Mathis et al v. Educare Community Living Corp.-Texas et al

Plaintiff: Dontrail Mathis, Dontraus Jenkins, Ramona James, Leslie Morgan, Chelsea Williams and Rashawnda Green
Defendant: Res-Care, Inc., Educare Community Living Corp.-Texas and Educare Community Living Limited Partnership
Case Number: 2:2018cv00518
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Educare Community Living Corp.-Texas, Educare Community Living Limited Partnership, Res-Care, Inc. (Jansonius, John)
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Educare Community Living Corp.-Texas, Educare Community Living Limited Partnership, Res-Care, Inc..(Jansonius, John)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Rashawnda Green, Ramona James, Dontraus Jenkins, Dontrail Mathis, Leslie Morgan, Chelsea Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent to Join Collective Action)(White, Alexander)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Rashawnda Green, Ramona James, Dontraus Jenkins, Dontrail Mathis, Leslie Morgan, Chelsea Williams to join collective action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(White, Alexander)
January 14, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE RE-FILE USING THE CORRECT FORMAT Document # 13, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 ***FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE by Leslie Morgan of consent to join collective action (White, Alexander) Modified on 1/14/2019 (ch, ).
December 17, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER THE WRONG EVENT Document # 11, Motion for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
December 17, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR WRONG EVENT WAS USED***Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Res-Care, Inc. to 1/21/2019; Educare Community Living Corp.-Texas to 1/21/2019; Educare Community Living Limited Partnership to 1/21/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) Modified on 12/17/2018 (ch, ).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/17/2018. (ch, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Educare Community Living Corp.-Texas, Educare Community Living Limited Partnership, Res-Care, Inc.. (Jansonius, John) Modified on 12/17/2018 (ch, ). Modified on 12/17/2018 (ch, ).
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert Barravecchio on behalf of Ramona James, Dontraus Jenkins, Dontrail Mathis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7065754. (Barravecchio, Robert)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James Vagnini on behalf of Ramona James, Dontraus Jenkins, Dontrail Mathis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7057670. (Vagnini, James)
December 11, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Notice submitted document #7 #8 does not reflect the signing attorney or pro se party's signature s required by Local Rule CV-5(a)(5). Please re-file in the correct notice format. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT NOTICE by Chelsea Williams to become party plaintiff (White, Alexander) Modified on 12/11/2018 (nkl, ).
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT NOTICE by Rashawnda Green to become party plaintiff (White, Alexander) Modified on 12/11/2018 (nkl, ).
December 10, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR - the attorney appearing in the case should use their user id and password to appear in case. Document # 6, NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alexander M. White on behalf of Ramona James, Dontraus Jenkins, Dontrail Mathis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7056214. (White, Alexander) Modified on 12/10/2018 (nkl, ).
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alexander M. White on behalf of Ramona James, Dontraus Jenkins, Dontrail Mathis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7056120. (White, Alexander)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dontrail Mathis, Ramona James, Dontraus Jenkins. Educare Community Living Corp.-Texas served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Ellwanger, Jay)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dontrail Mathis, Ramona James, Dontraus Jenkins. Educare Community Living Limited Partnership served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Ellwanger, Jay)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Educare Community Living Corp.-Texas c/o C T Corporation System, Educare Community Living Limited Partnership c/o C T Corporation System, Res-Care, Inc. c/o C T Corporation System. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Educare Community Living Limited Partnership, #2 Summons(es) Res-Care, Inc.)(nkl, )
November 21, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
November 21, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Educare Community Living Corp.-Texas, Educare Community Living Limited Partnership, Res-Care, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7035243.), filed by Dontrail Mathis, Ramona James, Dontraus Jenkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellwanger, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis et al v. Educare Community Living Corp.-Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontrail Mathis
Represented By: Jay D Ellwanger
Represented By: Robert Barravecchio
Represented By: James Vagnini
Represented By: Alexander M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dontraus Jenkins
Represented By: Jay D Ellwanger
Represented By: Robert Barravecchio
Represented By: James Vagnini
Represented By: Alexander M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona James
Represented By: Jay D Ellwanger
Represented By: Robert Barravecchio
Represented By: James Vagnini
Represented By: Alexander M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashawnda Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Res-Care, Inc.
Represented By: John V Jansonius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educare Community Living Corp.-Texas
Represented By: John V Jansonius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educare Community Living Limited Partnership
Represented By: John V Jansonius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?