SEVEN Networks, LLC v. Apple Inc

Plaintiff: SEVEN Networks, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00115
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Sorensen Hansen on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Hansen, Eric)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Robert Schubert on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Schubert, Kevin)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Lee Burgess on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Burgess, Kevin)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Raymond Hasenour on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Hasenour, Seth)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Lee Fornarotto on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Fornarotto, Lauren)
April 26, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc to 6/16/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Smith, Melissa)
April 26, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc to 6/1/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Smith, Melissa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of SEVEN Networks, LLC (Truelove, Jennifer)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SEVEN Networks, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CF SVN LLC for SEVEN Networks, LLC. (Burgess, Kevin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc. (ch, )
April 11, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
April 11, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7219889.), filed by SEVEN Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxter, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEVEN Networks, LLC v. Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEVEN Networks, LLC
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Kevin Lee Burgess
Represented By: Kevin Robert Schubert
Represented By: Jennifer Leigh Truelove
Represented By: Eric Sorensen Hansen
Represented By: Lauren Lee Fornarotto
Represented By: Seth Raymond Hasenour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?