Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd v. T-Mobile US, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc. and T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00055
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Presiding Judge: Roy S. Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 389 Report and Recommendations Denying 248 Opposed SEALED MOTION by Defendants and Intervenors for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of US Patent No. 8,798,575 filed by Nokia Sol utions and Networks US LLC, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Denying 252 Opposed MOTION for Summary Judgment of Ineligibility of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,798,575 and 8,531,971 filed by Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc ., Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, T-Mobile USA, Inc., Denying 249 Opposed SEALED MOTION by Defendants and Intervenors NSN for Summary Judgment of Exhaustion of US Patent No. 8,798,575 filed by No kia Solutions and Networks US LLC, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Granting 245 SEALED MOTION by Defendants for Partial Summary Judgment of No Pre-Suit Damages filed by Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC, Nokia Solutions and Netw orks Oy, Denying 250 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants T-Mobile and Intervenor NSN for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of US Patents 8,325,675 and 8,908,627 filed by Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC, Nokia Solutions an d Networks Oy, Denying 253 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claim 1 of U.S. Patent No. 8,325,675 filed by Nokia Solutions and Networks US LLC, T-Mobile US, Inc., Ericsson Inc., Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson, T-Mobile USA, Inc..The parties objections to the Report and Recommendation, Dkt. Nos. 405, 429, 430, 431, are OVERRULED. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/7/2017. (ch, )
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 390 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Huaweis motion to strike portions of Dr. Lyons invalidity reports, Dkt. 243, is GRANTED. T-Mobile and Intervenors Daubert motion to exclude Dr. Leopolds Opinions Concerning Prior Art, Dkt. 247, is DENIED. Huaweis motion for leave to supplement Dr. Leopolds and Dr. Wells expert reports, Dkt. 336, is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/16/2017. (ch, )
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 340 Report and Recommendations. Huaweis objections are OVERRULED. The Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED Huaweis motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/27/2017. (ch, )
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 321 Report and Recommendations, Denying 246 Motion for Summary Judgment. Huawei Objection 327 OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/6/2017. (ch, )
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/17/2017. (ch, )
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 142 Report and Recommendations, Denying 25 Motion to Dismiss filed by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/24/2017. (ch, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd v. T-Mobile US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd
Represented By: David M Barkan
Represented By: Carl Edward Bruce
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Jane J Du
Represented By: Linda Liu Kordziel
Represented By: Thomas Howard Reger, II
Represented By: Richard Alex Sterba
Represented By: Brian Gregory Strand
Represented By: Kevin K. Su
Represented By: Neil Alexander Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Steven John Pollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Steven John Pollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?