Johnson v. TSPC-TX, LLC dba Thrive Skilled Pediatric Care

Plaintiff: Wendy Johnson
Defendant: TSPC-TX, LLC dba Thrive Skilled Pediatric Care
Case Number: 2:2018cv00388
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
1 Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ethan J Davis on behalf of TSPC-TX, LLC dba Thrive Skilled Pediatric Care (Davis, Ethan)
October 24, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/6/2018 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/24/2018. (nkl, )
October 4, 2018 8 NOTICE by Wendy Johnson Certificate of Interested Parties (Hommel, William)
October 4, 2018 7 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Wendy Johnson (Hommel, William)
October 2, 2018 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TSPC-TX, LLC dba Thrive Skilled Pediatric Care (Parker, Talley)
October 2, 2018 5 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint by TSPC-TX, LLC dba Thrive Skilled Pediatric Care.(Parker, Talley)
September 21, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/21/2018. (nkl, )
September 19, 2018 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wendy Johnson. TSPC-TX, LLC dba Thrive Skilled Pediatric Care served on 9/11/2018, answer due 10/2/2018. (mjc, )
September 7, 2018 2 SUMMONS Issued as to TSPC-TX, LLC dba Thrive Skilled Pediatric Care CT Corporation System. (nkl, )
September 7, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
September 7, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against TSPC-TX, LLC dba Thrive Skilled Pediatric Care ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6932539.), filed by Wendy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hommel, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. TSPC-TX, LLC dba Thrive Skilled Pediatric Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Johnson
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSPC-TX, LLC dba Thrive Skilled Pediatric Care
Represented By: Talley Ray Parker
Represented By: Ethan J Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?