Dahl v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: Julie Dahl
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00155
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/21/2019. (nkl, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/19/2019. (nkl, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Julie Dahl (Thompson, John)
June 12, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Acosta, Matthew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Acosta, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Prudential Insurance Company of America to 6/12/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Prudential Insurance Company of America.( Acosta, Matthew)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Julie Dahl OF VACATION OF PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY IN CHARGE (Thompson, John)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America c/o its agent for service: CT Corporation System. (nkl, )
May 3, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bernard A Guerrini on behalf of Julie Dahl (Guerrini, Bernard)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7254230.), filed by Julie Dahl. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thompson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahl v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Matthew C Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Dahl
Represented By: Bernard A Guerrini
Represented By: John Leslie Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?