Arntsen v. Harris Potteries, L.P.
Plaintiff: Edward Arntsen
Defendant: Harris Potteries, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00242
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Harris Potteries, L.P. (Jones, Michelle)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Harris Potteries, L.P..(Jones, Michelle)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/20/2019. (nkl, )
July 25, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Harris Potteries, L.P. to 8/29/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Harris Potteries, L.P..( Jones, Michelle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Arntsen. Harris Potteries, L.P. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (mjc, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Harris Potteries, L.P. ATTN: Registered Agent Kevin Miller. (nkl, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Edward Arntsen (Forsman, Wade)
July 5, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 5, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7337721.), filed by Edward Arntsen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Forsman, Wade)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arntsen v. Harris Potteries, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris Potteries, L.P.
Represented By: Michelle McCullough Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Arntsen
Represented By: Wade Arnold Forsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?