Alacritech Inc. v. CenturyLink, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alacritech Inc.
Defendant: CenturyLink, Inc.
Consol_plaintiff: Alacritech Inc.
Consol_defendant: Wistron Corporation, Wiwynn Corporation, SMS Infocomm Corporation and Dell Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00693
Filed: June 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Denying without prejudice 339 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/22/2017. (ch, )
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/21/2017. (nkl, )
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - denying 59 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/19/2017. (ch, )
August 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 184 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Serve Amended Infringement Contentions and File Amended Complaint Against Defendants Wistron Corporation and Wiwynn Corporation filed by Alacritech Inc... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/20/2017. (nkl, )
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - granting in part 259 Motion to Strike a Portion ofAlacritechs Patent Rule 3-1 Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/14/2017. (ch, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alacritech Inc. v. CenturyLink, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alacritech Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan G Graves
Represented By: Phillip Edward Morton
Represented By: Frank V Pietrantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Alacritech Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Wistron Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Wiwynn Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: SMS Infocomm Corporation
Represented By: Ravinder Singh Deol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: David M Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?