Sol IP, LLC v. AT&T Mobility LLC
Plaintiff: Sol IP, LLC
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Petitioner: Ericsson, Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: Sprint Corporation, Verizon Communications Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Sprint Communications Company L.P. and Sprint Solutions, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: David Folsom, Daniel Weinstein, David Keyzer and Scott Woloson
Case Number: 2:2018cv00526
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Roy S Payne
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 176 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (table))(Shih, Daniel)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER - Court hereby appoints David Keyzer and Scott Woloson as the Courts technical advisors in this case. David Keyzer will serve as the technical advisor for the LTE patents, and Scott Woloson will serve as the technical advisor for the Wi-Fi patents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/11/2019. (ch, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 174 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rocco Filippo Nicola Magni on behalf of Sol IP, LLC (Magni, Rocco)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER re #150 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS filed by Ericsson, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/9/2019. (nkl, )
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #169 Motion to Substitute and Issue Letter of Request to France Concerning ETSI. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/6/2019. (nkl, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah L Segal on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Segal, Sarah)
September 5, 2019 Filing 170 NOTICE by Sol IP, LLC re #150 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS (JOINT NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT) (Tribble, Max)
September 4, 2019 Filing 169 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute and Issue Letter of Request to France Concerning ETSI by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Finkelson, David)
September 4, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearings Proceedings held on 08/26/2019 before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tammy Goolsby, CSR. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Motion to Redact due 9/25/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2019. (klc, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 167 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Status Conference held on 8/27/2019. (Court Reporter Tammy Goolsby.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (bga, )
August 27, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #145 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL SOL IP TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS : Motion Hearing RESET for 10/2/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. *Note that only the TIME has changed*(bga, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 166 REPLY to Response to Motion re #150 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Barton, Ross)
August 22, 2019 Filing 165 REDACTION to #164 Sealed Response to Motion by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Daniel J. Shih, #3 Exhibit A)(Shih, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 164 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #150 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS filed by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Daniel J. Shih, #3 Exhibit A)(Shih, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #155 Motion for Issuance of Letter of Request to the Central Authority of France to Obtain Evidence from the European Telecommunications Standards Institute (nkl, )
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #154 Motion for Issuance of Letter of Request to the Central Authority of France to Obtain Evidence from the 3rd Generation Partnership Project. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/22/2019. (nkl, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 161 REDACTION to #159 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion by Sol IP, LLC. (Shih, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sol IP, LLC re P.R. 4-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 20, 2019 Filing 159 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #132 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING filed by Sol IP, LLC. (Shih, Daniel)
August 19, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference RESET back to original date of 8/26/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne at the request of Defendant's counsel.(bga, )
August 19, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference RESET for 10/2/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
August 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #145 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL SOL IP TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/18/2019. (ch, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 157 Joint MOTION to Continue the Hearing on Motion to Compel (dkt 145) and Adjourn Plaintiff's Response Deadline by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
August 15, 2019 Filing 156 REDACTION to #153 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Stevenson, Theodore)
August 14, 2019 Filing 155 Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letter of Request to the Central Authority of France to Obtain Evidence from the European Telecommunications Standards Institute by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Finkelson, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 154 Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letter of Request to the Central Authority of France to Obtain Evidence from the 3rd Generation Partnership Project by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Finkelson, David)
August 13, 2019 Filing 153 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #132 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson, Inc., Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Stevenson, Theodore)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER re #145 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL SOL IP TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS filed by Ericsson, Inc., #150 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS filed by Ericsson, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/13/2019. (nkl, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Clutter, Patrick)
August 12, 2019 Filing 150 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc., Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., and Sprint Spectrum L.P., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Docket Control Order, #2 Proposed Order Focusing Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs)(Stevenson, Theodore) Modified on 8/13/2019 (nkl, ).
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #140 Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/2/2019. (nkl, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 148 REDACTION to #146 Sealed Response to Motion by Sol IP, LLC. (Shih, Daniel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 147 REDACTION to #145 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL SOL IP TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS by Ericsson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
August 6, 2019 Filing 146 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #132 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING filed by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shih, Daniel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 145 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL SOL IP TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS by Ericsson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erik B. Fountain, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #141 Motion to Amend/Correct for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/1/2019. (nkl, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-1 (Barton, Ross)
July 31, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sol IP, LLC re P.R. 4-1 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 31, 2019 Filing 141 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Ericsson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 31, 2019 Filing 140 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting #138 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #132 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING Responses due by 8/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/25/2019. (nkl, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 138 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #132 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shih, Daniel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Barton, Ross)
July 19, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Maninger on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Maninger, Laura)
July 19, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Wayne Breedlove on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Breedlove, Scott)
July 19, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edgar Leon Carter on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Carter, Edgar)
July 19, 2019 Filing 133 REDACTION to #132 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Rosenthal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 16, 2019 Filing 132 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Rosenthal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 E-DISCOVERY ORDER granting #130 Motion FOR ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/3/2019. (nkl, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 130 Joint MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY by AT&T Mobility LLC, Ericsson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re #105 Defendants Objections to the Protective Orderfiled by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/29/2019. (nkl, )
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #123 Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendant AT&T Mobility LLCs Supplemental Brief in Support of Objections to Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/19/2019. (nkl, )
April 19, 2019 Filing 127 Sol IP, LLC's ANSWER to #120 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Ericsson, Inc. by Sol IP, LLC.(Tribble, Max)
April 19, 2019 Filing 126 Sol IP, LLC's ANSWER to #119 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Ericsson, Inc. by Sol IP, LLC.(Tribble, Max)
April 19, 2019 Filing 125 Sol IP, LLC's ANSWER to #118 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Ericsson, Inc. by Sol IP, LLC.(Tribble, Max)
April 18, 2019 Filing 124 RESPONSE to #115 Notice (Other) regarding Sol IP, LLCs Response to Defendant AT&T Mobility LLCs Supplemental Brief in Support of Objections to Docket Control Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) filed by Sol IP, LLC. (Tribble, Max)
April 18, 2019 Filing 123 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant AT&T Mobility LLCs Supplemental Brief in Support of Objections to Docket Control Order by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
April 10, 2019 Filing 122 RESPONSE to #105 Response to Non-Motion Sol IP, LLC'S Response To AT&T Mobility LLC's Objections To Protective Order [D.I. 96] Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(A) [D.I. 105] filed by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoek, Kathryn)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #114 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/5/2019. (nkl, )
April 5, 2019 Filing 120 ANSWER to #102 Amended Complaint,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Sol IP, LLC by Ericsson, Inc..(Stevenson, Theodore)
April 5, 2019 Filing 119 ANSWER to #101 Amended Complaint,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Sol IP, LLC by Ericsson, Inc..(Stevenson, Theodore)
April 5, 2019 Filing 118 ANSWER to #100 Amended Complaint,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Sol IP, LLC by Ericsson, Inc..(Stevenson, Theodore)
April 5, 2019 Filing 117 ANSWER to #102 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless.(Barton, Ross)
April 5, 2019 Filing 116 ANSWER to #101 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Daly, Andriana)
April 4, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC re #98 Response to Non-Motion SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (Stevenson, Theodore)
April 4, 2019 Filing 114 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS OBJECTIONS TO DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
April 4, 2019 Filing 113 ANSWER to #100 Amended Complaint,,,,, by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Stevenson, Theodore)
April 3, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Oleg Elkhunovich on behalf of Sol IP, LLC (Elkhunovich, Oleg)
April 1, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Florina Yezril on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Yezril, Florina)
March 29, 2019 Filing 110 ANSWER to #85 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Sol IP, LLC.(Tribble, Max)
March 29, 2019 Filing 109 ANSWER to #84 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Sol IP, LLC.(Tribble, Max)
March 29, 2019 Filing 108 ANSWER to #83 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Sol IP, LLC.(Tribble, Max)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/28/2019. (nkl, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shih, Daniel)
March 27, 2019 Filing 105 RESPONSE to #96 Protective Order filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 22, 2019 Filing 104 RESPONSE to #98 Response to Non-Motion Sol IP, LLC's Response to Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Objections to Docket Control Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) by Sol IP, LLC. (Tribble, Max)
March 22, 2019 Filing 103 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Form AO120)(Shih, Daniel)
March 22, 2019 Filing 102 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) against Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, filed by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Patent No. 9,603,174), #2 Exhibit 2 (U.S. Patent No. 8,761,814), #3 Exhibit 3 (U.S. Patent No. 9,155,066), #4 Exhibit 4 (U.S. Patent No. 8,270,354), #5 Exhibit 5 (U.S. Patent No. 8,311,031), #6 Exhibit 6 (U.S. Patent No. 9,496,976), #7 Exhibit 7 (U.S. Patent No. 10,080,204), #8 Exhibit 8 (U.S. Patent No. 8,320,565), #9 Exhibit 9 (U.S. Patent No. 8,320,571), #10 Exhibit 10 (U.S. Patent No. 9,144,064), #11 Exhibit 11 (U.S. Patent No. 9,204,438), #12 Exhibit 12 (U.S. Patent No. 9,888,435), #13 Exhibit 13 (U.S. Patent No. 8,320,337), #14 Exhibit 14 (U.S. Patent No. 8,971,168), #15 Exhibit 15 (U.S. Patent No. 8,593,936), #16 Exhibit 16 (U.S. Patent No. 10,075,946), #17 Exhibit 17 (U.S. Patent No. 10,009,884), #18 Exhibit 18 (U.S. Patent No. 9,265,063), #19 Exhibit 19 (U.S. Patent No. 10,057,095), #20 Exhibit 20 (U.S. Patent No. 9,432,940), #21 Exhibit 21 (U.S. Patent No. 9,634,746), #22 Exhibit 22 (U.S. Patent No. 10,090,894), #23 Exhibit 23 (U.S. Patent No. 8,654,881), #24 Exhibit 24 (U.S. Patent No. 9,900,067), #25 Exhibit 25 (U.S. Patent No. 10,045,256), #26 Exhibit 26 (U.S. Patent No. RE45,466), #27 Exhibit 27 (U.S. Patent No. 10,231,211))(Tribble, Max)
March 22, 2019 Filing 101 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) against Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., filed by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Patent No. 9,603,174), #2 Exhibit 2 (U.S. Patent No. 8,761,814), #3 Exhibit 3 (U.S. Patent No. 9,155,066), #4 Exhibit 4 (U.S. Patent No. 8,270,354), #5 Exhibit 5 (U.S. Patent No. 8,311,031), #6 Exhibit 6 (U.S. Patent No. 9,496,976), #7 Exhibit 7 (U.S. Patent No. 10,080,204), #8 Exhibit 8 (U.S. Patent No. 8,320,565), #9 Exhibit 9 (U.S. Patent No. 8,320,571), #10 Exhibit 10 (U.S. Patent No. 9,144,064), #11 Exhibit 11 (U.S. Patent No. 9,204,438), #12 Exhibit 12 (U.S. Patent No. 9,888,435), #13 Exhibit 13 (U.S. Patent No. 8,320,337), #14 Exhibit 14 (U.S. Patent No. 8,971,168), #15 Exhibit 15 (U.S. Patent No. 8,593,936), #16 Exhibit 16 (U.S. Patent No. 10,075,946), #17 Exhibit 17 (U.S. Patent No. 10,009,884), #18 Exhibit 18 (U.S. Patent No. 9,265,063), #19 Exhibit 19 (U.S. Patent No. 10,057,095), #20 Exhibit 20 (U.S. Patent No. 9,432,940), #21 Exhibit 21 (U.S. Patent No. 9,634,746), #22 Exhibit 22 (U.S. Patent No. 10,090,894), #23 Exhibit 23 (U.S. Patent No. 8,654,881), #24 Exhibit 24 (U.S. Patent No. 9,900,067), #25 Exhibit 25 (U.S. Patent No. 10,045,256), #26 Exhibit 26 (U.S. Patent No. RE45,466), #27 Exhibit 27 (U.S. Patent No. 10,231,211))(Tribble, Max)
March 22, 2019 Filing 100 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) against AT&T Mobility LLC, filed by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Patent No. 9,603,174), #2 Exhibit 2 (U.S. Patent No. 8,761,814), #3 Exhibit 3 (U.S. Patent No. 9,155,066), #4 Exhibit 4 (U.S. Patent No. 8,270,354), #5 Exhibit 5 (U.S. Patent No. 8,311,031), #6 Exhibit 6 (U.S. Patent No. 9,496,976), #7 Exhibit 7 (U.S. Patent No. 10,080,204), #8 Exhibit 8 (U.S. Patent No. 8,320,565), #9 Exhibit 9 (U.S. Patent No. 8,320,571), #10 Exhibit 10 (U.S. Patent No. 9,144,064), #11 Exhibit 11 (U.S. Patent No. 9,204,438), #12 Exhibit 12 (U.S. Patent No. 9,888,435), #13 Exhibit 13 (U.S. Patent No. 8,320,337), #14 Exhibit 14 (U.S. Patent No. 8,971,168), #15 Exhibit 15 (U.S. Patent No. 8,593,936), #16 Exhibit 16 (U.S. Patent No. 10,075,946), #17 Exhibit 17 (U.S. Patent No. 10,009,884), #18 Exhibit 18 (U.S. Patent No. 9,265,063), #19 Exhibit 19 (U.S. Patent No. 10,057,095), #20 Exhibit 20 (U.S. Patent No. 9,432,940), #21 Exhibit 21 (U.S. Patent No. 9,634,746), #22 Exhibit 22 (U.S. Patent No. 10,090,894), #23 Exhibit 23 (U.S. Patent No. 8,654,881), #24 Exhibit 24 (U.S. Patent No. 9,900,067), #25 Exhibit 25 (U.S. Patent No. 10,045,256), #26 Exhibit 26 (U.S. Patent No. RE45,466), #27 Exhibit 27 (U.S. Patent No. 10,231,211))(Tribble, Max)
March 20, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Andrea on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Andrea, Brian)
March 18, 2019 Filing 98 RESPONSE to #56 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 18, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 97, MOTION for Reconsideration. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 97 FILED IN ERROR MOTION for Reconsideration re #56 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Objections Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rosenthal, Brian) Modified on 3/18/2019 (nkl, ).
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/13/2019. (ch, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 95 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Entry of a Partially Disputed Protective Order by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
March 11, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sol IP, LLC (P.R. 3-1 & 3-2) (Shih, Daniel)
March 11, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of Sol IP, LLC (Grinstein, Joseph)
March 8, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ahtoosa Dale on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Dale, Ahtoosa)
March 8, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Travis Underwood on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Underwood, James)
March 8, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Andrew Bittner on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Bittner, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Robert Rueckheim on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Rueckheim, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Brett Johnson on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Johnson, Michael)
March 8, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M Melsheimer on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Melsheimer, Thomas)
March 8, 2019 Filing 86 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ericsson, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericcson, Corporate Parent Ericsson Holding II, Inc. for Ericsson, Inc.. (Stevenson, Theodore)
March 8, 2019 Filing 85 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, ERICSSON INC.S ANSWER IN INTERVENTION, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO SOL IPS COMPLAINT to VERIZON, COUNTERCLAIM against Sol IP, LLC by Ericsson, Inc..(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 8, 2019 Filing 84 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, ERICSSON INC.S ANSWER IN INTERVENTION, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO SOL IPS COMPLAINT to SPRINT, COUNTERCLAIM against Sol IP, LLC by Ericsson, Inc..(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 8, 2019 Filing 83 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, ERICSSON INC.S ANSWER IN INTERVENTION, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO SOL IPS COMPLAINT to AT&T, COUNTERCLAIM against Sol IP, LLC by Ericsson, Inc..(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/8/2019. (nkl, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 81 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
March 7, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Lewis Rabinowitz on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Rabinowitz, Marcus)
March 7, 2019 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Sorensen Hansen on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Hansen, Eric)
March 7, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Hess on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Hess, Kevin)
March 7, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Nathanial Powers on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Powers, Jonathan)
March 7, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren Henry Lipschitz on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Lipschitz, Warren)
March 7, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas M Mathews on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Mathews, Nicholas)
March 7, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Lee Burgess on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Burgess, Kevin)
March 7, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erik Bruce Fountain on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Fountain, Erik)
March 7, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christine Michelle Woodin on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Woodin, Christine)
March 7, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chelsea Ann Ayres Priest on behalf of Ericsson, Inc. (Priest, Chelsea)
March 6, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rudolph Fink, IV on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Fink, Rudolph)
March 6, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Daly, Andriana)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re #58 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Sol IP, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 2:18cv528) terminated., Attorney Michael Clayton Deane; M Joseph John Ravindra Fernando; David S Frist; Michael E Jones; Michael J Newton; Darlena Subashi; Nicholas Tang Tsui; Ross Ritter Barton and Lindsay Catherine Church terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/5/2019. (nkl, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re #57 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Sol IP, LLC, Sprint Corporation (Consolidated Civil Action 2:18cv527) terminated., Attorney Robert William Weber; Andriana Shultz Daly and David E Finkelson terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/5/2019. (nkl, )
March 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Barton, Ross)
March 4, 2019 Filing 65 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Barton, Ross)
March 4, 2019 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless (Barton, Ross)
March 4, 2019 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless.(Barton, Ross)
March 4, 2019 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Corporation for Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Daly, Andriana)
March 4, 2019 Filing 61 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Daly, Andriana)
March 4, 2019 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc., Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance LLC, Corporate Parent SBC Tower Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Bell South Mobile Data, Inc. for AT&T Mobility LLC. (Stevenson, Theodore)
March 4, 2019 Filing 59 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 4, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sol IP, LLC (Tribble, Max)
March 4, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sol IP, LLC (Tribble, Max)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #48 Motion Entry of a Partially Disputed Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/1/2019. (nkl, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DISCOVERY ORDER granting #49 Motion for Entry of a Partially Disputed Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/1/2019. (nkl, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/28/2019. (nkl, )
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/28/2019. (nkl, )
March 1, 2019 Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 3/14/2019. Jury Selection set for 6/15/2020 09:00AM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Markman Hearing set for 12/4/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Motions in Limine due by 4/27/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/11/2020. (nkl, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE by Sol IP, LLC of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Tribble, Max)
February 27, 2019 Filing 51 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
February 27, 2019 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Ericsson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 26, 2019 Filing 49 Joint MOTION for Entry of a Partially Disputed Discovery Order by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
February 26, 2019 Filing 48 Joint MOTION Entry of a Partially Disputed Docket Control Order by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery Order and Proposed Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/26/2019. (nkl, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Discovery Order and Proposed Docket Control Order by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
February 14, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Ashley Rosenthal on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Rosenthal, Brian)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. Daniel Weinstein (Ret.), is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case as to Defendant, AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/12/2019. (nkl, )
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Hon. David Folsom, Jackson Walker, L.L.P., 6002 Summerfield Drive, Suite B, Texarkana, Texas 75503, telephone number 903-255-3251, fax number 903-255- 3266, and email dfolsom@jw.com, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/12/2019. (ch, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. Daniel Weinstein (Ret.), filed by Sol IP, LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. David Folsom (Ret.), filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Sol IP, LLC, Verizon Communications Inc.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 8, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. David Folsom (Ret.), filed by Sol IP, LLC, Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darlena Subashi on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc. (Subashi, Darlena)
February 7, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Clayton Deane on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc. (Deane, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lindsay Catherine Church on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc. (Church, Lindsay)
February 7, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Tang Tsui on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc. (Tsui, Nicholas)
February 7, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David S Frist on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc. (Frist, David)
February 7, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M Joseph John Ravindra Fernando on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc. (Fernando, M Joseph)
February 7, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ross Ritter Barton on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc. (Barton, Ross)
February 7, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Michael J Newton on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc. (Newton, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Newton on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc. (Newton, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy Payne: Scheduling Conference held on 2/7/19. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the magistrate judge. The parties were then given Markman and jury selection dates. The parties were directed to meet and confer regarding any changes to the Courts proposed docket control order and discovery order, and the parties are to submit the proposed orders within fourteen days. The parties were also instructed to submit the name of an agreed mediator within 3 days. (Court Reporter Tammy Goolsby.) (bga, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Iwahashi on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Iwahashi, Ryan)
February 6, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian M Buroker on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Buroker, Brian)
February 6, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Josh A Krevitt on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Krevitt, Josh)
February 6, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Hershkowitz on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Hershkowitz, Benjamin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andriana Shultz Daly on behalf of Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7114939. (Daly, Andriana) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #1 Sealed Attachment) (jmv, ).
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/24/2019. (nkl, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Sol IP, LLC, Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Verizon Communications Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David E Finkelson on behalf of Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7099943. (Finkelson, David)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/15/2019. (nkl, )
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/15/2019. (nkl, )
January 16, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sprint Communications Company L.P. to 3/4/2019; Sprint Corporation to 3/4/2019; Sprint Solutions, Inc. to 3/4/2019; Sprint Spectrum L.P. to 3/4/2019. (nkl, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Sprint Communications Company L.P., Sprint Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with Lead Case No. 2:18-CV-00526-RWS-RSP. All parties are instructed to file future filings (except relating to venue) in the Lead Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/11/2019. (nkl, )
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/26/2018. (nkl, )
December 27, 2018 Answer Due Deadline Updated for AT&T Mobility LLC to 3/4/2019. (nkl, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas M Mathews on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Mathews, Nicholas)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore Stevenson, III on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Stevenson, Theodore)
December 18, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sol IP, LLC. AT&T Mobility LLC served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/1/2019. (Shih, Daniel)
December 18, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR - was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 13, AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 13 FILED IN ERROR AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint on AT&T served on The Corporation Trust Company, Registered Agent on 12/11/18, filed by Sol IP, LLC. (Shih, Daniel) Modified on 12/18/2018 (nkl, ).
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seong Jun Park on behalf of Sol IP, LLC (Park, Seong Jun)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC. (ch, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Sol IP, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Sol IP, LLC (Capshaw, Sidney)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryce Thomas Barcelo on behalf of Sol IP, LLC (Barcelo, Bryce)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathryn P Hoek on behalf of Sol IP, LLC (Hoek, Kathryn)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Bertoldi on behalf of Sol IP, LLC (Bertoldi, Jason)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kalpana Srinivasan on behalf of Sol IP, LLC (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Max Lalon Tribble, Jr on behalf of Sol IP, LLC (Tribble, Max)
December 4, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, )
December 4, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sol IP, LLC (Shih, Daniel)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Form AO120)(Shih, Daniel)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against AT&T Mobility LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7047864.), filed by Sol IP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 (U.S. Patent No. 9,603,174), #3 Exhibit 2 (U.S. Patent No. 8,761,814), #4 Exhibit 3 (U.S. Patent No. 9,155,066), #5 Exhibit 4 (U.S. Patent No. 8,270,354), #6 Exhibit 5 (U.S. Patent No. 8,311,031), #7 Exhibit 6 (U.S. Patent No. 9,496,976), #8 Exhibit 7 (U.S. Patent No. 10,080,204), #9 Exhibit 8 (U.S. Patent No. 8,320,565), #10 Exhibit 9 (U.S. Patent No. 8,320,571), #11 Exhibit 10 (U.S. Patent No. 9,144,064), #12 Exhibit 11 (U.S. Patent No. 9,204,438), #13 Exhibit 12 (U.S. Patent No. 9,888,435), #14 Exhibit 13 (U.S. Patent No. 8,320,337), #15 Exhibit 14 (U.S. Patent No. 8,971,168), #16 Exhibit 15 (U.S. Patent No. 8,593,936), #17 Exhibit 16 (U.S. Patent No. 10,075,946), #18 Exhibit 17 (U.S. Patent No. 10,009,884), #19 Exhibit 18 (U.S. Patent No. 9,265,063), #20 Exhibit 19 (U.S. Patent No. 10,057,095), #21 Exhibit 20 (U.S. Patent No. 9,432,940), #22 Exhibit 21 (U.S. Patent No. 9,634,746), #23 Exhibit 22 (U.S. Patent No. 10,090,894), #24 Exhibit 23 (U.S. Patent No. 8,654,881), #25 Exhibit 24 (U.S. Patent No. 9,900,067), #26 Exhibit 25 (U.S. Patent No. 10,045,256))(Shih, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2018: #27 Civil Cover Sheet 2) (nkl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sol IP, LLC v. AT&T Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sol IP, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J Shih
Represented By: Bryce Thomas Barcelo
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Jason Bertoldi
Represented By: Seong Jun Park
Represented By: Kathryn P Hoek
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Max Lalon Tribble, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Grinstein
Represented By: Oleg Elkhunovich
Represented By: Rocco Filippo Nicola Magni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: Josh A Krevitt
Represented By: Benjamin Hershkowitz
Represented By: Ryan Iwahashi
Represented By: Brian M Buroker
Represented By: Brian Ashley Rosenthal
Represented By: Rudolph Fink, IV
Represented By: Brian K Andrea
Represented By: Florina Yezril
Represented By: Sarah L Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sprint Corporation
Represented By: David E Finkelson
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Andriana Shultz Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Verizon Communications Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Lindsay Catherine Church
Represented By: David S Frist
Represented By: M Joseph John Ravindra Fernando
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Represented By: Michael J Newton
Represented By: Michael Clayton Deane
Represented By: Darlena Subashi
Represented By: Nicholas Tang Tsui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sprint Spectrum L.P.
Represented By: David E Finkelson
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Andriana Shultz Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Lindsay Catherine Church
Represented By: David S Frist
Represented By: M Joseph John Ravindra Fernando
Represented By: Ross Ritter Barton
Represented By: Michael J Newton
Represented By: Michael Clayton Deane
Represented By: Darlena Subashi
Represented By: Nicholas Tang Tsui
Represented By: Laura Maninger
Represented By: Scott Wayne Breedlove
Represented By: Edgar Leon Carter
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Represented By: David E Finkelson
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Andriana Shultz Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sprint Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: David E Finkelson
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Andriana Shultz Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Daniel Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: David Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Scott Woloson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ericsson, Inc.
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Represented By: Nicholas M Mathews
Represented By: Warren Henry Lipschitz
Represented By: Erik Bruce Fountain
Represented By: Eric Sorensen Hansen
Represented By: Jonathan Nathanial Powers
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: Kevin Hess
Represented By: Chelsea Ann Ayres Priest
Represented By: Christine Michelle Woodin
Represented By: Marcus Lewis Rabinowitz
Represented By: James Travis Underwood
Represented By: Michael Andrew Bittner
Represented By: Thomas M Melsheimer
Represented By: Michael Robert Rueckheim
Represented By: Michael Brett Johnson
Represented By: Ahtoosa Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?