Vocalife LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Vocalife LLC
Defendant: Amazon.com LLC and Amazon.com, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00123
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com LLC to 6/17/2019; Amazon.com, Inc. to 6/17/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Randall Akin on behalf of Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. (Akin, Kyle)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc..( Doan, Jennifer)
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vocalife LLC. Amazon.com LLC served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019; Amazon.com, Inc. served on 4/25/2019, answer due 5/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(nkl, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justine Minseon Park on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Park, Justine)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Rubino, Vincent)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Chester Drucker on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Drucker, Lawrence)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Vocalife LLC (Fabricant, Alfred)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.., Summons Issued as to Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons(es))(ch, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Vocalife LLC identifying Corporate Parent Algovate Inc. for Vocalife LLC. (Baxter, Samuel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Baxter, Samuel)
April 16, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
April 16, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Amazon.com LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7228386.), filed by Vocalife LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baxter, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vocalife LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com LLC
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Randall Akin
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vocalife LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Chester Drucker
Represented By: Justine Minseon Park
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Represented By: Alfred Ross Fabricant
Represented By: Vincent J Rubino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?