiah Goldberg, Maria Gonzales, Cameron Handy, Sandra Hernandez, Christy House, Patricia Long, Arthur Martinez 1, Arthur Martinez 2, and Africa Payne (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Holleman, John)
August 15, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Brandee Yarbro, Jordan Beegle 1, Jordan Beegle 2, Joseph Carrera, Betty Clark, Shaley Clemm, Karen Duckett, Greg Erickson, Jose Garibay, Calvin Gowin, Randell Hendricks, Terry Jenkins, Scott Killips, Angela Stultz, Fred Velasquez 1, Fred Velasquez 2, Erica Walls, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Holleman, John)
August 14, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Cindy Callahan, Kathleen Damkoehler, Merlin Grassiree, Scott Powers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Holleman, John)
August 13, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Charles Alotto, Aaron Brown, Randy Charles, Thomas Cote, Sandra Desouza, Sherman Henderson, Charles Phelps, James Roberts, Rickey Wilson, Carlos Zavala (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Holleman, John)
August 11, 2014 Filing 147 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Karin Cockrell, Mark Hieronimus, Sarah J Hubbard, Reginald Hudnall, Corey Jamison, Thomas F. Kennedy 1, Thomas F. Kennedy 2, Victoria Kleinschmit, Joseph Ostrowski, Matthew Quimby, Lester Shaw, Lisa Stratton, Ivan Tadeo, Zacharri Trujillo, Jessie Tutro, Chris Vilato, Tommy Vinson, Glen Weitzel, Kenneth Wood (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Holleman, John)
August 8, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Mitchell Alberto, Ritesh Chand, Rosie Charles, Monique Crawford, Victoria Hardee 1, Victoria Hardee 2, Leonard Harris, Mark Howard, Donald Kirkland, Barbara Miller, Julio Solano (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Holleman, John)
August 7, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Conset to Join Collective Action: Amber Whit Church (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
August 7, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Jeremy Banks, Marteisha Chamblee, Marteisha Chamblee 2, Joseph E Hocker III, Barron Johnson, Kelly Johnson, Anthony Nguyen, Joseph Siam (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Holleman, John)
August 6, 2014 Filing 143 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Lynn Harris, Michelle Mahoney, Brian Murrell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Holleman, John)
August 5, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Ireland, Wilson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Holleman, John)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Gloria M. Portela, Seyfarth Shaw LLP, 700 Milam Street, Suite 1400, Houston, Texas 77002, telephone number 713.225.2341, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/5/2014. (ch, )
August 4, 2014 Filing 140 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Benford, Castro, Ellison, Hunsinger, Jennings, Lanier, Lanier, Medina, Ross, Sanchez, Schaefer, Wells, Woods, Alexander, Belis, Bracco, Carlson, Diffey, Dunbar, Fallie, Fuller, Harris, Kellum, McGuire, Reynaga, Robbins, Shouse, Walls, Watts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29)(Holleman, John)
August 4, 2014 Filing 139 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Gloria M. Portela, filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Moore, Steven)
August 1, 2014 Filing 138 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Baines, Efird, Getz, Hicks, Rodriguez, Rodriguez, Todd, Wyland (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Holleman, John)
July 31, 2014 Filing 137 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Armstrong, Bauman, Browning, Diaz, Hryn, Martinez, Musgrove, Oxford, Peters (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Holleman, John)
July 30, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Blankenship, Britt, Romo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Holleman, John)
July 29, 2014 Filing 135 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Duncan, Falt, Flowers, O'Connor, Pinto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Holleman, John)
July 28, 2014 Filing 134 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Domingo, Farley, Haskins, Hoyle, Salyers, Torres, Townsend, Waltzer-Lewis, Warnick, Wells, Alfonso, Ayala, Claudio, Dean, Dean, Dib, Dixon, Duke, Eiler, Glee, Granados, Harrington, Hennung, Hill, Little, Martinez, Mendoza, Ross, Sullivan, Todd, Treat, Valoricristo, Wilcox, Zelaya (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34)(Holleman, John)
July 25, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Bays, Caldwell, Caudill, Hunter, Jamison, Maxwell, Mitchell, Muckelvaney, Ramirez, Rivera, Slocum, White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Holleman, John)
July 24, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Appleman, Davis, Draughn, Erta, Hernandez, Hieronimus, Jenkins, Jenkins, Juno, Newton, Peregrina, Pope, Shaw, Stogdill, Wajer, Ware, Wright (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Holleman, John)
July 23, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Arrasmith, Donald, Knight, McFarland, McQuirter, Peyatt Jr, Thompson, Willis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Holleman, John)
July 22, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Hess, Gullikson, Long, McMillen, Rymarenko, Rynerson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Holleman, John)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/21/2014. (ch, )
July 21, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Brown, Brown, Courtney, DeMary, Santos, Harmon, Johnson, Mason, Morales, Shouse, Tyson, Verhelle, Wynes, Baker, Barbera, Barron, Bell, Brooks, Carey, Durden, Davis, Devine, Downs, Duncan, Elbert, Falt, Gomez, Harper, Harrell, Johnson, Kirk, Klotz, Loheac, McNeely, Noa, Pagnozzi, Petty, Price, Reynolds, Stinson, Uma, Uma, Urbanek, Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44)(Holleman, John)
July 18, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Casimir, Denton, Eckberg, Evan, Ferguson, Flegler, Franklin, Garcia, Harris, Hunt, Hunt, Labrado, McCoy, Russell, Smith, Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Holleman, John)
July 17, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Cantrell, Davis, Holliday, Kroh, McGraw, Nascimento, Newton, Patterson, Schisel, Ulmer, Williams, Zirkle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit `1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Holleman, John)
July 16, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action: Clark (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
July 16, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Anderson, Barger, Davis, Farrow, Harris, Henry, Henry, Humphrey, Humphrey, Jacome, Maddern, Noah, Schweingruber, Schweingruber, Shepard, Tavares, Underwood, Whitfield, O'Brien (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Holleman, John)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 AMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER re #119 Joint MOTION for Discovery Order filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/15/2014. (nkl, )
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/15/2014. (nkl, )
July 15, 2014 Filing 121 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Modrak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
July 15, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Blaha, Davis, Christopher, Dawson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Holleman, John)
July 14, 2014 Filing 119 Joint MOTION for Discovery Order by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Discovery Order)(Stiegler, Charles)
July 14, 2014 Filing 118 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stiegler, Charles)
July 14, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Allen, Banagan, Bliese, Brancaccio, Brooks, Brumett, Cannon, Carroll, Charles, Christian, Cortijo Rivera, Cotten, DeLeon, DeLeon, Ehrhardt, Fleming, Fosbrink, Fox, Gietz, Gonzalez, Gutierrez, Johns, Jones, Kelly, Mainor, McAllister, McAllister, Miller, Mosher, Mungorayla, Owen, Ramos, Reyes, Sisco, Smith, Stewart, Taylor, Tremblett, Walls, Williams, Griffin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41)(Holleman, John)
July 14, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO FILE A MOTION AND ATTACH ORDER Document # 116, Submission of Proposed Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
July 11, 2014 Filing 116 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE***Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Healthcare Services Group Inc . (Sulzer, Kenneth) Modified on 7/14/2014 (ch, ).
July 11, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Crawford, Cruz, Delgado, Frank, Gittens, Gross, Leak, Logan, Martinez, Martinez, McCue, Perreault-Smith, Perreault-Smith, Privett, Rice, Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Holleman, John)
July 10, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Anderson, Ardds, Barton, Brooks, Ellison, Goldberg, Gori, Guadron, Harmon, Heimlich, Holland, Patterson, Razo, Razo, Smith, Sorensen, Stucker, Ticzon, Walls, Wynia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Holleman, John)
July 9, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Arrasmith, Conwasy, Davis, Hart, Hayes, Johnson, Johnson, Johnson, Mack, Roth, Sullivan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Holleman, John)
July 8, 2014 Filing 112 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Efird, Morin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Holleman, John)
July 8, 2014 Filing 111 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/30/14 (Scheduling Conference) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/1/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2014. (sholmes, )
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #79 Motion and Brief for Extension of Deadlines and for Other Relief. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/8/2014. (ch, )
July 7, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Amaya, Anderson, Arroyo-Suarez, Baez, Barnard, Barnes, Bell III, Beutel, Boyd, Bradford, Bradford, Browbn, Buck, Cannon, Capozzi, Carpenter, Carrasuillo, Casey, Casey, Charlot, Colvin, DeCourt, Dennis, Desmarais, Donald, Drutowski, Falt, Garcia, Gash, Ciruzzi, Gomes, Gylfe, Hall, Hammett, Hern II, Hern II, Holder, House, Hull, Jenkins, Krocak, Lawless, Lee, Lerew, Lewis, Little, Lowe, Lyons, Mainwaring, Mainwaring, Middlebrooks, Nichols, Ostrowski, Packard, Pirozzi, Ratchford, Renner, Reynaga, Robbins, Robinson, Rollyson, Ruiz, Scott, Seavey, Smith, Taylor, Turner, Turner, Vega, Weston, Williams, Wilson, Wood, Wright (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74)(Holleman, John)
July 3, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Axt, Barbarello, Bishop, calarroda, Evans, Giles, Hall, Hanna, Hanna, Jackson, Jones, Kalba, Keown, Kimble, Kosinski, Kosinski, Lucero, Mayberry, Moates, Nguyen, Padilla, Pinto, Pulido, Ramos, Schrader, Sheakley, Smith, Taylor, Webb, White, Woods, Wright, Ziebarth (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33)(Holleman, John)
July 2, 2014 Filing 107 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Blaha, Robertson-Callaway, Robertson-Callaway, Crawford, Denman, Denman, Dutt, Ewing, Floyd, Gueco, Hansen, Monn, Mullins, Robertson, Schmidt, Sprayberry-Church, Sprayberry-Church, Warrington, Webb, Welch, Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Holleman, John)
July 1, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Allen, Allen, Chaudhry, DiChiavo, Gallant, Holmquist, Odum, Odum, Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Holleman, John)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Docket Control Order: Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Amended Pleadings due by 11/4/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 11/4/2014. Jury Selection set for 7/13/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation Completion due by 12/3/2014. Motions in Limine due by 6/2/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/14/2015. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/01/2014. (nkl, )
June 30, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 6/30/2014. Counsel present at the hearing were Misses Jackson and Ocker; Messrs. Holleman, Steadman, Sulzer and Smith. The Court discussed various scheduling and discovery matters. The parties will submit an Agreed Protective Order within 10 days, and supplement their briefing on the class discovery issue within two weeks. Defendant to provide information requested by Plaintiffs within 30 days. The Court ruled on various motions.(Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR, CRR.) (jml)
June 30, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Acosta, Albuquerque, Ammons, Bell, Blankenship, Brackett, Bray, Carcamo, Chiplin, Chiplin, Cloer, Cornelius, DeCuire, delucia, Duenaz, Ellison, Fulkerson, Gillham, Gipson, Glee, Gonzalez, Griffin, Gutierrez, Hirsch, Jefferson, Kimling, Kleinschmit, Klinger, Latimore, Le, Le, Loman, Ludlam, Malone, Meadows, Morris, Parson, Perez, Petro, Powers, Pulliam, Quinanilla, Ramos, Ramos, Roberts, Salas, Sanchez, Schuster, Scott, Scott, Scott, Shakleford, SHakleford, Stinson, Stokes, Sullivan, Tani, Tarasick, Tarasick, Tayor, Ulmer, Wemette, Willette (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63)(Holleman, John)
June 30, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Absher, Aldridge, Alfonso, Altman, Banks, Bryan, Callahan, Calzada, Chicas, Clark, Corbin, Davis, Davis, DeLeon, Dominguez, Dorman, Elam, Evans, Ford, Gavin, Granados, Greco, Gutshall, Hackman, Hill, Hill, Hutto, Irvin, Jackson, Jackson, Jacobs, Jeter, Jimenez, Jimenez, Johnson, Knowles, Krueger, Maldonado, Marshall, Meyers, Middlebrooks, Mitchell, Morales, Muniz, Noland, Nye, Payne, Phebus, Ramos, Reich, Samayoa, Schaaf, Smith, Sumoba, Tafolla, Turner, White, Wofford, Wojtalewicz, Ybarra, Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61)(Holleman, John)
June 27, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent To Join Collective Action:Baez, Barbera, Brooks, Burdett, Burns, Caraballo, Carter, Cleveland, Clinton-Seals, Cummings, Cummings, Diaz, Edwards, Fuentes, Hagorman, Hall, Harris, Hays, Heard, Hernandez, Highsmith, Hollopeter, Hood, Jones, Kiphorn, Klotz, Leon, Lopez, Lowe, Mahoney, Marcelino, Moore, Moore, Nelson, Perkins, Phillips, Price, Ray, Schneider, Smith, Stevents, Sullivan, Torres, Trefethen, Trefethen, Trevino, Tubbs, Tubbs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48)(Holleman, John)
June 26, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Allen, Austin, Barnes, Bivens, Blackburn, Blouin, Carter, Chisolm, Claudio, Collins, Cornelison, Deeg, DeMary, Downs, Fincher, Freid, Gerih, Gonzalez, Gotch, Griffin, Grubb, Harper, Herman, Hernandez, Hogan, Jackson, Jordan, King, king, Lanham, Libby, Little, Lorance, Lorance, Macdonald, Macdonald, Martell, McBride, McChristy, McChristy, Medina, Mendoza, Mendoza, Minor, Morin, Murrell, Perdomo, Rivera, Robbins, Roberts, Robinson, Schaefer, Shaver, Thompson, Trisket, Verdugo, Verdugo, Williams, Hernandez, Townsend, Zissler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61)(Holleman, John)
June 25, 2014 Filing 99 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Holleman, John)
June 25, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Britt, Edwards, Ford, Harrell, Hills, Hunt, Huval, Johnson, Kondaiya, Mansfield, McCloud, Miller, Monaco, Pleming, Rice, Scott, Shemanski, Spivey, Stichler, Thomas, Thomas, Underwood, Walker, Wilson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Holleman, John)
June 24, 2014 Filing 97 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Aievoli, Bessette, Dewberry, Dos Reis, Duncan, Garcia, Hansen, Jones, Jones, Libby Jr., Reynolds, Reynolds, Ricketts, Smith, White, Whilloughby (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Holleman, John)
June 23, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (ch, )
June 23, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Baines, Bennett, Bowling, Bradley, Brannam, Brooking, Brown, Christian, Clinton, Conn, Cotton, Devshom, Domingo, Draughn, Edging, Eggertsen, Esquiver, Feliciano, Foust, Garcia, Garner, Gentry, Glass, Graff, Gruszynshe, Hamilton, Hartman, Hartwell, Heafner, Hemingway, Hemingway, Henderson, Hernandez, Hirai, Huckaby, Jackson, Laird, Layne, Lewis, Livingston, Lopez, Martinez, Maxwell, Mazur, McMillen, Medina, Mingo, Morris, Newman, OBrien, OShaughnessy, Patel, Patel, Phillips, Polen, Preski, Quarrell, Reich, Restine, Robinson, Rodriguez, Rutledge, Schisel II, Schulte, Seddon, Shelton, Skiles, Smith, Tavares, Taylor, VanDeWalle, VanDeWalle, Wade, Walker, Waltzer-Lewis, Wells, Williams, Wilson, Wise, Zissler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80)(Holleman, John)
June 23, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Anderson, Appleman, Belis, Bentley, Bentley, Berrier, Bourbon, Bowers, Brannam, Brooks, Bryant, Cagle, Cahak, Claudio, Coffee, Colon, Courtney, Davis, DeLaittre, Dib, Elliott, Ermiger, Erta, Fallie, Finsness, Frederiksen, Gandy, Garibay, Giddens, Goodman, Gullikson, Hamner, Harney, Harris, Hilburn, Hill, Holding, Honeycutt, Hudnall, Hudson, Isham, Jensen, Jimenez, Johnson, Kennedy, Kennedy, King, Kirk, Lambert, Lane, Lippy, Lopez, Luten, Lyons, Marshall, McDeavitt, McKinney, Moore, newsom, Nola, Olson, Page, Parks, Paul, Perry, Podgurski, Powers, Riley, Roberts, Robinson, Sallee, Sand, Shelton, Silva, Simpson, Sims, Sims, Skotzke, Smith, Smith, Steele, Sternal, Summers, Valdez, Valvo, Waldron, Washington, Watson, Whitaker, Williams, Wilson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit 91)(Holleman, John)
June 23, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Steven Woodrow Moore on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4714981. (Moore, Steven)
June 20, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Borque, Brown, Bump, Christianson, Cogdill, Coll, Collins, Cordova, Crump, Diaz, Franke, Geren, Gravedoni, Grey, Harris, Hart, Henderson, Henry, Herndon, Hines, Hollanquest, Hryn, Johnson, Joseph, Kelly, Knighton, Lamon, Lopez, Madrigal, Majors, Majra, Neighbors, Oliver, Oneill, Pappas, Paquin Jr., Patton, Pevey, Proffitt, Reed, Robinson, Senn, Smith, Tollinchi, Towers, Wells Jr., Williams, Wimer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48)(Holleman, John)
June 20, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Andersen, Banagan, Barrick, Baxter, Beatty, Carter, Claye, Clinton-Seals, Collins, Edwards, Farrow, Floyd, Gentry, Harrell, Hesse, Heyward, Hipsky Jr., Huffman, Huggins Sr., Huggins Sr., Jackson, Jennings, Jones, Juno, Kearschner, Kern, Kern, Kirby, Levarity, Long, McDaniel, Meserve, Minear, Montaldo, Muckelvaney, Mulock, Noah, Nunez, Okun, Oshaughnessy, Prior, Purifoy, Rivera, Smith, Smith, Stacy, Stevens, Stubbs, Talley, Talley, Todd, Tolliver, Tolliver, Washington, Wey, Willoughby (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56)(Holleman, John)
June 19, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action:Alvis, Atwood, Ayers, Batchelder, Bauman, Beck, Block, Bolles, Boyd, Brewster, Bundle, Campos, Carpinteyro, Castro, Christal, Clifton, Close, Colby, Cryderman, Davis, Dehart, Diaz, Dodd, Epps, Estrada, Farrar, Fox, Frank, Franklin, Gardner, Gomez, Grady, Grayson, Greico, Gueco, Hartman, Hernandez, Himes, Hixon, Howell, Hubbard, Humphrey, Hunsinger, Jackson, Jester, Johnson Jr, Jones, Jones, Kerr, King, Kreck, Grieger, Kubicek, Littlejohn, Loucks, Marshall, Mason, McClanahan, McCrea, McQueen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60)(Holleman, John)
June 19, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Meade, Mercado, Mitchell, Mitchell, Mitchell, Montgomery, Morehead, Moss, Muhs, Nieto, Oglesby, Pack, Peal, Peregrina, Perkins, Pettus, Pryor, Richard, Robinson, Rodriguez, Romero, Roth, Royalty, Rubio, Rubio, Schmunk, Scott, Sebastio, Serrano, Shaw, Sills, Sims, Smith, Staples, Stephens, Summers, Terry, Udoetok, Warner, Washington Jr., Washington, Watson, Watson, Watts, Wells, Williams, Wyland, Zerrudo, Zimmerman, Zimmerman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50)(Holleman, John)
June 18, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Adcock, Banks, Bartolomei, Calvin, Cannon, Collins, Green, Johnson, Lowery, McBride, McQuirter, McQuirter, Moore, Phillips, Royster-Hooks, Russell, Stevens, Tardy, Tardy, Tocco, Whelan, Wilhelm, Wilks, Wofford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Holleman, John)
June 17, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Sharon Espinosa, Rickey Fields, Deshora McAdoo, Donald Quinn, Rodney Richardson, John Stevens, Ruby Testerman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Holleman, John)
June 17, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Ty Barnhart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
June 16, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Clerkley, Lopez, Vaughn, Johnson, Krieger, Carter, Jimenez, Simm, Bufford, Hayden, Richard, Garcia, Wimer, Burton, McQueen, Trevino, McBride, Wesson, Shook, Santiago, Coleman, Kearschner, Connell, Boe, Dillingham, Perez, Jones, Flegler, Parker, Whitkamack, Cooper, Brantner, Lowery, Dodd, Moss, Franklin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36)(Holleman, John)
June 16, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Chris Audibert (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
June 13, 2014 Filing 84 RESPONSE to Motion re #77 MOTION for Reconsideration re #65 Memorandum & Opinion [DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CERTIFYING ORDER FOR APPEAL (DOCKET ENTRY #65] PLAINTIFFS SURREPLY TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER (DKT #65) GRANTING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CERTIFYING ORDER FOR APPEAL filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
June 11, 2014 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion re #77 MOTION for Reconsideration re #65 Memorandum & Opinion [DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CERTIFYING ORDER FOR APPEAL (DOCKET ENTRY #65] filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Kushner, Brad)
June 10, 2014 Filing 82 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #79 Emergency MOTION extension of deadline and other relief PLAINTIFFS SURREPLY TO DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE AND OTHER RELIEF filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
June 9, 2014 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #79 Emergency MOTION extension of deadline and other relief filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Kushner, Brad)
June 9, 2014 Filing 80 RESPONSE to Motion re #79 Emergency MOTION extension of deadline and other relief PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS EMERGENCY MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE AND OTHER RELIEF filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
June 6, 2014 Filing 79 Emergency MOTION extension of deadline and other relief by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Osbeck Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
June 4, 2014 Filing 78 RESPONSE to Motion re #77 MOTION for Reconsideration re #65 Memorandum & Opinion [DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CERTIFYING ORDER FOR APPEAL (DOCKET ENTRY #65] Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Order (DKT #65) Granting Conditional Certification or, in the Alternative, Certifying Order for Appeal filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Holleman, John)
May 30, 2014 Filing 77 MOTION for Reconsideration re #65 Memorandum & Opinion [DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER GRANTING CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CERTIFYING ORDER FOR APPEAL (DOCKET ENTRY #65] by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Kushner, Brad)
May 30, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc (Smith, Michael)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2014 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/30/2014. (nkl, )
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - re: to the Courts Memorandum Opinion and Order. For the reasons stated above, Plaintiffs proposed class action notices and consent forms are hereby APPROVED subject to the changes described above. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within ten (10) days of this date, Defendant HSG shall provide Plaintiffs with the names, current or last-known physical and e-mail addresses, telephone numbers, and dates of employment of the members of the collective action class. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/29/2014. (ch, )
May 19, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Enzo DerBoghossian on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4664972. (DerBoghossian, Enzo)
May 19, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Charles J Stiegler on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4664954. (Stiegler, Charles)
May 19, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Laura Reathaford on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4664848. (Reathaford, Laura)
May 19, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth Dawson Sulzer on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4664708. (Sulzer, Kenneth)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph D Shelby terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/16/2014. (ch, )
May 15, 2014 Filing 68 RESPONSE to Motion re #56 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED NOTICE filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Holleman, John)
May 15, 2014 Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney JOSEPH D. SHELBY by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kleinman, Kenneth)
May 12, 2014 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Salaried Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Hourly Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Salaried Notice of Consent, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Hourly Notice of Consent)(Staley, James)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/2/2014. (ch, )
March 25, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Padraig McAuley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
February 20, 2014 Filing 63 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #56 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Londa, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2014 Filing 62 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
February 10, 2014 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION AND BRIEF TO CONDITIONALLY CERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION AND SENDNOTICE TO CLASS MEMBERS PURSUANT TO 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
February 7, 2014 Filing 60 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Consent to Join Collective Action: James T. Ayers III (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
January 31, 2014 Filing 59 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #58 Response to Motion,.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit)(Staley, James)
January 31, 2014 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Motion re #56 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Staley, James)
January 20, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
January 14, 2014 Filing 56 Opposed MOTION to Certify Class by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. Responses due by 1/31/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46)(Holleman, John)
January 14, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action: Julie McCoy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
January 7, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
December 24, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Consent to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
December 17, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
December 13, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
December 11, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Holleman, John)
December 11, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2013 re #41 Opposed Motion to Compel Discovery. Counsel on the call were Misses Jackson and Ocker; Messrs. Steadman, Kleinman, Kushner and Shelby. The Court carried ruling on the Motion to Compel. Counsel are to contact the Court's law clerk (Ms. Wang) after the 30(b)(6) deposition is taken. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.)(jml)
December 11, 2013 Corrected Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2013 re 41 Opposed Motion to Compel Discovery. Counsel on the call were Misses Jackson and Ocker; Messrs. Steadman, Kleinman, Kushner, Staley and Shelby. The Court carried ruling on the Motion to Compel. Counsel are to contact the Court's law clerk (Ms. Wang) after the 30(b)(6) deposition is taken. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.)(jml) (Entered: 2013-12-11 )
December 9, 2013 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #41 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery : Motion Hearing RESET for 12/11/2013 09:30 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***The Court's telephone conference number is (903) 938-8452. The parties are to contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call.*** PLEASE NOTE THAT THE ONLY CHANGE IS THE TIME FOR THE HEARING.(jml) Modified on 12/10/2013 (jml, ).
December 9, 2013 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #41 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2013 02:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***The Court's telephone conference number is (903) 938-8452. The parties are to contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call.***(jml)
December 6, 2013 Filing 49 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #41 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Staley, James)
December 6, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph P Hofmann on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4431897. (Hofmann, Joseph)
December 5, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to John Terrell Holleman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Holleman, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re #41 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSED MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holleman, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 45 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
November 25, 2013 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Amended and Substituted Notice to take Depositin of Defendant's Corporae Representative, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Staley, James)
November 21, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Consent to Join Collective Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
November 19, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman of Filing of Consent to Join (Spencer Pike) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spencer Pike Consent)(Steadman, Timothy)
November 8, 2013 Filing 41 Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10/14/2013 Letter from Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit 10/29/2013 Letter from Defendant, #3 Exhibit 10/31/2013 Letter from Plaintiffs, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ocker, Dorotha)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Joint Proposed Docket Control Order on Class Certification Issues. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/4/2013. (ch, )
October 30, 2013 Filing 39 Submission of by Healthcare Services Group Inc Joint Proposed Docket Control Order On Class Certification Issues. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Staley, James)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - Court hereby DENIES Plaintiffs Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Action and Send Notice to Class Members WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Further ORDERED to jointly submit a proposed docket control order to the Court within fourteen (14) days from this date, which provides a defined period of immediate discovery limited to the certification issues discussed above. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/16/13. (ehs, )
October 14, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/2/13 (Class Certification Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2014. (sholmes, )
October 4, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
October 2, 2013 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 10/2/2013 re #11 MOTION to Certify Class under the FLSA. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
September 13, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #11 MOTION to Certify Class under the FLSA : Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Scheduling Conference to follow the Motion hearing.(jml)
September 12, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 10/2/2013 02:00 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
August 19, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 10/3/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/6/2013 11:20 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/15/2013. (ch, ) Modified on 8/19/2013 (ch, ).
August 8, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE of return of service to HealthCare Services Group Inc on 7/8/13 delivery of Pltf's Opposed Motion and Brief to Conditionally Certify Collective Action and Send Notice to Class Members Pursuant to 29 USC 216(b) (ehs, )
August 6, 2013 Filing 32 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Certify Class under the FLSA filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Kleinman, Kenneth)
August 2, 2013 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #28 Response to Non-Motion, filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Holleman, John)
August 2, 2013 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Certify Class under the FLSA filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Holleman, John)
July 25, 2013 Filing 29 NOTICE by Healthcare Services Group Inc re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Certificate of Service (Londa, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2013 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Certify Class, Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' Advertisement, #2 Exhibit B: Redlined Version of Plaintiffs' Proposed Notice, #3 Text of Proposed Order Sustaining Objections)(Londa, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2013 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Certify Class under the FLSA filed by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration, #2 Exhibit B: Declaration, #3 Exhibit C: Declaration, #4 Exhibit D: Declaration, #5 Exhibit E: Declaration, #6 Exhibit F: Declaration, #7 Exhibit G: Declaration, #8 Exhibit H: Declaration, #9 Exhibit I: Declaration, #10 Exhibit J: Declaration, #11 Exhibit K. Declaration, #12 Exhibit L: Declaration, #13 Exhibit M: Declaration, #14 Exhibit N: Depo, #15 Exhibit O: Declaration, #16 Exhibit P: Declaration, #17 Exhibit Q: Depo, #18 Exhibit R: Declaration, #19 Exhibit S: Declaration, #20 Exhibit T: Depo, #21 Exhibit U: Depo, #22 Exhibit V: Declaration, #23 Exhibit W: Declaration, #24 Exhibit X: Depo, #25 Exhibit Y: Declaration, #26 Exhibit Z: Redline Proposed Notice, #27 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion)(Londa, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2013 Filing 26 NOTICE by Healthcare Services Group Inc of Agreed Deadline Pursuant to The Eastern District Local Rules for Defendant Healthcare Services Group, Inc. to File Its Response to Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion and Brief To Conditionally Certify Collective Action and Send Notice to Class Members (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-mail)(Staley, James)
July 17, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James R Staley on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc (Staley, James)
July 17, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Timothy A Steadman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4225810. (Steadman, Timothy)
July 17, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Maryna O Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4225799. (Jackson, Maryna)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/16/2013. (ch, )
July 16, 2013 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Certify Class under the FLSAEmergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Certify Class under the FLSA PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY OPPOSED MOTION FOR THE ENTRY OF AN ORDER EXTENDING THE RESPONSE DEADLINE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONDITIONALLY CERTIFY COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Holleman, John)
July 15, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman Regarding Readiness for Status Conference (Ocker, Dorotha)
July 15, 2013 Filing 19 Cert of Svc that pltf's opposed motion and Brief to conditionally certify collective action and send ntc to class members pursuant to 29 USC 216(b) via hand delivery (ehs, )
July 15, 2013 Filing 18 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Certify Class under the FLSA by Healthcare Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certificate of Conference)(Kleinman, Kenneth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2013: #4 CORRECTED ORDER) (ch, ).
July 10, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brad Michael Kushner on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4216293. (Kushner, Brad)
July 10, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Theresa M Zechman on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4216281. (Zechman, Theresa)
July 10, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph D Shelby on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4216275. (Shelby, Joseph)
July 10, 2013 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Healthcare Services Group Inc.(Londa, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth D Kleinman on behalf of Healthcare Services Group Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4216253. (Kleinman, Kenneth)
July 5, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION: MICHAEL MUHS, BARBARA LASWELL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Holleman, John)
July 5, 2013 Filing 11 OPPOSED MOTION to Certify Class under the FLSA by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Holleman, John) ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2013: #9 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
July 3, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION: WANDA SHANEYFELT, KELLY PERKINS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Holleman, John)
July 3, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dorotha Michelle Ocker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ocker, Dorotha)
July 1, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION: RONALD MCBRIDE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holleman, John)
June 26, 2013 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman, Sandra Kelly. Healthcare Services Group Inc served on 6/20/2013, answer due 7/11/2013. (ehs, )
June 26, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION: DEBRAL SHAUL, MARILYN HUCKABY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Holleman, John)
June 26, 2013 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 4 and 5 submitted NOT IN CORRECT FORMAT NO SIGNATURE PAGE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
June 25, 2013 Filing 5 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION: SHAUL, DEBRA (Holleman, John) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ch, ).
June 25, 2013 Filing 4 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Sandra Kelly, Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman CONSENT TO JOIN COLLECTIVE ACTION: HUCKABY, MARILYN (Holleman, John) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ch, ).
June 3, 2013 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Healthcare Services Group Inc. (ch, )
June 3, 2013 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Healthcare Services Group Inc. (ehs, )
June 3, 2013 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ehs, )
May 31, 2013 Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. (ehs, )
May 31, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Healthcare Services Group Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4162048.), filed by Sylvia Patino, Janice Waltman, Sandra Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Exhibit A, #3 Summons(es))(Holleman, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly et al v. Healthcare Services Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Kelly
Represented By: Matthew M Ford
Represented By: Jerry D Garner
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman
Represented By: Dorotha Michelle Ocker
Represented By: Timothy A Steadman
Represented By: Maryna O Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Patino
Represented By: Matthew M Ford
Represented By: Jerry D Garner
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman
Represented By: Dorotha Michelle Ocker
Represented By: Timothy A Steadman
Represented By: Maryna O Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Waltman
Represented By: Matthew M Ford
Represented By: Jerry D Garner
Represented By: John Terrell Holleman
Represented By: Dorotha Michelle Ocker
Represented By: Timothy A Steadman
Represented By: Maryna O Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthcare Services Group Inc
Represented By: Enzo DerBoghossian
Represented By: Robert A Escalante
Represented By: Joseph P Hofmann
Represented By: Brad Michael Kushner
Represented By: Jeffrey C Londa
Represented By: Laura Reathaford
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: James R Staley
Represented By: Theresa M Zechman
Represented By: Joseph D Shelby
Represented By: Kenneth Dawson Sulzer
Represented By: Charles J Stiegler
Represented By: Kenneth D Kleinman
Represented By: Stacey C. S. Cerrone
Represented By: Dawn M Amos
Represented By: Steven Woodrow Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Gloria Portela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: F Witcher McCullough, III
Represented By: F Witcher McCullough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?