GARTEISER HONEA, P.C. et al v. Moskowitz et al
Plaintiff: GARTEISER HONEA, P.C. and GARTEISER HONEA, PLLC
Defendant: WISTARIA TRADING, INC., Scott Moskowitz, Blue Spike, LLC, Blue Spike, Inc. and BLUE SPIKE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2018cv00372
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/18/2018. (ch, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by BLUE SPIKE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED COMPANY, Blue Spike, Inc., Blue Spike, LLC, Scott Moskowitz, WISTARIA TRADING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnston, Coyt)
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by GARTEISER HONEA, P.C., GARTEISER HONEA, PLLC (Garteiser, Randall)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BLUE SPIKE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED COMPANY, Blue Spike, Inc., Blue Spike, LLC, Scott Moskowitz, WISTARIA TRADING, INC., filed by GARTEISER HONEA, P.C., GARTEISER HONEA, PLLC.(Garteiser, Randall)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Brief in Support by BLUE SPIKE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED COMPANY, Blue Spike, Inc., Blue Spike, LLC, Scott Moskowitz, WISTARIA TRADING, INC.. (Tobey, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GARTEISER HONEA, P.C., GARTEISER HONEA, PLLC. WISTARIA TRADING, INC. served on 9/8/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Garteiser, Randall)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GARTEISER HONEA, P.C., GARTEISER HONEA, PLLC. Scott Moskowitz served on 9/8/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Garteiser, Randall)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GARTEISER HONEA, P.C., GARTEISER HONEA, PLLC. BLUE SPIKE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED COMPANY served on 9/8/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Garteiser, Randall)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GARTEISER HONEA, P.C., GARTEISER HONEA, PLLC. Blue Spike, Inc. served on 9/8/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Garteiser, Randall)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GARTEISER HONEA, P.C., GARTEISER HONEA, PLLC. Blue Spike, Inc. served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Garteiser, Randall)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GARTEISER HONEA, P.C., GARTEISER HONEA, PLLC. Blue Spike, LLC served on 9/8/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Garteiser, Randall)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GARTEISER HONEA, P.C., GARTEISER HONEA, PLLC. Blue Spike, LLC served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Garteiser, Randall)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Blue Spike, Inc. c/o CT Corporation System, Blue Spike, LLC c/o CT Corporation System, WISTARIA TRADING, INC. c/o Scott Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Blue Spike LLC, #2 Summons(es) Blue Spike, Inc.)(nkl, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to BLUE SPIKE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED COMPANY, Blue Spike, Inc., Blue Spike, LLC, Scott Moskowitz, WISTARIA TRADING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es))(ch, )
August 27, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
August 27, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BLUE SPIKE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED COMPANY, Blue Spike, Inc., Blue Spike, LLC, Scott Moskowitz, WISTARIA TRADING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6914636.), filed by GARTEISER HONEA, P.C., GARTEISER HONEA, PLLC.(Garteiser, Randall) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2018: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ch, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARTEISER HONEA, P.C. et al v. Moskowitz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WISTARIA TRADING, INC.
Represented By: Robert L Tobey
Represented By: Coyt Randal Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Moskowitz
Represented By: Robert L Tobey
Represented By: Coyt Randal Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Spike, LLC
Represented By: Robert L Tobey
Represented By: Coyt Randal Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Spike, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L Tobey
Represented By: Coyt Randal Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE SPIKE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED COMPANY
Represented By: Robert L Tobey
Represented By: Coyt Randal Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARTEISER HONEA, P.C.
Represented By: Randall T Garteiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARTEISER HONEA, PLLC
Represented By: Randall T Garteiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?