Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Plaintiff: Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00283
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:19-cv-00250. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial., Cases associated.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/21/2019. (nkl, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. JPMorgan Chase & Co. waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Hansley, Austin)
August 30, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (ch, )
August 22, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
August 22, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC (Hansley, Austin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. (Hansley, Austin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hansley, Austin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original against JPMorgan Chase & Co. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7404138.), filed by Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Hansley, Austin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lighthouse Consulting Group, LLC
Represented By: Austin Lee Hansley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?