McNews Produce, Co. v. Heart of Texas Produce, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: McNews Produce, Co.
Defendant: Heart of Texas Produce, Inc. and Harold Ray Knight
Case Number: 2:2018cv00348
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Anderson
0 Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
1 Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McNews Produce, Co.. Heart of Texas Produce, Inc. served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/8/2018. (Phenix, John)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by McNews Produce, Co.. Harold Ray Knight served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Phenix, John)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Heart of Texas Produce, Inc. Registered Agent for Service: HAROLD KNTGHT. (nkl, )
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/13/2018. (nkl, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Heart of Texas Produce, Inc. Registered Agent for Service: Harold Knight, Harold Ray Knight. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) HEART oF TEXAS PRODUCE, lNC.)(nkl, )
August 8, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
August 8, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heart of Texas Produce, Inc., Harold Ray Knight ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6889127.), filed by McNews Produce Company.(Phenix, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (nkl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNews Produce, Co. v. Heart of Texas Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heart of Texas Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Ray Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McNews Produce, Co.
Represented By: John Russell Phenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?