Giessen et al v. Intec Communications, LLC.

Plaintiff: Donald Lee and Roy Giessen
Defendant: Tekkcomm LLC and Intec Communications, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00173
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss or for Definite Statement filed by Roy Giessen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Harry)
June 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Intec Communications, LLC., filed by Roy Giessen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A fiber drops, #2 Exhibit B did not get paid, #3 Exhibit C Giessen Intec, #4 Exhibit D never got that from Intec, #5 Exhibit E Intec was supposed, #6 Exhibit F rely on intech, #7 Exhibit G intec payroll girl, #8 Exhibit H Intec office address, #9 Exhibit I can send into Intec)(Whitehurst, Harry)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF filed in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Which Relief May be Granted by Intec Communications, LLC.. (Field, Brett)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss or for Definite Statement by Intec Communications, LLC.. (Field, Brett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
May 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Intec Communications, LLC. Registered Agent for Intec Communications, LLC. being Sukhi Jolly, Tekkcomm LLC. Registered Agent for Tekkcomm. LLC being United States Corp. Agents, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Tekkcomm, LLC.)(nkl, )
May 14, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
May 14, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7268223.), filed by Roy Giessen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitehurst, Harry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giessen et al v. Intec Communications, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tekkcomm LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intec Communications, LLC.
Represented By: Brett Stephan Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lee
Represented By: Harry Bob Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Giessen
Represented By: Harry Bob Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?