Allergan, Inc. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Allergan, Inc.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Apotex, Inc., Apotex Corp., Akorn, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Mylan, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01455
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 522 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 10/16/2017. (ch, )
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 455 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 8/25/2017. (ch, )
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - granting 291 Motion of Compel Compliance with Subpoena. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 4/10/2017. (ch, )
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - denying 271 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO AMEND THE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 2:16-cv-0401 AS TO DEFENDANT FAMY CARE LIMITED ONLY. 283 MOTION for Hearing DEFENDANT FAMY CARE LIMITED'S MOTION FOR IN-PERSON HEARING on Opposed Motion to Amend Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 2/28/2017. (ch, )
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 1/26/2017. (ch, )
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 1/12/2017. (ch, )
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 12/13/2016. (nkl, )
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 4/19/2016. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allergan, Inc. v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allergan, Inc.
Represented By: Juanita Rose Brooks
Represented By: Susan M Coletti
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Herriges
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Michael J Kane
Represented By: Deanna Jean Reichel
Represented By: Jonathan Elliot Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Brady Paddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex, Inc.
Represented By: Dallas William Tharpe
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Dallas William Tharpe
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akorn, Inc.
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?