Sanderson v. Tyler Motor Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mark Sanderson
Defendant: Tyler Motor Company, Inc.
Undetermined: William Joseph Cornelius
Case Number: 2:2018cv00294
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Amended Pleadings due by 12/6/2018. Discovery due by 11/29/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 10/4/2018. Jury Selection set for 3/4/2019 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation Completion due by 12/20/2018. Motions in Limine due by 1/31/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/7/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/10/2018. (nkl, )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/10/2018. (nkl, )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/10/2018. (nkl, )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. William Cornelius is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/10/2018. (nkl, )
September 7, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 9/7/2018 in chambers with no recording. Bob Whitehurst present for plaintiff. Robert Fielder present for defendant. Proposed deadlines for Docket Control Order and Discovery Order discussed. Standard protective order requested. Bill Cornelius appointed as Mediator. (bga, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Tyler Motor Company, Inc.. (Fielder, Robert)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY - Scheduling Conference set for 9/7/2018 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/6/2018. (nkl, )
August 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Mark Sanderson (Whitehurst, Harry)
August 3, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tyler Motor Company, Inc. (Fielder, Robert)
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Tyler Motor Company, Inc..(Fielder, Robert)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/19/2018. (nkl, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tyler Motor Company, Inc., filed by Mark Sanderson.(Whitehurst, Harry)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Tyler Motor Company, Inc.. (ch, )
July 18, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 18, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tyler Motor Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6859051.), filed by Mark Sanderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehurst, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanderson v. Tyler Motor Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Lynn Fielder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Sanderson
Represented By: Harry Bob Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: William Joseph Cornelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?