ERFINDERGEMEINSCHAFT UROPEP GbR v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Plaintiff: ERFINDERGEMEINSCHAFT UROPEP GbR
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company and Brookshire Brothers Inc
Case Number: 2:2015cv01202
Filed: July 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 396 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - denying 375 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. For the foregoing reasons, Lillys motion for judgment as a matter of law and a new trial is denied. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 8/25/2017. (ch, )
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 390 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 377 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by ERFINDERGEMEINSCHAFT UROPEP GbR.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 7/18/2017. (nkl, )
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 359 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 5/18/2017. (nkl, )
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 257 Opposed MOTION to Preclude Lilly's Experts from Presenting Testimony that Contradicts the Court's Summary Judgment Ruling filed by ERFINDERGEMEINSCHAFT UROPEP GbR.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 4/13/2017. (nkl, )
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - granting in part denying in part 223 Motion to Exclude. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 3/17/2017. (ch, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 198 MOTION in Limine filed by Eli Lilly and Company, 207 MOTION in Limine filed by ERFINDERGEMEINSCHAFT UROPEP GbR.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 3/13/2017. (nkl, )
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 172 MOTION for Summary Judgment that the Claims of the '124 Patent are Anticipated filed by Eli Lilly and Company, 232 MOTION to Supplement the Record for Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefi niteness filed by Eli Lilly and Company, 174 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement and no Willfulness filed by Eli Lilly and Company, 213 MOTION to Supplement Evidence in Support of Lilly's Motion for Sum mary Judgment that the Claims of the '124 Patent are Anticipated filed by Eli Lilly and Company, 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Motion for Confirmation fo the Court's Claim Construction Order and Partial Summar y Judgment of Infringement and Memorandum of Law In Support Thereof filed by ERFINDERGEMEINSCHAFT UROPEP GbR, 173 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Eli Lilly and Company.. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 3/3/2017. (nkl, )
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 2/1/2017. (nkl, )
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 1/20/2017. (nkl, )
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 10/21/2016. (ch, )
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 05/13/2016. (nkl, )
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 04/26/2016. (nkl, )
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 02/26/2016. (nkl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ERFINDERGEMEINSCHAFT UROPEP GbR v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERFINDERGEMEINSCHAFT UROPEP GbR
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Ahmed Jamal Davis
Represented By: Cherylyn Esoy Mizzo
Represented By: John Wesley Samples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: Felicia J Boyd
Represented By: Jon Bentley Hyland
Represented By: Todd G Vare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookshire Brothers Inc
Represented By: Felicia J Boyd
Represented By: Jon Bentley Hyland
Represented By: Todd G Vare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?