Raytheon Company v. Cray, Inc.

Plaintiff: Raytheon Company
Defendant: Cray, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01554
Filed: September 25, 2015
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S. Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2017 313 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on July 18, 2017. (jml)
June 29, 2017 289 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/29/2017. (nkl, )
June 19, 2017 273 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER 109 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION TESTIMONY ON TOPICS 40 AND 41, AND TO COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION filed by Cray, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/19/2017. (nkl, )
June 12, 2017 263 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/09/2017. (nkl, )
June 6, 2017 261 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/06/2017. (nkl, )
June 5, 2017 259 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/05/2017. (nkl, )
September 23, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 21 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Cray, Inc., 65 Report and Recommendations,. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/21/2016. (nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raytheon Company v. Cray, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raytheon Company
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Represented By: Brian Gregory Fahrenbach
Represented By: Thomas J Filarski
Represented By: Daniel Steven Stringfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cray, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Alexander Kohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?