SMITH v. ENRIQUE GUZMAN, Individually and doing businiess as V & D GUZMAN TRANSPORTATION SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: ALLIE SMITH
Defendant: ENRIQUE GUZMAN, Individually and doing businiess as V & D GUZMAN TRANSPORTATION SERVICES and JOSE DELEON
Case Number: 2:2019cv00273
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ENRIQUE GUZMAN, Individually and doing businiess as V & D GUZMAN TRANSPORTATION SERVICES.(Jordan, McKenzie)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLIE SMITH. ENRIQUE GUZMAN, Individually and doing businiess as V & D GUZMAN TRANSPORTATION SERVICES served on 9/15/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Erskine, Blake)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to JOSE DELEON, ENRIQUE GUZMAN, Individually and doing businiess as V & D GUZMAN TRANSPORTATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) Jose DeLeon)(nkl, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ken Keith Miller on behalf of ALLIE SMITH (Miller, Ken)
August 9, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
August 9, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ORIGINAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7385419.), filed by ALLIE SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erskine, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. ENRIQUE GUZMAN, Individually and doing businiess as V & D GUZMAN TRANSPORTATION SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIE SMITH
Represented By: Blake Charles Erskine
Represented By: Ken Keith Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENRIQUE GUZMAN, Individually and doing businiess as V & D GUZMAN TRANSPORTATION SERVICES
Represented By: McKenzie Lee Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE DELEON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?