GENBAND US LLC v. Metaswitch Networks Corp. et al
Plaintiff: GENBAND US LLC
Defendant: Metaswitch Networks Corp., Metaswitch Networks Ltd and MetaSwitch, INC.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00033
Filed: January 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Presiding Judge: Roy S. Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER AND OPINION WITH FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/29/2016. (ch, )
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 457 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/15/2016. (ch, )
January 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER on Exhibit Objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/10/2016. (rsp2, )
January 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 261 , 262 , 266 Motions to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/09/2016. (rsp2, )
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 258 Sealed Motion to Strike Expert Report of Mark R. Lanning. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/08/2016. (rsp2, )
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 310 SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/6/15. (ch, )
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/2/2015. (ch, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENBAND US LLC v. Metaswitch Networks Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENBAND US LLC
Represented By: Jeffery Derek Baxter
Represented By: Tim Joseph Calloway
Represented By: Vernon Edward Evans
Represented By: Douglas Mark Kubehl
Represented By: Roshan Suresh Mansinghani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metaswitch Networks Corp.
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Gregory Blake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metaswitch Networks Ltd
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Gregory Blake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetaSwitch, INC.
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Gregory Blake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?