ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. v. Amazon.com Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation (f/k/a Research In Motion Corporation), Huawei Device USA, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Blackberry Limited (f//k/a Research in Motion Limited), HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv01112
Filed: December 18, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2016 Filing 1160 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA-Federal Circuit re 1158 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Apple, Inc. USCA Case Number 16-2007 (Attachments: # 1 Key Rule Changes)(dlc, )
May 5, 2016 Filing 1159 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA-Federal Circuit on 5/5/16, as to 1150 Memorandum & Opinion, 1158 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, 1064 Final Judgment, 1153 Memorandum & Opinion and certified copy of Docket Sheet. (dlc, )
May 5, 2016 Filing 1158 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 1150 Memorandum & Opinion, 1064 Judgment, 1153 Memorandum & Opinion by Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-5731749. (Smith, Melissa)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal, 1064 Final Judgment, 1150 Memorandum Opinion & Order, 1153 Memorandum Opinion & Order, and certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re 1158 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 ORDER granting 1156 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/29/2016. (nkl, )
April 28, 2016 Filing 1156 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims and Counterclaims by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 27, 2016 Filing 1155 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 4/27/16, by USCA-Federal Circuit as to 1153 Memorandum & Opinion and certified copy of updated docket sheet. (dlc, )
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Transmission of 1153 Memorandum Opinion and Order and Certified copy of Updated Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re 1151 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
April 26, 2016 Filing 1154 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT re 1151 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. USCA-Federal Circuit Case Number 16-1916 (Attachments: # 1 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT Key Rule Changes)(dlc, )
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/25/2016. (nkl, )
April 25, 2016 Filing 1152 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA - FEDERAL CIRCUIT on 4/25/16 as to 1150 Memorandum & Opinion, 459 Memorandum & Opinion, 1151 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, 1064 Final Judgment and certified copy of Docket Sheet. (tkd, )
April 25, 2016 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, #459 and #1150 Memorandum Opinions, #1064 Final Judgment and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email re 1151 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (tkd, )
April 22, 2016 Filing 1151 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 1150 Memorandum & Opinion, 459 Memorandum & Opinion, 1064 Judgment by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-5714479. (Baxter, Samuel)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/15/2016. (nkl, )
March 9, 2016 Filing 1149 Redaction of 1074 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/16/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). (mrm, )
March 9, 2016 Filing 1148 Redaction of 1072 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/16/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). (mrm, )
March 9, 2016 Filing 1147 Redaction of 1070 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/13/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). (mrm, )
March 8, 2016 Filing 1146 Redaction of 1067 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/12/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). (mrm, )
March 8, 2016 Filing 1145 Redaction of 1021 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/3/15 (Pretrial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). (mrm, )
March 8, 2016 Filing 1144 Redaction of 946 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/16/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). (mrm, )
March 8, 2016 Filing 1143 Redaction of 941 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/14/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). (mrm, )
March 3, 2016 Filing 1142 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/26/16 (Post Trial Motions Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2016. (sholmes, )
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 ORDER granting 1136 Motion to Sever. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/26/2016. (nkl, )
March 1, 2016 Severed cause number 2:16cv176. (nkl, )
February 26, 2016 Filing 1140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motions Hearing held on 2/26/2016 re 1104 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Patent Invalidity and Alternative Motion for a New Trial (Renewed) filed by Apple, Inc., 1038 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO THE GOOGLE-SAMSUNG TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL (RENEWED) filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., 1031 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity of Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 6,963,859 for Obviousness-Type Double Patenting filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, 1106 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO THE APPLE TRIAL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., 1034 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(b), and in the Alternative, Request for a New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, 1032 MOTION --Conditional Motion for Bench Trial on Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Defenses filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
February 25, 2016 Filing 1139 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Lackey, Walter)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 ORDER - The Court enters this order sua sponte., Motions terminated as moot 686 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Report and Testimony of Dr. John Phillip Mellor filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., 930 SEALED MOTION for Production of Stefik Inventore Notes and Proposals and Leave for Their Use at Deposition filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc... Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/19/2016. (nkl, )
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 ORDER - The Court enters this order sua sponte. Denied 1052 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement filed by Apple, Inc., denied 1054 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 50(A) filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., terminated as moot 1044 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S DENIAL TO ADMIT APL-CV_01304517 INTO EVIDENCE filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., denied 1055 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Patent Invalidity filed by Apple, Inc., denied 1053 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement, No Damages, and No Enhanced Damages filed by Apple, Inc... Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/19/2016. (nkl, )
February 17, 2016 Filing 1136 Joint MOTION to Sever HTC, Huawei, Motorola, and Samsung Defendants from Civil Action 2:13-cv-1112 into a Separate Action, and Consolidate that Separate Action with Civil Action No. 2:14-cv-61 by Apple, Inc., ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 1034 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(b), and in the Alternative, Request for a New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59, 1031 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity of Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 6,963,859 for Obviousness-Type Double Patenting, 1038 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO THE GOOGLE-SAMSUNG TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL (RENEWED), 1032 MOTION --Conditional Motion for Bench Trial on Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Defenses : Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2016 10:30 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/03/2016. (nkl, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 1106 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO THE APPLE TRIAL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL, 1104 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Patent Invalidity and Alternative Motion for a New Trial (Renewed) : Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2016 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/03/2016. (nkl, )
February 3, 2016 Filing 1133 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re 1106 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO THE APPLE TRIAL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2016 Filing 1132 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 1031 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity of Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 6,963,859 for Obviousness-Type Double Patenting filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
February 3, 2016 Filing 1131 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 1104 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Patent Invalidity and Alternative Motion for a New Trial (Renewed) filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 ORDER denying 1128 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/29/2016. (nkl, )
January 28, 2016 Filing 1129 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1128 MOTION to Strike 1127 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sirota, Neil)
January 28, 2016 Filing 1128 MOTION to Strike 1127 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 26, 2016 Filing 1127 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 1038 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO THE GOOGLE-SAMSUNG TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL (RENEWED) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 27, # 2 Exhibit 28, # 3 Exhibit 29)(Sirota, Neil)
January 26, 2016 Filing 1126 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 1032 MOTION --Conditional Motion for Bench Trial on Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Defenses filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
January 26, 2016 Filing 1125 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 1034 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(b), and in the Alternative, Request for a New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
January 25, 2016 Filing 1124 REPLY to Response to Motion re 1104 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Patent Invalidity and Alternative Motion for a New Trial (Renewed) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Melissa)
January 25, 2016 Filing 1123 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 1106 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO THE APPLE TRIAL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 20, 2016 Filing 1122 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1031 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity of Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 6,963,859 for Obviousness-Type Double Patenting filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Unikel, Robert)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 ORDER re 1115 Proposed Bill of Costs, filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/19/2016. (nkl, )
January 19, 2016 Filing 1120 BILL OF COSTS by Apple, Inc., ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. Costs Taxed in the amount of $420000.00. (nkl, )
January 19, 2016 Filing 1119 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1115 Proposed Bill of Costs,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Corrected Exhibit A))(Smith, Melissa)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 ORDER granting 1098 Motion to Redact re 1067 Transcript, 1072 Transcript,, 1068 Transcript, 1074 Transcript, 1070 Transcript, ; granting 1107 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/15/2016. (nkl, )
January 15, 2016 Filing 1117 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1106 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO THE APPLE TRIAL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Smith, Melissa)
January 15, 2016 Filing 1116 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 1115 Proposed Bill of Costs,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Aaron Stanley)(Smith, Melissa)
January 15, 2016 Filing 1115 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Bryan Anderson, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G-1, # 9 Exhibit G-2, # 10 Exhibit G-3, # 11 Exhibit G-4, # 12 Exhibit G-5, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I)(Smith, Melissa)
January 15, 2016 Filing 1114 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1104 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Patent Invalidity and Alternative Motion for a New Trial (Renewed) filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 6, 2016 Filing 1113 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 1038 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO THE GOOGLE-SAMSUNG TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL (RENEWED) filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 6, 2016 Filing 1112 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1032 MOTION --Conditional Motion for Bench Trial on Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Defenses filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Unikel, Robert)
January 6, 2016 Filing 1111 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 1034 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(b), and in the Alternative, Request for a New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18, # 2 Exhibit 19, # 3 Exhibit 20, # 4 Exhibit 21, # 5 Exhibit 22, # 6 Errata 23, # 7 Exhibit 24)(Unikel, Robert)
January 4, 2016 Filing 1110 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1109 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 30, 2015 Filing 1109 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1031 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity of Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 6,963,859 for Obviousness-Type Double Patenting filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Responsive Statement of Fact and Conclusions of Law, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 ORDER granting 1105 Motion for Entry of Briefing Schedule for Post-Trial Briefs. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/29/2015. (nkl, )
December 28, 2015 Filing 1107 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO REDACT PORTIONS OF APPLE TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1106 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO THE APPLE TRIAL OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1105 Joint MOTION for Entry of Briefing Schedule for Post-Trial Briefs by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 22, 2015 Filing 1104 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Patent Invalidity and Alternative Motion for a New Trial (Renewed) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 ORDER granting 1102 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/21/2015. (ch, )
December 18, 2015 Filing 1102 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1031 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity of Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 6,963,859 for Obviousness-Type Double Patenting by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1101 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1038 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO THE GOOGLE-SAMSUNG TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL (RENEWED) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Text of Proposed Order)(Sirota, Neil)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1100 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1034 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(b), and in the Alternative, Request for a New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 18, 2015 Filing 1099 RESPONSE in Opposition re 1032 MOTION --Conditional Motion for Bench Trial on Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Defenses filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 17, 2015 Filing 1098 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 1074 Transcript,,,, by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 ORDER granting 1096 Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/16/2015. (nkl, )
December 15, 2015 Filing 1096 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Bill of Costs (Second) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 15, 2015 Filing 1095 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 1031 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity of Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 6,963,859 for Obviousness-Type Double Patenting (Notice of Joinder) (Smith, Melissa)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ORDER memorializing denial of 937 Samsung Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 50(a) on the record at 957 trial transcript of proceedings held on 9/22/2015. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/15/2015. (jrg2)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 ORDER granting 1090 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/10/2015. (nkl, )
December 10, 2015 Filing 1092 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION (Baxter, Samuel)
December 9, 2015 Filing 1091 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Melissa Richards Smith re 1074 Transcript,,,,. (Smith, Melissa)
December 3, 2015 Filing 1090 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO REDACT NOVEMBER 3, 2015 PRE-TRIAL TRANSCRIPT by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER granting 1087 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A Krellner terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/03/2015. (nkl, )
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 ORDER granting 1066 Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/02/2015. (nkl, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1087 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Kelly A. Krellner by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 2, 2015 Filing 1086 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/20/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1085 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/20/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1084 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/19/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1083 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1082 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/19/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1081 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1080 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/18/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christine L. Bickham, RMR, CRR,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1079 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/18/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Christine L. Bickham, RMR, CRR,Telephone number: 409-654-2891. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1078 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1077 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/17/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1076 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/17/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1075 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1074 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/16/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1073 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1072 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/16/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1071 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1070 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/13/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1069 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/13/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1068 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/12/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 2, 2015 Filing 1067 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/12/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2016. (sholmes, )
December 1, 2015 Filing 1066 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Bill of Costs by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 ORDER re Costs. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/24/2015. (nkl, )
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/24/2015. (nkl, )
November 23, 2015 Filing 1063 BILL OF COSTS by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC. Costs Taxed in the amount of $10317.19. (nkl, )
November 23, 2015 Filing 1062 BILL OF COSTS by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Costs Taxed in the amount of $200105.40. (nkl, )
November 20, 2015 Filing 1061 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial completed on 11/20/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 20, 2015 Filing 1060 SEALED Jury Note. (jml)
November 20, 2015 Filing 1059 JURY VERDICT. (jml) . Modified on 11/20/2015 (jml).
November 20, 2015 Filing 1058 Defendant's, Apple, Inc., Final Trial Exhibit List. (jml)
November 20, 2015 Filing 1057 Plaintiff's, ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., Final Trial Exhibit List. (jml)
November 19, 2015 Filing 1056 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 11/19/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 19, 2015 Filing 1055 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Patent Invalidity by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 19, 2015 Filing 1054 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 50(A) by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 19, 2015 Filing 1053 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement, No Damages, and No Enhanced Damages by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 19, 2015 Filing 1052 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Direct Infringement by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 19, 2015 Filing 1046 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 1044 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S DENIAL TO ADMIT APL-CV_01304517 INTO EVIDENCE filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit Declaration of Bill Maxwell)(Smith, Melissa)
November 19, 2015 Filing 1045 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. CONTENTGUARD'S RESPONSE TO APPLE'S ORAL REQUEST TO PRESENT ADDITIONAL DIRECT TESTIMONY OR A SUR-REBUTTAL CASE RELATING TO ITS PREVIOUSLY UNDISCLOSED SERVER OPERATIONS(Baxter, Samuel)
November 18, 2015 Filing 1051 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 11/18/2015. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham, CSR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 18, 2015 Filing 1044 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S DENIAL TO ADMIT APL-CV_01304517 INTO EVIDENCE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 17, 2015 Filing 1050 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 11/17/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 16, 2015 Filing 1049 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 11/16/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 13, 2015 Filing 1048 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 11/13/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 ORDER granting 1039 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/2015. (nkl, )
November 13, 2015 Filing 1042 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. re 1021 Transcript,,,, NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION (Baxter, Samuel)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 ORDER denying 1027 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/2015. (nkl, )
November 12, 2015 Filing 1047 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 11/12/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 12, 2015 Filing 1040 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Apple's Sealed Bench Brief Regarding DRM-Free Music (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 11/12/2015 (nkl, ).
November 12, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 1040, Apple's Sealed Bench Brief Regarding DRM-Free Music. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
November 11, 2015 Filing 1039 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CORRECT EXPERT DISCLOSURE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 10, 2015 Filing 1038 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW WITH RESPECT TO THE GOOGLE-SAMSUNG TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR A NEW TRIAL (RENEWED) by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 ORDER denying 1017 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/10/2015. (nkl, )
November 10, 2015 Filing 1036 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motorola's Agreed Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit Final Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Motorola's Itemized Agreed Costs, # 4 Exhibit Deposition Invoices, # 5 Exhibit Document Conversion Invoices, # 6 Exhibit Court Appointed Expert Invoice)(Unikel, Robert)
November 10, 2015 Filing 1035 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1027 Opposed SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Report filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 10, 2015 Filing 1034 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 50(b), and in the Alternative, Request for a New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59 by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
November 10, 2015 Filing 1033 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Court Reporter itemization and invoices, # 2 Exhibit B - Deposition itemization and invoices, # 3 Exhibit C - Witness itemization and invoices, # 4 Exhibit D- E-Discovery itemization and invoices, # 5 Exhibit E - Reporoduction itemization and invoices, # 6 Exhibit F - Graphics itemization and invoices, # 7 Exhibit G - Court appointed expert invoice, # 8 Exhibit H - Interpretation itemization and invoices)(Sirota, Neil)
November 10, 2015 Filing 1032 MOTION --Conditional Motion for Bench Trial on Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Defenses by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
November 10, 2015 Filing 1031 SEALED MOTION for Judgment of Invalidity of Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 6,963,859 for Obviousness-Type Double Patenting by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 ORDER denying 993 Sealed Motion; denying 995 Sealed Motion; denying 999 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/10/2015. (nkl, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 1029 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/9/15 (Jury Selection) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2016. (sholmes, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 1028 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/9/15 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2016. (sholmes, )
November 9, 2015 Filing 1027 Opposed SEALED MOTION Renewed Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Report by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
November 9, 2015 Filing 1026 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 11/9/2015 re 1017 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Teece's November 3 Exhibits filed by Apple, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (jml)
November 9, 2015 Filing 1025 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Selection held on 11/9/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 8, 2015 Filing 1024 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 1017 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Teece's November 3 Exhibits filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 ORDER granting 1018 Motion to Expedite Briefing on 1017 Apple's Motion to Strike Dr. Teece's November 3 Exhibits. ContentGuard's opposition is due Sunday, November 8, 2015, at 3:00 p.m. CST. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2015. (jrg2)
November 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION on 692 ContentGuard's Motion to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. John P.J. Kelly. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2015. (jrg2)
November 7, 2015 Filing 1021 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/3/15 (Pretrial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2016. (sholmes, )
November 6, 2015 Filing 1020 Proposed Jury Instructions by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Final Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Verdict Form)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1019 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1014 Sealed Exhibit List.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1018 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing re 1017 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Teece's November 3 Exhibits by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1017 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Teece's November 3 Exhibits by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1015 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF CONTENGUARD HOLDINGS INC.'S EXHIBIT LIST (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 6, 2015 Filing 1014 Sealed Exhibit List by Apple, Inc... (Smith, Melissa)
November 5, 2015 Filing 1013 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. NOTICE REGARDING FINAL SELECTION OF PATENTS FOR THE APPLE TRIAL (Baxter, Samuel)
November 5, 2015 Filing 1012 TRIAL Witness List by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
November 5, 2015 Filing 1011 BILL OF COSTS by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Costs Taxed in the amount of $30248.07. (nkl, )
November 5, 2015 Filing 1010 BILL OF COSTS by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Costs Taxed in the amount of $35586.66. (nkl, )
November 4, 2015 Filing 1009 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple, Inc. for proceedings held on Pretrial Conference on 11/3/2015 before Judge Gilstrap. (Smith, Melissa)
November 3, 2015 Filing 1016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/3/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 3, 2015 Filing 1008 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Attachment A - Summary of Costs, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Garnett, Terrence)
November 3, 2015 Filing 1007 Witness List by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 ORDER granting 1003 Motion to Modify Schedule. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/03/2015. (nkl, )
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 ORDER granting 1002 Motion to Modify Schedule. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/03/2015. (nkl, )
November 3, 2015 Filing 1004 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Attachment A Itemization of Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 2 Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6)(Partridge, Scott)
November 3, 2015 Filing 1003 Joint MOTION to Modify Schedule by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. and by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
November 2, 2015 Filing 1002 Joint MOTION to Modify Schedule to file Bill of Costs by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sirota, Neil)
November 2, 2015 Filing 1001 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 995 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Report, 993 Opposed SEALED MOTION Apple's Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, 999 Opposed SEALED MOTION Apple's Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece Concerning the Amazon License filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 30, 2015 Filing 1000 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice Regarding Service of Supplemental Trial Witness List (Smith, Melissa)
October 29, 2015 Filing 999 Opposed SEALED MOTION Apple's Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece Concerning the Amazon License by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Smith, Melissa)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 998 ORDER granting 996 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/2015. (nkl, )
October 29, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 11/3/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***Please note that the only change is the TIME for the hearing.***(jml)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 997 ORDER granting 994 Motion to Modify Schedule. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/27/2015. (nkl, )
October 27, 2015 Filing 996 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Report by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 27, 2015 Filing 995 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Report by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
October 26, 2015 Filing 994 Joint MOTION to Modify Schedule by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. and by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
October 26, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2015 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
October 20, 2015 Filing 993 Opposed SEALED MOTION Apple's Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 992 ORDER granting 990 Motion Requesting Submission of a Juror Questionnaire. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/14/2015. (nkl, )
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 991 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/14/2015. (nkl, )
October 13, 2015 Filing 990 Joint MOTION Requesting Submission of a Juror Questionnaire by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 989 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/12/2015. (nkl, )
October 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 988 ORDER granting 986 Sealed Patent Motion to Redact September 14, 2015 PM Trial Transcript. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/9/15. (mrm, )
October 12, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Jury Trial RESET for 11/12/2015 08:30 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***Please note the date change for the beginning of the trial.***(jml)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 987 ORDER granting 985 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/08/2015. (nkl, )
October 7, 2015 Filing 986 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO REDACT SEPTEMBER 14, 2015 TRIAL TRANSCRIPT by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 7, 2015 Filing 985 Joint MOTION to Dismiss certain Claims by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 984 ORDER granting 983 Motion to Redact re 946 Transcript. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/06/2015. (nkl, )
October 5, 2015 Filing 983 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 946 Transcript,,,, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boerman, Brian)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 982 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/05/2015. (nkl, )
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 981 ORDER granting 976 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/05/2015. (nkl, )
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 980 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/02/2015. (nkl, )
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 979 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/02/2015. (nkl, )
October 1, 2015 Filing 978 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 938 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4)(Smith, Melissa)
October 1, 2015 Filing 977 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 962 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J, # 2 Exhibit K, # 3 Exhibit L, # 4 Exhibit M)(Smith, Melissa)
September 30, 2015 Filing 976 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
September 30, 2015 Filing 975 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 938 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 30, 2015 Filing 974 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 962 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 30, 2015 Filing 973 Samsung 's Final Trial Exhibit List. (jml)
September 30, 2015 Filing 972 ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.'s Final Trial Exhibit List.(jml)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 971 ORDER re 962 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Continue Trial Date filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/29/2015. (nkl, )
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 970 ORDER granting 934 Motion to redact confidential information from the trial record. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/29/2015. (nkl, )
September 30, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Selection set for 11/9/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
September 25, 2015 Filing 962 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Smith, Melissa)
September 24, 2015 Filing 961 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/23/15 (Trial Transcript - Verdict) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 960 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 959 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/23/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 958 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 957 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/22/15 (Trial Transcript - JMOLs) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 956 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9 /22/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 955 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/22/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 954 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/21/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 953 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 952 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/21/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 951 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 950 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/17/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 949 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 948 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/17/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session *REDACTED) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 947 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 946 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/16/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 945 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 944 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/16/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 943 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/15/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 942 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/15/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 941 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/14/15 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2015 Filing 940 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/14/15 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2015. (sholmes, )
September 23, 2015 Filing 969 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial completed on 9/23/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
September 23, 2015 Filing 939 JURY VERDICT. (jml)
September 23, 2015 Filing 938 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Bud Tribble, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa)
September 22, 2015 Filing 968 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 9/22/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
September 22, 2015 Filing 937 SEALED MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 50(A) by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Jones, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2015: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
September 22, 2015 Filing 936 Proposed Jury Instructions by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 22, 2015 Filing 935 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. OFFER OF PROOF REGARDING RELATED PROCEEDINGS BEFORE THE PATENT TRIAL AND APPEAL BOARD (Baxter, Samuel)
September 22, 2015 Filing 934 Unopposed MOTION to Redact Confidential Information from Trial Testimony by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sibble, Joshua)
September 21, 2015 Filing 967 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 9/21/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
September 21, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 933, TRIAL BRIEF TO RESTRICT THE SCOPE OF GOOGLE'S EXPERT (DR. CLARK) TESTIMONY TO WHAT IS DISCLOSED IN HIS REPORT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
September 20, 2015 Filing 933 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY TRIAL BRIEF TO RESTRICT THE SCOPE OF GOOGLE'S EXPERT (DR. CLARK) TESTIMONY TO WHAT IS DISCLOSED IN HIS REPORT by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 9/21/2015 (nkl, ).
September 20, 2015 Filing 932 TRIAL BRIEF TO LIMIT MR. WARD'S TESTIMONY TO THE SCOPE OF HIS REPORT by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6 Part 1, # 7 Exhibit 6 Part 2, # 8 Exhibit 6 Part 3)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 17, 2015 Filing 966 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 9/17/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
September 17, 2015 Filing 931 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple, Inc. for proceedings held on 09/14/2015-09/17/2015 before Judge Gilstrap. (Smith, Melissa)
September 17, 2015 Filing 930 SEALED MOTION for Production of Stefik Inventore Notes and Proposals and Leave for Their Use at Deposition by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sirota, Neil)
September 16, 2015 Filing 965 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 9/16/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
September 15, 2015 Filing 929 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to David T Pritikin on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Pritikin, David)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 928 ORDER denying as moot 925 Opposed MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE AND NEW TRIAL SETTING filed by Apple, Inc.., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Trial set for 11/9/2015 08:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/14/2015. (nkl, )
September 14, 2015 Filing 927 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. OBJECTIONS TO GOOGLE AND SAMSUNG'S OPENING DEMONSTRATIVES (Baxter, Samuel)
September 14, 2015 Filing 926 RESPONSE to DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO STEFIK DIRECT SLIDES 34 AND 35 AND OPENING SLIDE 16 by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 11, 2015 Filing 925 Opposed MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE AND NEW TRIAL SETTING by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 924 ORDER granting 916 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/10/2015. (nkl, )
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 923 ORDER denying 906 Sealed Motion; granting 908 Sealed Motion; granting 915 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/09/2015. (jrg2)
September 9, 2015 Filing 922 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 906 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 9, 2015 Filing 921 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 908 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 9, 2015 Filing 920 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 915 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Report filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 919 ORDER granting 903 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC terminated., Attorney John Frederick Bufe; Eric Joseph Faragi; Allen Franklin Gardner; Brian D Johnston; Michael E Jones; Robert Lawrence Maier; Joshua David Sibble; Neil Phillip Sirota; Eliot Damon Williams; Michael Joseph Barta and Brian S Boerman terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/08/2015. (nkl, )
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 918 ORDER granting 902 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims, Defenses, andCounterclaims filed by plaintiff ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. and defendants Samsung Electronics, Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/08/2015. (nkl, )
September 9, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY - DUPLICATE TO 915 . Document # 913, SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Report. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 917 ORDER granting 914 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/8/2015. (jrg2)
September 8, 2015 Filing 916 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION TO ADOPT AND ENTER JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING REPRESENTATIVE MODELS AND PRODUCT TESTING BETWEEN SAMSUNG AND CONTENTGUARD by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 8, 2015 Filing 915 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Report by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sibble, Joshua)
September 8, 2015 Filing 914 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Report by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sibble, Joshua)
September 8, 2015 Filing 913 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Expert Report by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sibble, Joshua) Modified on 9/9/2015 (nkl, ).
September 8, 2015 Filing 912 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas A Broughan, III on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5379174. (Broughan, Thomas)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER granting 907 Motion to Expedite briefing schedules; granting 909 Motion to Expedite briefing schedules. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/08/2015. (nkl, )
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 910 ORDER granting 905 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/08/2015. (nkl, ) Modified on 9/8/2015 (jml).
September 7, 2015 Filing 909 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 7, 2015 Filing 908 Opposed SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 6, 2015 Filing 907 MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maier, Robert)
September 6, 2015 Filing 906 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Maier, Robert)
September 6, 2015 Filing 905 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to FIle Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Maier, Robert)
September 6, 2015 Filing 904 Proposed Jury Instructions by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 4, 2015 Filing 903 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
September 4, 2015 Filing 902 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 901 SUBSTITUTE ORDER re 896 Order on Sealed Patent Motion, Order on Sealed Motion, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/04/2015. (nkl, )
September 4, 2015 Filing 900 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING THE COURT'S SEPTEMBER 4, 2015 ORDER (DKT. NO. 899) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 899 ORDER re 692 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. John P.J. Kelly filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/04/2015. (nkl, )
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 898 ORDER granting 890 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Amazon.com Inc.., Amazon.com Inc. and Amazon.com Inc. terminated., Attorney Katherine Hacker; John M Hughes; Brent Douglas McCabe; Abby M Mollen; Glen Eric Summers; Joshua Reed Thane; Michael John Valaik; Alison G Wheeler; Joshua P Ackerman and Jennifer Haltom Doan terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/03/2015. (nkl, )
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 897 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/03/2015. (nkl, )
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 896 WITHDRAWN PER 901 ORDER granting 478 Sealed Patent Motion; granting in part and denying in part 857 Sealed Patent Motion; denying 863 Sealed Patent Motion; finding as moot 869 Sealed Motion; denying 874 Motion to Adopt Claim Construction Clarification as Part of Jury Instructions; denying 875 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/03/2015. (nkl, ) Modified on 9/4/2015 (nkl, ).
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 894 ORDER re 877 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 09/02/2015. (nkl, )
September 2, 2015 Filing 893 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
September 2, 2015 Filing 892 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/1/15 (Pretrial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/8/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/4/2015. (sholmes, )
September 2, 2015 Filing 891 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 692 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. John P.J. Kelly filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 2, 2015 Filing 890 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
September 1, 2015 Filing 895 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/1/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
September 1, 2015 Filing 889 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Patrick Wisse on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Wisse, John)
September 1, 2015 Filing 888 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott M Border on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Border, Scott)
September 1, 2015 Filing 887 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua David Sibble on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Sibble, Joshua)
September 1, 2015 Filing 886 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 869 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to ContentGuards August 19, 2015 Production of the Dozios Memorandum, and Proposed Supplemental Teece Report filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Declaration of Timothy M. Dozois, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 885 ORDER granting 881 Apple Inc.'s Sealed Motion for Leave to file Reply to ContentGuard's Response to the Court's Order 860 re ContentGuard's Daubert Motion 692 . Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on August 31, 2015. (jml)
August 31, 2015 Filing 884 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 863 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE GOOGLE AND SAMSUNG DEFENDANTS FROM RELYING ON CERTAIN ALLEGED PRIOR ART COMBINATIONS filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Sirota, Neil)
August 31, 2015 Filing 883 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 857 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT filed by Apple, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit 9)(Sirota, Neil)
August 31, 2015 Filing 882 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW (DKT. 866) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 31, 2015 Filing 881 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Reply to ContentGuard's Response to the Court's Order [Dkt. 860] by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit)(Smith, Melissa)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 880 ORDER re 869 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to ContentGuards August 19, 2015 Production of the Dozios Memorandum, and Proposed Supplemental Teece Report filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/31/2015. (nkl, )
August 31, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 876, Proposed Jury Instructions. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
August 29, 2015 Filing 879 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 857 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E, # 4 Exhibit F, # 5 Exhibit G, # 6 Exhibit H, # 7 Exhibit I)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 29, 2015 Filing 878 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 863 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE GOOGLE AND SAMSUNG DEFENDANTS FROM RELYING ON CERTAIN ALLEGED PRIOR ART COMBINATIONS filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
August 29, 2015 Filing 877 Proposed Jury Instructions by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 28, 2015 Filing 876 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Proposed Jury Instructions by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 8/31/2015 (nkl, ).
August 28, 2015 Filing 875 Opposed SEALED MOTION for a Trial Setting by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Nathan Wenk)(Smith, Melissa)
August 28, 2015 Filing 874 Opposed MOTION to Adopt Claim Construction Clarification as Part of Jury Instructions by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 28, 2015 Filing 873 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 869 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to ContentGuards August 19, 2015 Production of the Dozios Memorandum, and Proposed Supplemental Teece Report (Notice of Errata Sheet to Correct a Legal Citation) (Smith, Melissa)
August 28, 2015 Filing 872 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. to 860 Order, 865 Response to Non-Motion filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
August 27, 2015 Filing 871 SEALED CORRECTED RESPONSE to Motion re 857 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT filed by Apple, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Sirota, Neil)
August 27, 2015 Filing 870 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 857 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT filed by Apple, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Sirota, Neil)
August 27, 2015 Filing 869 Emergency SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents in Response to ContentGuards August 19, 2015 Production of the Dozios Memorandum, and Proposed Supplemental Teece Report by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Nathan Greenblatt, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Melissa)
August 27, 2015 Filing 868 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 863 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE GOOGLE AND SAMSUNG DEFENDANTS FROM RELYING ON CERTAIN ALLEGED PRIOR ART COMBINATIONS filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, Part 1, # 9 Exhibit 8, Part 2, # 10 Exhibit 8, Part 3, # 11 Exhibit 8, Part 4, # 12 Exhibit 8, Part 5, # 13 Exhibit 8, Part 6, # 14 Exhibit 8, Part 7, # 15 Exhibit 9, # 16 Exhibit 10, # 17 Exhibit 11, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Sirota, Neil)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER granting 864 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/26/2015. (nkl, )
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER re 510 Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/26/2015. (nkl, )
August 26, 2015 Filing 865 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to 860 Order filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Declaration of John P.J. Kelly, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Smith, Melissa)
August 25, 2015 Filing 864 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE GOOGLE AND SAMSUNG DEFENDANTS FROM RELYING ON CERTAIN ALLEGED PRIOR ART COMBINATIONS (DKT. 863) by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 25, 2015 Filing 863 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE GOOGLE AND SAMSUNG DEFENDANTS FROM RELYING ON CERTAIN ALLEGED PRIOR ART COMBINATIONS by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 25, 2015 Filing 862 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rosemary Tyson Snider on behalf of ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. (Snider, Rosemary)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 861 ORDER granting 858 Motion to Expedite Briefing on ContentGuards Motion for Leave to Supplement Expert Report. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/25/2015. (nkl, )
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 860 ORDER re 692 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. John P.J. Kelly filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/24/2015. (nkl, )
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 859 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/24/2015. (nkl, )
August 25, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 853, SEALED RESPONSE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
August 24, 2015 Filing 858 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT (DKT. 857) by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 24, 2015 Filing 857 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT EXPERT REPORT by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 856 ORDER re Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on August 24, 2015. (jml)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ORDER granting 852 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on August 24, 2015. (jml)
August 24, 2015 Filing 854 RESPONSE to 853 Response to Non-Motion CONTENTGUARD'S OBJECTION TO APPLE'S OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATION OF DR. TREVOR J. SMEDLEY IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. JOHN P.J. KELLY by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
August 24, 2015 Filing 853 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to 851 Sealed Patent Document filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 8/25/2015 (nkl, ).
August 21, 2015 Filing 852 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND STAY AND NOTICE REGARDING PLAINTIFF CONTENTGUARD HOLDINGS, INC. AND DEFENDANT AMAZON.COM, INC.'S JOINT MOTION TO STAY ALL DEADLINES re 797 Joint MOTION to Stay ALL DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, 801 Order on Motion to Stay by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 20, 2015 Filing 851 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING THE COURT'S AUGUST 12, 2015 ORDER (DKT. 835) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 850 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER re Daubert Motions. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on August 19, 2015. (jml)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 849 ORDER granting 847 Joint Motion Requesting Submission of a Juror Questionnaire. This Order SUPERSEDES that order (Dkt. No. 846).. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/19/2015. (nkl, )
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 848 ORDER re Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/19/2015. (nkl, )
August 19, 2015 Filing 847 Joint MOTION Requesting Submission of A Juror Questionnaire by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 846 ORDER re 834 Joint MOTION Requesting Submission of a Juror Questionnaire filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/19/2015. (nkl, )
August 19, 2015 Filing 845 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Bufe, John)
August 17, 2015 Filing 844 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: second session suspended (Apple Inc)(Folsom, David)
August 17, 2015 Filing 843 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: second session suspended (Samsung entities)(Folsom, David)
August 17, 2015 Filing 842 Sealed Document. Notice of Compliance with the Court's August 12, 2015 Order [Dkt. 835] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of John P.J. Kelly, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Smith, Melissa)
August 14, 2015 Filing 841 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 282 (Sirota, Neil)
August 14, 2015 Filing 840 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 282 (Smith, Melissa)
August 14, 2015 Filing 839 NOTICE by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Defendants' Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 282 (Partridge, Scott)
August 14, 2015 Filing 838 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
August 14, 2015 Filing 837 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/7/15 (Pretrial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes,CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015. (sholmes, )
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 835 ORDER re 692 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. John P.J. Kelly. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/12/2015. (ch, )
August 12, 2015 Filing 834 Joint MOTION Requesting Submission of a Juror Questionnaire by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
August 11, 2015 Filing 833 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH AUGUST 6, 2015 ORDER (DKT. 825) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 10, 2015 Filing 832 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 830 Response to Non-Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Smith, Melissa)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 689 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment Limiting ContentGuard's Pre-Suit Damages for Failure to Comply with the Constructive Notice Requirement of 35 U.S.C. § 287. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/10/15. (mrm, )
August 10, 2015 Filing 830 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple, Inc. to 828 Sealed Patent Document, filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
August 10, 2015 Filing 829 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Apple Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Submission of Isaacson Excerpts and Renewal of Objections to Admission of PX-1171 (Smith, Melissa)
August 7, 2015 Filing 836 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 8/7/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
August 7, 2015 Filing 828 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. NOTICE OF DECLARATION FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF CONTENTGUARD HOLDINGS, INC.'S DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF DR. JOHN P. KELLY (DKT. 692) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 7, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Omnibus Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
August 6, 2015 Filing 827 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/5/15 (Pretrial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/31/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2015. (sholmes, )
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 826 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re Joint Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C.§ 101. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on August 6, 2015. (jml)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 825 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re Motions to Exclude Expert Damages Testimony. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on August 6, 2015. (jml) Modified on 8/6/2015 (jml, ).
August 6, 2015 Filing 824 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Filing Demonstratives (08/05/2015 Hearing) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
August 5, 2015 Filing 823 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Pretrial Conference held on 8/5/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
August 4, 2015 Filing 822 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/31/15 (Pretrial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2015. (sholmes, )
August 4, 2015 Filing 821 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/29/15 (Pretrial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/28/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2015. (sholmes, )
August 4, 2015 NOTICE of Hearings: Pretrial Conferences set for 8/5/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 and 8/7/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 820 ORDER granting 667 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/03/2015. (nkl, )
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ORDER re 759 Notice (Other), filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., 758 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., 760 MOTION in Limine filed by Amazon.com Inc., 800 Notice (Other) filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., 762 SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motions in Limine filed by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., 757 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/31/2015. (nkl, )
August 2, 2015 Filing 818 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/27/15 (Pretrial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/7/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2015. (sholmes, )
July 31, 2015 Filing 817 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2015 re 723 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion To Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Teece, Dr. Danaher, And Dr. Prince filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
July 29, 2015 Filing 816 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2015 re 667 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S ORDER PRECLUDING APPLE INC.'S RELIANCE ON THE INTERTRUST VDE SYSTEM AND TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY CONCERNING CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVES filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., 689 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Limiting ContentGuard's Pre-Suit Damages for Failure to Comply with Constructive Notice Requirement of 35 U.S.C. Section 287 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: # 1 Atty Attendance Sheet) (jmv, ) (Main Document 816 replaced on 8/4/2015) (jmv, ).
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 815 ORDER re Trial. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/28/2015. (nkl, )
July 28, 2015 Filing 814 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 721 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Combined Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports and Testimony of Michael T. Goodrich and David Martin filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 28, 2015 Filing 813 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 684 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Steve White filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
July 28, 2015 Filing 812 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 811 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
July 28, 2015 Filing 811 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 685 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Atul Prakash filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
July 28, 2015 Filing 810 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 723 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion To Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Teece, Dr. Danaher, And Dr. Prince, 662 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, 666 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Danaher Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, 663 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Prince Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A40, # 3 Exhibit A41, # 4 Exhibit A42, # 5 Exhibit A43, # 6 Exhibit A44, # 7 Exhibit A45)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 28, 2015 Filing 809 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 688 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Noninfringement Reports and Testimony of Paul Clark, Brian Noble, John Kelly and Gene Tsudik filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
July 28, 2015 Filing 808 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 683 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Report and Testimony of Dr. Brian Noble filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Sirota, Neil)
July 28, 2015 Filing 807 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 692 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. John P.J. Kelly filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
July 28, 2015 Filing 806 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 688 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Noninfringement Reports and Testimony of Paul Clark, Brian Noble, John Kelly and Gene Tsudik filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Unikel, Robert)
July 28, 2015 Filing 805 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 679 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF JEAN RENARD WARD filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8, # 2 Exhibit 9, # 3 Exhibit 10)(Unikel, Robert)
July 28, 2015 Filing 804 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 690 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Paul Clark filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Unikel, Robert)
July 28, 2015 Filing 803 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 667 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S ORDER PRECLUDING APPLE INC.'S RELIANCE ON THE INTERTRUST VDE SYSTEM AND TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY CONCERNING CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVES filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
July 27, 2015 Filing 802 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 7/27/2015 re 758 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., 760 MOTION in Limine filed by Amazon.com Inc., 762 SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motions in Limine filed by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., 757 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Apple, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-in Sheets) (tlh, )
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 801 ORDER granting 797 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/25/2015. (nkl, )
July 26, 2015 Filing 800 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. re 785 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, JOINT NOTICE REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Baxter, Samuel)
July 24, 2015 Filing 799 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 689 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Limiting ContentGuard's Pre-Suit Damages for Failure to Comply with Constructive Notice Requirement of 35 U.S.C. Section 287 filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 24, 2015 Filing 798 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: Amended Report (Settled - Amazon.com Inc.)(Folsom, David)
July 24, 2015 Filing 797 Joint MOTION to Stay ALL DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 23, 2015 Filing 796 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 758 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F)(Smith, Melissa)
July 23, 2015 Filing 795 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. of Joinder in Google's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine in case no. 2:14-CV-61 (Sirota, Neil)
July 23, 2015 Filing 794 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 762 SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motions in Limine filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dana E. Vallera, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2015: # 7 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
July 23, 2015 Filing 793 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 757 SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dana E. Vallera, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 792 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 791 Proposed Jury Instructions by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 790 Proposed Jury Instructions by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 789 Proposed Pretrial Order (JOINT) by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 788 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 666 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Danaher Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, 723 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion To Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Teece, Dr. Danaher, And Dr. Prince, 662 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, 663 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Prince Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Unikel, Robert)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 787 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER:( Jury instructions and Proposed Pretrial Order for Amazon due by 7/27/2015, Jury instructions and Proposed Pretrial Order for Samsung and Apple due by 7/22/2015.), granting in part 768 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 650 Order filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., granting in part 770 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 650 Order filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/15. (mrm, )
July 22, 2015 Filing 786 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 692 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. John P.J. Kelly filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 785 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion; resetting 539 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Invalid Pursuant to 35 USC 101 (Renewed Motion) : Motion Hearing reset for 7/29/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Motions in Limine set for Hearing on 7/27/2015 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/15. (mrm, )
July 22, 2015 Filing 784 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 721 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Combined Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports and Testimony of Michael T. Goodrich and David Martin filed by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 48, # 2 Exhibit 49, # 3 Exhibit 50, # 4 Exhibit 51, # 5 Exhibit 52, # 6 Exhibit 53, # 7 Exhibit 54, # 8 Exhibit 55, # 9 Exhibit 56, # 10 Exhibit 57, # 11 Exhibit 58, # 12 Exhibit 59, # 13 Exhibit 60, # 14 Exhibit 61)(Unikel, Robert)
July 22, 2015 Filing 783 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 688 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Noninfringement Reports and Testimony of Paul Clark, Brian Noble, John Kelly and Gene Tsudik filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 782 ORDER; The Court hereby ORDERS the Parties to provide the Court with two copies of each expert report that is the subject of either a live Daubert motion or a live motion to strike by 1 p.m. CDT on Friday, July 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/15. (mrm, )
July 22, 2015 Filing 781 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 688 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Noninfringement Reports and Testimony of Paul Clark, Brian Noble, John Kelly and Gene Tsudik filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dana E. Vallera, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 780 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 688 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Noninfringement Reports and Testimony of Paul Clark, Brian Noble, John Kelly and Gene Tsudik filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Dana E. Vallera, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 779 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 671 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE AND PRECLUDE AMAZON.COM, INC.'S EXPERT KEVIN M. MURPHY filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 778 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 684 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Steve White filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 777 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 683 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Report and Testimony of Dr. Brian Noble filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 776 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 679 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF JEAN RENARD WARD filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 775 REPLY to Response to Motion re 685 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Atul Prakash filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 774 SEALED REPLY in Support of Motion re 680 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Infringement Opinions of Plaintiff's Technical Expert Dr. Goodrich filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
July 22, 2015 Filing 773 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 694 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Gene Tsudik filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 772 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 690 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Paul Clark filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 22, 2015 Filing 771 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 667 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S ORDER PRECLUDING APPLE INC.'S RELIANCE ON THE INTERTRUST VDE SYSTEM AND TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY CONCERNING CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVES filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 21, 2015 Filing 770 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 650 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 21, 2015 Filing 769 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 488 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Notice of Joinder to Amazon's Opposition to ContentGuard's Emergency Motion for Protective Order (Smith, Melissa)
July 20, 2015 Filing 768 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 650 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 17, 2015 Filing 767 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David L Anderson on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5300644. (Anderson, David)
July 17, 2015 Filing 766 ***FILED IN ERROR.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David L Anderson on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Anderson, David) Modified on 7/17/2015 (ch, ).
July 17, 2015 Filing 765 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 681 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement of the Asserted Method Claims by the Amazon Kindle Apps for Third-Party Devices filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
July 17, 2015 Filing 764 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 689 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Limiting ContentGuard's Pre-Suit Damages for Failure to Comply with Constructive Notice Requirement of 35 U.S.C. Section 287 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 48)(Smith, Melissa)
July 17, 2015 Filing 763 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Randy Yim on behalf of ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. (Yim, Jonathan)
July 17, 2015 Filing 762 SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motions in Limine by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - PX-0148 - SAMS.00168915 - SAMS.00168923, # 2 Ex. B - Kwon depo transcript excerpts, # 3 Ex. C - SAMS00070477-83, # 4 Ex. D - Teece depo transcript exceprts, # 5 Ex. E - 4.17.15 CG's Third Supp Resps to Defendants' First Interrogatories (3-5, 11), # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
July 17, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. USED WRONG EVENT REFILED AT 767 Document # 766, Notice of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
July 17, 2015 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motions in Limine submitted document 761 does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
July 17, 2015 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 760 MOTION in Limine filed by Amazon. This entire filing has been MODIFIED to be a SEALED entry, per attorney. Certificate of authority and filed under seal were included on pleading. (sm, )
July 16, 2015 Filing 761 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motions in Limine by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - PX-0148 - SAMS.00168915 - SAMS.00168923, # 2 Ex. B - Kwon depo transcript excerpts, # 3 Ex. C - SAMS00070477-83, # 4 Ex. D - Teece depo transcript exceprts, # 5 Ex. E - 4.17.15 CG's Third Supp Resps to Defendants' First Interrogatories (3-5, 11), # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 7/17/2015 (nkl, ).
July 16, 2015 Filing 760 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 7/17/2015 (sm, ).
July 16, 2015 Filing 759 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. JOINT NOTICE OF CERTAIN AGREEMENTS REGARDING MOTIONS IN LIMINE BY CONTENTGUARD HOLDINGS, INC. AND GOOGLE, INC., APPLE, INC., AMAZON.COM, INC., AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS, AMERICA, INC. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 16, 2015 Filing 758 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION IN LIMINE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dana E. Vallera, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 16, 2015 Filing 757 SEALED MOTION in Limine by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23)(Smith, Melissa)
July 16, 2015 Filing 756 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Denial of Institution of Certain Inter Partes Review Petitions for U.S. Patent No. 8,393,007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2015 Filing 755 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 666 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Danaher Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, 723 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion To Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Teece, Dr. Danaher, And Dr. Prince, 663 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Prince Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, 662 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 15, 2015 Filing 754 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 662 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, 723 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion To Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Teece, Dr. Danaher, And Dr. Prince, 666 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Danaher Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, 663 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Prince Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit A3, # 5 Exhibit A4, # 6 Exhibit A5, # 7 Exhibit A6, # 8 Exhibit A7, # 9 Exhibit A8, # 10 Exhibit A9, # 11 Exhibit A10, # 12 Exhibit A11, # 13 Exhibit A12, # 14 Exhibit A13, # 15 Exhibit A14, # 16 Exhibit A15, # 17 Exhibit A16, # 18 Exhibit A17, # 19 Exhibit A18, # 20 Exhibit A19, # 21 Exhibit A20, # 22 Exhibit A21, # 23 Exhibit A22, # 24 Exhibit A23, # 25 Exhibit A24, # 26 Exhibit A25, # 27 Exhibit A26, # 28 Exhibit A27, # 29 Exhibit A28, # 30 Exhibit A29, # 31 Exhibit A30, # 32 Exhibit A31, # 33 Exhibit A32, # 34 Exhibit A33, # 35 Exhibit A34, # 36 Exhibit A35, # 37 Exhibit A36, # 38 Exhibit A37, # 39 Exhibit A38, # 40 Exhibit A39, # 41 Exhibit B, # 42 Exhibit B1, # 43 Exhibit B2, # 44 Exhibit C, # 45 Exhibit C1, # 46 Exhibit C2, # 47 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 15, 2015 Filing 753 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 736 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2015 Filing 752 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 737 Sealed Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2015 Filing 751 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 738 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2015 Filing 750 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 688 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Non-infringement Reports and Testimony of Paul Clark, Brian Noble, John Kelly and Gene Tsudik filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Unikel, Robert)
July 15, 2015 Filing 749 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 679 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF JEAN RENARD WARD filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Unikel, Robert)
July 15, 2015 Filing 748 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 685 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Atul Prakash filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7-1, # 9 Exhibit 7-2, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2015 Filing 747 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 694 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Gene Tsudik, 688 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Noninfringement Reports and Testimony of Paul Clark, Brian Noble, John Kelly and Gene Tsudik filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 15, 2015 Filing 746 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 690 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Paul Clark filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Unikel, Robert)
July 15, 2015 Filing 745 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 739 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit V)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2015 Filing 744 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 671 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE AND PRECLUDE AMAZON.COM, INC.'S EXPERT KEVIN M. MURPHY filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 15, 2015 Filing 743 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 683 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Report and Testimony of Dr. Brian Noble filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sirota, Neil)
July 15, 2015 Filing 742 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 680 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Infringement Opinions of Plaintiff's Technical Expert Dr. Goodrich filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 15, 2015 Filing 741 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 684 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Steve White filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2015 Filing 740 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 721 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Combined Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports and Testimony of Michael T. Goodrich and David Martin filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 15, 2015 Filing 739 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 738 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of John P.J. Kelly, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2015 Filing 738 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 692 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. John P.J. Kelly filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2015 Filing 737 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 688 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Noninfringement Reports and Testimony of Paul Clark, Brian Noble, John Kelly and Gene Tsudik filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2015 Filing 736 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 667 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S ORDER PRECLUDING APPLE INC.'S RELIANCE ON THE INTERTRUST VDE SYSTEM AND TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY CONCERNING CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVES filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D-1, # 7 Exhibit D-2, # 8 Exhibit D-3, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K)(Smith, Melissa)
July 13, 2015 Filing 735 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. OF DENIAL OF INSTITUTION OF CERTAIN INTER PARTES REVIEW PETITIONS FOR U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,963,859, 7,269,576, 7,523,072, 8,370,956, AND 8,393,007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Smith, Melissa)
July 13, 2015 Filing 734 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 650 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 13, 2015 Filing 733 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Jones, Michael)
July 13, 2015 Filing 732 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Doan, Jennifer)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ORDER granting 725 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 725 Motion Consolidate Daubert Briefing. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/13/2015. (nkl, )
July 13, 2015 Filing 730 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Smith, Melissa)
July 13, 2015 Filing 729 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPT AND REAL TIME REPORTING OF TRIAL PROCEEDINGS (Baxter, Samuel)
July 10, 2015 Filing 728 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 681 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement of the Asserted Method Claims by the Amazon Kindle Apps for Third-Party Devices filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 10, 2015 Filing 727 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 689 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Limiting ContentGuard's Pre-Suit Damages for Failure to Comply with Constructive Notice Requirement of 35 U.S.C. Section 287 filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3A, # 4 Exhibit 3B, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5A, # 7 Exhibit 5B, # 8 Exhibit 5C, # 9 Exhibit 5D, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 10, 2015 Filing 726 RESPONSE to 719 Sealed Document, by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 10, 2015 Filing 725 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , MOTION CONSOLIDATE DAUBERT BRIEFING by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 9, 2015 Filing 724 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC re 710 Order, JOINT NOTICE (Garnett, Terrence)
July 9, 2015 Filing 723 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Joint Motion To Exclude The Testimony Of Dr. Teece, Dr. Danaher, And Dr. Prince by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 539 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Invalid Pursuant to 35 USC 101 (Renewed Motion) : Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/9/2015. (ch, )
July 8, 2015 Filing 721 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Combined Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports and Testimony of Michael T. Goodrich and David Martin by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
July 6, 2015 Filing 720 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Denial of Institution of Certain Inter Partes Review Petitions for U.S. Patent Nos. 7,774,280 and 8,001,053 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
July 3, 2015 Filing 719 Sealed Document. Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Invalid Pursuant to 35 USC 101 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Unikel, Robert)
July 2, 2015 Filing 718 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 717 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Unikel, Robert)
July 2, 2015 Filing 717 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC Notice Of Errata To Google & Android Defendants' Motion To Exclude Jeffrey Prince Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Evidence 702 (Unikel, Robert)
July 2, 2015 Filing 716 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 715 Notice (Other). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Unikel, Robert)
July 2, 2015 Filing 715 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC Notice Of Errata To Goolge & Android Defendants' Motion To Exclude David Teece Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Evidence 702 (Unikel, Robert)
July 2, 2015 Filing 714 Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Google & Android Defendants' Motion To Exclude Brett Danaher Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Evidence 702, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Unikel, Robert)
July 2, 2015 Filing 713 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Amazon.com Inc. (Notice of Compliance Regarding Pretrial Disclosures (Doan, Jennifer)
July 2, 2015 Filing 712 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. re 620 Notice (Other) CORRECTED JOINT PROPOSAL FOR SEPARATE TRIALS (Baxter, Samuel)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER re 672 Notice (Other) filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/02/2015. (nkl, )
July 1, 2015 Filing 711 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Evidentiary Hearing held on 7/1/2015. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
July 1, 2015 Filing 709 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/1/15 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/2/2015. (sholmes, )
July 1, 2015 Filing 708 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation of Compliance Regarding Pretrial Disclosures (Garnett, Terrence)
July 1, 2015 Filing 707 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC of Compliance regarding Objections to Pretrial Disclosures and Rebuttal Pretrial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
July 1, 2015 Filing 706 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC Notice of Compliance Regarding Objections to Pretrial Disclosures and Rebuttal Pretrial Disclosures (Unikel, Robert)
July 1, 2015 Filing 705 NOTICE by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. of Compliance Regarding Pretrial Disclosures (Partridge, Scott)
July 1, 2015 Filing 704 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Objections to Pretrial Disclosures and Rebuttal Pretrial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
June 30, 2015 Filing 703 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Amazon.com, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
June 29, 2015 Filing 702 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Denial of Institution of Certain Inter Partes Review Petitions for U.S. Patent Nos. 7,774,280, 8,001,053, 8,393,007 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Smith, Melissa)
June 29, 2015 Filing 701 SEALED MOTION To Exclude David Teece Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Evidence 702 by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
June 29, 2015 Filing 700 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Brett Danaher Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Evidence 702 by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
June 29, 2015 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SEALED MOTION To Exclude David Teece Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 702 submitted document 697 does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
June 29, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 698, SEALED MOTION Exhibits 3 & 10 To Dkt No 697. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
June 29, 2015 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SEALED MOTION To Exclude Brett Danaher Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Evidence 702 submitted document 696 does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
June 26, 2015 Filing 699 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation Joinder in Google, Inc.'s Motions To Exclude Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Evidence 702, filed in related Civil Action No. 2:14-cv-61-RJG at Docket Nos. 240,241,242 (Garnett, Terrence)
June 26, 2015 Filing 698 FILED IN ERROR- ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE SEALED MOTION Exhibits 3 & 10 To Dkt No 697 by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10)(Unikel, Robert) Modified on 6/29/2015 (nkl, ).
June 26, 2015 Filing 697 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT SEALED MOTION To Exclude David Teece Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 702 by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8, # 8 Exhibit 9, # 9 Exhibit 11, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert) Modified on 6/29/2015 (nkl, ).
June 26, 2015 Filing 696 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT SEALED MOTION To Exclude Brett Danaher Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Evidence 702 by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert) Modified on 6/29/2015 (ch, ). Modified on 6/29/2015 (nkl, ).
June 26, 2015 Filing 695 SEALED MOTION To Exclude Jeffrey Prince Expert Opinion Testimony Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Evidence 702 by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
June 26, 2015 Filing 694 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Gene Tsudik by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 26, 2015 Filing 693 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation re 682 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Teece, Dr. Danaher and Dr. Prince HTC America, Inc., and HTC Corporation's Joinder in Amazon.com, Inc.s Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Teece, Dr. Danaher and Dr. Prince (Garnett, Terrence)
June 26, 2015 Filing 692 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. John P.J. Kelly by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 691 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation Joinder in Defendant Google, Inc.s Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Michael T. Goodrich and David Martin that Contradict the Courts Claim Construction Opinion and Order, filed in related Civil Action No. 2:14-cv-61-RJG, at Docket No. 232 (Garnett, Terrence)
June 26, 2015 Filing 690 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Paul Clark by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 26, 2015 Filing 689 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Limiting ContentGuard's Pre-Suit Damages for Failure to Comply with Constructive Notice Requirement of 35 U.S.C. Section 287 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7-1, # 9 Exhibit 7-2, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37, # 40 Exhibit 38, # 41 Exhibit 39, # 42 Exhibit 40, # 43 Exhibit 41, # 44 Exhibit 42, # 45 Exhibit 43, # 46 Exhibit 44, # 47 Exhibit 45, # 48 Exhibit 46, # 49 Exhibit 47)(Smith, Melissa)
June 26, 2015 Filing 688 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Noninfringement Reports and Testimony of Paul Clark, Brian Noble, John Kelly and Gene Tsudik by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Dana E. Vallera, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 26, 2015 Filing 687 NOTICE by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Notice of Joinder in Google Inc's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Michael T. Goodrich That Contradict the Court's Claim Construction in Case No 2:14-CV-061 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
June 26, 2015 Filing 686 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Report and Testimony of Dr. John Phillip Mellor by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 26, 2015 Filing 685 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Atul Prakash by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 26, 2015 Filing 684 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Reports and Testimony of Dr. Steve White by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 26, 2015 Filing 683 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Report and Testimony of Dr. Brian Noble by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 26, 2015 Filing 682 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Teece, Dr. Danaher and Dr. Prince by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 26, 2015 Filing 681 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement of the Asserted Method Claims by the Amazon Kindle Apps for Third-Party Devices by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 26, 2015 Filing 680 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Infringement Opinions of Plaintiff's Technical Expert Dr. Goodrich by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 26, 2015 Filing 679 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO EXCLUDE PORTIONS OF THE REPORTS AND TESTIMONY OF JEAN RENARD WARD by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 26, 2015 Filing 678 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC of Institution of Covered Business Method Review for U.S. Patent No. 7,774,280 and Denial of Institution of Covered Business Method Review for U.S. Patent No. 8,001,053 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Unikel, Robert)
June 26, 2015 Filing 677 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Infringement Expert Michael T. Goodrich Regarding Indirect Infringement by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
June 26, 2015 Filing 676 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings for ContentGuard's Failure to State a Claim Upon which Relief can be Granted Against HTC with Regard to the '859 Patent by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Garnett, Terrence) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2015: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
June 26, 2015 Filing 675 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Testimony of ContentGuard Technical Expert Michael Goodrich by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29)(Smith, Melissa)
June 26, 2015 Filing 674 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 673 Opposed MOTION to Strike Testimony of ContentGuard Technical Expert David Martin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Melissa)
June 26, 2015 Filing 673 Opposed MOTION to Strike Testimony of ContentGuard Technical Expert David Martin by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5)(Smith, Melissa)
June 26, 2015 Filing 672 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC , Supplemental Joint Notice Regarding Trial Proposal (Partridge, Scott)
June 26, 2015 Filing 671 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE AND PRECLUDE AMAZON.COM, INC.'S EXPERT KEVIN M. MURPHY by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 26, 2015 Filing 670 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Expert Opinions of Dr. David Teece for Failing to Calculate Damages Using a Smallest Salable Unit by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Lisa Kelly, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Partridge, Scott)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER re 539 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Invalid Pursuant to 35 USC 101 (Renewed Motion) filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/26/2015. (nkl, )
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 668 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC Joinder in Defendant Google, Inc.s Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Michael T. Goodrich and David Martin that Contradict the Courts Claim Construction Opinion and Order, filed in related Civil Action No. 2:14-cv-61-RJG at Docket No. 232 (Jones, Michael)
June 26, 2015 Filing 667 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S ORDER PRECLUDING APPLE INC.'S RELIANCE ON THE INTERTRUST VDE SYSTEM AND TO PRECLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY CONCERNING CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVES by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 26, 2015 Filing 666 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Danaher Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Smith, Melissa)
June 26, 2015 Filing 665 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC of Joinder in Google, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Michael T. Goodrich That Contradict the Court's Claim Construction in Case No. 2:14-cv-61 (Unikel, Robert)
June 26, 2015 Filing 663 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Prince Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Smith, Melissa)
June 26, 2015 Filing 662 SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Teece Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Smith, Melissa)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER granting 659 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/25/2015. (nkl, )
June 25, 2015 Filing 660 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/23/15 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2015. (sholmes, )
June 25, 2015 Filing 659 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER granting 655 Motion to Dismiss certain claims pertaining to U.S.Patent No. 7,225,160 (hereinafter the 160 Patent). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/25/2015. (nkl, )
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 657 ORDER granting 654 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims, Defenses, andCounterclaims filed by plaintiff ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. (ContentGuard) and defendant Amazon.com, Inc. (Amazon). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/25/2015. (nkl, )
June 25, 2015 Filing 656 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. NOTICE REGARDING PATENT TRIAL AND APPEALS BOARD'S REJECTION OF GOOGLE INC.'S SECTION 101 CHALLENGES TO U.S. PATENT NO. 7,774,280 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 24, 2015 Filing 655 Joint MOTION to Dismiss CERTAIN CLAIMS, DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 24, 2015 Filing 654 Joint MOTION to Dismiss CERTAIN CLAIMS, DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 24, 2015 Filing 653 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. re 631 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings (Baxter, Samuel)
June 23, 2015 Filing 664 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 6/23/2015 re 559 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 559 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/23/2015. (ch, )
June 19, 2015 Filing 651 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Pretrial Disclosures (Doan, Jennifer)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER granting 643 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/18/2015. (nkl, )
June 19, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 559 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions : Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2015 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
June 19, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 559 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions : Motion Hearing RESET for 6/23/2015 11:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***PLEASE NOTE THAT ONLY THE TIME FOR THE HEARING HAS CHANGED.****(jml)
June 18, 2015 Filing 649 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation Notice of Compliance Regarding Pretrial Disclosures (Garnett, Terrence)
June 18, 2015 Filing 648 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Motorola Mobility LLC Regarding Pretrial Disclosures (Unikel, Robert)
June 18, 2015 Filing 647 NOTICE by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Notice of Compliance Regarding Pretrial Disclosures (Partridge, Scott)
June 18, 2015 Filing 646 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Pretrial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
June 18, 2015 Filing 645 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. regarding Compliance with Pretrial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
June 17, 2015 Filing 644 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC re 539 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Invalid Pursuant to 35 USC 101 (Renewed Motion) (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 17, 2015 Filing 643 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 616 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,, by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 15, 2015 Filing 642 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Sixth Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER granting 640 Motion to Dismiss certain claims pertaining to U.S. Patent No. 8,585,556. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/12/2015. (nkl, )
June 11, 2015 Filing 640 Joint MOTION to Dismiss CERTAIN CLAIMS BY PLAINTIFF CONTENTGUARD HOLDINGS, INC. AND COUNTERCLAIMS BY APPLE INC. by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 9, 2015 Filing 639 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER denying the petition for writ of mandamus. Circuit Judges: Dyk, Taranton, and Chen.
June 9, 2015 Filing 638 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. NOTICE REGARDING DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S PETITION FOR MANDAMUS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 9, 2015 Filing 637 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Fifth Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
June 8, 2015 Filing 636 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 559 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
June 4, 2015 Filing 635 NOTICE by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. , Notice of Compliance Regarding Disclosures for Rebuttal Expert Witnesses (Partridge, Scott)
June 3, 2015 Filing 634 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC re 539 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Invalid Pursuant to 35 USC 101 (Renewed Motion) (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Unikel, Robert)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER granting 622 Motion to Dismiss Certain Claims by Plaintiff ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. and Counterclaims by Defendants HTC Corporation and HTC America Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/01/2015. (nkl, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 632 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Motorola Mobility LLC regarding Compliance with Rebuttal Expert Reports (Unikel, Robert)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER - Hearing reset for 7/1/2015 10:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/01/2015. (nkl, )
June 1, 2015 Filing 630 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Donald A Miller on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5223716. (Miller, Donald)
June 1, 2015 Filing 629 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. regarding Compliance with Rebuttal Expert Reports (Jones, Michael)
June 1, 2015 Filing 628 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Disclosure for Rebuttal Expert Witnesses (Doan, Jennifer)
June 1, 2015 Filing 627 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Disclosures for Rebuttal Expert Witnesses (Smith, Melissa)
May 29, 2015 Filing 626 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 539 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Invalid Pursuant to 35 USC 101 (Renewed Motion) filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
May 29, 2015 Filing 625 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 559 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 29, 2015 Filing 624 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey P Kushan on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5220851. (Kushan, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2015 Filing 623 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey P Kushan on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5220661. (Kushan, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2015 Filing 622 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims by Plaintiff ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. and Defendants HTC Corporation and HTC America Inc. by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
May 28, 2015 Filing 621 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 620 Notice (Other).. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Melissa R. Smith, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Smith, Melissa)
May 28, 2015 Filing 620 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. JOINT PROPOSAL FOR SEPARATE TRIALS (Baxter, Samuel)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER on Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 519 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, 522 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., 520 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Apple, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., HTC Corporation, Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., 525 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., 516 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/28/2015. (nkl, )
May 27, 2015 Filing 618 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Paul J Reilly on behalf of Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5216555. (Reilly, Paul)
May 26, 2015 Filing 617 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 562 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Reply Letter Brief re MSJ Limiting Damages Period)(Jones, Michael)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER granting 615 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 578 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Mediation Completion due by 7/1/2015.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/26/2015. (nkl, )
May 22, 2015 Filing 615 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 578 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 19, 2015 Filing 614 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 613 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Authorization to Seal)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 19, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 611, Letter Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
May 18, 2015 Filing 613 Letter Brief filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 18, 2015 Filing 612 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 559 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Errata 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 18, 2015 Filing 611 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Letter Brief filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 5/19/2015 (nkl, ).
May 18, 2015 Filing 610 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Motorola Mobility LLC)(Folsom, David)
May 18, 2015 Filing 609 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC)(Folsom, David)
May 18, 2015 Filing 608 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.)(Folsom, David)
May 18, 2015 Filing 607 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
May 18, 2015 Filing 606 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 480 MOTION for Reconsideration re 459 Memorandum & Opinion Based on Intervening Supreme Court Authority filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
May 18, 2015 Filing 605 REPLY to Response to Motion re 539 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Invalid Pursuant to 35 USC 101 (Renewed Motion) filed by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17)(Unikel, Robert)
May 14, 2015 Filing 604 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Offer of Proof Regarding Intertrust VDE System Prior Art (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
May 12, 2015 Filing 603 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Samsung Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Declaration of Youngjin Kwon re 515 , 557 . (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Youngjin Kwon)(Jones, Michael)
May 12, 2015 Filing 602 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Apple, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
May 12, 2015 Filing 601 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 528 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. Filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Partridge, Scott)
May 12, 2015 Filing 600 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 529 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. Filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Partridge, Scott)
May 12, 2015 Filing 599 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 527 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. Filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Partridge, Scott)
May 12, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE. Document # 592, Additional Attachments to Main Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
May 11, 2015 Filing 598 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 525 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. Filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 11, 2015 Filing 597 RESPONSE in Opposition re 539 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Invalid Pursuant to 35 USC 101 (Renewed Motion) filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 11, 2015 Filing 596 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 522 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Filed by Amazon.com Inc., HTC America, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Apple, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., HTC Corporation, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Huawei Device USA, Inc. filed by Amazon.com Inc., HTC America, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Apple, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., HTC Corporation, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 11, 2015 Filing 595 SEALED Notice of Compliance regarding Reply Letter Brief filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 11, 2015 Filing 594 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 531 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation Filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Garnett, Terrence)
May 11, 2015 Filing 593 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 519 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Unikel, Robert)
May 11, 2015 Filing 592 FILED IN ERROR - ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE Additional Attachments to Main Document: 586 SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 585 SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 587 SEALED Response/Reply/Sur-Reply to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief,.. (Partridge, Scott) Modified on 5/12/2015 (nkl, ).
May 11, 2015 Filing 591 REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 530 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., HTC Corporation Filed by HTC America, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc. filed by HTC America, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Partridge, Scott)
May 11, 2015 Filing 590 SEALED REPLY by Apple, Inc. to 518 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
May 11, 2015 Filing 589 SEALED REPLY by Apple, Inc. to 517 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
May 11, 2015 Filing 588 SEALED REPLY by Apple, Inc. to 516 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
May 11, 2015 Filing 587 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 528 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. Filed by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Partridge, Scott) Modified on 5/11/2015 (nkl, ).
May 11, 2015 Filing 586 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 529 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. Filed by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Partridge, Scott) Modified on 5/11/2015 (nkl, ).
May 11, 2015 Filing 585 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 527 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. Filed by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Partridge, Scott) Modified on 5/11/2015 (nkl, ).
May 11, 2015 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief submitted document 585 586 587 does not contain a Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal per Local Rule CV-5(a)(7)(A). Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
May 8, 2015 Filing 584 RESPONSE to 498 Sealed Document ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS OF SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
May 8, 2015 Filing 583 RESPONSE to 494 Sealed Document ANSWER TO APPLE INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
May 8, 2015 Filing 582 ANSWER to 537 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc..(Baxter, Samuel)
May 7, 2015 Filing 581 REPLY to Response to Motion re 480 MOTION for Reconsideration re 459 Memorandum & Opinion Based on Intervening Supreme Court Authority filed by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., DirecTV, LLC, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Doan, Jennifer)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER granting 576 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter J Wied and Vincent K Yip terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/07/2015. (nkl, )
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER granting 561 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/07/2015. (nkl, )
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER granting 564 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/07/2015. (nkl, )
May 6, 2015 Filing 577 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/28/15 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2015. (sholmes, )
May 6, 2015 Filing 576 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed for Vincent Yip and Peter Wied by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
May 5, 2015 Filing 575 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 522 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 574 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 516 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc. Filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 573 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 529 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. Filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 572 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 528 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. Filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 571 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 530 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., HTC Corporation Filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 570 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 531 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation Filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 569 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 519 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility LLC Filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 568 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 527 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA, Inc. Filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 567 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 518 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc. Filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 566 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 523 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Amazon.com Inc. Filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 565 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 517 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc. Filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 564 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 477 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,, by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 5, 2015 Filing 563 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 525 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. Filed by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Unikel, Robert)
May 4, 2015 Filing 562 SEALED Letter Brief re Motion for Summary Judgment to Limit Damages Period filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Ex 1 - SJ Letter Brief regarding pre-suit pre-notice damages)(Jones, Michael)
May 4, 2015 Filing 561 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to File Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File A Motion for Summary Judgment After the April 21, 2015 Deadline by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
May 4, 2015 Filing 560 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Samsung Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Letter Brief Requesting Permission to File a Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement with Respect to Allegations Relating to OMA DRM 524 . (Jones, Michael)
April 30, 2015 Filing 559 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 30, 2015 Filing 557 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - NOTICE BY CONTENTGUARD AND SAMSUNG OF AGREEMENT AND SUBSTANTIAL RESOLUTION OF CONTENTGUARD'S MOTION TO COMPEL [DKT. 515] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 29, 2015 Filing 556 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER denying 470 Sealed Motion; denying 499 Motion Renewal of its Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions ; granting 502 Sealed Motion; taking under advisement 503 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/28/2015. (nkl, )
April 28, 2015 Filing 558 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2015 re 502 SEALED MOTION Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion to Compel 499 Opposed MOTION Renewal of its Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions filed by Apple, Inc., 503 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD, SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. TO PROVIDE RELEVANT DISCOVERY filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., 470 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Invalidity Contentions to Include the Intertrust VDE System as Section 102(g) Prior Art filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER denying 364 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/27/2015. (nkl, )
April 27, 2015 Filing 553 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE OF DOCKETING. A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed. USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT Case No. 15-136. (dlc, )
April 27, 2015 Filing 552 RESPONSE in Opposition re 480 MOTION for Reconsideration re 459 Memorandum & Opinion Based on Intervening Supreme Court Authority filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
April 27, 2015 Filing 551 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 550 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Theodore Chandler, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Smith, Melissa)
April 27, 2015 Filing 550 REPLY to Response to Motion re 499 Opposed MOTION Renewal of its Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
April 27, 2015 Filing 549 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 470 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Invalidity Contentions to Include the Intertrust VDE System as Section 102(g) Prior Art filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Katherine Hacker, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Unikel, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(Smith, Melissa)
April 27, 2015 Filing 548 Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 4-R1, # 3 Exhibit 4-R2, # 4 Exhibit 17-R)(Unikel, Robert)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER granting 533 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/27/2015. (nkl, )
April 27, 2015 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SEALED MOTION submitted document 541 does not contain a Certificate of Conference and there is no proposed order attched to the document. Correction should be made by one business day (nkl, )
April 26, 2015 Filing 546 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. to 535 Notice (Other), filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 26, 2015 Filing 545 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 499 Opposed MOTION Renewal of its Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 26, 2015 Filing 544 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 515 SEALED PATENT MOTION CORRECTED MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. TO PROVIDE RELEVANT DISCOVERY [DKT. 503] filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of N.Sirota, # 2 Ex. A - 040315 email Briody to Sirota, # 3 Ex. B - 070314 ContentGuard's First 30(b)(6) Notice to Samsung, # 4 Ex. C - 012315 ltr from Lelutiu to Sirota, # 5 Ex. D - 121714 ltr from Maier to Engelmann, # 6 Ex. E - 040615 email from Briody to Sirota, # 7 Ex. F - Declaration of Youngjin Kwon, # 8 Ex. G - 042515 webpage of Farrell Law Firm, # 9 Ex. H - SightSound Techs v. Apple, # 10 Ex. I - Tessera v. Micron Tech, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 26, 2015 Filing 543 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 541 SEALED MOTION (Supplemental Notice Regarding Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion to Compel) filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 26, 2015 Filing 542 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 470 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Invalidity Contentions to Include the Intertrust VDE System as Section 102(g) Prior Art filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Radu Lelutiu, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 24, 2015 Filing 541 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT SEALED MOTION (Supplemental Notice Regarding Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion to Compel) by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 4-R1, # 2 Exhibit 4-R2, # 3 Exhibit 17-R, # 4 Exhibit A)(Unikel, Robert) Modified on 4/27/2015 (nkl, ).
April 24, 2015 Filing 540 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 470 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Invalidity Contentions to Include the Intertrust VDE System as Section 102(g) Prior Art (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Melissa)
April 24, 2015 Filing 539 Joint MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Invalid Pursuant to 35 USC 101 (Renewed Motion) by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 538 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/23/2015. (nkl, )
April 23, 2015 Filing 537 ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint,, (Second), COUNTERCLAIM against ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. by Amazon.com Inc..(Doan, Jennifer)
April 23, 2015 Filing 536 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 535 Notice (Other),. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Nathaniel C. Love, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T)(Smith, Melissa)
April 23, 2015 Filing 535 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 499 Opposed MOTION Renewal of its Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions Supplemental Submission in Support of its Renewed Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions (Smith, Melissa)
April 23, 2015 Filing 534 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. PLAINTIFF CONTENTGUARD HOLDINGS, INC.'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S ORDER REGARDING IN CAMERA INSPECTION [DKT.510] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 23, 2015 Filing 533 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Briefs Regarding Defendants' Joint Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring all Asserted Patent Claims Invalid Pursuant to 35 USC 101 by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
April 22, 2015 Filing 532 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 529 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 530 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 528 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 527 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief.. (Partridge, Scott)
April 22, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 526, SEALED Letter Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
April 21, 2015 Filing 531 Letter Brief filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Yip, Vincent)
April 21, 2015 Filing 530 SEALED Letter Brief filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Brief)(Partridge, Scott)
April 21, 2015 Filing 529 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter brief)(Partridge, Scott)
April 21, 2015 Filing 528 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter brief)(Partridge, Scott)
April 21, 2015 Filing 527 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Brief)(Partridge, Scott)
April 21, 2015 Filing 526 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY SEALED Letter Brief filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Brief)(Partridge, Scott) Modified on 4/22/2015 (nkl, ).
April 21, 2015 Filing 525 Letter Brief filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 21, 2015 Filing 524 SEALED Letter Brief re Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Samsung's Ltr Brief re MSJ of Noninfringement)(Jones, Michael)
April 21, 2015 Filing 523 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 21, 2015 Filing 522 Letter Brief filed by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 21, 2015 Filing 521 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***Letter Brief filed by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 4/21/2015 (sm, ).
April 21, 2015 Filing 520 Letter Brief filed by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Unikel, Robert)
April 21, 2015 Filing 519 Letter Brief filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Unikel, Robert)
April 21, 2015 Filing 518 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
April 21, 2015 Filing 517 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
April 21, 2015 Filing 516 Letter Brief filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
April 21, 2015 Filing 515 SEALED PATENT MOTION CORRECTED MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. TO PROVIDE RELEVANT DISCOVERY [DKT. 503] by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Declaration of Dana E.Vallera, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 503 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD, SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. TO PROVIDE RELEVANT DISCOVERY, 470 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Invalidity Contentions to Include the Intertrust VDE System as Section 102(g) Prior Art, 499 Opposed MOTION Renewal of its Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions , 502 SEALED MOTION Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/21/2015. (nkl, )
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER granting 508 Motion for Leave to Take Third-Party Deposition After Close of Fact Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/20/2015. (nkl, )
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER granting 505 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/20/2015. (nkl, )
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER granting 504 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/20/2015. (nkl, )
April 21, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY. Document # 521, Notice of Letter Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER re 478 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/20/2015. (nkl, )
April 20, 2015 Filing 509 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. Tenth Notice of Compliance with Third-Party Production Provisions (Doan, Jennifer)
April 20, 2015 Filing 508 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Take Third Party Deposition After Close of Fact Discovery by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 20, 2015 Filing 507 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. re 478 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (NOTICE CONCERNING PALO ALTO RESEARCH CENTER'S POSITION WITH RESPECT TO THE PRIVILEGE DISPUTE RAISED IN EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 20, 2015 Filing 506 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/15/15 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2015. (sholmes, )
April 17, 2015 Filing 505 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 17, 2015 Filing 504 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 17, 2015 Filing 503 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION DEFENDANTS SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD, SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC AND SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. TO PROVIDE RELEVANT DISCOVERY by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dana E. Vallera, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2015: # 21 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
April 17, 2015 Filing 502 SEALED MOTION Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion to Compel by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
April 17, 2015 Filing 500 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 470 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Invalidity Contentions to Include the Intertrust VDE System as Section 102(g) Prior Art by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 17, 2015 Filing 499 Opposed MOTION Renewal of its Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 15, 2015 Filing 501 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2015 re 478 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
April 15, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 478 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER : Motion Hearing RESET for 4/15/2015 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. PLEASE NOTE THAT ONLY THE TIME FOR THE HEARING HAS CHANGED.(jml)
April 14, 2015 Filing 498 Sealed Document. Answer and Counterclaims of Defendants and Counterclaimants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Sirota, Neil)
April 14, 2015 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Sealed Document submitted document 495 does not contain a Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal per Local Rule CV-5(a)(7)(A). Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
April 13, 2015 Filing 497 Sealed Document. Defendants HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (Wied, Peter)
April 13, 2015 Filing 496 SEALED NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS to Main Document: 488 Sealed Response to Motion,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Glen Summers, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 13, 2015 Filing 495 DEFICEINT DOCUMENT Sealed Document. ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANTS AND COUNTERCLAIMANTSSAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD., SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.,AND SAMSUNG TELECOMMUNICATIONS AMERICA, LLC TOPLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT (Sirota, Neil) Modified on 4/14/2015 (nkl, ).
April 13, 2015 Filing 494 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Sealed Answer and Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint (Smith, Melissa)
April 13, 2015 Filing 493 Sealed Document. Motorola Mobility, LLC's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. (Unikel, Robert)
April 13, 2015 Filing 492 Sealed Document. Huawei Device USA, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (Partridge, Scott)
April 13, 2015 Filing 491 Sealed Document. Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Partridge, Scott)
April 13, 2015 Filing 490 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 480 MOTION for Reconsideration re 459 Memorandum & Opinion Based on Intervening Supreme Court Authority Notice of Joinder to Motion for Reconsideration (Smith, Melissa)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER withdrawing 409 Motion for Protective Order in light of the Parties' agreement 487 . Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/13/2015. (jrg3, ) Modified on 4/13/2015 (mrm, ).
April 13, 2015 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 409 Apple Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Senior Executive Eduardo Cue. The hearing previously set on April 15, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. is CANCELLED. (jml)
April 12, 2015 Filing 488 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 478 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Glen Summers, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 10, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 11, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 12, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 13, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 14, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 15, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 16, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 17, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 18, # 21 Exhibit Ex. 19, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 20, # 23 Exhibit Ex. 21, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 22, # 25 Exhibit Ex. 23, # 26 Exhibit Ex. 24, # 27 Exhibit Ex. 25, # 28 Exhibit Ex. 26, # 29 Exhibit Ex. 27, # 30 Exhibit Ex. 28, # 31 Exhibit Ex. 29, # 32 Exhibit Ex. 30)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 11, 2015 Filing 487 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Joint Notice of Resolution (Smith, Melissa)
April 10, 2015 Filing 486 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC's Notice Of Compliance With Third-Party Productions (Unikel, Robert)
April 9, 2015 Filing 485 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. Ninth Notice of Compliance with Third-Party Production Provisions (Doan, Jennifer)
April 9, 2015 Filing 484 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John M Hughes on behalf of Amazon.com Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5143314. (Hughes, John)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER granting 479 Opposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER DKT. #478 filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.., ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 478 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER :( Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2015 01:00 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/08/2015. (nkl, )
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER denying 390 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 298 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/08/2015. (nkl, )
April 8, 2015 Filing 481 RESPONSE in Opposition re 479 Opposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER DKT. #478 filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 7, 2015 Filing 480 MOTION for Reconsideration re 459 Memorandum & Opinion Based on Intervening Supreme Court Authority by Amazon.com Inc., DirecTV, LLC, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 7, 2015 Filing 479 Opposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING ON EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER DKT. #478 by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 7, 2015 Filing 478 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Radu Lelutiu, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit N-1, # 17 Exhibit N-2, # 18 Exhibit N-3, # 19 Exhibit N-4, # 20 Exhibit N-5, # 21 Exhibit N-6, # 22 Exhibit N-7, # 23 Exhibit N-8, # 24 Exhibit N-9, # 25 Exhibit N-10, # 26 Exhibit N-11, # 27 Exhibit N-12, # 28 Exhibit N-13, # 29 Exhibit N-14, # 30 Exhibit N-15, # 31 Exhibit N-16, # 32 Exhibit N-17, # 33 Exhibit N-18, # 34 Exhibit N-19, # 35 Exhibit N-20, # 36 Exhibit N-21, # 37 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER granting 475 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 462 Order on Sealed Patent Motion filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.., SCHEDULING ORDER:( Mediation Completion due by 5/22/2015.). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 04/07/2015. (nkl, )
April 2, 2015 Filing 476 RESPONSE to 426 Notice (Other),, SURREPLY IN FURTHER RESPONSE TO APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF JOINING MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
April 2, 2015 Filing 475 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 462 Order on Sealed Patent Motion by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER granting 264 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/2/2015. (ch, )
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER granting 234 Motion to withdraw 224 Emergency Motion for Ruling, denying as Moot 235 Motion for Ruling. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/1/2015. (ch, )
April 1, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 409 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Apple Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Senior Executive Eduardo Cue : Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2015 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 472 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 110 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on March 31, 2015. (jml)
March 30, 2015 Filing 471 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 470 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Invalidity Contentions to Include the Intertrust VDE System as Section 102(g) Prior Art.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3a, # 2 Exhibit 3b, # 3 Exhibit 3c, # 4 Exhibit 3d, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24a, # 26 Exhibit 24b, # 27 Exhibit 25a, # 28 Exhibit 25b, # 29 Exhibit 26, # 30 Exhibit 27)(Smith, Melissa)
March 30, 2015 Filing 470 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Amend Invalidity Contentions to Include the Intertrust VDE System as Section 102(g) Prior Art by Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Smith, Melissa)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 469 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/29/2015. (nkl, )
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 468 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/29/2015. (nkl, )
March 23, 2015 Filing 467 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
March 23, 2015 Filing 466 RESPONSE to 446 Response to Non-Motion Reply in Support of its Notice of Joining Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring all Asserted Patent Claims Against it Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 101 and Additional Submission Regarding Claims Not Asserted Against Motorola (Dkt. 426) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit J)(Smith, Melissa)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER to Pay Technical Advisor. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/20/2015. (nkl, )
March 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER finding as moot 103 Motion to Dismiss in light of the 104 Motion to Dismiss filed fifteen minutes later by the same parties. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/21/2015. (jrg3)
March 20, 2015 Filing 463 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 390 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against It Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER granting 451 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/20/2015. (nkl, )
March 20, 2015 Filing 461 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
March 20, 2015 Filing 460 NOTICE by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Defendants Huawei Device USA, Inc. and Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Notice of Compliance with Third Party Production Provisions (Partridge, Scott)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 459 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/20/2015. (nkl, )
March 19, 2015 Filing 458 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 451 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER filed by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 19, 2015 Filing 457 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 456 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/19/2015. (nkl, )
March 18, 2015 Filing 455 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Wonjoo Suh on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5105643. (Suh, Wonjoo)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER granting 447 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shahar Harel terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/17/2015. (nkl, )
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting 452 Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/17/2015. (nkl, )
March 15, 2015 Filing 452 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: DKT. #451 by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 15, 2015 Filing 451 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Declaration of Holly Engelmann, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 450 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
March 13, 2015 Filing 449 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. re 366 Claim Construction Chart or Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Doan, Jennifer)
March 13, 2015 Filing 448 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
March 13, 2015 Filing 447 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 13, 2015 Filing 446 RESPONSE to 426 Notice (Other),, by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 11, 2015 Filing 445 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. (Eighth Notice of Compliance with Third-Party Production Provisions) (Doan, Jennifer)
March 9, 2015 Filing 444 RESPONSE to 433 Notice (Other) SURREPLY IN FURTHER RESPONSE TO APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
March 9, 2015 Filing 443 REPLY to Response to Motion re 390 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against It Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13)(Unikel, Robert)
March 9, 2015 Filing 442 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. Seventh Notice of Compliance with Third-Party Production Provisions (Doan, Jennifer)
March 9, 2015 Filing 441 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. regarding Compliance with Third Party Confidentiality Provisions (Jones, Michael)
March 6, 2015 Filing 440 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 409 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Apple Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Senior Executive Eduardo Cue filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 5, 2015 Filing 439 RESPONSE to 436 Response to Non-Motion Reply to Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
March 5, 2015 Filing 438 STIPULATION re 152 Protective Order (Joint) by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 5, 2015 Filing 437 RESPONSE to 435 Notice (Other) filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 4, 2015 Filing 436 RESPONSE to 433 Notice (Other) filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
March 4, 2015 Filing 435 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. re 110 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 3, 2015 Filing 434 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Jacobson Eber on behalf of Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. (Eber, Michelle)
March 3, 2015 Filing 433 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 156 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
March 2, 2015 Filing 432 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 385 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record in Support of Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Transfer filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
February 27, 2015 Filing 431 REPLY to Response to Motion re 409 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Apple Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Senior Executive Eduardo Cue filed by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 27, 2015 Filing 430 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. of Compliance with Third Party Confidentiality Provisions (Jones, Michael)
February 27, 2015 Filing 429 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
February 25, 2015 Filing 428 RESPONSE to Motion re 390 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against It Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 24, 2015 Filing 427 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. re 390 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against It Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 (Doan, Jennifer)
February 24, 2015 Filing 426 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 390 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against It Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 Notice of Joinder in Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against it Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. Section 101 and Additional Submission Regarding Claims Not Asserted (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Smith, Melissa)
February 24, 2015 Filing 425 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
February 23, 2015 Filing 424 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 364 MOTION to Stay filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
February 21, 2015 Filing 423 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/6/15 (Claim Construction Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2015. (sholmes, )
February 20, 2015 Filing 422 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 385 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record in Support of Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Transfer filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Smith, Melissa)
February 20, 2015 Filing 421 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER granting 418 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 390 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against It Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101. Responses due by 2/25/2015. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/20/2015. (nkl, )
February 19, 2015 Filing 419 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. Sixth Notice of Compliance with Third-Party Production Provisions (Doan, Jennifer)
February 19, 2015 Filing 418 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 390 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against It Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 17, 2015 Filing 417 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 409 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Apple Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Senior Executive Eduardo Cue filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 17, 2015 Filing 416 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 385 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record in Support of Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Transfer filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 17, 2015 Filing 414 RESPONSE to 379 Response in Support of Motion, filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
February 17, 2015 Filing 413 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. NOTICE OF THIRD-PARTY NOKIA CORP.'S OBJECTIONS TO ESI PRODUCTION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 16, 2015 Filing 411 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Alan Blumenkopf on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Blumenkopf, Bryan)
February 13, 2015 Filing 410 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 409 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Apple Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Senior Executive Eduardo Cue.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eduardo Cue)(Smith, Melissa)
February 13, 2015 Filing 409 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order Apple Inc.'s Motion for a Protective Order to Prevent the Deposition of Senior Executive Eduardo Cue by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Smith, Melissa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2015: # 6 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
February 13, 2015 Filing 408 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. re 298 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Third Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 12, 2015 Filing 407 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. re 399 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFF CONTENTGUARD HOLDINGS, INC.'S NOTICE IN RESPONSE TO APPLE'S NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF EXHIBIT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 12, 2015 Filing 406 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
February 12, 2015 Filing 405 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 364 MOTION to Stay filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Nathaniel C. Love, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Smith, Melissa)
February 11, 2015 Filing 404 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation re 390 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against It Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 Joinder (Wied, Peter)
February 11, 2015 Filing 403 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC re 390 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against It Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 Joinder (Gardner, Allen)
February 10, 2015 Filing 402 NOTICE by Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. re 390 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against It Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 Huawei's Notice of Joining Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against It Invalid Pursuant to 35 USC §101 (Partridge, Scott)
February 9, 2015 Filing 401 RESPONSE in Opposition re 364 MOTION to Stay filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 9, 2015 Filing 400 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
February 9, 2015 Filing 399 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Submission of Exhibit by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Thomas Broughan, III, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Smith, Melissa)
February 9, 2015 Filing 398 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Filing of Presentation Slides (02/06/2015 Hearing) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A, # 2 Exhibit 1B, # 3 Exhibit 1C)(Smith, Melissa)
February 9, 2015 Filing 397 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. re 304 Claim Construction Brief,, NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit W)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 8, 2015 Filing 396 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/5/15 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. <P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov<P> Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2015. (sholmes, )
February 6, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 2/6/2015 01:00 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***Please note that the only change is the time for the hearing.****(jml)
February 5, 2015 Filing 395 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eliot Damon Williams on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Williams, Eliot)
February 5, 2015 Filing 394 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian D Johnston on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Johnston, Brian)
February 5, 2015 Filing 393 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.JOINT LIST OF DISPUTES BETWEEN CONTENTGUARD AND APPLE TO BE RESOLVED BY THE COURT AT THE HEARING ON FEBRUARY 5, 2015 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 4, 2015 Filing 392 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Court Order [Dkt. 378] (Smith, Melissa)
February 4, 2015 Filing 391 Sealed Document. Response to ContentGuard's January 30, 2015 Letter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W)(Smith, Melissa)
February 3, 2015 Filing 390 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Declaring All Asserted Patent Claims Against It Invalid Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 101 by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
February 3, 2015 Filing 389 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Christopher Briody on behalf of ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. (Briody, John)
February 3, 2015 Filing 388 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karla Yahaira Valenzuela on behalf of ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. (Valenzuela, Karla)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER granting 273 Motion to Sever; granting 319 Motion to Approve Stipulation and for Entry of Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 02/02/2015. (nkl, )
February 3, 2015 Case No. 2:15-CV-128 for the severed parties DirectTV (nkl, )
February 2, 2015 Filing 386 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC re 319 Joint MOTION to Approve Stipulation and for Entry of Docket Control Order re 273 MOTION to Sever Non-Opposition (Gardner, Allen)
January 30, 2015 Filing 385 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record in Support of Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Transfer by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Bryan Anderson, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19)(Smith, Melissa)
January 30, 2015 Filing 384 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. re 298 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Second Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Amazon.com's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER denied as moot 381 Motion to Preclude ContentGuard from Presenting Live Testimony from Dr. Goodrich at the February 6 Claim Construction Hearing. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/30/2015. (nkl, )
January 29, 2015 Filing 382 Letter from Sam Baxter to Judge Gilstrap dated January 29, 2015 (jml)
January 29, 2015 Filing 381 Emergency MOTION to Preclude ContentGuard from Presenting Live Testimony from Dr. Goodrich at the February 6 Claim Construction Hearing by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., DirecTV, LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER granting 377 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 279 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. Mediation Completion due by 4/3/2015. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/29/2015. (nkl, )
January 29, 2015 Filing 379 RESPONSE in Support re 235 MOTION For a Ruling, or in the Alternative, Stay Defendant Motorola Mobility LLC's Supplemental Memorandum In Support Of Its Motion For A Ruling, Or In The Alternative, Stay (Dkt. No. 235) filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
January 29, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference RESET for 2/5/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER - the Court hereby reschedules the hearing on Defendant Amazons Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 289). Status Conference set for 2/4/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/28/2015. (nkl, )
January 28, 2015 Filing 377 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 279 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting 335 Motion for Leave to File Separate Responsive Claim Construction Brief. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/28/2015. (nkl, )
January 27, 2015 Filing 375 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 350 SEALED MOTION Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion To Preclude Dr. David J. Teece From Accessing Confidential Information Under The Protective Order And Acting As A Consultant In This Matter filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
January 27, 2015 Filing 374 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 368 Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Theodore Chandler, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa)
January 27, 2015 Filing 373 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
January 27, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 369, SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
January 26, 2015 Filing 372 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 298 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 26, 2015 Filing 371 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. re 298 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 26, 2015 Filing 370 RESPONSE in Support re 350 SEALED MOTION Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion To Preclude Dr. David J. Teece From Accessing Confidential Information Under The Protective Order And Acting As A Consultant In This Matter filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA, # 2 Exhibit BB, # 3 Exhibit CC)(Unikel, Robert)
January 26, 2015 Filing 369 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 368 Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Theodore Chandler, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 1/27/2015 (nkl, ).
January 26, 2015 Filing 368 RESPONSE to Motion re 367 MOTION for Hearing filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Bryan Anderson)(Smith, Melissa)
January 23, 2015 Filing 367 MOTION for Hearing by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 23, 2015 Filing 366 Joint Claim Construction Chart by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 23, 2015 Filing 365 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. JOINT NOTICE REGARDING MARKMAN HEARING (Baxter, Samuel)
January 22, 2015 Filing 364 MOTION to Stay by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa)
January 22, 2015 Filing 363 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Douglas McCabe on behalf of Amazon.com Inc. (McCabe, Brent)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2015. (nkl, )
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 361 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL FROM NON-PARTY PARAMOUNT PICTURES CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2015. (nkl, )
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER granting 322 Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines on Amazon.com, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2015. (nkl, )
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER granting 316 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2015. (nkl, )
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER granting 287 Motion to Extend Dead-line To Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2015. (nkl, )
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting 227 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2015. (nkl, )
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING THE DISCLOSURE AND USE OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL FROM NON-PARTY PARAMOUNT PICTURES CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/22/2015. (nkl, )
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER re 349 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation (f/k/a Research In Motion Corporation) and Blackberry Limited (f//k/a Research in Motion Limited) terminated., Attorney Ian Chen; James Joseph Elacqua; Mairead Schwab; Sheria Dranise Smith; John Steven Torkelson; Edgar Leon Carter and William Jerry Casey terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/21/2015. (nkl, )
January 20, 2015 Filing 354 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 353 SUR-Reply to Claim Construction Brief,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 20, 2015 Filing 353 SUR-REPLY to 304 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., DirecTV, LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 16, 2015 Filing 352 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 350 SEALED MOTION Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion To Preclude Dr. David J. Teece From Accessing Confidential Information Under The Protective Order And Acting As A Consultant In This Matter filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David J. Teece, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 13, 2015 Filing 351 REPLY to Response to Motion re 298 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
January 12, 2015 Filing 350 SEALED MOTION Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion To Preclude Dr. David J. Teece From Accessing Confidential Information Under The Protective Order And Acting As A Consultant In This Matter by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Filed Under Seal, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Sealed Additional Attachments, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Malecek, Michael)
January 12, 2015 Filing 349 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting 343 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/09/2015. (nkl, )
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting 343 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/09/2015. (nkl, )
January 9, 2015 Filing 346 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 345 Reply to Claim Construction Brief,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AB, # 2 Exhibit AC)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 9, 2015 Filing 345 REPLY to 331 Claim Construction Brief,,, filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AA, # 2 Exhibit AD, # 3 Exhibit AE, # 4 Exhibit AF, # 5 Exhibit AG, # 6 Exhibit AH, # 7 Exhibit AI, # 8 Exhibit AJ, # 9 Exhibit AK)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 9, 2015 Filing 344 REPLY to 336 Claim Construction Brief filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
January 8, 2015 Filing 343 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages On Claim Construction Reply, Joint MOTION for Leave to File Claim Construction Surreply by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enlarge Page Limits on Claim Construction Reply, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Claim Construction Surreply)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 7, 2015 Filing 342 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Filing of Petitions for Patent Office Review of Asserted Patents (Smith, Melissa)
January 6, 2015 Filing 341 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel)
January 6, 2015 Filing 340 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
January 6, 2015 Filing 339 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Notice of Compliance with Third Party Confidentiality Provisions by Defendants Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
December 29, 2014 Filing 338 NOTICE of Change of Address by Terrence D Garnett (Garnett, Terrence)
December 23, 2014 Filing 337 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Notice of Compliance with Third Party Confidentiality Provisions by Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
December 22, 2014 Filing 336 AMAZON'S SEPARATE RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
December 22, 2014 Filing 335 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Separate Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 22, 2014 Filing 334 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 329 Response to Non-Motion,.. (Smith, Melissa)
December 22, 2014 Filing 333 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 331 Defendants' Joint Responsive Claim Construction Brief,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 7)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 22, 2014 Filing 332 RESPONSE in Opposition re 298 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 22, 2014 Filing 331 Defendants' Joint Responsive CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation (f/k/a Research In Motion Corporation), Blackberry Limited (f//k/a Research in Motion Limited), Directv LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 10, # 9 Exhibit 11, # 10 Exhibit 12, # 11 Exhibit 13, # 12 Exhibit 14, # 13 Exhibit 15, # 14 Exhibit 16, # 15 Exhibit 17, # 16 Exhibit 18, # 17 Exhibit 19, # 18 Exhibit 20, # 19 Exhibit 21, # 20 Exhibit 22, # 21 Exhibit 23)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 22, 2014 Filing 330 NOTICE by DirecTV, LLC, Directv LLC re 298 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Everingham, Charles)
December 22, 2014 Filing 329 Sealed Response by Apple Inc. to 325 Notice of Apple's Non-Compliance filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Theodore Chandler, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 9)(Smith, Melissa)
December 22, 2014 Filing 328 STIPULATION and Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Material From Non-Party Paramount Pictures Corp. by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., Apple, Inc., and Non-Party Paramount Pictures Corporation by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
December 19, 2014 Filing 327 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel)
December 19, 2014 Filing 326 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. re 320 Notice (Other) (CORRECTED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE) (Baxter, Samuel)
December 18, 2014 Filing 325 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 18, 2014 Filing 324 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
December 18, 2014 Filing 323 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC Compliance with Third Party Confidentiality Provisions (Jones, Michael)
December 17, 2014 Filing 322 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 298 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 16, 2014 Filing 321 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
December 15, 2014 Filing 320 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel)
December 12, 2014 Filing 319 Joint MOTION to Approve Stipulation and for Entry of Docket Control Order re 273 MOTION to Sever by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc., DirecTV, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Stipulation, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Docket Control Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Everingham, Charles)
December 12, 2014 Filing 318 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. Fifth Notice of Compliance with Third-Party Production Provisions by Defendant Amazon (Doan, Jennifer)
December 11, 2014 Filing 317 RESPONSE to 305 Response to Non-Motion DIRECTVs Reply to ContentGuard's Response to Notice of Joinder filed by DirecTV, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ronald Coslick)(Everingham, Charles)
December 9, 2014 Filing 316 Joint MOTION for Hearing re 298 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 9, 2014 Filing 315 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 298 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 9, 2014 Filing 314 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Notice of Compliance with Third Party Confidentiality Provisions by Defendants Samsung Electronic Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting 310 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.s Motion for Severance. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/09/2014. (nkl, )
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER granting 309 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/09/2014. (nkl, )
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER granting 306 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 273 MOTION to Sever . Responses due by 12/5/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/09/2014. (nkl, )
December 5, 2014 Filing 310 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.s Motion for Severance by Directv LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Kevin)
December 5, 2014 Filing 309 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation (f/k/a Research In Motion Corporation), Blackberry Limited (f//k/a Research in Motion Limited), DirecTV, LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 5, 2014 Filing 308 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dana Elizabeth Vallera on behalf of ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. (Vallera, Dana)
December 5, 2014 Filing 307 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
December 1, 2014 Filing 306 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.s Motion for Severance by DirecTV, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Everingham, Charles)
December 1, 2014 Filing 305 RESPONSE to 275 Notice (Other) by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
November 25, 2014 Filing 304 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 25, 2014 Filing 303 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TECHNICAL TUTORIAL DEADLINE (Baxter, Samuel)
November 25, 2014 Filing 302 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation (f/k/a Research In Motion Corporation), Blackberry Limited (f//k/a Research in Motion Limited), DirecTV, LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC Defendants' Notice of Compliance with Joint Technical Tutorial Deadline (Doan, Jennifer)
November 24, 2014 Filing 301 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/19/14 before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2015. (sholmes, )
November 24, 2014 Filing 300 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/18/14 (Afternoon Transcript) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2015. (sholmes, )
November 24, 2014 Filing 299 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/18/14 (Morning Transcript) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/18/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2015. (sholmes, )
November 21, 2014 Filing 298 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER finding as moot 203 Motion to Strike by the parties' agreement 294 . Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2014. (jrg3)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER finding as moot 202 Motion Adopt a Modified Version of General Order No. 13-20 Focusing Claims and Prior Art by agreement of the parties 294 . Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/20/2014. (jrg3)
November 20, 2014 Filing 293 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. re 292 Claim Construction Chart or Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Notice of Corrected Exhibit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Doan, Jennifer)
November 19, 2014 Filing 295 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Status Conference held on 11/19/2014. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (jml)
November 18, 2014 Filing 294 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Status Conference held on 11/18/2014. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 18, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/19/2014 11:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. *Continuation of hearing from 11/18/2014 re remaining unresolved issues.*(jml)
November 17, 2014 Filing 292 JOINT Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 17, 2014 Filing 291 DIRECTV, LLCS ANSWER to 244 Amended Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. by DirecTV, LLC, Directv LLC.(Everingham, Charles)
November 17, 2014 Filing 290 DIRECTV, LLCS ANSWER to 245 Answer to Intervenor Complaint, Counterclaim,, by DirecTV, LLC, Directv LLC.(Everingham, Charles)
November 17, 2014 Filing 289 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 277 Notice (Other),, (APPLE INC.'S NOTICE OF JOINDER TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF CONTENTGUARD HOLDINGS, INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' JOINT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS) (Smith, Melissa)
November 17, 2014 Filing 288 RESPONSE in Opposition re 254 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 17, 2014 Filing 287 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 244 Amended Complaint,, by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
November 17, 2014 Filing 286 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 239 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT APPLE INC. TO PROVIDE RELEVANT DISCOVERY filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shahzeb Akhyar, # 2 Declaration of Trevor J. Smedley)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 14, 2014 Filing 285 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation re 283 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Motorola Mobility LLC, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc., of Joining Motion to Dismiss (Wied, Peter)
November 14, 2014 Filing 284 RESPONSE to Motion re 203 Emergency MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS JOINT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
November 14, 2014 Filing 283 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Motorola Mobility LLC, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Telecommunications America, Inc., BlackBerry Corp., and BlackBerry Limited by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unikel, Robert)
November 14, 2014 Filing 282 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 156 Opposed SEALED MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Sever and Transfer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting 255 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.s Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/14/2014. (nkl, )
November 13, 2014 Filing 280 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joshua P Ackerman on behalf of Amazon.com Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4926629. (Ackerman, Joshua)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting 272 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/13/2014. (nkl, )
November 13, 2014 Filing 278 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Notice of Compliance with Third Party Confidentiality Provisions by Defendants Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Jones, Michael)
November 13, 2014 Filing 277 NOTICE by BlackBerry Corporation (f/k/a Research In Motion Corporation), Blackberry Limited (f//k/a Research in Motion Limited), HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC re 274 Notice (Other) in Response to Plaintiff ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.'s Supplemental Submission in Support of its Motion to STrike Defendants' Joint Invalidity Contentions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Prior Art References Produced by ContentGuard)(Unikel, Robert)
November 13, 2014 Filing 276 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. to 265 Sealed Document filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 13, 2014 Filing 275 NOTICE by DirecTV, LLC, Directv LLC re 110 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California (Everingham, Charles)
November 12, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. re 203 Emergency MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS JOINT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 12, 2014 Filing 273 MOTION to Sever by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 12, 2014 Filing 272 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 253 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting 267 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/12/2014. (nkl, )
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER granting 266 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Guy Rotem Eddon terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/12/2014. (nkl, )
November 11, 2014 Filing 269 NOTICE by Motorola Mobility LLC of Amended Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Mann, James)
November 10, 2014 Filing 268 RESPONSE to 249 Notice (Other) by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
November 10, 2014 Filing 267 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 245 Answer to Intervenor Complaint, Counterclaim,, by DirecTV, LLC, Directv LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Everingham, Charles)
November 10, 2014 Filing 266 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Guy Eddon by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 7, 2014 Filing 265 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Sever and Transfer (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Smith, Melissa)
November 7, 2014 Filing 264 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Sever and Transfer by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 7, 2014 Filing 263 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance With Third-Party Production Provisions (Smith, Melissa)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER - Status Conference set for 11/18/2014 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/05/2014. (nkl, )
November 5, 2014 Filing 261 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. Fourth Notice of Compliance with Third-Party Production Provisions (Doan, Jennifer)
November 3, 2014 Filing 260 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 258 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Theodore W. Chandler, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Chandler Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Chandler Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Chandler Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to Chandler Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to Chandler Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to Chandler Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to Chandler Decl., # 9 Exhibit 8 to Chandler Decl., # 10 Exhibit 9 to Chandler Decl., # 11 Exhibit 10 to Chandler Decl., # 12 Exhibit 11 to Chandler Decl., # 13 Exhibit 12 to Chandler Decl., # 14 Exhibit 13 to Chandler Decl., # 15 Exhibit 14 to Chandler Decl., # 16 Exhibit 15 to Chandler Decl., # 17 Exhibit 16 to Chandler Decl., # 18 Exhibit 17 to Chandler Decl., # 19 Exhibit 18 to Chandler Decl., # 20 Exhibit 19 to Chandler Decl., # 21 Exhibit 20 to Chandler Decl., # 22 Exhibit 21 to Chandler Decl., # 23 Exhibit 22 to Chandler Decl., # 24 Exhibit 23 to Chandler Decl., # 25 Exhibit 24 to Chandler Decl., # 26 Exhibit 25 to Chandler Decl., # 27 Exhibit 26 to Chandler Decl., # 28 Exhibit 27 to Chandler Decl., # 29 Exhibit 28 to Chandler Decl., # 30 Exhibit 29 to Chandler Decl., # 31 Exhibit 30 to Chandler Decl., # 32 Exhibit 31 to Chandler Decl., # 33 Exhibit 32 to Chandler Decl., # 34 Exhibit 33 to Chandler Decl., # 35 Exhibit 34 to Chandler Decl., # 36 Exhibit 35 to Chandler Decl., # 37 Exhibit 36 to Chandler Decl., # 38 Exhibit 37 to Chandler Decl., # 39 Exhibit 38 to Chandler Decl., # 40 Exhibit 39 to Chandler Decl., # 41 Exhibit 40 to Chandler Decl., # 42 Exhibit 41 to Chandler Decl., # 43 Exhibit 42 to Chandler Decl., # 44 Exhibit 43 to Chandler Decl., # 45 Exhibit 44 to Chandler Decl., # 46 Exhibit 45 to Chandler Decl., # 47 Exhibit 46 to Chandler Decl., # 48 Exhibit 47 to Chandler Decl., # 49 Exhibit 48 to Chandler Decl., # 50 Exhibit 49 to Chandler Decl., # 51 Exhibit 50 to Chandler Decl., # 52 Exhibit 51 to Chandler Decl., # 53 Exhibit 52 to Chandler Decl., # 54 Exhibit 53 to Chandler Decl., # 55 Exhibit 54 to Chandler Decl., # 56 Exhibit 55 to Chandler Decl., # 57 Exhibit 56 to Chandler Decl., # 58 Exhibit 57 to Chandler Decl., # 59 Exhibit 58 to Chandler Decl., # 60 Exhibit 59 to Chandler Decl., # 61 Exhibit 60 to Chandler Decl., # 62 Exhibit 61 to Chandler Decl.)(Smith, Melissa)
November 3, 2014 Filing 259 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 258 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bryan K. Anderson, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Anderson Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to Anderson Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to Anderson Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4a to Anderson Decl., # 6 Exhibit 4b to Anderson Decl., # 7 Exhibit 5 to Anderson Decl., # 8 Exhibit 6 to Anderson Decl., # 9 Exhibit 7 to Anderson Decl., # 10 Exhibit 8 to Anderson Decl., # 11 Exhibit 9 to Anderson Decl., # 12 Exhibit 10 to Anderson Decl., # 13 Exhibit 11 to Anderson Decl., # 14 Exhibit 12 to Anderson Decl., # 15 Exhibit 13 to Anderson Decl., # 16 Exhibit 14 to Anderson Decl., # 17 Exhibit 15 to Anderson Decl., # 18 Exhibit 16 to Anderson Decl., # 19 Exhibit 17 to Anderson Decl., # 20 Exhibit 18 to Anderson Decl., # 21 Exhibit 19 to Anderson Decl., # 22 Exhibit 20 to Anderson Decl., # 23 Exhibit 21 to Anderson Decl., # 24 Exhibit 22 to Anderson Decl., # 25 Exhibit 23 to Anderson Decl., # 26 Exhibit 24 to Anderson Decl., # 27 Exhibit 25 to Anderson Decl., # 28 Exhibit 26 to Anderson Decl., # 29 Exhibit 27 to Anderson Decl., # 30 Exhibit 28 to Anderson Decl., # 31 Exhibit 29 to Anderson Decl., # 32 Exhibit 30 to Anderson Decl., # 33 Exhibit 31 to Anderson Decl., # 34 Exhibit 32 to Anderson Decl., # 35 Exhibit 33 to Anderson Decl., # 36 Exhibit 34 to Anderson Decl., # 37 Exhibit 35 to Anderson Decl., # 38 Exhibit 36 to Anderson Decl., # 39 Exhibit 37 to Anderson Decl., # 40 Exhibit 38 to Anderson Decl., # 41 Exhibit 39 to Anderson Decl., # 42 Exhibit 40 to Anderson Decl., # 43 Exhibit 41 to Anderson Decl.)(Smith, Melissa)
November 3, 2014 Filing 258 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 239 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT APPLE INC. TO PROVIDE RELEVANT DISCOVERY filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Index of Exhibits, # 6 Declaration of Christopher R. Wysocki, # 7 Declaration of Brad Reigel, # 8 Declaration of Beth Kellermann, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
November 3, 2014 Filing 257 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation of Compliance with Third-Party Production Provisions (Wied, Peter)
November 3, 2014 Filing 256 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher James Mierzejewski on behalf of ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. (Mierzejewski, Christopher)
November 3, 2014 Filing 255 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 244 Amended Complaint,, by Amazon.com Inc., BlackBerry Corporation (f/k/a Research In Motion Corporation), Blackberry Limited (f//k/a Research in Motion Limited), DirecTV, LLC, HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
October 31, 2014 Filing 254 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Appendix A)(Smith, Melissa)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting 233 Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/31/2014. (nkl, )
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting 232 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 213 Intervenor Complaint. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/31/2014. (nkl, )
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting 248 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 239 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT APPLE INC. TO PROVIDE RELEVANT DISCOVERY. Responses due by 11/3/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/27/2014. (nkl, )
October 24, 2014 Filing 250 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 218 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 24, 2014 Filing 249 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. re 205 SEALED MOTION to Sever Amazon.com Inc.'s Notice in Support of Motion to Sever (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
October 24, 2014 Filing 248 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 239 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT APPLE INC. TO PROVIDE RELEVANT DISCOVERY by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 17, 2014 Filing 247 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 245 Answer to Intervenor Complaint, Counterclaim,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 17, 2014 Filing 246 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 244 Amended Complaint,,.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 17, 2014 Filing 245 ANSWER to 213 Intervenor Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against DirecTV, LLC by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 17, 2014 Filing 244 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against Amazon.com Inc., Apple, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation (f/k/a Research In Motion Corporation), Blackberry Limited (f//k/a Research in Motion Limited), HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Huawei Device USA, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Motorola Mobility LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, DirecTV, LLC, filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 17, 2014 Filing 243 NOTICE by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc. re 152 Protective Order (Baxter, Samuel)
October 16, 2014 Filing 242 NOTICE by Amazon.com Inc. Third Notice of Compliance with Third-Party Production Provisions (Doan, Jennifer)
October 14, 2014 Filing 241 REPLY to Response to Motion re 218 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit INDEX OF ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS, # 2 Exhibit 34, # 3 Exhibit 35, # 4 Exhibit 36)(Smith, Melissa)
October 10, 2014 Filing 240 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 218 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions filed by ContentGuard Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Trevor J. Smedley, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 E