Rockstar Consortium US LP et al v. Google Inc Featured Case

Plaintiffs Rockstar Consortium US LP and Netstar Technologies LLP allege that Google Inc. participated in, but did not win, an auction of Nortel’s patent portfolio in July 2011. The plaintiffs allege that despite losing the auction, Google is using the patented inventions, infringing on the plaintiffs' rights. The patents at issue are U.S. Patent Nos. 6,098,065; 7,236,969; 7,469,245; 7,672,970; 7,895,178; 7,895,183; and 7,933,883. They generally describe to "Associative Search Engine" inventions.

Plaintiff: Rockstar Consortium US LP and NetStar Technologies LLC
Defendant: Google Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv00893
Filed: October 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Presiding Judge: Roy S. Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting 316 Notice Regarding Google's Motion to Enforce the Protective Order 90 mooting 310 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/31/2015. (ch, )
March 31, 2015 Filing 316 NOTICE by Google Inc re 310 SEALED MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order (Dkt. 90) of Stipulation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carl)
March 26, 2015 Filing 315 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Johnny William Carter on behalf of Susman Godfrey L.L.P. (Carter, Johnny)
March 25, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 310 SEALED MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order (Dkt. 90) : Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2015 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
March 17, 2015 Filing 314 SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 310 SEALED MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order (Dkt. 90) filed by Susman Godfrey L.L.P.. (Nelson, Justin)
March 10, 2015 Filing 313 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 310 SEALED MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order (Dkt. 90) filed by Google Inc. (Perlson, David)
March 10, 2015 Filing 312 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 311 Sealed Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Nelson, Justin)
March 5, 2015 Filing 311 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 310 SEALED MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order (Dkt. 90) filed by Susman Godfrey L.L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
February 20, 2015 Filing 310 SEALED MOTION to Enforce the Protective Order (Dkt. 90) by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Carl G. Anderson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting 308 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/29/15. (ch, )
January 29, 2015 Filing 308 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
January 27, 2015 Filing 307 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 306 SEALED ORDER - Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/27/2015. (ch, ) Modified on 1/27/2015 (ch, ).
January 26, 2015 Filing 305 NOTICE by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP re 301 Sealed Patent Document, Certificate of Authority to File Under Seal (Schwegmann, Christopher)
January 26, 2015 Filing 304 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Notice of Filing Supplemental Evidence. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schwegmann, Christopher) Modified on 1/27/2015 (ch, ).
January 26, 2015 ***DISREGARD DEFICIENCY FOR # 301***NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 301 submitted CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, ) Modified on 1/27/2015 (ch, ).
January 25, 2015 Filing 303 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Susman Godfrey L.L.P.'s Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction [dkt 297]. (Tribble, Max)
January 25, 2015 Filing 302 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS TO 301 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Schwegmann, Christopher)
January 25, 2015 Filing 301 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Rockstar's Response in Opposition to Susman Godfrey's Emergency Ex Parte Motion to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwegmann, Christopher) Modified on 1/26/2015 (ch, )
January 23, 2015 Filing 300 Sealed Response to Susman Godfrey's Under Seal Filings (Dkt. Nos. 295, 296, and 297). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Perlson, David)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER re 297 Sealed Patent Document, 295 Sealed Patent Document. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/23/2015. (ch, )
January 23, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing Motion: Hearing on Intervenor's Motion 297 set for 1/26/2015 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
January 23, 2015 Filing 298 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher John Schwegmann on behalf of NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP (Schwegmann, Christopher)
January 22, 2015 Filing 297 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT Emergency Ex Parte Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Manne, Neal) Modified on 1/22/2015 (ch, ).
January 22, 2015 Filing 296 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Verified Complaint in Intervention (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Manne, Neal) Modified on 1/22/2015 (ch, ).
January 22, 2015 Filing 295 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Manne, Neal)
January 22, 2015 Filing 294 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neal S Manne on behalf of Susman Godfrey L.L.P. (Manne, Neal)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER re: Extending Stay - Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/5/2015. (ch, )
December 29, 2014 Filing 292 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 291 Sealed Document.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Justin)
December 29, 2014 Filing 291 Sealed Joint Status Report and Request to Extend Stay Pending Finalization of Settlement (Nelson, Justin)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER - The Court has received Mr. Keyzers invoice for services through November 6, 2014, the court orders payment to be promptly made as follow herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/19/2014. (ch, )
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting 280 Motion to Stay. All deadlines stayed until 12/29/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/19/2014. (ch, ) Modified on 11/19/2014 (ch, ).
November 18, 2014 Filing 288 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit CC, # 3 Exhibit DD)(Perlson, David)
November 18, 2014 Filing 287 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 222 SEALED MOTION Rockstar's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery from Google filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Kristin Zrmhal, # 2 Affidavit Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 3 Exhibit EE, # 4 Exhibit FF, # 5 Exhibit GG, # 6 Exhibit HH, # 7 Exhibit II, # 8 Errata JJ, # 9 Exhibit KK, # 10 Exhibit LL)(Perlson, David)
November 18, 2014 Filing 286 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 228 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery from Rockstar filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Bonn, Amanda)
November 18, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 283 and 284, Sur-Reply tp Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 18, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER THE WRONG EVENT Document # 281, Sur-Reply in Opposition. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 18, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , 222 SEALED MOTION Rockstar's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery from Google, 228 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery from Rockstar, 220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions : Motion Hearing RESET for 1/6/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/18/2014. (ch, )
November 17, 2014 Filing 284 ***FILED IN ERRROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED SURREPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 222 SEALED MOTION Rockstar's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery from Google filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Kristin Zrmhal, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 3 Exhibit EE, # 4 Exhibit FF, # 5 Exhibit GG, # 6 Exhibit HH, # 7 Exhibit II, # 8 Exhibit JJ, # 9 Exhibit KK, # 10 Exhibit LL)(Perlson, David) Modified on 11/18/2014 (ch, ).
November 17, 2014 Filing 283 ***FILED IN ERROR PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED SURREPLY IN RESPONSE to Motion re 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit CC, # 3 Exhibit DD)(Perlson, David) Modified on 11/18/2014 (ch, ).
November 17, 2014 Filing 282 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Meng Xi, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Xi, Meng)
November 17, 2014 Filing 281 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 228 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery from Rockstar filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Bonn, Amanda) Modified on 11/18/2014 (ch, ).
November 17, 2014 Filing 280 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
November 14, 2014 Filing 279 REPLY to Response to Motion re 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Bonn, Amanda)
November 14, 2014 Filing 278 Sur-Reply to Corrected Sur-Reply to Defendant Google's Objections (Dkt. 188) to the Magistrate's Memorandum Opinion and Order (Dkt. 165) Denying Google's Motion to Transfer filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Bonn, Amanda) Modified on 11/14/2014 (ch, ).
November 14, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 274, Sur-Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
November 14, 2014 Filing 277 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 275 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document.. (Bonn, Amanda)
November 13, 2014 Filing 276 REPLY to Response to Motion re 220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Lance Yang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Perlson, David)
November 13, 2014 Filing 275 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 274 Response to Non-Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Bonn, Amanda)
November 13, 2014 Filing 274 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SUR-REPLY to 241 Appellant's Reply Brief Plaintiffs Sur-Reply To Defendant Googles Objections (Dkt. 188) To The Magistrates Memorandum Opinion And Order (Dkt. 165) Denying Googles Motion To Transfer filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Bonn, Amanda) Modified on 11/14/2014 (ch, ). Modified on 11/14/2014 (ch, ).
November 12, 2014 Filing 273 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 245 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sam Stake, # 2 Exhibit 33, # 3 Exhibit 34, # 4 Exhibit 35, # 5 Exhibit 36, # 6 Exhibit 37, # 7 Exhibit 38)(Perlson, David)
November 12, 2014 Filing 272 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 222 SEALED MOTION Rockstar's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery from Google filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amanda Bonn, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Bonn, Amanda)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER denying 265 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/12/2014. (ch, )
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER denying 268 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/12/2014. (ch, )
November 11, 2014 Filing 269 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 245 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sam Stake, # 2 Exhibit 33, # 3 Exhibit 34, # 4 Exhibit 35, # 5 Exhibit 36, # 6 Exhibit 37, # 7 Exhibit 38)(Perlson, David)
November 11, 2014 Filing 268 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Google's Reply in Support of Its Expedited Motion To Compel Discovery by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
November 11, 2014 Filing 267 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 222 SEALED MOTION Rockstar's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery from Google filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amanda Bonn, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Bonn, Amanda)
November 11, 2014 Filing 266 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Exhibit BB, # 30 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
November 11, 2014 Filing 265 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Plaintiff's Reply in Further Support of its Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda)
November 11, 2014 Filing 264 NOTICE by Google Inc Notice Concerning Preliminary Election of Asserted Claims and Update on Narrowing of Issues for Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Disclosure of Preliminary Election of Asserted Claims, # 2 Exhibit B - Counsel Correspondence)(Sistos, Antonio)
November 10, 2014 Filing 263 RESPONSE in Opposition re 220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Meng Xi, # 2 Exhibit A - Google.com search re InfoSeek IPO filing, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 1 of 3 InfoSeek Corporation's S-1, # 4 Exhibit B - Part 2 of 3 InfoSeek Corporation's S-1, # 5 Exhibit B - Part 3 of 3 InfoSeek Corporation's S-1, # 6 Exhibit C - Zimmerman's Research Guide, # 7 Exhibit D - 11/5/2014 email between ThomsonReuters and Meng Xi, # 8 Exhibit E - 11/5/2014 email between Intelligize and Meng Xi, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Xi, Meng)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting 261 Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/10/2014. (ch, )
November 7, 2014 Filing 261 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Replies in Support of Expedited Motions To Compel Discovery by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting 254 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/6/2014. (ch, )
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting 253 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/6/2014. (ch, )
November 5, 2014 Filing 258 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 245 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery, 228 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery from Rockstar of Donald Powers filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Bonn, Amanda)
November 5, 2014 Filing 256 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 228 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery from Rockstar, 245 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amanda Bonn, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17)(Bonn, Amanda)
November 5, 2014 Filing 255 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 222 SEALED MOTION Rockstar's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery from Google filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Nevin Kapur, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 7 Exhibit A, # 8 Exhibit B, # 9 Exhibit C, # 10 Exhibit D, # 11 Exhibit E, # 12 Exhibit F, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit H, # 15 Exhibit I, # 16 Exhibit J, # 17 Exhibit K, # 18 Exhibit L, # 19 Exhibit M, # 20 Exhibit N, # 21 Exhibit O, # 22 Exhibit P, # 23 Exhibit Q, # 24 Exhibit R, # 25 Exhibit S, # 26 Exhibit T, # 27 Exhibit U, # 28 Exhibit V, # 29 Exhibit W, # 30 Exhibit X, # 31 Exhibit Y, # 32 Exhibit Z, # 33 Exhibit AA, # 34 Exhibit BB, # 35 Exhibit CC, # 36 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
November 5, 2014 Filing 254 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Rockstar's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery from Google by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
November 5, 2014 Filing 253 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Plaintiffs Response to Defendant's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda)
November 5, 2014 Filing 252 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re 188 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
November 4, 2014 Filing 251 Sealed Document - REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE (LETTER OF REQUEST) WITH RESPECT TO BRITISH WITNESS - EDOUARD GUEYFFIER (ch, )
November 4, 2014 Filing 250 Sealed Document - REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE (LETTER ROGATORY) WITH RESPECT TO INDIAN WITNESS - KSHITIJ BHATIA (ch, )
November 4, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , 222 SEALED MOTION Rockstar's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery from Google, 228 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery from Rockstar, 220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER granting 244 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/4/2014. (ch, )
November 3, 2014 Filing 248 REPLY IN SUPPORT to 217 Response to Non-Motion, Reply in Support of Objections to Magistrate's Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying Google's Motion To Transfer filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sam Stake, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Perlson, David) Modified on 11/3/2014 (ch, ).
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , 222 SEALED MOTION Rockstar's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery from Google, 228 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery from Rockstar, 220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions :( Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2014 02:00 PM before Judge Roy S. Payne 234 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing on Outstanding Issues filed by Rockstar Consortium US LP.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/3/2014. (ch, ) Modified on 11/4/2014 (ch, ).
November 3, 2014 Filing 246 REPLY to Response to Motion re 234 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing on Outstanding Issues filed by Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Nelson, Justin)
November 3, 2014 Filing 245 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sam Stake, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
November 3, 2014 Filing 244 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Expedited Motion To Compel Discovery by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
October 31, 2014 Filing 243 RESPONSE in Opposition re 234 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing on Outstanding Issues Google's Response to Rockstar's Motion to Set Hearing on Outstanding Issues filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
October 31, 2014 Filing 242 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/28/14 (Claim Construction Hearing) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2015. (sholmes, )
October 31, 2014 Filing 241 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sam Stake, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Perlson, David)
October 31, 2014 Filing 240 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 150 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Privileged and Confidential Nortel Documents, 152 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Perlson, David)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting 221 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/31/2014. (ch, )
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting 219 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Supplement Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/31/2014. (ch, )
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting 216 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/31/2014. (ch, )
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER denying 223 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/31/2014. (ch, ) Modified on 10/31/2014 (ch, ).
October 31, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 235 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
October 30, 2014 Filing 235 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 150 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Privileged and Confidential Nortel Documents filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Perlson, David) Modified on 10/31/2014 (ch, ).
October 30, 2014 Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing on Outstanding Issues by Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
October 30, 2014 Filing 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
October 28, 2014 Filing 232 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 10/28/2014. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
October 27, 2014 Filing 231 Joint Statement Concerning Update of Narrowing of Issues and Proposal for Claim Construction Hearing Procedure by Google Inc. (Sistos, Antonio)
October 27, 2014 Filing 230 SEALED RESPONSE by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP to 212 Notice (Other) Google Inc.'s Objections to Evidence Submitted with Plaintiffs' Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 9/25/14 Skillen Deposition Excerpts)(Xi, Meng)
October 27, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 225, 226, and 227, Opening Brief Regarding. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 27, 2014 Filing 228 SEALED MOTION To Compel Discovery from Rockstar by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sam Stake, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
October 27, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 224, Opening Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Disputes. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 25, 2014 Filing 227 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Exhibit 5 in Support of Google's Opening Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7)(Perlson, David) Modified on 10/27/2014 (ch, ).
October 25, 2014 Filing 226 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Exhibit 17 in Support of Google's Opening Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18, # 2 Exhibit 19, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Exhibit 22, # 6 Exhibit 23, # 7 Exhibit 24, # 8 Exhibit 25, # 9 Exhibit 26, # 10 Exhibit 27, # 11 Exhibit 28, # 12 Exhibit 29, # 13 Exhibit 30, # 14 Exhibit 31, # 15 Exhibit 32, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 10/27/2014 (ch, ).
October 25, 2014 Filing 225 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS Declaration of Sam Stake in Support of Google's Opening Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 10, # 9 Exhibit 11, # 10 Exhibit 12, # 11 Exhibit 13, # 12 Exhibit 14, # 13 Exhibit 15, # 14 Exhibit 16)(Perlson, David) Modified on 10/27/2014 (ch, ).
October 25, 2014 Filing 224 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Opposed SEALED MOTION Google's Opening Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Disputes by Google Inc. (Perlson, David) Modified on 10/27/2014 (ch, ).
October 25, 2014 Filing 223 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Google's Opening Brief Regarding Outstanding Discovery Disputes by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
October 25, 2014 Filing 222 SEALED MOTION Rockstar's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery from Google by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amanda K. Bonn, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda)
October 24, 2014 Filing 221 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Rockstar's Expedited Motion to Compel Discovery From Google by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda)
October 24, 2014 Filing 220 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Lance Yang, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10a, # 12 Exhibit 10b, # 13 Exhibit 11)(Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2014: # 14 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
October 24, 2014 Filing 219 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Supplemental Brief on Privilege by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
October 23, 2014 Filing 218 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 217 Response to Non-Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Google's Responses to Plaintiffs' 3rd Set of Interrogatories)(Nelson, Justin)
October 23, 2014 Filing 217 RESPONSE to 188 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Justin A. Nelson, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Google's Responses to Plaintiffs' 3rd Set of Interrogatories FILED SEPARATELY UNDER SEAL, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Address of Ericsson's Headquarters, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Map showing Ericsson's Headquarters is in the EDOT, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 8/4/14 Krishnan Notice of Subpoena, # 6 Exhibit 5 - 6/5/14 Garlick Notice of Subpoena, # 7 Exhibit 6 - 6/5/14 Garlick & Markison Notice of Subpoena, # 8 Exhibit 7 - 7/22/14 Ericsson Notice of Subpoena, # 9 Exhibit 8 - 9/8/14 Fisher Notice of Subpoena, # 10 Exhibit 9 - 9/8/14 Weiss Notice of Subpoena, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Google's 2d Notice of Rule 30(b)(6) Depo to Rockstar)(Nelson, Justin)
October 23, 2014 Filing 216 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting 209 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Edouard Gueffier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/21/2014. (ch, )
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 208 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Kshitij Bhatia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/21/2014. (ch, )
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER re 200 Claim Construction Chart or Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/20/2014. (ch, )
October 20, 2014 Filing 212 NOTICE by Google Inc re 198 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion,, Google's Objections to Plaintiffs Evidence Submitted with its Reply Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Carl)
October 20, 2014 Filing 211 BRIEF filed Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Regarding Privilege [dkt 206] by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Meng Xi, # 2 Exhibit A - Excerpts from 10-9-2014 Hearing)(Xi, Meng)
October 20, 2014 Filing 210 BRIEF filed -Supplemental Brief in Further Support of Motions for Protective Order [Dkt. 150 and 152] by Nortel Networks Corporation, Nortel Networks Inc, Nortel Networks Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dacus, Deron)
October 20, 2014 Filing 209 Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Edouard Gueyffier by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Michelle Ernst, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
October 20, 2014 Filing 208 Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Kshitij Bhatia by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Michelle Ernst, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
October 17, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE by Google Inc Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying 117 Motion to Strike ; denying 122 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 136 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part 150 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 152 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/15/2014. (ch, )
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER finding as moot 106 Motion to Expedite Briefing on 105 Motion for the Court to Enter its [Model] Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs in view of Dkt. No. 201. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/16/2014. (No document attached.) (rsp1, )
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER finding as moot 105 Motion for the Court to Enter its [Model] Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs in view of Dkt. No. 201. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/16/2015. (No document attached.) (rsp1, )
October 15, 2014 Filing 203 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 126 MOTION to Compel filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Nelson, Justin)
October 15, 2014 Filing 202 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 126 MOTION to Compel filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal)(Perlson, David)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 201 AGREED ORDER FOCUSING PATENT CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/15/2014. (ch, )
October 14, 2014 Filing 200 Joint Claim Construction Chart Pursuant to Patent Rule 4-5(d) by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - U.S. Patent No. 7,236,969, # 2 Appendix B - U.S. Patent No. 7,469,245, # 3 Appendix C - U.S. Patent No. 7,672,970, # 4 Appendix D - U.S. Patent No. 7,895,178, # 5 Appendix E - U.S. Patent No. 7,895,183, # 6 Appendix F - U.S. Patent No. 7,933,883, # 7 Appendix G - Ordering Agreements and Disputes, # 8 Appendix H - Antecedent Basis Agreements and Disputes)(Anderson, Carl)
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting 194 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/9/2014. (ch, )
October 8, 2014 Filing 198 SEALED PATENT REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP to 158 Claim Construction Brief,,,, filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21 - Application, # 2 Exhibit 22 - Skillen Transcript, # 3 Exhibit 23 - Livermore Transcript, # 4 Exhibit 24 - Comments on Statement of Reasons, # 5 Exhibit 25 - Lenovo History, # 6 Exhibit 26 - Toshiba Laptop History, # 7 Exhibit 27 - Fujitsu Tablets History, # 8 Exhibit 28 - Fujitsu Tablets No. 2, # 9 Exhibit 29 - Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 30 - Nethopper, # 11 Exhibit 31 - Nokia Communicator 9000, # 12 Exhibit 32 - Barrons, # 13 Exhibit 33 - Newtons)(Tribble, Max)
October 8, 2014 Filing 197 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul B Keller on behalf of Ernst & Young Inc. (Keller, Paul)
October 8, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 195, Sealed. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting 191 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/7/2014. (ch, )
October 7, 2014 Filing 195 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Rockstar Consortium US LP and Netstar Technologies LLC's Reply Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 21 - Patent 6,098,065 prosecution history, # 2 Exhibit 22 - Skillen deposition excerpts, # 3 Exhibit 23 - Livermore deposition excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 24 - Patent '969 prosecution history, # 5 Exhibit 25 - History of Lenovo laptops, # 6 Exhibit 26 - History of Toshiba laptops, # 7 Exhibit 27 - History of Fujitsu tablets, # 8 Exhibit 28 - White Paper Fujitsu Tablet PCS, # 9 Exhibit 29 - "The Virtual Book", # 10 Exhibit 30 - NetHopper 2.0 article, # 11 Exhibit 31 - Nokia 9000 Communicator press release, # 12 Exhibit 32 - Barron's Dictionary excerpts, # 13 Exhibit 33 - Newton's Telecom Dictionary excerpts)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 10/8/2014 (ch, ).
October 7, 2014 Filing 194 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by One Page by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
October 7, 2014 Filing 193 NOTICE by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP re 166 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,, Regarding Counsel Availability (Tribble, Max)
October 6, 2014 Filing 192 SEALED SURREPLY to Motion re 126 MOTION to Compel filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer Polse, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5)(Perlson, David) Modified on 10/7/2014 (ch, ).
October 6, 2014 Filing 191 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Surreply to Rockstar's Motion to Compel by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
October 6, 2014 Filing 190 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 136 SEALED MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1, 7, 10, 11 and 13 filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Perlson, David)
October 6, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 10/28/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. **Note that only the TIME has changed**(bga, )
October 3, 2014 Filing 189 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Google's Objections to the Order Denying Google's Motion To Transfer by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion To Expedite)(Perlson, David)
October 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Google Inc re 165 Memorandum & Opinion (Perlson, David)
October 3, 2014 Filing 187 REPLY to Response to Motion re 152 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Nortel Networks Corporation, Nortel Networks Limited. (Dacus, Deron)
October 3, 2014 Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion re 150 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Privileged and Confidential Nortel Documents filed by Nortel Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of Asset Sale Agreement)(Supko, Mark)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting 182 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/2/2014. (ch, )
October 2, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 117 MOTION to Strike Defendant Google Inc.'s Deficient Obviousness Disclosure Under Patent Rule 3-3(B) : Motion Hearing RESET for 10/9/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re 117 Motion to Strike Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/1/2014. (ch, )
September 30, 2014 Filing 183 Sealed RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David A. Perlson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N)(Sistos, Antonio)
September 30, 2014 Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google Inc.'s Motion to Exceed Page Limit)(Sistos, Antonio)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting 174 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/30/2014. (ch, )
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER finding as moot 172 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in view of Dkt. No. 174. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/30/2014. (No document attached). (rsp1, )
September 26, 2014 Filing 179 RESPONSE in Opposition re 152 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 26, 2014 Filing 178 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 150 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Privileged and Confidential Nortel Documents filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David A. Perlson, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 26, 2014 Filing 177 NOTICE by Nortel Networks Inc re 150 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Privileged and Confidential Nortel Documents , Providing Notice of Filings in Nortel Bankruptcy Proceeding (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Debtors Motion for Bankruptcy Relief re Third-Party Discovery, # 2 Exhibit B - Debtors' Motion for Bankruptcy Relief re Third-Party Discovery, # 3 Exhibit C - Ross Declaration ISO Bankruptcy Motion, # 4 Exhibit D - Notice of Cost-Sharing Motion, # 5 Exhibit E - Cost Sharing Motion)(Supko, Mark)
September 26, 2014 Filing 176 RESPONSE to Motion re 150 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Privileged and Confidential Nortel Documents, 152 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Bonn, Amanda)
September 26, 2014 Filing 175 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 122 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Patent Rule 3-1 Infringement Contentions filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Blackburn, Shawn)
September 26, 2014 Filing 174 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Corrected] by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
September 26, 2014 Filing 173 REPLY to Response to Motion re 126 MOTION to Compel filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Solomon, # 2 Declaration of John Lahad, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John Lahad)(Nelson, Justin)
September 26, 2014 Filing 172 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
September 25, 2014 Filing 171 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 136 SEALED MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1, 7, 10, 11 and 13 filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Meng Xi, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Pltfs' 1st Set of ROGS to Google, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Livermore Deposition Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 3 - 8/27/2014 email among counsel, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Xi, Meng)
September 25, 2014 Filing 170 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re 117 MOTION to Strike Defendant Google Inc.'s Deficient Obviousness Disclosure Under Patent Rule 3-3(B) by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
September 25, 2014 Filing 169 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lin Yang on behalf of Google Inc (Yang, Lance)
September 25, 2014 Filing 168 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER dismissing the petition for writ of mandamus. Entered on 9/25/14. (dlc, )
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER finding as moot 164 Motion for Hearing in view of Dkt. No. 165 and Dkt. No. 166. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/25/2014. (no document attached). (rsp1, )
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 105 Opposed MOTION for the Court to Enter its [Model] Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims, and to Extend the Deadline for the Parties to Comply with P.R. 4-2 , 126 MOTION to Compel , 152 MOTION for Protective Order , 150 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Privileged and Confidential Nortel Documents, 136 SEALED MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1, 7, 10, 11 and 13, 122 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Patent Rule 3-1 Infringement Contentions : Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/25/2014. (ch, )
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/23/2014. (nkl, )
September 22, 2014 Filing 164 Opposed MOTION for Hearing by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Sam Stake, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Google's Motion)(Perlson, David)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER The Court hereby appoints David Keyzer as the Courts technical advisor in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/22/2014. (ch, )
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 161 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Reply to Motion to Strike. Deadline is 9/26/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/22/2014. (ch, )
September 17, 2014 Filing 161 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Surreply to Google's Reply to 122 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Patent Rule 3-1 Infringement Contentions by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
September 17, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP Notice of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Xi, Meng)
September 17, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE by Google Inc Notice of Compliance Regarding Technology Tutorial (Sistos, Antonio)
September 16, 2014 Filing 158 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 969 patent, # 3 Exhibit 2 - 245 patent, # 4 Exhibit 3 - 970 patent, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 178 patent, # 6 Exhibit 5 - 183 patent, # 7 Exhibit 6 - 883 patent, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Barron's 5th ed. - client and server, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Webster's 8th ed. - client, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Newton's Telecom - client and server, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Webster's College 1999 - interface, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Federal Standard 1037C - link, # 13 Exhibit 12 - NTC Am English Learners - correlate and match, # 14 Exhibit 13 - Webster's College 1999 - database, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Newton's Telecom - database, # 16 Exhibit 15 - Modern Dictionary of Electronics - database, # 17 Exhibit 16 Dictionary of Computer and Internet Terms - database, # 18 Exhibit 17 Webster's Third Intl - refine, # 19 Exhibit 18 Webster's College 1999 - refine, # 20 Exhibit 19 - IBM Dictionary - sort, # 21 Exhibit 20 - Roget's Thesaurus - change and update)(Tribble, Max)
September 16, 2014 Filing 157 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 126 MOTION to Compel filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Kristin Zmrhal, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 16, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP Withdrawal of Attorney Kristin Malone (Nelson, Justin)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 152 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/15/2014. (ch, )
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 150 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Privileged and Confidential Nortel Documents : Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2014 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/15/2014. (ch, )
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 147 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 126 MOTION to Compel Responses due by 9/16/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/15/2014. (ch, )
September 15, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 151, Motion for Protective Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (SEE # 152)(ch, )
September 13, 2014 Filing 152 MOTION for Protective Order by Nortel Networks Corporation, Nortel Networks Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
September 13, 2014 Filing 151 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION for Protective Order by Nortel Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 9/15/2014 (ch, ).
September 12, 2014 Filing 150 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Privileged and Confidential Nortel Documents by Nortel Networks Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Supko, Mark)
September 12, 2014 Filing 149 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark M Supko on behalf of Nortel Networks Inc (Supko, Mark)
September 11, 2014 Filing 148 REPLY to Response to Motion re 122 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Patent Rule 3-1 Infringement Contentions filed by Google Inc. (Perlson, David)
September 11, 2014 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 126 MOTION to Compel by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 143 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 136 SEALED MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1, 7, 10, 11 and 13 Responses due by 9/25/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/11/2014. (ch, )
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 144 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 122 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Patent Rule 3-1 Infringement Contentions Responses due by 9/11/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/10/2014. (ch, )
September 6, 2014 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 122 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Patent Rule 3-1 Infringement Contentions by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
September 5, 2014 Filing 143 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 136 SEALED MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1, 7, 10, 11 and 13 by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Xi, Meng)
September 4, 2014 Filing 142 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 117 MOTION to Strike Defendant Google Inc.'s Deficient Obviousness Disclosure Under Patent Rule 3-3(B) filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lance Yang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Perlson, David)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 137 Motion for Extension of Time to File Surreply to Rockstars Motion to Strike Googles Deficient Obviousness Disclosure Under Patent Rule 3-3(b) (Dkt. No. 117), and to file its Response to Rockstars Motion to Compel Discovery (Dkt. No. 126). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/02/2014. (nkl, )
August 29, 2014 Filing 140 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER. Respondents Rockstar Consortium US LP and Netstar Technologies LLC are directed to respond to the petition no later than seven days after the issuance of this order. Any reply by Google is due no later than three days from the date of service of the response. (dlc, )
August 29, 2014 Filing 139 NOTICE of Docketing-USCA FEDERAL CIRCUIT. A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed. USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT No. 14-152. (dlc, )
August 29, 2014 Filing 138 RESPONSE in Opposition re 122 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Patent Rule 3-1 Infringement Contentions filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shawn D. Blackburn, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Rockstar's P.R. 3-1 Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Rockstar's P.R. 3-1 Infringement Claim Chart for '065, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Rockstar's P.R. 3-1 Infringement Claim Chart for '969, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Rockstar's P.R. 3-1 Infringement Claim Chart for '245, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Rockstar's P.R. 3-1 Infringement Claim Chart for '970, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Rockstar's P.R. 3-1 Infringement Claim Chart for '178, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Rockstar's P.R. 3-1 Infringement Claim Chart for '183, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Rockstar's P.R. 3-1 Infringement Claim Chart for '883, # 10 Exhibit 9 - 4-14-14 email between counsel, # 11 Exhibit 10 - 4-18-14 email between counsel, # 12 Exhibit 11 - 7-3-14 email between counsel, # 13 Exhibit 12 - 7-8-14 email between counsel, # 14 Exhibit 13 - 7-24-14 email between counsel, # 15 Exhibit 14 - 8-27-14 email between counsel, # 16 Exhibit 15 - 6-23-14 email between counsel, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
August 29, 2014 Filing 137 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Surreply to Rockstar's Motion to Strike Obviousness Disclosure, and Response to Rockstar's Motion to Compel Discovery by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 25, 2014 Filing 136 SEALED MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1, 7, 10, 11 and 13 by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 25, 2014 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 135 submitted NO CERITIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
August 22, 2014 Filing 135 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** SEALED MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1, 7, 10, 11 and 13 by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David) Modified on 8/25/2014 (ch, ).
August 21, 2014 Filing 134 REPLY to Response to Motion re 117 MOTION to Strike Defendant Google Inc.'s Deficient Obviousness Disclosure Under Patent Rule 3-3(B) filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Lahad, John)
August 21, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Meng Xi on behalf of NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4800202. (Xi, Meng)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/20/14. (ch, )
August 19, 2014 Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Google Inc.'s Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Patent Rule 3-1 Infringement Contentions [dkt 122] by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
August 19, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Carl G Anderson on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4797407. (Anderson, Carl)
August 18, 2014 Filing 126 MOTION to Compel by Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Exhibits ISO Motion to Compel, # 2 Affidavit of Amanda Bonn ISO Motion to Compel, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Bonn, Amanda)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 118 Sealed Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/14/2014. (ch, )
August 11, 2014 Filing 124 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 105 Opposed MOTION for the Court to Enter its [Model] Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims, and to Extend the Deadline for the Parties to Comply with P.R. 4-2 filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Lahad, John)
August 11, 2014 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re 117 MOTION to Strike Defendant Google Inc.'s Deficient Obviousness Disclosure Under Patent Rule 3-3(B) filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lance Yang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 8, 2014 Filing 122 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Patent Rule 3-1 Infringement Contentions by Google Inc. Responses due by 8/25/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 13, # 13 Exhibit 14, # 14 Exhibit 15, # 15 Exhibit 16, # 16 Exhibit 17, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
August 5, 2014 Filing 121 NOTICE by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP PR 4-3 Submission of the Parties (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Rockstar's Proposals, # 2 Exhibit B -- Google's Proposals)(Sistos, Antonio)
August 5, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michelle L Ernst on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4777252. (Ernst, Michelle)
July 30, 2014 Filing 119 REPLY to Response to Motion re 105 Opposed MOTION for the Court to Enter its [Model] Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims, and to Extend the Deadline for the Parties to Comply with P.R. 4-2 filed by Google Inc. (Perlson, David)
July 25, 2014 Filing 118 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to Nortel Networks Corporation, Brian Collie, and Jean-Pierre Fortin by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 23, 2014 Filing 117 MOTION to Strike Defendant Google Inc.'s Deficient Obviousness Disclosure Under Patent Rule 3-3(B) by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John Lahad, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John)
July 21, 2014 Filing 116 RESPONSE in Opposition re 105 Opposed MOTION for the Court to Enter its [Model] Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims, and to Extend the Deadline for the Parties to Comply with P.R. 4-2 filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John P. Lahad, # 2 Exhibit 1 Exhibit B to Google's Invalidity Contentions, # 3 Exhibit 2 6-23-2014 Letter from Google's counsel to Plaintiffs' counsel, # 4 Exhibit 3 7-2-2014 and 7-3-2014 Email exchanges between counsel, # 5 Exhibit 4 7-18-2014 Email from Google's counsel to Plaintiffs' counsel, # 6 Exhibit 5 7-21-2014 Email from Plaintiffs' counsel to Google's counsel, # 7 Exhibit 6 General Order 13-20, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John)
July 21, 2014 Filing 115 RESPONSE in Opposition re 106 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Google's Motion for the Court to Enter its [Model] Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, and to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims, and to Extend the Deadline for the Partie filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahad, John)
July 17, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Roderick M Thompson on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4751620. (Thompson, Roderick)
July 17, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eugene Y Mar on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4751597. (Mar, Eugene)
July 17, 2014 Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Erik C Olson on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4751479. (Olson, Erik)
July 16, 2014 Filing 111 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google Inc re P.R. 4-2 (Perlson, David)
July 16, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP re P.R. 4-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 14, 2014 Filing 109 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 100 Opposed MOTION to Strike 97 Response in Opposition to Motion, for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Response to Google's Motion to Transfer, and, in the Alternative, Cross-Motion to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Google's Trans filed by Google Inc. (Perlson, David)
July 10, 2014 Filing 108 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 98 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Response to Google's Motion to Transfer, and, Google's Request, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Resolution of Google's Transf er Motion filed by Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Bonn, Amanda)
July 7, 2014 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 Opposed MOTION to Strike 97 Response in Opposition to Motion, for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Response to Google's Motion to Transfer, and, in the Alternative, Cross-Motion to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Google's Trans fer Motion (Dkt. No. 97) filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Bonn, Amanda)
July 2, 2014 Filing 106 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Google's Motion for the Court to Enter its [Model] Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, and to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims, and to Extend the Deadline for the Parties to Comply with P.R. 4-2 by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 2, 2014 Filing 105 Opposed MOTION for the Court to Enter its [Model] Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs, to Limit the Number of Asserted Claims, and to Extend the Deadline for the Parties to Comply with P.R. 4-2 by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 63 Motion for Leave to File Respone to Google's Notice of Supplemental Authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/2/2014. (ch, )
June 27, 2014 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 Opposed MOTION to Strike 97 Response in Opposition to Motion, for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Response to Google's Motion to Transfer, and, in the Alternative, Cross-Motion to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Google's Trans filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts in Support of Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
June 27, 2014 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion re 98 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Response to Google's Motion to Transfer, and, Google's Request, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Resolution of Google's Transf filed by Google Inc. (Perlson, David)
June 26, 2014 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re 98 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Response to Google's Motion to Transfer, and, Google's Request, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Resolution of Google's Transf er Motion filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amanda K. Bonn in Support of Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Google Inc.'s Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Bonn, Amanda)
June 26, 2014 Filing 100 Opposed MOTION to Strike 97 Response in Opposition to Motion, for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Response to Google's Motion to Transfer, and, in the Alternative, Cross-Motion to Stay Case Pending Resolution of Google's Transfer Motion by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. Responses due by 7/10/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Strike Dkt. No. 97, # 2 Affidavit of Amanda K. Bonn in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposed Motion to Strike Dkt. No. 97, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Bonn, Amanda)
June 25, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google Inc Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Perlson, David)
June 25, 2014 Filing 98 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief in Response to Google's Motion to Transfer, and, Google's Request, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Resolution of Google's Transfer Motion by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
June 25, 2014 Filing 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re 92 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Brief In Response To Googles Motion To Transfer In Light Of Newly-Acquired Evidence filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Andrea Pallios Roberts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
June 25, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP re P.R. 4-1 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/24/2014. (ch, )
June 23, 2014 Filing 94 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 93 Additional Attachments to Main Document,,,.. (Bonn, Amanda)
June 20, 2014 Filing 93 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 92 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Brief In Response To Googles Motion To Transfer In Light Of Newly-Acquired Evidence.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 31, # 2 Exhibit 32, # 3 Exhibit 33, # 4 Exhibit 34, # 5 Exhibit 35, # 6 Exhibit 36, # 7 Exhibit 37, # 8 Exhibit 38, # 9 Exhibit 39, # 10 Exhibit 40, # 11 Exhibit 41, # 12 Exhibit 42, # 13 Exhibit 43, # 14 Exhibit 44, # 15 Exhibit 45, # 16 Exhibit 46, # 17 Exhibit 47, # 18 Exhibit 48, # 19 Exhibit 49, # 20 Exhibit 50, # 21 Exhibit 51, # 22 Exhibit 52, # 23 Exhibit 53, # 24 Exhibit 54, # 25 Exhibit 55, # 26 Exhibit 56, # 27 Exhibit 57, # 28 Exhibit 58, # 29 Exhibit 59, # 30 Exhibit 60, # 31 Exhibit 61, # 32 Exhibit 62, # 33 Exhibit 63, # 34 Exhibit 64, # 35 Exhibit 65, # 36 Exhibit 66)(Bonn, Amanda)
June 20, 2014 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Brief In Response To Googles Motion To Transfer In Light Of Newly-Acquired Evidence by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief In Response to Google's Motion to Transfer in Light of Newly-Acquired Evidence, # 2 Supplement Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief In Response to Google's Motion to Transfer, # 3 Affidavit of Amanda Bonn In Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief In Response to Google's Motion to Transfer, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24, # 28 Exhibit 25, # 29 Exhibit 26, # 30 Exhibit 27, # 31 Exhibit 28, # 32 Exhibit 29, # 33 Exhibit 30)(Bonn, Amanda)
June 19, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Amanda Bonn on behalf of Rockstar Consortium US LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4711798. (Bonn, Amanda)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/19/2014. (ch, )
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Proposed E-Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/19/2014. (ch, )
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER finding as moot 83 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/19/14. (Payne, Roy)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER finding as moot 82 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/19/14. (Payne, Roy)
June 17, 2014 Filing 86 Joint SEALED MOTION for Entry of E-Discovery Order by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Perlson, David)
June 17, 2014 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Joint Motion for Entry of E-Discovery Order by Google Inc. (Perlson, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2014: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
June 16, 2014 Filing 84 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed E-Discovery Order by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
June 13, 2014 Filing 83 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Proposed E-Discovery Order by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
June 11, 2014 Filing 82 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed E-Discovery Order by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
June 3, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP re 80 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Of Error in Joint Motion For Protective Order (Blackburn, Shawn)
May 30, 2014 Filing 80 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit B Plaintiffs' Brief, # 3 Exhibit C Defendant's Brief)(Blackburn, Shawn)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed E-Discovery Order. Deadline is 6/11/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/30/2014. (ch, )
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/29/2014. (ch, )
May 28, 2014 Filing 77 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed E-Discovery Order by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
May 28, 2014 Filing 76 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Protective Order by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
May 28, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE by Google Inc Notice of Compliance With Patent Local Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Perlson, David)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/28/2014. (ch, )
May 23, 2014 Filing 73 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Protective Order by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 71 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/19/2014. (ch, )
May 16, 2014 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Extension of Time for Google to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/12/2014. (ch, )
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/12/2014. (ch, )
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2014., Jury Selection set for 6/8/2015 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 11/25/2014., Markman Hearing set for 10/28/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 4/6/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/20/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/12/2014. (ch, )
May 9, 2014 Filing 67 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Proposed Protective Order by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
May 9, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Pallios Roberts on behalf of Google Inc (Roberts, Andrea)
May 8, 2014 Filing 65 Joint MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order and Notice of Compliance with Court Order by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A [Proposed] Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B [Proposed] Discovery Order)(Lahad, John)
May 2, 2014 Filing 64 RESPONSE to 49 Notice (Other), 63 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Response to Google's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Nelson, Justin)
May 2, 2014 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Google's Notice of Supplemental Authority by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 57 Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order; denying 58 Motion for Entry of Discovery Order. ORDERS the Parties to meet and confer in person with lead and local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/30/14. (mrm, )
April 30, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Google Inc Initial Disclosures (Perlson, David)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/30/2014. (ch, )
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to File Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/30/2014. (ch, )
April 29, 2014 Filing 58 Joint MOTION For Entry of Proposed Discovery Order by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Discovery Order)(Mann, James)
April 29, 2014 Filing 57 Joint MOTION For Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Docket Control Order)(Mann, James)
April 29, 2014 Filing 56 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP re Initial Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 29, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT, FILE AS MOTION Document # 53, 54, 55, Notice of Joint Motion for Entry of Orders. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
April 28, 2014 Filing 55 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP Joint Motion for Entry of Discovery Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David) Modified on 4/29/2014 (ch, ).
April 28, 2014 Filing 54 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY NOTICE by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP Joint Motion for Entry of Discovery Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David) Modified on 4/29/2014 (nkl, ).
April 28, 2014 Filing 53 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP Joint Motion for Entry of Docket Control Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David) Modified on 4/29/2014 (ch, ).
April 28, 2014 Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blackburn, Shawn)
April 25, 2014 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Docket Control Order and Proposed Discovery Order by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
April 25, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE by Google Inc, NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP Joint Notice of Mediator (Lahad, John)
April 24, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE by Google Inc Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perlson, David)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Proposed Docket Control Order, Discovery Order and Notice of Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/21/2014. (ch, )
April 18, 2014 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, and Notice of Mediator by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perlson, David)
April 16, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn Daniel Blackburn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blackburn, Shawn)
April 7, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 4/7/14. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
April 7, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 4/7/14. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Court's scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.)(jml)
April 7, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 7, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP (Capshaw, Sidney)
April 7, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP (Rambin, Daymon)
April 3, 2014 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP (Henry, Claire)
March 27, 2014 Filing 41 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Change Venue filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Justin A. Nelson, # 2 Exhibit 16)(Nelson, Justin)
March 26, 2014 Filing 40 NOTICE by Rockstar Consortium US LP Notice of Compliance with Disclosure Deadlines (Lahad, John)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2014 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy Payne.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/18/14. (mrm, )
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Googles Reply to Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/14/2014. (ch, )
March 13, 2014 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Surreply to Google Inc.'s Reply to Motion to Transfer Venue by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
March 10, 2014 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sam Stake, # 2 Exhibit 45, # 3 Exhibit 46, # 4 Second Declaration of Abeer Dubey)(Mann, James)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 18 MOTION to Change Venue Responses due by 3/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/28/2014. (ch, )
February 27, 2014 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiffs' Response to Google's Motion to Transfer by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to File Reply To Plaintiffs' Response to Google's Motion to Transfer)(Mann, James)
February 20, 2014 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re 18 MOTION to Change Venue filed by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Donald Powers, # 2 Declaration of Mark Hearn, # 3 Declaration of Kristin Malone, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 8 Exhibit 5 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 9 Exhibit 6 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 10 Exhibit 7 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 11 Exhibit 8 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 12 Exhibit 9 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 13 Exhibit 10 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 14 Exhibit 11 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 15 Exhibit 12 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 16 Exhibit 13 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 17 Exhibit 14 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 18 Exhibit 15 to Decl. of K. Malone, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
February 18, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kristin Malone on behalf of NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4528397. (Malone, Kristin)
February 13, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sean S Pak on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4523163. (Pak, Sean)
January 30, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sam Stake on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4501378. (Stake, Sam)
January 30, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Antonio Sistos on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4501370. (Sistos, Antonio)
January 30, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert B Wilson on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4501351. (Wilson, Robert)
January 30, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Charles K Verhoeven on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4501311. (Verhoeven, Charles)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 18 MOTION to Change Venue Responses due by 2/20/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/21/2014. (ch, )
January 17, 2014 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 MOTION to Change Venue by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Justin)
January 10, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Perlson on behalf of Google Inc (Perlson, David)
January 10, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE by NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF READINESS FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Nelson, Justin)
January 10, 2014 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc (Mann, James)
January 10, 2014 Filing 21 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Google Inc. (Mann, James)
January 10, 2014 Filing 20 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Google Inc.(Mann, James)
January 10, 2014 Filing 19 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 18 MOTION to Change Venue .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 25, # 2 Exhibit 26, # 3 Exhibit 27, # 4 Exhibit 28, # 5 Exhibit 29, # 6 Exhibit 30, # 7 Exhibit 31, # 8 Exhibit 32, # 9 Exhibit 33, # 10 Exhibit 34, # 11 Exhibit 35, # 12 Exhibit 36, # 13 Exhibit 37, # 14 Exhibit 38, # 15 Exhibit 39, # 16 Exhibit 40, # 17 Exhibit 41, # 18 Exhibit 42, # 19 Exhibit 43, # 20 Exhibit 44)(Mann, James)
January 10, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION to Change Venue by Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Google Inc's Motion to Transfer Venue, # 2 Index, # 3 Declaration of Abeer Dubey, # 4 Declaration of Sam Stake, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19, # 24 Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit 21, # 26 Exhibit 22, # 27 Exhibit 23, # 28 Exhibit 24)(Mann, James)
December 26, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google Inc to 1/10/2014. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bas, )
December 26, 2013 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc.( Mann, James)
November 12, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google Inc to 12/27/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 12, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy Tindel on behalf of Google Inc (Tindel, Andy)
November 11, 2013 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc.( Mann, James)
November 11, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Google Inc (Thompson, Gregory)
November 11, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Google Inc (Mann, James)
November 7, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Pierre Lahad on behalf of NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP (Lahad, John)
November 5, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP (Ward, Thomas)
October 31, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Parker C Folse, III on behalf of NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP (Folse, Parker)
October 31, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Lyle Kaplan on behalf of NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP (Kaplan, Alexander)
October 31, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Adatto Nelson on behalf of NetStar Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP (Nelson, Justin)
October 31, 2013 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NetStar Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rockstar Consortium US LP for NetStar Technologies LLC. (Tribble, Max)
October 31, 2013 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rockstar Consortium US LP (Tribble, Max)
October 31, 2013 Filing 5 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tribble, Max)
October 31, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Google Inc. (ehs, )
October 31, 2013 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/31/2013. (ch, )
October 31, 2013 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
October 31, 2013 Filing 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1 Complaint,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Tribble, Max)
October 31, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Google Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4385057.), filed by Rockstar Consortium US LP, NetStar Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 List of Attorneys, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6)(Tribble, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockstar Consortium US LP et al v. Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockstar Consortium US LP
Represented By: Parker C Folse, III
Represented By: Alexander Lyle Kaplan
Represented By: John Pierre Lahad
Represented By: Justin Adatto Nelson
Represented By: Max Lalon Tribble, Jr
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NetStar Technologies LLC
Represented By: Parker C Folse, III
Represented By: Alexander Lyle Kaplan
Represented By: John Pierre Lahad
Represented By: Justin Adatto Nelson
Represented By: Max Lalon Tribble, Jr
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Gregory Blake Thompson
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?