Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations, LLC v. Guardian Protection Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC
Defendant: Guardian Protection Services, Inc. and Leigh M. Rothschild
Not Classified By Court: Robert W Faulkner
Consolidated Defendant: ADS Security, L.P., Alarm Security Group, LLC, Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc., Guardian Alarm Company, GUARDIAN OF GEORGIA, INC. D/B/A ACKERMAN SECURITY SYSTEMS, Icon Security Systems, Inc., Monitronics International, Inc. and Slomin's, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01431
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/12/19. (ch, )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #131 Report and Recommendations the Court DENIES the Motion. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/12/2019. (ch, )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 RESPONSE to Motion re #137 MOTION for Reconsideration re #136 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Reply in Support of ADS Security, L.P.'s Motion to Reconsider Order Adopting Report and Recommendation filed by ADS Security, L.P.. (Roth, Blake)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 RESPONSE to Motion re #137 MOTION for Reconsideration re #136 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Bertini, Christopher)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION for Reconsideration re #136 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, by ADS Security, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Service)(Roth, Blake) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2019: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #131 Report and Recommendations. Rothschilds motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 125) is DENIED with respect to personal jurisdiction and GRANTED respect to service of process. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims against Leigh M. Rothschild are DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/16/2019. (ch, )
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE to #134 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Leigh M. Rothschild. (Bertini, Christopher)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 OBJECTION to #131 Report and Recommendations Limited Objection by ADS Security, L.P.. (Roth, Blake)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILE UNDER OBJECTION TO R&R Document # 131, RESPONSE TO NON MOTION. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ***FILED IN ERROR***RESPONSE to #131 Report and Recommendations ADS Security, L.P.'s Limited Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by ADS Security, L.P.. (Roth, Blake) Modified on 8/22/2019 (ch, ).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ***FILED IN ERROR***RESPONSE in Opposition re #125 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction AND limited objection to the Report and Recommendation (Dkt. No. 131) filed by ADS Security, L.P.. (Roth, Blake) Modified on 8/21/2019 (ch, ).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER THE WRONG EVENT Document # 132, Response in Opposition to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #125 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Leigh M. Rothschild.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/13/19. (ch, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 REPLY to Response to Motion re #125 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Bertini, Christopher)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #125 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ADS Security, L.P.. (Roth, Blake)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ADS Security, L.P.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1463). Leigh M. Rothschild served on 4/20/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Roth, Blake)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ANSWER to Complaint by Leigh M. Rothschild.(Bertini, Christopher)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leigh M. Rothschild. (Bertini, Christopher)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Leigh M. Rothschild. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit)(Bertini, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2019: #4 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 SUMMONS Issued as to Leigh M. Rothschild. (ch, )
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #117 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/11/2019. (ch, )
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 RESPONSE to 120 filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Bertini, Christopher)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ***FILED IN ERROR***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Bertini, Christopher) Modified on 3/7/2019 (ch, ).
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER TO WRONG EVENT Document # 121, Sur-Reply to Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims . Reply in Further Support of Motion for Leave to Amend CounterClaims. filed by ADS Security, L.P.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1463). (Roth, Blake)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RESPONSE to Motion re #117 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Ordere)(Bertini, Christopher)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Robert W Faulkner, Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC by ADS Security, L.P..(Roth, Blake)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Counterclaims by ADS Security, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Roth, Blake)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jay Brett Johnson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/16/2019. (nkl, )
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 1/16/2019 re #107 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by ADS Security, L.P., #113 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Renewed Motion to Withdraw As Attorney filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Court Reporter ECRO.) (bga, )
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Renewed Motion to Withdraw As Attorney by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR - does not contain a Certificate of Conference. Document # 113, MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Renewed Motion to Withdraw As Attorney. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 FILED IN ERROR MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Renewed Motion to Withdraw As Attorney by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 1/16/2019 (nkl, ).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher David Bertini on behalf of Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC (Bertini, Christopher)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #107 MOTION for Order to Show Cause : Motion Hearing RESET for 1/16/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER denying #109 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ; granting #110 Motion to Continue. Show Cause is continued to January 15, 2019 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/4/2018. (ch, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Show Cause Hearing set for 1/15/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Joint MOTION to Continue by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #107 MOTION for Order to Show Cause : Motion Hearing RESET for 12/10/2018 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #107 MOTION for Order to Show Cause : Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2018 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE to Motion re #107 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Johnson, Jay)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by ADS Security, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Declaration of Blake D. Roth)(Roth, Blake)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #105 Motion to Withdraw ; granting #105 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/25/2018. (ch, )
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw of Nathan J. Bailey, MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ADS Security, L.P.. (Bailey, Nathan)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/8/2017. (ch, )
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 RESPONSE to #100 Notice (Other) Reply to Rothchild's Response to ADS's Fee Submission filed by ADS Security, L.P.. (Bailey, Nathan)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the REPLY #102 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY. (slo, )
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ** DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. ATTORNEY MUST REFILE. ** REPLY to Response to Motion re #98 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by ADS Security, L.P.. (Bailey, Nathan) Modified on 9/28/2017 (slo, ).
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE to #100 Notice (Other) Plaintiff Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations, LLC's Response To Defendant's Fee Submission by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE by ADS Security, L.P. of Fees Submission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Nathan J. Bailey, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bailey, Nathan)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER RESETTING FEES BRIEFING DEADLINES re #98 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by ADS Security, L.P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/9/2017. (slo, )
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by ADS Security, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bailey, Nathan)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER re remand from Federal Circuit for calculation of attorney fees under 35 U.S.C. 285. Defendants shall each submit a full accounting of all fees and costs sought under 285 within 21 days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff may file a response within 14 days after service of Defendants briefs. Any reply will be due within 7 days after Plaintiffs response. If a dispute remains, the Court will hear argument on September 6, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. (Status Conference re remand for calculation of attorney fees set for 9/6/2017 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/19/2017. (slo, )
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MANDATE of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT in accordance with the judgment of this court, entered June 5, 2017, as to #90 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by ADS Security, L.P. Costs in the amount of $962.12 were determined and taxed against the appellee. (dlc, )
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 USCA OPINION and JUDGMENT filed. The decision of the district court is reversed and remanded (Precedential Opinion) as to #90 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by ADS Security, L.P. Circuit Judges: Prost, Mayer, Wallach. Concurring opinion filed by Judge Mayer. (Attachments: #1 USCA Federal Circuit Opinion, #2 Rehearing Q&A, #3 Supreme Court Info Sheet)(tkd, )
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/8/15 (Scheduling Conference) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/26/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/6/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2016. (sholmes, )
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by ADS Security, L.P. for proceedings held on 12/8/2015 before Judge Gilstrap, (Bailey, Nathan)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA re #90 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by ADS Security, L.P.. USCA Case Number 16-2521 (dlc, )
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 8/17/16, by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #90 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, #89 Memorandum & Opinion, and certified copies of docket sheets. (dlc, )
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #89 Memorandum & Opinion by ADS Security, L.P.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-5890460. (Bailey, Nathan)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal, #89 Memorandum Opinion & Order, and certified copies of Docket Sheets to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #90 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ***REVERSED, See #95 USCA OPINION***MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/18/2016. (ch, ) Modified on 7/13/2017 (dlc, ).
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120 ) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, )
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #85 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Guardian of Georgia, Inc. d/b/a Ackerman Security Systems Without Prejudice (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1429). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/21/2016. (ch, )
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Guardian of Georgia, Inc. d/b/a Ackerman Security Systems Without Prejudice by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
April 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings : Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2016 before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jill McFadden,Telephone number: (903) 530-3163. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2016. (tlh, )
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #80 Unopposed Motion to Dismiss with prejudice ADS Security, L.P. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1463). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/6/2016. (ch, )
April 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE by ADS Security, L.P. re #59 Response to Motion,, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Garfum.com Opinion)(Bailey, Nathan)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Amended and Unopposed Motion To Dismiss Defendant ADS Security, LP With Prejudice by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2016 re #58 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ADS Security, LP filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (bga, )
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #74 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/14/16. (mrm, )
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE by ADS Security, L.P. Notice of Compliance with L.P.R. 4-1 (Proposed Claim Terms) (Bailey, Nathan)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance Regarding Its Proposed Claim Terms (Johnson, Jay)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nicolo Davidson on behalf of ADS Security, L.P.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5653606. (Davidson, Nicolo)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Joint MOTION For Entry of Amended Docket Control Order by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER - Setting Hearing on Motion #58 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2016 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. denying #72 Joint MOTION to Stay.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/7/2016. (ch, )
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ADS Security, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY)(Bailey, Nathan)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #58 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ADS Security, LP Plaintiff's Surreply to Defendant ADS Security, L.P.'s Reply Memorandum on Attorneys' Fees filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Jay)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Replies due by 3/3/2016.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/1/2016. (ch, )
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
February 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE by ADS Security, L.P. of Motions Filed in Related Proceeding (Bailey, Nathan)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/21/2016. (ch, )
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #63 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 9 to ADS's Reply in Support of its Cross Motion for Attorneys' Fees, #64 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document.. (Bailey, Nathan)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ADS Security, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bailey, Nathan)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #63 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 9 to ADS's Reply in Support of its Cross Motion for Attorneys' Fees, #62 Reply to Response to Motion,,. (Bailey, Nathan)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 9 to ADS's Reply in Support of its Cross Motion for Attorneys' Fees by ADS Security, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bailey, Nathan)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REPLY to Response to Motion re #58 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ADS Security, LP In Support of ADS's Cross Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by ADS Security, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: OnStar Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2: Email with Invalidity Charts, #3 Exhibit 3: Declaration of Nathan J. Bailey, #4 Exhibit 4: Coca Cola Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5: Patent Family File History Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 6: November 20 Email from Jay Johnson, #7 Exhibit 7: U.S. Patent No. 7,099,740 to Bartholomew et al., #8 Exhibit 8: References Cited in 090 Patent, #9 Exhibit 10: RPX Patent Activity Report, #10 Exhibit 11: Various Articles)(Bailey, Nathan)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew C Cox on behalf of ADS Security, L.P. (Cox, Matthew)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ADS Security, LP Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant ADS Security LP's Cross Motion For Attorneys' Fees filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Johnson, Jay)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion re #58 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ADS Security, LP and CROSS MOTION for Attorneys' Fees filed by ADS Security, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1: Safe Harbor Notice, #3 Exhibit 2: RCDI Active Cases, #4 Exhibit 3: Declaration re: Attorneys Fees, #5 Exhibit 4: ADS's Invalidity Contentions, #6 Exhibit 5: Prior Art References Part I, #7 Exhibit 6: Prior Art References Part II, #8 Exhibit 7: Declaration re: RCDI Conduct)(Bailey, Nathan)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ADS Security, LP by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY***Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ADS Security, LP by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay) Modified on 1/21/2016 (ch, ).
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE by ADS Security, L.P. of Compliance With Local Patent Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Bailey, Nathan)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 57, Opposed Motion to Dismiss. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. NEED TO FILE A MOTION Document # 55, Notice of Withdrawal of Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ***FILED IN ERROR***
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Plaintiff's Sur-Reply To Defendant ADS Security, LP's Reply on Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/29/2015. (nkl, )
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing set for 7/15/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC Notice of Compliance with Paragraphs 1 & 3 of the Discovery Order (Johnson, Jay)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE by ADS Security, L.P. of Compliance with Initial Disclosure Requirements (Bailey, Nathan)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2017 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Jury instructions due by 1/2/2017. Jury Selection set for 2/6/2017 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation Completion due by 8/12/2016. Markman Hearing set for 7/15/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/28/15. (mjc, )
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DISCOVERY ORDER re #47 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Discovery Order filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/28/2015. (nkl, )
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Agreed Protective Order by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Jay)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Discovery Order by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Discovery Order)(Johnson, Jay)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Joint MOTION For Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Docket Control Order)(Johnson, Jay)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE the Status Conference set for 1/4/2016 is CANCELLED. (bga, )
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by ADS Security, L.P.. (Bailey, Nathan)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations, LLC against Guardian Protection Services, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs, attorneys' fees and other litigation expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/21/15. (mll, )
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations, LLC against Monitronics International, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs, attorneys' fees and other litigation expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/21/15. (mll, )
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations, LLC against Central Security Group Nationwide, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its owncosts, attorneys' fees and other litigation expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/21/15. (mll, )
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations, LLC against Alarm Security Group, LLC. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs, attorneys' fees and other litigation expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/21/15. (mll, )
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Guardian Protection Services, Inc. by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Central Security Group Nationwide, Inc. by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Alarm Security Group LLC by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Honorable Robert Faulkner (Ret.) of JAMS, 8401 North Central Expressway, Suite 610, Dallas, Texas 75225, telephone number 214-744-5267 and fax number 214-720-6010, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/17/2015. (ch, )
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Johnson, Jay)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC Notice of Selection of Mediator (Johnson, Jay)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 12/8/15. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Letter Brief filed by ADS Security, L.P., Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Joint Letter Brief)(Bailey, Nathan)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Slomin's, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1469). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/30/2015. (ch, )
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice Icon Security Systems, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1468). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/30/2015. (ch, )
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Slomin's Inc. by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Icon Security Systems, Inc. by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/25/2015. (nkl, )
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement. Status Conference set for 1/4/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/25/2015. (ch, )
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Answer Due Deadline Updated for Alarm Security Group, LLC to 12/18/2015; Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc. to 12/18/2015; Monitronics International, Inc. to 12/18/2015. (nkl, )
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by ADS Security, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1: Email re: Assertion of Claim 1, #3 Exhibit 2: Attack on Internet of Things Article, #4 Exhibit 3: U.S. Patent No. 8,788,090)(Bailey, Nathan)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice Guardian Alarm Company (Consolidated Civil Action 2:15cv1496). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/23/2015. (ch, )
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement re Slomins by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance with Patent Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Johnson, Jay)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Guardian Alarm Company by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC (Johnson, Jay)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricardo Joel Bonilla on behalf of Alarm Security Group, LLC, Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc., Guardian Protection Services, Inc., Monitronics International, Inc. (Bonilla, Ricardo)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC by ADS Security, L.P..(Bailey, Nathan)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Slomins's Inc.( Johnson, Jay)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ADS Security, L.P. to 11/24/2015. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ADS Security, L.P..( Bailey, Nathan)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alarm Security Group, LLC.( Winterle, Bret)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Monitronics International, Inc..( Winterle, Bret)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Guardian Protection Services, Inc..( Winterle, Bret)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc..( Winterle, Bret)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alarm Security Group, LLC.( Winterle, Bret)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Guardian Protection Services, Inc. to 12/18/2015. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Alarm Security Group, LLC to 11/24/2015. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Monitronics International, Inc. to 11/24/2015. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc. to 11/23/2015. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Alarm Security Group, LLC to 11/9/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/1/2015. (ch, )
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. Guardian Protection Services, Inc. served on 10/6/2015. (ch, )
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues, except venue. Cause No. 2:15cv1431 is designated as the LEAD CASE. All parties are instructed to file any future filings except relating to venue in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. The Clerk is instructed to add the consolidated defendants into the Lead Case and their corresponding Lead and Local Counsel only. Additional counsel may file a Notice of Appearance in the Lead Case if they wish to continue as counsel of record in the lead consolidated action. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/15. (mll, )
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Consolidated Defendants added: ADS Security LP (2:15cv1463); Alarm Security Group LLC (2:15cv1464); Central Security Group - Nationwide Inc (2:15cv1462); Guardian Alarm Company (2:15cv1496); Guardian of Georgia Inc (2:15cv1429); Icon Security Systems Inc (2:15cv1468); Monitronics International Inc (2:15cv1466); Slomin's Inc (2:15cv1469). (mll, )
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil J McNabnay on behalf of Guardian Protection Services, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Guardian Protection Services, Inc..( Winterle, Bret)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Guardian Protection Services, Inc. to 12/3/2015. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Guardian Protection Services, Inc.. (nkl, )
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/25/2015. (ch, )
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT RCDI against Guardian Protection Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5353414.), filed by Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Jay) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2015: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (nkl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations, LLC v. Guardian Protection Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Robert W Faulkner
Represented By: Robert W Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothschild Connected Devices Innovations,LLC
Represented By: Jay Brett Johnson
Represented By: Christopher David Bertini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Protection Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Bret Thomas Winterle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh M. Rothschild
Represented By: Christopher David Bertini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ADS Security, L.P.
Represented By: Matthew C Cox
Represented By: Blake Daniel Roth
Represented By: Nathan J Bailey
Represented By: Nicolo Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Alarm Security Group, LLC
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Represented By: Bret Thomas Winterle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Central Security Group - Nationwide, Inc.
Represented By: Bret Thomas Winterle
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Guardian Alarm Company
Represented By: John S Le Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: GUARDIAN OF GEORGIA, INC. D/B/A ACKERMAN SECURITY SYSTEMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Icon Security Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Monitronics International, Inc.
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Bret Thomas Winterle
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Slomin's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?