Better Mouse Company, LLC v. Anker Tech Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Better Mouse Company, LLC
Defendant: Fantasia Trading LLC, Anker Tech Corporation, Anker Innovations Technology Co. Ltd. and Anker Innovations Limited
Case Number: 2:2019cv00157
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fantasia Trading LLC (Johnson, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2019 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Anker Tech Corporation (Johnson, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Anker Innovations Technology Co. Ltd. (Johnson, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Anker Innovations Limited (Johnson, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Anker Tech Corporation. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 28, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Fantasia Trading LLC. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 28, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Anker Innovations Limited. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 28, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Anker Innovations Technology Co. Ltd.. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Anker Innovations Limited (Johnson, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Anker Innovations Technology Co. Ltd. (Johnson, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fantasia Trading LLC (Johnson, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Anker Tech Corporation (Johnson, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Anker Innovations Limited to 7/4/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
June 3, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Anker Tech Corporation to 7/3/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
June 3, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Anker Innovations Technology Co. Ltd. to 7/4/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
June 3, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Fantasia Trading LLC to 7/3/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Thompson, Larry)
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Thompson, Larry)
May 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Ellis on behalf of Better Mouse Company, LLC (Ellis, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Better Mouse Company, LLC (Harrington, Zachariah)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Antonelli on behalf of Better Mouse Company, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Thompson, Larry)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Thompson, Larry)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Fantasia Trading LLC SERVE: Business Filings Incorporated. (nkl, )
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Anker Innovations Limited SERVE: Texas Secretary of State, Anker Innovations Technology Co. Ltd. SERVE: Texas Secretary of State, Anker Tech Corporation SERVE: Business Filings Incorporated (use 9325335). (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) \Anker Innovations Technology Co. Ltd., #2 Summons(es) Anker Tech Corporation)(nkl, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 9 REDACTION to #2 Sealed Document,,, SEALED COMPLAINT against Anker Tech Corporation, Anker Innovations Technology Co. Ltd., Anker Innovations Limited f/k/a Anker Tech Co. Ltd., and Fantasia Trading LLC. d/b/a AnkerDirect by Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A [Settlement and License Agreement], #3 Exhibit B [L. Thompson Aug. 2, 2018, Email to O. Yu], #4 Exhibit C [L. Thompson Sep. 6 and 7, 2018, Emails to O. Yu], #5 Exhibit D [Anker Email Chain], #6 Exhibit E [Email Translations], #7 Exhibit F [M. Ellis Email and Letter], #8 Exhibit G [M. Ellis Email and Letter], #9 Exhibit H [Sep 19, 2018, Email from P. Peng], #10 Exhibit I [Sep. 20, 2018, Email from M. Ellis], #11 Exhibit J [Email Exchange Between M. Ellis and P. Peng], #12 Exhibit K [Email from O. Yu], #13 Exhibit L [Email Exchange Between M. Ellis and Owen Yu])(Thompson, Larry)
May 8, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - The attorney appearing in the case should file a Notice of Attorney Appearance with their user id and password in order to appear in the case. Document # 4, NOTICE of Attorney Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Better Mouse Company, LLC (Thompson, Larry)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Better Mouse Company, LLC of Related Cases (Thompson, Larry)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to File Original Complaint Under Seal #2 Sealed Complaint. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/7/2019. (nkl, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis on behalf of Better Mouse Company, LLC (Davis, Stafford)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of Better Mouse Company, LLC (Bartles, Catherine) Modified on 5/8/2019 (nkl, ).
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Susan Bartles on behalf of Better Mouse Company, LLC (Bartles, Catherine)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 SEALED COMPLAINT against Anker Tech Corporation, Anker Innovations Technology Co. Ltd., Anker Innovations Limited f/k/a Anker Tech Co. Ltd., and Fantasia Trading LLC. d/b/a AnkerDirect (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A [Settlement and License Agreement], #3 Exhibit B [L. Thompson Aug. 2, 2018, Email to O. Yu], #4 Exhibit C [L. Thompson Sep. 6 and 7, 2018, Emails to O. Yu], #5 Exhibit D [Anker Email Chain], #6 Exhibit E [Email Translations], #7 Exhibit F [M. Ellis Email and Letter], #8 Exhibit G [M. Ellis Email and Letter], #9 Exhibit H [Sep 19, 2018, Email from P. Peng], #10 Exhibit I [Sep. 20, 2018, Email from M. Ellis], #11 Exhibit J [Email Exchange Between M. Ellis and P. Peng], #12 Exhibit K [Email from O. Yu], #13 Exhibit L [Email Exchange Between M. Ellis and Owen Yu])(Thompson, Larry)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Document MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL by Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Larry)
May 6, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TXE100018495 (aam, )
May 6, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
May 6, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Better Mouse Company, LLC v. Anker Tech Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fantasia Trading LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Lance Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anker Tech Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Lance Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anker Innovations Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Jeffrey Lance Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anker Innovations Limited
Represented By: Jeffrey Lance Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Better Mouse Company, LLC
Represented By: Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Zachariah Harrington
Represented By: Matthew J Antonelli
Represented By: Catherine Susan Bartles
Represented By: Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis
Represented By: Michael David Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?