AGIS Software Development LLC v. Apple, Inc

Plaintiff: Agis Software Development LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc and Navizon, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018mc00004
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2018 19 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/24/18 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 10/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/25/2018. (sholmes, )
September 24, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER re #1 Petition to Perpetuate Testimony, filed by Apple Inc. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/24/2018. (nkl, )
September 24, 2018 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 9/24/2018 re #7 filed by Navizon, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (jml)
September 21, 2018 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bobby Lamb on behalf of Apple Inc (Lamb, Bobby)
September 17, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing set 9/24/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District Apple, Inc's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena to Non-Party Navizon, Inc. and Memorandum in Support. (jml)
September 7, 2018 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Motion to Compel filed by Navizon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cyril Houri, #2 Declaration of Christopher L. Evans, #3 Exhibit A)(Evans, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER re #1 Petition to Perpetuate Testimony, filed by Apple Inc. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/6/2018. (nkl, )
September 6, 2018 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Matty on behalf of Apple Inc (Matty, Brian)
September 6, 2018 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cosmin Maier on behalf of Apple Inc (Maier, Cosmin)
September 5, 2018 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Apple Inc (Smith, Melissa)
September 5, 2018 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher L Evans on behalf of Navizon, Inc. (Evans, Christopher)
August 31, 2018 9 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:18-mc-23360. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 31, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING action to the Eastern District of Texas. This case is CLOSED for Statistical purposes. Motions terminated: Granting #7 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue to Transfer Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel to the Eastern District of Texas filed by Navizon, Inc. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/31/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/31/2018.]
August 29, 2018 7 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue to Transfer Apple Inc.'s Motion to Compel to the Eastern District of Texas by Navizon, Inc.. Attorney Gus Michael Centrone added to party Navizon, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/12/2018 (Centrone, Gus) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/31/2018.]
August 24, 2018 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Apple, Inc. (Fernandez, Lazaro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/31/2018.]
August 20, 2018 5 NOTICE by Apple, Inc re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, NOTICE OF FILING OF DECLARATION OF KATHRYN BI IN SUPPORT OF APPLE INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA TO NON-PARTY NAVIZON, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kathryn Bi) (Fernandez, Lazaro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/31/2018.]
August 20, 2018 4 NOTICE by Apple, Inc re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Civil Cover Sheet (Fernandez, Lazaro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/31/2018.]
August 20, 2018 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ail) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/31/2018.]
August 17, 2018 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. (ail) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/31/2018.]
August 17, 2018 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District Apple, Inc's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena to Non-Party Navizon, Inc. and Memorandum in Support. Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-10918728, filed by Apple, Inc.(Fernandez, Lazaro) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 8/31/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGIS Software Development LLC v. Apple, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Bobby Lamb
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Cosmin Maier
Represented By: Brian Matty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navizon, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agis Software Development LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?