Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC et al v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC and Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00015
Filed: January 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2014 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. New case number 3:14-cv-5093 (ch, )
November 21, 2014 Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:14-cv-05093, filed 11/19/2014. (ch, )
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Change Venue. ORDERED transferred to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/27/2014. (ch, )
October 22, 2014 Filing 87 Claim Construction Chart by Apple Inc., Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
October 17, 2014 Filing 86 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
October 16, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alyssa J Holtslander on behalf of Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4886558. (Holtslander, Alyssa)
October 15, 2014 Filing 84 REPLY to 76 Claim Construction Brief filed by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
October 14, 2014 Filing 83 RESPONSE to Apple's Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims (Dkt #6 in Case 2:14-cv-867) filed by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
October 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEA DCASE, Cause No. 2:14-cv-15. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/13/14. (ch, )
October 8, 2014 Filing 81 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Dale Buscaino, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Affidavit of Mark Scarsi, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E)(Scarsi, Mark)
October 6, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Pendency of Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to In Re Apple Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER appoints Shane Nelson to serve as the Technical Advisor. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/29/2014. (ch, )
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/25/2014. (ch, )
September 24, 2014 Filing 77 Joint MOTION Amend Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
September 24, 2014 Filing 76 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
September 24, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP Of Compliance Regarding Technology Tutorial (Yarbrough, Herbert)
September 24, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Smith, Melissa)
September 22, 2014 Filing 73 Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC's and Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP's ANSWER to 71 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP.(Yarbrough, Herbert)
September 12, 2014 Filing 72 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Proposed Constructions)(Smith, Melissa)
September 2, 2014 Filing 71 ANSWER to 62 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP by Apple Inc..(Scarsi, Mark)
September 2, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP Of Compliance Re: P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Yarbrough, Herbert)
September 2, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Compliance Re P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 60 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/26/2014. (ch, )
August 21, 2014 Filing 67 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Compliance Re P.R. 4-1(a) Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
August 21, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP Notice of Compliance Re: P.R. 4-1(a) Disclosures (Yarbrough, Herbert)
August 19, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Lichtenberg on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4796470. (Lichtenberg, Andrew)
August 18, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Completed Briefing (Smith, Melissa)
August 15, 2014 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Apple's Reply to Rembrandt's Response in Opposition to Supplemental Briefing Re Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
August 14, 2014 Filing 62 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., filed by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP.(Yarbrough, Herbert)
August 14, 2014 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Scarsi, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Mark Scarsi Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Mark Scarsi Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Mark Scarsi Declaration)(Smith, Melissa)
August 14, 2014 Filing 60 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Apple's Reply to Rembrandt's Response in Opposition to Supplemental Briefing Re Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER the court enters this Order sua sponte. The Courts 51 Memorandum & Opinion is VACATED and WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/12/2014. (ch, )
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/8/2014. (ch, )
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/8/2014. (ch, )
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Seal Exhibit D to Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Apple Inc's Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/5/2014. (ch, )
August 4, 2014 Filing 55 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 54 Plaintiffs' Response to Apple Inc.'s Supplemental Briefing Re: Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue (Yarbrough, Herbert)
August 4, 2014 Filing 54 RESPONSE to 48 Notice (Other), Apple Inc.'s Supplemental Briefing Re: Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit E)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
August 4, 2014 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 46 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/1/2014. (ch, )
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ***VACATED AND WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 59***MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/1/2014. (ch, ) Modified on 8/12/2014 (ch, ).
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/1/2014. (ch, )
July 31, 2014 Filing 49 Joint MOTION For Entry Of ESI Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 31, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 47, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
July 30, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 22 MOTION to Change Venue (SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF MARK C. SCARSI, # 2 Exhibit A TO THE DECLARATION OF MARK C. SCARSI)(Smith, Melissa)
July 30, 2014 Filing 47 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 22 MOTION to Change Venue Supplemental Briefing Re Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Mark Scarsi, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Mark Scarsi Declaration)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/31/2014 (nkl, ).
July 30, 2014 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing Re Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 23, 2014 Filing 45 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. (Scarsi, Mark)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Amended Pleadings due by 8/20/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 8/20/2014. Jury Selection set for 5/11/2015 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation Completion due by 2/6/2015. Markman Hearing set for 11/5/2014 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Motions in Limine due by 3/16/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/23/2015.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/23/2014. (nkl, )
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/23/2014. (nkl, )
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Hannah Lynn Cannom terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/22/2014. (nkl, )
July 22, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP Re: Initial and Additional Disclosures (Yarbrough, Herbert)
July 22, 2014 Filing 40 Joint MOTION For Entry of Protective Order by Apple Inc., Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Proposed Protective Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
July 21, 2014 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Hannah Cannom by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
July 15, 2014 Filing 38 Joint MOTION For Entry Of A Discovery Order by Apple Inc., Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Proposed Discovery Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
July 15, 2014 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Apple Inc., Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
July 15, 2014 Filing 36 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP Of Submission of Competing Docket Control Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Proposed Docket Control Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
July 3, 2014 Filing 35 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hesha Abrams, filed by Apple Inc., Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
July 1, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 7/1/14. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before Judge Payne. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR, CRR.)(jml)
June 17, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP Notice of Compliance re P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Yarbrough, Herbert)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/16/2014. (ch, )
June 12, 2014 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Debby E. Gunter by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
June 4, 2014 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin R Schlesinger on behalf of Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4688214. (Schlesinger, Benjamin)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2014 02:00 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy S Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/3/2014. (ch, )
April 14, 2014 Filing 29 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
April 7, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP (Yarbrough, Herbert)
April 3, 2014 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple Inc.. (Scarsi, Mark)
March 31, 2014 Filing 26 Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC's and Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP's ANSWER to 19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP.(Yarbrough, Herbert)
March 24, 2014 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP (Yarbrough, Herbert)
March 24, 2014 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
March 7, 2014 Filing 23 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 22 MOTION to Change Venue .. (Smith, Melissa)
March 5, 2014 Filing 22 MOTION to Change Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mark Buckley, # 2 Affidavit of Mark C. Scarsi, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
March 5, 2014 Filing 21 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
March 5, 2014 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
March 5, 2014 Filing 19 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP by Apple Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
March 5, 2014 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
February 20, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E Robert Yoches on behalf of Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP (Yoches, E)
February 19, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Anita Bhushan on behalf of Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4530761. (Bhushan, Anita)
February 11, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jacob A Schroeder on behalf of Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4518896. (Schroeder, Jacob)
February 11, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gerald F Ivey on behalf of Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4518806. (Ivey, Gerald)
February 11, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard B Racine on behalf of Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4518775. (Racine, Richard)
February 11, 2014 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Kabakoff on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4518691. (Kabakoff, Stephen)
February 11, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher T Blackford on behalf of Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4518578. (Blackford, Christopher)
February 5, 2014 Filing 11 APPROVED APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher J Gaspar for Apple Inc. ($100 FILING FEE PAID, Receipt # 0540-4510221). (pkb, )
February 5, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ashlee Lin on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4510329. (Lin, Ashlee)
February 5, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Miguel Ruiz on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4510325. (Ruiz, Miguel)
February 5, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Hannah Lynn Cannom on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4510232. (Cannom, Hannah)
February 5, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark C Scarsi on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4510144. (Scarsi, Mark)
January 27, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 3/5/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
January 24, 2014 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
January 23, 2014 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. Apple Inc. served by Process Server on 1/10/2014, answer due 1/31/2014. (ch, )
January 10, 2014 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
January 10, 2014 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.. (ch, )
January 10, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP (Gunter, Debra)
January 10, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4474019.), filed by Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC, Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent 6,185,678, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
January 10, 2014 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
January 10, 2014 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rembrandt Patent Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rembrandt Secure Computing, LP
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Hannah Lynn Cannom
Represented By: Christopher J Gaspar
Represented By: Ashlee Lin
Represented By: Miguel Ruiz
Represented By: Mark C Scarsi
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?