COURTNEY MORTIMER v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: COURTNEY TUCKER FKA COURTNEY MORTIMER and Courtney Mortimer
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00046
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 5/3/2019 10:50 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
March 27, 2019 Scheduling Conference reset for 5/2/2019 10:20 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, )
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Hearing (Scheduling Conference). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/26/2019. (nkl, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Hearing (Scheduling Conference) by Courtney Mortimer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodman, Robert)
March 18, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2019 02:50 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
March 13, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 ORIGINAL ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Courtney Mortimer by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Lynch, Dennis)
March 4, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America to 3/13/2019. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.( Jean, Cameron)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/22/2019. (ch, )
February 11, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
February 11, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America By and Through Its Registered Agent Coporation Service Company. (nkl, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7132562.), filed by COURTNEY TUCKER FKA COURTNEY MORTIMER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COURTNEY MORTIMER v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Dennis M Lynch
Represented By: Cameron Elliot Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY TUCKER FKA COURTNEY MORTIMER
Represented By: Robert Edward Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Mortimer
Represented By: Robert Edward Goodman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?