Huawei Device USA Inc et al v. Harris Corporation
Plaintiff: Huawei Device (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd, Huawei Device USA Inc and Huawei Technologies USA Inc
Defendant: Harris Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00222
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jolene L. Wang on behalf of Huawei Device (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd, Huawei Technologies USA Inc (Wang, Jolene)
July 9, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - this case is consolidated please file in the lead case. Document # 10, NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Harris Corporation [NOTICE OF P.R. 3-3 AND 3-4 DISCLOSURES] (Johanningmeier, Corey) Modified on 7/9/2019 (nkl, ).
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Seventeen and Eighteen of Defendants Counterclaims Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Huawei Device (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd., Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd, Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Middleton, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/27/2019. (nkl, )
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED DISCOVERY ORDER granting #6 Motion for Discovery [Joint Motion to Enter Agreed Discovery and Protective Orders]. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/27/2019. (nkl, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Discovery [Joint Motion to Enter Agreed Discovery and Protective Orders] by Harris Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johanningmeier, Corey)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Harris Corporation.(De Mory, Denise)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Harris Corporation, filed by Huawei Device USA Inc, Huawei Technologies USA Inc, Huawei Device (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd, Huawei Device Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Smith, Melissa)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, Jury Selection set for 6/8/2020 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 11/14/2019 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 4/27/2020 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/12/2019. (klc, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/12/2019. (klc, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/12/2019. (klc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huawei Device USA Inc et al v. Harris Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huawei Device (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin John Post
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bonny
Represented By: Andrew Townsend Radsch
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: James Lawrence Davis, Jr
Represented By: Alexander Ernest Middleton
Represented By: James R Batchelder
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Represented By: Jolene L. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huawei Device Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kevin John Post
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bonny
Represented By: Andrew Townsend Radsch
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: James Lawrence Davis, Jr
Represented By: Alexander Ernest Middleton
Represented By: James R Batchelder
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Represented By: Jolene L. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Represented By: Kevin John Post
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bonny
Represented By: Andrew Townsend Radsch
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: James Lawrence Davis, Jr
Represented By: Alexander Ernest Middleton
Represented By: James R Batchelder
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Represented By: Jolene L. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huawei Device USA Inc
Represented By: Kevin John Post
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bonny
Represented By: Andrew Townsend Radsch
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: James Lawrence Davis, Jr
Represented By: Alexander Ernest Middleton
Represented By: James R Batchelder
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Represented By: Jolene L. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huawei Technologies USA Inc
Represented By: Kevin John Post
Represented By: Christopher Michael Bonny
Represented By: Andrew Townsend Radsch
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: James Lawrence Davis, Jr
Represented By: Alexander Ernest Middleton
Represented By: James R Batchelder
Represented By: Steven Mark Geiszler
Represented By: Jolene L. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Corey A Johanningmeier
Represented By: Nicholas Stephan Mancuso
Represented By: Christina M Finn
Represented By: Robin K. Curtis
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Henry Charles Bunsow
Represented By: Denise M De Mory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?