Constellation Technologies LLC v. Time Warner Cable Inc et al
Plaintiff: Constellation Technologies LLC
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Inc and Time Warner Cable Enterprises
Consolidated Defendant: Windstream Communications Inc, Rockstar Consortium US LP, Windstream Holdings Inc and Windstream Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Robert W Faulkner
Case Number: 2:2013cv01079
Filed: December 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #163 SETTLEMENT Papers & MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/29/215. (ch, )
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting #162 SETTLEMENT Papers & MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/29/15. (ch, )
January 28, 2015 Filing 163 SETTLEMENT Papers & MOTION to Dismiss Jointly Filed By Windstream and by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elsea, Zachary)
January 28, 2015 Filing 162 SETTLEMENT Papers & MOTION to Dismiss Jointly Filed by TWC, Rockstar, and by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elsea, Zachary)
January 28, 2015 NOTICE that the Markman Hearing set for 3/3/15 is CANCELLED. (bga, )
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting 159 and #160 Joint SEALED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF STAY PENDING TRANSACTION CLOSING AND REGULATORY REVIEW filed by Constellation Technologies LLC, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc, Windstream Communications Inc, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #160 Joint SEALED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF STAY PENDING TRANSACTION CLOSING AND REGULATORY REVIEW Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/5/2015. (ch, ) Modified on 1/5/2015 (ch, ).
January 5, 2015 *** DKT 159 HAS BEEN GRANTED- PLEASE IGNORE***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 159, Joint MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF STAY PENDING TRANSACTION CLOSING AND REGULATORY REVIEW. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, ) Modified on 1/5/2015 (nkl, ).
December 31, 2014 Filing 160 Joint SEALED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF STAY PENDING TRANSACTION CLOSING AND REGULATORY REVIEW by Constellation Technologies LLC, Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #157 Joint MOTION TO STAY ALL DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. Status Conference set for 1/6/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/2/2014. (ch, )
November 26, 2014 Filing 157 Joint MOTION TO STAY ALL DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Constellation Technologies LLC, Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #153 Joint MOTION to Stay ALL DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT Status Conference set for 1/6/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/20/2014. (ch, )
November 19, 2014 Filing 155 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Windstream's Counterclaims by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
November 18, 2014 Filing 154 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to TWC's Counterclaims by Constellation Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium US LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Elsea, Zachary)
November 14, 2014 Filing 153 Joint MOTION to Stay ALL DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
November 14, 2014 Filing 152 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 4-2 by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #149 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/10/2014. (ch, )
November 6, 2014 Filing 150 RESPONSE to #148 Notice (Other) Constellation's Notice of Collateral Proceedings by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Jones, Michael)
November 6, 2014 Filing 149 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Response to #148 Constellation's Notice of Collateral Proceedings by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 5, 2014 Filing 148 NOTICE by Constellation Technologies LLC Of Collateral Proceeding In Which TWC Seeks To Stay This Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Elsea, Zachary)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #146 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to TWC's Counterclaims. Deadline is 11/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/5/2014. (ch, )
October 30, 2014 Filing 146 Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO TWC'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
October 30, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc regarding Compliance with PR 4-1 (Jones, Michael)
October 30, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE by Constellation Technologies LLC of Compliance With P.R. 4-1 (Elsea, Zachary)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #138 Motion for Issuance of Requests for International Judical Assistance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/29/2014. (ch, )
October 28, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE by Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Govett, Brett)
October 27, 2014 Filing 141 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc. (Govett, Brett)
October 27, 2014 Filing 140 ANSWER to Complaint for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against Constellation Technologies LLC by Windstream Holdings Inc, Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation.(Govett, Brett)
October 24, 2014 Filing 139 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Constellation Technologies LLC. Rockstar Consortium US LP served on 10/20/2014, answer due 11/10/2014. (ch, )
October 21, 2014 Filing 138 Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Requests for International Judicial Assistance by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Ltr Rog to Kent Felske, #2 Ex. B - Ltr Rog to Wenfeng Chen, #3 Ex. C - Ltr Rog to Rolf Meier, #4 Ex. D - Ltr Rog to Tim Rahrer, #5 Ex. E - Ltr Rog to Keith Smith, #6 Ex. F - Ltr Rog to Thinh Nguyen, #7 Ex. G - Ltr Rog to Russell Pretty, #8 Ex. H - Ltr Rog to David Mann, #9 Ex. I - Ltr Rog to Nortel, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 15, 2014 Filing 137 SUMMONS Issued as to Rockstar Consortium US LP. (ch, )
October 15, 2014 Filing 136 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Jones, Michael)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/15/2014. (ch, )
October 15, 2014 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Windstream Communications Inc to 10/28/2014; Windstream Corporation to 10/28/2014; Windstream Holdings Inc to 10/28/2014. (ch, )
October 14, 2014 Filing 134 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Constellation Technologies LLC, Rockstar Consortium LP by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 01 - Nortel Press Release, #2 Ex. 02 - Nortel Networks SEC 10-K, #3 Ex. 03 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws 1999, #4 Ex. 04 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws 2006, #5 Ex. 05 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws 2006, #6 Ex. 06 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws 2008, #7 Ex. 07 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws 2008, #8 Ex. 08 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws 2009, #9 Ex. 09 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws 2011, #10 Ex. 10 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws 2011, #11 Ex. 11 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws 2012, #12 Ex. 12 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws 2012, #13 Ex. 13 - IEEE-SA Standards Board Bylaws 2013, #14 Ex. 14 - Guidelines for Implementation of the TSB Patent Policy (07-07-1999), #15 Ex. 15 - Guidelines for Implementation of the TSB Patent Policy (02-02-2000), #16 Ex. 16 - Guidelines for Implementation of ITU-T Patent Policy (06-15-2002), #17 Ex. 17 - Guidelines for Implementation of ITU-T Patent Policy (03-12-2005), #18 Ex. 18 - Guidelines for Implementation of ITU-T Patent Policy (Nov 2005), #19 Ex. 19 - Guidelines for Implementation of the Common Patent Policy for ITU-T (03-01-2007), #20 Ex. 20 - Guidelines for Implementation of the Common Patent Policy (04-23-2012), #21 Ex. 21 - Request for Comments 1310 - Internet Standards Process, #22 Ex. 22 - Request for Comments 1602 - The Internet Standards Process Rev. 2, #23 Ex. 23 - Request for Comments 2026 - Internet Standards Process Rev. 3, #24 Ex. 24 - Request for Comments 3668 - IP Rights in IETF Technology, #25 Ex. 25 - Request for Comments 3979 - IP Rights in IETF Technology, #26 Ex. 26 - 3GPP Working Procedures (07-07-1999), #27 Ex. 27 - 3GPP Working Procedures (04-25-2002), #28 Ex. 28 - 3GPP Working Procedures (04-24-2006), #29 Ex. 29 - 3GPP Working Procedures (10-27-2007), #30 Ex. 30 - Operating Procedures for ATIS Forums and Committees, #31 Ex. 31 - Operating Procedures for ATIS Forums and Committees, #32 Ex. 32 - ETSI IPR Policy, Rules of Procedure, 22 November 2000, #33 Ex. 33 - ETSI IPR Policy, Rules of Procedure, 23 November 2005, #34 Ex. 34 - ETSI IPR Policy, Rules of Procedure, 29 March 2007, #35 Ex. 35 - ETSI Rules of Procedure, 30 November 2011, #36 Ex. 36 - ETSI Rules of Procedure, 20 March 2013, #37 Ex. 37 - Overview of 3GPP Release 8 V0.3.1 (2014-03), #38 Ex. 38 - List of SDOs to which Nortel made a general licensing commitment, #39 Ex. 39 - Letter from Thompson to Scozzafava re IEEE 802.3 Standard, #40 Ex. 40 - Letter from Mills re Nortel Position regarding Patents and IETF Standards, #41 Ex. 41 - Wired Article titled How Apple and Microsoft Armed 4000 Patent Warheads, #42 Ex. 42 - Charter v. Rockstar, Amended Complaint)(Gardner, Allen)
October 10, 2014 Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
October 10, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc (Jones, Michael)
October 7, 2014 Filing 131 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Waheed U Khan on behalf of Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc (Khan, Waheed) Modified on 10/7/2014 (ch, ).
October 7, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Waheed U Khan on behalf of Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc (Khan, Waheed)
October 7, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE COPY OF # 130 Document # 131, Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
October 6, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Bechtel Regitz on behalf of Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc (Regitz, Michael)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER DENIES Windstreams Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 17) in member case 2:13-cv-1080. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/29/2014. (nkl, )
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER denying #18 Motion to Dismiss Willful Infringment Claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/29/2014. (ch, )
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #122 Motion to Serve Amended Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/25/2014. (ch, )
September 25, 2014 Filing 125 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER dismissing the Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Entered 9/25/14. (dlc, )
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER finding as moot #80 Motion to Stay in view of #121 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/25/2014. (No document attached.) (rsp2)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ESI ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/25/2014. (ch, )
September 24, 2014 Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION to Serve Amended Invalidity Contentions by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/22/2014. (nkl, )
September 16, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert C Harrits on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4837734. (Harrits, Robert)
September 16, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dustin Guzior on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4837709. (Guzior, Dustin)
September 12, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Reisner on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4832423. (Reisner, Daniel)
September 8, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE by Constellation Technologies LLC re #39 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, (NOTICE OF CORRECTION) (Gillam, Harry)
September 5, 2014 Filing 116 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER directing the respondent, Constellation Technologies LLC to respond to the petition no later than seven days after issuance of this order. Any reply by Time Warner is due no later than three days from the date of service of the response. (dlc, )
September 5, 2014 Filing 115 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE OF DOCKETING. A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed. USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT Case No. 14-153. (dlc, )
August 18, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/12/14 (Motions Hearing) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2014. (sholmes, )
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER - the court conducted a hearing 8/12/2014 denying #99 Sealed Motion; denying #100 Sealed Patent Motion; granting in part and denying in part #102 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/12/2014. (ch, )
August 12, 2014 Filing 112 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 8/12/2014 re #100 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Constellation's Infringement Contentions filed by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc, #102 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel TWC to Comply with the Discovery Order and Patent Local Rules filed by Constellation Technologies LLC, #99 SEALED MOTION For Protective Order filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
August 11, 2014 Filing 111 Sealed Document. CONSTELLATION'S SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO TIME WARNER CABLE'S MOTION TO STRIKE INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS (Gillam, Harry)
August 11, 2014 Filing 110 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #102 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel TWC to Comply with the Discovery Order and Patent Local Rules filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Elsea, Zachary)
August 8, 2014 Filing 109 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #100 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Constellation's Infringement Contentions filed by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Karim Oussayef, #2 Exhibit A - Constellation's 3rd Interrogatories to TWC - excerpts)(McDavit, Jonas)
August 8, 2014 Filing 108 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #99 SEALED MOTION For Protective Order filed by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Jones, Michael)
August 4, 2014 Filing 107 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #102 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel TWC to Comply with the Discovery Order and Patent Local Rules filed by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of J. McDavit, #2 Exhibit A - 2014-05-23 Letter, #3 Exhibit B - 2014-05-30 Letter, #4 Exhibit C - 2014-06-20 Email, #5 Exhibit D - 2014-06-24 Email, #6 Exhibit E - Production Letters, #7 Exhibit F - 2014-06-23 Email, #8 Exhibit G - 2014-07-09 Email, #9 Exhibit H - Email Chain, #10 Exhibit I - 2014-06-13 - Constellation Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, #11 Exhibit J - 2014-04-22 - Constellation's 1st Interrogatories, #12 Exhibit K - 2014-06-27 Letter, #13 Exhibit L - 2014-07-02 Email, #14 Exhibit M - 2014-06-27 Email, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(McDavit, Jonas)
August 1, 2014 Filing 106 REPLY to Response to Motion re #99 SEALED MOTION For Protective Order filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Elsea, Zachary)
July 28, 2014 Filing 105 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #100 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Constellation's Infringement Contentions filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF AMIT M. AGARWAL, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
July 25, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #102 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel TWC to Comply with the Discovery Order and Patent Local Rules, #100 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Constellation's Infringement Contentions, #99 SEALED MOTION For Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2014 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
July 24, 2014 Filing 104 Joint SEALED MOTION for Entry of an ESI Order by Constellation Technologies LLC, Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc, Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit B)(Werner, Thomas)
July 21, 2014 Filing 103 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #99 SEALED MOTION For Protective Order filed by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of K. Oussayef, #2 Ex 01 - TWC PR3-1 Disclosures - Cover Pleading, #3 Ex 02 - TWC PR3-1 Disclosures - Exhibit A Smith, #4 Ex 03 - TWC PR3-1 Disclosures - Exhibit B Sen, #5 Ex 04 - TWC PR3-1 Disclosures - Exhibit C Wang, #6 Ex 05 - TWC PR3-1 Disclosures - Exhibit D-1 Pfeffer, #7 Ex 06 - TWC PR3-1 Disclosures - Exhibit D-2 Pfeffer, #8 Ex 07 - TWC PR3-1 Disclosures - Exhibit E Fredette, #9 Ex 08 - TWC PR3-1 Disclosures - Exhibit F Meier, #10 Ex 09 - 2014-04-28 Email, #11 Ex 10 - 2013-06-20 Email, #12 Ex 11 - 2014-06-24 Email, #13 Ex 12 - 2014-06-27 Letter, #14 Ex 13 - Fractus - ORDER denying 392 Motion for Protective Order Regarding PR 3-1..., #15 Ex 14 - 2014-06-27 Email, #16 Ex 15 - Sheasby Decl, #17 Ex 16 - 2014-06-27 Email, #18 Ex 17 - 2014-07-02 - MDL ORDER, #19 Ex 18 - 2014-07-11 - MDL Constellation Notice, #20 Ex 19 - SEALED - Charter Amended Complaint, #21 Ex 20 - TWC's Resp to Constellation's 2nd ROGs (Nos. 8-9), #22 Ex 21 - 2014-07-03 Email, #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 18, 2014 Filing 102 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel TWC to Comply with the Discovery Order and Patent Local Rules by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14, #15 Exhibit Ex. 15, #16 Exhibit Ex. 16, #17 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Constellation's Motion to Compel)(Elsea, Zachary)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/17/2014. (ch, )
July 11, 2014 Filing 100 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Strike Constellation's Infringement Contentions by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 McDavit Declaration, #2 Ex. 1 - 032814 PR 3-1, #3 Ex. 2 FUS - Ex A to PR 3-1, #4 Ex. 3 FUS - Ex B to PR 3-1, #5 Ex. 4 FUS - Ex C to PR 3-1, #6 Ex. 5 FUS - Ex D-1 to PR 3-1, #7 Ex. 6 FUS - Ex D2 to PR 3-1, #8 Ex. 7 FUS - Ex E to PR 3-1, #9 Ex. 8 FUS - Ex F to PR 3-1, #10 Ex. 9 FUS - Ex A and F excerpts of PR 3-1, #11 Ex. 10 FUS - Ex B to PR 3-1, #12 Ex. 11 FUS - Ex C to PR 3-1, #13 Ex. 12 FUS - Ex D-1 to PR 3-1, #14 Ex. 13 FUS - Ex A, B, C, D-1, D-2, E and F excertps to PR 3-1, #15 Ex. 14 - 051914 email from Oussayef, #16 Ex. 15 - 042814 Ltr from Werner, #17 Ex. 16 - 050914 Ltr from Werner, #18 Ex. 17 - 052314 Ltr from Brons, #19 Ex. 18 - 061714 Ltf rom Oussayef, #20 Ex. 19 - 050614 TWC 1st ROGS, #21 Ex. 20 FUS - 061614 Pltff Resp to 1st ROGS, #22 Ex. 21 - docs production 00010536-10699, #23 Ex. 22 FUS - 061814 Ltr from Oussayef, #24 Ex. 23 FUS - 062714 ltr from Werner, #25 Ex. 24 - Universal Mobile Tel, #26 Ex. 25 - doc production 03131402-03131648, #27 Ex. 26 - doc production 03131771-03131808, #28 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 3, 2014 Filing 99 SEALED MOTION For Protective Order by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Donald Powers, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Elsea, Zachary)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER ON PROPOSED STIPULATION REGARDING THE FORM OF DOCUMENT PRODUCTION -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/24/2014. (ch, )
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/23/2014. (ch, )
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/23/2014. (ch, )
June 23, 2014 Filing 95 Sealed Document. PLAINTIFF CONSTELLATION TECHNOLOGIES LLC'S SUR-REPLY TO TWC'S MOTION TO STAY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gillam, Harry)
June 23, 2014 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
June 23, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 89, CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
June 18, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David S Benyacar on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4710025. (Benyacar, David)
June 18, 2014 Filing 92 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Constellation Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rockstar Consortium US LP, Other Affiliate Ericsson Inc., Other Affiliate Apple Inc., Other Affiliate Microsoft Corporation, Other Affiliate Rockstar Consortium LLC, Other Affiliate Blackberry Corporation for Constellation Technologies LLC. (Gillam, Harry)
June 18, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Paul Isaac Margulies on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4709614. (Margulies, Paul)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2014., Jury Selection set for 10/13/2015 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Mediation Completion due by 3/31/2015., Markman Hearing set for 3/3/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 8/11/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/25/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/17/2014. (ch, )
June 17, 2014 Filing 89 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Constellation Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rockstar Consortium US LP for Constellation Technologies LLC. (Gillam, Harry) Modified on 6/23/2014 (nkl, ).
June 13, 2014 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #80 MOTION to Stay filed by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. McDavit, #2 EX D - Order in Network-1 v. D-Link)(Jones, Michael)
June 2, 2014 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re #80 MOTION to Stay filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
May 27, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc regarding service of PR 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Govett, Brett)
May 27, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc regarding service of PR 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
May 23, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc of MultiDistrict Litigation Motion (Attachments: #1 Ex A part 1, #2 Ex A part 2, #3 Ex A part 3, #4 Ex A part 4)(Jones, Michael)
May 22, 2014 Filing 83 Joint MOTION for Protective Order With Disputed Provisions by Constellation Technologies LLC, Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc, Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit C)(Werner, Thomas) Modified on 5/23/2014 (ch, ).
May 22, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Document # 82, Joint MOTION for Protective Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
May 21, 2014 Filing 82 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Joint MOTION for Protective Order with Disputed Provisions by Constellation Technologies LLC, Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc, Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2, #5 Exhibit C)(Werner, Thomas) Modified on 5/22/2014 (nkl, ).
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/16/2014. (ch, )
May 16, 2014 Filing 80 MOTION to Stay by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit McDavit, #2 Exhibit Rockstar Orders, #3 Exhibit Solid State Storage Solutions Order, #4 Exhibit Secure Axcess Opinion, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 16, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc Amended Initial Disclosure (Jones, Michael)
May 12, 2014 Filing 78 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Constellation Technologies LLC, Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc, Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 12, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jonas R McDavit on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4652827. (McDavit, Jonas)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Leave to File Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/6/2014. (ch, )
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/6/2014. (ch, )
May 5, 2014 Filing 74 RESPONSE to #63 Notice (Other), re Defendants' Request for Oral Hearing and Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Gillam, Harry)
May 5, 2014 Filing 73 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Defendants Time Warner Cable Inc. and Time Warner Cable Enterprises LLC's Request for Oral Hearing and Notice of Supplemental Authority (Dkt. 63) by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
May 2, 2014 Filing 72 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Constellation Technologies LLC, Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc, Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/2/2014. (ch, )
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension to Comply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/2/2014. (ch, )
April 30, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Amit Agarwal on behalf of Constellation Technologies LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4639358. (Agarwal, Amit)
April 29, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc (Govett, Brett)
April 29, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE by Constellation Technologies LLC OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Gillam, Harry)
April 29, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc of Compliance regarding Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
April 24, 2014 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Constellation Technologies LLC, Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc, Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Werner, Thomas)
April 23, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas C Werner on behalf of Constellation Technologies LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4626690. (Werner, Thomas)
April 22, 2014 Filing 63 NOTICE by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc re #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Delaware Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) of Request for Oral Hearing and Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rockstar Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 21, 2014 Filing 62 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Robert Faulkner, filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Gillam, Harry)
April 21, 2014 Filing 61 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #49 Opposed MOTION to Sever filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Gillam, Harry)
April 21, 2014 Filing 60 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Docket Control Order, #2 Exhibit B - proposed Discovery Order, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit C-1, #6 Exhibit C-2, #7 Exhibit D)(Gillam, Harry)
April 18, 2014 Filing 59 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Delaware Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Gillam, Harry)
April 15, 2014 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re #49 Opposed MOTION to Sever filed by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc, Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc. (Govett, Brett)
April 11, 2014 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 Opposed MOTION to Sever filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time and for Leave to File a Consolidated Sur-reply to Defendants' Replies in Support of their Motions to Transfer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/9/14. (mrm, )
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to file their Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Delaware Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) under seal. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/9/14. (mrm, )
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER assigning case to Judge Payne by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/9/14. (mrm, )
April 9, 2014 Filing 53 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Constellation Technologies LLC, Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (mrm, )
April 8, 2014 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time and for Leave to File a Consolidated Sur-reply by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
April 7, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 4/7/14. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
April 7, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 4/7/14. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Court's scheduling order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within 14 days of the conference. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.)(jml)
April 7, 2014 Filing 51 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Delaware Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) filed by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Block Supplemental Declaration, #2 Modi Supplemental Declaration, #3 Exhibit 60 - 032414 ltr from Judge Robinson, #4 Exhibit 61 - Patent Case Order for Scheduling Order, #5 Exhibit 62 - Patent Case Scheduling Order, #6 Exhibit 63 - Horsham, Pa facility article, #7 Exhibit 64 - Google agrees to sell Horsham article, #8 Exhibit 65 - Arris' Horsham unit article, #9 Exhibit 66 - Arris Investor Day 2013 presentation, #10 Exhibit 67 - TWC PR 3-1 Ex. D-2, #11 Exhibit 68 - Map of distance between Dallas and Austin, #12 Exhibit 69 - Going Up in San Jose article)(Jones, Michael)
April 7, 2014 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Their Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 4, 2014 Filing 49 Opposed MOTION to Sever by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc, Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. The new deadline is APRIL 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/31/14. (bas, )
March 31, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE by Constellation Technologies LLC of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Gillam, Harry)
March 31, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Samson Krumholz on behalf of Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc (Krumholz, Richard)
March 31, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Brinn Hall on behalf of Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc (Hall, Eric)
March 21, 2014 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel S Leventhal on behalf of Windstream Communications Inc, Windstream Corporation, Windstream Holdings Inc (Leventhal, Daniel)
March 21, 2014 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Delaware Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 21, 2014 Filing 42 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time for Parties to Comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 and P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - setting Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2014 02:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/20/2014. (ch, ) (ch, ).
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER consolidating this case (the LEAD CASE) with 2:12cv1080 for all pretrial issues (except venue.) All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/19/14. (bas, )
March 19, 2014 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Delaware Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Powers Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Powers Declaration, #3 Garland Declaration, #4 Veschi Declaration, #5 McColgan Declaration, #6 Tiegerman Declaration, #7 Guindi Declaration, #8 Lee Declaration, #9 Josephson Declaration, #10 Anderson Declaration, #11 Mann Declaration, #12 Pfeffer Declaration, #13 Grant Declaration, #14 Felske Declaration, #15 Elsea Declaration, #16 Exhibit 1 to Elsea Declaration, #17 Exhibit 2 to Elsea Declaration, #18 Exhibit 3 to Elsea Declaration, #19 Exhibit 4 to Elsea Declaration, #20 Exhibit 5 to Elsea Declaration, #21 Exhibit 6 to Elsea Declaration, #22 Exhibit 7 to Elsea Declaration, #23 Exhibit 8 to Elsea Declaration, #24 Exhibit 9 to Elsea Declaration, #25 Exhibit 10 to Elsea Declaration, #26 Exhibit 11 to Elsea Declaration, #27 Exhibit 12 to Elsea Declaration, #28 Exhibit 13 to Elsea Declaration, #29 Exhibit 14 to Elsea Declaration, #30 Exhibit 15 to Elsea Declaration, #31 Exhibit 16 to Elsea Declaration, #32 Exhibit 17 to Elsea Declaration, #33 Exhibit 18 to Elsea Declaration, #34 Exhibit 19 to Elsea Declaration, #35 Exhibit 20 to Elsea Declaration, #36 Exhibit 21 to Elsea Declaration, #37 Exhibit 22 to Elsea Declaration, #38 Exhibit A, #39 Exhibit B, #40 Exhibit C, #41 Exhibit D, #42 Exhibit E, #43 Exhibit F, #44 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
March 17, 2014 Filing 38 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Gillam, Harry)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time and for leave to File Consolidated Briefing on Response to Dfts Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/7/2014. (ch, )
March 7, 2014 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Modi, #2 Exhibit 1 - Callwave, #3 Exhibit 2 - Blue Spike)(Jones, Michael)
March 6, 2014 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time and for Leave to File Consolidated Briefing on Responses to Defenants' Motions to Transfer by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
February 24, 2014 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Z. Elsea, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Z. Elsea, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Z. Elsea, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Z. Elsea, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 3/14/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/19/14. (bas, )
February 19, 2014 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Edward Terchunian on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4531125. (Terchunian, Edward)
February 19, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Karim Z Oussayef on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4531123. (Oussayef, Karim)
February 19, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tamir Packin on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4531120. (Packin, Tamir)
February 19, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ameet A Modi on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4531119. (Modi, Ameet)
February 19, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Paul A Bondor on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4531118. (Bondor, Paul)
February 19, 2014 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael P Stadnick on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4531116. (Stadnick, Michael)
February 19, 2014 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John M Desmarais on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4531115. (Desmarais, John)
February 18, 2014 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Delaware Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
February 11, 2014 Filing 24 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #23 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Delaware Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a).. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 30 - Montreal Distances, #2 Exhibit 31 - Montreal Travel, #3 Exhibit 32 - Hartford Distances, #4 Exhibit 33 - Hartford Travel, #5 Exhibit 34 - Distance PHL to Wilmington, #6 Exhibit 35 - Distance Shreveport to Marshall, #7 Exhibit 36 - Prosecutor Locations, #8 Exhibit 37 - 649 FH, #9 Exhibit 38 - 048 FH, #10 Exhibit 39 - 917 FH, #11 Exhibit 40 - 299 FH, #12 Exhibit 41 - 389 FH, #13 Exhibit 42 - 879 FH, #14 Exhibit 43 - Angela de Wilton _ LinkedIn, #15 Exhibit 44 - Lindsay McGuinness _ LinkedIn, #16 Exhibit 45 - Holmes Anderson _ LinkedIn, #17 Exhibit 46 - Tony Josephson _ LinkedIn, #18 Exhibit 47- Wei Wei Jeang _ LinkedIn, #19 Exhibit 48 - William Lee _ LinkedIn, #20 Exhibit 49 - Boston Distances, #21 Exhibit 50 - Boston Travel, #22 Exhibit 51 - Cary Distances, #23 Exhibit 52 - Travel Cary to Raleigh Intl, #24 Exhibit 53 - Raleigh Travel, #25 Exhibit 54 - Arris Horsham, #26 Exhibit 55 - Distance Horsham to Wilmington, #27 Exhibit 56 - Judicial Statistics, #28 Exhibit 57 - Travel Herdon to IAD, #29 Exhibit 58 - Herndon Travel, #30 Exhibit 59 - Denver Distances, #31 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 11, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Delaware Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Block, #2 Declaration of A. Modi, #3 Exhibit 1 - Cisco Complaint Excerpt, #4 Exhibit 2 - Arris Complaint Excerpt, #5 Exhibit 3 - All Cases to SLR, #6 Exhibit 4 - Charter Complaint Excerpt, #7 Exhibit 5 - WoW 10-Q, #8 Exhibit 6 - Time Warner Cable Inc. DE, #9 Exhibit 7- Time Warner Cable Enterprises DE, #10 Exhibit 8 - NYC Distances, #11 Exhibit 9 - Herndon Distances, #12 Exhibit 10 - Constellation - Delaware, #13 Exhibit 11 - TX Sec of State Constellation, #14 Exhibit 12 - John Garland _ LinkedIn, #15 Exhibit 13 - PTO Assignments, #16 Exhibit 14 - Rockstar - Delaware, #17 Exhibit 15 - Rockstar - About, #18 Exhibit 16 - Rockstar - LinkedIn, #19 Exhibit 17- Constellation Ottawa employees, #20 Exhibit 18 - Rockstar Texas employees, #21 Exhibit 19 - Inventor Locations, #22 Exhibit 20 - Smith and Pretty (649), #23 Exhibit 21 - Nguyen Gossain Sen Shaw (389), #24 Exhibit 22 - Qiang and Chen and Jia (048), #25 Exhibit 23 - Mann and Pfeffer (879), #26 Exhibit 24 - Meier and Rahrer (299), #27 Exhibit 25 - Andersson Fredette Ghanwani (917), #28 Exhibit 26 - Toronto Distances, #29 Exhibit 27 - Toronto Travel, #30 Exhibit 28 - Ottawa Distance, #31 Exhibit 29- Ottawa Travel)(Jones, Michael)
February 10, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE by Constellation Technologies LLC of Readiness for a Scheduling Conference (Gillam, Harry)
February 10, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #22). Document # 21, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
February 7, 2014 Filing 21 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc of Readiness for a Scheduling Conference (Gillam, Harry) Modified on 2/10/2014 (sm, ).
February 7, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc (Gardner, Allen)
February 7, 2014 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner Cable Inc., for Time Warner Cable Enterprises; Corporate Parent None for Time Warner Cable Inc. (Jones, Michael)
February 7, 2014 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 4, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Time Warner Cable Inc to 2/7/2014. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 4, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Time Warner Cable Enterprises to 2/7/2014. 4 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
January 31, 2014 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Time Warner Cable Inc.( Jones, Michael)
January 31, 2014 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Time Warner Cable Enterprises.( Jones, Michael)
January 3, 2014 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc, filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gillam, Harry)
December 30, 2013 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Time Warner Cable Enterprises.( Jones, Michael)
December 30, 2013 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Time Warner Cable Inc.( Jones, Michael)
December 30, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Time Warner Cable Enterprises to 2/3/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bas, )
December 30, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Time Warner Cable Inc to 2/3/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bas, )
December 20, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James A Milkey on behalf of Constellation Technologies LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4452919. (Milkey, James)
December 20, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin W Hattenbach on behalf of Constellation Technologies LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4452796. (Hattenbach, Benjamin)
December 20, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jason G Sheasby on behalf of Constellation Technologies LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4452719. (Sheasby, Jason)
December 20, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Zachary Truman Elsea on behalf of Constellation Technologies LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4452733. (Elsea, Zachary)
December 20, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ellisen S Turner on behalf of Constellation Technologies LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4452589. (Turner, Ellisen)
December 20, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Hong Annita Zhong on behalf of Constellation Technologies LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4452513. (Zhong, Hong)
December 12, 2013 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Time Warner Cable Inc. (Attachments: #1 Time Warner Cable Enterprises LLC)(ch, )
December 12, 2013 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
December 12, 2013 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
December 11, 2013 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Gillam, Harry)
December 11, 2013 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Gillam, Harry)
December 11, 2013 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Constellation Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rockstar Consortium US LP for Constellation Technologies LLC. (Gillam, Harry)
December 11, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Time Warner Cable Enterprises, Time Warner Cable Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4439444.), filed by Constellation Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gillam, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Constellation Technologies LLC v. Time Warner Cable Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Windstream Communications Inc
Represented By: Daniel S Leventhal
Represented By: Michael Bechtel Regitz
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Eric Brinn Hall
Represented By: Waheed U Khan
Represented By: Richard Samson Krumholz
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Rockstar Consortium US LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Windstream Holdings Inc
Represented By: Daniel S Leventhal
Represented By: Michael Bechtel Regitz
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Eric Brinn Hall
Represented By: Waheed U Khan
Represented By: Richard Samson Krumholz
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Windstream Corporation
Represented By: Daniel S Leventhal
Represented By: Michael Bechtel Regitz
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Eric Brinn Hall
Represented By: Waheed U Khan
Represented By: Richard Samson Krumholz
Represented By: Brett Christopher Govett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Inc
Represented By: John M Desmarais
Represented By: Edward B. Geist
Represented By: Ameet A Modi
Represented By: Jonas R McDavit
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Daniel Reisner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Dustin Guzior
Represented By: Robert C Harrits
Represented By: Michael P Stadnick
Represented By: Paul A Bondor
Represented By: Karim Z Oussayef
Represented By: Paul Isaac Margulies
Represented By: Tamir Packin
Represented By: David S Benyacar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable Enterprises
Represented By: John M Desmarais
Represented By: Edward B. Geist
Represented By: Ameet A Modi
Represented By: Jonas R McDavit
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Daniel Reisner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Dustin Guzior
Represented By: Robert C Harrits
Represented By: Michael P Stadnick
Represented By: Paul A Bondor
Represented By: Karim Z Oussayef
Represented By: Paul Isaac Margulies
Represented By: Tamir Packin
Represented By: David S Benyacar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Robert W Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constellation Technologies LLC
Represented By: Amit Agarwal
Represented By: Ellisen S Turner
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Hong Annita Zhong
Represented By: Benjamin W Hattenbach
Represented By: Jason G Sheasby
Represented By: James A Milkey
Represented By: Zachary Truman Elsea
Represented By: Thomas C Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?