Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. v. Ericsson, Inc.
Plaintiff: Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., Ericsson Inc., Vadata, Inc., Philips Healthcare Infomatics Inc., Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. and Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Consolidated Defendant: Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Artek Surfin Chemicals, Ltd. (d/b/a Galata Chemicals, LLC), Ubisoft Studio, Inc. (d/b/a Ubisoft), Johnson & Johnson USA, Inc., ALE USA Inc. dba Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., Uber Technologies, Inc., Siemens Corporation, Alibaba Cloud Computing, Ltd., Netflix, Inc., Philips, Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., Spotify USA, Inc., Nasdaq, Inc., Zynga, Inc., General Electric Company, McGraw Hill Financial, Inc. (d/b/a S&P Global and S&P Capital IQ), The Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Zillow, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Hitachi America, Ltd., Ticketleap.com, LLC, TicketLeap, Inc., Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (d/b/a Ticketmaster, Inc.), Zillow Group, Inc., Nimbus Development, Inc. and AdRoll, Inc.
Intervenor: Ramey & Schwaller, LLP
Case Number: 2:2016cv00618
Filed: June 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Roy S Payne
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 183
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 188 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 187 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/02/2018. (nkl, )
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #184 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/21/2018. (nkl, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 185 Proposed Agreed Judgment Final Judgment. (Rothberg, Edward)
September 20, 2018 Filing 184 MOTION to Dismiss Joint Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Dismissal)(Rothberg, Edward)
September 20, 2018 Filing 183 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY Proposed Agreed Judgment Final Judgment. (Rothberg, Edward) Modified on 9/20/2018 (nkl, ).
September 20, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 183, Proposed Agreed Judgment Final Judgment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #181 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.., Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation and Philips Healthcare Infomatics Inc. terminated., Attorney Dallas William Tharpe; Herbert A Yarbrough, III; Daniel G Chung and Frank A DeCosta, III terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/5/2018. (nkl, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 181 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadden, J)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting #155 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., General Electric Company., General Electric Company (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv627) terminated., Attorney Saina Shamilov; Jeffrey A Andrews and J David Hadden terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/31/2018. (nkl, )
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting #178 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.., Ericsson Inc. (Added back per order #111) terminated., Attorney Steven Chase Callahan terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/30/2018. (nkl, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 178 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #176 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.., Hitachi, Ltd. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv636), Hitachi America, Ltd. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv636) and Hitachi America, Ltd. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv636) terminated., Attorney J Thad Heartfield and Paul Edward Poirot terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/29/2018. (nkl, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 176 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadden, J)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #168 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., SAP America, Inc.., SAP America, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv621) terminated., Attorney J David Hadden and Saina Shamilov terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/28/2018. (nkl, )
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #167 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.., Ubisoft Studio, Inc. (d/b/a Ubisoft) (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv626). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/28/2018. (ch, )
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting #166 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.., Uber Technologies, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv631) and Uber Technologies, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv631) terminated., Attorney Katherine K. Vidal; Adam R Shartzer and Noorossadat Torabi terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/28/2018. (nkl, )
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #165 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.., Siemens Corporation (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv622) terminated., Attorney Melissa Richards Smith terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/28/2018. (nkl, )
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #164 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.., McGraw Hill Financial, Inc. (d/b/a S&P Global and S&P Capital IQ) (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv628) terminated., Attorney Hui Li and Melissa Richards Smith terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/28/2018. (nkl, )
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #163 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.., Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (d/b/a Ticketmaster, Inc.) (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv625) terminated., Attorney Melissa Richards Smith; Ryan K Yagura; Andrea LaFountain and Farrah Reynolds terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/28/2018. (nkl, )
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting #162 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.., ALE USA Inc. dba Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv630) terminated., Attorney Eric Hugh Findlay and Greg Harlan Parker terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/28/2018. (nkl, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 168 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadden, J)
August 23, 2018 Filing 167 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadden, J)
August 23, 2018 Filing 166 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadden, J)
August 23, 2018 Filing 165 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadden, J)
August 23, 2018 Filing 164 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadden, J)
August 23, 2018 Filing 163 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadden, J)
August 23, 2018 Filing 162 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadden, J)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #147 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., Artek Surfin Chemicals, Ltd. (d/b/a Galata Chemicals, LLC)., Artek Surfin Chemicals, Ltd. (d/b/a Galata Chemicals, LLC) (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv632) terminated., Attorney Jennifer Haltom Doan and Jeffrey Randall Roeser terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/23/2018. (nkl, )
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #148 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., TicketLeap, Inc.., TicketLeap, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv624) terminated., Attorney Lynn Eileen Rzonca and Melissa Richards Smith terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/23/2018. (nkl, )
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #145 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., AdRoll, Inc.., AdRoll, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv634) terminated., Attorney Jeffrey Randall Roeser; Jennifer Haltom Doan and Laura E Miller terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/23/2018. (nkl, )
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #154 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.., Johnson & Johnson USA, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv619). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/23/2018. (ch, )
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #150 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.., Spotify USA, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv635). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/22/2018. (ch, )
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #146 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., Zynga, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv629). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/22/18. (ch, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 155 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., General Electric Company, Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadden, J)
August 22, 2018 Filing 154 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hadden, J)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #149 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.., Nasdaq, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv623).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/22/2018. (ch, )
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #144 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Vadata, Inc., Zillow, Inc., Zillow Group, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.., Zillow Group, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv637) and Zillow, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv637) terminated., Attorney Saina Shamilov; Jennifer Haltom Doan and J David Hadden terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/22/2018. (nkl, )
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #143 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., Netflix, Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/22/2018. (ch, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 150 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Spotify USA, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 22, 2018 Filing 149 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Nasdaq, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 22, 2018 Filing 148 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., TicketLeap, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 22, 2018 Filing 147 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Artek Surfin Chemicals, Ltd. (d/b/a Galata Chemicals, LLC), Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 22, 2018 Filing 146 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc., Zynga, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 22, 2018 Filing 145 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by AdRoll, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 22, 2018 Filing 144 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc., Zillow Group, Inc., Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
August 22, 2018 Filing 143 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #141 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sonali D Maitra and James S Tsuei terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/21/2018. (ch, )
June 20, 2018 Filing 141 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Sonali D. Maitra and James S. Tsuei by AdRoll, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Spotify USA, Inc., Zynga, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 19, 2018 Filing 140 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura E Miller on behalf of AdRoll, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Spotify USA, Inc., Zynga, Inc. (Miller, Laura)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #138 Motion to Withdraw of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/31/2018. (nkl, )
May 30, 2018 Filing 138 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw of Counsel by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vidal, Katherine)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER denying without prejudice #136 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/21/2018. (ch, )
May 17, 2018 Filing 136 MOTION to Intervene by Ramey & Schwaller, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Intervenor Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of William P. Ramey III)(Ramey, William)
May 16, 2018 Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #134 Response to Motion, Declaration of Edward L. Rothberg in Support of Plaintiff's Revised Brief In Opposition to Motion to Intervene by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Original Petition, #2 Exhibit B- Order of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C- Verified Original Answer)(Rothberg, Edward)
May 16, 2018 Filing 134 AMENDED RESPONSE to Motion re #131 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Original Petition, #2 Exhibit B- Order of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C- Verified Original Answer, #4 Text of Proposed Order Order Denying Motion to Intervene)(Rothberg, Edward)
May 9, 2018 Filing 133 RESPONSE to Motion re #131 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene MOTION TO INTERVENE filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Original Petition, #2 Exhibit B- Original Answer Counterclaim and Third Party Petition, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion to Intervene)(Rothberg, Edward)
May 9, 2018 Filing 132 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #131 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene MOTION TO INTERVENE.. (Ramey, William) Modified on 5/9/2018 (ch, ).
May 9, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 131 and 132, Moiton to Intervenue and additional attachment to main documents. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
May 8, 2018 Filing 131 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***Unopposed MOTION to Intervene MOTION TO INTERVENE by Ramey & Schwaller, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of William P. Ramey III)(Ramey, William) Modified on 5/9/2018 (ch, ).
February 7, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Noorossadat Torabi on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6653232. (Torabi, Noorossadat)
October 13, 2017 Filing 129 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward L Rothberg on behalf of Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd., Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. (Rothberg, Edward)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #127 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William P Ramey, III terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/27/2017. (nkl, )
September 22, 2017 Filing 127 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Ramey Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Ramey, William)
July 24, 2017 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #117 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William Ramey of Ramey & Schwaller, LLP and Buffy Martines of Laminack, Pirtle, & Martines, LLP in reply to Doc. No. 123 filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Ramey, William)
July 20, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY HAS REFILED (SEE #125). Document # 124, Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
July 19, 2017 Filing 125 RESPONSE to Motion re #117 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William Ramey of Ramey & Schwaller, LLP and Buffy Martines of Laminack, Pirtle, & Martines, LLP (Defendants' Response to Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Request to Dismiss without Prejudice) filed by AdRoll, Inc., Artek Surfin Chemicals, Ltd. (d/b/a Galata Chemicals, LLC), Nasdaq, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Spotify USA, Inc., The Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., TicketLeap, Inc., Ticketleap.com, LLC, Zillow Group, Inc., Zillow, Inc., Zynga, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 19, 2017 Filing 124 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE to Motion re #117 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William Ramey of Ramey & Schwaller, LLP and Buffy Martines of Laminack, Pirtle, & Martines, LLP (Response to Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Request to Dismiss without Prejudice) filed by AdRoll, Inc., Artek Surfin Chemicals, Ltd. (d/b/a Galata Chemicals, LLC), Nasdaq, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Spotify USA, Inc., The Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., TicketLeap, Inc., Ticketleap.com, LLC, Zynga, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer) Modified on 7/20/2017 (sm, ).
July 19, 2017 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #117 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William Ramey of Ramey & Schwaller, LLP and Buffy Martines of Laminack, Pirtle, & Martines, LLP filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Hadden, J)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER re #117 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William Ramey of Ramey & Schwaller, LLP and Buffy Martines of Laminack, Pirtle, & Martines, LLP filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/5/2017. (nkl, )
June 30, 2017 Filing 121 RESPONSE to #118 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney OBJECTIONS OF AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC., VADATA, INC., AND AMAZON.COM, INC. TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAYNE'S ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv624), Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Vadata, Inc.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv623), Vadata, Inc.. (Hadden, J)
June 27, 2017 Filing 120 NOTICE by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. Notice of Supplement to Certificate of Conference (Ramey, William)
June 26, 2017 Filing 119 ***FILED IN ERRROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Additional Attachments to Main Document:. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) Modified on 6/26/2017 (sm, ).
June 26, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED. Document # 119, Additional attachment to main document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 VACATED PER ORDER #122 ORDER granting #117 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William P Ramey, III terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 06/16/2017. (nkl, ) Modified on 7/5/2017 (nkl, ).
June 15, 2017 Filing 117 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William Ramey of Ramey & Schwaller, LLP and Buffy Martines of Laminack, Pirtle, & Martines, LLP by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd., Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
February 24, 2017 Filing 116 REPLY to Response to Motion re #106 MOTION to Stay in Civ. No. 2:16-cv-01074 filed by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Nimbus Development, Inc.. (Watkins, Brett)
February 8, 2017 Filing 115 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER denying the petition for writ of mandamus. Circuit Judges: Dyk, Bryson, and Taranto. Issued: February 8, 2017. (dlc, )
February 8, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James S Tsuei on behalf of AdRoll, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Spotify USA, Inc., Zynga, Inc. (Tsuei, James)
February 6, 2017 Filing 113 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE OF DOCKETING. A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed. USCA-Federal Circuit Case No. 17-112 (dlc, )
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DECONSOLIDATING CASE - The Court hereby ORDERS that Case No. 2:16-cv-1074 (Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. (GEMSA) v. Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Alibaba Cloud Computing, Ltd., and Nimbus Development, Inc.) be no longer consolidated under lead Case No. 2:16-cv-618, and it shall not be subject to the stay entered in that matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/30/2017. (ch, )
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Unopposed MOTION for Reconsideration re #109 Order,, or For Confirmation That GEMSA's Claims Against Ericsson (1) Will Remain in Texas And (2) Are Presently Stayed. ORDERED that GEMSAs claims against Ericsson are SEVEREDfrom 2:17-cv-00076-RWS-RSP into 2:16-cv-00618-RWS-RSP, will not be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia, and are STAYED pending resolution of the transferred GEMSA v. Amazon case (i.e., 2:17-cv-00076-RWS-RSP) and Amazons declaratory judgment action in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia (E.D. Va. Case No. 3:16-cv-619). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/26/2017. (ch, )
January 26, 2017 Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION for Reconsideration re #109 Order,, or For Confirmation That GEMSA's Claims Against Ericsson (1) Will Remain in Texas And (2) Are Presently Stayed by Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re #16 Opposed MOTION to Stay and Notice of Joinder in Amazon's Motion to Stay filed by Ericsson Inc., #10 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer Claims Against Amazon Web Services, Inc. and VADATA, Inc. Under the First-To-File Rule and to Stay Claims Against Customer Defendant Ericsson, Inc. Pending Resolution of the First-Filed Acti filed by Vadata, Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/24/2017. (nkl, )
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER finding as moot #22 Motion for Hearing in light of Memorandum Order #107 granting Motions #10 and #16 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/25/2017. (rsp3, )
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/24/2017. (nkl, )
January 25, 2017 The severed case number 2:17-cv-00076-RWS-RSP. The following Docket Nos. was added to the severed case 1, 8, 10, 11, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 23, 107 and 109. (nkl, )
January 24, 2017 Filing 106 MOTION to Stay by Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Nimbus Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mann, James)
January 24, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brett Nelson Watkins on behalf of Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Nimbus Development, Inc. (Watkins, Brett)
January 24, 2017 Filing 104 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carey Richard Ramos on behalf of Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Nimbus Development, Inc. (Ramos, Carey)
January 24, 2017 Filing 103 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Stuart Gerchick on behalf of Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Nimbus Development, Inc. (Gerchick, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2017 Filing 102 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd. (Thompson, Gregory)
January 24, 2017 Filing 101 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Mark Mann on behalf of Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd. (Mann, James)
January 19, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Farrah Reynolds on behalf of Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (d/b/a Ticketmaster, Inc.). Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6119162. (Reynolds, Farrah)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/19/2017. (ch, )
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/19/2017. (ch, )
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/19/2017. (ch, )
January 17, 2017 Filing 96 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #93 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order on Electronically Stored Information .. (Ramey, William)
January 17, 2017 Filing 95 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #92 Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery Order.. (Ramey, William)
January 17, 2017 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Protective Order and Discovery Order by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
January 17, 2017 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order on Electronically Stored Information by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
January 17, 2017 Filing 92 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Extension of Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/10/2017. (nkl, )
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #88 Motion for Extension of Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/10/2017. (nkl, )
January 6, 2017 Filing 89 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadline re #41 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by ALE USA Inc. dba Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., AdRoll, Inc., Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Artek Surfin Chemicals, Ltd. (d/b/a Galata Chemicals, LLC), Ericsson Inc., General Electric Company, Hitachi America, Ltd.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv636), Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (d/b/a Ticketmaster, Inc.), McGraw Hill Financial, Inc. (d/b/a S&P Global and S&P Capital IQ), Nasdaq, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Nimbus Development, Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc., SAP America, Inc., Siemens Corporation, Spotify USA, Inc., The Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., TicketLeap, Inc., Uber Technologies, Inc., Ubisoft Studio, Inc. (d/b/a Ubisoft), Vadata, Inc., Zillow Group, Inc., Zillow, Inc., Zynga, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 6, 2017 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadline re #41 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by ALE USA Inc. dba Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc., AdRoll, Inc., Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd., Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Artek Surfin Chemicals, Ltd. (d/b/a Galata Chemicals, LLC), Ericsson Inc., General Electric Company, Hitachi America, Ltd.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv636), Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (d/b/a Ticketmaster, Inc.), McGraw Hill Financial, Inc. (d/b/a S&P Global and S&P Capital IQ), Nasdaq, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Nimbus Development, Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc., SAP America, Inc., Siemens Corporation, Spotify USA, Inc., The Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., TicketLeap, Inc., Uber Technologies, Inc., Ubisoft Studio, Inc. (d/b/a Ubisoft), Vadata, Inc., Zillow Group, Inc., Zillow, Inc., Zynga, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 30, 2016 Filing 87 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Philips Holding USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips N.V. for Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
December 30, 2016 Filing 86 Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc.'s ANSWER to #70 Amended Complaint, by Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc..(Yarbrough, Herbert)
December 30, 2016 Filing 85 Philips Electronics North America Corp.'s ANSWER to #70 Amended Complaint, by Philips Electronics North America Corporation.(Yarbrough, Herbert)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/27/2016. (nkl, )
December 22, 2016 Filing 83 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Mediator by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., General Electric Company, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Vadata, Inc., Zillow Group, Inc., Zillow, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re Joint Motion for Extension to File Notice of Mediator)(Shamilov, Saina)
December 22, 2016 Filing 82 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrea LaFountain on behalf of Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (d/b/a Ticketmaster, Inc.). Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6084285. (LaFountain, Andrea)
December 21, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Saina Shamilov on behalf of General Electric Company (Shamilov, Saina)
December 21, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J David Hadden on behalf of General Electric Company (Hadden, J)
December 21, 2016 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Blake Thompson on behalf of Nimbus Development, Inc. (Thompson, Gregory)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned case is hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:16-cv-00618-RWS-RSP. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/21/2016. (nkl, )
December 20, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dallas William Tharpe on behalf of Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc. (Tharpe, Dallas)
December 20, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
December 20, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel G Chung on behalf of Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc. (Chung, Daniel)
December 20, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank A DeCosta, III on behalf of Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc. (DeCosta, Frank)
December 19, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 12/19/16. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the magistrate judge. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts proposed docket control order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders by January 9, 2017. The parties were also instructed to submit the name of an agreed mediator within 3 days. (bga, )
December 19, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Christopher Lang on behalf of Ubisoft Studio, Inc. (d/b/a Ubisoft) (Lang, Mark)
December 19, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric A Buresh on behalf of Ubisoft Studio, Inc. (d/b/a Ubisoft) (Buresh, Eric)
December 16, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lealon LeCorte Martin on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (Martin, Lealon)
December 16, 2016 Filing 70 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Philips Healthcare Infomatics Inc., Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc., filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ramey, William)
December 16, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of ALE USA Inc. dba Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
December 16, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dallas William Tharpe on behalf of Philips, Inc. (Tharpe, Dallas)
December 15, 2016 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Philips, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Philips Holding USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips N.V. for Philips, Inc.. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #64 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint to change the Defendants name from Johnson & Johnson USA, Inc. to Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/15/2016. (nkl, )
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kfir B Levy; Tiffany A Miller; Jamie B Beaber and James A Fussell, III terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/15/2016. (nkl, )
December 15, 2016 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint to Correct the Name of Defendant Johnson & Johnson USA, Inc. by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A Plfs 2nd Am Complaint, #3 Exhibit Complaint Ex A, #4 Exhibit Complaint Ex B)(Ramey, William)
December 13, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Zynga, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
December 13, 2016 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Hitachi America, Ltd.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv636). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaber, Jamie)
December 13, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Ubisoft Studio, Inc. (d/b/a Ubisoft) (Smith, Melissa)
December 13, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (d/b/a Ticketmaster, Inc.) (Smith, Melissa)
December 13, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Edward Poirot on behalf of Hitachi America, Ltd.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv636) (Poirot, Paul)
December 7, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Hitachi America, Ltd.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv636) (Heartfield, J)
December 7, 2016 Filing 57 ANSWER to #54 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd..(Ramey, William)
November 18, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sonali D Maitra on behalf of AdRoll, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Spotify USA, Inc., Zynga, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6037995. (Maitra, Sonali)
November 18, 2016 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
November 17, 2016 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uber Technologies, Inc. (Basso, Bryan)
November 17, 2016 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint [Answer to First Amended Complaint (consolidated from 2:16-cv-631)], COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Basso, Bryan)
November 15, 2016 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany A Miller on behalf of Hitachi America, Ltd.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv636) (Miller, Tiffany)
November 15, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kfir B Levy on behalf of Hitachi America, Ltd.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv636) (Levy, Kfir)
November 15, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamie B Beaber on behalf of Hitachi America, Ltd.(Consolidated Civil Action 2:16cv636) (Beaber, Jamie)
November 15, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam R Shartzer on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (Shartzer, Adam)
November 15, 2016 Filing 49 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Netflix, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
November 15, 2016 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Netflix, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
November 15, 2016 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint [Answer to First Amended Complaint (Consolidated from 2:16-cv-633)] by Netflix, Inc..(Doan, Jennifer)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael David Hatcher terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/14/16. (mrm, )
November 14, 2016 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
November 10, 2016 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Zillow Group, Inc., Zillow, Inc. (Hadden, J)
November 10, 2016 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint - First Amended Complaint (Consolidated from 2:16-cv-00637) by Zillow Group, Inc., Zillow, Inc..(Hadden, J)
November 10, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. re Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative,Transfer Claims Against Amazon Web Services, Inc. and VADATA, Inc. Under the First-to-File Rule and to Stay Claims Against Customer Defendant Johnson & Johnson USA, Inc. Pending Resolution of the First-Filed Action in the Eastern District of Virginia (Shamilov, Saina)
November 10, 2016 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Johnson & Johnson USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Withdraw of Michael D. Hatcher as Counsel)(Hatcher, Michael)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2016 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/9/2016. (nkl, )
October 31, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank A DeCosta, III on behalf of Philips, Inc. (DeCosta, Frank)
October 28, 2016 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Hadden, J)
October 27, 2016 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TicketLeap, Inc. (Rzonca, Lynn)
October 27, 2016 Filing 37 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TicketLeap, Inc.. (Rzonca, Lynn)
October 27, 2016 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint (Consolidated from 2:16-cv-00624) by TicketLeap, Inc..(Rzonca, Lynn)
October 27, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Zillow Group, Inc. to 11/11/2016; Zillow, Inc. to 11/11/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 26, 2016 Filing 35 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Zillow Group, Inc., Zillow, Inc..( Doan, Jennifer)
October 26, 2016 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint - First Amended Complaint (Consolidated from 2:16-cv-00619) by Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc..(Hadden, J)
October 25, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Randall Roeser on behalf of AdRoll, Inc., Artek Surfin Chemicals, Ltd. (d/b/a Galata Chemicals, LLC), Nasdaq, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Spotify USA, Inc., The Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Zynga, Inc. (Roeser, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Netflix, Inc. to 11/15/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 24, 2016 Filing 32 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Netflix, Inc..( Doan, Jennifer)
October 20, 2016 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer Claims Against Amazon Web Services, Inc. and VADATA, Inc. Under the First-To-File Rule and to Stay Claims Against Customer Defendant Ericsson, Inc. Pending Resolution of the First-Filed Acti (Reply ISO Dkt 18 in 2:16-cv-00631-RWS-RSP) filed by Uber Technologies, Inc.. (Basso, Bryan)
October 20, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan K Basso on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (Basso, Bryan)
October 20, 2016 Filing 29 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Uber Technologies, Inc..( Petersen, Emily)
October 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Uber Technologies, Inc. to 11/17/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 17, 2016 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Original Answer to Defendant Hitachi America, Ltd.'s Counterclaim by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd..(Ramey, William)
October 13, 2016 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd's Original Answer to Defendant Alcatel-Lucent, Inc.'s Counterclaim by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd..(Ramey, William)
October 12, 2016 Filing 26 NOTICE by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc. of Supplemental Authority In Support of Motions to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer Claims Against Amazon Web Services, Inc. and Vadata, Inc. Under the First-To-File Rule and to Stay Claims Against Customer Defendants Pending Resolution of the First-Filed Action in the Eastern District of Virginia (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shamilov, Saina)
October 6, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel G Chung on behalf of Philips, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5973515. (Chung, Daniel)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:16-cv-00618. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/05/2016. (nkl, )
October 3, 2016 Filing 23 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #16 Opposed MOTION to Stay and Notice of Joinder in Amazon's Motion to Stay filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Ramey, William)
September 30, 2016 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing re #10 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer Claims Against Amazon Web Services, Inc. and VADATA, Inc. Under the First-To-File Rule and to Stay Claims Against Customer Defendant Ericsson, Inc. Pending Resolution of the First-Filed Acti on in the Eastern District of Virginia by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Hadden, J) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2016: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
September 23, 2016 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Support re #16 Opposed MOTION to Stay and Notice of Joinder in Amazon's Motion to Stay filed by Ericsson Inc.. (Callahan, Steven)
September 13, 2016 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 Opposed MOTION to Stay and Notice of Joinder in Amazon's Motion to Stay filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Ramey Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1)(Ramey, William)
September 12, 2016 Filing 19 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #10 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer Claims Against Amazon Web Services, Inc. and VADATA, Inc. Under the First-To-File Rule and to Stay Claims Against Customer Defendant Ericsson, Inc. Pending Resolution of the First-Filed Acti filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Ramey, William)
September 7, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. Certificate of Interested Persons (Ramey, William)
September 1, 2016 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer Claims Against Amazon Web Services, Inc. and VADATA, Inc. Under the First-To-File Rule and to Stay Claims Against Customer Defendant Ericsson, Inc. Pending Resolution of the First-Filed Acti filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ravi Ranganath ISO Reply, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Hadden, J)
August 31, 2016 Filing 16 Opposed MOTION to Stay and Notice of Joinder in Amazon's Motion to Stay by Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration of Steven Callahan), #2 Exhibit A (PACER Search Results), #3 Exhibit B (Amazon's Declaratory Judgment Complaint), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven)
August 25, 2016 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Ericsson Holding II Inc. and Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson as parent corporations filed by Ericsson Inc. (Callahan, Steven)
August 25, 2016 Filing 14 Defendant Ericsson Inc.'s ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint, by Ericsson Inc..(Callahan, Steven)
August 22, 2016 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer Claims Against Amazon Web Services, Inc. and VADATA, Inc. Under the First-To-File Rule and to Stay Claims Against Customer Defendant Ericsson, Inc. Pending Resolution of the First-Filed Acti filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dec. of Ramey, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, Witness List, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, Sales Records, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, Invalidity Contentions, Patent 1st Page, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4, Invalidity Contentions, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5, '400 Patent, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6, '677 Patents, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ramey, William)
August 5, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. Notice of Related Cases (Ramey, William)
August 4, 2016 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc. (Hadden, J)
August 4, 2016 Filing 10 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer Claims Against Amazon Web Services, Inc. and VADATA, Inc. Under the First-To-File Rule and to Stay Claims Against Customer Defendant Ericsson, Inc. Pending Resolution of the First-Filed Action in the Eastern District of Virginia by Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ravi Ranganath in Support of Motion to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, Transfer Claims, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Or, In the Alternative, Transfer Claims)(Hadden, J)
August 3, 2016 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Amazon Web Services, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company, Vadata, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Amazon Web Services Inc)(nkl, )
July 27, 2016 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Ericsson Inc., Amazon Web Services, Inc., Vadata, Inc., filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ramey, William)
July 15, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Matthew Garza on behalf of Ericsson Inc. (Garza, Anthony)
July 15, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Chase Callahan on behalf of Ericsson Inc. (Callahan, Steven)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ericsson Inc.( Callahan, Steven)
July 15, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ericsson Inc. to 8/25/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 23, 2016 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William)
June 21, 2016 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Ericsson, Inc.. (nkl, )
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/14/2016. (ch, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/14/2016) (ch, ).
June 14, 2016 Filing 1 Original COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand against Ericsson, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5786555.), filed by Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Form AO 120)(Ramey, William)
June 14, 2016 Case assigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (ch, )
June 14, 2016 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd. v. Ericsson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Equity Management (SA) Pty. Ltd.
Represented By: William P Ramey, III
Represented By: Edward L Rothberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Represented By: J David Hadden
Represented By: Saina Shamilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ericsson Inc.
Represented By: Steven Chase Callahan
Represented By: Anthony Matthew Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vadata, Inc.
Represented By: J David Hadden
Represented By: Saina Shamilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Healthcare Infomatics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Healthcare Informatics Inc.
Represented By: Frank A DeCosta, III
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Represented By: Daniel G Chung
Represented By: Dallas William Tharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Represented By: J David Hadden
Represented By: Saina Shamilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Alibaba Group Holding, Ltd.
Represented By: Brett Nelson Watkins
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Carey Richard Ramos
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Gerchick
Represented By: Gregory Blake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Artek Surfin Chemicals, Ltd. (d/b/a Galata Chemicals, LLC)
Represented By: Jeffrey Randall Roeser
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Ubisoft Studio, Inc. (d/b/a Ubisoft)
Represented By: Mark Christopher Lang
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Eric Allan Buresh
Represented By: Michelle Lyons Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Johnson & Johnson USA, Inc.
Represented By: Michael David Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ALE USA Inc. dba Alcatel-Lucent Enterprise USA Inc.
Represented By: Greg Harlan Parker
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Noorossadat Torabi
Represented By: Emily Nicole Petersen
Represented By: Katherine K. Vidal
Represented By: Adam R Shartzer
Represented By: Lealon LeCorte Martin
Represented By: Bryan K Basso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Siemens Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Alibaba Cloud Computing, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Sonali D Maitra
Represented By: James Shrin Tsuei
Represented By: Laura E Miller
Represented By: Jeffrey Randall Roeser
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Philips, Inc.
Represented By: Frank A DeCosta, III
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Represented By: Daniel G Chung
Represented By: Dallas William Tharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Hitachi, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Spotify USA, Inc.
Represented By: Sonali D Maitra
Represented By: James Shrin Tsuei
Represented By: Laura E Miller
Represented By: Jeffrey Randall Roeser
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Nasdaq, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Randall Roeser
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Zynga, Inc.
Represented By: Sonali D Maitra
Represented By: James Shrin Tsuei
Represented By: Laura E Miller
Represented By: Brent Douglas McCabe
Represented By: Jeffrey Randall Roeser
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: J David Hadden
Represented By: Jeffrey A Andrews
Represented By: Saina Shamilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: McGraw Hill Financial, Inc. (d/b/a S&P Global and S&P Capital IQ)
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Hui Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Randall Roeser
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: SAP America, Inc.
Represented By: J David Hadden
Represented By: Saina Shamilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Zillow, Inc.
Represented By: J David Hadden
Represented By: Saina Shamilov
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: J David Hadden
Represented By: Saina Shamilov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Hitachi America, Ltd.
Represented By: Kfir B Levy
Represented By: James A Fussell, III
Represented By: Tiffany A Miller
Represented By: Jamie B Beaber
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Paul Edward Poirot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Ticketleap.com, LLC
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: TicketLeap, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Eileen Rzonca
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. (d/b/a Ticketmaster, Inc.)
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Farrah Reynolds
Represented By: Ryan K Yagura
Represented By: Andrea LaFountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Zillow Group, Inc.
Represented By: J David Hadden
Represented By: Saina Shamilov
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Nimbus Development, Inc.
Represented By: Brett Nelson Watkins
Represented By: James Mark Mann
Represented By: Carey Richard Ramos
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Gerchick
Represented By: Gregory Blake Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: AdRoll, Inc.
Represented By: Sonali D Maitra
Represented By: James Shrin Tsuei
Represented By: Laura E Miller
Represented By: Jeffrey Randall Roeser
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ramey & Schwaller, LLP
Represented By: William P Ramey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?