Pendley v. Schultz

Plaintiff: Susan Pendley
Defendant: Larna Schultz
Case Number: 2:2018cv00517
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Defendant Larna Schultz's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Larna Schultz.(Balido, Carlos)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan Pendley. Larna Schultz served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. (Satterwhite, Micah)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Larna Schultz. (ch, )
November 21, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT w/ Request for Summons against Larna Schultz, filed by Susan Pendley. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Request for Summons)(Satterwhite, Micah)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Larna Schultz ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7034147.), filed by Susan Pendley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Satterwhite, Micah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendley v. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larna Schultz
Represented By: Carlos Alberto Balido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Pendley
Represented By: Micah Lynn Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?