Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. v. AMX LLC
Plaintiff: Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.
Defendant: AMX LLC
Consolidated Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Acuity Brands, Inc. and Control4 Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Gary V McGowan, David Folsom and Technical Advisor Richard David Egan
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Crestron Electronics, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: WI-Lan, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00500
Filed: April 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Collin
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2016 Filing 104 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, )
April 14, 2016 Filing 103 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Kella, Michael)
March 24, 2016 Filing 102 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Kella, Michael)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #100 MOTION to Dismiss Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) filed by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.., Crestron Electronics, Inc., WI-Lan, Inc., Crestron Electronics, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv502) and Crestron Electronics, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv502) terminated., Attorney Harry Lee Gillam, Jr; Michael Patrick Kella; Timothy D Krieger; Anthony G Simon; Benjamin R Askew and William C Bergmann terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/14/2016. (nkl, )
March 14, 2016 Filing 100 MOTION to Dismiss Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kella, Michael)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #97 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/12/2016. (gsg)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - Court appoints Rich Egan as its technical advisor in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/12/2016. (ch, )
February 11, 2016 Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending United States Patent and Trademark Office Review of Patents-in-Suit by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kella, Michael)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #94 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/22/2016. (nkl, )
January 21, 2016 Filing 95 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kella, Michael)
January 19, 2016 Filing 94 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kella, Michael)
January 15, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE by Crestron Electronics, Inc. of Decision Regarding Institution of Inter Partes Review of U.S. Patent No. 6,160,359 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bergmann, William)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #91 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice between Plaintiff and Defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. filed by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv504) and UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv504) terminated., Attorney Jonathan Ray Spivey; Christopher Aaron Shield and LaTasha Mabry Snipes terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/13/2016. (nkl, )
January 13, 2016 NOTICE the Status Conference set for January 22, 2016 is CANCELLED. (bga, )
January 11, 2016 Filing 91 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice between Plaintiff and Defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kella, Michael)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/04/2016. (nkl, )
December 30, 2015 Filing 89 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #84 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Correct Docket Control Order by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Corrected Docket Control Order)(Kella, Michael)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #85 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. filed by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.., Status Conference set for 1/22/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/29/2015. (nkl, )
December 22, 2015 Filing 87 NOTICE by AMX LLC, Control4 Corporation, Crestron Electronics, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 Joint Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence (Biddinger, Brian)
December 22, 2015 Filing 86 NOTICE by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. of Compliance of P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Kella, Michael)
December 22, 2015 Filing 85 Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kella, Michael)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/21/2015. (ch, )
December 18, 2015 Filing 83 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #70 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,,,,, Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Amended Docket Control Order)(Kella, Michael)
December 16, 2015 Filing 82 NOTICE by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. of Compliance with Judge Gilstrap's Standing Order Requiring Notice of Relevant Determinations from Related Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision regarding Institution of Inter Partes Review, #2 Exhibit B - Scheduling Order)(Kella, Michael)
December 10, 2015 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #73 MOTION to Dismiss Crestron Electronics, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint Third-Party Defendant Wi-LAN Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Crestron Electronics, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint filed by WI-Lan, Inc.. (Kella, Michael)
December 8, 2015 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by LaTasha Mabry Snipes on behalf of UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Snipes, LaTasha)
November 30, 2015 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION to Dismiss Crestron Electronics, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint filed by Crestron Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Bergmann, William)
November 12, 2015 Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #73 MOTION to Dismiss Crestron Electronics, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint by Crestron Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bergmann, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2015: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
November 3, 2015 Filing 77 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Crestron Electronics, Inc. of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Bergmann, William)
November 3, 2015 Filing 76 Notice of Compliance Regarding INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by AMX LLC. (Biddinger, Brian)
November 3, 2015 Filing 75 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. of Compliance re: P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 (Spivey, Jonathan)
November 3, 2015 Filing 74 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Control4 Corporation of Compliance re P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
October 30, 2015 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss Crestron Electronics, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint by WI-Lan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Assignment of Patent Rights, #3 Exhibit B - Assignment Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Certificate of Filing of Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.)(Kella, Michael)
October 28, 2015 Filing 72 RESPONSE to #50 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Kella, Michael)
October 20, 2015 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Darrell W Stark on behalf of AMX LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5444975. (Stark, Darrell)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re #41 - Pretrial Conference set for 9/7/2016 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 1/12/2016., Joinder of Parties due by 9/7/2015., Jury Selection set for 10/3/2016 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 4/26/2016., Markman Hearing set for 3/29/2016 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions in Limine due by 8/15/2016., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/11/2015. (nkl, )
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re #50 Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Crestron Electronics, Inc.s Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/9/15. (mrm, )
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #50 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Crestron Electronic's, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint Against Wi-LAN Inc. Responses due by 10/28/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/9/15. (mrm, )
October 1, 2015 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony G Simon on behalf of WI-Lan, Inc. (Simon, Anthony)
September 29, 2015 Filing 66 NOTICE by Crestron Electronics, Inc. Notice of Ex Parte Reexamination Office Action Rejecting Claims 1-36 of U.S. Patent No. 6,118,230 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bergmann, William)
September 28, 2015 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #50 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Crestron Electronics, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kella, Michael)
September 28, 2015 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #50 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, Crestron Electronic's, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint Against Wi-LAN Inc. by WI-Lan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kella, Michael)
September 28, 2015 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin R Askew on behalf of WI-Lan, Inc. (Askew, Benjamin)
September 28, 2015 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy D Krieger on behalf of WI-Lan, Inc. (Krieger, Timothy)
September 28, 2015 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Patrick Kella on behalf of WI-Lan, Inc. (Kella, Michael)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DISCOVERY ORDER re #58 Joint MOTION re #54 Order, Joint Motion for Entry of the Parties' Discovery Order filed by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/22/2015. (nkl, )
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/22/2015. (nkl, )
September 14, 2015 Filing 58 Joint MOTION re #54 Order, Joint Motion for Entry of the Parties' Discovery Order by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discovery Order)(Kella, Michael)
September 14, 2015 Filing 57 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order)(Kella, Michael)
September 11, 2015 Filing 56 CORRECTED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crestron Electronics, Inc. for WI-Lan, Inc.. (nkl, )
September 11, 2015 Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crestron Electronics, Inc.. WI-Lan, Inc. served on 9/9/2015, answer due 9/30/2015. (nkl, )
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re #48 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Partially Agreed filed by AMX LLC, #42 MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Partially Agreed Discovery Order filed by Control4 Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/09/2015. (nkl, )
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 E-DISCOVERY ORDER re #43 MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Partially Agreed ESI Order filed by Control4 Corporation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 09/08/2015. (nkl, )
September 8, 2015 Filing 52 SUMMONS ON A THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT Issued as to WI-Lan, Inc.. (nkl, )
September 4, 2015 Filing 51 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Crestron Electronics, Inc.. (Gillam, Harry)
September 4, 2015 Filing 50 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Wi-LAN, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. by Crestron Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Gillam, Harry)
August 21, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Control4 Corporation re Service of Initial Disclosures (Damstedt, Benjamin)
August 20, 2015 Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Partially Agreed by AMX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Protective Order)(Schoenhard, Paul)
August 20, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance with Paragraphs 1 and 3 of the Proposed Partially Agreed Discovery Order (Kella, Michael)
August 20, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE by AMX LLC of Service of Initial Disclosures (Schoenhard, Paul)
August 20, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Crestron Electronics, Inc. Regarding Service of Initial Disclosures (Bergmann, William)
August 20, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Spivey, Jonathan)
August 13, 2015 Filing 43 MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Partially Agreed ESI Order by Control4 Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Partially Agreed ESI Order)(Damstedt, Benjamin)
August 13, 2015 Filing 42 MOTION Joint Motion for Entry of Partially Agreed Discovery Order by Control4 Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Partially Agreed Discovery Order)(Damstedt, Benjamin)
August 13, 2015 Filing 41 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Control4 Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Agreed Docket Control Order)(Damstedt, Benjamin)
August 6, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. Notice of Compliance with L.P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Kella, Michael)
August 6, 2015 Filing 39 RESPONSE to #32 Response to Non-Motion, Crestron Electronic, Inc.'s Reply to Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.'s Opposition to Crestron's Motion to Dismiss filed in Case No. 2:15-cv-502-JRG-RSP (D.I. 16) filed by Crestron Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bergmann, William)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. David Folsom is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case as to the following defendants: AMX LLC; Crestron Electronics, Inc.; and Control4 Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/05/2015. (nkl, )
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Gary McGowan is hereby appointed as mediator in the member case 2:15-CV-504 Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. v. UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 08/05/2015. (nkl, )
August 3, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, David Folsom, filed by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. regarding Lead Case No. 2:15-cv-500 and Member Case Nos. 2:15-cv-502 and 2:15-cv-503 (Kella, Michael)
August 3, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Gary McGowan, filed by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. regarding Member Case No. 2:15-cv-504 (Kella, Michael)
July 30, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 7/30/15. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml)
July 29, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of AMX LLC (Findlay, Eric)
July 28, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of AMX LLC (Craft, Roger)
July 27, 2015 Filing 32 RESPONSE to Plaintiff Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Defendant Crestron Electronics, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) (Doc. 16) filed in Case No. 2:15-cv-502-JRG-RSP filed by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Kella, Michael)
July 20, 2015 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.'s Counterclaims by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Kella, Michael)
July 20, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Aaron Shield on behalf of UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Shield, Christopher)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/20/2015. (nkl, )
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Crestron Electronics, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/20/2015. (nkl, )
July 13, 2015 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Amend Deadlines by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kella, Michael)
July 13, 2015 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kella, Michael)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 7/30/2015 01:30 PM before the Honorable Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/02/2015. (nkl, )
July 2, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. (Kella, Michael)
June 30, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Control4 Corporation (Craft, Roger)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Acuity Brands, Inc.., Acuity Brands, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv501) terminated., Attorney Michael Charles Smith terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/29/2015. (nkl, )
June 26, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy S Teter on behalf of Control4 Corporation (Teter, Timothy)
June 26, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lam Khanh Nguyen on behalf of Control4 Corporation (Nguyen, Lam)
June 25, 2015 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Acuity Brands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
June 25, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
June 25, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Richard Shapiro on behalf of AMX LLC (Shapiro, Matthew)
June 25, 2015 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AMX LLC identifying Corporate Parent Harman Professional, Inc., Other Affiliate Harman International Industries, Incorporated for AMX LLC. (Biddinger, Brian)
June 25, 2015 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by AMX LLC.(Biddinger, Brian)
June 25, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Paul M Schoenhard on behalf of AMX LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5263952. (Schoenhard, Paul)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-CV-00500. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/25/2015. (nkl, )
June 5, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AMX LLC to 06/25/2015. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, ).
June 5, 2015 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AMX LLC.( Biddinger, Brian)
May 18, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy D Krieger on behalf of Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. (Krieger, Timothy)
May 18, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin R Askew on behalf of Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. (Askew, Benjamin)
May 8, 2015 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AMX LLC to 6/10/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
May 8, 2015 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AMX LLC.( Biddinger, Brian)
April 30, 2015 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. AMX LLC served on 4/20/2015, answer due 5/11/2015. (nkl, )
April 15, 2015 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/15/2015. (ch, )
April 15, 2015 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
April 15, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. (Hill, Jack)
April 15, 2015 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to AMX LLC. (nkl, )
April 14, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Patrick Kella on behalf of Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. (Kella, Michael)
April 14, 2015 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wi-Lan Technologies, Inc. for Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Simon, Anthony)
April 14, 2015 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Simon, Anthony)
April 14, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony G Simon on behalf of Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. (Simon, Anthony)
April 14, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMX LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5151093.), filed by Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,118,230, #3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 6,160,359, #4 Exhibit C - 5,945,993)(Simon, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intuitive Building Controls, Inc. v. AMX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intuitive Building Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony G Simon
Represented By: Timothy D Krieger
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Benjamin R Askew
Represented By: Michael Patrick Kella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: LaTasha Mabry Snipes
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Shield
Represented By: Jonathan Ray Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Acuity Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Control4 Corporation
Represented By: Lam Khanh Nguyen
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Benjamin G Damstedt
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Timothy S Teter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Gary V McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Technical Advisor Richard David Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Crestron Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: William C Bergmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: WI-Lan, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy D Krieger
Represented By: Benjamin R Askew
Represented By: Anthony G Simon
Represented By: Michael Patrick Kella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMX LLC
Represented By: Brian P Biddinger
Represented By: Paul M Schoenhard
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Darrell W Stark
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Matthew Richard Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?